LNWR/LMS Webb "2F" Class 0-6-2T
Class | LNWR | LNWR (Duplicate) | LMS | LMS (Duplicate) | BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Coal Tank | 602 | 7568 | 09/1881 | 1932 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 627 | 7570 | 09/1881 | 06/1927 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 971 | 7574 | 09/1881 | 01/1929 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 703 | 7571 | 27571 | 09/1881 | 08/1946 | |||||
Coal Tank | 957 | 7573 | 09/1881 | 1932 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 766 | 7572 | 27572 | 09/1881 | 11/1946 | |||||
Coal Tank | 1060 | 7575 | 27575 | 09/1881 | 12/1938 | |||||
Coal Tank | 102 | 7576 | 09/1881 | 09/1934 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 119 | 3710 | 7577 | 27577 | 09/1881 | 02/1946 | ||||
Coal Tank | 141 | 7578 | 09/1881 | 08/1928 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 313 | 3119 | 7579 | 10/1881 | 08/1928 | |||||
Coal Tank | 205 | 3154 | 7580 | 27580 | 58883 | 10/1881 | 8A W |
Edge Hill Withdrawn |
13/03/1948 31/12/1949 |
31/12/1949 |
Coal Tank | 207 | 3206 | 7581 | 10/1881 | 02/1929 | |||||
Coal Tank | 208 | 3292 | 7582 | 10/1881 | 1931 | |||||
Coal Tank | 227 | 3737 | 7551 | 27551 | 10/1881 | 11/1938 | ||||
Coal Tank | 68 | 3707 | 7584 | 10/1881 | 08/1932 | |||||
Coal Tank | 850 | 7583 | 27583 | 10/1881 | 01/1937 | |||||
Coal Tank | 232 | 3738 | 7585 | 27585 | 58884 | 10/1881 | W | Withdrawn | 13/11/1948 | 13/11/1948 |
Coal Tank | 239 | 3740 | 7586 | 27586 | 58885 | 11/1881 | W | Withdrawn | 18/09/1948 | 18/09/1948 |
Coal Tank | 241 | 3742 | 7587 | 11/1881 | 09/1932 | |||||
Coal Tank | 242 | 3743 | 7588 | 11/1881 | 11/1932 | |||||
Coal Tank | 243 | 3744 | 7589 | 11/1881 | 09/1925 | |||||
Coal Tank | 244 | 3745 | 7590 | 27590 | 11/1881 | 11/1947 | ||||
Coal Tank | 246 | 3746 | 7591 | 27591 | 58886 | 12/1881 | 4A W |
Shrewsbury Withdrawn |
20/03/1948 01/1949 |
01/1949 |
Coal Tank | 247 | 3747 | 7592 | 27592 | 12/1881 | 01/1936 | ||||
Coal Tank | 248 | 3748 | 7593 | 27593 | 12/1881 | 04/1938 | ||||
Coal Tank | 249 | 3749 | 7594 | 27594 | 12/1881 | 08/1938 | ||||
Coal Tank | 251 | 3750 | 7595 | 12/1881 | 06/1930 | |||||
Coal Tank | 252 | 3751 | 7596 | 27596 | 58887 | 12/1881 | 4A 4A W |
Bletchley Bletchley Withdrawn |
21/10/1950 04/11/1950 09/04/1955 |
09/04/1955 |
Coal Tank | 142 | 3718 | 12/1881 | 07/1922 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 2458 | 7597 | 27597 | 08/1882 | 11/1947 | |||||
Coal Tank | 2459 | 7598 | 08/1882 | 06/1927 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 2460 | 7599 | 08/1882 | 12/1930 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 2461 | 7600 | 27600 | 08/1882 | 07/1937 | |||||
Coal Tank | 2462 | 7601 | 08/1882 | 1931 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 2463 | 7602 | 27602 | 58888 | 08/1882 | 7B 7D 4E 86K 86K 87K W |
Bangor Rhyl Tredegar Abergavenny Abergavenny Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) Withdrawn |
22/06/1946 13/03/1948 28/01/1950 26/01/1952 29/02/1952 22/05/1954 30/09/1954 |
30/09/1954 | |
Coal Tank | 996 | 7607 | 08/1882 | 11/1930 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 991 | 7554 | 08/1882 | 11/1928 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 701 | 7605 | 27605 | 08/1882 | 04/1946 | |||||
Coal Tank | 770 | 7553 | 27553 | 58880 | 08/1882 | 86K 86K 87K W |
Abergavenny Abergavenny Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) Withdrawn |
26/01/1952 29/02/1952 31/08/1952 30/04/1954 |
30/04/1954 | |
Coal Tank | 605 | 7569 | 08/1882 | 11/1928 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 611 | 7552 | 27552 | 09/1882 | 08/1947 | |||||
Coal Tank | 682 | 7604 | 27604 | 09/1882 | 03/1946 | |||||
Coal Tank | 292 | 3053 | 7609 | 27609 | 09/1882 | 04/1946 | ||||
Coal Tank | 679 | 7603 | 27603 | 58889 | 09/1882 | 7D 86K 87K W |
Rhyl Abergavenny Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) Withdrawn |
08/05/1948 31/12/1950 21/02/1953 31/08/1953 |
31/08/1953 | |
Coal Tank | 717 | 7606 | 27606 | 09/1882 | 11/1946 | |||||
Coal Tank | 140 | 3716 | 7610 | 09/1882 | 1932 | |||||
Coal Tank | 157 | 3725 | 7611 | 09/1882 | 1931 | |||||
Coal Tank | 158 | 3726 | 7612 | 09/1882 | 04/1927 | |||||
Coal Tank | 267 | 3756 | 7613 | 09/1882 | 1932 | |||||
Coal Tank | 693 | 7614 | 09/1882 | 11/1930 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 997 | 7608 | 27608 | 09/1882 | 10/1934 | |||||
Coal Tank | 268 | 3757 | 7615 | 27615 | 09/1882 | 03/1936 | ||||
Coal Tank | 269 | 3758 | 7616 | 27616 | 09/1882 | 12/1945 | ||||
Coal Tank | 270 | 3759 | 7617 | 09/1882 | 10/1928 | |||||
Coal Tank | 272 | 3760 | 7618 | 27618 | 01/1883 | 10/1947 | ||||
Coal Tank | 273 | 3761 | 7619 | 27619 | 58890 | 01/1883 | 8A 8C W |
Edge Hill Speke Junction Withdrawn |
03/07/1948 11/12/1948 11/1949 |
11/1949 |
Coal Tank | 274 | 3762 | 7620 | 01/1883 | 04/1928 | |||||
Coal Tank | 277 | 3763 | 7621 | 27621 | 58891 | 01/1883 | 4D W |
Abergavenny Withdrawn |
24/01/1948 08/1955 |
08/1955 |
Coal Tank | 281 | 3764 | 7622 | 01/1883 | 04/1927 | |||||
Coal Tank | 673 | 7624 | 27624 | 01/1883 | 06/1946 | |||||
Coal Tank | 797 | 7626 | 27626 | 01/1883 | 11/1944 | |||||
Coal Tank | 1009 | 7627 | 27627 | 58893 | 01/1883 | 10D W |
Plodder Lane Withdrawn |
20/03/1948 16/10/1948 |
16/10/1948 | |
Coal Tank | 629 | 7623 | 27623 | 02/1883 | 10D | Plodder Lane | 02/11/1935 | 11/1944 | ||
Coal Tank | 747 | 7625 | 27625 | 58892 | 02/1883 | W | Withdrawn | 24/05/1952 | 24/05/1952 | |
Coal Tank | 1015 | 7556 | 02/1883 | 09/1924 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 671 | 7649 | 02/1883 | 1933 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 607 | 7647 | 02/1883 | 02/1928 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 690 | 7650 | 27650 | 02/1883 | 03/1946 | |||||
Coal Tank | 615 | 7648 | 27648 | 02/1883 | 01/1948 | |||||
Coal Tank | 2473 | 7628 | 02/1883 | 04/1927 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 2474 | 7629 | 02/1883 | 05/1928 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 2475 | 7630 | 02/1883 | 12/1934 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 2476 | 7631 | 02/1883 | 09/1944 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 2477 | 7632 | 02/1883 | 07/1933 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 2478 | 7633 | 02/1883 | 06/1926 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 2479 | 7634 | 03/1883 | 05/1929 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 2480 | 7635 | 27635 | 58894 | 03/1883 | 23B 4D W |
Aintree Abergavenny Withdrawn |
02/11/1935 10/04/1948 03/1949 |
03/1949 | |
Coal Tank | 2481 | 7636 | 27636 | 03/1883 | 12/1947 | |||||
Coal Tank | 2482 | 7637 | 03/1883 | 03/1926 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 2483 | 7638 | 27638 | 03/1883 | 07/1934 | |||||
Coal Tank | 2484 | 7639 | 27639 | 03/1883 | 11/1936 | |||||
Coal Tank | 2485 | 7640 | 27640 | 03/1883 | 10/1947 | |||||
Coal Tank | 2486 | 7641 | 03/1883 | 11/1932 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 2487 | 7642 | 03/1883 | 09/1932 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 2488 | 7643 | 04/1883 | 07/1934 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 2489 | 7644 | 04/1883 | 04/1926 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 2490 | 7555 | 27555 | 04/1883 | 01/1947 | |||||
Coal Tank | 2491 | 7645 | 27645 | 04/1883 | 12/1945 | |||||
Coal Tank | 2492 | 7646 | 04/1883 | 09/1926 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 952 | 7651 | 27651 | 07/1883 | 10/1938 | |||||
Coal Tank | 953 | 7657 | 27657 | 07/1883 | 11/1936 | |||||
Coal Tank | 617 | 7652 | 07/1883 | 11/1934 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 678 | 7653 | 07/1883 | 06/1927 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 518 | 3285 | 7566 | 07/1883 | 03/1928 | |||||
Coal Tank | 694 | 7655 | 27655 | 07/1883 | 04/1937 | |||||
Coal Tank | 692 | 7654 | 27654 | 58895 | 07/1883 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1951 | 10/1951 | |
Coal Tank | 698 | 7656 | 07/1883 | 1932 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 780 | 7658 | 07/1883 | 04/1927 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 959 | 7659 | 27659 | 07/1883 | 11/1935 | |||||
Coal Tank | 1004 | 7660 | 27660 | 07/1883 | 09/1938 | |||||
Coal Tank | 42 | 3705 | 7662 | 27662 | 07/1883 | 07/1946 | ||||
Coal Tank | 110 | 3709 | 7663 | 27663 | 07/1883 | 12/1947 | ||||
Coal Tank | 148 | 3720 | 7664 | 27664 | 07/1883 | 12/1947 | ||||
Coal Tank | 150 | 3722 | 7665 | 08/1883 | 03/1928 | |||||
Coal Tank | 169 | 3728 | 7666 | 27666 | 08/1883 | 01/1947 | ||||
Coal Tank | 178 | 08/1883 | 01/1920 | |||||||
Coal Tank | 179 | 3729 | 7667 | 08/1883 | 1931 | |||||
Coal Tank | 223 | 3735 | 7668 | 27684 | 08/1883 | 1931 | ||||
Coal Tank | 259 | 3753 | 7669 | 27669 | 58896 | 08/1883 | 7D 7B 4A W |
Rhyl Bangor Shrewsbury Withdrawn |
20/03/1948 08/05/1948 17/07/1948 01/1949 |
01/1949 |
Coal Tank | 1106 | 7672 | 27672 | 10/1883 | 10/1947 | |||||
Coal Tank | 1109 | 7673 | 10/1883 | 07/1928 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 324 | 3151 | 7675 | 11/1883 | 06/1927 | |||||
Coal Tank | 848 | 7670 | 11/1883 | 05/1927 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 1101 | 7671 | 11/1883 | 07/1931 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 1112 | 7674 | 27674 | 58897 | 11/1883 | 8A 10D 8A 4A W |
Edge Hill Plodder Lane Edge Hill Bletchley Withdrawn |
22/06/1946 11/09/1948 06/11/1948 01/07/1950 10/1950 |
10/1950 | |
Coal Tank | 373 | 3339 | 7684 | 11/1883 | 11/1935 | |||||
Coal Tank | 1118 | 7682 | 11/1883 | 06/1947 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 981 | 7680 | 27680 | 11/1883 | 01/1937 | |||||
Coal Tank | 491 | 3005 | 7567 | 11/1883 | 03/1928 | |||||
Coal Tank | 149 | 3721 | 7687 | 12/1883 | 1932 | |||||
Coal Tank | 1013 | 7681 | 27681 | 58898 | 12/1883 | 6C W |
Birkenhead Mollington Street Withdrawn |
08/02/1936 02/10/1948 |
02/10/1948 | |
Coal Tank | 367 | 3029 | 7683 | 12/1883 | 04/1927 | |||||
Coal Tank | 489 | 3448 | 7685 | 12/1883 | 10/1927 | |||||
Coal Tank | 490 | 3457 | 7686 | 27686 | 12/1883 | 11/1935 | ||||
Coal Tank | 492 | 3055 | 7557 | 12/1883 | 12/1930 | |||||
Coal Tank | 925 | 7676 | 01/1884 | 10/1928 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 926 | 7677 | 01/1884 | 1932 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 927 | 7678 | 27678 | 01/1884 | 12/1945 | |||||
Coal Tank | 928 | 7679 | 01/1884 | 1932 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 6 | 3336 | 7692 | 58899 | 04/1884 | 2B 4D 87K W |
Bletchley Abergavenny Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) Withdrawn |
03/07/1948 23/10/1948 08/08/1953 08/1954 |
08/1954 | |
Coal Tank | 8 | 3475 | 7693 | 04/1884 | 03/1928 | |||||
Coal Tank | 23 | 3702 | 7694 | 04/1884 | 10/1927 | |||||
Coal Tank | 30 | 3703 | 7695 | 04/1884 | 11/1928 | |||||
Coal Tank | 32 | 3704 | 7696 | 04/1884 | 05/1932 | |||||
Coal Tank | 1057 | 7690 | 07/1884 | 07/1947 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 948 | 7689 | 07/1884 | 07/1927 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 152 | 3723 | 7691 | 27691 | 09/1884 | 1935 | ||||
Coal Tank | 751 | 7688 | 08/1884 | 04/1938 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 994 | 09/1884 | 07/1922 | |||||||
Coal Tank | 63 | 3706 | 7697 | 09/1884 | 04/1924 | |||||
Coal Tank | 145 | 3719 | 7698 | 09/1884 | 08/1928 | |||||
Coal Tank | 186 | 3724 | 7699 | 58900 | 09/1884 | 8C 8C 4A 10E 3E 3E 87K 84G W |
Speke Junction Speke Junction Shrewsbury Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Monument Lane Monument Lane Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) Shrewsbury Withdrawn |
10/12/1949 24/12/1949 25/03/1950 01/07/1950 24/02/1951 28/02/1951 27/03/1954 19/06/1954 10/1954 |
10/1954 | |
Coal Tank | 161 | 3727 | 7700 | 09/1884 | 03/1948 | |||||
Coal Tank | 258 | 3752 | 7701 | 09/1884 | 07/1927 | |||||
Coal Tank | 1005 | 7705 | 10/1884 | 11/1946 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 947 | 7702 | 10/1884 | 07/1928 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 949 | 7703 | 58901 | 10/1884 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1948 | 07/1948 | ||
Coal Tank | 950 | 7704 | 10/1884 | 12/1930 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 483 | 3423 | 7706 | 10/1884 | 06/1928 | |||||
Coal Tank | 484 | 12/1884 | 02/1920 | |||||||
Coal Tank | 652 | 7707 | 12/1884 | 12/1930 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 699 | 7708 | 12/1884 | 03/1928 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 771 | 7709 | 12/1884 | 06/1947 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 782 | 12/1884 | 11/1922 | |||||||
Coal Tank | 796 | 7710 | 58902 | 12/1884 | W | Withdrawn | 31/12/1954 | 31/12/1954 | ||
Coal Tank | 958 | 7558 | 27558 | 12/1884 | 01/1947 | |||||
Coal Tank | 966 | 7711 | 58903 | 01/1885 | 8C 7B W |
Speke Junction Bangor Withdrawn |
02/11/1935 13/03/1948 19/06/1954 |
19/06/1954 | ||
Coal Tank | 970 | 7712 | 01/1885 | 07/1938 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 1012 | 01/1885 | 07/1922 | |||||||
Coal Tank | 1016 | 7713 | 01/1885 | 11/1932 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 1075 | 7714 | 01/1885 | 06/1928 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 1201 | 7715 | 01/1885 | 01/1948 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 1202 | 7716 | 01/1885 | 09/1928 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 1203 | 7717 | 01/1885 | 11/1947 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 1204 | 7718 | 01/1885 | 1932 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 1206 | 7719 | 01/1885 | 1932 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 1207 | 7720 | 58904 | 01/1885 | 8A 4A W |
Edge Hill Shrewsbury Withdrawn |
06/11/1948 22/01/1949 30/09/1955 |
30/09/1955 | ||
Coal Tank | 1208 | 7721 | 58905 | 01/1885 | W | Withdrawn | 28/08/1948 | 28/08/1948 | ||
Coal Tank | 1209 | 7722 | 01/1885 | 01/1947 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 1210 | 7723 | 04/1886 | 04/1927 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 2360 | 7724 | 04/1886 | 08/1938 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 2361 | 7725 | 04/1886 | 11/1930 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 2362 | 7726 | 04/1885 | 09/1927 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 2363 | 7727 | 27727 | 04/1886 | 03/1936 | |||||
Coal Tank | 2364 | 7728 | 04/1886 | 12/1938 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 2453 | 7729 | 04/1886 | 01/1944 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 2454 | 7730 | 58906 | 04/1886 | 7A 7B 4D W |
Llandudno Junction Bangor Abergavenny Withdrawn |
21/02/1948 17/07/1948 11/09/1948 13/11/1948 |
13/11/1948 | ||
Coal Tank | 2455 | 7731 | 04/1886 | 06/1928 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 2456 | 7732 | 04/1886 | 05/1928 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 2457 | 7733 | 58907 | 04/1886 | 2A W |
Rugby Withdrawn |
30/11/1935 02/10/1948 |
02/10/1948 | ||
Coal Tank | 355 | 3271 | 7735 | 07/1886 | 11/1928 | |||||
Coal Tank | 357 | 3320 | 7736 | 27736 | 07/1886 | 05/1936 | ||||
Coal Tank | 359 | 3325 | 7737 | 58908 | 07/1886 | 3E 8A 4E 8A 10E 4A 3E 4A 4A W |
Monument Lane Edge Hill Tredegar Edge Hill Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Bletchley Monument Lane Bletchley Bletchley Withdrawn |
30/10/1948 23/04/1949 27/08/1949 17/09/1949 25/03/1950 01/07/1950 11/08/1951 01/09/1951 08/09/1951 10/11/1951 |
10/11/1951 | |
Coal Tank | 240 | 3741 | 7741 | 58910 | 07/1886 | W | Withdrawn | 05/07/1952 | 05/07/1952 | |
Coal Tank | 210 | 3453 | 7740 | 58909 | 07/1886 | W | Withdrawn | 12/06/1948 | 12/06/1948 | |
Coal Tank | 369 | 3058 | 7734 | 27734 | 07/1886 | 09/1936 | ||||
Coal Tank | 436 | 3415 | 7559 | 07/1886 | 1931 | |||||
Coal Tank | 452 | 3422 | 7739 | 07/1886 | 1931 | |||||
Coal Tank | 438 | 3418 | 7738 | 07/1886 | 12/1930 | |||||
Coal Tank | 120 | 3711 | 7749 | 08/1886 | 01/1928 | |||||
Coal Tank | 261 | 3754 | 7756 | 58914 | 08/1886 | W | Withdrawn | 28/08/1948 | 28/08/1948 | |
Coal Tank | 266 | 3755 | 7757 | 58915 | 08/1886 | 9D 4E 86K 86K 87K W |
Buxton (LNWR) Tredegar Abergavenny Abergavenny Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) Withdrawn |
03/07/1948 14/08/1948 26/01/1952 29/02/1952 27/03/1954 30/09/1954 |
30/09/1954 | |
Coal Tank | 215 | 3731 | 7751 | 58912 | 08/1886 | 2B W |
Bletchley Withdrawn |
23/04/1949 16/12/1950 |
16/12/1950 | |
Coal Tank | 293 | 3105 | 7744 | 08/1886 | 1931 | |||||
Coal Tank | 296 | 3109 | 7745 | 08/1886 | 04/1927 | |||||
Coal Tank | 192 | 3068 | 7743 | 08/1886 | 12/1930 | |||||
Coal Tank | 211 | 3509 | 7748 | 08/1886 | 07/1931 | |||||
Coal Tank | 220 | 3733 | 7753 | 08/1886 | 10/1927 | |||||
Coal Tank | 440 | 3419 | 7747 | 08/1886 | 09/1947 | |||||
Coal Tank | 221 | 3734 | 7754 | 08/1886 | 04/1927 | |||||
Coal Tank | 237 | 3739 | 7755 | 08/1886 | 09/1947 | |||||
Coal Tank | 123 | 3712 | 7750 | 27750 | 08/1886 | 03/1936 | ||||
Coal Tank | 183 | 3044 | 7742 | 08/1886 | 10/1947 | |||||
Coal Tank | 216 | 3732 | 7752 | 58913 | 08/1885 | 10D 4D W |
Plodder Lane Abergavenny Withdrawn |
03/07/1948 23/10/1948 06/1952 |
06/1952 | |
Coal Tank | 407 | 3353 | 7746 | 58911 | 08/1886 | 8A 4A 4A 7D 7D 86K 87K W |
Edge Hill Bletchley Bletchley Rhyl Rhyl Abergavenny Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) Withdrawn |
27/08/1949 30/09/1950 07/10/1950 21/10/1950 04/11/1950 03/11/1951 31/08/1952 31/03/1954 |
31/03/1954 | |
Coal Tank | 1338 | 7762 | 12/1886 | 01/1935 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 2010 | 7763 | 12/1886 | 04/1946 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 442 | 3420 | 7560 | 12/1886 | 05/1928 | |||||
Coal Tank | 429 | 3414 | 7764 | 12/1886 | 7B | Bangor | 08/02/1936 | 02/1939 | ||
Coal Tank | 411 | 3356 | 7758 | 12/1886 | 1932 | |||||
Coal Tank | 417 | 3387 | 7759 | 58916 | 12/1886 | 4D W |
Abergavenny Withdrawn |
23/10/1948 07/10/1950 |
07/10/1950 | |
Coal Tank | 224 | 3736 | 7761 | 12/1886 | 03/1946 | |||||
Coal Tank | 549 | 3287 | 7550 | 12/1886 | 07/1931 | |||||
Coal Tank | 551 | 3428 | 7760 | 12/1886 | 12/1930 | |||||
Coal Tank | 554 | 3447 | 7767 | 02/1887 | 06/1927 | |||||
Coal Tank | 557 | 3765 | 7768 | 02/1887 | 12/1944 | |||||
Coal Tank | 558 | 3766 | 7769 | 58918 | 02/1887 | W | Withdrawn | 24/04/1948 | 24/04/1948 | |
Coal Tank | 579 | 7766 | 02/1887 | 06/1927 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 567 | 3767 | 7770 | 02/1887 | 02/1936 | |||||
Coal Tank | 568 | 3768 | 7771 | 02/1887 | 1928 | |||||
Coal Tank | 569 | 3769 | 7772 | 02/1887 | 04/1947 | |||||
Coal Tank | 570 | 3770 | 7773 | 58919 | 02/1887 | 86K W |
Abergavenny Withdrawn |
25/03/1950 20/12/1952 |
20/12/1952 | |
Coal Tank | 571 | 3771 | 7774 | 02/1887 | 03/1936 | |||||
Coal Tank | 572 | 3772 | 7775 | 02/1887 | 11/1930 | |||||
Coal Tank | 573 | 3773 | 7776 | 02/1887 | 12/1924 | |||||
Coal Tank | 974 | 3774 | 7777 | 02/1887 | 09/1930 | |||||
Coal Tank | 575 | 3775 | 7778 | 02/1887 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | 02/11/1935 | 09/1946 | ||
Coal Tank | 576 | 3776 | 7561 | 27561 | 58881 | 02/1887 | 4A W |
Shrewsbury Withdrawn |
23/04/1949 09/1950 |
09/1950 |
Coal Tank | 578 | 7765 | 58917 | 02/1887 | 10E 7B 7D W |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Bangor Rhyl Withdrawn |
22/06/1946 05/06/1948 23/10/1948 02/1950 |
02/1950 | ||
Coal Tank | 129 | 3714 | 7787 | 58922 | 05/1887 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1948 | 07/1948 | |
Coal Tank | 443 | 3421 | 7785 | 05/1887 | 1932 | |||||
Coal Tank | 135 | 3715 | 7788 | 05/1887 | 1931 | |||||
Coal Tank | 580 | 7779 | 05/1887 | 04/1932 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 582 | 7780 | 58920 | 05/1887 | W | Withdrawn | 14/08/1948 | 14/08/1948 | ||
Coal Tank | 584 | 7781 | 05/1887 | 1934 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 585 | 7782 | 58921 | 05/1887 | 8A 7D 86K 86K 86K 87K W |
Edge Hill Rhyl Abergavenny Abergavenny Abergavenny Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) Withdrawn |
11/12/1948 31/12/1950 03/11/1951 26/01/1952 29/02/1952 11/07/1953 21/08/1954 |
21/08/1954 | ||
Coal Tank | 435 | 3155 | 7562 | 27562 | 58882 | 05/1887 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1949 | 10/1949 |
Coal Tank | 125 | 3713 | 7786 | 05/1887 | 04/1927 | |||||
Coal Tank | 588 | 7783 | 05/1887 | 1932 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 589 | 7784 | 05/1887 | 01/1936 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 590 | 7789 | 58923 | 06/1887 | 4E W |
Tredegar Withdrawn |
06/11/1948 01/1950 |
01/1950 | ||
Coal Tank | 591 | 7790 | 06/1887 | 12/1930 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 592 | 7791 | 58924 | 06/1887 | 8A 7D 86K 87K W |
Edge Hill Rhyl Abergavenny Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) Withdrawn |
11/04/1936 18/02/1950 31/10/1950 22/05/1954 30/09/1954 |
30/09/1954 | ||
Coal Tank | 594 | 7792 | 06/1887 | 11/1937 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 595 | 7793 | 06/1887 | 1932 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 596 | 7794 | 58925 | 06/1887 | 4A 4E 86K 86K W |
Shrewsbury Tredegar Abergavenny Abergavenny Withdrawn |
24/04/1948 10/07/1948 26/01/1952 29/02/1952 30/09/1955 |
30/09/1955 | ||
Coal Tank | 597 | 7563 | 27563 | 06/1887 | 10/1934 | |||||
Coal Tank | 493 | 3062 | 27795 | 06/1887 | 01/1947 | |||||
Coal Tank | 325 | 3209 | 7796 | 07/1887 | 02/1948 | |||||
Coal Tank | 706 | 7797 | 06/1888 | 12/1945 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 753 | 7798 | 07/1888 | 05/1927 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 1053 | 7661 | 09/1888 | 09/1928 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 1054 | 7799 | 58926 | 09/1888 | 8A 2B 84G 86K 84G W |
Edge Hill Bletchley Shrewsbury Abergavenny Shrewsbury Withdrawn |
06/11/1948 12/11/1949 30/09/1950 22/05/1954 08/10/1955 31/10/1958 |
31/10/1958 | ||
Coal Tank | 1062 | 7800 | 09/1888 | 10/1927 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 1063 | 7801 | 09/1888 | 1932 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 1067 | 7802 | 58927 | 09/1888 | 3E W |
Monument Lane Withdrawn |
06/11/1948 10/1949 |
10/1949 | ||
Coal Tank | 1068 | 7803 | 58928 | 09/1888 | 3E W |
Monument Lane Withdrawn |
12/11/1949 27/01/1951 |
27/01/1951 | ||
Coal Tank | 1069 | 7804 | 09/1888 | 10/1934 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 1076 | 7805 | 09/1888 | 1931 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 1031 | 7806 | 09/1888 | 03/1936 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 1046 | 7807 | 12/1888 | 01/1946 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 1048 | 7808 | 58929 | 12/1888 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1950 | 03/1950 | ||
Coal Tank | 1049 | 7809 | 12/1888 | 08/1928 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 1050 | 7810 | 12/1888 | 04/1927 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 1052 | 7811 | 12/1888 | 1934 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 1077 | 7812 | 12/1888 | 01/1946 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 1078 | 7813 | 12/1888 | 08/1932 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 1079 | 7814 | 12/1888 | 12/1934 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 1080 | 7815 | 12/1888 | 11/1928 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 1250 | 7816 | 58930 | 07/1892 | 4A 4E W |
Shrewsbury Tredegar Withdrawn |
13/03/1948 20/03/1948 18/09/1948 |
18/09/1948 | ||
Coal Tank | 1251 | 7817 | 07/1892 | 11/1926 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 1252 | 7818 | 07/1892 | 10/1934 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 1253 | 7819 | 07/1892 | 04/1927 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 1254 | 7820 | 07/1892 | 10/1934 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 1255 | 7821 | 58931 | 07/1892 | 6A W |
Chester (MR) Withdrawn |
22/06/1946 27/03/1948 |
27/03/1948 | ||
Coal Tank | 1256 | 7822 | 58932 | 07/1892 | 8A 7D 10E 10E 3E 4A 3E W |
Edge Hill Rhyl Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Monument Lane Bletchley Monument Lane Withdrawn |
18/09/1948 09/09/1950 30/11/1950 02/12/1950 01/12/1951 26/01/1952 19/04/1952 06/1952 |
06/1952 | ||
Coal Tank | 1257 | 07/1892 | 01/1920 | |||||||
Coal Tank | 1258 | 7823 | 07/1892 | 06/1947 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 1259 | 7824 | 07/1892 | 05/1945 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 331 | 3231 | 7828 | 10/1896 | 10/1928 | |||||
Coal Tank | 1198 | 7826 | 10/1896 | 1932 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 1199 | 7564 | 10/1896 | 1931 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 1200 | 7827 | 10/1896 | 04/1946 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 10 | 3498 | 7829 | 58933 | 10/1896 | 4E W |
Tredegar Withdrawn |
24/01/1948 15/12/1951 |
15/12/1951 | |
Coal Tank | 11 | 3669 | 7830 | 27830 | 58934 | 10/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1949 | 10/1949 |
Coal Tank | 709 | 7825 | 10/1896 | 12/1927 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 13 | 3670 | 7831 | 10/1896 | 07/1935 | |||||
Coal Tank | 15 | 3701 | 7832 | 11/1896 | 10/1927 | |||||
Coal Tank | 69 | 11/1896 | 01/1920 | |||||||
Coal Tank | 2350 | 7833 | 58935 | 02/1897 | 4E 4D W |
Tredegar Abergavenny Withdrawn |
12/11/1949 19/11/1949 10/1951 |
10/1951 | ||
Coal Tank | 2351 | 7834 | 02/1897 | 10/1947 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 2352 | 7835 | 02/1897 | 03/1936 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 2353 | 7836 | 58936 | 02/1897 | W | Withdrawn | 22/05/1948 | 22/05/1948 | ||
Coal Tank | 2354 | 7837 | 02/1897 | 05/1927 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 2355 | 7838 | 02/1897 | 11/1938 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 2356 | 7565 | 02/1897 | 12/1930 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 2357 | 7839 | 02/1897 | 02/1928 | ||||||
Coal Tank | 2358 | 7840 | 58937 | 02/1897 | W | Withdrawn | 24/04/1948 | 24/04/1948 | ||
Coal Tank | 180 | 7841 | 02/1897 | 02/1948 |