SR Bulleid "MN" Class 4-6-2
Class | Number | Built | Name | Name Date | Notes | Removed | Date Withdrawn |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Merchant Navy | 21C1 | 06/1941 | CHANNEL PACKET | 10/03/1941 | 11/1964 | 22/11/1964 | |
Merchant Navy | 21C2 | 06/1941 | UNION CASTLE | 04/07/1941 | 02/1964 | 23/02/1964 | |
Merchant Navy | 21C3 | 09/1941 | ROYAL MAIL | 24/10/1941 | 07/1967 | 09/07/1967 | |
Merchant Navy | 21C4 | 10/1941 | CUNARD WHITE STAR | 01/01/1942 | 10/1965 | 31/10/1965 | |
Merchant Navy | 21C5 | 12/1941 | CANADIAN PACIFIC | 27/03/1942 | 10/1965 | 10/10/1965 | |
Merchant Navy | 21C6 | 12/1941 | PENINSULAR & ORIENTAL S.N. CO. | 04/06/1942 | 08/1964 | 16/08/1964 | |
Merchant Navy | 21C7 | 06/1942 | ABERDEEN COMMONWEALTH | 30/07/1942 | 07/1967 | 09/07/1967 | |
Merchant Navy | 21C8 | 06/1942 | ORIENT LINE | 02/11/1942 | 07/1967 | 09/07/1967 | |
Merchant Navy | 21C9 | 07/1942 | SHAW SAVILL | 30/07/1942 | 30/09/1964 | 07/09/1964 | |
Merchant Navy | 21C10 | 08/1942 | BLUE STAR | 18/12/1942 | 09/1966 | 11/09/1966 | |
Merchant Navy | 21C11 | 12/1944 | GENERAL STEAM NAVIGATION | 20/02/1945 | 02/1966 | 06/02/1966 | |
Merchant Navy | 21C12 | 01/1945 | UNITED STATES LINES | 10/04/1945 | 04/1967 | 23/04/1967 | |
Merchant Navy | 21C13 | 02/1945 | BLUE FUNNEL | 17/04/1945 | 07/1967 | 02/1967 | |
Merchant Navy | 21C14 | 02/1945 | NEDERLAND LINE | 27/11/1945 | 03/1967 | 26/03/1967 | |
Merchant Navy | 21C15 | 03/1945 | ROTTERDAM LLOYD | 27/11/1945 | 02/1964 | 23/02/1964 | |
Merchant Navy | 21C16 | 03/1945 | ELDERS FYFFES | 05/07/1945 | 08/1965 | 08/08/1965 | |
Merchant Navy | 21C17 | 04/1945 | BELGIAN MARINE | 22/10/1945 | 07/1966 | 17/07/1966 | |
Merchant Navy | 21C18 | 05/1945 | BRITISH INDIA LINE | 13/12/1945 | 08/1964 | 09/08/1964 | |
Merchant Navy | 21C19 | 06/1945 | FRENCH LINE CGT | 22/09/1945 | 09/1965 | 05/09/1965 | |
Merchant Navy | 21C20 | 06/1945 | BIBBY LINE | 18/10/1945 | 02/1965 | 14/02/1965 | |
Merchant Navy | 35021 | 09/1948 | NEW ZEALAND LINE | 24/11/1948 | 08/08/1965 | ||
Merchant Navy | 35022 | 10/1948 | HOLLAND AMERICA LINE | 24/01/1949 | 22/05/1966 | ||
Merchant Navy | 35023 | 11/1948 | HOLLAND-AFRIKA LINE | 24/01/1949 | 09/07/1967 | ||
Merchant Navy | 35024 | 11/1948 | EAST ASIATIC COMPANY | 05/05/1949 | 24/01/1965 | ||
Merchant Navy | 35025 | 11/1948 | BROCKLEBANK LINE | 20/09/1949 | 07/09/1964 | ||
Merchant Navy | 35026 | 12/1948 | LAMPORT & HOLT LINE | 15/01/1951 | Named jointly with 35028, CLAN LINE. | 26/03/1967 | |
Merchant Navy | 35027 | 12/1948 | PORT LINE | 24/04/1950 | 18/09/1966 | ||
Merchant Navy | 35028 | 12/1948 | CLAN LINE | 15/01/1951 | Named jointly with 35026 LAMPORT & HOLT LINE | 09/07/1967 | |
Merchant Navy | 35029 | 02/1949 | ELLERMAN LINE | 01/03/1951 | 11/09/1966 | ||
Merchant Navy | 35030 | 04/1949 | ELDER-DEMPSTER LINES | 05/06/1950 | 09/07/1967 |