BR Swindon & Crewe 52 C-C
Class | Number | Built | Name | Name Date | Notes | Removed | Date Withdrawn |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Western | 1000 | 29/12/1961 | WESTERN ENTERPRISE | 29/12/1961 | 11/02/1974 | ||
Western | 1001 | 12/02/1962 | WESTERN PATHFINDER | 12/02/1962 | 04/10/1976 | ||
Western | 1002 | 19/03/1962 | WESTERN EXPLORER | 19/03/1962 | 29/01/1974 | ||
Western | 1003 | 14/04/1962 | WESTERN PIONEER | 14/04/1962 | 05/01/1975 | ||
Western | 1004 | 12/05/1962 | WESTERN CRUSADER | 12/05/1962 | 01/08/1973 | ||
Western | 1005 | 18/06/1962 | WESTERN VENTURER | 18/06/1962 | 16/11/1976 | ||
Western | 1006 | 06/07/1962 | WESTERN STALWART | 06/07/1962 | 06/04/1975 | ||
Western | 1007 | 01/08/1962 | WESTERN TALISMAN | 01/08/1962 | 29/01/1974 | ||
Western | 1008 | 04/09/1962 | WESTERN HARRIER | 04/09/1962 | 21/10/1974 | ||
Western | 1009 | 24/09/1962 | WESTERN INVADER | 24/09/1962 | 10/11/1976 | ||
Western | 1010 | 15/10/1962 | WESTERN CAMPAIGNER | 15/10/1962 | 28/02/1977 | ||
Western | 1011 | 27/10/1962 | WESTERN THUNDERER | 27/10/1962 | 06/10/1975 | ||
Western | 1012 | 17/11/1962 | WESTERN FIREBRAND | 17/11/1962 | 02/11/1975 | ||
Western | 1013 | 13/12/1962 | WESTERN RANGER | 13/12/1962 | 28/02/1977 | ||
Western | 1014 | 24/12/1962 | WESTERN LEVIATHAN | 24/12/1962 | 06/08/1974 | ||
Western | 1015 | 21/01/1963 | WESTERN CHAMPION | 21/01/1963 | 13/12/1976 | ||
Western | 1016 | 16/02/1963 | WESTERN GLADIATOR | 16/02/1963 | 29/12/1975 | ||
Western | 1017 | 15/03/1963 | WESTERN WARRIOR | 15/03/1963 | 01/08/1973 | ||
Western | 1018 | 02/04/1963 | WESTERN BUCCANEER | 02/04/1963 | 04/06/1973 | ||
Western | 1019 | 02/05/1963 | WESTERN CHALLENGER | 02/05/1963 | 06/05/1973 | ||
Western | 1020 | 21/05/1963 | WESTERN HERO | 21/05/1963 | 04/06/1973 | ||
Western | 1021 | 17/06/1963 | WESTERN CAVALIER | 17/06/1963 | 10/08/1976 | ||
Western | 1022 | 16/07/1963 | WESTERN SENTINEL | 16/07/1963 | 18/01/1977 | ||
Western | 1023 | 23/09/1963 | WESTERN FUSILIER | 23/09/1963 | 28/02/1977 | ||
Western | 1024 | 01/10/1963 | WESTERN HUNTSMAN | 01/10/1963 | 18/11/1973 | ||
Western | 1025 | 01/11/1963 | WESTERN GUARDSMAN | 01/11/1963 | 06/10/1975 | ||
Western | 1026 | 24/12/1963 | WESTERN CENTURION | 24/12/1963 | 06/10/1975 | ||
Western | 1027 | 28/01/1964 | WESTERN LANCER | 28/01/1964 | 02/11/1975 | ||
Western | 1028 | 25/02/1964 | WESTERN HUSSAR | 25/02/1964 | 06/10/1976 | ||
Western | 1029 | 20/04/1964 | WESTERN LEGIONAIRE | 20/04/1964 | 18/11/1974 | ||
Western | 1029 | 20/04/1964 | WESTERN LEGIONNAIRE | 15/04/1969 | Name spelling corrected from LEGIONAIRE. | 18/11/1974 | |
Western | 1030 | 05/12/1963 | WESTERN MUSKETEER | 05/12/1963 | 19/04/1976 | ||
Western | 1031 | 20/12/1963 | WESTERN RIFLEMAN | 20/12/1963 | 01/02/1975 | ||
Western | 1032 | 31/12/1963 | WESTERN MARKSMAN | 31/12/1963 | 06/05/1973 | ||
Western | 1033 | 17/01/1964 | WESTERN TROOPER | 17/01/1964 | 17/09/1976 | ||
Western | 1034 | 15/04/1964 | WESTERN DRAGOON | 15/04/1964 | 06/10/1975 | ||
Western | 1035 | 27/07/1962 | WESTERN YEOMAN | 27/07/1962 | 05/01/1975 | ||
Western | 1036 | 29/08/1962 | WESTERN EMPEROR | 29/08/1962 | 01/11/1976 | ||
Western | 1037 | 31/08/1962 | WESTERN EMPRESS | 31/08/1962 | 24/05/1976 | ||
Western | 1038 | 07/09/1962 | WESTERN SOVEREIGN | 07/09/1962 | 08/10/1973 | ||
Western | 1039 | 07/09/1962 | WESTERN KING | 07/09/1962 | 21/07/1973 | ||
Western | 1040 | 20/09/1962 | WESTERN QUEEN | 20/09/1962 | 29/02/1976 | ||
Western | 1041 | 10/10/1962 | WESTERN PRINCE | 10/10/1962 | 23/02/1977 | ||
Western | 1042 | 19/10/1962 | WESTERN PRINCESS | 19/10/1962 | 21/07/1973 | ||
Western | 1043 | 26/10/1962 | WESTERN DUKE | 26/10/1962 | 04/04/1976 | ||
Western | 1044 | 12/11/1962 | WESTERN DUCHESS | 12/11/1962 | 01/02/1975 | ||
Western | 1045 | 16/11/1962 | WESTERN VISCOUNT | 16/11/1962 | 16/12/1974 | ||
Western | 1046 | 24/12/1962 | WESTERN MARQUIS | 24/12/1962 | 11/12/1975 | ||
Western | 1047 | 04/02/1963 | WESTERN LORD | 04/02/1963 | 29/02/1976 | ||
Western | 1048 | 15/12/1962 | WESTERN LADY | 15/12/1962 | 28/02/1977 | ||
Western | 1049 | 14/12/1962 | WESTERN MONARCH | 14/12/1962 | 26/04/1976 | ||
Western | 1050 | 01/01/1963 | WESTERN RULER | 01/01/1963 | 06/04/1975 | ||
Western | 1051 | 21/01/1963 | WESTERN AMBASSADOR | 21/01/1963 | 02/09/1976 | ||
Western | 1052 | 04/02/1963 | WESTERN VICEROY | 04/02/1963 | 06/10/1975 | ||
Western | 1053 | 11/02/1963 | WESTERN PATRIARCH | 11/02/1963 | 15/11/1976 | ||
Western | 1054 | 02/03/1963 | WESTERN GOVERNOR | 02/03/1963 | 25/11/1976 | ||
Western | 1055 | 02/03/1963 | WESTERN ADVOCATE | 02/03/1963 | 05/01/1976 | ||
Western | 1056 | 08/03/1963 | WESTERN SULTAN | 08/03/1963 | 15/12/1976 | ||
Western | 1057 | 06/04/1963 | WESTERN CHIEFTAIN | 06/04/1963 | 02/05/1976 | ||
Western | 1058 | 25/03/1963 | WESTERN NOBLEMAN | 25/03/1963 | 24/01/1977 | ||
Western | 1059 | 06/04/1963 | WESTERN EMPIRE | 06/04/1963 | 06/10/1975 | ||
Western | 1060 | 11/04/1963 | WESTERN DOMINION | 11/04/1963 | 18/11/1973 | ||
Western | 1061 | 19/04/1963 | WESTERN ENVOY | 19/04/1963 | 21/10/1974 | ||
Western | 1062 | 06/05/1963 | WESTERN COURIER | 06/05/1963 | 22/08/1974 | ||
Western | 1063 | 17/05/1963 | WESTERN MONITOR | 17/05/1963 | 04/04/1976 | ||
Western | 1064 | 24/05/1963 | WESTERN REGENT | 24/05/1963 | 11/12/1975 | ||
Western | 1065 | 18/06/1963 | WESTERN CONSORT | 18/06/1963 | 04/11/1976 | ||
Western | 1066 | 14/06/1963 | WESTERN PREFECT | 14/06/1963 | 12/11/1974 | ||
Western | 1067 | 18/07/1963 | WESTERN DRUID | 18/07/1963 | 24/01/1976 | ||
Western | 1068 | 12/07/1963 | WESTERN RELIANCE | 12/07/1963 | 12/10/1976 | ||
Western | 1069 | 21/10/1963 | WESTERN VANGUARD | 21/10/1963 | 06/10/1975 | ||
Western | 1070 | 28/10/1963 | WESTERN GAUNTLET | 28/10/1963 | 30/12/1976 | ||
Western | 1071 | 07/11/1963 | WESTERN RENOWN | 07/11/1963 | 07/12/1976 | ||
Western | 1072 | 07/11/1963 | WESTERN GLORY | 07/11/1963 | 02/11/1976 | ||
Western | 1073 | 03/12/1963 | WESTERN BULWARK | 03/12/1963 | 29/08/1974 |