Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 931 Today
» 1090 Yesterday
» 3246 Week
» 31204 Month
» 65846 Year
» 1287411 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LYR/LMS Aspinall "5" Class 2-4-2T


Class LYR LMS BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
LYR5 1008 10621 50621 02/1899 20D
W
Normanton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/1954
09/1954
LYR5 1009 10622 50622 03/1899 20A
W
Holbeck (MR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/1952
08/1952
LYR5 1010 10623 50623 03/1899 20F
20E
W
Skipton
Manningham
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/12/1949
06/1952
06/1952
LYR5 1012 10625 50625 03/1910 20G
W
Hellifield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/08/1952
09/08/1952
LYR5 1017 10630 50630 07/1899 20E
W
Manningham
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/1950
10/1950
LYR5 1033 10631 50631 04/1890 20E
W
Manningham
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/11/1948
20/11/1948
LYR5 1036 10633 50633 05/1890 20E
W
Manningham
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/1952
06/1952
LYR5 1037 10634 50634 06/1890 20E
W
Manningham
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/1952
10/1952
LYR5 1039 10636 50636 06/1890 20E
W
Manningham
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/1957
07/1957
LYR5 1042 10639 50639 07/1890 10B
W
Preston
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/1952
05/1952
LYR5 1043 10640 50640 07/1890 24F
27C
W
Fleetwood
Southport
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/07/1951
04/1952
04/1952
LYR5 1045 10642 50642 08/1890 26C
W
Bolton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/1951
03/1951
LYR5 1046 10643 50643 08/1890 11B
10D
10B
8B
W
Barrow in Furness
Plodder Lane
Preston
Warrington Dallam
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/10/1951
14/06/1952
28/11/1953
10/1958
10/1958
LYR5 1047 10644 50644 08/1890 11B
10B
8B
W
Barrow in Furness
Preston
Warrington Dallam
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/07/1952
21/03/1953
10/1958
10/1958
LYR5 1049 10646 50646 08/1890 26C
27B
26C
20C
15D
W
Bolton
Aintree
Bolton
Royston
Bedford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/01/1951
24/03/1951
09/10/1954
25/02/1956
11/1958
11/1958
LYR5 1052 10647 50647 09/1890 25A
24F
26D
24B
26D
26C
26E
26D
26C
W
Wakefield
Fleetwood
Bury
Rose Grove
Bury
Bolton
Bacup
Bury
Bolton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/12/1949
24/03/1951
19/05/1951
16/06/1951
22/03/1952
04/10/1952
06/11/1954
26/02/1955
02/1959
02/1959
LYR5 1157 10648 50648 04/1892 23B
26C
26E
26C
24B
27B
24B
W
Aintree
Bolton
Bacup
Bolton
Rose Grove
Aintree
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/10/1951
14/06/1952
12/07/1952
08/08/1953
30/01/1954
27/03/1954
11/1955
11/1955
LYR5 1159 10650 50650 05/1892 25A
26E
26C
26C
20C
15A
W
Wakefield
Bacup
Bolton
Bolton
Royston
Wellingborough
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/12/1950
14/06/1952
03/10/1953
06/11/1954
25/02/1956
10/1956
10/1956
LYR5 1160 10651 50651 05/1892 26E
26D
27B
26D
24B
W
Bacup
Bury
Aintree
Bury
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/03/1951
16/06/1951
11/08/1951
14/06/1952
12/1955
12/1955
LYR5 1161 10652 50652 05/1892 26E
27B
26E
27B
24B
W
Bacup
Aintree
Bacup
Aintree
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/02/1951
24/03/1951
19/05/1951
16/06/1951
13/10/1956
13/10/1956
LYR5 1162 10653 50653 05/1892 24B
W
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/1956
02/1956
LYR5 1163 10654 50654 06/1892 24B
W
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/1951
04/1951
LYR5 1164 10655 50655 06/1892 23B
26D
24B
26C
24B
W
Aintree
Bury
Rose Grove
Bolton
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/06/1951
14/06/1952
05/11/1955
25/02/1956
08/1956
08/1956
LYR5 1065 10656 50656 06/1892 25A
26E
26D
24B
26C
W
Wakefield
Bacup
Bury
Rose Grove
Bolton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/12/1950
24/03/1951
21/03/1953
11/09/1954
03/1955
03/1955
LYR5 1168 10660 50660 07/1892 23B
26E
W
Aintree
Bacup
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/11/1950
03/1958
03/1958
LYR5 323 10665 50665 07/1892 25F
W
Low Moor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/1949
08/1949
LYR5 337 10667 50667 08/1892 25A
W
Wakefield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/03/1948
20/03/1948
LYR5 1172 10670 50670 08/1892 25D
W
Mirfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/1949
04/1949
LYR5 1173 10671 50671 08/1892 20F
20E
W
Skipton
Manningham
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/12/1949
03/1952
03/1952
LYR5   10675 50675 09/1892 24D
24F
W
Lower Darwen
Fleetwood
Withdrawn
22/06/1946
01/01/1948
31/12/1949
31/12/1949
LYR5 1178 10676 50676 09/1892 10B
W
Preston
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/1950
03/1950
LYR5 16 10678 50678 09/1892 23C
10B
W
Southport
Preston
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/11/1950
12/1953
12/1953
LYR5 340 10681 50681 10/1892 20E
W
Manningham
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/1952
07/1952
LYR5 680 10686 50686 11/1892 20G
20E
W
Hellifield
Manningham
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/07/1952
08/1955
08/1955
LYR5 46 10687 50687 09/1893 24D
23C
7D
8B
W
Lower Darwen
Southport
Rhyl
Warrington Dallam
Withdrawn
22/06/1946
01/01/1948
04/11/1950
02/12/1950
05/1953
05/1953
LYR5 119 10689 50689 09/1893 20A
20A
W
Holbeck (MR)
Holbeck (MR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/12/1949
08/1952
08/1952
LYR5 206 10692 50692 10/1893 23D
W
Wigan Central (L&Y)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/1949
10/1949
LYR5 1210 10695 50695 10/1893 25A
W
Wakefield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/1952
07/1952
LYR5 1211 10696 50696 10/1893 23C
W
Southport
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/1949
02/1949
LYR5 1212 10697 50697 11/1893 26C
W
Bolton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/1952
05/1952
LYR5 1218 10703 50703 12/1893 24F
W
Fleetwood
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/1953
03/1953
LYR5 36 10705 50705 02/1895 24F
W
Fleetwood
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/1958
10/1958
LYR5 1262 10711 50711 03/1895 25E
W
Sowerby Bridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/1949
06/1949
LYR5 1263 10712 50712 03/1895 25D
25E
28A
24C
27C
27A
W
Mirfield
Sowerby Bridge
Blackpool Central
Lostock Hall
Southport
Bank Hall
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/11/1950
19/05/1951
11/07/1953
09/10/1954
10/08/1957
03/1959
03/1959
LYR5 1265 10714 50714 03/1895 20E
W
Manningham
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/1953
08/1953
LYR5 1266 10715 50715 03/1895 25F
25E
25A
25E
25E
W
Low Moor
Sowerby Bridge
Wakefield
Sowerby Bridge
Sowerby Bridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/02/1951
16/06/1951
08/09/1951
22/03/1952
02/1955
02/1955
LYR5 1271 10720 50720 05/1895 24F
24C
W
Fleetwood
Lostock Hall
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/08/1951
12/1951
12/1951
LYR5 1272 10721 50721 05/1895 24E
27C
27A
W
Blackpool Central
Southport
Bank Hall
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/11/1952
10/08/1957
01/1961
01/1961
LYR5 24 10725 50725 03/1896 24E
24C
25B
W
Blackpool Central
Lostock Hall
Huddersfield Hillhouse
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/07/1953
19/06/1954
10/1958
10/1958
LYR5 76 10728 50728 03/1896 23C
W
Southport
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/08/1948
07/08/1948
LYR5 97 10731 50731 04/1896 25D
26C
26C
W
Mirfield
Bolton
Bolton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/09/1951
23/02/1952
11/1955
11/1955
LYR5 104 10732 50732 04/1896 24F
W
Fleetwood
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/1949
06/1949
LYR5 129 10735 50735 04/1896 24D
W
Lower Darwen
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/1952
06/1952
LYR5 156 10736 50736 04/1896 26A
25F
W
Newton Heath
Low Moor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/07/1951
12/1951
12/1951
LYR5 296 10738 50738 05/1896 26A
W
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/07/1949
16/07/1949
LYR5 415 10743 50743 06/1896 23C
W
Southport
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/1950
06/1950
LYR5 1313 10746 50746 06/1896 23C
24D
27C
W
Southport
Lower Darwen
Southport
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/09/1951
04/12/1954
02/1961
02/1961
LYR5 1315 10748 50748 06/1896 25A
28B
W
Wakefield
Fleetwood
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/03/1950
09/1950
09/1950
LYR5 1316 10749 50749 06/1896 24E
W
Blackpool Central
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/1952
01/1952
LYR5   10750 50750 06/1896 24E
W
Blackpool Central
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/1949
12/1949
LYR5 1319 10752 50752 07/1896 23C
24F
28A
25E
W
Southport
Fleetwood
Blackpool Central
Sowerby Bridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/01/1950
09/09/1950
06/09/1952
08/1957
08/1957
LYR5 1322 10755 50755 08/1896 25A
W
Wakefield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/1950
07/1950
LYR5 1324 10757 50757 08/1896 23D
24E
26A
25E
25F
25E
25F
W
Wigan Central (L&Y)
Blackpool Central
Newton Heath
Sowerby Bridge
Low Moor
Sowerby Bridge
Low Moor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/07/1949
16/06/1951
21/03/1953
24/04/1954
09/10/1954
21/05/1955
11/1958
11/1958
LYR5 1329 10762 50762 09/1896 25F
25D
25F
W
Low Moor
Mirfield
Low Moor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/10/1951
12/07/1952
12/1953
12/1953
LYR5 1331 10764 50764 01/1897 25A
24B
24C
25F
W
Wakefield
Rose Grove
Lostock Hall
Low Moor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/07/1951
19/04/1952
21/03/1953
07/1956
07/1956
LYR5 1332 10765 50765 01/1897 24F
26C
25B
W
Fleetwood
Bolton
Huddersfield Hillhouse
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/08/1951
02/01/1954
06/1954
06/1954
LYR5 1333 10766 50766 01/1897 24E
W
Blackpool Central
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/1951
08/1951
LYR5 1344 10777 50777 03/1897 25A
28B
28A
27C
24C
25E
W
Wakefield
Fleetwood
Blackpool Central
Southport
Lostock Hall
Sowerby Bridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/03/1951
06/10/1951
14/06/1952
24/04/1954
19/06/1954
10/1958
10/1958
LYR5 1345 10778 50778 03/1897 23C
W
Southport
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/1953
03/1953
LYR5 1348 10781 50781 04/1897 24D
24C
27C
27E
W
Lower Darwen
Lostock Hall
Southport
Walton on the Hill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/10/1950
31/10/1953
30/11/1957
02/1960
02/1960
LYR5 1371 10788 50788 04/1898 25F
26C
26B
24F
W
Low Moor
Bolton
Agecroft
Fleetwood
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/11/1950
11/08/1951
12/07/1952
08/1956
08/1956
LYR5 1377 10793 50793 05/1898 10B
W
Preston
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/1950
02/1950
LYR5 1379 10795 50795 05/1898 20F
W
Skipton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/1959
11/1959
LYR5 1382 10798 50798 05/1898 25D
28B
W
Mirfield
Fleetwood
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/06/1950
07/1950
07/1950
LYR5 1383 10799 50799 06/1898 24D
24E
26C
25B
W
Lower Darwen
Blackpool Central
Bolton
Huddersfield Hillhouse
Withdrawn
22/06/1946
01/01/1948
24/03/1951
26/01/1952
08/1952
08/1952
LYR5 1384 10800 50800 06/1898 25A
W
Wakefield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/08/1948
07/08/1948
LYR5 1385 10801 50801 06/1898 25A
W
Wakefield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/12/1948
04/12/1948
LYR5 1386 10802 50802 06/1898 24F
W
Fleetwood
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/1952
07/1952
LYR5 1388 10804 50804 07/1898 25A
25B
W
Wakefield
Huddersfield Hillhouse
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/12/1949
02/1950
02/1950
LYR5 1390 10806 50806 07/1898 25A
24F
28A
27C
W
Wakefield
Fleetwood
Blackpool Central
Southport
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/12/1949
07/10/1950
06/10/1951
02/1952
02/1952
LYR5 1391 10807 50807 07/1898 26C
25F
W
Bolton
Low Moor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/07/1952
05/1955
05/1955
LYR5 703 10812 50812 08/1898 24F
W
Fleetwood
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/1952
05/1952
LYR5 721 10813 50813 08/1898 25A
W
Wakefield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/1949
05/1949
LYR5 724 10815 50815 08/1898 26C
26C
W
Bolton
Bolton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/09/1950
02/1951
02/1951
LYR5 730 10818 50818 09/1898 26A
26C
26A
25F
25E
W
Newton Heath
Bolton
Newton Heath
Low Moor
Sowerby Bridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/09/1950
19/05/1951
14/06/1952
24/04/1954
10/1958
10/1958
LYR5 34 10823 50823 10/1898 26D
W
Bury
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/12/1948
04/12/1948
LYR5 192 10829 50829 11/1898 25D
26E
26C
26D
27B
26E
26D
26C
W
Mirfield
Bacup
Bolton
Bury
Aintree
Bacup
Bury
Bolton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/12/1950
31/12/1950
19/05/1951
16/06/1951
08/09/1951
06/11/1954
06/10/1956
04/1958
04/1958
LYR5 314 10831 50831 11/1898 26C
24D
24C
25F
25B
25F
W
Bolton
Lower Darwen
Lostock Hall
Low Moor
Huddersfield Hillhouse
Low Moor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/07/1951
22/03/1952
12/07/1952
09/10/1954
03/12/1955
11/1958
11/1958
LYR5 646 10840 50840 06/1899 25F
26C
26B
W
Low Moor
Bolton
Agecroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/02/1951
11/08/1951
02/1952
02/1952
LYR5 658 10842 50842 07/1899 20G
W
Hellifield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/1951
08/1951
LYR5 667 10844 50844 08/1899 23D
W
Wigan Central (L&Y)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/1950
09/1950
LYR5 674 10849 50849 09/1899 23C
W
Southport
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/1950
02/1950
LYR5 675 10850 50850 10/1899 25D
24F
26C
27C
W
Mirfield
Fleetwood
Bolton
Southport
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/12/1949
11/08/1951
13/06/1960
11/1961
11/1961
LYR5 867 10875 50875 05/1905 26D
W
Bury
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/05/1948
22/05/1948
LYR5 1462 10880 50880 06/1905 20A
20E
W
Holbeck (MR)
Manningham
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/12/1948
10/1949
10/1949
LYR5 1468 10886 50886 09/1905 25F
25F
W
Low Moor
Low Moor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/07/1951
12/1951
12/1951
LYR5 1470 10887 50887 10/1905 23D
25E
26C
26C
26D
26C
W
Wigan Central (L&Y)
Sowerby Bridge
Bolton
Bolton
Bury
Bolton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/03/1951
06/10/1951
22/03/1952
06/11/1954
06/10/1956
12/1957
12/1957
LYR5 1527 10889 50889 01/1910 24E
W
Blackpool Central
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/1949
10/1949
LYR5 1535 10892 50892 03/1910 26D
25E
25A
25E
25A
25D
25F
W
Bury
Sowerby Bridge
Wakefield
Sowerby Bridge
Wakefield
Mirfield
Low Moor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/11/1950
24/02/1951
16/06/1951
08/09/1951
06/10/1951
26/01/1952
05/1952
05/1952
LYR5 1541 10896 50896 03/1910 20G
W
Hellifield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/12/1948
04/12/1948
LYR5 1544 10898 50898 04/1910 25D
25E
W
Mirfield
Sowerby Bridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/10/1950
02/1952
02/1952
LYR5 1545 10899 50899 04/1910 20G
W
Hellifield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/10/1948
23/10/1948