SR Bulleid "MN" Class 4-6-2
Class | SR | BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Merchant Navy | 21C1 | 35001 | 06/1941 | EXJ 73A 70A 70F W |
Exmouth Junction Stewarts Lane Nine Elms Bournemouth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/01/1957 14/06/1959 14/09/1964 22/11/1964 |
22/11/1964 |
Merchant Navy | 21C2 | 35002 | 06/1941 | EXJ 71B 72A 71B 70A 71B 70A W |
Exmouth Junction Bournemouth Exmouth Junction Bournemouth Nine Elms Bournemouth Nine Elms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/05/1954 18/06/1954 06/06/1958 24/11/1960 17/01/1961 27/01/1964 23/02/1964 |
23/02/1964 |
Merchant Navy | 21C3 | 35003 | 09/1941 | EXJ 70A 70F 70G 70A W |
Exmouth Junction Nine Elms Bournemouth Weymouth Radipole (GWR) Nine Elms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1964 14/09/1964 17/10/1966 17/04/1967 09/07/1967 |
09/07/1967 |
Merchant Navy | 21C4 | 35004 | 10/1941 | EXJ EXJ 72B 70F W |
Exmouth Junction Exmouth Junction Salisbury Bournemouth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/02/1950 01/04/1957 14/09/1964 31/10/1965 |
31/10/1965 |
Merchant Navy | 21C5 | 35005 | 12/1941 | EXJ 9E 72A 72A 70A 71B 70G W |
Exmouth Junction Nine Elms Exmouth Junction Exmouth Junction Nine Elms Bournemouth Weymouth Radipole (GWR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/09/1948 05/05/1951 12/05/1951 19/03/1954 26/11/1959 14/09/1964 10/10/1965 |
10/10/1965 |
Merchant Navy | 21C6 | 35006 | 12/1941 | SAL W |
Salisbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/08/1964 |
16/08/1964 |
Merchant Navy | 21C7 | 35007 | 06/1942 | SAL 70G 70A W |
Salisbury Weymouth Radipole (GWR) Nine Elms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/01/1965 17/04/1967 09/07/1967 |
09/07/1967 |
Merchant Navy | 21C8 | 35008 | 06/1942 | SAL 71B 72A 71B 70G 70A W |
Salisbury Bournemouth Exmouth Junction Bournemouth Weymouth Radipole (GWR) Nine Elms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/02/1954 20/08/1954 10/03/1960 17/10/1966 17/04/1967 09/07/1967 |
09/07/1967 |
Merchant Navy | 21C9 | 35009 | 07/1942 | SAL 72A W |
Salisbury Exmouth Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/04/1957 14/09/1964 |
07/09/1964 |
Merchant Navy | 21C10 | 35010 | 08/1942 | SAL 9E 71B 72A 83D 70F W |
Salisbury Nine Elms Bournemouth Exmouth Junction Exmouth Junction Bournemouth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/02/1950 27/01/1956 10/03/1960 20/07/1964 06/09/1964 11/09/1966 |
11/09/1966 |
Merchant Navy | 21C11 | 35011 | 12/1944 | 9E 71B 70A 72A 71B W |
Nine Elms Bournemouth Nine Elms Exmouth Junction Bournemouth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/02/1954 13/05/1954 12/06/1957 10/03/1960 06/02/1966 |
06/02/1966 |
Merchant Navy | 21C12 | 35012 | 01/1945 | 9E 71B 70A 70G 70A W |
Nine Elms Bournemouth Nine Elms Weymouth Radipole (GWR) Nine Elms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/02/1954 13/05/1954 14/09/1964 17/04/1967 23/04/1967 |
23/04/1967 |
Merchant Navy | 21C13 | 35013 | 02/1945 | 9E 72A 70F 70G W 70A |
Nine Elms Exmouth Junction Bournemouth Weymouth Radipole (GWR) Withdrawn Nine Elms |
01/01/1948 19/03/1954 06/09/1964 17/10/1966 02/1967 17/04/1967 |
02/1967 |
Merchant Navy | 21C14 | 35014 | 02/1945 | 9E 72A 71B 73A 70A 70G W |
Nine Elms Exmouth Junction Bournemouth Stewarts Lane Nine Elms Weymouth Radipole (GWR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/05/1954 20/08/1954 21/06/1955 15/06/1956 14/09/1964 26/03/1967 |
26/03/1967 |
Merchant Navy | 21C15 | 35015 | 03/1945 | 9E 73A 70A W |
Nine Elms Stewarts Lane Nine Elms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/06/1956 14/06/1959 23/02/1964 |
23/02/1964 |
Merchant Navy | 21C16 | 35016 | 03/1945 | 9E 70G W |
Nine Elms Weymouth Radipole (GWR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/09/1964 08/08/1965 |
08/08/1965 |
Merchant Navy | 21C17 | 35017 | 04/1945 | 9E 70G W |
Nine Elms Weymouth Radipole (GWR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/09/1964 17/07/1966 |
17/07/1966 |
Merchant Navy | 21C18 | 35018 | 05/1945 | 9E 71B 70A W |
Nine Elms Bournemouth Nine Elms Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/11/1960 17/01/1961 09/08/1964 |
09/08/1964 |
Merchant Navy | 21C19 | 35019 | 06/1945 | 9E 70G W |
Nine Elms Weymouth Radipole (GWR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/09/1964 05/09/1965 |
05/09/1965 |
Merchant Navy | 21C20 | 35020 | 06/1945 | 9E 70G W |
Nine Elms Weymouth Radipole (GWR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/09/1964 14/02/1965 |
14/02/1965 |
Merchant Navy | 35021 | 09/1948 | 70A 70A 71B W |
Nine Elms Nine Elms Bournemouth Withdrawn |
05/05/1951 12/05/1951 12/06/1957 08/08/1965 |
08/08/1965 | |
Merchant Navy | 35022 | 10/1948 | RTS 71B 72A 70A 70G W |
Rugby Testing Station (on loan) Bournemouth Exmouth Junction Nine Elms Weymouth Radipole (GWR) Withdrawn |
14/06/1952 18/06/1954 10/03/1960 23/02/1964 14/09/1964 22/05/1966 |
22/05/1966 | |
Merchant Navy | 35023 | 11/1948 | 71B 70G 70A W |
Bournemouth Weymouth Radipole (GWR) Nine Elms Withdrawn |
10/03/1960 17/10/1966 17/04/1967 09/07/1967 |
09/07/1967 | |
Merchant Navy | 35024 | 11/1948 | 71B 70A 70G W |
Bournemouth Nine Elms Weymouth Radipole (GWR) Withdrawn |
01/05/1959 01/02/1962 14/09/1964 24/01/1965 |
24/01/1965 | |
Merchant Navy | 35025 | 11/1948 | 73A 72A 70A 71B 72A W |
Stewarts Lane Exmouth Junction Nine Elms Bournemouth Exmouth Junction Withdrawn |
22/04/1950 19/03/1952 18/06/1954 15/06/1956 10/03/1960 14/09/1964 |
07/09/1964 | |
Merchant Navy | 35026 | 12/1948 | 73A 72A 71B 72A 70A 70G W |
Stewarts Lane Exmouth Junction Bournemouth Exmouth Junction Nine Elms Weymouth Radipole (GWR) Withdrawn |
22/04/1950 25/01/1957 12/06/1957 01/05/1959 23/02/1964 14/09/1964 26/03/1967 |
26/03/1967 | |
Merchant Navy | 35027 | 12/1948 | 73A 71B W |
Stewarts Lane Bournemouth Withdrawn |
22/04/1950 21/06/1955 18/09/1966 |
18/09/1966 | |
Merchant Navy | 35028 | 12/1948 | DOV 73A 70A 70G 70A W |
Dover Marine Stewarts Lane Nine Elms Weymouth Radipole (GWR) Nine Elms Withdrawn |
15/10/1949 22/04/1950 14/06/1959 14/09/1964 17/04/1967 09/07/1967 |
09/07/1967 | |
Merchant Navy | 35029 | 02/1949 | DOV 70A 70G W |
Dover Marine Nine Elms Weymouth Radipole (GWR) Withdrawn |
15/10/1949 21/06/1955 14/09/1964 11/09/1966 |
11/09/1966 | |
Merchant Navy | 35030 | 04/1949 | DOV 70A 70G 70A W |
Dover Marine Nine Elms Weymouth Radipole (GWR) Nine Elms Withdrawn |
15/10/1949 21/06/1955 14/09/1964 17/04/1967 09/07/1967 |
09/07/1967 |