01/10/1960 |
To Service |
11 |
|
NEW |
1B |
Camden |
|
05/10/1960 |
To Service |
68 |
|
NEW |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
08/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
11 |
1B |
Camden |
17A |
Derby |
|
15/10/1960 |
To Service |
12 |
|
NEW |
1B |
Camden |
|
18/10/1960 |
To Service |
69 |
|
NEW |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
22/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
12 |
1B |
Camden |
17A |
Derby |
|
05/11/1960 |
To Service |
13 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
12/11/1960 |
To Service |
70 |
|
NEW |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
19/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
68 |
5A |
Crewe North |
17A |
Derby |
|
19/11/1960 |
To Service |
72 |
|
NEW |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
24/11/1960 |
To Service |
14 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
25/11/1960 |
To Service |
71 |
|
NEW |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
25/11/1960 |
To Service |
73 |
|
NEW |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
26/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
69 |
5A |
Crewe North |
17A |
Derby |
|
30/11/1960 |
To Service |
76 |
|
NEW |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
02/12/1960 |
To Service |
75 |
|
NEW |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
03/12/1960 |
Reallocation |
68 |
17A |
Derby |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
05/12/1960 |
To Service |
74 |
|
NEW |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
09/12/1960 |
To Service |
15 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
10/12/1960 |
Reallocation |
70 |
5A |
Crewe North |
17A |
Derby |
|
10/12/1960 |
To Service |
77 |
|
NEW |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
12/12/1960 |
To Service |
78 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
15/12/1960 |
To Service |
16 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
15/12/1960 |
To Service |
79 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
17/12/1960 |
Reallocation |
68 |
5A |
Crewe North |
17A |
Derby |
|
17/12/1960 |
Reallocation |
71 |
5A |
Crewe North |
17A |
Derby |
|
17/12/1960 |
Reallocation |
72 |
5A |
Crewe North |
17A |
Derby |
|
17/12/1960 |
To Service |
80 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
21/12/1960 |
To Service |
81 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
23/12/1960 |
To Service |
17 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
24/12/1960 |
Reallocation |
14 |
17A |
Derby |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
31/12/1960 |
Reallocation |
11 |
17A |
Derby |
55H |
Neville Hill |
|
31/12/1960 |
To Service |
18 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
31/12/1960 |
To Service |
19 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
31/12/1960 |
Reallocation |
73 |
5A |
Crewe North |
17A |
Derby |
|
31/12/1960 |
To Service |
82 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
31/12/1960 |
To Service |
83 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
31/12/1960 |
To Service |
84 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
07/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
11 |
55H |
Neville Hill |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
07/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
73 |
17A |
Derby |
17A |
Derby |
|
07/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
74 |
5A |
Crewe North |
17A |
Derby |
|
07/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
75 |
5A |
Crewe North |
17A |
Derby |
|
07/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
76 |
5A |
Crewe North |
17A |
Derby |
|
07/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
77 |
5A |
Crewe North |
17A |
Derby |
|
04/02/1961 |
Reallocation |
12 |
17A |
Derby |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
04/02/1961 |
Reallocation |
13 |
17A |
Derby |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
06/02/1961 |
To Service |
85 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
18/02/1961 |
Reallocation |
15 |
17A |
Derby |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
18/02/1961 |
Reallocation |
16 |
17A |
Derby |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
24/02/1961 |
To Service |
20 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
24/02/1961 |
To Service |
87 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
25/02/1961 |
Reallocation |
11 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
55H |
Neville Hill |
|
25/02/1961 |
Reallocation |
12 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
55H |
Neville Hill |
|
25/02/1961 |
Reallocation |
14 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
55H |
Neville Hill |
|
25/02/1961 |
Reallocation |
15 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
55H |
Neville Hill |
|
25/02/1961 |
Reallocation |
16 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
55H |
Neville Hill |
|
02/03/1961 |
To Service |
88 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
03/03/1961 |
To Service |
21 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
09/03/1961 |
To Service |
86 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
11/03/1961 |
To Service |
90 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
17/03/1961 |
To Service |
91 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
22/03/1961 |
To Service |
89 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
25/03/1961 |
To Service |
92 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
28/03/1961 |
To Service |
93 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
30/03/1961 |
To Service |
22 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
01/04/1961 |
Reallocation |
13 |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
55H |
Neville Hill |
|
06/04/1961 |
To Service |
94 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
08/04/1961 |
Reallocation |
17 |
17A |
Derby |
55H |
Neville Hill |
|
08/04/1961 |
Reallocation |
18 |
17A |
Derby |
55H |
Neville Hill |
|
08/04/1961 |
To Service |
23 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
15/04/1961 |
To Service |
24 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
15/04/1961 |
To Service |
25 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
15/04/1961 |
To Service |
95 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
18/04/1961 |
To Service |
96 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
22/04/1961 |
To Service |
26 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
22/04/1961 |
Reallocation |
93 |
17A |
Derby |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
|
22/04/1961 |
To Service |
97 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
26/04/1961 |
To Service |
98 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
29/04/1961 |
Reallocation |
24 |
17A |
Derby |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
29/04/1961 |
To Service |
27 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
03/05/1961 |
To Service |
99 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
04/05/1961 |
To Service |
28 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
08/05/1961 |
To Service |
100 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
13/05/1961 |
To Service |
29 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
18/05/1961 |
To Service |
102 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
20/05/1961 |
To Service |
30 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
20/05/1961 |
To Service |
101 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
30/05/1961 |
To Service |
103 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
01/06/1961 |
To Service |
104 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
03/06/1961 |
To Service |
31 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
03/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
91 |
17A |
Derby |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
09/06/1961 |
To Service |
105 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
10/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
101 |
17A |
Derby |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
12/06/1961 |
To Service |
32 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
15/06/1961 |
To Service |
106 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
17/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
19 |
17A |
Derby |
55H |
Neville Hill |
|
17/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
20 |
17A |
Derby |
55H |
Neville Hill |
|
17/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
22 |
17A |
Derby |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
17/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
26 |
17A |
Derby |
55H |
Neville Hill |
|
17/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
29 |
17A |
Derby |
55H |
Neville Hill |
|
17/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
30 |
17A |
Derby |
55H |
Neville Hill |
|
17/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
31 |
17A |
Derby |
55H |
Neville Hill |
|
19/06/1961 |
To Service |
33 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
29/06/1961 |
To Service |
34 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
30/06/1961 |
To Service |
35 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
30/06/1961 |
To Service |
109 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
06/07/1961 |
To Service |
36 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
08/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
21 |
17A |
Derby |
55H |
Neville Hill |
|
08/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
25 |
17A |
Derby |
55H |
Neville Hill |
|
08/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
27 |
17A |
Derby |
55H |
Neville Hill |
|
08/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
68 |
17A |
Derby |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
|
08/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
77 |
17A |
Derby |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
|
08/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
86 |
17A |
Derby |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
|
08/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
90 |
17A |
Derby |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
|
10/07/1961 |
To Service |
37 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
13/07/1961 |
To Service |
38 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
15/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
68 |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
17A |
Derby |
|
20/07/1961 |
To Service |
39 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
20/07/1961 |
To Service |
107 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
22/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
34 |
17A |
Derby |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
|
25/07/1961 |
To Service |
110 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
26/07/1961 |
To Service |
40 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
28/07/1961 |
To Service |
108 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
29/07/1961 |
To Service |
41 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
04/08/1961 |
To Service |
111 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
05/08/1961 |
Reallocation |
24 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
17A |
Derby |
|
08/08/1961 |
To Service |
112 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
19/08/1961 |
Reallocation |
35 |
17A |
Derby |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
19/08/1961 |
To Service |
42 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
19/08/1961 |
Reallocation |
77 |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
17A |
Derby |
|
19/08/1961 |
Reallocation |
90 |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
17A |
Derby |
|
19/08/1961 |
Reallocation |
93 |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
17A |
Derby |
|
28/08/1961 |
To Service |
43 |
|
NEW |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
28/08/1961 |
To Service |
115 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
01/09/1961 |
To Service |
116 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
02/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
14 |
55H |
Neville Hill |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
02/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
18 |
55H |
Neville Hill |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
02/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
23 |
17A |
Derby |
55H |
Neville Hill |
|
02/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
28 |
17A |
Derby |
55H |
Neville Hill |
|
02/09/1961 |
To Service |
44 |
|
NEW |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
02/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
86 |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
17A |
Derby |
|
08/09/1961 |
To Service |
45 |
|
NEW |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
09/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
14 |
52A |
Gateshead |
55H |
Neville Hill |
|
09/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
18 |
52A |
Gateshead |
55H |
Neville Hill |
|
09/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
101 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
17A |
Derby |
|
09/09/1961 |
To Service |
117 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
10/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
33 |
17A |
Derby |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
10/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
34 |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
10/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
35 |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
10/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
36 |
17A |
Derby |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
10/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
37 |
17A |
Derby |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
10/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
38 |
17A |
Derby |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
10/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
39 |
17A |
Derby |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
10/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
40 |
17A |
Derby |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
10/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
41 |
17A |
Derby |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
10/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
42 |
17A |
Derby |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
14/09/1961 |
To Service |
113 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
16/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
22 |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
17A |
Derby |
|
16/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
22 |
17A |
Derby |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
16/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
24 |
17A |
Derby |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
16/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
30 |
55H |
Neville Hill |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
16/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
32 |
17A |
Derby |
55H |
Neville Hill |
|
16/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
68 |
17A |
Derby |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
16/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
69 |
17A |
Derby |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
16/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
70 |
17A |
Derby |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
16/09/1961 |
To Service |
118 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
19/09/1961 |
To Service |
114 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
23/09/1961 |
To Service |
119 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
30/09/1961 |
To Service |
47 |
|
NEW |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
30/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
101 |
17A |
Derby |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
30/09/1961 |
To Service |
120 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
02/10/1961 |
To Service |
46 |
|
NEW |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
02/10/1961 |
To Service |
48 |
|
NEW |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
06/10/1961 |
To Service |
121 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
07/10/1961 |
To Service |
49 |
|
NEW |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
07/10/1961 |
Reallocation |
71 |
17A |
Derby |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
07/10/1961 |
Reallocation |
72 |
17A |
Derby |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
07/10/1961 |
Reallocation |
73 |
17A |
Derby |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
07/10/1961 |
Reallocation |
74 |
17A |
Derby |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
07/10/1961 |
Reallocation |
75 |
17A |
Derby |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
11/10/1961 |
To Service |
122 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
21/10/1961 |
To Service |
124 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
28/10/1961 |
To Service |
123 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
31/10/1961 |
To Service |
125 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
09/11/1961 |
To Service |
126 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
11/11/1961 |
Reallocation |
76 |
17A |
Derby |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
11/11/1961 |
Reallocation |
77 |
17A |
Derby |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
11/11/1961 |
Reallocation |
78 |
17A |
Derby |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
15/11/1961 |
To Service |
127 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
18/11/1961 |
To Service |
128 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
25/11/1961 |
To Service |
129 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
04/12/1961 |
To Service |
130 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
09/12/1961 |
To Service |
131 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
16/12/1961 |
To Service |
132 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
21/12/1961 |
To Service |
133 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
30/12/1961 |
To Service |
134 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
30/12/1961 |
To Service |
135 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
30/12/1961 |
To Service |
136 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
30/12/1961 |
To Service |
137 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
06/01/1962 |
Reallocation |
101 |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
17A |
Derby |
|
13/01/1962 |
Reallocation |
79 |
17A |
Derby |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
13/01/1962 |
Reallocation |
80 |
17A |
Derby |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
13/01/1962 |
Reallocation |
86 |
17A |
Derby |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
13/01/1962 |
Reallocation |
93 |
17A |
Derby |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
13/01/1962 |
Reallocation |
105 |
17A |
Derby |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
13/01/1962 |
Reallocation |
108 |
17A |
Derby |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
13/01/1962 |
Reallocation |
134 |
17A |
Derby |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
30/01/1962 |
To Service |
58 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
03/02/1962 |
Reallocation |
81 |
17A |
Derby |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
03/02/1962 |
Reallocation |
82 |
17A |
Derby |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
03/02/1962 |
Reallocation |
83 |
17A |
Derby |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
03/02/1962 |
Reallocation |
85 |
17A |
Derby |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
03/02/1962 |
Reallocation |
87 |
17A |
Derby |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
03/02/1962 |
Reallocation |
93 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
17A |
Derby |
|
03/02/1962 |
Reallocation |
101 |
17A |
Derby |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
03/02/1962 |
Reallocation |
105 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
17A |
Derby |
|
03/02/1962 |
Reallocation |
108 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
17A |
Derby |
|
03/02/1962 |
Reallocation |
134 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
17A |
Derby |
|
06/02/1962 |
To Service |
59 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
10/02/1962 |
Reallocation |
85 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
17A |
Derby |
|
10/02/1962 |
Reallocation |
88 |
17A |
Derby |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
10/02/1962 |
Reallocation |
89 |
17A |
Derby |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
10/02/1962 |
Reallocation |
90 |
17A |
Derby |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
10/02/1962 |
Reallocation |
92 |
17A |
Derby |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
15/02/1962 |
To Service |
60 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
03/03/1962 |
Reallocation |
86 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
17A |
Derby |
|
03/03/1962 |
Reallocation |
87 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
17A |
Derby |
|
03/03/1962 |
Reallocation |
88 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
17A |
Derby |
|
03/03/1962 |
Reallocation |
89 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
17A |
Derby |
|
03/03/1962 |
Reallocation |
90 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
17A |
Derby |
|
03/03/1962 |
Reallocation |
92 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
17A |
Derby |
|
08/03/1962 |
To Service |
61 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
15/03/1962 |
To Service |
62 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
17/03/1962 |
Reallocation |
101 |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
17A |
Derby |
|
24/03/1962 |
Reallocation |
107 |
17A |
Derby |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
29/03/1962 |
To Service |
63 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
07/04/1962 |
Reallocation |
83 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
17A |
Derby |
|
09/04/1962 |
To Service |
64 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
13/04/1962 |
To Service |
65 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
17/04/1962 |
To Service |
66 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
03/05/1962 |
To Service |
67 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
05/05/1962 |
Reallocation |
107 |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
17A |
Derby |
|
19/05/1962 |
Reallocation |
115 |
17A |
Derby |
17A |
Derby |
|
22/05/1962 |
To Service |
50 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
05/06/1962 |
To Service |
51 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
07/06/1962 |
To Service |
52 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
09/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
106 |
17A |
Derby |
17A |
Derby |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
22 |
52A |
Gateshead |
55H |
Neville Hill |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
24 |
52A |
Gateshead |
55H |
Neville Hill |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
28 |
55H |
Neville Hill |
55H |
Neville Hill |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
30 |
52A |
Gateshead |
55H |
Neville Hill |
|
25/06/1962 |
To Service |
53 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
07/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
13 |
55H |
Neville Hill |
17A |
Derby |
|
07/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
91 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
17A |
Derby |
|
14/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
52 |
17A |
Derby |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
14/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
53 |
17A |
Derby |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
21/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
11 |
55H |
Neville Hill |
17A |
Derby |
|
28/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
12 |
55H |
Neville Hill |
17A |
Derby |
|
08/08/1962 |
To Service |
54 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
10/09/1962 |
To Service |
55 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
15/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
11 |
17A |
Derby |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
15/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
12 |
17A |
Derby |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
15/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
13 |
17A |
Derby |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
15/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
50 |
17A |
Derby |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
15/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
51 |
17A |
Derby |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
15/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
54 |
17A |
Derby |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
23/11/1962 |
To Service |
56 |
|
NEW |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
08/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
14 |
55H |
Neville Hill |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
08/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
15 |
55H |
Neville Hill |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
08/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
16 |
55H |
Neville Hill |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
08/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
17 |
55H |
Neville Hill |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
08/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
18 |
55H |
Neville Hill |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
08/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
19 |
55H |
Neville Hill |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
08/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
20 |
55H |
Neville Hill |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
08/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
21 |
55H |
Neville Hill |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
08/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
22 |
55H |
Neville Hill |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
08/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
23 |
55H |
Neville Hill |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
08/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
24 |
55H |
Neville Hill |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
08/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
25 |
55H |
Neville Hill |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
08/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
26 |
55H |
Neville Hill |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
08/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
27 |
55H |
Neville Hill |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
08/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
28 |
55H |
Neville Hill |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
08/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
29 |
55H |
Neville Hill |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
08/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
30 |
55H |
Neville Hill |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
08/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
31 |
55H |
Neville Hill |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
08/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
32 |
55H |
Neville Hill |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
22/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
133 |
17A |
Derby |
17A |
Derby |
|
19/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
55 |
17A |
Derby |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
19/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
58 |
17A |
Derby |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
19/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
59 |
17A |
Derby |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
19/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
61 |
17A |
Derby |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
19/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
62 |
17A |
Derby |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
19/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
64 |
17A |
Derby |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
19/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
65 |
17A |
Derby |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
19/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
66 |
17A |
Derby |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
19/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
67 |
17A |
Derby |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
19/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
83 |
17A |
Derby |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
19/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
84 |
17A |
Derby |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
09/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
11 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
17A |
Derby |
|
09/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
12 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
17A |
Derby |
|
09/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
13 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
17A |
Derby |
|
09/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
43 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
17A |
Derby |
|
09/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
44 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
17A |
Derby |
|
09/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
45 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
17A |
Derby |
|
09/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
46 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
17A |
Derby |
|
09/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
47 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
17A |
Derby |
|
09/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
48 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
17A |
Derby |
|
09/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
49 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
17A |
Derby |
|
09/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
50 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
17A |
Derby |
|
09/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
51 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
17A |
Derby |
|
09/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
53 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
17A |
Derby |
|
09/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
54 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
17A |
Derby |
|
09/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
55 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
17A |
Derby |
|
09/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
56 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
17A |
Derby |
|
09/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
58 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
17A |
Derby |
|
09/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
59 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
17A |
Derby |
|
09/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
61 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
17A |
Derby |
|
09/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
62 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
17A |
Derby |
|
09/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
65 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
17A |
Derby |
|
09/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
66 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
17A |
Derby |
|
09/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
67 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
17A |
Derby |
|
09/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
68 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
17A |
Derby |
|
09/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
69 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
17A |
Derby |
|
09/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
71 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
17A |
Derby |
|
09/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
72 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
17A |
Derby |
|
09/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
73 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
17A |
Derby |
|
09/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
74 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
17A |
Derby |
|
09/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
75 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
17A |
Derby |
|
09/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
77 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
17A |
Derby |
|
09/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
78 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
17A |
Derby |
|
09/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
79 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
17A |
Derby |
|
09/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
80 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
17A |
Derby |
|
09/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
81 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
17A |
Derby |
|
09/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
83 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
17A |
Derby |
|
09/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
84 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
17A |
Derby |
|
16/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
52 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
17A |
Derby |
|
16/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
76 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
17A |
Derby |
|
06/04/1963 |
Reallocation |
70 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
17A |
Derby |
|
20/04/1963 |
Reallocation |
64 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
17A |
Derby |
|
11/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
82 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
17A |
Derby |
|
15/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
77 |
17A |
Derby |
18A |
Toton |
|
29/06/1963 |
To Service |
57 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
29/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
74 |
17A |
Derby |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
29/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
76 |
17A |
Derby |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
06/07/1963 |
Reallocation |
45 |
17A |
Derby |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
06/07/1963 |
Reallocation |
49 |
17A |
Derby |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
06/07/1963 |
Reallocation |
61 |
17A |
Derby |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
06/07/1963 |
Reallocation |
85 |
17A |
Derby |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
13/07/1963 |
Reallocation |
103 |
17A |
Derby |
18A |
Toton |
|
10/08/1963 |
Reallocation |
90 |
17A |
Derby |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
28/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
79 |
17A |
Derby |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
08/02/1964 |
Reallocation |
45 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
16C |
Derby |
|
08/02/1964 |
Reallocation |
49 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
16C |
Derby |
|
08/02/1964 |
Reallocation |
85 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
16C |
Derby |
|
08/02/1964 |
Reallocation |
90 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
16C |
Derby |
|
08/02/1964 |
Reallocation |
101 |
17A |
Derby |
15B |
Wellingborough |
|
15/02/1964 |
Reallocation |
46 |
17A |
Derby |
16A |
Toton |
|
15/02/1964 |
Reallocation |
75 |
17A |
Derby |
16A |
Toton |
|
15/02/1964 |
Reallocation |
81 |
17A |
Derby |
16A |
Toton |
|
15/02/1964 |
Reallocation |
92 |
17A |
Derby |
16A |
Toton |
|
15/02/1964 |
Reallocation |
102 |
17A |
Derby |
16A |
Toton |
|
15/02/1964 |
Reallocation |
104 |
17A |
Derby |
16A |
Toton |
|
15/02/1964 |
Reallocation |
106 |
17A |
Derby |
16A |
Toton |
|
15/02/1964 |
Reallocation |
117 |
17A |
Derby |
16A |
Toton |
|
15/02/1964 |
Reallocation |
126 |
17A |
Derby |
16A |
Toton |
|
15/02/1964 |
Reallocation |
132 |
17A |
Derby |
16A |
Toton |
|
07/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
89 |
17A |
Derby |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
|
07/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
90 |
16C |
Derby |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
|
07/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
100 |
17A |
Derby |
16A |
Toton |
|
07/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
105 |
17A |
Derby |
16A |
Toton |
|
07/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
109 |
17A |
Derby |
16A |
Toton |
|
21/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
101 |
15B |
Wellingborough |
16C |
Derby |
|
11/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
104 |
16A |
Toton |
15B |
Wellingborough |
|
11/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
105 |
16A |
Toton |
15B |
Wellingborough |
|
11/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
106 |
16A |
Toton |
15B |
Wellingborough |
|
11/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
107 |
17A |
Derby |
15B |
Wellingborough |
|
11/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
109 |
16A |
Toton |
15B |
Wellingborough |
|
11/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
132 |
16A |
Toton |
15B |
Wellingborough |
|
30/05/1964 |
Reallocation |
62 |
17A |
Derby |
16A |
Toton |
|
30/05/1964 |
Reallocation |
68 |
17A |
Derby |
16A |
Toton |
|
30/05/1964 |
Reallocation |
84 |
17A |
Derby |
16A |
Toton |
|
30/05/1964 |
Reallocation |
110 |
17A |
Derby |
16A |
Toton |
|
30/05/1964 |
Reallocation |
137 |
17A |
Derby |
16A |
Toton |
|
13/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
104 |
15B |
Wellingborough |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
|
13/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
105 |
15B |
Wellingborough |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
|
13/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
106 |
15B |
Wellingborough |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
|
13/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
107 |
15B |
Wellingborough |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
|
13/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
130 |
17A |
Derby |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
|
13/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
131 |
17A |
Derby |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
|
13/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
132 |
15B |
Wellingborough |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
|
13/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
133 |
17A |
Derby |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
|
13/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
134 |
17A |
Derby |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
|
13/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
135 |
17A |
Derby |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
|
13/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
136 |
17A |
Derby |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
|
27/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
109 |
15B |
Wellingborough |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
|
25/07/1964 |
Reallocation |
101 |
16C |
Derby |
16A |
Toton |
|
25/07/1964 |
Reallocation |
108 |
17A |
Derby |
16A |
Toton |
|
08/08/1964 |
Reallocation |
94 |
17A |
Derby |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
12/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
60 |
17A |
Derby |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
|
12/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
63 |
17A |
Derby |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
|
12/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
64 |
17A |
Derby |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
|
12/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
65 |
17A |
Derby |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
|
12/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
66 |
17A |
Derby |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
|
12/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
67 |
17A |
Derby |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
|
12/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
69 |
17A |
Derby |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
|
12/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
70 |
17A |
Derby |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
|
12/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
71 |
17A |
Derby |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
|
12/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
72 |
17A |
Derby |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
|
12/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
73 |
17A |
Derby |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
|
26/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
57 |
18A |
Toton |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
10/10/1964 |
Reallocation |
80 |
17A |
Derby |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
|
10/10/1964 |
Reallocation |
82 |
17A |
Derby |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
|
07/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
119 |
17A |
Derby |
15B |
Wellingborough |
|
07/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
120 |
17A |
Derby |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
|
07/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
121 |
17A |
Derby |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
|
07/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
124 |
17A |
Derby |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
|
07/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
125 |
17A |
Derby |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
|
07/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
127 |
17A |
Derby |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
|
07/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
128 |
17A |
Derby |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
|
07/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
129 |
17A |
Derby |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
|
21/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
11 |
17A |
Derby |
16D |
Nottingham |
|
21/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
13 |
17A |
Derby |
16A |
Toton |
|
21/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
94 |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
16D |
Nottingham |
|
12/12/1964 |
Reallocation |
43 |
17A |
Derby |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
|
12/12/1964 |
Reallocation |
44 |
17A |
Derby |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
|
12/12/1964 |
Reallocation |
47 |
17A |
Derby |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
|
12/12/1964 |
Reallocation |
49 |
16C |
Derby |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
|
12/12/1964 |
Reallocation |
50 |
17A |
Derby |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
|
12/12/1964 |
Reallocation |
51 |
17A |
Derby |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
11 |
16D |
Nottingham |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
12 |
17A |
Derby |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
13 |
16A |
Toton |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
43 |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
44 |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
45 |
16C |
Derby |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
46 |
16A |
Toton |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
47 |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
48 |
17A |
Derby |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
49 |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
50 |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
51 |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
52 |
17A |
Derby |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
53 |
17A |
Derby |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
54 |
17A |
Derby |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
55 |
17A |
Derby |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
56 |
17A |
Derby |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
57 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
D15 |
Leicester Division |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
58 |
17A |
Derby |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
59 |
17A |
Derby |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
60 |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
61 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
62 |
16A |
Toton |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
63 |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
64 |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
65 |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
66 |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
67 |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
68 |
16A |
Toton |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
69 |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
70 |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
71 |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
72 |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
73 |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
74 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
75 |
16A |
Toton |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
76 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
77 |
18A |
Toton |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
78 |
17A |
Derby |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
79 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
80 |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
81 |
16A |
Toton |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
82 |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
83 |
17A |
Derby |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
84 |
16A |
Toton |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
85 |
16C |
Derby |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
86 |
17A |
Derby |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
87 |
17A |
Derby |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
88 |
17A |
Derby |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
89 |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
90 |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
91 |
17A |
Derby |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
92 |
16A |
Toton |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
93 |
17A |
Derby |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
94 |
16D |
Nottingham |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
95 |
17A |
Derby |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
96 |
17A |
Derby |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
97 |
17A |
Derby |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
98 |
17A |
Derby |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
99 |
17A |
Derby |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
100 |
16A |
Toton |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
101 |
16A |
Toton |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
102 |
16A |
Toton |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
103 |
18A |
Toton |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
104 |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
105 |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
106 |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
107 |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
108 |
16A |
Toton |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
109 |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
110 |
16A |
Toton |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
111 |
17A |
Derby |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
112 |
17A |
Derby |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
113 |
17A |
Derby |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
114 |
17A |
Derby |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
115 |
17A |
Derby |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
116 |
17A |
Derby |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
117 |
16A |
Toton |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
118 |
17A |
Derby |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
119 |
15B |
Wellingborough |
D15 |
Leicester Division |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
120 |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
121 |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
122 |
17A |
Derby |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
123 |
17A |
Derby |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
124 |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
125 |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
126 |
16A |
Toton |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
127 |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
128 |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
129 |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
130 |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
131 |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
132 |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
133 |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
134 |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
135 |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
136 |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
137 |
16A |
Toton |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
13/02/1965 |
Reallocation |
56 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
20/02/1965 |
Reallocation |
56 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
20/02/1965 |
Reallocation |
119 |
D15 |
Leicester Division |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
06/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
43 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
2E |
Saltley |
|
06/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
67 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
2E |
Saltley |
|
06/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
69 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
2E |
Saltley |
|
06/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
134 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
2E |
Saltley |
|
08/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
43 |
2E |
Saltley |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
08/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
67 |
2E |
Saltley |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
08/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
69 |
2E |
Saltley |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
08/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
134 |
2E |
Saltley |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
62 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
68 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
75 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
81 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
84 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
92 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
94 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
D15 |
Leicester Division |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
100 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
101 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
103 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
126 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
D15 |
Leicester Division |
|
11/09/1965 |
Reallocation |
11 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
11/09/1965 |
Reallocation |
12 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
11/09/1965 |
Reallocation |
13 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
46 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
135 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
136 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
09/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
126 |
D15 |
Leicester Division |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
07/11/1965 |
Reallocation |
33 |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
13/11/1965 |
Reallocation |
133 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
13/11/1965 |
Reallocation |
134 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
04/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
33 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
11/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
113 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
41A |
Tinsley |
|
25/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
113 |
41A |
Tinsley |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
08/01/1966 |
Reallocation |
36 |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
08/01/1966 |
Reallocation |
37 |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
08/01/1966 |
Reallocation |
38 |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
08/01/1966 |
Reallocation |
39 |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
08/01/1966 |
Reallocation |
40 |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
08/01/1966 |
Reallocation |
41 |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
08/01/1966 |
Reallocation |
42 |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
15/01/1966 |
Reallocation |
34 |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
15/01/1966 |
Reallocation |
35 |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
05/03/1966 |
Reallocation |
88 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
41A |
Tinsley |
|
12/03/1966 |
Reallocation |
88 |
41A |
Tinsley |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
23/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
108 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
23/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
133 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
23/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
134 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
21/05/1966 |
Reallocation |
77 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
21/05/1966 |
Reallocation |
111 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
21/05/1966 |
Reallocation |
130 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
21/05/1966 |
Reallocation |
131 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
21/05/1966 |
Reallocation |
132 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
21/05/1966 |
Reallocation |
133 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
21/05/1966 |
Reallocation |
134 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
25/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
96 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
25/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
102 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
25/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
110 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
25/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
111 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
25/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
126 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
06/08/1966 |
Reallocation |
58 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
06/08/1966 |
Reallocation |
59 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
06/08/1966 |
Reallocation |
60 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
06/08/1966 |
Reallocation |
61 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
06/08/1966 |
Reallocation |
98 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
08/10/1966 |
Reallocation |
53 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
07/01/1967 |
Reallocation |
94 |
D15 |
Leicester Division |
ML |
Tinsley |
|
28/01/1967 |
Reallocation |
61 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
11/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
53 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
11/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
60 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
11/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
96 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
29/04/1967 |
Reallocation |
94 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
30/09/1967 |
Reallocation |
59 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
30/09/1967 |
Reallocation |
100 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
30/09/1967 |
Reallocation |
101 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
30/09/1967 |
Reallocation |
102 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
30/09/1967 |
Reallocation |
103 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
30/09/1967 |
Reallocation |
104 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
30/09/1967 |
Reallocation |
105 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
30/09/1967 |
Reallocation |
106 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
30/09/1967 |
Reallocation |
107 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
30/09/1967 |
Reallocation |
108 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
30/09/1967 |
Reallocation |
109 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
30/09/1967 |
Reallocation |
110 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
30/09/1967 |
Reallocation |
111 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
30/09/1967 |
Reallocation |
112 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
14/10/1967 |
Reallocation |
21 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
28/10/1967 |
Reallocation |
11 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
11/11/1967 |
Reallocation |
106 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
11/11/1967 |
Reallocation |
113 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
11/11/1967 |
Reallocation |
114 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
18/11/1967 |
Reallocation |
18 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
25/11/1967 |
Reallocation |
97 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
09/12/1967 |
Reallocation |
96 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
09/12/1967 |
Reallocation |
115 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
09/12/1967 |
Reallocation |
117 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
09/12/1967 |
Reallocation |
118 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
09/12/1967 |
Reallocation |
119 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
16/12/1967 |
Reallocation |
33 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/12/1967 |
Reallocation |
53 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
16/12/1967 |
Reallocation |
57 |
D15 |
Leicester Division |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/12/1967 |
Reallocation |
58 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/12/1967 |
Reallocation |
60 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
06/01/1968 |
Reallocation |
13 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
06/01/1968 |
Reallocation |
116 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
27/01/1968 |
Reallocation |
99 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
09/03/1968 |
Reallocation |
96 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
06/04/1968 |
Reallocation |
131 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
06/04/1968 |
Reallocation |
132 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
06/04/1968 |
Reallocation |
133 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
06/04/1968 |
Reallocation |
134 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
06/04/1968 |
Reallocation |
135 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
18/05/1968 |
Reallocation |
97 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
18/05/1968 |
Reallocation |
98 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
18/05/1968 |
Reallocation |
99 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
18/05/1968 |
Reallocation |
120 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
18/05/1968 |
Reallocation |
121 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
18/05/1968 |
Reallocation |
122 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
18/05/1968 |
Reallocation |
123 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
18/05/1968 |
Reallocation |
124 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
18/05/1968 |
Reallocation |
125 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
18/05/1968 |
Reallocation |
130 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
18/05/1968 |
Reallocation |
136 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
18/05/1968 |
Reallocation |
137 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
08/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
123 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
08/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
124 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
08/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
125 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
11 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
13 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
18 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
21 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
33 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
36 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
37 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
38 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
39 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
40 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
41 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
42 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
43 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
44 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
45 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
46 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
47 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
48 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
49 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
50 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
51 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
52 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
54 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
55 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
56 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
57 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
58 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
59 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
61 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
62 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
63 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
64 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
65 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
66 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
67 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
68 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
69 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
70 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
71 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
72 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
73 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
74 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
75 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
76 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
77 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
78 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
79 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
80 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
81 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
82 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
83 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
84 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
85 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
86 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
87 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
88 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
89 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
90 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
91 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
92 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
93 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
94 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
95 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
96 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
97 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
98 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
99 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
123 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
124 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
125 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
126 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
127 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
128 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
129 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
130 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
131 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
132 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
133 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
134 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
135 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
136 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
137 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/08/1968 |
Reallocation |
20 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/08/1968 |
Reallocation |
22 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/08/1968 |
Reallocation |
29 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/08/1968 |
Reallocation |
32 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/08/1968 |
Reallocation |
35 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/08/1968 |
Reallocation |
53 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
17/08/1968 |
Reallocation |
60 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
17/08/1968 |
Reallocation |
89 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
17/08/1968 |
Reallocation |
112 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
17/08/1968 |
Reallocation |
129 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
10/07/1971 |
Reallocation |
12 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
40B |
Immingham |
|
09/10/1971 |
Reallocation |
12 |
40B |
Immingham |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
09/10/1971 |
Reallocation |
13 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
09/10/1971 |
Reallocation |
18 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
09/10/1971 |
Reallocation |
20 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
09/10/1971 |
Reallocation |
21 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
09/10/1971 |
Reallocation |
22 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
08/07/1972 |
Reallocation |
86 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
86A |
Cardiff Canton |
|
09/09/1972 |
Reallocation |
11 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
09/09/1972 |
Reallocation |
29 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
09/09/1972 |
Reallocation |
32 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
09/09/1972 |
Reallocation |
33 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
09/09/1972 |
Reallocation |
36 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
D01 |
London Division |
|
09/09/1972 |
Reallocation |
37 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
D01 |
London Division |
|
09/09/1972 |
Reallocation |
38 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
D01 |
London Division |
|
09/09/1972 |
Reallocation |
40 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
D01 |
London Division |
|
09/09/1972 |
Reallocation |
41 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
D01 |
London Division |
|
09/09/1972 |
Reallocation |
137 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
07/10/1972 |
Reallocation |
35 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
07/10/1972 |
Reallocation |
42 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
07/10/1972 |
Reallocation |
44 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
07/10/1972 |
Reallocation |
45 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
07/10/1972 |
Reallocation |
48 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
07/10/1972 |
Reallocation |
49 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
07/10/1972 |
Reallocation |
50 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
07/10/1972 |
Reallocation |
54 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
D01 |
London Division |
|
07/10/1972 |
Reallocation |
55 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
D01 |
London Division |
|
07/10/1972 |
Reallocation |
56 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
D01 |
London Division |
|
07/10/1972 |
Reallocation |
57 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
D01 |
London Division |
|
07/10/1972 |
Reallocation |
58 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
07/10/1972 |
Reallocation |
69 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
07/10/1972 |
Reallocation |
101 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
06/01/1973 |
Reallocation |
52 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
D01 |
London Division |
|
12/05/1973 |
Reallocation |
46 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
CD |
Cricklewood East |
|
26/05/1973 |
Reallocation |
11 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
TO |
Toton |
|
26/05/1973 |
Reallocation |
35 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
TO |
Toton |
|
26/05/1973 |
Reallocation |
76 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
HO |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
26/05/1973 |
Reallocation |
125 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
HO |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
07/07/1973 |
Reallocation |
45002 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
TO |
Toton |
|
07/07/1973 |
Reallocation |
36 |
D01 |
London Division |
TO |
Toton |
|
07/07/1973 |
Reallocation |
45101 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
HO |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
28/07/1973 |
Reallocation |
45109 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
HO |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
28/07/1973 |
Reallocation |
45101 |
HO |
Holbeck (MR) |
TO |
Toton |
|
06/10/1973 |
Reallocation |
45002 |
TO |
Toton |
HO |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
06/10/1973 |
Reallocation |
37 |
D01 |
London Division |
TO |
Toton |
|
06/10/1973 |
Reallocation |
38 |
D01 |
London Division |
TO |
Toton |
|
06/10/1973 |
Reallocation |
45109 |
HO |
Holbeck (MR) |
TO |
Toton |
|
06/10/1973 |
Reallocation |
137 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
TO |
Toton |
|
27/10/1973 |
Reallocation |
45107 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
HO |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
27/10/1973 |
Reallocation |
76 |
HO |
Holbeck (MR) |
TO |
Toton |
|
03/11/1973 |
Reallocation |
45107 |
HO |
Holbeck (MR) |
TO |
Toton |
|
03/11/1973 |
Reallocation |
76 |
TO |
Toton |
HO |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
17/11/1973 |
Reallocation |
34 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
TO |
Toton |
|
17/11/1973 |
Reallocation |
37 |
TO |
Toton |
HO |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
08/12/1973 |
Reallocation |
18 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
TO |
Toton |
|
08/12/1973 |
Reallocation |
70 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
HO |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
12/01/1974 |
Reallocation |
36 |
TO |
Toton |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
|
12/01/1974 |
Reallocation |
38 |
TO |
Toton |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
|
12/01/1974 |
Reallocation |
62 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
|
02/02/1974 |
Reallocation |
28 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
TO |
Toton |
|
02/02/1974 |
Reallocation |
108 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
HO |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
16/03/1974 |
Reallocation |
32 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
TO |
Toton |
|
16/03/1974 |
Reallocation |
45014 |
TO |
Toton |
HO |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
27/04/1974 |
Reallocation |
45123 |
D01 |
London Division |
TO |
Toton |
|
27/04/1974 |
Reallocation |
63 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
|
18/05/1974 |
Reallocation |
22 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
TO |
Toton |
|
18/05/1974 |
Reallocation |
45007 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
HO |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
08/06/1974 |
Reallocation |
63 |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
TO |
Toton |
|
20/07/1974 |
Reallocation |
45133 |
D01 |
London Division |
TO |
Toton |
|
20/07/1974 |
Reallocation |
63 |
TO |
Toton |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
|
12/10/1974 |
Reallocation |
36 |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
HO |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
12/10/1974 |
Reallocation |
38 |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
HO |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
12/10/1974 |
Reallocation |
45137 |
D01 |
London Division |
TO |
Toton |
|
12/10/1974 |
Reallocation |
64 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
|
12/10/1974 |
Reallocation |
66 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
|
12/10/1974 |
Reallocation |
68 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
|
12/10/1974 |
Reallocation |
71 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
|
09/11/1974 |
Reallocation |
39 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
|
09/11/1974 |
Reallocation |
41 |
D01 |
London Division |
TO |
Toton |
|
09/11/1974 |
Reallocation |
55 |
D01 |
London Division |
TO |
Toton |
|
09/11/1974 |
Reallocation |
62 |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
TO |
Toton |
|
09/11/1974 |
Reallocation |
66 |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
TO |
Toton |
|
09/11/1974 |
Reallocation |
91 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
|
09/11/1974 |
Reallocation |
100 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
|
09/11/1974 |
Reallocation |
131 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
|
10/05/1975 |
Reallocation |
45049 |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
TO |
Toton |
|
10/05/1975 |
Reallocation |
45072 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
|
11/10/1975 |
Reallocation |
45033 |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
TO |
Toton |
|
11/10/1975 |
Reallocation |
45056 |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
TO |
Toton |
|
11/10/1975 |
Reallocation |
45074 |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
TO |
Toton |
|
08/11/1975 |
Reallocation |
45049 |
TO |
Toton |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
|
08/11/1975 |
Reallocation |
45050 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
|
08/05/1976 |
Reallocation |
45023 |
D01 |
London Division |
TO |
Toton |
|
08/05/1976 |
Reallocation |
45072 |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
TO |
Toton |
|
10/07/1976 |
Reallocation |
45060 |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
TO |
Toton |
|
11/12/1976 |
Reallocation |
45058 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
TO |
Cardiff Canton |
|
01/1977 |
Reallocation |
45058 |
TO |
Toton |
TO |
Toton |
|
04/1977 |
Reallocation |
45056 |
TO |
Toton |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
|
06/1977 |
Reallocation |
45056 |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
TO |
Toton |
|
31/07/1977 |
Condemned |
45067 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
COND |
|
10/1977 |
Reallocation |
45024 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
10/1977 |
Reallocation |
45025 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
10/1977 |
Reallocation |
45026 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
10/1977 |
Reallocation |
45027 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
10/1977 |
Reallocation |
45021 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
10/1977 |
Reallocation |
45028 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
10/1977 |
Reallocation |
45029 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
10/1977 |
Reallocation |
45030 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
10/1977 |
Reallocation |
45031 |
HO |
Holbeck (MR) |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
10/1977 |
Reallocation |
45032 |
HO |
Holbeck (MR) |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
10/1977 |
Reallocation |
45034 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
10/1977 |
Reallocation |
45035 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
10/1977 |
Reallocation |
45036 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
10/1977 |
Reallocation |
45038 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
10/1977 |
Reallocation |
45039 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
10/1977 |
Reallocation |
45040 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
10/1977 |
Reallocation |
45041 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
10/1977 |
Reallocation |
45043 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
10/1977 |
Reallocation |
45022 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
10/1977 |
Reallocation |
45047 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
10/1977 |
Reallocation |
45048 |
HO |
Holbeck (MR) |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
10/1977 |
Reallocation |
45053 |
HO |
Holbeck (MR) |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
10/1977 |
Reallocation |
45061 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
12/03/1978 |
Reallocation |
45033 |
TO |
Toton |
TO |
Toton |
|
12/03/1978 |
Reallocation |
45042 |
D01 |
London Division |
TO |
Toton |
|
03/08/1980 |
Condemned |
45047 |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
COND |
|
30/11/1980 |
Condemned |
45030 |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
COND |
|
14/12/1980 |
Condemned |
45018 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
COND |
|
14/12/1980 |
Condemned |
45024 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
14/12/1980 |
Condemned |
45021 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
14/12/1980 |
Condemned |
45028 |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
COND |
|
14/12/1980 |
Condemned |
45029 |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
COND |
|
14/12/1980 |
Condemned |
45032 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
14/12/1980 |
Condemned |
45039 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
14/12/1980 |
Condemned |
45008 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
COND |
|
10/05/1981 |
Condemned |
45025 |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
COND |
|
31/05/1981 |
Condemned |
45011 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
COND |
|
31/05/1981 |
Condemned |
45027 |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
COND |
|
31/05/1981 |
Condemned |
45031 |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
COND |
|
31/05/1981 |
Condemned |
45035 |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
COND |
|
07/1981 |
Reallocation |
45033 |
TO |
Toton |
TO |
Toton |
|
07/1981 |
Reallocation |
45037 |
CD |
Cricklewood East |
TO |
Toton |
|
12/07/1981 |
Condemned |
45071 |
HO |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
COND |
|
16/08/1981 |
Condemned |
45061 |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
COND |
|
18/10/1981 |
Condemned |
45073 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
COND |
|
04/11/1981 |
Reallocation |
45053 |
TI |
Tinsley |
98Su |
Derby |
|
08/05/1983 |
Condemned |
45045 |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
|
COND |
|
27/11/1983 |
Condemned |
45053 |
98Su |
|
|
COND |
|
12/09/1984 |
Condemned |
45023 |
TO |
Toton |
|
COND |
|
12/09/1984 |
Condemned |
45043 |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
COND |
|
12/09/1984 |
Condemned |
45050 |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1984 |
Condemned |
45002 |
HO |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
COND |
|
04/01/1985 |
Condemned |
45147 |
TO |
Toton |
|
COND |
|
21/01/1985 |
Condemned |
45057 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
COND |
|
21/01/1985 |
Condemned |
45054 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
COND |
|
21/01/1985 |
Condemned |
45064 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
COND |
|
24/01/1985 |
Condemned |
45075 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
COND |
|
05/03/1985 |
Condemned |
45065 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
COND |
|
28/03/1985 |
Condemned |
45010 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
COND |
|
11/04/1985 |
Condemned |
45055 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
COND |
|
26/04/1985 |
Condemned |
45072 |
TO |
Toton |
|
COND |
|
29/04/1985 |
Condemned |
45042 |
TO |
Toton |
|
COND |
|
05/06/1985 |
Condemned |
45038 |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
COND |
|
24/06/1985 |
Condemned |
45048 |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
COND |
|
01/08/1985 |
Condemned |
45017 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
COND |
|
04/09/1985 |
Condemned |
45019 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
COND |
|
04/09/1985 |
Condemned |
45074 |
TO |
Toton |
|
COND |
|
18/11/1985 |
Condemned |
45016 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
COND |
|
29/11/1985 |
Condemned |
45056 |
TO |
Toton |
|
COND |
|
08/12/1985 |
Condemned |
45020 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
COND |
|
08/12/1985 |
Condemned |
45004 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
COND |
|
08/12/1985 |
Condemned |
45060 |
TO |
Toton |
|
COND |
|
08/12/1985 |
Condemned |
45003 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
COND |
|
20/01/1986 |
Condemned |
45001 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
COND |
|
27/01/1986 |
Condemned |
45109 |
TO |
Toton |
|
COND |
|
28/01/1986 |
Condemned |
45068 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
COND |
|
03/03/1986 |
Condemned |
45015 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
COND |
|
03/03/1986 |
Condemned |
45059 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
COND |
|
10/03/1986 |
Condemned |
45014 |
HO |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
COND |
|
17/03/1986 |
Condemned |
45005 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
COND |
|
07/04/1986 |
Condemned |
45026 |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
COND |
|
02/05/1986 |
Condemned |
45063 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
COND |
|
11/05/1986 |
Condemned |
45036 |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
COND |
|
11/05/1986 |
Condemned |
45077 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
COND |
|
12/05/1986 |
Condemned |
45117 |
TO |
Toton |
|
COND |
|
08/07/1986 |
Condemned |
45069 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
COND |
|
03/09/1986 |
Condemned |
45131 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
COND |
|
09/09/1986 |
Condemned |
45102 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
COND |
|
13/09/1986 |
Condemned |
45009 |
HO |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
COND |
|
14/09/1986 |
Condemned |
45006 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
COND |
|
12/11/1986 |
Condemned |
45076 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
COND |
|
13/11/1986 |
Condemned |
45101 |
TO |
Toton |
|
COND |
|
22/12/1986 |
Condemned |
45116 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
COND |
|
22/12/1986 |
Condemned |
45138 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
COND |
|
29/01/1987 |
Condemned |
45070 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
COND |
|
11/02/1987 |
Condemned |
45148 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
COND |
|
17/02/1987 |
Condemned |
45114 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
COND |
|
09/03/1987 |
Condemned |
45135 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
COND |
|
24/03/1987 |
Condemned |
45120 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
COND |
|
07/04/1987 |
Condemned |
45146 |
TO |
Toton |
|
COND |
|
09/04/1987 |
Condemned |
45051 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
COND |
|
27/04/1987 |
Condemned |
45122 |
TO |
Toton |
|
COND |
|
27/04/1987 |
Condemned |
45013 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
COND |
|
27/04/1987 |
Condemned |
45126 |
TO |
Toton |
|
COND |
|
27/04/1987 |
Condemned |
45139 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
COND |
|
07/05/1987 |
Condemned |
45119 |
TO |
Toton |
|
COND |
|
07/05/1987 |
Condemned |
45112 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
COND |
|
07/05/1987 |
Condemned |
45143 |
TO |
Toton |
|
COND |
|
07/05/1987 |
Condemned |
45111 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
COND |
|
07/05/1987 |
Condemned |
45127 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
COND |
|
07/05/1987 |
Condemned |
45136 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
COND |
|
07/05/1987 |
Condemned |
45125 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
COND |
|
08/05/1987 |
Condemned |
45118 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
COND |
|
10/05/1987 |
Condemned |
45133 |
TO |
Toton |
|
COND |
|
10/05/1987 |
Condemned |
45105 |
86A |
Cardiff Canton |
|
COND |
|
10/05/1987 |
Condemned |
45130 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
COND |
|
11/05/1987 |
Condemned |
45132 |
TO |
Toton |
|
COND |
|
15/06/1987 |
Condemned |
45137 |
TO |
Toton |
|
COND |
|
15/06/1987 |
Condemned |
45044 |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
|
COND |
|
15/06/1987 |
Condemned |
45129 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
COND |
|
18/06/1987 |
Condemned |
45142 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
COND |
|
02/07/1987 |
Condemned |
45062 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
COND |
|
22/07/1987 |
Condemned |
45123 |
TO |
Toton |
|
COND |
|
04/08/1987 |
Condemned |
45108 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
COND |
|
09/1987 |
Reallocation |
97410 |
98W |
|
GD |
Gateshead |
|
09/1987 |
Reallocation |
97411 |
98W |
|
GD |
Gateshead |
|
09/1987 |
Reallocation |
97412 |
98W |
|
GD |
Gateshead |
|
09/1987 |
Reallocation |
97409 |
98W |
|
GD |
Gateshead |
|
09/1987 |
Reallocation |
97413 |
98W |
|
GD |
Gateshead |
|
03/09/1987 |
Condemned |
45058 |
TO |
Toton |
|
COND |
|
14/09/1987 |
Condemned |
45149 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
COND |
|
17/09/1987 |
Condemned |
45134 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
COND |
|
27/10/1987 |
Condemned |
45049 |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
|
COND |
|
19/11/1987 |
Condemned |
45121 |
TO |
Toton |
|
COND |
|
21/12/1987 |
Condemned |
45144 |
TO |
Toton |
|
COND |
|
22/01/1988 |
Condemned |
45124 |
TO |
Toton |
|
COND |
|
04/02/1988 |
Condemned |
45033 |
TO |
Toton |
|
COND |
|
04/02/1988 |
Condemned |
45150 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
COND |
|
23/02/1988 |
Condemned |
45145 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
COND |
|
29/03/1988 |
Condemned |
45140 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
COND |
|
13/04/1988 |
Condemned |
45104 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
COND |
|
15/05/1988 |
Reallocation |
97410 |
GD |
Gateshead |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
15/05/1988 |
Reallocation |
97411 |
GD |
Gateshead |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
15/05/1988 |
Reallocation |
97412 |
GD |
Gateshead |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
15/05/1988 |
Reallocation |
97409 |
GD |
Gateshead |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
15/05/1988 |
Reallocation |
97413 |
GD |
Gateshead |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
08/06/1988 |
Condemned |
45041 |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
COND |
|
08/06/1988 |
Condemned |
45052 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
COND |
|
13/06/1988 |
Condemned |
45115 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
COND |
|
07/1988 |
Condemned |
97411 |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
COND |
|
07/1988 |
Condemned |
97409 |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
COND |
|
26/07/1988 |
Condemned |
97413 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
27/07/1988 |
Condemned |
45107 |
TO |
Toton |
|
COND |
|
27/07/1988 |
Condemned |
45037 |
TO |
Toton |
|
COND |
|
27/07/1988 |
Condemned |
45110 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
COND |
|
27/07/1988 |
Condemned |
45012 |
HO |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
COND |
|
27/07/1988 |
Condemned |
45007 |
HO |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
COND |
|
08/1988 |
Condemned |
97412 |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
COND |
|
02/08/1988 |
Condemned |
45046 |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
|
COND |
|
02/08/1988 |
Condemned |
45113 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
COND |
|
02/08/1988 |
Condemned |
45103 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
COND |
|
04/08/1988 |
Condemned |
45141 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
COND |
|
20/02/1989 |
Condemned |
45106 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
COND |
|
22/04/1989 |
Condemned |
45128 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
COND |
|