Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 61 Today
» 924 Yesterday
» 6517 Week
» 23833 Month
» 282692 Year
» 793794 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

142


BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
56190 11/07/1958 Darlington 60.24
56191
56192
56193 30/05/1958 Hull Springhead 60.36
56194 11/07/1958 Darlington 60.24
56195 11/07/1958 Darlington 60.24
56196 27/06/1958 Darlington 60.28
56197 04/07/1958 Hull Springhead 60.26
56198 27/06/1958 Darlington 60.28
56199 04/07/1958 Hull Springhead 60.26
56200 14/08/1958 Bradford Hammerton Street 60.15
56201 06/08/1958 Bradford Hammerton Street 60.17
56202 07/08/1958 Bradford Hammerton Street 60.17
56203 14/08/1958 Bradford Hammerton Street 60.15
56204 07/08/1958 Bradford Hammerton Street 60.17
56205 28/07/1958 Darlington 60.20
56206 04/09/1958 Bradford Hammerton Street 60.09
56207 04/09/1958 Bradford Hammerton Street 60.09
56208 19/08/1958 Bradford Hammerton Street 60.14
56209 14/08/1958 Bradford Hammerton Street 60.15
56210 19/08/1958 Bradford Hammerton Street 60.14
56211 29/11/1969 Allerton
56212
56213
56214
56215
56221
56222
56223
56224
56225
56226
56227
56228
56229
56230
56231
56232
56233
56234
56235
56236
56237
56238
56239
56240
56241
56242
56243
56244
56245
56246
56247
56248
56249
56250
56251
56252
56253
56254
56255 02/11/1969 Accrington
56256
56257
56258
56259
56260
56261
56262
56263
56264
56265
56266
56267
56268
56269
56270
56271
56272
56273
56274
56275
56276
56277
56278
56279
56484
56485
56486
56487
56488
56489
56490
56491
56492
56493
56494
56495
56496
56497
56498
56499
56500
56501
56502
56503
56504