Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 999 Today
» 948 Yesterday
» 7119 Week
» 18690 Month
» 266983 Year
» 1151364 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

SR Bulleid "West Country/Battle of Britain" Class 4-6-2


Date Number (at time) Depot (at time) Code Details Ref Link
Fri 16/07/1954 34070 74B   Brighton Works Arrivals: Period under review. RO 9/1954  
Tue 20/07/1954 34025,
34025,
34026,
34026,
34056,
34056,
34108,
34108
72A,
72A,
72A,
72A,
72A,
72A,
??,
??
  Eastleigh Works Arrivals: Period under review.
Eastleigh Works Arrivals: Period under review.
Eastleigh Works Arrivals: Period under review.
Eastleigh Works Arrivals: Period under review.
Eastleigh Works Arrivals: Period under review.
Eastleigh Works Arrivals: Period under review.
Eastleigh Works Arrivals: Period under review.
Eastleigh Works Arrivals: Period under review.
RO 9/1954  
Sat 08/1954 34025,
34025,
34055
72A,
72A,
72B
  Eastleigh Works Open Day: Open Day
Eastleigh Works Open Day: Open Day
Eastleigh Works Open Day: Open Day - Open day exhibit
RO 9/1954  
Sat 18/02/1961 34002,
34011,
34018,
34018,
34024,
34024,
34052,
34052,
34066,
34072
72A,
72A,
70A,
70A,
72A,
72A,
72B,
72B,
72A,
72A
  Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Works yard.
Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Works yard.
Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Works yard.
Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
   
Sat 25/02/1961 34002,
34011,
34018,
34018,
34024,
34024,
34066
72A,
72A,
70A,
70A,
72A,
72A,
72A
  Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
   
Sun 26/11/1961 34007,
34015,
34016,
34016,
34033,
34057,
34072,
34094,
34103,
34110
70A,
72A,
71A,
71A,
83H,
75A,
72A,
70A,
71B,
72A
  Eastleigh Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop.
Eastleigh Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop.
Eastleigh Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop.
Eastleigh Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop.
Eastleigh Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop.
Eastleigh Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop.
Eastleigh Works visit: Around the Works - Works yard.
Eastleigh Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop.
Eastleigh Works visit: Around the Works - Works yard.
Eastleigh Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop.
SLS 1/1962  
Tue 18/05/1965 34036,
34036
70D,
70D
  At Waterloo Station
At Waterloo Station
   
Sat 07/05/1966 34014,
34014,
34062,
34062,
34063,
34075
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn
  Birds Scrapyard, Bridgend: Dumped
Birds Scrapyard, Bridgend: Dumped
Birds Scrapyard, Bridgend: Dumped
Birds Scrapyard, Bridgend: Dumped
Birds Scrapyard, Bridgend: Dumped
Birds Scrapyard, Bridgend: Dumped
RO 8/1966  
Sun 23/10/1966 34006,
34015,
34025,
34025,
34032,
34032,
34060,
34060,
34104,
34104,
34108,
34108
70E,
70E,
70F,
70F,
Wdn,
Wdn,
70D,
70D,
70D,
70D,
70E,
70E
  Salisbury depot: On shed RO 12/1966