CR/LMS McIntosh "782" Class 0-6-0T
CR | CR (Renum) | LMS | BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
782 | 16254 | 56254 | 06/1898 | 16/04/1958 | 59.83 | |||||||
783 | 16255 | 56255 | 06/1898 | 12/1958 | 60.5 | |||||||
784 | 16256 | 56256 | 06/1898 | 06/1959 | 61 | 61.12 | ||||||
785 | 16257 | 56257 | 06/1898 | 03/1957 | 58.75 | |||||||
786 | 16258 | 56258 | 07/1898 | 03/1953 | 54.67 | 54.79 | ||||||
787 | 16259 | 56259 | 07/1898 | 07/1960 | 62 | 62.21 | ||||||
788 | 16260 | 56260 | 07/1898 | 09/12/1960 | 62.42 | 62.46 | ||||||
789 | 16261 | 56261 | 08/1898 | 05/10/1956 | 58.17 | |||||||
790 | 16262 | 56262 | 08/1898 | 19/01/1959 | 60.42 | 60.79 | ||||||
791 | 16263 | 56263 | 09/1898 | 12/12/1955 | 57.25 | |||||||
792 | 16264 | 56264 | 09/1898 | 20/10/1959 | 61.08 | 61.12 | ||||||
793 | 16265 | 56265 | 09/1898 | 09/1958 | 60 | |||||||
794 | 16266 | 56266 | 09/1898 | 12/11/1959 | 61.17 | 61.21 | ||||||
795 | 16267 | 56267 | 09/1898 | 08/07/1958 | 59.83 | |||||||
796 | 16268 | 56268 | 09/1898 | 22/02/1952 | 53.42 | |||||||
797 | 16269 | 56269 | 09/1898 | 08/12/1959 | 61.25 | 61.37 | ||||||
798 | 16270 | 56270 | 10/1898 | 23/10/1948 | 50 | |||||||
799 | 16271 | 56271 | 10/1898 | 11/05/1956 | 57.58 | |||||||
800 | 16272 | 56272 | 10/1898 | 10/10/1958 | 60 | |||||||
801 | 16273 | 56273 | 10/1898 | 05/1956 | 57.58 | |||||||
802 | 16274 | 56274 | 10/1898 | 02/1958 | 59.33 | |||||||
803 | 16275 | 56275 | 10/1898 | 26/03/1958 | 59.42 | |||||||
804 | 16276 | 56276 | 10/1898 | 05/02/1953 | 54.33 | 54.62 | ||||||
805 | 16277 | 56277 | 11/1898 | 30/04/1958 | 59.42 | 59.62 | ||||||
806 | 16278 | 56278 | 11/1898 | 11/06/1962 | 63.58 | Cut | Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) | 09/1963 | 64.87 | |||
807 | 16279 | 56279 | 11/1898 | 11/1960 | 62 | 62.04 | ||||||
808 | 16280 | 56280 | 11/1898 | 24/12/1957 | 59.08 | |||||||
809 | 16281 | 56281 | 11/1898 | 13/11/1958 | 60 | 60.21 | ||||||
810 | 16282 | 56282 | 11/1898 | 02/04/1962 | 63.42 | 63.70 | ||||||
811 | 16283 | 56283 | 12/1898 | 09/1958 | 59.75 | |||||||
236 | 16240 | 56240 | 12/1898 | 07/1961 | 62.58 | 62.62 | ||||||
237 | 16241 | 56241 | 12/1898 | 20/01/1960 | 61.08 | 61.12 | ||||||
238 | 16242 | 56242 | 12/1898 | 07/1961 | 62.58 | 62.62 | ||||||
239 | 16243 | 56243 | 12/1898 | 08/02/1957 | 58.17 | |||||||
240 | 16244 | 56244 | 12/1898 | 28/05/1958 | 59.42 | |||||||
241 | 16245 | 56245 | 12/1898 | 02/1959 | 60.17 | |||||||
242 | 16246 | 56246 | 01/1899 | 10/04/1961 | 62.25 | 62.37 | ||||||
243 | 16247 | 56247 | 01/1899 | 07/01/1959 | 60 | |||||||
244 | 16248 | 56248 | 01/1899 | 07/01/1955 | 56 | 56.04 | ||||||
245 | 16249 | 56249 | 01/1899 | 10/1956 | 57.75 | |||||||
246 | 16250 | 56250 | 01/1899 | 02/1954 | 55.08 | |||||||
247 | 16251 | 56251 | 01/1899 | 11/1958 | 59.83 | |||||||
485 | 16252 | 56252 | 01/1899 | 03/1959 | 60.17 | 60.70 | ||||||
516 | 16253 | 56253 | 01/1899 | 12/1958 | 59.92 | 60.20 | ||||||
631 | 16285 | 56285 | 10/1904 | 21/09/1959 | 54.92 | 54.95 | ||||||
632 | 16286 | 56286 | 10/1904 | 05/1958 | 53.58 | |||||||
633 | 16287 | 56287 | 11/1904 | 14/04/1959 | 54.42 | 54.62 | ||||||
634 | 16288 | 56288 | 11/1904 | 09/01/1959 | 54.17 | |||||||
635 | 16289 | 56289 | 12/1904 | 11/1960 | 55.92 | 55.96 | ||||||
636 | 16290 | 56290 | 11/1904 | 29/06/1959 | 54.58 | 54.62 | ||||||
637 | 16291 | 56291 | 11/1904 | 23/07/1959 | 54.67 | 54.70 | ||||||
638 | 16292 | 56292 | 12/1904 | 27/05/1960 | 55.42 | 55.54 | ||||||
639 | 16293 | 56293 | 12/1904 | 05/11/1958 | 53.92 | |||||||
640 | 16294 | 56294 | 12/1904 | 29/04/1957 | 52.33 | |||||||
641 | 16295 | 56295 | 03/1905 | 24/12/1959 | 54.75 | 54.79 | ||||||
642 | 16296 | 56296 | 03/1905 | 20/08/1959 | 54.42 | 54.54 | ||||||
643 | 16297 | 56297 | 04/1905 | 25/11/1957 | 52.58 | |||||||
644 | 16298 | 56298 | 04/1905 | 25/10/1961 | 56.5 | 57.62 | ||||||
645 | 16299 | 56299 | 04/1905 | 02/1957 | 51.83 | 51.95 | ||||||
646 | 16300 | 56300 | 04/1905 | 11/1960 | 55.58 | 55.62 | ||||||
647 | 16301 | 56301 | 05/1905 | 07/10/1958 | 53.42 | |||||||
648 | 16302 | 56302 | 05/1905 | 29/12/1962 | 57.58 | 58.71 | ||||||
649 | 16303 | 56303 | 05/1905 | 31/08/1956 | 51.25 | |||||||
650 | 16230 | 56230 | 05/1905 | 29/01/1957 | 51.67 | |||||||
128 | 16304 | 56304 | 04/1907 | 21/03/1960 | 52.92 | 52.95 | ||||||
129 | 16305 | 56305 | 04/1907 | 04/12/1961 | 54.67 | 54.79 | ||||||
166 | 16306 | 56306 | 04/1907 | 04/12/1958 | 51.67 | |||||||
324 | 271 | 16307 | 56307 | 04/1907 | 19/10/1956 | 49.5 | ||||||
472 | 16311 | 56311 | 04/1907 | 08/01/1959 | 51.75 | |||||||
668 | 16317 | 56317 | 05/1907 | 25/05/1956 | 49 | 49.20 | ||||||
425 | 275 | 16308 | 56308 | 04/1907 | 14/10/1960 | 53.5 | 54.12 | |||||
434 | 489 | 16312 | 56312 | 05/1907 | 21/05/1962 | 55 | Cut | Arnott Young (Troon) | 06/1963 | 56.12 | ||
501 | 16313 | 56313 | 05/1907 | 08/01/1962 | 54.67 | Cut | Arnott Young (Carmyle) | 01/1963 | 55.71 | |||
630 | 16315 | 56315 | 06/1907 | 15/05/1958 | 50.92 | |||||||
417 | 16310 | 56310 | 09/1907 | 04/11/1960 | 53.17 | 53.21 | ||||||
426 | 276 | 16309 | 56309 | 09/1907 | 31/01/1961 | 53.33 | 54.12 | |||||
629 | 16314 | 56314 | 10/1907 | 14/02/1958 | 50.33 | 50.45 | ||||||
667 | 16316 | 56316 | 10/1907 | 10/10/1959 | 52 | 52.54 | ||||||
669 | 16318 | 56318 | 10/1907 | 26/06/1959 | 51.67 | 51.87 | ||||||
432 | 487 | 16325 | 56325 | 01/1910 | 29/12/1962 | 52.92 | 53.95 | |||||
433 | 488 | 16284 | 56284 | 02/1910 | 28/05/1958 | 48.25 | ||||||
475 | 16319 | 56319 | 02/1910 | 31/05/1956 | 46.25 | 46.44 | ||||||
435 | 490 | 16326 | 56326 | 07/1910 | 30/10/1961 | 51.25 | 52.37 | |||||
436 | 491 | 16327 | 56327 | 07/1910 | 23/09/1959 | 49.17 | 49.28 | |||||
476 | 16320 | 56320 | 07/1910 | 01/1957 | 46.5 | |||||||
477 | 16321 | 56321 | 07/1910 | 18/09/1959 | 49.17 | 49.28 | ||||||
478 | 16322 | 56322 | 07/1910 | 30/09/1959 | 49.17 | 49.28 | ||||||
479 | 16323 | 56323 | 07/1910 | 07/10/1958 | 48.25 | |||||||
480 | 16324 | 56324 | 08/1910 | 20/03/1961 | 50.58 | 50.70 | ||||||
416 | 16328 | 56328 | 03/1910 | 02/09/1958 | 48.5 | |||||||
418 | 482 | 16331 | 56331 | 03/1910 | 16/06/1960 | 50.25 | 50.54 | |||||
481 | 16330 | 56330 | 09/1910 | 10/05/1958 | 47.67 | 47.78 | ||||||
474 | 16329 | 56329 | 10/1910 | 05/08/1957 | 46.83 | |||||||
483 | 16332 | 56332 | 10/1910 | 10/10/1959 | 49 | 49.53 | ||||||
484 | 16333 | 56333 | 10/1910 | 10/10/1959 | 49 | 49.12 | ||||||
500 | 16334 | 56334 | 10/1910 | 17/01/1958 | 47.25 | |||||||
608 | 16335 | 56335 | 11/1910 | 14/07/1960 | 49.67 | 49.87 | ||||||
609 | 16336 | 56336 | 11/1910 | 29/12/1962 | 52.08 | 53.12 | ||||||
610 | 16337 | 56337 | 11/1910 | 30/06/1961 | 50.58 | 50.78 | ||||||
277 | 16338 | 56338 | 04/1911 | 24/03/1961 | 49.92 | 50.12 | ||||||
390 | 16344 | 56344 | 04/1911 | 17/09/1959 | 48.42 | 48.53 | ||||||
393 | 16339 | 56339 | 05/1911 | 28/08/1956 | 45.25 | |||||||
397 | 16340 | 56340 | 06/1911 | 10/10/1959 | 48.33 | 48.37 | ||||||
405 | 16341 | 56341 | 07/1911 | 08/03/1961 | 49.67 | 50.12 | ||||||
430 | 486 | 16343 | 56343 | 10/1911 | 01/1961 | 49.25 | 49.53 | |||||
471 | 16342 | 56342 | 10/1911 | 19/03/1957 | 45.42 | |||||||
651 | 16351 | 56351 | 10/1912 | 20/11/1948 | 36.08 | |||||||
781 | 16352 | 56352 | 11/1912 | 15/05/1959 | 46.5 | 46.61 | ||||||
130 | 16345 | 56345 | 11/1912 | 10/10/1958 | 45.92 | |||||||
131 | 16346 | 56346 | 12/1912 | 12/09/1957 | 44.75 | |||||||
171 | 16347 | 56347 | 10/1912 | 16/07/1962 | 49.75 | Cut | Arnott Young (Carmyle) | 09/1963 | 50.95 | |||
172 | 16348 | 56348 | 11/1912 | 06/05/1960 | 47.5 | 47.70 | ||||||
173 | 16349 | 56349 | 11/1912 | 11/03/1960 | 47.33 | 47.70 | ||||||
174 | 16350 | 56350 | 12/1912 | 02/07/1957 | 44.58 | |||||||
175 | 16353 | 56353 | 09/1913 | 06/1958 | 44.75 | |||||||
176 | 16354 | 56354 | 09/1913 | 13/02/1958 | 44.42 | |||||||
177 | 16355 | 56355 | 09/1913 | 09/11/1956 | 43.17 | |||||||
178 | 16356 | 56356 | 09/1913 | 11/12/1961 | 48.25 | 49.20 | ||||||
508 | 16357 | 56357 | 10/1913 | 06/12/1957 | 44.17 | |||||||
509 | 16358 | 56358 | 10/1913 | 10/1956 | 43 | |||||||
232 | 16359 | 56359 | 06/1916 | 19/05/1959 | 42.92 | 43.03 | ||||||
233 | 16360 | 56360 | 07/1916 | 23/08/1961 | 45.08 | 45.28 | ||||||
234 | 16361 | 56361 | 07/1916 | 18/11/1960 | 44.33 | 44.45 | ||||||
235 | 16362 | 56362 | 08/1916 | 04/08/1961 | 45 | 45.20 | ||||||
272 | 16363 | 56363 | 08/1916 | 25/06/1960 | 43.83 | 44.03 | ||||||
273 | 16364 | 56364 | 09/1916 | 15/12/1960 | 44.25 | 45.28 | ||||||
274 | 16365 | 56365 | 09/1916 | 15/05/1959 | 42.67 | 42.78 | ||||||
248 | 16366 | 56366 | 07/1921 | 02/11/1956 | 35.33 | |||||||
249 | 16367 | 56367 | 07/1921 | 01/02/1960 | 38.58 | 38.69 | ||||||
250 | 16368 | 56368 | 08/1921 | 04/12/1961 | 40.33 | 40.86 | ||||||
251 | 16369 | 56369 | 08/1921 | 04/11/1957 | 36.25 | |||||||
252 | 16370 | 56370 | 04/1922 | 13/02/1961 | 38.83 | 39.36 | ||||||
253 | 16371 | 56371 | 04/1922 | 20/01/1960 | 37.75 | 37.86 | ||||||
254 | 16372 | 56372 | 05/1922 | 11/05/1961 | 39 | 39.28 | ||||||
255 | 16373 | 56373 | 05/1922 | 10/10/1959 | 37.42 | 37.95 | ||||||
394 | 16374 | 56374 | 05/1922 | 10/10/1959 | 37.42 | 37.95 | ||||||
395 | 16375 | 56375 | 06/1922 | 07/08/1958 | 36.17 | |||||||
396 | 16376 | 56376 | 06/1922 | 10/03/1961 | 38.75 | 39.19 |