Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 809 Today
» 1106 Yesterday
» 7961 Week
» 27606 Month
» 62248 Year
» 1283813 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LYR/LMS Aspinall "5" Class 2-4-2T


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
22/06/1946 Reallocation 10675     24D Lower Darwen  
22/06/1946 Reallocation 10687     24D Lower Darwen  
22/06/1946 Reallocation 10799     24D Lower Darwen  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10621     20D Normanton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10622     20A Holbeck (MR)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10623     20F Skipton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10625     20G Hellifield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10630     20E Manningham  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50631     20E Manningham  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10633     20E Manningham  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10634     20E Manningham  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10636     20E Manningham  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10639     10B Preston  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10640     24F Fleetwood  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10642     26C Bolton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10643     11B Barrow in Furness  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10644     11B Barrow in Furness  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10646     26C Bolton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10647     25A Wakefield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10648     23B Aintree  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10650     25A Wakefield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10651     26E Bacup  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10652     26E Bacup  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10653     24B Rose Grove  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10654     24B Rose Grove  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10655     23B Aintree  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10656     25A Wakefield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10660     23B Aintree  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50665     25F Low Moor  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50667     25A Wakefield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50670     25D Mirfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10671     20F Skipton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10675 24D Lower Darwen 24F Fleetwood  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50676     10B Preston  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10678     23C Southport  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10681     20E Manningham  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10686     20G Hellifield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10687 24D Lower Darwen 23C Southport  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10689     20A Holbeck (MR)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50692     23D Wigan Central (L&Y)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10695     25A Wakefield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50696     23C Southport  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10697     26C Bolton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10703     24F Fleetwood  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10705     24F Fleetwood  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50711     25E Sowerby Bridge  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10712     25D Mirfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10714     20E Manningham  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10715     25F Low Moor  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10720     24F Fleetwood  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10721     24E Blackpool Central  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50725     24E Blackpool Central  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50728     23C Southport  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10731     25D Mirfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50732     24F Fleetwood  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50735     24D Lower Darwen  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50736     26A Newton Heath  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50738     26A Newton Heath  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50743     23C Southport  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10746     23C Southport  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50748     25A Wakefield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10749     24E Blackpool Central  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50750     24E Blackpool Central  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10752     23C Southport  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50755     25A Wakefield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10757     23D Wigan Central (L&Y)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10762     25F Low Moor  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10764     25A Wakefield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10765     24F Fleetwood  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10766     24E Blackpool Central  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10777     25A Wakefield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10778     23C Southport  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10781     24D Lower Darwen  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10788     25F Low Moor  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50793     10B Preston  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10795     20F Skipton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50798     25D Mirfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10799 24D Lower Darwen 24E Blackpool Central  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50800     25A Wakefield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50801     25A Wakefield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10802     24F Fleetwood  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50804     25A Wakefield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10806     25A Wakefield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10807     26C Bolton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10812     24F Fleetwood  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50813     25A Wakefield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50815     26C Bolton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10818     26A Newton Heath  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50823     26D Bury  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10829     25D Mirfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10831     26C Bolton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10840     25F Low Moor  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10842     20G Hellifield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50844     23D Wigan Central (L&Y)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50849     23C Southport  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10850     25D Mirfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50875     26D Bury  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50880     20A Holbeck (MR)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10886     25F Low Moor  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10887     23D Wigan Central (L&Y)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50889     24E Blackpool Central  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50892     26D Bury  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50896     20G Hellifield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10898     25D Mirfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50899     20G Hellifield  
20/03/1948 Condemned 50667 25A Wakefield   COND  
22/05/1948 Condemned 50875 26D Bury   COND  
07/08/1948 Condemned 50728 23C Southport   COND  
07/08/1948 Condemned 50800 25A Wakefield   COND  
23/10/1948 Condemned 50899 20G Hellifield   COND  
20/11/1948 Condemned 50631 20E Manningham   COND  
04/12/1948 Condemned 50801 25A Wakefield   COND  
04/12/1948 Condemned 50823 26D Bury   COND  
04/12/1948 Condemned 50896 20G Hellifield   COND  
11/12/1948 Reallocation 50880 20A Holbeck (MR) 20E Manningham  
02/1949 Condemned 50696 23C Southport   COND  
04/1949 Condemned 50670 25D Mirfield   COND  
05/1949 Condemned 50813 25A Wakefield   COND  
06/1949 Condemned 50711 25E Sowerby Bridge   COND  
06/1949 Condemned 50732 24F Fleetwood   COND  
16/07/1949 Condemned 50738 26A Newton Heath   COND  
16/07/1949 Reallocation 10757 23D Wigan Central (L&Y) 24E Blackpool Central  
08/1949 Condemned 50665 25F Low Moor   COND  
10/1949 Condemned 50692 23D Wigan Central (L&Y)   COND  
10/1949 Condemned 50880 20E Manningham   COND  
10/1949 Condemned 50889 24E Blackpool Central   COND  
12/1949 Condemned 50750 24E Blackpool Central   COND  
24/12/1949 Reallocation 50623 20F Skipton 20E Manningham  
24/12/1949 Reallocation 50647 25A Wakefield 24F Fleetwood  
24/12/1949 Reallocation 50671 20F Skipton 20E Manningham  
24/12/1949 Reallocation 10689 20A Holbeck (MR) 20A Holbeck (MR)  
24/12/1949 Reallocation 50804 25A Wakefield 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse  
24/12/1949 Reallocation 50806 25A Wakefield 24F Fleetwood  
24/12/1949 Reallocation 10850 25D Mirfield 24F Fleetwood  
31/12/1949 Condemned 50675 24F Fleetwood   COND  
14/01/1950 Reallocation 50752 23C Southport 24F Fleetwood  
02/1950 Condemned 50793 10B Preston   COND  
02/1950 Condemned 50804 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse   COND  
02/1950 Condemned 50849 23C Southport   COND  
03/1950 Condemned 50676 10B Preston   COND  
11/03/1950 Reallocation 50748 25A Wakefield 28B Fleetwood  
06/1950 Condemned 50743 23C Southport   COND  
17/06/1950 Reallocation 50798 25D Mirfield 28B Fleetwood  
07/1950 Condemned 50755 25A Wakefield   COND  
07/1950 Condemned 50798 28B Fleetwood   COND  
09/1950 Condemned 50748 28B Fleetwood   COND  
09/1950 Condemned 50844 23D Wigan Central (L&Y)   COND  
09/09/1950 Reallocation 50752 24F Fleetwood 28A Blackpool Central  
09/09/1950 Reallocation 50815 26C Bolton 26C Bolton  
09/09/1950 Reallocation 50818 26A Newton Heath 26C Bolton  
10/1950 Condemned 50630 20E Manningham   COND  
07/10/1950 Reallocation 50781 24D Lower Darwen 24C Lostock Hall  
07/10/1950 Reallocation 50806 24F Fleetwood 28A Blackpool Central  
07/10/1950 Reallocation 50898 25D Mirfield 25E Sowerby Bridge  
04/11/1950 Reallocation 50660 23B Aintree 26E Bacup  
04/11/1950 Reallocation 50678 23C Southport 10B Preston  
04/11/1950 Reallocation 50687 23C Southport 7D Rhyl  
04/11/1950 Reallocation 50712 25D Mirfield 25E Sowerby Bridge  
04/11/1950 Reallocation 50788 25F Low Moor 26C Bolton  
04/11/1950 Reallocation 50892 26D Bury 25E Sowerby Bridge  
02/12/1950 Reallocation 50650 25A Wakefield 26E Bacup  
02/12/1950 Reallocation 50687 7D Rhyl 8B Warrington Dallam  
02/12/1950 Reallocation 50829 25D Mirfield 26E Bacup  
31/12/1950 Reallocation 50656 25A Wakefield 26E Bacup  
31/12/1950 Reallocation 50829 26E Bacup 26C Bolton  
27/01/1951 Reallocation 50646 26C Bolton 27B Aintree  
02/1951 Condemned 50815 26C Bolton   COND  
24/02/1951 Reallocation 50652 26E Bacup 27B Aintree  
24/02/1951 Reallocation 50715 25F Low Moor 25E Sowerby Bridge  
24/02/1951 Reallocation 50840 25F Low Moor 26C Bolton  
24/02/1951 Reallocation 50892 25E Sowerby Bridge 25A Wakefield  
03/1951 Condemned 50642 26C Bolton   COND  
24/03/1951 Reallocation 50646 27B Aintree 26C Bolton  
24/03/1951 Reallocation 50647 24F Fleetwood 26D Bury  
24/03/1951 Reallocation 50651 26E Bacup 26D Bury  
24/03/1951 Reallocation 50652 27B Aintree 26E Bacup  
24/03/1951 Reallocation 50656 26E Bacup 26D Bury  
24/03/1951 Reallocation 50777 25A Wakefield 28B Fleetwood  
24/03/1951 Reallocation 10799 24E Blackpool Central 26C Bolton  
24/03/1951 Reallocation 10887 23D Wigan Central (L&Y) 25E Sowerby Bridge  
04/1951 Condemned 50654 24B Rose Grove   COND  
19/05/1951 Reallocation 50647 26D Bury 24B Rose Grove  
19/05/1951 Reallocation 50652 26E Bacup 27B Aintree  
19/05/1951 Reallocation 50712 25E Sowerby Bridge 28A Blackpool Central  
19/05/1951 Reallocation 50818 26C Bolton 26A Newton Heath  
19/05/1951 Reallocation 50829 26C Bolton 26D Bury  
16/06/1951 Reallocation 50647 24B Rose Grove 26D Bury  
16/06/1951 Reallocation 50651 26D Bury 27B Aintree  
16/06/1951 Reallocation 50652 27B Aintree 24B Rose Grove  
16/06/1951 Reallocation 50655 23B Aintree 26D Bury  
16/06/1951 Reallocation 50715 25E Sowerby Bridge 25A Wakefield  
16/06/1951 Reallocation 50757 24E Blackpool Central 26A Newton Heath  
16/06/1951 Reallocation 50829 26D Bury 27B Aintree  
16/06/1951 Reallocation 50892 25A Wakefield 25E Sowerby Bridge  
17/07/1951 Reallocation 50640 24F Fleetwood 27C Southport  
17/07/1951 Reallocation 50736 26A Newton Heath 25F Low Moor  
17/07/1951 Reallocation 50764 25A Wakefield 24B Rose Grove  
17/07/1951 Reallocation 50831 26C Bolton 24D Lower Darwen  
17/07/1951 Reallocation 50886 25F Low Moor 25F Low Moor  
08/1951 Condemned 50766 24E Blackpool Central   COND  
08/1951 Condemned 50842 20G Hellifield   COND  
11/08/1951 Reallocation 50651 27B Aintree 26D Bury  
11/08/1951 Reallocation 50720 24F Fleetwood 24C Lostock Hall  
11/08/1951 Reallocation 50765 24F Fleetwood 26C Bolton  
11/08/1951 Reallocation 50788 26C Bolton 26B Agecroft  
11/08/1951 Reallocation 50840 26C Bolton 26B Agecroft  
11/08/1951 Reallocation 50850 24F Fleetwood 26C Bolton  
08/09/1951 Reallocation 50715 25A Wakefield 25E Sowerby Bridge  
08/09/1951 Reallocation 50731 25D Mirfield 26C Bolton  
08/09/1951 Reallocation 50746 23C Southport 24D Lower Darwen  
08/09/1951 Reallocation 50829 27B Aintree 26E Bacup  
08/09/1951 Reallocation 50892 25E Sowerby Bridge 25A Wakefield  
06/10/1951 Reallocation 50643 11B Barrow in Furness 10D Plodder Lane  
06/10/1951 Reallocation 50648 23B Aintree 26C Bolton  
06/10/1951 Reallocation 50762 25F Low Moor 25D Mirfield  
06/10/1951 Reallocation 50777 28B Fleetwood 28A Blackpool Central  
06/10/1951 Reallocation 50806 28A Blackpool Central 27C Southport  
06/10/1951 Reallocation 50887 25E Sowerby Bridge 26C Bolton  
06/10/1951 Reallocation 50892 25A Wakefield 25D Mirfield  
12/1951 Condemned 50720 24C Lostock Hall   COND  
12/1951 Condemned 50736 25F Low Moor   COND  
12/1951 Condemned 50886 25F Low Moor   COND  
01/1952 Condemned 50749 24E Blackpool Central   COND  
26/01/1952 Reallocation 50799 26C Bolton 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse  
26/01/1952 Reallocation 50892 25D Mirfield 25F Low Moor  
02/1952 Condemned 50806 27C Southport   COND  
02/1952 Condemned 50840 26B Agecroft   COND  
02/1952 Condemned 50898 25E Sowerby Bridge   COND  
23/02/1952 Reallocation 50731 26C Bolton 26C Bolton  
03/1952 Condemned 50671 20E Manningham   COND  
22/03/1952 Reallocation 50647 26D Bury 26C Bolton  
22/03/1952 Reallocation 50715 25E Sowerby Bridge 25E Sowerby Bridge  
22/03/1952 Reallocation 50831 24D Lower Darwen 24C Lostock Hall  
22/03/1952 Reallocation 50887 26C Bolton 26C Bolton  
04/1952 Condemned 50640 27C Southport   COND  
19/04/1952 Reallocation 50764 24B Rose Grove 24C Lostock Hall  
05/1952 Condemned 50639 10B Preston   COND  
05/1952 Condemned 50697 26C Bolton   COND  
05/1952 Condemned 50812 24F Fleetwood   COND  
05/1952 Condemned 50892 25F Low Moor   COND  
06/1952 Condemned 50623 20E Manningham   COND  
06/1952 Condemned 50633 20E Manningham   COND  
06/1952 Condemned 50735 24D Lower Darwen   COND  
14/06/1952 Reallocation 50643 10D Plodder Lane 10B Preston  
14/06/1952 Reallocation 50648 26C Bolton 26E Bacup  
14/06/1952 Reallocation 50650 26E Bacup 26C Bolton  
14/06/1952 Reallocation 50651 26D Bury 24B Rose Grove  
14/06/1952 Reallocation 50655 26D Bury 24B Rose Grove  
14/06/1952 Reallocation 50777 28A Blackpool Central 27C Southport  
14/06/1952 Reallocation 50818 26A Newton Heath 25F Low Moor  
07/1952 Condemned 50681 20E Manningham   COND  
07/1952 Condemned 50695 25A Wakefield   COND  
07/1952 Condemned 50802 24F Fleetwood   COND  
12/07/1952 Reallocation 50644 11B Barrow in Furness 10B Preston  
12/07/1952 Reallocation 50648 26E Bacup 26C Bolton  
12/07/1952 Reallocation 50686 20G Hellifield 20E Manningham  
12/07/1952 Reallocation 50762 25D Mirfield 25F Low Moor  
12/07/1952 Reallocation 50788 26B Agecroft 24F Fleetwood  
12/07/1952 Reallocation 50807 26C Bolton 25F Low Moor  
12/07/1952 Reallocation 50831 24C Lostock Hall 25F Low Moor  
08/1952 Condemned 50622 20A Holbeck (MR)   COND  
08/1952 Condemned 50689 20A Holbeck (MR)   COND  
08/1952 Condemned 50799 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse   COND  
09/08/1952 Condemned 50625 20G Hellifield   COND  
06/09/1952 Reallocation 50752 28A Blackpool Central 25E Sowerby Bridge  
10/1952 Condemned 50634 20E Manningham   COND  
04/10/1952 Reallocation 50647 26C Bolton 26E Bacup  
29/11/1952 Reallocation 50721 24E Blackpool Central 27C Southport  
03/1953 Condemned 50703 24F Fleetwood   COND  
03/1953 Condemned 50778 23C Southport   COND  
21/03/1953 Reallocation 50644 10B Preston 8B Warrington Dallam  
21/03/1953 Reallocation 50656 26D Bury 24B Rose Grove  
21/03/1953 Reallocation 50757 26A Newton Heath 25E Sowerby Bridge  
21/03/1953 Reallocation 50764 24C Lostock Hall 25F Low Moor  
05/1953 Condemned 50687 8B Warrington Dallam   COND  
11/07/1953 Reallocation 50712 28A Blackpool Central 24C Lostock Hall  
11/07/1953 Reallocation 50725 24E Blackpool Central 24C Lostock Hall  
08/1953 Condemned 50714 20E Manningham   COND  
08/08/1953 Reallocation 50648 26C Bolton 24B Rose Grove  
03/10/1953 Reallocation 50650 26C Bolton 26C Bolton  
31/10/1953 Reallocation 50781 24C Lostock Hall 27C Southport  
28/11/1953 Reallocation 50643 10B Preston 8B Warrington Dallam  
12/1953 Condemned 50678 10B Preston   COND  
12/1953 Condemned 50762 25F Low Moor   COND  
02/01/1954 Reallocation 50765 26C Bolton 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse  
30/01/1954 Reallocation 50648 24B Rose Grove 27B Aintree  
27/03/1954 Reallocation 50648 27B Aintree 24B Rose Grove  
24/04/1954 Reallocation 50757 25E Sowerby Bridge 25F Low Moor  
24/04/1954 Reallocation 50777 27C Southport 24C Lostock Hall  
24/04/1954 Reallocation 50818 25F Low Moor 25E Sowerby Bridge  
06/1954 Condemned 50765 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse   COND  
19/06/1954 Reallocation 50725 24C Lostock Hall 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse  
19/06/1954 Reallocation 50777 24C Lostock Hall 25E Sowerby Bridge  
09/1954 Condemned 50621 20D Normanton   COND  
11/09/1954 Reallocation 50656 24B Rose Grove 26C Bolton  
09/10/1954 Reallocation 50646 26C Bolton 20C Royston  
09/10/1954 Reallocation 50712 24C Lostock Hall 27C Southport  
09/10/1954 Reallocation 50757 25F Low Moor 25E Sowerby Bridge  
09/10/1954 Reallocation 50831 25F Low Moor 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse  
06/11/1954 Reallocation 50647 26E Bacup 26D Bury  
06/11/1954 Reallocation 50650 26C Bolton 20C Royston  
06/11/1954 Reallocation 50829 26E Bacup 26D Bury  
06/11/1954 Reallocation 50887 26C Bolton 26D Bury  
04/12/1954 Reallocation 50746 24D Lower Darwen 27C Southport  
02/1955 Condemned 50715 25E Sowerby Bridge   COND  
26/02/1955 Reallocation 50647 26D Bury 26C Bolton  
03/1955 Condemned 50656 26C Bolton   COND  
05/1955 Condemned 50807 25F Low Moor   COND  
21/05/1955 Reallocation 50757 25E Sowerby Bridge 25F Low Moor  
08/1955 Condemned 50686 20E Manningham   COND  
11/1955 Condemned 50648 24B Rose Grove   COND  
11/1955 Condemned 50731 26C Bolton   COND  
05/11/1955 Reallocation 50655 24B Rose Grove 26C Bolton  
12/1955 Condemned 50651 24B Rose Grove   COND  
03/12/1955 Reallocation 50831 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse 25F Low Moor  
02/1956 Condemned 50653 24B Rose Grove   COND  
25/02/1956 Reallocation 50646 20C Royston 15D Bedford  
25/02/1956 Reallocation 50650 20C Royston 15A Wellingborough  
25/02/1956 Reallocation 50655 26C Bolton 24B Rose Grove  
07/1956 Condemned 50764 25F Low Moor   COND  
08/1956 Condemned 50655 24B Rose Grove   COND  
08/1956 Condemned 50788 24F Fleetwood   COND  
10/1956 Condemned 50650 15A Wellingborough   COND  
06/10/1956 Reallocation 50829 26D Bury 26C Bolton  
06/10/1956 Reallocation 50887 26D Bury 26C Bolton  
13/10/1956 Condemned 50652 24B Rose Grove   COND  
07/1957 Condemned 50636 20E Manningham   COND  
08/1957 Condemned 50752 25E Sowerby Bridge   COND  
10/08/1957 Reallocation 50712 27C Southport 27A Bank Hall  
10/08/1957 Reallocation 50721 27C Southport 27A Bank Hall  
30/11/1957 Reallocation 50781 27C Southport 27E Walton on the Hill  
12/1957 Condemned 50887 26C Bolton   COND  
03/1958 Condemned 50660 26E Bacup   COND  
04/1958 Condemned 50829 26C Bolton   COND  
10/1958 Condemned 50643 8B Warrington Dallam   COND  
10/1958 Condemned 50644 8B Warrington Dallam   COND  
10/1958 Condemned 50705 24F Fleetwood   COND  
10/1958 Condemned 50725 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse   COND  
10/1958 Condemned 50777 25E Sowerby Bridge   COND  
10/1958 Condemned 50818 25E Sowerby Bridge   COND  
11/1958 Condemned 50646 15D Bedford   COND  
11/1958 Condemned 50757 25F Low Moor   COND  
11/1958 Condemned 50831 25F Low Moor   COND  
02/1959 Condemned 50647 26C Bolton   COND  
03/1959 Condemned 50712 27A Bank Hall   COND  
11/1959 Condemned 50795 20F Skipton   COND  
02/1960 Condemned 50781 27E Walton on the Hill   COND  
13/06/1960 Reallocation 50850 26C Bolton 27C Southport  
01/1961 Condemned 50721 27A Bank Hall   COND  
02/1961 Condemned 50746 27C Southport   COND  
11/1961 Condemned 50850 27C Southport   COND