Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 709 Today
» 1106 Yesterday
» 7861 Week
» 27506 Month
» 62148 Year
» 1283713 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

SR Bulleid "Merchant Navy" Class 4-6-2


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C1     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C2     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C3     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C4     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C5     EXJ Exmouth Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C6     SAL Salisbury  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C7     SAL Salisbury  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C8     SAL Salisbury  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C9     SAL Salisbury  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C10     SAL Salisbury  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C11     9E Nine Elms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C12     9E Nine Elms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C13     9E Nine Elms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C14     9E Nine Elms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C15     9E Nine Elms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C16     9E Nine Elms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C17     9E Nine Elms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C18     9E Nine Elms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C19     9E Nine Elms  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 21C20     9E Nine Elms  
12/05/1951 Reallocation 35005 EXJ Exmouth Junction 72A Exmouth Junction  
12/05/1951 Reallocation 35021     70A Nine Elms  
19/03/1952 Reallocation 35025     72A Exmouth Junction  
08/02/1954 Reallocation 35008 SAL Salisbury 71B Bournemouth  
08/02/1954 Reallocation 35011 9E Nine Elms 71B Bournemouth  
08/02/1954 Reallocation 35012 9E Nine Elms 71B Bournemouth  
19/03/1954 Reallocation 35005 72A Exmouth Junction 70A Nine Elms  
19/03/1954 Reallocation 35013 9E Nine Elms 72A Exmouth Junction  
13/05/1954 Reallocation 35002 EXJ Exmouth Junction 71B Bournemouth  
13/05/1954 Reallocation 35011 71B Bournemouth 70A Nine Elms  
13/05/1954 Reallocation 35012 71B Bournemouth 70A Nine Elms  
13/05/1954 Reallocation 35014 9E Nine Elms 72A Exmouth Junction  
18/06/1954 Reallocation 35002 71B Bournemouth 72A Exmouth Junction  
18/06/1954 Reallocation 35022 99R   71B Bournemouth  
18/06/1954 Reallocation 35025 72A Exmouth Junction 70A Nine Elms  
20/08/1954 Reallocation 35008 71B Bournemouth 72A Exmouth Junction  
20/08/1954 Reallocation 35014 72A Exmouth Junction 71B Bournemouth  
21/06/1955 Reallocation 35014 71B Bournemouth 73A Stewarts Lane  
21/06/1955 Reallocation 35027     71B Bournemouth  
21/06/1955 Reallocation 35029     70A Nine Elms  
21/06/1955 Reallocation 35030     70A Nine Elms  
27/01/1956 Reallocation 35010 SAL Salisbury 71B Bournemouth  
15/06/1956 Reallocation 35014 73A Stewarts Lane 70A Nine Elms  
15/06/1956 Reallocation 35015 9E Nine Elms 73A Stewarts Lane  
15/06/1956 Reallocation 35025 70A Nine Elms 71B Bournemouth  
25/01/1957 Reallocation 35001 EXJ Exmouth Junction 73A Stewarts Lane  
25/01/1957 Reallocation 35026     72A Exmouth Junction  
01/04/1957 Reallocation 35004 EXJ Exmouth Junction 72B Salisbury  
01/04/1957 Reallocation 35009 SAL Salisbury 72A Exmouth Junction  
12/06/1957 Reallocation 35011 70A Nine Elms 72A Exmouth Junction  
12/06/1957 Reallocation 35021 70A Nine Elms 71B Bournemouth  
12/06/1957 Reallocation 35026 72A Exmouth Junction 71B Bournemouth  
06/06/1958 Reallocation 35002 72A Exmouth Junction 71B Bournemouth  
01/05/1959 Reallocation 35024     71B Bournemouth  
01/05/1959 Reallocation 35026 71B Bournemouth 72A Exmouth Junction  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 35001 73A Stewarts Lane 70A Nine Elms  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 35015 73A Stewarts Lane 70A Nine Elms  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 35028     70A Nine Elms  
26/11/1959 Reallocation 35005 70A Nine Elms 71B Bournemouth  
10/03/1960 Reallocation 35008 72A Exmouth Junction 71B Bournemouth  
10/03/1960 Reallocation 35010 71B Bournemouth 72A Exmouth Junction  
10/03/1960 Reallocation 35011 72A Exmouth Junction 71B Bournemouth  
10/03/1960 Reallocation 35022 71B Bournemouth 72A Exmouth Junction  
10/03/1960 Reallocation 35023     71B Bournemouth  
10/03/1960 Reallocation 35025 71B Bournemouth 72A Exmouth Junction  
24/11/1960 Reallocation 35002 71B Bournemouth 70A Nine Elms  
24/11/1960 Reallocation 35018 9E Nine Elms 71B Bournemouth  
17/01/1961 Reallocation 35002 70A Nine Elms 71B Bournemouth  
17/01/1961 Reallocation 35018 71B Bournemouth 70A Nine Elms  
01/02/1962 Reallocation 35024 71B Bournemouth 70A Nine Elms  
27/01/1964 Reallocation 35002 71B Bournemouth 70A Nine Elms  
02/1964 Condemned 35002 70A Nine Elms   COND  
02/1964 Condemned 35015 70A Nine Elms   COND  
02/03/1964 Reallocation 35022 72A Exmouth Junction 70A Nine Elms  
02/03/1964 Reallocation 35026 72A Exmouth Junction 70A Nine Elms  
20/07/1964 Reallocation 35003 EXJ Exmouth Junction 70A Nine Elms  
20/07/1964 Reallocation 35010 72A Exmouth Junction 83D Exmouth Junction  
08/1964 Condemned 35006 SAL Salisbury   COND  
08/1964 Condemned 35018 70A Nine Elms   COND  
09/1964 Condemned 35009 72A Exmouth Junction   COND  
09/1964 Condemned 35025 72A Exmouth Junction   COND  
14/09/1964 Reallocation 35001 70A Nine Elms 70F Bournemouth  
14/09/1964 Reallocation 35003 70A Nine Elms 70F Bournemouth  
14/09/1964 Reallocation 35004 72B Salisbury 70F Bournemouth  
14/09/1964 Reallocation 35005 71B Bournemouth 70G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)  
14/09/1964 Reallocation 35010 83D Exmouth Junction 70F Bournemouth  
14/09/1964 Reallocation 35012 70A Nine Elms 70G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)  
14/09/1964 Reallocation 35013 72A Exmouth Junction 70F Bournemouth  
14/09/1964 Reallocation 35014 70A Nine Elms 70G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)  
14/09/1964 Reallocation 35016 9E Nine Elms 70G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)  
14/09/1964 Reallocation 35017 9E Nine Elms 70G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)  
14/09/1964 Reallocation 35019 9E Nine Elms 70G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)  
14/09/1964 Reallocation 35020 9E Nine Elms 70G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)  
14/09/1964 Reallocation 35022 70A Nine Elms 70G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)  
14/09/1964 Reallocation 35024 70A Nine Elms 70G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)  
14/09/1964 Reallocation 35026 70A Nine Elms 70G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)  
14/09/1964 Reallocation 35028 70A Nine Elms 70G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)  
14/09/1964 Reallocation 35029 70A Nine Elms 70G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)  
14/09/1964 Reallocation 35030 70A Nine Elms 70G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)  
22/11/1964 Condemned 35001 98W     COND  
01/1965 Condemned 35024 70G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)   COND  
18/01/1965 Reallocation 35007 SAL Salisbury 70G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)  
02/1965 Condemned 35020 70G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)   COND  
08/1965 Condemned 35016 70G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)   COND  
08/1965 Condemned 35021 71B Bournemouth   COND  
09/1965 Condemned 35019 70G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)   COND  
10/10/1965 Condemned 35005 98W     COND  
31/10/1965 Condemned 35004 70F Bournemouth   COND  
02/1966 Condemned 35011 71B Bournemouth   COND  
05/1966 Condemned 35022 70G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)   COND  
07/1966 Condemned 35017 70G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)   COND  
09/1966 Condemned 35010 70F Bournemouth   COND  
09/1966 Condemned 35027 71B Bournemouth   COND  
09/1966 Condemned 35029 70G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)   COND  
17/10/1966 Reallocation 35003 70F Bournemouth 70G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)  
17/10/1966 Reallocation 35008 71B Bournemouth 70G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)  
17/10/1966 Reallocation 35013 70F Bournemouth 70G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)  
17/10/1966 Reallocation 35023 71B Bournemouth 70G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)  
02/1967 Condemned 35013 70G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)   COND  
03/1967 Condemned 35014 70G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)   COND  
03/1967 Condemned 35026 70G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)   COND  
04/1967 Condemned 35012 70G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)   COND  
17/04/1967 Reallocation 35003 70G Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 70A Nine Elms  
17/04/1967 Reallocation 35007 70G Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 70A Nine Elms  
17/04/1967 Reallocation 35008 70G Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 70A Nine Elms  
17/04/1967 Reallocation 35012 98W   70A Nine Elms  
17/04/1967 Reallocation 35013 98W   70A Nine Elms  
17/04/1967 Reallocation 35023 70G Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 70A Nine Elms  
17/04/1967 Reallocation 35028 70G Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 70A Nine Elms  
17/04/1967 Reallocation 35030 70G Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 70A Nine Elms  
07/1967 Condemned 35003 70A Nine Elms   COND  
07/1967 Condemned 35007 70A Nine Elms   COND  
07/1967 Condemned 35008 70A Nine Elms   COND  
07/1967 Condemned 35023 70A Nine Elms   COND  
07/1967 Condemned 35028 70A Nine Elms   COND  
07/1967 Condemned 35030 70A Nine Elms   COND