Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 216 Today
» 1073 Yesterday
» 216 Week
» 11787 Month
» 260080 Year
» 1144461 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

MR/LMS Johnson "1532" Class 0-4-4T


MR MR (1907) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
1532 1266 08/1881 Belle Vue 18/05/1935 53.75
1533 1267 08/1881 Belle Vue 04/11/1944 63.25
1534 1268 08/1881 Belle Vue 17/05/1925 43.75
1535 1269 09/1881 Belle Vue 18/05/1935 53.67
1536 1270 09/1881 Belle Vue 12/07/1925 43.83
1537 1271 10/1881 Belle Vue 06/11/1927 46.08
1538 1272 58039 10/1881 Belle Vue 30/10/1948 67
1539 1273 58040 10/1881 Belle Vue 26/03/1955 73.42
1540 1274 11/1881 Belle Vue 01/01/1938 56.17
1541 1275 58041 11/1881 Belle Vue 22/04/1950 68.42
1542 1276 12/1881 Belle Vue 26/03/1938 56.25
1543 1277 12/1881 Belle Vue 18/05/1946 64.42
1544 1278 58042 12/1881 Manningham 29/12/1951 70
1545 1279 12/1881 Manningham 27/02/1937 55.17
1546 1280 12/1881 Manningham 20/04/1924 42.33
1547 1281 02/1882 Kentish Town 08/1919 37.5
1548 1282 02/1882 Kentish Town 04/1920 38.17
1549 1283 03/1882 Kentish Town 20/06/1926 44.25
1550 1284 04/1882 Kentish Town 24/04/1927 45
1551 1285 04/1882 Kentish Town 28/11/1931 49.58
1632 1286 06/1883 Sheffield Grimesthorpe 10/08/1946 63.17
1633 1287 58043 06/1883 Manningham 24/02/1951 67.67
1634 1288 07/1883 Manningham 28/11/1931 48.33
1635 1289 08/1883 Sheffield Grimesthorpe 03/10/1931 48.17
1636 1290 58044 07/1883 Manningham 17/04/1948 64.75
1637 1291 12/1883 Manningham 29/11/1930 46.92
1638 1292 12/1883 Manningham 03/10/1931 47.83
1639 1293 12/1883 Manningham 02/11/1935 51.92
1640 1294 02/1884 Manningham 20/04/1946 62.17
1641 1295 58045 02/1884 Manningham 03/11/1951 67.75
1642 1296 02/1884 Sheffield Grimesthorpe 29/01/1938 53.92
1643 1297 02/1884 Sheffield Grimesthorpe 05/10/1946 62.67
1644 1298 58046 03/1884 Sheffield Grimesthorpe 29/12/1951 67.75
1645 1299 03/1884 Manningham 04/10/1930 46.58
1646 1300 03/1884 Manningham 18/06/1938 54.25
1647 1301 03/1884 Manningham 13/06/1936 52.25
1648 1302 03/1884 Nottingham 05/10/1946 62.58
1649 1303 58047 04/1884 Bristol Barrow Road 09/08/1952 68.33
1650 1304 04/1884 Bristol Barrow Road 22/03/1930 45.92
1651 1305 04/1884 Bristol Barrow Road 05/09/1931 47.42
1652 1306 05/1884 Bristol Barrow Road 18/05/1935 51
1653 1307 05/1884 Bristol Barrow Road 21/02/1948 63.75
1654 1308 06/1884 Bristol Barrow Road 25/01/1930 45.58
1655 1309 06/1884 Bristol Barrow Road 01/12/1934 50.5
1656 1310 06/1884 Bristol Barrow Road 28/12/1924 40.5
1718 1311 05/1885 Kentish Town 30/11/1924 39.5
1719 1312 05/1885 Kentish Town 13/07/1935 50.17
1720 1313 06/1885 Kentish Town 01/12/1934 49.5
1721 1314 06/1885 Kentish Town 14/06/1925 40
1722 1315 58048 06/1885 Kentish Town 05/11/1949 64.42
1723 1316 06/1885 Belle Vue 09/08/1925 40.17
1724 1317 06/1885 Belle Vue 12/08/1933 48.17
1725 1318 06/1885 Belle Vue 22/02/1930 44.67
1726 1319 06/1885 Belle Vue 01/1924 38.58
1727 1320 06/1885 Belle Vue 26/12/1931 46.5
1728 1321 03/1886 Kentish Town 01/12/1934 48.75
1729 1322 58049 03/1886 Walsall Pleck 25/03/1950 64
1730 1323 03/1886 Bristol Barrow Road 12/07/1925 39.33
1731 1324 58050 03/1886 Thornbury 21/02/1953 66.92
1732 1325 04/1886 Redditch 11/09/1937 51.42
1733 1326 04/1886 29/11/1930 44.58
1734 1327 05/1886 Redditch 20/04/1940 53.92
1735 1328 05/1886 Redditch 28/11/1931 45.5
1736 1329 05/1886 Malvern (MR) 13/07/1935 49.17
1737 1330 58051 05/1886 Bourne 03/11/1956 70.5
1823 1331 04/1889 Bath Green Park (S&D) 28/11/1931 42.58
1824 1332 05/1889 Bristol Barrow Road 05/09/1931 42.33
1825 1333 05/1889 Bristol Barrow Road 26/12/1931 42.58
1826 1334 05/1889 Bristol Barrow Road 02/11/1946 57.5
1827 1335 05/1889 Bristol Barrow Road 12/07/1925 36.17
1828 1336 05/1889 Bristol Barrow Road 28/11/1931 42.5
1829 1337 58052 05/1889 Bristol Barrow Road 21/04/1951 61.92
1830 1338 05/1889 Bristol Barrow Road 05/10/1947 58.42
1831 1339 05/1889 Derby 26/12/1931 42.58
1832 1340 58053 05/1889 Derby 21/02/1953 63.75
1322 1341 58054 02/1892 Mansfield 03/12/1955 63.83
1323 1342 58055 02/1892 Mansfield 12/06/1948 56.33
1324 1343 02/1892 Mansfield 22/05/1937 45.25
1325 1344 58056 03/1892 Mansfield 11/09/1954 62.5
1326 1345 03/1892 Mansfield 26/12/1931 39.75
202 1346 02/1892 Nottingham 30/11/1947 55.75
1428 1347 03/1892 Mansfield 01/12/1934 42.75
1429 1348 58057 03/1892 Mansfield 21/05/1949 57.17
1430 1349 03/1892 Mansfield 28/11/1931 39.67
1697 1350 58058 03/1892 Nottingham 01/11/1952 60.67
1833 1351 01/1892 Manningham 25/02/1933 41.08
1834 1352 01/1892 Manningham 26/12/1931 39.92
1835 1353 58059 02/1892 Manningham 07/10/1950 58.67
1836 1354 02/1892 Manningham 13/07/1935 43.42
1837 1355 02/1892 Manningham 22/02/1936 44
1838 1356 02/1892 Manningham 02/11/1935 43.75
1839 1357 58060 02/1892 Manningham 12/07/1952 60.42
1840 1358 58061 02/1892 Manningham 02/12/1950 58.83
1841 1359 02/1892 Manningham 29/12/1928 36.83
1842 1360 58062 02/1892 Manningham 24/03/1956 64.08
2013 1361 04/1892 Gloucester Barnwood 21/02/1948 55.83
2014 1362 04/1892 Gloucester Barnwood 06/09/1930 38.42
2015 1363 05/1892 Gloucester Barnwood 22/05/1937 45
2016 1364 05/1892 Gloucester Barnwood 18/06/1938 46.08
2017 1365 58063 05/1892 Gloucester Barnwood 16/06/1951 59.08
2018 1366 58064 05/1892 Coalville 25/02/1950 57.75
2019 1367 58065 05/1892 Leicester Midland 31/10/1959 67.42
2020 1368 58066 05/1892 Leicester Midland 04/10/1958 66.42
2021 1369 05/1892 Leicester Midland 18/04/1936 43.92
2022 1370 58067 05/1892 Hitchin (MR) 21/02/1953 60.75
2218 1371 58068 08/1893 Cricklewood East 31/10/1953 60.17
2219 1372 08/1893 Cricklewood East 25/01/1930 36.42
2220 1373 58069 08/1893 Cricklewood East 17/05/1952 58.75
2221 1374 09/1893 Cricklewood East 02/11/1946 53.17
2222 1375 58070 09/1893 Cricklewood East 21/02/1953 59.42
2223 1376 09/1893 Cricklewood East 05/09/1936 43
2224 1377 58071 09/1893 Cricklewood East 14/07/1956 62.83
2225 1378 09/1893 Cricklewood East 03/11/1945 52.17
2226 1379 58072 09/1893 Cricklewood East 03/11/1956 63.17
2227 1380 09/1893 Cricklewood East 05/10/1946 53.08