Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 62 Today
» 839 Yesterday
» 62 Week
» 18383 Month
» 106575 Year
» 990956 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LNWR/LMS Webb "1P" Class 2-4-2T


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
01/1907 Condemned 1764       COND  
1921 Condemned 1154       COND  
05/1922 Condemned 344       COND  
05/1924 Condemned 661       COND  
09/1924 Condemned 657       COND  
05/1925 Condemned 1762       COND  
08/1925 Condemned 1758       COND  
10/1925 Condemned 1155       COND  
08/1927 Condemned 660       COND  
10/1927 Condemned 2139       COND  
10/1927 Condemned 2215       COND  
1928 Condemned 144       COND  
03/1928 Condemned 199       COND  
04/1928 Condemned 6751       COND  
07/1928 Condemned 6644       COND  
07/1928 Condemned 6716       COND  
07/1928 Condemned 187       COND  
07/1928 Condemned 6730       COND  
07/1928 Condemned 6731       COND  
07/1928 Condemned 6732       COND  
07/1928 Condemned 6733       COND  
09/1928 Condemned 6618       COND  
09/1928 Condemned 6698       COND  
03/1930 Condemned 6623       COND  
03/1930 Condemned 6724       COND  
03/1930 Condemned 6752       COND  
05/1930 Condemned 6670       COND  
05/1930 Condemned 6745       COND  
06/1930 Condemned 6609       COND  
07/1930 Condemned 6675       COND  
08/1930 Condemned 6613       COND  
09/1930 Condemned 6706       COND  
09/1930 Condemned 6744       COND  
12/1930 Condemned 6638       COND  
1931 Condemned 6640       COND  
1931 Condemned 6648       COND  
1931 Condemned 6651       COND  
1931 Condemned 6677       COND  
1931 Condemned 6736       COND  
07/1931 Condemned 6606       COND  
07/1931 Condemned 6610       COND  
07/1931 Condemned 6702       COND  
1932 Condemned 6621       COND  
1932 Condemned 6622       COND  
1932 Condemned 6624       COND  
1932 Condemned 6626       COND  
1932 Condemned 6649       COND  
1932 Condemned 6719       COND  
05/1932 Condemned 6629       COND  
07/1932 Condemned 6735       COND  
09/1932 Condemned 6617       COND  
09/1932 Condemned 6642       COND  
10/1932 Condemned 6714       COND  
11/1932 Condemned 6631       COND  
11/1932 Condemned 6647       COND  
01/1934 Condemned 6726       COND  
02/1934 Condemned 6693       COND  
05/1934 Condemned 6633       COND  
11/1934 Condemned 6672       COND  
11/1934 Condemned 6750       COND  
1935 Condemned 6709       COND  
1935 Condemned 6720       COND  
01/1935 Condemned 6655       COND  
07/1935 Condemned 6662       COND  
08/1935 Condemned 6697       COND  
09/1935 Condemned 6737       COND  
10/1935 Condemned 6721       COND  
01/1936 Condemned 6707       COND  
02/1936 Condemned 6664       COND  
02/1936 Condemned 6753       COND  
03/1936 Condemned 6602       COND  
03/1936 Condemned 6668       COND  
03/1936 Condemned 6671       COND  
03/1936 Condemned 6756       COND  
04/1936 Condemned 6611       COND  
04/1936 Condemned 1174       COND  
04/1936 Condemned 6694       COND  
10/1936 Condemned 6695       COND  
02/1937 Condemned 6708       COND  
03/1937 Condemned 6625       COND  
03/1937 Condemned 6705       COND  
1944 Condemned 6743       COND  
09/1945 Condemned 6659       COND  
11/1945 Condemned 6699       COND  
02/1946 Condemned 6657       COND  
03/1946 Condemned 6667       COND  
03/1946 Condemned 6734       COND  
05/1946 Condemned 6741       COND  
06/1946 Condemned 6607       COND  
06/1946 Condemned 6755       COND  
08/1946 Condemned 6652       COND  
09/1946 Condemned 6713       COND  
10/1946 Condemned 6641       COND  
10/1946 Condemned 6645       COND  
10/1946 Condemned 6700       COND  
10/1946 Condemned 6746       COND  
12/1946 Condemned 6722       COND  
04/1947 Condemned 6690       COND  
05/1947 Condemned 6619       COND  
05/1947 Condemned 6646       COND  
05/1947 Condemned 6723       COND  
05/1947 Condemned 6739       COND  
06/1947 Condemned 6653       COND  
06/1947 Condemned 6728       COND  
07/1947 Condemned 6650       COND  
08/1947 Condemned 6685       COND  
08/1947 Condemned 6703       COND  
09/1947 Condemned 6627       COND  
09/1947 Condemned 6660       COND  
09/1947 Condemned 6704       COND  
09/1947 Condemned 6748       COND  
11/1947 Condemned 6689       COND  
11/1947 Condemned 6729       COND  
12/1947 Condemned 6636       COND  
12/1947 Condemned 6674       COND  
12/1947 Condemned 6682       COND  
12/1947 Condemned 6725       COND  
12/1947 Condemned 6754       COND  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 6601     4A Shrewsbury  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 6603     8B Warrington Dallam  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 6604     2B Bletchley  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 6605     5A Crewe North  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 6616     2C Northampton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 6620     4B Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 6628     10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 6632     7D Rhyl  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 6635     12G Dumfries  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 6637     10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 6639     12G Dumfries  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 6643     7B Bangor  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 6654     3B Bushbury  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 6656     27C Hamilton (West)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 6658     7D Rhyl  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 6661     3C Ryecroft (Walsall)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 6663     8B Warrington Dallam  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 6666     2C Northampton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 6669     2E Warwick  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 6673     2E Warwick  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 6676     10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 6679     3C Ryecroft (Walsall)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 6680     5A Crewe North  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 6681     7A Llandudno Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 6682 98W   10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 6683     2E Warwick  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 6686     1C Watford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 6687     7D Rhyl  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 6688     8B Warrington Dallam  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 6691     7D Rhyl  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 6692     10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 6701     7D Rhyl  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 6710     8B Warrington Dallam  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 6711     5A Crewe North  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 6712     7D Rhyl  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 6718     8B Warrington Dallam  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 6727     7D Rhyl  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 6738     9D Buxton (LNWR)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 6740     4B Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 6742     2C Northampton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 6747     7A Llandudno Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 6749     2E Warwick  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 6757     3C Ryecroft (Walsall)  
24/01/1948 Condemned 6718 8B Warrington Dallam   COND  
02/1948 Condemned 6679 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)   COND  
07/02/1948 Condemned 6747 7A Llandudno Junction   COND  
20/03/1948 Condemned 6692 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)   COND  
27/03/1948 Condemned 6691 7D Rhyl   COND  
24/04/1948 Condemned 6673 2E Warwick   COND  
08/05/1948 Condemned 6738 9D Buxton (LNWR)   COND  
08/05/1948 Condemned 6740 4B Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)   COND  
22/05/1948 Condemned 6605 5A Crewe North   COND  
22/05/1948 Condemned 6686 1C Watford   COND  
06/1948 Condemned 6661 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)   COND  
12/06/1948 Condemned 6681 7A Llandudno Junction   COND  
11/12/1948 Reallocation 6656 27C Hamilton (West) 12G Dumfries  
11/12/1948 Reallocation 6710 8B Warrington Dallam 5A Crewe North  
05/1949 Condemned 46711 5A Crewe North   COND  
06/1949 Condemned 46639 12G Dumfries   COND  
16/07/1949 Reallocation 46656 12G Dumfries 68D Beattock  
16/07/1949 Condemned 46663 8B Warrington Dallam   COND  
09/1949 Condemned 46637 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)   COND  
09/1949 Condemned 46669 2E Warwick   COND  
09/1949 Condemned 46710 5A Crewe North   COND  
12/1949 Condemned 46676 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)   COND  
12/1949 Condemned 46687 7D Rhyl   COND  
12/1949 Condemned 46742 2C Northampton   COND  
04/1950 Condemned 46635 12G Dumfries   COND  
06/1950 Condemned 46632 7D Rhyl   COND  
12/1950 Condemned 46658 7D Rhyl   COND  
02/12/1950 Reallocation 46757 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)  
31/12/1950 Reallocation 46727 7D Rhyl 8B Warrington Dallam  
27/01/1951 Reallocation 46643 7B Bangor 6D Chester Northgate  
04/1951 Condemned 46688 8B Warrington Dallam   COND  
19/05/1951 Reallocation 46643 6D Chester Northgate 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)  
19/05/1951 Reallocation 6683 2E Warwick 4A Bletchley  
07/1951 Condemned 46603 8B Warrington Dallam   COND  
07/1951 Condemned 46628 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)   COND  
17/07/1951 Reallocation 6683 4A Bletchley 2C Warwick  
11/08/1951 Reallocation 46643 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 8B Warrington Dallam  
29/12/1951 Reallocation 46712 7D Rhyl 2A Rugby  
02/1952 Condemned 46656 68D Beattock   COND  
02/1952 Condemned 46749 2E Warwick   COND  
23/02/1952 Reallocation 46712 2A Rugby 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)  
23/02/1952 Reallocation 46757 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 2A Rugby  
22/03/1952 Reallocation 46654 3B Bushbury 2C Warwick  
22/03/1952 Reallocation 46727 8B Warrington Dallam 11B Barrow in Furness  
12/07/1952 Reallocation 46643 8B Warrington Dallam 6K Rhyl  
12/07/1952 Reallocation 46701 7D Rhyl 6H Bangor  
12/1952 Condemned 46727 11B Barrow in Furness   COND  
01/1953 Condemned 46643 6K Rhyl   COND  
01/1953 Condemned 46680 5A Crewe North   COND  
02/1953 Condemned 46620 4B Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)   COND  
02/1953 Condemned 46683 2C Warwick   COND  
02/1953 Condemned 46701 6H Bangor   COND  
02/1953 Condemned 46757 2A Rugby   COND  
21/02/1953 Reallocation 46616 2C Northampton 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)  
16/05/1953 Reallocation 46601 4A Shrewsbury 2A Rugby  
11/07/1953 Reallocation 46601 2A Rugby 1E Bletchley  
11/07/1953 Reallocation 46604 2B Bletchley 6H Bangor  
09/1953 Condemned 46654 2C Warwick   COND  
31/10/1953 Reallocation 46601 1E Bletchley 2A Rugby  
12/1953 Condemned 46601 2A Rugby   COND  
02/01/1954 Reallocation 46604 6H Bangor 2A Rugby  
24/04/1954 Reallocation 46604 2A Rugby 5A Crewe North  
06/1954 Condemned 46666 2C Northampton   COND  
19/06/1954 Reallocation 46712 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 2C Warwick  
08/1954 Condemned 46712 2C Warwick   COND  
11/09/1954 Reallocation 46604 5A Crewe North 2C Warwick  
08/1955 Condemned 46604 2C Warwick   COND  
09/1955 Condemned 46616 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)   COND