MR/LMS Johnson "2228" Class 0-4-4T
MR | MR (1907) | BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2228 | 1381 | 03/1895 | Kentish Town | 02/12/1933 | 38.75 | ||||||
2229 | 1382 | 58073 | 04/1895 | Kentish Town | 28/01/1956 | 60.75 | |||||
2230 | 1383 | 04/1895 | Kentish Town | 28/11/1931 | 36.58 | ||||||
2231 | 1384 | 04/1895 | Kentish Town | 26/12/1931 | 36.67 | ||||||
2232 | 1385 | 05/1895 | Kentish Town | 24/01/1948 | 52.67 | ||||||
2255 | 1386 | 02/1895 | Saltley | 26/12/1931 | 36.83 | ||||||
2234 | 1387 | 02/1895 | Brecon | 29/01/1938 | 42.92 | ||||||
2235 | 1388 | 02/1895 | Brecon | 03/11/1934 | 39.75 | ||||||
2236 | 1389 | 58074 | 02/1895 | Brecon | 02/10/1948 | 53.67 | |||||
2237 | 1390 | 58075 | 02/1895 | Saltley | 03/10/1953 | 58.67 | |||||
2238 | 1391 | 02/1895 | Mansfield | 02/11/1935 | 40.75 | ||||||
2259 | 1392 | 02/1895 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 31/12/1938 | 43.83 | ||||||
2240 | 1393 | 02/1895 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 09/09/1944 | 49.58 | ||||||
2241 | 1394 | 02/1895 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 30/12/1939 | 44.83 | ||||||
2242 | 1395 | 03/1895 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 20/04/1946 | 51.08 | ||||||
2243 | 1396 | 58076 | 03/1895 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 21/02/1953 | 57.92 | |||||
2244 | 1397 | 58077 | 03/1895 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 08/10/1955 | 60.58 | |||||
2245 | 1398 | 03/1895 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 01/12/1934 | 39.75 | ||||||
2246 | 1399 | 03/1895 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 03/10/1931 | 36.58 | ||||||
2247 | 1400 | 03/1895 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 09/10/1937 | 42.58 | ||||||
690 | 1401 | 02/1898 | Mansfield | 05/10/1946 | 48.67 | ||||||
691 | 1402 | 58078 | 02/1898 | Mansfield | 21/05/1949 | 51.25 | |||||
692 | 1403 | 02/1898 | Mansfield | 02/11/1946 | 48.75 | ||||||
695 | 1404 | 03/1898 | Mansfield | 07/09/1947 | 49.5 | ||||||
694 | 1405 | 03/1898 | Mansfield | 13/07/1935 | 37.33 | ||||||
695 | 1406 | 58079 | 04/1898 | Mansfield | 09/09/1950 | 52.42 | |||||
780 | 1407 | 04/1898 | Mansfield | 18/05/1946 | 48.08 | ||||||
781 | 1408 | 04/1898 | Mansfield | 30/11/1947 | 49.58 | ||||||
782 | 1409 | 05/1898 | Mansfield | 02/11/1946 | 48.5 | ||||||
783 | 1410 | 05/1898 | Mansfield | 01/01/1938 | 39.67 | ||||||
2611 | 1411 | 58080 | 06/1900 | Skipton | 28/01/1956 | 55.58 | |||||
2612 | 1412 | 06/1900 | Skipton | 28/11/1931 | 31.42 | ||||||
2613 | 1413 | 58081 | 06/1900 | Skipton | 04/09/1948 | 48.25 | |||||
2614 | 1414 | 06/1900 | Skipton | 01/12/1934 | 34.5 | ||||||
2615 | 1415 | 06/1900 | Skipton | 23/02/1935 | 34.67 | ||||||
2616 | 1416 | 58082 | 07/1900 | Skipton | 22/04/1950 | 49.75 | |||||
2617 | 1417 | 07/1900 | Lancaster Green Ayre | 30/12/1939 | 39.42 | ||||||
2618 | 1418 | 07/1900 | Lancaster Green Ayre | 13/07/1935 | 35 | ||||||
2619 | 1419 | 07/1900 | Lancaster Green Ayre | 29/11/1930 | 30.33 | ||||||
2620 | 1420 | 58083 | 07/1900 | Lancaster Green Ayre | 05/10/1957 | 57.25 | |||||
2621 | 1421 | 58084 | 08/1900 | Brecon | 26/02/1955 | 54.5 | |||||
2622 | 1422 | 58085 | 08/1900 | Brecon | 18/04/1959 | 58.67 | |||||
2623 | 1423 | 58086 | 08/1900 | Brecon | 05/08/1960 | 60 | |||||
2624 | 1424 | 58087 | 08/1900 | Swansea (Upper Bank) | 16/07/1955 | 54.92 | |||||
2625 | 1425 | 58088 | 08/1900 | St Albans | 21/03/1953 | 52.58 | |||||
2626 | 1426 | 58089 | 09/1900 | Cricklewood East | 06/11/1954 | 54.17 | |||||
2627 | 1427 | 09/1900 | St Albans | 13/07/1935 | 34.83 | ||||||
2628 | 1428 | 09/1900 | Derby | 28/12/1946 | 46.25 | ||||||
2629 | 1429 | 58090 | 09/1900 | Derby | 21/03/1953 | 52.5 | |||||
2630 | 1430 | 58091 | 09/1900 | Bourne | 03/11/1956 | 56.17 |