04 0-6-0
LNER (Wks Num) | BR | BR (1955 Num) | BR (Pre Tops) | Date To Service | Bld | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) | Name | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
11121 | D2215 | 04/07/1955 | DR | Stratford | 15/03/1969 | 13.67 | Cut | Birds (Long Marston) | 03/1970 | 14.71 | |||||
11122 | D2216 | 05/07/1955 | DR | Stratford | 09/05/1971 | 15.83 | 68.57 | ||||||||
11123 | D2217 | 28/07/1955 | DR | Stratford | 07/05/1972 | Stratford | 16.83 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 11/1973 | 18.32 | ||||
11124 | D2218 | 16/08/1955 | DR | Norwich Thorpe | 17/08/1968 | 13 | Cut | Steelbreaking and Dismantling Co. (Chesterfield) | 08/1969 | 14.01 | |||||
11125 | D2219 | 17/08/1955 | DR | Norwich Thorpe | 06/04/1968 | 12.67 | Cut | Geeson Ltd (Ripley) | 05/1977 | 21.76 | |||||
11126 | D2220 | 22/08/1955 | DR | Norwich Thorpe | 03/02/1968 | 12.5 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 05/1968 | 12.74 | |||||
11127 | D2221 | 04/09/1955 | DR | Stratford | 13/07/1968 | 12.83 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 08/1969 | 13.96 | |||||
11128 | D2222 | 08/09/1955 | DR | Stratford | 28/10/1968 | 13.08 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 04/1969 | 13.61 | |||||
11129 | D2223 | 26/09/1955 | DR | Stratford | 23/05/1971 | 15.67 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 11/1971 | 16.15 | |||||
11130 | D2224 | 30/09/1955 | DR | Stratford | 13/04/1968 | 12.58 | Cut | Drapers (Hull) | 08/1968 | 12.88 | |||||
11131 | D2225 | 15/10/1955 | DR | Stratford | 19/04/1969 | 13.5 | Cut | National Coal Board (Wath) | 07/1985 | 29.77 | |||||
11132 | D2226 | 30/10/1955 | DR | Stratford | 13/04/1968 | 12.5 | Cut | Drapers (Hull) | 08/1968 | 12.80 | |||||
11133 | D2227 | 20/11/1955 | DR | Stratford | 13/04/1968 | 12.42 | Cut | Drapers (Hull) | 08/1968 | 12.75 | |||||
11134 | D2228 | 27/11/1955 | DR | Stratford | 13/07/1968 | 12.67 | Cut | Bowaters (Sittingbourne) | 01/1979 | 23.15 | |||||
11135 | D2229 | 28/11/1955 | DR | Stratford | 31/12/1969 | 14.08 | Prs | Preserved | 68.17 | ||||||
11149 | D2230 | 16/01/1956 | DR | West Hartlepool | 28/03/1968 | 12.17 | Cut | Steelbreaking and Dismantling Co. (Chesterfield) | 01/1969 | 13.01 | |||||
11150 | D2231 | 19/01/1956 | DR | West Hartlepool | 07/1969 | 13.5 | Cut | Steelbreaking and Dismantling Co. (Chesterfield) | 05/1970 | 14.33 | |||||
11151 | D2232 | 27/02/1956 | DR | West Hartlepool | 28/03/1968 | 12.08 | 67.92 | ||||||||
11152 | D2233 | 10/02/1956 | DR | Immingham | 21/09/1968 | 12.58 | Cut | Steelbreaking and Dismantling Co. (Chesterfield) | 08/1969 | 13.52 | |||||
11153 | D2234 | 17/02/1956 | DR | Immingham | 13/04/1968 | 12.17 | Cut | Drapers (Hull) | 08/1968 | 12.50 | |||||
11154 | D2235 | 06/03/1956 | DR | Immingham | 06/04/1968 | 12.08 | Cut | A Findlay (Worsborough) | 07/1968 | 12.37 | |||||
11155 | D2236 | 27/03/1956 | DR | Kings Cross | 03/02/1968 | 11.92 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 05/1968 | 12.14 | |||||
11156 | D2237 | 24/04/1956 | DR | New England | 31/10/1969 | 13.5 | Cut | Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) | 03/1970 | 13.90 | |||||
11157 | D2238 | 10/05/1956 | DR | New England | 27/07/1968 | 12.17 | Cut | National Coal Board (Manvers Main) | 11/1982 | 26.53 | |||||
11158 | D2239 | 18/05/1956 | DR | New England | 30/09/1971 | 15.33 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 0000 | ||||||
11159 | D2240 | 03/06/1956 | DR | New England | 20/04/1968 | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 11.83 | Cut | R A Kings (Norwich) | 10/1970 | 14.38 | ||||
11160 | D2241 | 15/06/1956 | DR | New England | 23/05/1971 | 14.92 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 11/1976 | 20.43 | |||||
11212 | D2242 | 26/10/1956 | DR | Neville Hill | 31/12/1969 | 13.17 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 08/1970 | 13.81 | |||||
11213 | D2243 | 26/10/1956 | DR | Neville Hill | 07/1969 | 12.75 | Cut | Middlesbrough and Hartlepool Dock Authority (?) | 03/1973 | 16.39 | |||||
11214 | D2244 | 12/11/1956 | DR | Neville Hill | 29/06/1970 | 13.58 | Cut | A R Adams (Newport, Gwent) | 01/1981 | 24.19 | |||||
11215 | D2245 | 12/11/1956 | DR | Neville Hill | 28/12/1968 | 12.08 | Prs | Preserved | 67.21 | ||||||
11216 | D2246 | 06/12/1956 | DR | Neville Hill | 08/07/1968 | 11.58 | Prs | Preserved | 67.15 | ||||||
11217 | D2247 | 14/12/1956 | DR | Percy Main | 31/12/1969 | 13 | Cut | Duport Steels (Briton Ferry) | 09/1979 | 22.77 | |||||
11218 | D2248 | 08/01/1957 | DR | Percy Main | 29/06/1970 | 13.42 | Cut | Carol & Good (Rotherham) | 04/1987 | 30.28 | |||||
11219 | D2249 | 17/01/1957 | DR | Percy Main | 27/12/1970 | 13.92 | Cut | P Woods (Shipbreaking) (Queenborough) | 09/1971 | 14.67 | |||||
11220 | D2250 | 10/04/1957 | DR | Hither Green | 13/06/1968 | 11.17 | Cut | Pounds (at Fratton TMD) | 06/1969 | 12.19 | |||||
11221 | D2251 | 17/04/1957 | DR | Hither Green | 01/12/1968 | 11.67 | Cut | Pollock and Brown (Southampton) | 09/1969 | 12.42 | |||||
11222 | D2252 | 17/04/1957 | DR | Brighton | 27/10/1968 | 11.5 | Cut | Pollock and Brown (Southampton) | 11/1969 | 12.59 | |||||
11223 | D2253 | 10/04/1957 | DR | Hither Green | 28/04/1969 | 12 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 12/1969 | 12.69 | |||||
11224 | D2254 | 26/04/1957 | DR | Hither Green | 11/06/1967 | 10.17 | Cut | British Rail (at Selhurst MPD) | 07/1967 | 10.22 | |||||
11225 | D2255 | 26/04/1957 | DR | Hither Green | 03/03/1968 | 10.92 | Cut | Pollock and Brown (Southampton) | 08/1969 | 12.31 | |||||
11226 | D2256 | 20/09/1957 | DR | Hither Green | 29/09/1968 | 11 | Cut | Pollock and Brown (Southampton) | 08/1969 | 11.91 | |||||
11227 | D2257 | 28/09/1957 | DR | Plymouth Friary | 14/01/1968 | 10.33 | Cut | Pollock and Brown (Southampton) | 07/1968 | 10.80 | |||||
11228 | D2258 | 28/09/1957 | DR | Plymouth Friary | 05/09/1970 | 13 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 0000 | ||||||
11229 | D2259 | 28/09/1957 | DR | Plymouth Friary | 22/12/1968 | 11.25 | Cut | Bowaters (Sittingbourne) | 01/1978 | 20.31 | |||||
D2260 | 10/12/1957 | DR | Bradford Hammerton Street | 24/10/1970 | 12.83 | Cut | P D Fuels (Coed Bach) | 06/1983 | 25.53 | ||||||
D2261 | 12/12/1957 | DR | Bradford Hammerton Street | 15/03/1970 | 12.25 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 08/1970 | 12.68 | ||||||
D2262 | 21/11/1957 | DR | Royston | 23/09/1968 | 10.83 | Cut | Ford Motors (Dagenham) | 07/1978 | 20.66 | ||||||
D2263 | 21/11/1957 | DR | Royston | 06/11/1967 | 10 | Cut | Pollock and Brown (Southampton) | 12/1968 | 11.07 | ||||||
D2264 | 28/12/1957 | DR | Bradford Hammerton Street | 31/12/1969 | 12 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 08/1970 | 12.64 | ||||||
D2265 | 28/12/1957 | DR | Bradford Hammerton Street | 15/03/1970 | 12.25 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 09/1970 | 12.72 | ||||||
D2266 | 09/01/1958 | DR | Royston | 27/11/1967 | 9.83 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 04/1968 | 10.27 | ||||||
D2267 | 20/01/1958 | DR | Royston | 31/12/1969 | 11.92 | Prs | Preserved | 45.26 | |||||||
D2268 | 13/02/1958 | DR | Royston | 10/06/1968 | 10.33 | Cut | T W Ward (Beighton) | 11/1968 | 10.76 | ||||||
D2269 | 13/02/1958 | DR | Royston | 25/08/1968 | 10.5 | Cut | Pounds (at Fratton TMD) | 06/1969 | 11.34 | ||||||
D2270 | 04/03/1958 | DR | Stourton | 13/02/1968 | 9.92 | Cut | Duport Steels (Briton Ferry) | 09/1979 | 21.55 | ||||||
D2271 | 14/03/1958 | DR | Stourton | 26/10/1969 | Bradford Hammerton Street | 11.58 | Prs | Preserved | 65.88 | ||||||
D2272 | 28/03/1958 | DR | Holbeck (MR) | 24/10/1970 | 12.58 | Prs | Preserved | 65.84 | |||||||
D2273 | 18/04/1958 | DR | Holbeck (MR) | 16/10/1967 | 9.5 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 11/1968 | 10.59 |