Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 61 Today
» 924 Yesterday
» 6517 Week
» 23833 Month
» 282692 Year
» 793794 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

142


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To
30/05/1958 To Service 56193   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
27/06/1958 To Service 56196   NEW 51A Darlington
27/06/1958 To Service 56198   NEW 51A Darlington
04/07/1958 To Service 56197   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
04/07/1958 To Service 56199   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
11/07/1958 To Service 56190   NEW 51A Darlington
11/07/1958 To Service 56194   NEW 51A Darlington
11/07/1958 To Service 56195   NEW 51A Darlington
28/07/1958 To Service 56205   NEW 51A Darlington
06/08/1958 To Service 56201   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
07/08/1958 To Service 56202   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
07/08/1958 To Service 56204   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
14/08/1958 To Service 56200   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
14/08/1958 To Service 56203   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
14/08/1958 To Service 56209   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
19/08/1958 To Service 56208   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
19/08/1958 To Service 56210   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
04/09/1958 To Service 56206   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
04/09/1958 To Service 56207   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
02/11/1969 Condemned 56255       COND
29/11/1969 Condemned 56211       COND