LNWR/LMS Beames "G2" Class 0-8-0
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/11/1935 | Reallocation | 9450 | 2D | Nuneaton | |||
30/11/1935 | Reallocation | 9396 | 2C | Northampton | |||
30/11/1935 | Reallocation | 9400 | 2A | Rugby | |||
30/11/1935 | Reallocation | 9401 | 2A | Rugby | |||
11/04/1936 | Reallocation | 9425 | 2B | Bletchley | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9395 | 2C | Northampton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9396 | 2C | Northampton | 5B | Crewe South | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9397 | 2A | Rugby | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9398 | 1A | Willesden | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9399 | 2A | Rugby | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9400 | 2A | Rugby | 2D | Nuneaton | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9401 | 2A | Rugby | 2B | Bletchley | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9402 | 3A | Bescot | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9403 | 4D | Abergavenny | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9404 | 2A | Rugby | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9405 | 10C | Patricroft | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9406 | 2B | Bletchley | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9407 | 4B | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9408 | 2A | Rugby | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9409 | 4E | Tredegar | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9410 | 2A | Rugby | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9411 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9412 | 2D | Nuneaton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9413 | 2A | Rugby | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9414 | 2C | Northampton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9415 | 5B | Crewe South | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9416 | 2B | Bletchley | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9417 | 10B | Preston | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9418 | 4B | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9419 | 10B | Preston | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9420 | 10B | Preston | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9421 | 10B | Preston | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9422 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9423 | 2F | Coventry | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9424 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9425 | 2B | Bletchley | 3A | Bescot | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9426 | 2C | Northampton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9427 | 2B | Bletchley | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9428 | 2D | Nuneaton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9429 | 2D | Nuneaton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9430 | 2D | Nuneaton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9431 | 3A | Bescot | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9432 | 2D | Nuneaton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9433 | 2A | Rugby | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9434 | 2A | Rugby | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9435 | 2D | Nuneaton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9436 | 2D | Nuneaton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9437 | 2D | Nuneaton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9438 | 1A | Willesden | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9439 | 2D | Nuneaton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9440 | 2F | Coventry | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9441 | 2A | Rugby | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9442 | 10B | Preston | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9443 | 2B | Bletchley | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9444 | 2C | Northampton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9445 | 4A | Shrewsbury | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9446 | 2A | Rugby | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9447 | 6B | Mold Junction | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9448 | 1A | Willesden | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9449 | 8A | Edge Hill | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9450 | 2D | Nuneaton | 5B | Crewe South | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9451 | 10B | Preston | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9452 | 2A | Rugby | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9453 | 1A | Willesden | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9454 | 1A | Willesden | |||
10/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9406 | 2B | Bletchley | 4D | Abergavenny | |
24/04/1948 | Reallocation | 9396 | 5B | Crewe South | 1A | Willesden | |
24/04/1948 | Reallocation | 9415 | 5B | Crewe South | 9A | Longsight | |
24/04/1948 | Reallocation | 9450 | 5B | Crewe South | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | |
10/07/1948 | Reallocation | 49442 | 10B | Preston | 2A | Rugby | |
17/07/1948 | Reallocation | 9395 | 2C | Northampton | 2D | Nuneaton | |
17/07/1948 | Reallocation | 9414 | 2C | Northampton | 2D | Nuneaton | |
07/08/1948 | Reallocation | 49451 | 10B | Preston | 2D | Nuneaton | |
28/08/1948 | Reallocation | 49426 | 2C | Northampton | 2A | Rugby | |
25/09/1948 | Reallocation | 49407 | 4B | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | 2A | Rugby | |
16/10/1948 | Reallocation | 49424 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 2D | Nuneaton | |
23/10/1948 | Reallocation | 49400 | 2D | Nuneaton | 8B | Warrington Dallam | |
30/10/1948 | Reallocation | 49425 | 3A | Bescot | 2A | Rugby | |
27/11/1948 | Reallocation | 9445 | 4A | Shrewsbury | 2A | Rugby | |
11/12/1948 | Reallocation | 9405 | 10C | Patricroft | 10C | Patricroft | |
11/12/1948 | Reallocation | 49431 | 3A | Bescot | 2A | Rugby | |
11/12/1948 | Reallocation | 9445 | 2A | Rugby | 2F | Coventry | |
18/12/1948 | Reallocation | 49431 | 2A | Rugby | 2A | Rugby | |
25/12/1948 | Reallocation | 49416 | 2B | Bletchley | 2A | Rugby | |
25/12/1948 | Reallocation | 9421 | 10B | Preston | 2D | Nuneaton | |
01/01/1949 | Reallocation | 49411 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | 2A | Rugby | |
15/01/1949 | Reallocation | 49419 | 10B | Preston | 2D | Nuneaton | |
26/02/1949 | Reallocation | 49400 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | 2D | Nuneaton | |
12/03/1949 | Reallocation | 9405 | 10C | Patricroft | 2B | Bletchley | |
12/03/1949 | Reallocation | 9417 | 10B | Preston | 2B | Bletchley | |
12/03/1949 | Reallocation | 9420 | 10B | Preston | 2B | Bletchley | |
12/03/1949 | Reallocation | 9422 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 2B | Bletchley | |
12/03/1949 | Reallocation | 9450 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | 2B | Bletchley | |
19/03/1949 | Reallocation | 49404 | 2A | Rugby | 8A | Edge Hill | |
19/03/1949 | Reallocation | 9415 | 9A | Longsight | 2A | Rugby | |
02/04/1949 | Reallocation | 49419 | 2D | Nuneaton | 8A | Edge Hill | |
02/04/1949 | Reallocation | 9444 | 2C | Northampton | 2D | Nuneaton | |
09/04/1949 | Reallocation | 49427 | 2B | Bletchley | 8A | Edge Hill | |
09/04/1949 | Reallocation | 49429 | 2D | Nuneaton | 8A | Edge Hill | |
09/04/1949 | Reallocation | 49438 | 1A | Willesden | 2D | Nuneaton | |
07/05/1949 | Reallocation | 49454 | 1A | Willesden | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | |
21/05/1949 | Reallocation | 9402 | 3A | Bescot | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
21/05/1949 | Reallocation | 49428 | 2D | Nuneaton | 9A | Longsight | |
28/05/1949 | Reallocation | 49410 | 2A | Rugby | 5B | Crewe South | |
28/05/1949 | Reallocation | 9423 | 2F | Coventry | 2A | Rugby | |
13/08/1949 | Reallocation | 49422 | 2B | Bletchley | 4D | Abergavenny | |
08/10/1949 | Reallocation | 49453 | 1A | Willesden | 2B | Bletchley | |
05/11/1949 | Reallocation | 49438 | 2D | Nuneaton | 11A | Carnforth | |
10/12/1949 | Reallocation | 49410 | 5B | Crewe South | 5C | Stafford | |
07/01/1950 | Reallocation | 49442 | 2A | Rugby | 2F | Coventry | |
14/01/1950 | Reallocation | 9441 | 2A | Rugby | 2F | Coventry | |
14/01/1950 | Reallocation | 49442 | 2F | Coventry | 2F | Coventry | |
18/02/1950 | Reallocation | 49407 | 2A | Rugby | 5B | Crewe South | |
25/02/1950 | Reallocation | 49401 | 2B | Bletchley | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | |
25/02/1950 | Reallocation | 49446 | 2A | Rugby | 2B | Bletchley | |
25/02/1950 | Reallocation | 49453 | 2B | Bletchley | 2B | Bletchley | |
18/03/1950 | Reallocation | 9399 | 2A | Rugby | 2C | Northampton | |
08/04/1950 | Reallocation | 49405 | 2B | Bletchley | 2D | Nuneaton | |
22/04/1950 | Reallocation | 49397 | 2A | Rugby | 2D | Nuneaton | |
22/04/1950 | Reallocation | 49434 | 2A | Rugby | 2D | Nuneaton | |
06/05/1950 | Reallocation | 9444 | 2D | Nuneaton | 2D | Nuneaton | |
06/05/1950 | Reallocation | 49445 | 2F | Coventry | 8A | Edge Hill | |
13/05/1950 | Reallocation | 49399 | 2C | Northampton | 8A | Edge Hill | |
13/05/1950 | Reallocation | 49430 | 2D | Nuneaton | 2C | Northampton | |
17/06/1950 | Reallocation | 49412 | RA | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
17/06/1950 | Reallocation | 49421 | 2D | Nuneaton | 10C | Patricroft | |
17/06/1950 | Reallocation | 49448 | 1A | Willesden | 4A | Shrewsbury | |
24/06/1950 | Reallocation | 49421 | 10C | Patricroft | 10C | Patricroft | |
24/06/1950 | Reallocation | 49448 | 4A | Shrewsbury | 4A | Shrewsbury | |
08/07/1950 | Reallocation | 49426 | 2A | Rugby | 10C | Patricroft | |
08/07/1950 | Reallocation | 49439 | 2D | Nuneaton | 9A | Longsight | |
15/07/1950 | Reallocation | 49400 | 2D | Nuneaton | 10C | Patricroft | |
12/08/1950 | Reallocation | 49420 | 2B | Bletchley | 8C | Speke Junction | |
26/08/1950 | Reallocation | 9395 | 2D | Nuneaton | 8C | Speke Junction | |
26/08/1950 | Reallocation | 9396 | 1A | Willesden | 2B | Nuneaton | |
09/09/1950 | Reallocation | 49395 | 8C | Speke Junction | 8C | Speke Junction | |
09/09/1950 | Reallocation | 49396 | 2B | Nuneaton | 2B | Nuneaton | |
23/09/1950 | Reallocation | 49396 | 2B | Nuneaton | 8C | Speke Junction | |
07/10/1950 | Reallocation | 49396 | 8C | Speke Junction | 8C | Speke Junction | |
28/10/1950 | Reallocation | 49398 | 1A | Willesden | 8C | Speke Junction | |
28/10/1950 | Reallocation | 49401 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | 2A | Rugby | |
04/11/1950 | Reallocation | 49398 | 8C | Speke Junction | 8C | Speke Junction | |
04/11/1950 | Reallocation | 49401 | 2A | Rugby | 2A | Rugby | |
02/12/1950 | Reallocation | 49451 | 2D | Nuneaton | 8C | Speke Junction | |
31/12/1950 | Reallocation | 49408 | 2A | Rugby | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
31/12/1950 | Reallocation | 49423 | 2A | Rugby | 2C | Warwick | |
31/12/1950 | Reallocation | 49451 | 8C | Speke Junction | 8C | Speke Junction | |
27/01/1951 | Reallocation | 49401 | 2A | Rugby | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
27/01/1951 | Reallocation | 49406 | 4D | Abergavenny | 8C | Speke Junction | |
27/01/1951 | Reallocation | 49436 | 2D | Nuneaton | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
31/01/1951 | Reallocation | 49401 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
31/01/1951 | Reallocation | 49436 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
14/04/1951 | Reallocation | 49423 | 2C | Warwick | 8A | Edge Hill | |
14/04/1951 | Reallocation | 49434 | 2D | Nuneaton | 11A | Carnforth | |
19/05/1951 | Reallocation | 49423 | 8A | Edge Hill | 8A | Edge Hill | |
19/05/1951 | Reallocation | 49434 | 11A | Carnforth | 11A | Carnforth | |
19/05/1951 | Reallocation | 49435 | 2D | Nuneaton | 9G | Northwich | |
30/06/1951 | Reallocation | 49448 | 4A | Shrewsbury | 86K | Abergavenny | |
25/08/1951 | Reallocation | 49396 | 8C | Speke Junction | 10B | Preston | |
25/08/1951 | Reallocation | 49430 | 2C | Northampton | 2B | Nuneaton | |
01/09/1951 | Reallocation | 49405 | 2D | Nuneaton | 9G | Northwich | |
01/09/1951 | Reallocation | 9417 | 2B | Bletchley | 2D | Coventry | |
08/09/1951 | Reallocation | 49396 | 10B | Preston | 10B | Preston | |
08/09/1951 | Reallocation | 49405 | 9G | Northwich | 9G | Northwich | |
08/09/1951 | Reallocation | 9417 | 2D | Coventry | 2D | Coventry | |
08/09/1951 | Reallocation | 49430 | 2B | Nuneaton | 2B | Nuneaton | |
03/11/1951 | Reallocation | 49434 | 11A | Carnforth | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | |
01/12/1951 | Reallocation | 49449 | 8A | Edge Hill | 11A | Carnforth | |
29/12/1951 | Reallocation | 49434 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 8A | Edge Hill | |
29/12/1951 | Reallocation | 9437 | 2D | Nuneaton | 8A | Edge Hill | |
29/12/1951 | Reallocation | 49454 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | 5B | Crewe South | |
23/02/1952 | Reallocation | 49397 | 2D | Nuneaton | 2A | Rugby | |
19/04/1952 | Reallocation | 49453 | 2B | Bletchley | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | |
04/10/1952 | Reallocation | 49416 | 2A | Rugby | 3B | Bushbury | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 49418 | 4B | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | |
29/11/1952 | Reallocation | 49418 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | |
18/04/1953 | Reallocation | 49415 | 2A | Rugby | 2D | Coventry | |
18/04/1953 | Reallocation | 49417 | 2D | Coventry | 2A | Rugby | |
18/04/1953 | Reallocation | 49425 | 2A | Rugby | 2D | Coventry | |
18/04/1953 | Reallocation | 49444 | 2D | Nuneaton | 2A | Rugby | |
31/10/1953 | Reallocation | 49416 | 3B | Bushbury | 8D | Widnes | |
19/06/1954 | Reallocation | 49411 | 2A | Rugby | 2D | Coventry | |
19/06/1954 | Reallocation | 49446 | 2B | Bletchley | 2A | Rugby | |
04/12/1954 | Reallocation | 49403 | 4D | Abergavenny | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
04/12/1954 | Reallocation | 49422 | 4D | Abergavenny | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
04/12/1954 | Reallocation | 49448 | 86K | Abergavenny | 5B | Crewe South | |
05/11/1955 | Reallocation | 49431 | 2A | Rugby | 2F | Market Harborough | |
05/11/1955 | Reallocation | 49444 | 2A | Rugby | 2F | Market Harborough | |
05/11/1955 | Reallocation | 49446 | 2A | Rugby | 2F | Market Harborough | |
05/11/1955 | Reallocation | 49447 | 6B | Mold Junction | 2F | Market Harborough | |
31/12/1955 | Reallocation | 49405 | 9G | Northwich | 2A | Rugby | |
31/12/1955 | Reallocation | 49435 | 9G | Northwich | 2A | Rugby | |
21/04/1956 | Reallocation | 49424 | 2D | Nuneaton | 84G | Shrewsbury | |
23/02/1957 | Reallocation | 49448 | 5B | Crewe South | 2A | Rugby | |
20/04/1957 | Reallocation | 49395 | 8C | Speke Junction | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | |
20/04/1957 | Reallocation | 49440 | 2F | Coventry | 85C | Hereford | |
20/04/1957 | Reallocation | 49448 | 2A | Rugby | 5B | Crewe South | |
18/05/1957 | Reallocation | 49430 | 2B | Nuneaton | 5C | Stafford | |
18/05/1957 | Reallocation | 49440 | 85C | Hereford | 86K | Tredegar | |
16/06/1957 | Reallocation | 49430 | 5C | Stafford | 2B | Nuneaton | |
02/11/1957 | Reallocation | 49440 | 86K | Tredegar | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
30/11/1957 | Reallocation | 49397 | 2A | Rugby | 8C | Speke Junction | |
30/11/1957 | Reallocation | 49413 | 2A | Rugby | 1A | Willesden | |
30/11/1957 | Reallocation | 49433 | 2A | Rugby | 8C | Speke Junction | |
30/11/1957 | Reallocation | 49448 | 5B | Crewe South | 10D | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | |
28/12/1957 | Reallocation | 49450 | 2B | Bletchley | 5C | Stafford | |
25/01/1958 | Reallocation | 49411 | 2D | Coventry | 3B | Bushbury | |
25/01/1958 | Reallocation | 49431 | 2F | Market Harborough | 2D | Coventry | |
25/01/1958 | Reallocation | 49446 | 2F | Market Harborough | 5C | Stafford | |
22/02/1958 | Reallocation | 49409 | 4E | Tredegar | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
22/02/1958 | Reallocation | 49417 | 2A | Rugby | 5B | Crewe South | |
22/02/1958 | Reallocation | 49450 | 5C | Stafford | 1E | Bletchley | |
22/02/1958 | Reallocation | 49452 | 2A | Rugby | 3B | Bushbury | |
22/03/1958 | Reallocation | 49403 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 1E | Bletchley | |
22/03/1958 | Reallocation | 49409 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 86K | Tredegar | |
22/03/1958 | Reallocation | 49422 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
22/03/1958 | Reallocation | 49424 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 8C | Speke Junction | |
22/03/1958 | Reallocation | 49440 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 2B | Nuneaton | |
19/04/1958 | Reallocation | 49417 | 5B | Crewe South | 8D | Widnes | |
12/07/1958 | Reallocation | 49417 | 8D | Widnes | 5B | Crewe South | |
12/07/1958 | Reallocation | 49424 | 8C | Speke Junction | 17B | Burton | |
01/11/1958 | Reallocation | 49400 | 10C | Patricroft | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | |
08/11/1958 | Reallocation | 49416 | 8D | Widnes | 8A | Edge Hill | |
15/11/1958 | Reallocation | 49415 | 2D | Coventry | 2B | Nuneaton | |
15/11/1958 | Reallocation | 49425 | 2D | Coventry | 2B | Nuneaton | |
15/11/1958 | Reallocation | 49431 | 2D | Coventry | 2B | Nuneaton | |
15/11/1958 | Reallocation | 49441 | 2F | Coventry | 2B | Nuneaton | |
15/11/1958 | Reallocation | 49442 | 2F | Coventry | 2A | Rugby | |
03/01/1959 | Reallocation | 49423 | 8A | Edge Hill | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | |
31/01/1959 | Reallocation | 49405 | 2A | Rugby | 8A | Edge Hill | |
31/01/1959 | Reallocation | 49435 | 2A | Rugby | 8A | Edge Hill | |
14/02/1959 | Reallocation | 49438 | 11A | Carnforth | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
18/04/1959 | Reallocation | 49428 | 9A | Longsight | 24L | Carnforth | |
18/04/1959 | Reallocation | 49439 | 9A | Longsight | 24L | Carnforth | |
23/05/1959 | Condemned | 49436 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | COND | ||
01/06/1959 | Condemned | 49409 | 86K | Tredegar | COND | ||
20/06/1959 | Reallocation | 49439 | 24L | Carnforth | 5B | Crewe South | |
15/08/1959 | Reallocation | 49406 | 8C | Speke Junction | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | |
15/08/1959 | Reallocation | 49433 | 8C | Speke Junction | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | |
15/08/1959 | Reallocation | 49451 | 8C | Speke Junction | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
24/10/1959 | Reallocation | 49411 | 3B | Bushbury | 3A | Bescot | |
07/11/1959 | Condemned | 49395 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | COND | ||
07/11/1959 | Condemned | 49396 | 10B | Preston | COND | ||
07/11/1959 | Condemned | 49397 | 8C | Speke Junction | COND | ||
07/11/1959 | Condemned | 49398 | 8C | Speke Junction | COND | ||
07/11/1959 | Condemned | 49400 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | COND | ||
07/11/1959 | Condemned | 49410 | 5C | Stafford | COND | ||
07/11/1959 | Condemned | 49417 | 5B | Crewe South | COND | ||
07/11/1959 | Condemned | 49418 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | COND | ||
07/11/1959 | Condemned | 49419 | 8A | Edge Hill | COND | ||
07/11/1959 | Condemned | 49420 | 8C | Speke Junction | COND | ||
07/11/1959 | Condemned | 49424 | SC | COND | |||
07/11/1959 | Condemned | 49427 | 8A | Edge Hill | COND | ||
14/11/1959 | Condemned | 49429 | 8A | Edge Hill | COND | ||
14/11/1959 | Condemned | 49435 | 8A | Edge Hill | COND | ||
14/11/1959 | Condemned | 49442 | 2A | Rugby | COND | ||
14/11/1959 | Condemned | 49445 | 8A | Edge Hill | COND | ||
14/11/1959 | Condemned | 49450 | 1E | Bletchley | COND | ||
12/12/1959 | Reallocation | 49406 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | |
02/01/1960 | Reallocation | 49401 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | |
16/01/1960 | Reallocation | 49428 | 24L | Carnforth | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | |
16/01/1960 | Reallocation | 49449 | 11A | Carnforth | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | |
09/07/1960 | Reallocation | 49447 | 2F | Market Harborough | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
30/07/1960 | Reallocation | 49401 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | |
30/07/1960 | Reallocation | 49453 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | |
06/08/1960 | Reallocation | 49444 | 2F | Market Harborough | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
27/08/1960 | Reallocation | 49444 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 8A | Edge Hill | |
10/09/1960 | Reallocation | 49428 | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | 24L | Carnforth | |
10/09/1960 | Reallocation | 49449 | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | 24L | Carnforth | |
17/09/1960 | Reallocation | 49430 | 2B | Nuneaton | 21B | Bescot | |
17/09/1960 | Reallocation | 49439 | 5B | Crewe South | 1E | Bletchley | |
17/09/1960 | Reallocation | 49448 | 10D | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | 8A | Edge Hill | |
12/11/1960 | Reallocation | 49439 | 1E | Bletchley | 2B | Nuneaton | |
28/01/1961 | Reallocation | 49415 | 2B | Nuneaton | 8A | Edge Hill | |
28/01/1961 | Reallocation | 49432 | 2D | Nuneaton | 8A | Edge Hill | |
06/05/1961 | Reallocation | 49446 | 5C | Stafford | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | |
02/09/1961 | Condemned | 49422 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | COND | ||
07/10/1961 | Condemned | 49412 | 8A | Edge Hill | COND | ||
07/10/1961 | Condemned | 49413 | 1A | Willesden | COND | ||
07/10/1961 | Condemned | 49414 | 2D | Nuneaton | COND | ||
07/10/1961 | Condemned | 49421 | 10C | Patricroft | COND | ||
07/10/1961 | Condemned | 49433 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | COND | ||
07/10/1961 | Condemned | 49441 | 2B | Nuneaton | COND | ||
07/10/1961 | Condemned | 49443 | 2B | Bletchley | COND | ||
07/10/1961 | Condemned | 49444 | 8A | Edge Hill | COND | ||
07/10/1961 | Condemned | 49453 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | COND | ||
14/10/1961 | Condemned | 49399 | 8A | Edge Hill | COND | ||
14/10/1961 | Condemned | 49401 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | COND | ||
14/10/1961 | Condemned | 49405 | 8A | Edge Hill | COND | ||
14/10/1961 | Condemned | 49411 | 3A | Bescot | COND | ||
11/11/1961 | Condemned | 49423 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | COND | ||
02/12/1961 | Reallocation | 49403 | 1E | Bletchley | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | |
06/01/1962 | Reallocation | 49439 | 2B | Nuneaton | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | |
24/03/1962 | Condemned | 49440 | 2B | Nuneaton | COND | ||
28/04/1962 | Condemned | 49404 | 8A | Edge Hill | COND | ||
05/05/1962 | Reallocation | 49425 | 2B | Nuneaton | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | |
05/05/1962 | Reallocation | 49431 | 2B | Nuneaton | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
02/06/1962 | Condemned | 49403 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | COND | ||
01/09/1962 | Condemned | 49416 | 8A | Edge Hill | COND | ||
01/09/1962 | Condemned | 49437 | 8A | Edge Hill | COND | ||
15/09/1962 | Condemned | 49425 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | COND | ||
22/09/1962 | Condemned | 49426 | 10C | Patricroft | COND | ||
20/10/1962 | Condemned | 49434 | 8A | Edge Hill | COND | ||
10/11/1962 | Reallocation | 49407 | 5B | Crewe South | 21C | Bushbury | |
17/11/1962 | Reallocation | 49452 | 3B | Bushbury | 21B | Bescot | |
24/11/1962 | Reallocation | 49406 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | 21B | Bescot | |
24/11/1962 | Reallocation | 49446 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | 21C | Bushbury | |
01/12/1962 | Condemned | 49402 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | COND | ||
01/12/1962 | Condemned | 49408 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | COND | ||
01/12/1962 | Condemned | 49415 | 8A | Edge Hill | COND | ||
01/12/1962 | Condemned | 49431 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | COND | ||
01/12/1962 | Condemned | 49432 | 8A | Edge Hill | COND | ||
01/12/1962 | Condemned | 49438 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | COND | ||
01/12/1962 | Condemned | 49447 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | COND | ||
01/12/1962 | Condemned | 49451 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | COND | ||
08/12/1962 | Condemned | 49428 | 24L | Carnforth | COND | ||
08/12/1962 | Condemned | 49439 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | COND | ||
08/12/1962 | Condemned | 49449 | 24L | Carnforth | COND | ||
08/12/1962 | Condemned | 49452 | 21B | Bescot | COND | ||
22/12/1962 | Reallocation | 49448 | 8A | Edge Hill | 5B | Crewe South | |
15/06/1963 | Condemned | 49406 | 21B | Bescot | COND | ||
15/06/1963 | Condemned | 49448 | 5B | Crewe South | COND | ||
15/06/1963 | Condemned | 49454 | 5B | Crewe South | COND | ||
20/07/1963 | Reallocation | 49407 | 21C | Bushbury | 21B | Bescot | |
28/12/1963 | Reallocation | 49407 | 21B | Bescot | 5B | Crewe South | |
21/03/1964 | Reallocation | 49407 | 5B | Crewe South | 2F | Bescot | |
09/04/1964 | Condemned | 49446 | 21C | Bushbury | COND | ||
11/1964 | Condemned | 49407 | 2F | Bescot | COND | ||
26/12/1964 | Condemned | 49430 | 21B | Bescot | COND |