43 B-B
BR (Pre Tops) | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
D833 | 06/07/1960 | 83D 83A D02 81A 81A ZL R 83A W |
Laira (New) Newton Abbot Birmingham Division (on loan) Old Oak Common Old Oak Common (on loan) Swindon Works (on loan) Reinstated Newton Abbot Withdrawn |
06/07/1960 12/08/1961 05/07/1967 31/07/1967 03/1969 06/1969 27/09/1969 10/1970 09/1971 03/10/1971 |
03/10/1971 |
D834 | 26/07/1960 | 83D 83A 81A 83A W |
Laira (New) Newton Abbot Old Oak Common Newton Abbot Withdrawn |
26/07/1960 12/08/1961 31/08/1967 15/03/1969 03/10/1971 |
03/10/1971 |
D835 | 05/08/1960 | 83D 83A 81A 83A W |
Laira (New) Newton Abbot Old Oak Common Newton Abbot Withdrawn |
05/08/1960 09/09/1961 31/08/1967 27/12/1969 03/10/1971 |
03/10/1971 |
D836 | 13/09/1960 | 83D 83A 81A 81A 83A W |
Laira (New) Newton Abbot Old Oak Common Old Oak Common (returned from loan) Newton Abbot Withdrawn |
13/09/1960 08/1961 14/08/1967 09/1967 02/1968 22/05/1971 22/05/1971 |
22/05/1971 |
D837 | 08/11/1960 | 83D 83A 81A 83A 81A 83A W |
Laira (New) Newton Abbot Old Oak Common Newton Abbot Old Oak Common Newton Abbot Withdrawn |
08/11/1960 02/12/1961 30/09/1967 18/03/1968 25/01/1969 22/08/1970 22/05/1971 22/05/1971 |
22/05/1971 |
D838 | 03/10/1960 | 83D 83A 81A 83A 81A 83A W |
Laira (New) Newton Abbot Old Oak Common Newton Abbot Old Oak Common Newton Abbot Withdrawn |
03/10/1960 02/12/1961 31/10/1967 18/03/1968 25/01/1969 15/03/1969 27/03/1971 |
27/03/1971 |
D839 | 12/11/1960 | 83D 83A 81A 83A 81A 82A 83A W |
Laira (New) Newton Abbot Old Oak Common Newton Abbot Old Oak Common Bristol Bath Road Newton Abbot Withdrawn |
12/11/1960 16/06/1962 30/09/1967 18/03/1968 01/06/1968 03/05/1969 16/08/1969 03/10/1971 |
03/10/1971 |
D840 | 03/02/1961 | 83D 83A 81A W |
Laira (New) Newton Abbot Old Oak Common Withdrawn |
03/02/1961 16/06/1962 31/08/1967 26/04/1969 |
26/04/1969 |
D841 | 14/12/1960 | 83D 83A 81A 81A 81A 83A W |
Laira (New) Newton Abbot Old Oak Common Old Oak Common Old Oak Common Newton Abbot Withdrawn |
14/12/1960 16/06/1962 31/10/1967 03/05/1969 06/12/1969 22/08/1970 14/11/1970 03/10/1971 |
03/10/1971 |
D842 | 20/12/1960 | 83D 83A 81A R W |
Laira (New) Newton Abbot Old Oak Common Reinstated Withdrawn |
20/12/1960 24/03/1962 31/08/1967 04/1969 16/08/1969 03/10/1971 |
03/10/1971 |
D843 | 02/01/1961 | 83D 83A 81A 83A W |
Laira (New) Newton Abbot Old Oak Common Newton Abbot Withdrawn |
02/01/1961 24/03/1962 08/1967 10/1970 22/05/1971 22/05/1971 |
22/05/1971 |
D844 | 16/03/1961 | 83D 83A 81A 83A W |
Laira (New) Newton Abbot Old Oak Common Newton Abbot Withdrawn |
16/03/1961 24/03/1962 31/10/1967 15/03/1969 03/10/1971 |
03/10/1971 |
D845 | 07/04/1961 | 83D 83A 81A 82A 83A W |
Laira (New) Newton Abbot Old Oak Common Bristol Bath Road Newton Abbot Withdrawn |
07/04/1961 21/04/1962 30/09/1967 14/06/1969 16/08/1969 03/10/1971 16/10/1971 |
03/10/1971 |
D846 | 12/04/1961 | 83D 83A 81A D02 81A 83A W |
Laira (New) Newton Abbot Old Oak Common Birmingham Division (on loan) Old Oak Common Newton Abbot Withdrawn |
12/04/1961 19/05/1962 01/07/1967 05/07/1967 12/08/1967 06/1970 22/05/1971 22/05/1971 |
22/05/1971 |
D847 | 22/04/1961 | 83D 83A 81A 83A W |
Laira (New) Newton Abbot Old Oak Common Newton Abbot Withdrawn |
22/04/1961 19/05/1962 31/08/1967 15/03/1969 27/03/1971 |
27/03/1971 |
D848 | 27/04/1961 | 83D 83A 81A W |
Laira (New) Newton Abbot Old Oak Common Withdrawn |
27/04/1961 24/02/1962 31/10/1967 26/03/1969 |
26/03/1969 |
D849 | 29/05/1961 | 83D 83A 83A 81A 83A W |
Laira (New) Newton Abbot Newton Abbot Old Oak Common Newton Abbot Withdrawn |
29/05/1961 24/02/1962 22/06/1964 31/10/1967 22/08/1970 22/05/1971 22/05/1971 |
22/05/1971 |
D850 | 08/06/1961 | 83D 83A 84A 83A 81A 81A R 83A 83A W |
Laira (New) Newton Abbot Laira Newton Abbot Old Oak Common Old Oak Common (on loan) Reinstated Newton Abbot Newton Abbot (on loan) Withdrawn |
08/06/1961 09/1962 06/1964 06/1964 10/1967 03/1969 05/1969 10/1970 22/05/1971 22/05/1971 |
22/05/1971 |
D851 | 10/07/1961 | 83D 83A 83D 83A 81A 83A 81A 83A 81A 83A W |
Laira (New) Newton Abbot Laira Newton Abbot Old Oak Common Newton Abbot Old Oak Common Newton Abbot Old Oak Common Newton Abbot Withdrawn |
10/07/1961 06/10/1962 29/06/1963 22/06/1964 31/10/1967 18/03/1968 01/06/1968 27/09/1969 22/08/1970 14/11/1970 22/05/1971 22/05/1971 |
22/05/1971 |
D852 | 24/07/1961 | 83D 83A 83D 83A 81A 83A 81A 83A W |
Laira (New) Newton Abbot Laira Newton Abbot Old Oak Common Newton Abbot Old Oak Common Newton Abbot Withdrawn |
24/07/1961 06/10/1962 29/06/1963 22/06/1964 31/10/1967 03/05/1969 06/12/1969 14/11/1970 03/10/1971 16/10/1971 |
03/10/1971 |
D853 | 30/08/1961 | 83D 83A 81A 81A 83A W |
Laira (New) Newton Abbot Old Oak Common Old Oak Common Newton Abbot Withdrawn |
30/08/1961 22/06/1964 31/10/1967 22/08/1970 14/11/1970 03/10/1971 |
03/10/1971 |
D854 | 26/09/1961 | 83D 83A 81A 81A 83A 83A 81A 83A W |
Laira (New) Newton Abbot Old Oak Common Old Oak Common Newton Abbot Newton Abbot Old Oak Common Newton Abbot Withdrawn |
26/09/1961 22/06/1964 18/03/1968 25/01/1969 03/05/1969 14/06/1969 27/09/1969 06/12/1969 14/11/1970 03/10/1971 |
03/10/1971 |
D855 | 25/10/1961 | 83D 83A 81A 81A 83A W |
Laira (New) Newton Abbot Old Oak Common Old Oak Common Newton Abbot Withdrawn |
25/10/1961 22/06/1964 18/03/1968 04/1969 03/05/1969 24/01/1970 03/10/1971 |
03/10/1971 |
D856 | 16/11/1961 | 83D 83A 81A 83A W |
Laira (New) Newton Abbot Old Oak Common Newton Abbot Withdrawn |
16/11/1961 11/07/1965 25/01/1969 16/08/1969 22/05/1971 22/05/1971 |
22/05/1971 |
D857 | 11/12/1961 | 83D 83A 83A W |
Laira (New) Newton Abbot Newton Abbot Withdrawn |
11/12/1961 11/07/1965 27/09/1969 03/10/1971 |
03/10/1971 |
D858 | 15/12/1961 | 83D 83A 83A W |
Laira (New) Newton Abbot Newton Abbot Withdrawn |
15/12/1961 11/07/1965 01/11/1969 03/10/1971 |
03/10/1971 |
D859 | 09/01/1962 | 83D 83A W |
Laira (New) Newton Abbot Withdrawn |
09/01/1962 11/07/1965 27/03/1971 |
27/03/1971 |
D860 | 22/01/1962 | 83D 83A W |
Laira (New) Newton Abbot Withdrawn |
22/01/1962 11/07/1965 27/03/1971 |
27/03/1971 |
D861 | 14/02/1962 | 83D 83A 83A W |
Laira (New) Newton Abbot Newton Abbot Withdrawn |
14/02/1962 11/07/1965 16/08/1969 03/10/1971 |
03/10/1971 |
D862 | 13/03/1962 | 83D 83A 83A 83A W |
Laira (New) Newton Abbot Newton Abbot Newton Abbot Withdrawn |
13/03/1962 11/07/1965 27/09/1969 01/11/1969 24/01/1970 29/05/1970 03/10/1971 |
03/10/1971 |
D863 | 07/04/1962 | 83D 83A W |
Laira (New) Newton Abbot Withdrawn |
07/04/1962 11/07/1965 26/03/1969 |
26/03/1969 |
D864 | 10/05/1962 | 83D 83A W |
Laira (New) Newton Abbot Withdrawn |
10/05/1962 11/07/1965 27/03/1971 |
27/03/1971 |
D865 | 28/06/1962 | 83D 83A 83A W |
Laira (New) Newton Abbot Newton Abbot Withdrawn |
28/06/1962 11/07/1965 27/09/1969 22/05/1971 22/05/1971 |
22/05/1971 |