SR Bulleid "WCBB" Class 4-6-2
Company | Old Number | Company | New Number | Subtype | Date | Information | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SR | 21C103 | renumbered to | BR | 34003 | y/e | 1948 | ||
SR | 21C161 | renumbered to | BR | 34061 | y/e | 1948 | ||
SR | 21C162 | renumbered to | BR | 34062 | y/e | 1948 | ||
SR | 21C167 | renumbered to | BR | 34067 | y/e | 1948 | ||
renumbered to | BR | 34071 | 01/01/1948 | |||||
SR | 21C104 | renumbered to | BR | 34004 | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | ||
SR | 21C105 | renumbered to | BR | 34005 | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | ||
SR | 21C106 | renumbered to | BR | 34006 | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | ||
SR | 21C111 | renumbered to | BR | 34011 | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | ||
SR | 21C115 | renumbered to | BR | 34015 | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | ||
SR | 21C117 | renumbered to | BR | 34017 | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | ||
SR | 21C119 | renumbered to | BR | 34019 | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | ||
SR | 21C120 | renumbered to | BR | 34020 | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | ||
SR | 21C123 | renumbered to | BR | 34023 | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | ||
SR | 21C132 | renumbered to | BR | 34032 | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | ||
SR | 21C136 | renumbered to | BR | 34036 | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | ||
SR | 21C142 | renumbered to | BR | 34042 | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | ||
SR | 21C156 | renumbered to | BR | 34056 | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | ||
SR | 21C164 | renumbered to | BR | 34064 | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | ||
SR | 21C112 | renumbered to | BR | 34012 | 9w/e | 01/08/1948 | ||
SR | 21C113 | renumbered to | BR | 34013 | 9w/e | 01/08/1948 | ||
SR | 21C116 | renumbered to | BR | 34016 | 9w/e | 01/08/1948 | ||
SR | 21C118 | renumbered to | BR | 34018 | 9w/e | 01/08/1948 | ||
SR | 21C121 | renumbered to | BR | 34021 | 9w/e | 01/08/1948 | ||
SR | 21C122 | renumbered to | BR | 34022 | 9w/e | 01/08/1948 | ||
SR | 21C124 | renumbered to | BR | 34024 | 9w/e | 01/08/1948 | ||
SR | 21C127 | renumbered to | BR | 34027 | 9w/e | 01/08/1948 | ||
SR | 21C134 | renumbered to | BR | 34034 | 9w/e | 01/08/1948 | ||
SR | 21C139 | renumbered to | BR | 34039 | 9w/e | 01/08/1948 | ||
SR | 21C165 | renumbered to | BR | 34065 | 9w/e | 01/08/1948 | ||
SR | 21C169 | renumbered to | BR | 34069 | 9w/e | 01/08/1948 | ||
SR | 21C148 | renumbered to | BR | 34048 | 5w/e | 04/09/1948 | ||
SR | 21C125 | renumbered to | BR | 34025 | 4w/e | 06/10/1948 | ||
SR | 21C143 | renumbered to | BR | 34043 | 4w/e | 06/10/1948 | ||
SR | 21C160 | renumbered to | BR | 34060 | 4w/e | 06/10/1948 | ||
SR | 21C140 | renumbered to | BR | 34040 | 5w/e | 13/11/1948 | ||
SR | 21C151 | renumbered to | BR | 34051 | 5w/e | 13/11/1948 | ||
SR | 21C168 | renumbered to | BR | 34068 | 5w/e | 13/11/1948 | ||
SR | 21C102 | renumbered to | BR | 34002 | 8w/e | 08/01/1949 | ||
SR | 21C128 | renumbered to | BR | 34028 | 8w/e | 08/01/1949 | ||
SR | 21C130 | renumbered to | BR | 34030 | 8w/e | 08/01/1949 | ||
SR | 21C133 | renumbered to | BR | 34033 | 8w/e | 08/01/1949 | ||
SR | 21C144 | renumbered to | BR | 34044 | 8w/e | 08/01/1949 | ||
SR | 21C145 | renumbered to | BR | 34045 | 8w/e | 08/01/1949 | ||
SR | 21C158 | renumbered to | BR | 34058 | 8w/e | 08/01/1949 | ||
SR | 21C131 | renumbered to | BR | 34031 | 5w/e | 12/02/1949 | ||
SR | 21C135 | renumbered to | BR | 34035 | 5w/e | 12/02/1949 | ||
SR | 21C141 | renumbered to | BR | 34041 | 5w/e | 12/02/1949 | ||
SR | 21C146 | renumbered to | BR | 34046 | 5w/e | 12/02/1949 | ||
SR | 21C147 | renumbered to | BR | 34047 | 5w/e | 12/02/1949 | ||
SR | 21C150 | renumbered to | BR | 34050 | 5w/e | 12/02/1949 | ||
SR | 21C163 | renumbered to | BR | 34063 | 5w/e | 12/02/1949 | ||
SR | 21C129 | renumbered to | BR | 34029 | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | ||
SR | 21C138 | renumbered to | BR | 34038 | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | ||
SR | 21C152 | renumbered to | BR | 34052 | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | ||
SR | 21C166 | renumbered to | BR | 34066 | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | ||
SR | 21C108 | renumbered to | BR | 34008 | on | 08/04/1949 | ||
SR | 21C109 | renumbered to | BR | 34009 | on | 13/04/1949 | ||
SR | 21C101 | renumbered to | BR | 34001 | 7w/e | 03/05/1949 | ||
SR | 21C107 | renumbered to | BR | 34007 | 7w/e | 03/05/1949 | ||
SR | 21C137 | renumbered to | BR | 34037 | 7w/e | 03/05/1949 | ||
SR | 21C149 | renumbered to | BR | 34049 | 7w/e | 03/05/1949 | ||
SR | 21C154 | renumbered to | BR | 34054 | 7w/e | 03/05/1949 | ||
SR | 21C159 | renumbered to | BR | 34059 | 7w/e | 03/05/1949 | ||
SR | 21C170 | renumbered to | BR | 34070 | 7w/e | 03/05/1949 | ||
SR | 21C126 | renumbered to | BR | 34026 | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | ||
SR | 21C153 | renumbered to | BR | 34053 | 25/06/1949 | |||
SR | 21C157 | renumbered to | BR | 34057 | 25/06/1949 | |||
SR | 21C155 | renumbered to | BR | 34055 | 5w/e | 31/07/1949 | ||
SR | 21C114 | renumbered to | BR | 34014 | 3w/e | 05/11/1949 | ||
SR | 21C110 | renumbered to | BR | 34010 | 4w/e | 28/01/1950 |