West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C101 |
06/1945 |
EXETER |
10/07/1945 |
|
07/1967 |
09/07/1967 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C102 |
06/1945 |
SALISBURY |
11/07/1945 |
|
04/1967 |
02/04/1967 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C103 |
06/1945 |
PLYMOUTH |
11/07/1945 |
|
10/1964 |
20/09/1964 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C104 |
06/1945 |
YEOVIL |
02/11/1945 |
|
07/1967 |
09/07/1967 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C105 |
07/1945 |
BARNSTAPLE |
30/08/1946 |
|
10/1966 |
02/10/1966 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C106 |
08/1945 |
BUDE |
01/11/1945 |
|
03/1967 |
19/03/1967 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C107 |
08/1945 |
WADEBRIDGE |
31/10/1945 |
|
10/1965 |
17/10/1965 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C108 |
09/1945 |
PADSTOW |
31/10/1945 |
|
06/1967 |
25/06/1967 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C109 |
15/09/1945 |
LYME REGIS |
27/08/1946 |
|
06/1966 |
02/10/1966 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C110 |
09/1945 |
SIDMOUTH |
27/06/1946 |
|
03/1965 |
07/03/1965 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C111 |
10/1945 |
TAVISTOCK |
13/06/1947 |
|
11/1963 |
30/11/1963 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C112 |
10/1945 |
LAUNCESTON |
01/11/1945 |
|
12/1966 |
11/12/1966 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C113 |
10/1945 |
OKEHAMPTON |
12/06/1947 |
|
07/1967 |
09/07/1967 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C114 |
11/1945 |
BUDLEIGH SALTERTON |
26/06/1946 |
|
03/1965 |
21/03/1965 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C115 |
11/1945 |
EXMOUTH |
26/06/1946 |
|
04/1967 |
16/04/1967 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C116 |
11/1945 |
BODMIN |
28/08/1946 |
|
06/1964 |
14/06/1964 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C117 |
12/1945 |
ILFRACOMBE |
29/08/1946 |
|
10/1966 |
02/10/1966 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C118 |
12/1945 |
AXMINSTER |
25/06/1946 |
|
07/1967 |
09/07/1967 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C119 |
12/1945 |
BIDEFORD |
29/08/1946 |
|
03/1967 |
19/03/1967 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C120 |
12/1945 |
SEATON |
25/06/1946 |
|
10/1964 |
07/09/1964 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C121 |
01/1946 |
DARTMOOR |
01/1946 |
|
07/1967 |
09/07/1967 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C122 |
01/1946 |
EXMOOR |
01/1946 |
|
04/1965 |
25/04/1965 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C123 |
02/1946 |
BLACKMOOR VALE |
08/1947 |
|
04/1950 |
09/07/1967 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
34023 |
02/1946 |
BLACKMORE VALE |
04/1950 |
Alternative (and equally valid) spelling of Blackmore/Blackmoor Vale |
|
09/07/1967 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C124 |
02/1946 |
TAMAR VALLEY |
02/1946 |
|
07/1967 |
09/07/1967 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C125 |
03/1946 |
ROUGH TOR |
11/04/1948 |
|
23/04/1948 |
09/07/1967 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C125 |
03/1946 |
WHIMPLE |
03/05/1948 |
|
07/1967 |
09/07/1967 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C127 |
04/1946 |
TAW VALLEY |
04/1946 |
|
08/1964 |
09/08/1964 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C128 |
04/1946 |
EDDYSTONE |
04/1946 |
|
05/1964 |
31/05/1964 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C129 |
05/1946 |
LUNDY |
05/1946 |
|
10/1964 |
13/09/1964 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C130 |
05/1946 |
WATERSMEET |
05/1946 |
|
10/1964 |
07/09/1964 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C131 |
06/1946 |
TORRINGTON |
06/1946 |
|
02/1965 |
07/02/1965 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C132 |
06/1946 |
CAMELFORD |
06/1946 |
|
10/1966 |
02/10/1966 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C133 |
06/1946 |
CHARD |
07/1946 |
|
12/1965 |
19/12/1965 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C134 |
07/1946 |
HONITON |
07/1946 |
|
07/1967 |
02/07/1967 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C135 |
07/1946 |
SHAFTESBURY |
07/1946 |
|
06/1963 |
08/06/1963 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C136 |
07/1946 |
WESTWARD HO |
07/1946 |
|
07/1967 |
09/07/1967 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C137 |
08/1946 |
CLOVELLY |
08/1946 |
|
07/1967 |
09/07/1967 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C138 |
09/1946 |
LYNTON |
09/1946 |
|
06/1966 |
12/06/1966 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C139 |
09/1946 |
BOSCASTLE |
09/1946 |
|
05/1965 |
09/05/1965 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C140 |
09/1946 |
CREWKERNE |
09/1946 |
|
07/1967 |
02/07/1967 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C141 |
09/1946 |
WILTON |
10/1946 |
|
01/1966 |
23/01/1966 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C142 |
10/1946 |
DORCHESTER |
10/1946 |
|
10/1965 |
03/10/1965 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C143 |
10/1946 |
COOMBE MARTIN |
10/1946 |
|
06/1963 |
08/06/1963 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C144 |
10/1946 |
WOOLACOMBE |
10/1946 |
|
05/1967 |
21/05/1967 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C145 |
10/1946 |
OTTERY ST. MARY |
10/1946 |
|
06/1964 |
28/06/1964 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C146 |
11/1946 |
BRAUNTON |
11/1946 |
|
10/1965 |
10/10/1965 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C147 |
11/1946 |
CALLINGTON |
11/1946 |
|
06/1967 |
25/06/1967 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C148 |
11/1946 |
CREDITON |
11/1946 |
|
03/1966 |
13/03/1966 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C149 |
12/1946 |
ANTI AIRCRAFT COMMAND |
12/1946 |
|
11/1963 |
07/12/1963 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C150 |
12/1946 |
ROYAL OBSERVER CORPS |
12/1946 |
|
08/1965 |
29/08/1965 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C151 |
12/1946 |
WINSTON CHURCHILL |
12/1946 |
|
10/1965 |
10/1965 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C152 |
12/1946 |
LORD DOWDING |
12/1946 |
|
07/1967 |
09/07/1967 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C153 |
01/1947 |
SIR KEITH PARK |
01/1947 |
|
10/1965 |
17/10/1965 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C154 |
01/1947 |
LORD BEAVERBROOK |
02/1947 |
|
10/1964 |
07/09/1964 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C155 |
02/1947 |
FIGHTER PILOT |
02/1947 |
|
06/1963 |
22/06/1963 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C156 |
02/1947 |
CROYDON |
02/1947 |
|
05/1967 |
07/05/1967 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C157 |
03/1947 |
BIGGIN HILL |
03/1947 |
|
05/1967 |
07/05/1967 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C158 |
03/1947 |
SIR FREDERICK PILE |
03/1947 |
|
10/1964 |
11/10/1964 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C159 |
04/1947 |
SIR ARCHIBALD SINCLAIR |
04/1947 |
|
05/1966 |
29/05/1966 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C160 |
04/1947 |
25 SQUADRON |
04/1947 |
|
07/1967 |
06/1967 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C161 |
04/1947 |
73 SQUADRON |
05/1947 |
|
08/1964 |
16/08/1964 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C162 |
05/1947 |
17 SQUADRON |
05/1947 |
|
07/1964 |
13/07/1964 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C163 |
05/1947 |
229 SQUADRON |
07/1947 |
|
08/1965 |
15/08/1965 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C164 |
07/1947 |
FIGHTER COMMAND |
07/1947 |
|
05/1966 |
22/05/1966 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C165 |
07/1947 |
HURRICANE |
09/1947 |
|
04/1964 |
08/04/1964 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C166 |
09/1947 |
SPITFIRE |
09/1947 |
|
09/1966 |
04/09/1966 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C167 |
09/1947 |
TANGMERE |
19/09/1947 |
|
|
16/11/1963 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C168 |
10/1947 |
KENLEY |
10/1947 |
|
12/1963 |
07/12/1963 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C169 |
10/1947 |
HAWKINGE |
10/1947 |
|
11/1963 |
23/11/1963 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
21C170 |
11/1947 |
MANSTON |
11/1947 |
|
08/1964 |
10/08/1964 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
34071 |
04/1948 |
601 SQUADRON |
04/1948 |
|
04/1967 |
30/04/1967 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
34072 |
04/1948 |
257 SQUADRON |
04/1948 |
|
10/1964 |
25/10/1964 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
34073 |
05/1948 |
249 SQUADRON |
05/1948 |
|
06/1964 |
28/06/1964 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
34074 |
05/1948 |
46 SQUADRON |
05/1948 |
|
06/1963 |
15/06/1963 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
34075 |
06/1948 |
264 SQUADRON |
06/1948 |
|
04/1964 |
08/04/1964 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
34076 |
06/1948 |
41 SQUADRON |
06/1948 |
|
01/1966 |
09/01/1966 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
34077 |
07/1948 |
603 SQUADRON |
07/1948 |
|
03/1967 |
26/03/1967 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
34078 |
07/1948 |
222 SQUADRON |
07/1948 |
|
10/1964 |
07/09/1964 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
34079 |
07/1948 |
141 SQUADRON |
07/1948 |
|
02/1966 |
27/02/1966 |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
34092 |
09/1949 |
CITY OF WELLS |
25/11/1949 |
|
|
29/11/1964 |