LNWR/LMS Beames "7F" Class 0-8-4T
LNWR | LMS | LMS (Dup) | LMS (Correction) | BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
380 | 7930 | 47930 | 02/1923 | Carnforth | 07/08/1948 | 25.5 | |||||||
782 | 7931 | 47931 | 02/1923 | 15/12/1951 | 28.83 | 28.93 | |||||||
1189 | 7932 | 47932 | 02/1923 | Nuneaton | 09/1949 | 26.58 | |||||||
1677 | 7933 | 47933 | 02/1923 | 17/06/1950 | Edge Hill | 27.33 | 27.43 | ||||||
1976 | 7934 | 03/1923 | 05/1946 | 23.17 | |||||||||
256 | 7935 | 03/1923 | 09/1946 | 23.5 | |||||||||
731 | 7936 | 47936 | 04/1923 | 06/1949 | 26.17 | 26.19 | |||||||
739 | 7937 | 47937 | 04/1923 | 07/10/1950 | 27.5 | ||||||||
1908 | 7938 | 47938 | 04/1923 | 21/02/1948 | 24.83 | 25.19 | |||||||
1956 | 7939 | 47939 | 04/1923 | 12/1950 | 27.67 | 27.69 | |||||||
468 | 7940 | 06/1923 | 01/1946 | 22.58 | |||||||||
792 | 7941 | 06/1923 | 12/1946 | 23.5 | |||||||||
793 | 7942 | 06/1923 | 11/1944 | 21.42 | |||||||||
1904 | 7943 | 27943 | 06/1923 | 02/1947 | 23.67 | ||||||||
609 | 7944 | 06/1923 | 11/1947 | 24.42 | |||||||||
7945 | 08/1923 | 09/1946 | 23.08 | ||||||||||
7946 | 08/1923 | 12/1946 | 23.33 | ||||||||||
7947 | 08/1923 | 08/1944 | 21 | ||||||||||
7948 | 47948 | 09/1923 | 03/07/1948 | 24.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) | 28/08/1948 | 24.97 | |||||
7949 | 09/1923 | 10/1946 | 23.08 | ||||||||||
7950 | 10/1923 | 06/1946 | 22.67 | ||||||||||
7951 | 47951 | 10/1923 | 01/1949 | 25.25 | |||||||||
7952 | 10/1923 | Shrewsbury | 08/1945 | 21.83 | |||||||||
7953 | 10/1923 | 05/1945 | 21.58 | ||||||||||
7954 | 47954 | 10/1923 | Stafford | 10/1948 | 25 | 25.02 | |||||||
7955 | 10/1923 | Longsight | 08/1946 | 22.83 | |||||||||
7956 | 47956 | 11/1923 | Stockport Edgeley | 27/11/1948 | 25 | ||||||||
7957 | 27957 | 7957 | 11/1923 | 12/1945 | 22.08 | ||||||||
7958 | 47958 | 11/1923 | Longsight | 04/12/1948 | 25.08 | ||||||||
7959 | 47959 | 01/1924 | 06/1948 | 24.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) | 07/08/1948 | 24.58 |