Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 66 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1013 Week
» 19795 Month
» 268088 Year
» 1152469 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

MR/LMS Johnson "1532" Class 0-4-4T


Class MR MR (1907) BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
1532 1532 1266   08/1881 21
21C
18
18
18
18
30
30
25
W
Belle Vue
Cornbrook Junction
Nottingham
Nottingham
Nottingham
Nottingham
Skipton
Skipton
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Withdrawn
08/1881
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
18/05/1935
18/05/1935
1532 1533 1267   08/1881 21
21C
18
18
18
24
24
23
8
W
Belle Vue
Cornbrook Junction
Nottingham
Nottingham
Nottingham
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Hasland
Bristol Barrow Road
Withdrawn
08/1881
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
04/11/1944
04/11/1944
1532 1534 1268   08/1881 21
21C
30
30
30
30
30
W
Belle Vue
Cornbrook Junction
Skipton
Skipton
Skipton
Skipton
Skipton
Withdrawn
08/1881
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
17/05/1925
17/05/1925
1532 1535 1269   09/1881 21
21C
30
30
30
30
30
30
30
W
Belle Vue
Cornbrook Junction
Skipton
Skipton
Skipton
Skipton
Skipton
Skipton
Skipton
Withdrawn
09/1881
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
18/05/1935
18/05/1935
1532 1536 1270   09/1881 21
21C
30
30
30
30
30
W
Belle Vue
Cornbrook Junction
Skipton
Skipton
Skipton
Skipton
Skipton
Withdrawn
09/1881
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
12/07/1925
12/07/1925
1532 1537 1271   10/1881 21
21C
30
30
30
30
30
W
Belle Vue
Cornbrook Junction
Skipton
Skipton
Skipton
Skipton
Skipton
Withdrawn
10/1881
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
06/11/1927
06/11/1927
1532 1538 1272 58039 10/1881 21
29
20
20
20
20
20
M14
M14
15D
W
Belle Vue
Manningham
Buxton (MR)
Buxton (MR)
Buxton (MR)
Buxton (MR)
Buxton (MR)
Bedford
Bedford
Bedford
Withdrawn
10/1881
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
11/1945
30/10/1948
30/10/1948
1532 1539 1273 58040 10/1881 21
29
20
20
20
20
20
M14
M14
15D
23A
20C
15D
15A
W
Belle Vue
Manningham
Buxton (MR)
Buxton (MR)
Buxton (MR)
Buxton (MR)
Buxton (MR)
Bedford
Bedford
Bedford
Skipton
Royston
Bedford
Wellingborough
Withdrawn
10/1881
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
11/1945
07/10/1950
06/09/1952
06/11/1954
01/01/1955
26/03/1955
26/03/1955
1532 1540 1274   11/1881 21
29
28
28
28
28
28
WD
W16
W
Belle Vue
Manningham
Holbeck (MR)
Holbeck (MR)
Holbeck (MR)
Holbeck (MR)
Holbeck (MR)
LNWR Western Division
Longsight
Withdrawn
11/1881
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
01/01/1938
01/01/1938
1532 1541 1275 58041 11/1881 21
29
28
28
28
28
28
W9
30
20F
W
Belle Vue
Manningham
Holbeck (MR)
Holbeck (MR)
Holbeck (MR)
Holbeck (MR)
Holbeck (MR)
Ryecroft (Walsall)
Skipton
Skipton
Withdrawn
11/1881
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
11/1945
22/04/1950
22/04/1950
1532 1542 1276   12/1881 21
29
25
25
28
28
28
WD
W16
W
Belle Vue
Manningham
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Holbeck (MR)
Holbeck (MR)
Holbeck (MR)
LNWR Western Division
Longsight
Withdrawn
12/1881
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
26/03/1938
26/03/1938
1532 1543 1277   12/1881 21
29
29
29
28
28
28
WD
30
20F
W
Belle Vue
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Holbeck (MR)
Holbeck (MR)
Holbeck (MR)
LNWR Western Division
Skipton
Skipton
Withdrawn
12/1881
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
11/1945
18/05/1946
18/05/1946
1532 1544 1278 58042 12/1881 29
29
29
29
29
28
28
W13
W16
9D
W
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Holbeck (MR)
Holbeck (MR)
Bushbury
Longsight
Buxton (LNWR)
Withdrawn
12/1881
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
11/1945
29/12/1951
29/12/1951
1532 1545 1279   12/1881 29
29
29
29
29
28
28
28
28
W
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Holbeck (MR)
Holbeck (MR)
Holbeck (MR)
Holbeck (MR)
Withdrawn
12/1881
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
27/02/1937
27/02/1937
1532 1546 1280   12/1881 29
29
29
29
29
29
29
W
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Withdrawn
12/1881
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
20/04/1924
20/04/1924
1532 1547 1281   02/1882 16
16
16
16
16
16
W
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Withdrawn
02/1882
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
08/1919
08/1919
1532 1548 1282   02/1882 16
16
16
16
16
16
W
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Withdrawn
02/1882
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
04/1920
04/1920
1532 1549 1283   03/1882 16
16
16
16
16
16
16
W
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Withdrawn
03/1882
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
20/06/1926
20/06/1926
1532 1550 1284   04/1882 16
16
16
16
16
16
16
W
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Withdrawn
04/1882
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
24/04/1927
24/04/1927
1532 1551 1285   04/1882 16
16
16
16
16
16
16
M16
W
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Withdrawn
04/1882
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
28/11/1931
28/11/1931
1532 1632 1286   06/1883 25
29
29
29
29
29
29
29
29
19B
W
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Sheffield Millhouses
Withdrawn
06/1883
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
11/1945
10/08/1946
10/08/1946
1532 1633 1287 58043 06/1883 29
29
29
29
29
29
29
29
29
13E
W
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Upminster
Withdrawn
06/1883
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
11/1945
24/02/1951
24/02/1951
1532 1634 1288   07/1883 29
29
29
29
29
29
29
28
W
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Holbeck (MR)
Withdrawn
07/1883
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
28/11/1931
28/11/1931
1532 1635 1289   08/1883 25
29
29
29
29
29
29
29
W
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Withdrawn
08/1883
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
03/10/1931
03/10/1931
1532 1636 1290 58044 07/1883 29
29
29
29
29
29
29
29
29
13A
13E
W
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Plaistow
Upminster
Withdrawn
07/1883
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
11/1945
22/06/1946
17/04/1948
17/04/1948
1532 1637 1291   12/1883 29
29
29
29
29
29
29
29
W
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Withdrawn
12/1883
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
29/11/1930
29/11/1930
1532 1638 1292   12/1883 29
29
29H
29H
29
29
29
29
W
Manningham
Manningham
Starbeck
Starbeck
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Withdrawn
12/1883
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
03/10/1931
03/10/1931
1532 1639 1293   12/1883 29
29
29I
29I
29
29
29
29
29
W
Manningham
Manningham
Ilkley
Ilkley
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Withdrawn
12/1883
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
02/11/1935
02/11/1935
1532 1640 1294   02/1884 29
29
29
29
29
29
16
M16
M15
W
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Cricklewood East
Withdrawn
02/1884
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
20/04/1946
20/04/1946
1532 1641 1295 58045 02/1884 29
29
29
29
29
29
29
29
29
19B
15A
33A
33A
15A
23A
W
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Sheffield Millhouses
Wellingborough
Plaistow
Plaistow
Wellingborough
Skipton
Withdrawn
02/1884
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
11/1945
09/09/1950
25/11/1950
23/12/1950
19/05/1951
17/07/1951
03/11/1951
03/11/1951
1532 1642 1296   02/1884 25
29
29
29
29
29
29
29
29
W
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Withdrawn
02/1884
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
29/01/1938
29/01/1938
1532 1643 1297   02/1884 25
29
29I
29I
29
29
29
M18
M18
16D
W
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Manningham
Ilkley
Ilkley
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Nottingham
Nottingham
Mansfield
Withdrawn
02/1884
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
11/1945
05/10/1946
05/10/1946
1532 1644 1298 58046 03/1884 25
29
29H
29H
29
29
29
29
30
22E
W
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Manningham
Starbeck
Starbeck
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Skipton
Highbridge
Withdrawn
03/1884
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
11/1945
29/12/1951
29/12/1951
1532 1645 1299   03/1884 29
29
29
29
29
29
29
29
W
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Withdrawn
03/1884
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
04/10/1930
04/10/1930
1532 1646 1300   03/1884 29
29
29
29
29
29
18
23
29
W
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Nottingham
Hasland
Manningham
Withdrawn
03/1884
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
18/06/1938
18/06/1938
1532 1647 1301   03/1884 29
29
29I
29I
29
29
18
M18
M18
W
Manningham
Manningham
Ilkley
Ilkley
Manningham
Manningham
Nottingham
Nottingham
Nottingham
Withdrawn
03/1884
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
13/06/1936
13/06/1936
1532 1648 1302   03/1884 18
21HM
18M
18M
18
18
18
M18
M18
15D
W
Nottingham
Heaton Mersey
Mansfield
Mansfield
Nottingham
Nottingham
Nottingham
Nottingham
Nottingham
Bedford
Withdrawn
03/1884
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
11/1945
05/10/1946
05/10/1946
1532 1649 1303 58047 04/1884 8
21HM
18M
18M
18
18
18
M18
6
22B
W
Bristol Barrow Road
Heaton Mersey
Mansfield
Mansfield
Nottingham
Nottingham
Nottingham
Nottingham
Swansea (Upper Bank)
Gloucester Barnwood
Withdrawn
04/1884
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
11/1945
09/08/1952
09/08/1952
1532 1650 1304   04/1884 8
21HM
18M
18M
18
18
9
28
W
Bristol Barrow Road
Heaton Mersey
Mansfield
Mansfield
Nottingham
Nottingham
Spital Bridge
Holbeck (MR)
Withdrawn
04/1884
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
22/03/1930
22/03/1930
1532 1651 1305   04/1884 8
18
18M
18M
18
18


W
Bristol Barrow Road
Nottingham
Mansfield
Mansfield
Nottingham
Nottingham


Withdrawn
04/1884
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
05/09/1931
05/09/1931
1532 1652 1306   05/1884 8
18
18M
18M
18
18
18
M18
M18
W
Bristol Barrow Road
Nottingham
Mansfield
Mansfield
Nottingham
Nottingham
Nottingham
Nottingham
Nottingham
Withdrawn
05/1884
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
18/05/1935
18/05/1935
1532 1653 1307   05/1884 8
18
18M
18M
18
18
18
M18
6
22E
W
Bristol Barrow Road
Nottingham
Mansfield
Mansfield
Nottingham
Nottingham
Nottingham
Nottingham
Swansea (Upper Bank)
Highbridge
Withdrawn
05/1884
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
11/1945
21/02/1948
21/02/1948
1532 1654 1308   06/1884 8
18
18M
18M
18
18
18
W
Bristol Barrow Road
Nottingham
Mansfield
Mansfield
Nottingham
Nottingham
Nottingham
Withdrawn
06/1884
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
25/01/1930
25/01/1930
1532 1655 1309   06/1884 8
18
18M
18M
18
18
18
M18
8
W
Bristol Barrow Road
Nottingham
Mansfield
Mansfield
Nottingham
Nottingham
Nottingham
Nottingham
Bristol Barrow Road
Withdrawn
06/1884
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
01/12/1934
01/12/1934
1532 1656 1310   06/1884 8
18
18M
18M
18
18
18
W
Bristol Barrow Road
Nottingham
Mansfield
Mansfield
Nottingham
Nottingham
Nottingham
Withdrawn
06/1884
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
28/12/1924
28/12/1924
1532 1718 1311   05/1885 16
16
16
16
16
16
16
W
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Withdrawn
05/1885
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
30/11/1924
30/11/1924
1532 1719 1312   05/1885 16
16
16
16
16
16
16
M16
M18
W
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Nottingham
Withdrawn
05/1885
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
13/07/1935
13/07/1935
1532 1720 1313   06/1885 16
16
16
16
16
16
16
M16
M18
W
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Nottingham
Withdrawn
06/1885
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
01/12/1934
01/12/1934
1532 1721 1314   06/1885 16
16
16
16
16
16
16
W
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Withdrawn
06/1885
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
14/06/1925
14/06/1925
1532 1722 1315 58048 06/1885 16
16
16
16
16
16
16
M16
M16
20A
W
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Holbeck (MR)
Withdrawn
06/1885
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
11/1945
05/11/1949
05/11/1949
1532 1723 1316   06/1885 21
16
16
16
16
16
16
W
Belle Vue
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Withdrawn
06/1885
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
09/08/1925
09/08/1925
1532 1724 1317   06/1885 21
16
16
16
16
16
16
M16
W
Belle Vue
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Withdrawn
06/1885
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
12/08/1933
12/08/1933
1532 1725 1318   06/1885 21
16
16
16
16
16
16
W
Belle Vue
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Withdrawn
06/1885
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
22/02/1930
22/02/1930
1532 1726 1319   06/1885 21
16
16
16
16
16
16
W
Belle Vue
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Withdrawn
06/1885
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
01/1924
01/1924
1532 1727 1320   06/1885 21
16
16
16
16
16
16
M16
W
Belle Vue
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Withdrawn
06/1885
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
26/12/1931
26/12/1931
1532 1728 1321   03/1886 16
10
16
16
16
16
16
M16
M16
W
Kentish Town
Leicester Midland
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Withdrawn
03/1886
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
01/12/1934
01/12/1934
1532 1729 1322 58049 03/1886 3W
10
3B
3B
3
3
4
4
22E
W
Walsall Pleck
Leicester Midland
Bournville
Bournville
Saltley
Saltley
Worcester (MR)
Worcester (MR)
Highbridge
Withdrawn
03/1886
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
11/1945
25/03/1950
25/03/1950
1532 1730 1323   03/1886 8
3
3B
3B
3
3
3
W
Bristol Barrow Road
Saltley
Bournville
Bournville
Saltley
Saltley
Saltley
Withdrawn
03/1886
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
12/07/1925
12/07/1925
1532 1731 1324 58050 03/1886 8Th
7S
3B
3B
3
3
3
7
7
22C
13A
W
Thornbury
Stroud
Bournville
Bournville
Saltley
Saltley
Saltley
Gloucester Barnwood
Gloucester Barnwood
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Plaistow
Withdrawn
03/1886
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
11/1945
22/06/1946
21/02/1953
21/02/1953
1532 1732 1325   04/1886 3R
7S
3B
3B
3
18
18
M18
M18
W
Redditch
Stroud
Bournville
Bournville
Saltley
Nottingham
Nottingham
Nottingham
Nottingham
Withdrawn
04/1886
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
11/09/1937
11/09/1937
1532 1733 1326   04/1886 3
3B
3B
3
23
24
23
W
Saltley
Bournville
Bournville
Saltley
Hasland
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Hasland
Withdrawn
04/1886
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
29/11/1930
29/11/1930
1532 1734 1327   05/1886 3R
5
3R
3R
3
3
3
20
M1
W
Redditch
Brecon
Redditch
Redditch
Saltley
Saltley
Saltley
Buxton (MR)
Derby
Withdrawn
05/1886
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
20/04/1940
20/04/1940
1532 1735 1328   05/1886 3R
5
3W
3W
3
3
3
8
W
Redditch
Brecon
Walsall Pleck
Walsall Pleck
Saltley
Saltley
Saltley
Bristol Barrow Road
Withdrawn
05/1886
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
28/11/1931
28/11/1931
1532 1736 1329   05/1886 4M
5
5
13
13
28
28
W
Malvern (MR)
Brecon
Brecon
Wellingborough
Wellingborough
Holbeck (MR)
Holbeck (MR)
Withdrawn
05/1886
04/1892
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
13/07/1935
13/07/1935
1532 1737 1330 58051 05/1886 10B
6
5
5
4
4
4
4
7
22B
22B
71J
W
Bourne
Swansea (Upper Bank)
Brecon
Brecon
Worcester (MR)
Worcester (MR)
Worcester (MR)
Worcester (MR)
Gloucester Barnwood
Gloucester Barnwood
Gloucester Barnwood
Highbridge
Withdrawn
05/1886
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
11/1945
04/11/1950
06/09/1952
03/11/1956
03/11/1956
1532 1823 1331   04/1889 8B
8B
8B
8B
8
8
5
9
W
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Bristol Barrow Road
Bristol Barrow Road
Brecon
Spital Bridge
Withdrawn
04/1889
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
28/11/1931
28/11/1931
1532 1824 1332   05/1889 8
8B
8
8
8
8
2
25
W
Bristol Barrow Road
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Bristol Barrow Road
Bristol Barrow Road
Bristol Barrow Road
Bristol Barrow Road
Burton
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Withdrawn
05/1889
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
05/09/1931
05/09/1931
1532 1825 1333   05/1889 8
8Th
8
8
8
8
2
25
W
Bristol Barrow Road
Thornbury
Bristol Barrow Road
Bristol Barrow Road
Bristol Barrow Road
Bristol Barrow Road
Burton
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Withdrawn
05/1889
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
26/12/1931
26/12/1931
1532 1826 1334   05/1889 8
8
8
8
8
8
8
8
8
22C
W
Bristol Barrow Road
Bristol Barrow Road
Bristol Barrow Road
Bristol Barrow Road
Bristol Barrow Road
Bristol Barrow Road
Bristol Barrow Road
Bristol Barrow Road
Bristol Barrow Road
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Withdrawn
05/1889
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
11/1945
02/11/1946
02/11/1946
1532 1827 1335   05/1889 8
8
8
8
8
8
3
W
Bristol Barrow Road
Bristol Barrow Road
Bristol Barrow Road
Bristol Barrow Road
Bristol Barrow Road
Bristol Barrow Road
Saltley
Withdrawn
05/1889
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
12/07/1925
12/07/1925
1532 1828 1336   05/1889 8
8
8
8
8
8
8
8
W
Bristol Barrow Road
Bristol Barrow Road
Bristol Barrow Road
Bristol Barrow Road
Bristol Barrow Road
Bristol Barrow Road
Bristol Barrow Road
Bristol Barrow Road
Withdrawn
05/1889
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
28/11/1931
28/11/1931
1532 1829 1337 58052 05/1889 8
8
8
8
8
8
8
8
8
17A
W
Bristol Barrow Road
Bristol Barrow Road
Bristol Barrow Road
Bristol Barrow Road
Bristol Barrow Road
Bristol Barrow Road
Bristol Barrow Road
Bristol Barrow Road
Bristol Barrow Road
Derby
Withdrawn
05/1889
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
11/1945
21/04/1951
21/04/1951
1532 1830 1338   05/1889 8
8
8
8
8
8
8
8
8
21A
W
Bristol Barrow Road
Bristol Barrow Road
Bristol Barrow Road
Bristol Barrow Road
Bristol Barrow Road
Bristol Barrow Road
Bristol Barrow Road
Bristol Barrow Road
Bristol Barrow Road
Saltley
Withdrawn
05/1889
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
11/1945
05/10/1947
05/10/1947
1532 1831 1339   05/1889 1
8
8
8
8
8
8
8
W
Derby
Bristol Barrow Road
Bristol Barrow Road
Bristol Barrow Road
Bristol Barrow Road
Bristol Barrow Road
Bristol Barrow Road
Bristol Barrow Road
Withdrawn
05/1889
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
26/12/1931
26/12/1931
1532 1832 1340 58053 05/1889 1
4M
8
8
8
18
18
M18
M18
15A
15A
17B
W
Derby
Malvern (MR)
Bristol Barrow Road
Bristol Barrow Road
Bristol Barrow Road
Nottingham
Nottingham
Nottingham
Nottingham
Wellingborough
Wellingborough
Burton
Withdrawn
05/1889
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
11/1945
16/07/1949
29/11/1952
21/02/1953
21/02/1953
1532 1322 1341 58054 02/1892 18M
21
18M
18M
18
18
18
M18
M18
16D
15C
15D
15A
W
Mansfield
Belle Vue
Mansfield
Mansfield
Nottingham
Nottingham
Nottingham
Nottingham
Nottingham
Mansfield
Leicester Midland
Bedford
Wellingborough
Withdrawn
02/1892
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
11/1945
17/06/1950
09/09/1950
17/07/1951
03/12/1955
03/12/1955
1532 1323 1342 58055 02/1892 18M
21
18M
18M
18
18
18
M18
M18
19B
W
Mansfield
Belle Vue
Mansfield
Mansfield
Nottingham
Nottingham
Nottingham
Nottingham
Nottingham
Sheffield Millhouses
Withdrawn
02/1892
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
11/1945
12/06/1948
12/06/1948
1532 1324 1343   02/1892 18M
21
18M
18M
18
18
18
M18
C6
W
Mansfield
Belle Vue
Mansfield
Mansfield
Nottingham
Nottingham
Nottingham
Nottingham
Wakefield
Withdrawn
02/1892
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
22/05/1937
22/05/1937
1532 1325 1344 58056 03/1892 18M
18M
18M
18M
18
18
18
M18
M18
16A
W
Mansfield
Mansfield
Mansfield
Mansfield
Nottingham
Nottingham
Nottingham
Nottingham
Nottingham
Nottingham
Withdrawn
03/1892
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
11/1945
11/09/1954
11/09/1954
1532 1326 1345   03/1892 18M
18M
18M
18M
18
18
18
M18
W
Mansfield
Mansfield
Mansfield
Mansfield
Nottingham
Nottingham
Nottingham
Nottingham
Withdrawn
03/1892
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
26/12/1931
26/12/1931
1532 202 1346   02/1892 18
18M
18M
18M
18
18
18
M18
6
22E
W
Nottingham
Mansfield
Mansfield
Mansfield
Nottingham
Nottingham
Nottingham
Nottingham
Swansea (Upper Bank)
Highbridge
Withdrawn
02/1892
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
11/1945
30/11/1947
30/11/1947
1532 1428 1347   03/1892 18M
18M
18M
18M
18
18
18
M18
M18
W
Mansfield
Mansfield
Mansfield
Mansfield
Nottingham
Nottingham
Nottingham
Nottingham
Nottingham
Withdrawn
03/1892
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
01/12/1934
01/12/1934
1532 1429 1348 58057 03/1892 18M
18M
18M
18M
18
18
18
M18
3
22C
W
Mansfield
Mansfield
Mansfield
Mansfield
Nottingham
Nottingham
Nottingham
Nottingham
Saltley
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Withdrawn
03/1892
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
11/1945
21/05/1949
21/05/1949
1532 1430 1349   03/1892 18M
7
18M
18M
18
18
18
M18
W
Mansfield
Gloucester Barnwood
Mansfield
Mansfield
Nottingham
Nottingham
Nottingham
Nottingham
Withdrawn
03/1892
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
28/11/1931
28/11/1931
1532 1697 1350 58058 03/1892 18
18M
18
18
18
M18
6
16D
17B
W
Nottingham
Mansfield
Nottingham
Nottingham
Nottingham
Nottingham
Swansea (Upper Bank)
Mansfield
Burton
Withdrawn
03/1892
04/1892
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
11/1945
22/03/1952
01/11/1952
01/11/1952
1532 1833 1351   01/1892 29
29
29
29
29
29
29
25
W
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Withdrawn
01/1892
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
25/02/1933
25/02/1933
1532 1834 1352   01/1892 29
29
29
29
29
29
29
25
W
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Withdrawn
01/1892
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
26/12/1931
26/12/1931
1532 1835 1353 58059 02/1892 29
29
29
29
29
29
29
29
29
22B
W
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Gloucester Barnwood
Withdrawn
02/1892
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
11/1945
07/10/1950
07/10/1950
1532 1836 1354   02/1892 29
29
29
29
29
29
29
29
29
W
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Withdrawn
02/1892
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
13/07/1935
13/07/1935
1532 1837 1355   02/1892 29
29
29
29
29
29
29
29
28
W
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Holbeck (MR)
Withdrawn
02/1892
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
22/02/1936
22/02/1936
1532 1838 1356   02/1892 29
29
29
29
29
29
29
29
29
W
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Withdrawn
02/1892
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
02/11/1935
02/11/1935
1532 1839 1357 58060 02/1892 29
29
29
29
29
29
29
29
2
17B
23A
20A
20C
W
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Burton
Burton
Skipton
Holbeck (MR)
Royston
Withdrawn
02/1892
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
11/1945
17/06/1950
09/09/1950
19/05/1951
12/07/1952
12/07/1952
1532 1840 1358 58061 02/1892 29
29
29
29
29
29
29
29
25
20H
W
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Lancaster Green Ayre
Withdrawn
02/1892
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
11/1945
02/12/1950
02/12/1950
1532 1841 1359   02/1892 29
29
29
29
29
29
29
W
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Withdrawn
02/1892
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
29/12/1928
29/12/1928
1532 1842 1360 58062 02/1892 29
29
29
29
29
29
29
29
M18
13A
W
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Manningham
Nottingham
Plaistow
Withdrawn
02/1892
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
11/1945
24/03/1956
24/03/1956
1532 2013 1361   04/1892 7
7
7
7
7
7
7
3
17A
W
Gloucester Barnwood
Gloucester Barnwood
Gloucester Barnwood
Gloucester Barnwood
Gloucester Barnwood
Gloucester Barnwood
Gloucester Barnwood
Saltley
Derby
Withdrawn
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
11/1945
21/02/1948
21/02/1948
1532 2014 1362   04/1892 7
7T
7T
7
7
7
7
W
Gloucester Barnwood
Tewkesbury
Tewkesbury
Gloucester Barnwood
Gloucester Barnwood
Gloucester Barnwood
Gloucester Barnwood
Withdrawn
04/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
06/09/1930
06/09/1930
1532 2015 1363   05/1892 7
7
7
7
7
7
7
7
W
Gloucester Barnwood
Gloucester Barnwood
Gloucester Barnwood
Gloucester Barnwood
Gloucester Barnwood
Gloucester Barnwood
Gloucester Barnwood
Gloucester Barnwood
Withdrawn
05/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
22/05/1937
22/05/1937
1532 2016 1364   05/1892 7
7
7
7
7
7
8
8
W
Gloucester Barnwood
Gloucester Barnwood
Gloucester Barnwood
Gloucester Barnwood
Gloucester Barnwood
Gloucester Barnwood
Bristol Barrow Road
Bristol Barrow Road
Withdrawn
05/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
18/06/1938
18/06/1938
1532 2017 1365 58063 05/1892 7
10
10
10
10
10
4
7
22B
W
Gloucester Barnwood
Leicester Midland
Leicester Midland
Leicester Midland
Leicester Midland
Leicester Midland
Worcester (MR)
Gloucester Barnwood
Gloucester Barnwood
Withdrawn
05/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
11/1945
16/06/1951
16/06/1951
1532 2018 1366 58064 05/1892 10C
10C
10C
10
10
10
20
30
20F
W
Coalville
Coalville
Coalville
Leicester Midland
Leicester Midland
Leicester Midland
Buxton (MR)
Skipton
Skipton
Withdrawn
05/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
11/1945
25/02/1950
25/02/1950
1532 2019 1367 58065 05/1892 10
10
10
10
10
10
M10
M10
21A
36E
40A
W
Leicester Midland
Leicester Midland
Leicester Midland
Leicester Midland
Leicester Midland
Leicester Midland
Leicester Midland
Leicester Midland
Saltley
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Lincoln
Withdrawn
05/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
11/1945
21/01/1956
10/01/1959
31/10/1959
31/10/1959
1532 2020 1368 58066 05/1892 10
10
10
10
10
10
M10
25
20C
20G
20F
20C
W
Leicester Midland
Leicester Midland
Leicester Midland
Leicester Midland
Leicester Midland
Leicester Midland
Leicester Midland
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Royston
Hellifield
Skipton
Royston
Withdrawn
05/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
11/1945
31/10/1953
30/01/1954
24/04/1954
04/10/1958
04/10/1958
1532 2021 1369   05/1892 10
10C
10C
10
10
10
M10
M14
W
Leicester Midland
Coalville
Coalville
Leicester Midland
Leicester Midland
Leicester Midland
Leicester Midland
Bedford
Withdrawn
05/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
18/04/1936
18/04/1936
1532 2022 1370 58067 05/1892 14H
10
10
10
10
10
M10
6
17A
W
Hitchin (MR)
Leicester Midland
Leicester Midland
Leicester Midland
Leicester Midland
Leicester Midland
Leicester Midland
Swansea (Upper Bank)
Derby
Withdrawn
05/1892
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
11/1945
21/02/1953
21/02/1953
1532 2218 1371 58068 08/1893 15
15
15
15
16
16
M16
M16
22E
W
Cricklewood East
Cricklewood East
Cricklewood East
Cricklewood East
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Highbridge
Withdrawn
08/1893
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
11/1945
31/10/1953
31/10/1953
1532 2219 1372   08/1893 15
15
15
15
16
25
W
Cricklewood East
Cricklewood East
Cricklewood East
Cricklewood East
Kentish Town
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Withdrawn
08/1893
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
25/01/1930
25/01/1930
1532 2220 1373 58069 08/1893 15
15
15
15
16
15
M16
M18
17A
W
Cricklewood East
Cricklewood East
Cricklewood East
Cricklewood East
Kentish Town
Cricklewood East
Kentish Town
Nottingham
Derby
Withdrawn
08/1893
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
11/1945
17/05/1952
17/05/1952
1532 2221 1374   09/1893 15
15
15
15
16
15
M16
M16
14B
W
Cricklewood East
Cricklewood East
Cricklewood East
Cricklewood East
Kentish Town
Cricklewood East
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Withdrawn
09/1893
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
11/1945
02/11/1946
02/11/1946
1532 2222 1375 58070 09/1893 15
15
15
16
16
15
M15
M1
22B
W
Cricklewood East
Cricklewood East
Cricklewood East
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Cricklewood East
Cricklewood East
Derby
Gloucester Barnwood
Withdrawn
09/1893
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
11/1945
21/02/1953
21/02/1953
1532 2223 1376   09/1893 15
15
15
16
16
15
M15
M16
W
Cricklewood East
Cricklewood East
Cricklewood East
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Cricklewood East
Cricklewood East
Kentish Town
Withdrawn
09/1893
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
05/09/1936
05/09/1936
1532 2224 1377 58071 09/1893 15
15
15
16
16
16
M15
M15
14B
22B
W
Cricklewood East
Cricklewood East
Cricklewood East
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Cricklewood East
Cricklewood East
Kentish Town
Gloucester Barnwood
Withdrawn
09/1893
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
11/1945
17/07/1951
14/07/1956
14/07/1956
1532 2225 1378   09/1893 15
15
15
15
16
16
M16
M16
W
Cricklewood East
Cricklewood East
Cricklewood East
Cricklewood East
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Withdrawn
09/1893
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
03/11/1945
03/11/1945
1532 2226 1379 58072 09/1893 15
15
15
16
16
15
M16
M18
14B
15C
71J
W
Cricklewood East
Cricklewood East
Cricklewood East
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Cricklewood East
Kentish Town
Nottingham
Kentish Town
Leicester Midland
Highbridge
Withdrawn
09/1893
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
11/1945
09/09/1950
19/03/1952
03/11/1956
03/11/1956
1532 2227 1380   09/1893 15
15
15
15
16
15
M15
M16
14B
W
Cricklewood East
Cricklewood East
Cricklewood East
Cricklewood East
Kentish Town
Cricklewood East
Cricklewood East
Kentish Town
Kentish Town
Withdrawn
09/1893
01/1899
12/1902
05/1908
04/1914
12/1921
03/1930
09/1933
11/1945
05/10/1946
05/10/1946