Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 287 Today
» 752 Yesterday
» 3526 Week
» 16039 Month
» 104231 Year
» 988612 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LNWR/LMS Webb "Coal Engines" Class 0-6-0


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
03/1901 Condemned 2206       COND  
06/1901 Condemned 987       COND  
06/1901 Condemned 225       COND  
07/1901 Condemned 2388       COND  
08/1901 Condemned 1298       COND  
08/1901 Condemned 2121       COND  
08/1901 Condemned 2227       COND  
03/1902 Condemned 188       COND  
03/1902 Condemned 495       COND  
03/1902 Condemned 741       COND  
03/1902 Condemned 2113       COND  
03/1902 Condemned 46       COND  
03/1902 Condemned 55       COND  
03/1902 Condemned 78       COND  
03/1902 Condemned 105       COND  
03/1902 Condemned 2211       COND  
04/1902 Condemned 100       COND  
04/1902 Condemned 143       COND  
05/1902 Condemned 1130       COND  
05/1902 Condemned 2074       COND  
05/1902 Condemned 405       COND  
05/1902 Condemned 2114       COND  
05/1902 Condemned 684       COND  
05/1902 Condemned 174       COND  
05/1902 Condemned 18       COND  
05/1902 Condemned 879       COND  
05/1902 Condemned 2342       COND  
05/1902 Condemned 2344       COND  
05/1902 Condemned 2369       COND  
05/1902 Condemned 352       COND  
05/1902 Condemned 1010       COND  
06/1902 Condemned 983       COND  
06/1902 Condemned 775       COND  
06/1902 Condemned 1140       COND  
06/1902 Condemned 2382       COND  
1903 Condemned 695       COND  
1903 Condemned 170       COND  
1903 Condemned 41       COND  
01/1903 Condemned 2080       COND  
09/1903 Condemned 2118       COND  
10/1903 Condemned 500       COND  
10/1903 Condemned 1299       COND  
10/1903 Condemned 2272       COND  
10/1903 Condemned 916       COND  
11/1903 Condemned 2208       COND  
1904 Condemned 412       COND  
01/1904 Condemned 1300       COND  
02/1904 Condemned 918       COND  
04/1904 Condemned 2164       COND  
04/1904 Condemned 1122       COND  
04/1904 Condemned 1110       COND  
08/1904 Condemned 2169       COND  
09/1904 Condemned 2339       COND  
10/1904 Condemned 106       COND  
1905 Condemned 688       COND  
1905 Condemned 811       COND  
1905 Condemned 2115       COND  
1905 Condemned 2116       COND  
1905 Condemned 2120       COND  
1905 Condemned 2166       COND  
1905 Condemned 2202       COND  
01/1905 Condemned 1137       COND  
02/1905 Condemned 606       COND  
02/1905 Condemned 1131       COND  
03/1905 Condemned 40       COND  
07/1905 Condemned 2257       COND  
08/1905 Condemned 1114       COND  
08/1905 Condemned 911       COND  
1906 Condemned 501       COND  
1906 Condemned 433       COND  
1906 Condemned 1295       COND  
1906 Condemned 988       COND  
1906 Condemned 784       COND  
1906 Condemned 2165       COND  
1906 Condemned 653       COND  
1906 Condemned 1129       COND  
1906 Condemned 1135       COND  
1906 Condemned 181       COND  
05/1906 Condemned 924       COND  
07/1906 Condemned 616       COND  
07/1906 Condemned 2210       COND  
08/1906 Condemned 874       COND  
09/1906 Condemned 2231       COND  
09/1906 Condemned 2269       COND  
11/1906 Condemned 2229       COND  
11/1906 Condemned 1095       COND  
1907 Condemned 496       COND  
1907 Condemned 937       COND  
1907 Condemned 1290       COND  
1907 Condemned 1297       COND  
1907 Condemned 2078       COND  
1907 Condemned 2087       COND  
1907 Condemned 976       COND  
1907 Condemned 2111       COND  
1907 Condemned 2112       COND  
1907 Condemned 2161       COND  
1907 Condemned 807       COND  
1907 Condemned 1125       COND  
1907 Condemned 1136       COND  
1907 Condemned 1196       COND  
1907 Condemned 2173       COND  
1907 Condemned 2196       COND  
1907 Condemned 2209       COND  
1907 Condemned 2424       COND  
1907 Condemned 2446       COND  
01/1907 Condemned 875       COND  
10/1907 Condemned 2253       COND  
10/1907 Condemned 2270       COND  
1908 Condemned 929       COND  
1908 Condemned 933       COND  
1908 Condemned 939       COND  
1908 Condemned 940       COND  
1908 Condemned 1292       COND  
1908 Condemned 1293       COND  
1908 Condemned 1296       COND  
1908 Condemned 2073       COND  
1908 Condemned 2076       COND  
1908 Condemned 2084       COND  
1908 Condemned 113       COND  
1908 Condemned 2110       COND  
1908 Condemned 2123       COND  
1908 Condemned 1123       COND  
1908 Condemned 1126       COND  
1908 Condemned 2199       COND  
07/1908 Condemned 1119       COND  
08/1908 Condemned 370       COND  
12/1908 Condemned 884       COND  
1909 Condemned 2077       COND  
1909 Condemned 2160       COND  
1909 Condemned 1158       COND  
02/1909 Condemned 2223       COND  
02/1909 Condemned 2228       COND  
02/1909 Condemned 920       COND  
08/1909 Condemned 880       COND  
03/1910 Condemned 1138       COND  
05/1910 Condemned 497       COND  
05/1910 Condemned 601       COND  
05/1910 Condemned 172       COND  
08/1910 Condemned 2083       COND  
08/1910 Condemned 2268       COND  
10/1910 Condemned 1195       COND  
10/1910 Condemned 2271       COND  
11/1910 Condemned 1294       COND  
01/1911 Condemned 2168       COND  
03/1911 Condemned 1186       COND  
06/1911 Condemned 502       COND  
06/1911 Condemned 2081       COND  
06/1911 Condemned 2212       COND  
06/1911 Condemned 882       COND  
06/1911 Condemned 2291       COND  
08/1911 Condemned 2089       COND  
08/1911 Condemned 2220       COND  
01/1913 Condemned 82       COND  
02/1913 Condemned 2124       COND  
03/1913 Condemned 89       COND  
03/1913 Condemned 3235       COND  
04/1913 Condemned 2086       COND  
04/1913 Condemned 2197       COND  
04/1913 Condemned 845       COND  
05/1913 Condemned 1161       COND  
05/1913 Condemned 2428       COND  
06/1913 Condemned 107       COND  
06/1913 Condemned 1159       COND  
07/1913 Condemned 138       COND  
08/1913 Condemned 2378       COND  
02/1914 Condemned 2377       COND  
04/1914 Condemned 2200       COND  
09/1914 Condemned 856       COND  
09/1914 Condemned 3023       COND  
10/1914 Condemned 984       COND  
12/1914 Condemned 58       COND  
12/1914 Condemned 1090       COND  
01/1915 Condemned 2277       COND  
02/1915 Condemned 1124       COND  
03/1915 Condemned 2300       COND  
05/1915 Condemned 2392       COND  
06/1915 Condemned 2203       COND  
08/1915 Condemned 745       COND  
10/1915 Condemned 122       COND  
12/1915 Condemned 2387       COND  
03/1916 Condemned 982       COND  
04/1918 Condemned ?       COND  
01/1919 Condemned 3498       COND  
05/1919 Condemned 3088       COND  
10/1919 Condemned 3541       COND  
03/1920 Condemned 3292       COND  
1924 Condemned 8250       COND  
1924 Condemned 8292       COND  
04/1924 Condemned 8132       COND  
04/1924 Condemned 8127       COND  
04/1924 Condemned 8243       COND  
05/1924 Condemned 8096       COND  
05/1924 Condemned 8201       COND  
06/1924 Condemned 8157       COND  
06/1924 Condemned 8228       COND  
06/1924 Condemned 8310       COND  
11/1924 Condemned 8156       COND  
09/1925 Condemned 8143       COND  
07/1926 Condemned 8119       COND  
07/1926 Condemned 8150       COND  
07/1926 Condemned 8194       COND  
08/1926 Condemned 8102       COND  
08/1926 Condemned 8169       COND  
08/1926 Condemned 8224       COND  
04/1927 Condemned 8170       COND  
04/1927 Condemned 8183       COND  
05/1927 Condemned 8092       COND  
05/1927 Condemned 8125       COND  
05/1927 Condemned 8185       COND  
05/1927 Condemned 8314       COND  
06/1927 Condemned 8163       COND  
06/1927 Condemned 8242       COND  
06/1927 Condemned 8270       COND  
06/1927 Condemned 8269       COND  
08/1927 Condemned 8229       COND  
01/1928 Condemned 8181       COND  
03/1928 Condemned 8110       COND  
03/1928 Condemned 8124       COND  
03/1928 Condemned 8144       COND  
03/1928 Condemned 8184       COND  
04/1928 Condemned 8136       COND  
04/1928 Condemned 8207       COND  
04/1928 Condemned 8213       COND  
07/1928 Condemned 8266       COND  
09/1928 Condemned 8301       COND  
10/1928 Condemned 8287       COND  
10/1928 Condemned 8266       COND  
12/1928 Condemned 8203       COND  
06/1929 Condemned 8188       COND  
07/1929 Condemned 8217       COND  
08/1929 Condemned 8179       COND  
08/1929 Condemned 8237       COND  
09/1929 Condemned 8214       COND  
10/1929 Condemned 8149       COND  
10/1929 Condemned 8168       COND  
10/1929 Condemned 8200       COND  
10/1929 Condemned 8219       COND  
03/1930 Condemned 8235       COND  
03/1930 Condemned 8241       COND  
03/1930 Condemned 8306       COND  
05/1930 Condemned 8165       COND  
05/1930 Condemned 8294       COND  
06/1930 Condemned 8135       COND  
06/1930 Condemned 8190       COND  
07/1930 Condemned 8305       COND  
08/1930 Condemned 8121       COND  
08/1930 Condemned 8122       COND  
09/1930 Condemned 8160       COND  
09/1930 Condemned 8180       COND  
10/1930 Condemned 8146       COND  
10/1930 Condemned 8283       COND  
11/1930 Condemned 8089       COND  
11/1930 Condemned 8098       COND  
12/1930 Condemned 8112       COND  
12/1930 Condemned 8113       COND  
12/1930 Condemned 8118       COND  
12/1930 Condemned 8123       COND  
12/1930 Condemned 8142       COND  
12/1930 Condemned 8154       COND  
12/1930 Condemned 8175       COND  
12/1930 Condemned 8176       COND  
12/1930 Condemned 8196       COND  
12/1930 Condemned 8218       COND  
12/1930 Condemned 8223       COND  
12/1930 Condemned 8274       COND  
12/1930 Condemned 8272       COND  
12/1930 Condemned 8281       COND  
12/1930 Condemned 8307       COND  
1932 Condemned 8094       COND  
1932 Condemned 8103       COND  
1932 Condemned 8126       COND  
1932 Condemned 8109       COND  
1932 Condemned 8120       COND  
1932 Condemned 8161       COND  
1932 Condemned 8192       COND  
1932 Condemned 8225       COND  
1932 Condemned 8222       COND  
1932 Condemned 8252       COND  
1932 Condemned 8248       COND  
1932 Condemned 8255       COND  
1932 Condemned 8264       COND  
1932 Condemned 8267       COND  
1932 Condemned 8280       COND  
1932 Condemned 8284       COND  
1932 Condemned 8282       COND  
1932 Condemned 8285       COND  
1932 Condemned 8302       COND  
1932 Condemned 8299       COND  
07/1932 Condemned 8162       COND  
08/1932 Condemned 8249       COND  
1933 Condemned 8131       COND  
1933 Condemned 8134       COND  
1933 Condemned 8151       COND  
1933 Condemned 8164       COND  
1933 Condemned 8173       COND  
1933 Condemned 8195       COND  
1933 Condemned 8206       COND  
1933 Condemned 8210       COND  
1933 Condemned 8212       COND  
1933 Condemned 8215       COND  
1933 Condemned 8231       COND  
1933 Condemned 8257       COND  
1933 Condemned 8258       COND  
1933 Condemned 8259       COND  
1933 Condemned 8268       COND  
1933 Condemned 8244       COND  
1933 Condemned 8293       COND  
1933 Condemned 8300       COND  
1933 Condemned 8298       COND  
12/1933 Condemned 8275       COND  
03/1934 Condemned 8178       COND  
05/1934 Condemned 8148       COND  
05/1934 Condemned 8276       COND  
10/1934 Condemned 8090       COND  
10/1934 Condemned 8155       COND  
10/1934 Condemned 8260       COND  
11/1934 Condemned 8147       COND  
12/1934 Condemned 8177       COND  
12/1934 Condemned 8290       COND  
02/1935 Condemned 8167       COND  
02/1935 Condemned 8232       COND  
02/1935 Condemned 8304       COND  
08/1935 Condemned 8208       COND  
08/1935 Condemned 8311       COND  
10/1935 Condemned 8197       COND  
10/1935 Condemned 8238       COND  
11/1935 Condemned 8193       COND  
11/1935 Condemned 8211       COND  
01/1936 Condemned 8174       COND  
03/1936 Condemned 8130       COND  
03/1936 Condemned 8254       COND  
03/1936 Condemned 8279       COND  
04/1936 Condemned 8140       COND  
04/1936 Condemned 8265       COND  
05/1936 Condemned 8291       COND  
08/1936 Condemned 8111       COND  
09/1936 Condemned 8220       COND  
11/1936 Condemned 8137       COND  
11/1936 Condemned 8198       COND  
11/1937 Condemned 8159       COND  
12/1937 Condemned 8101       COND  
12/1937 Condemned 8189       COND  
12/1937 Condemned 8277       COND  
12/1937 Condemned 8297       COND  
02/1939 Condemned 28099       COND  
1945 Condemned 28138       COND  
1945 Condemned 28187       COND  
02/1946 Condemned 28129       COND  
03/1946 Condemned 28209       COND  
03/1946 Condemned 28289       COND  
05/1946 Condemned 28226       COND  
06/1946 Condemned 28303       COND  
10/1946 Condemned 28186       COND  
03/1947 Condemned 28117       COND  
05/1947 Condemned 28139       COND  
05/1947 Condemned 28278       COND  
05/1947 Condemned 28261       COND  
09/1947 Condemned 28204       COND  
11/1947 Condemned 28288       COND  
08/11/1947 Condemned 28145       COND  
24/01/1948 Condemned 28230       COND  
31/01/1948 Condemned 28095       COND  
14/02/1948 Condemned 28153       COND  
21/02/1948 Condemned 28097       COND  
24/04/1948 Condemned 58345       COND  
29/05/1948 Condemned 58339       COND  
05/06/1948 Condemned 58337       COND  
12/06/1948 Condemned 58358       COND  
03/07/1948 Condemned 58357       COND  
24/07/1948 Condemned 58320       COND  
07/08/1948 Condemned 58325       COND  
28/08/1948 Condemned 58324       COND  
18/09/1948 Condemned 58359       COND  
25/09/1948 Condemned 58361       COND  
09/10/1948 Condemned 58353       COND  
16/10/1948 Condemned 58331       COND  
13/11/1948 Condemned 58356       COND  
18/12/1948 Condemned 58335       COND  
01/1949 Condemned 58342       COND  
03/1949 Condemned 58344       COND  
10/1949 Condemned 58334       COND  
01/1950 Condemned 58329       COND  
01/1950 Condemned 58351       COND  
03/1950 Condemned 58348       COND  
04/1950 Condemned 58341       COND  
05/1950 Condemned 58338       COND  
07/1950 Condemned 8182       COND  
07/1950 Condemned 8236       COND  
01/1951 Condemned 58349       COND  
04/1951 Condemned 58352       COND  
01/1952 Condemned 58322       COND  
01/1952 Condemned 58333       COND  
29/02/1952 Reallocation 58334     84G Shrewsbury  
29/02/1952 Reallocation 58346     84G Shrewsbury  
03/1952 Condemned 58335       COND  
03/1952 Condemned 58340       COND  
03/1952 Condemned 58346 84G Shrewsbury   COND  
31/03/1952 Reallocation 58334 84G Shrewsbury 84G Shrewsbury  
31/03/1952 Reallocation 58360     84G Shrewsbury  
04/1952 Condemned 58360 84G Shrewsbury   COND  
05/1952 Condemned 58350       COND  
06/1952 Condemned 58327       COND  
14/06/1952 Reallocation 58330     11B Barrow in Furness  
14/06/1952 Reallocation 58334 84G Shrewsbury 11B Barrow in Furness  
02/1953 Condemned 58330 11B Barrow in Furness   COND  
03/1953 Condemned 58328       COND  
03/1953 Condemned 58334 11B Barrow in Furness   COND  
03/1953 Condemned 58347       COND  
25/04/1953 Condemned 58323       COND  
05/1953 Condemned 58326       COND  
08/1953 Condemned 58321       COND  
08/1953 Condemned 58336       COND  
10/1953 Condemned 58332       COND  
03/10/1953 Condemned 58343       COND