Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 711 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14117 Week
» 67133 Month
» 186660 Year
» 3213513 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
MR/LMS Johnson "6" Class 0-4-4T
Class |
MR |
MR (1907) |
Built |
Date Withdrawn |
Modification |
Modification Date |
6 |
6
|
1226
|
06/1875 |
29/11/1930 |
18" Cylinders fitted |
05/1900 |
6 |
15
|
1227
|
06/1875 |
01/12/1928 |
18" Cylinders fitted |
11/1913 |
6 |
18
|
1228
|
06/1875 |
31/12/1938 |
18" Cylinders fitted |
06/1901 |
6 |
137
|
1229
|
06/1875 |
19/04/1930 |
18" Cylinders fitted |
08/1903 |
6 |
140
|
1230
|
06/1875 |
01/12/1928 |
18" Cylinders fitted |
10/1902 |
6 |
141
|
1231
|
06/1875 |
06/11/1927 |
18" Cylinders fitted |
08/1897 |
6 |
142
|
1232
|
06/1875 |
31/01/1926 |
18" Cylinders fitted |
09/1896 |
6 |
144
|
1234
|
12/1875 |
06/09/1930 |
18" Cylinders fitted |
03/1900 |
6 |
147
|
1235
|
12/1875 |
23/02/1935 |
18" Cylinders fitted |
06/1900 |