LNWR/LMS Beames "7F" Class 0-8-4T
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/1923 | To Service | 380 | NEW | 11A | Carnforth | ||
02/1923 | To Service | 1189 | NEW | 2D | Nuneaton | ||
10/1923 | To Service | 7952 | NEW | SALOP | Shrewsbury | ||
10/1923 | To Service | 7954 | NEW | 5C | Stafford | ||
10/1923 | To Service | 7955 | NEW | W16 | Longsight | ||
11/1923 | To Service | 7956 | NEW | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
11/1923 | To Service | 7958 | NEW | W16 | Longsight | ||
08/1944 | Condemned | 7947 | COND | ||||
11/1944 | Condemned | 7942 | COND | ||||
05/1945 | Condemned | 7953 | COND | ||||
08/1945 | Condemned | 7952 | COND | ||||
12/1945 | Condemned | 7957 | COND | ||||
01/1946 | Condemned | 7940 | COND | ||||
05/1946 | Condemned | 7934 | COND | ||||
06/1946 | Condemned | 7950 | COND | ||||
08/1946 | Condemned | 7955 | COND | ||||
09/1946 | Condemned | 7935 | COND | ||||
09/1946 | Condemned | 7945 | COND | ||||
10/1946 | Condemned | 7949 | COND | ||||
12/1946 | Condemned | 7941 | COND | ||||
12/1946 | Condemned | 7946 | COND | ||||
02/1947 | Condemned | 27943 | COND | ||||
11/1947 | Condemned | 609 | COND | ||||
11/1947 | Condemned | 7944 | COND | ||||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7930 | 8A | Edge Hill | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7931 | 4B | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7932 | 4B | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7933 | 8A | Edge Hill | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7936 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7937 | 4B | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7938 | 8A | Edge Hill | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7939 | 4E | Tredegar | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7948 | 4B | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7951 | 8A | Edge Hill | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7954 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7956 | 8A | Edge Hill | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7958 | 8A | Edge Hill | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7959 | 8A | Edge Hill | |||
17/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7932 | 4B | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | 8A | Edge Hill | |
21/02/1948 | Condemned | 7938 | 8A | Edge Hill | COND | ||
28/02/1948 | Reallocation | 7931 | 4B | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | 8A | Edge Hill | |
10/04/1948 | Reallocation | 7937 | 4B | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | 8A | Edge Hill | |
06/1948 | Condemned | 7959 | 8A | Edge Hill | COND | ||
03/07/1948 | Condemned | 7948 | 4B | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | COND | ||
07/08/1948 | Condemned | 7930 | 8A | Edge Hill | COND | ||
10/1948 | Condemned | 7954 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | COND | ||
27/11/1948 | Condemned | 7956 | 8A | Edge Hill | COND | ||
04/12/1948 | Condemned | 7958 | 8A | Edge Hill | COND | ||
01/1949 | Condemned | 47951 | 8A | Edge Hill | COND | ||
07/05/1949 | Reallocation | 47936 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | 8A | Edge Hill | |
06/1949 | Condemned | 47936 | 8A | Edge Hill | COND | ||
09/1949 | Condemned | 47932 | 8A | Edge Hill | COND | ||
17/06/1950 | Condemned | 47933 | 8A | Edge Hill | COND | ||
07/10/1950 | Condemned | 47937 | 8A | Edge Hill | COND | ||
12/1950 | Condemned | 47939 | 4E | Tredegar | COND | ||
15/12/1951 | Condemned | 47931 | 8A | Edge Hill | COND |