Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 840 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18643 Week
» 71659 Month
» 191186 Year
» 3218039 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
LMS Stanier "8F" Class 2-8-0
Company |
Old Number |
|
Company |
New Number |
Subtype |
|
Date |
Information |
LNER |
7651 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3100 |
1946 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
|
LNER |
7652 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3101 |
1946 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
|
LNER |
7653 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3102 |
1946 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
|
LNER |
7654 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3103 |
1946 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
|
LNER |
7655 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3104 |
1946 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
|
LNER |
7656 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3105 |
1946 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
|
LNER |
7657 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3106 |
1946 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
|
LNER |
7658 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3107 |
1946 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
|
LNER |
7659 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3108 |
1946 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
|
LNER |
7660 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3109 |
1946 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
|
LNER |
7661 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3110 |
1946 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
|
LNER |
7663 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3112 |
1946 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
|
LNER |
7664 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3113 |
1946 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
|
LNER |
7666 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3115 |
1946 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
|
LNER |
7675 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3124 |
1946 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
|
LNER |
7665 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3114 |
1946 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
|
LNER |
7667 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3116 |
1946 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
|
LNER |
7668 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3117 |
1946 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
|
LNER |
7670 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3119 |
1946 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
|
LNER |
7671 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3120 |
1946 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
|
LNER |
7672 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3121 |
1946 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
|
LNER |
7673 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3122 |
1946 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
|
LNER |
7662 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3111 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
7669 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3118 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
7674 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3123 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
3100 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3500 |
1947 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
|
LNER |
3101 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3501 |
1947 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
|
LNER |
3102 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3502 |
1947 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
|
LNER |
3103 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3503 |
1947 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
|
LNER |
3106 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3506 |
1947 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
|
LNER |
3108 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3508 |
1947 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
|
LNER |
3109 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3509 |
1947 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
|
LNER |
3110 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3510 |
1947 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
|
LNER |
3112 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3512 |
1947 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
|
LNER |
3118 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3518 |
1947 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
|
LNER |
3120 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3520 |
1947 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
|
LNER |
3123 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3523 |
1947 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
|
LNER |
3124 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3524 |
1947 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
|
LNER |
3125 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3525 |
1947 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
|
LNER |
3126 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3526 |
1947 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
|
LNER |
3127 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3527 |
1947 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
|
LNER |
3128 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3528 |
1947 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
|
LNER |
3130 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3530 |
1947 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
|
LNER |
3131 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3531 |
1947 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
|
LNER |
3132 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3532 |
1947 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
|
LNER |
3134 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3534 |
1947 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
|
LNER |
3135 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3535 |
1947 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
|
LNER |
3136 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3536 |
1947 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
|
LNER |
3137 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3537 |
1947 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
|
LNER |
3139 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3539 |
1947 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
|
LNER |
3140 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3540 |
1947 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
|
LNER |
3141 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3541 |
1947 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
|
LNER |
3143 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3543 |
1947 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
|
LNER |
3144 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3544 |
1947 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
|
LNER |
3149 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3549 |
1947 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
|
LNER |
3151 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3551 |
1947 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
|
LNER |
3152 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3552 |
1947 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
|
LNER |
3155 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3555 |
1947 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
|
LNER |
3159 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3559 |
1947 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
|
LNER |
3162 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3562 |
1947 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
|
LNER |
3164 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3564 |
1947 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
|
LNER |
3166 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3566 |
1947 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
|
LNER |
3104 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3504 |
1947 |
m/e |
03/1947 |
|
LNER |
3105 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3505 |
1947 |
m/e |
03/1947 |
|
LNER |
3107 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3507 |
1947 |
m/e |
03/1947 |
|
LNER |
3111 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3511 |
1947 |
m/e |
03/1947 |
|
LNER |
3113 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3513 |
1947 |
m/e |
03/1947 |
|
LNER |
3114 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3514 |
1947 |
m/e |
03/1947 |
|
LNER |
3115 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3515 |
1947 |
m/e |
03/1947 |
|
LNER |
3116 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3516 |
1947 |
m/e |
03/1947 |
|
LNER |
3117 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3517 |
1947 |
m/e |
03/1947 |
|
LNER |
3119 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3519 |
1947 |
m/e |
03/1947 |
|
LNER |
3121 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3521 |
1947 |
m/e |
03/1947 |
|
LNER |
3122 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3522 |
1947 |
m/e |
03/1947 |
|
LNER |
3129 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3529 |
1947 |
m/e |
03/1947 |
|
LNER |
3133 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3533 |
1947 |
m/e |
03/1947 |
|
LNER |
3146 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3546 |
1947 |
m/e |
03/1947 |
|
LNER |
3150 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3550 |
1947 |
m/e |
03/1947 |
|
LNER |
3153 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3553 |
1947 |
m/e |
03/1947 |
|
LNER |
3154 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3554 |
1947 |
m/e |
03/1947 |
|
LNER |
3156 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3556 |
1947 |
m/e |
03/1947 |
|
LNER |
3157 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3557 |
1947 |
m/e |
03/1947 |
|
LNER |
3158 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3558 |
1947 |
m/e |
03/1947 |
|
LNER |
3160 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3560 |
1947 |
m/e |
03/1947 |
|
LNER |
3163 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3563 |
1947 |
m/e |
03/1947 |
|
LNER |
3165 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3565 |
1947 |
m/e |
03/1947 |
|
LNER |
3138 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3538 |
1947 |
m/e |
04/1947 |
|
LNER |
3142 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3542 |
1947 |
m/e |
04/1947 |
|
LNER |
3145 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3545 |
1947 |
m/e |
04/1947 |
|
LNER |
3147 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3547 |
1947 |
m/e |
04/1947 |
|
LNER |
3148 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3548 |
1947 |
m/e |
04/1947 |
|
LNER |
3161 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3561 |
1947 |
m/e |
04/1947 |
|
LNER |
3167 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3567 |
1947 |
m/e |
04/1947 |
|
LNER |
3526 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
8731 |
|
m/e |
09/1947 |
|
LNER |
3529 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
8734 |
|
m/e |
09/1947 |
|
LNER |
3535 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
8740 |
|
m/e |
09/1947 |
|
LNER |
3536 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
8741 |
|
m/e |
09/1947 |
|
LNER |
3539 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
8744 |
|
m/e |
09/1947 |
|
LNER |
3541 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
8746 |
|
m/e |
09/1947 |
|
LNER |
3553 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
8758 |
|
m/e |
09/1947 |
|
LNER |
3559 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
8764 |
|
m/e |
09/1947 |
|
LNER |
3565 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
8770 |
|
m/e |
09/1947 |
|
LNER |
3566 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
8771 |
|
m/e |
09/1947 |
|
LNER |
3567 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
8772 |
|
m/e |
09/1947 |
|
LNER |
3503 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
8708 |
|
m/e |
10/1947 |
|
LNER |
3504 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
8709 |
|
m/e |
10/1947 |
|
LNER |
3507 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
8712 |
|
m/e |
10/1947 |
|
LNER |
3511 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
8716 |
|
m/e |
10/1947 |
|
LNER |
3512 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
8717 |
|
m/e |
10/1947 |
|
LNER |
3515 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
8720 |
|
m/e |
10/1947 |
|
LNER |
3518 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
8723 |
|
m/e |
10/1947 |
|
LNER |
3523 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
8728 |
|
m/e |
10/1947 |
|
LNER |
3524 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
8729 |
|
m/e |
10/1947 |
|
LNER |
3527 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
8732 |
|
m/e |
10/1947 |
|
LNER |
3528 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
8733 |
|
m/e |
10/1947 |
|
LNER |
3530 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
8735 |
|
m/e |
10/1947 |
|
LNER |
3531 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
8736 |
|
m/e |
10/1947 |
|
LNER |
3532 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
8737 |
|
m/e |
10/1947 |
|
LNER |
3533 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
8738 |
|
m/e |
10/1947 |
|
LNER |
3534 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
8739 |
|
m/e |
10/1947 |
|
LNER |
3537 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
8742 |
|
m/e |
10/1947 |
|
LNER |
3538 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
8743 |
|
m/e |
10/1947 |
|
LNER |
3540 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
8745 |
|
m/e |
10/1947 |
|
LNER |
3542 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
8747 |
|
m/e |
10/1947 |
|
LNER |
3543 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
8748 |
|
m/e |
10/1947 |
|
LNER |
3544 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
8749 |
|
m/e |
10/1947 |
|
LNER |
3545 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
8750 |
|
m/e |
10/1947 |
|
LNER |
3548 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
8753 |
|
m/e |
10/1947 |
|
LNER |
3549 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
8754 |
|
m/e |
10/1947 |
|
LNER |
3550 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
8755 |
|
m/e |
10/1947 |
|
LNER |
3551 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
8756 |
|
m/e |
10/1947 |
|
LNER |
3552 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
8757 |
|
m/e |
10/1947 |
|
LNER |
3555 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
8760 |
|
m/e |
10/1947 |
|
LNER |
3557 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
8762 |
|
m/e |
10/1947 |
|
LNER |
3558 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
8763 |
|
m/e |
10/1947 |
|
LNER |
3560 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
8765 |
|
m/e |
10/1947 |
|
LNER |
3561 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
8766 |
|
m/e |
10/1947 |
|
LNER |
3562 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
8767 |
|
m/e |
10/1947 |
|
LNER |
3564 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
8769 |
|
m/e |
10/1947 |
|
LNER |
3500 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
8705 |
|
m/e |
11/1947 |
|
LNER |
3502 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
8707 |
|
m/e |
11/1947 |
|
LNER |
3505 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
8710 |
|
m/e |
11/1947 |
|
LNER |
3506 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
8711 |
|
m/e |
11/1947 |
|
LNER |
3509 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
8714 |
|
m/e |
11/1947 |
|
LNER |
3510 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
8715 |
|
m/e |
11/1947 |
|
LNER |
3513 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
8718 |
|
m/e |
11/1947 |
|
LNER |
3514 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
8719 |
|
m/e |
11/1947 |
|
LNER |
3516 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
8721 |
|
m/e |
11/1947 |
|
LNER |
3517 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
8722 |
|
m/e |
11/1947 |
|
LNER |
3519 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
8724 |
|
m/e |
11/1947 |
|
LNER |
3520 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
8725 |
|
m/e |
11/1947 |
|
LNER |
3521 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
8726 |
|
m/e |
11/1947 |
|
LNER |
3522 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
8727 |
|
m/e |
11/1947 |
|
LNER |
3525 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
8730 |
|
m/e |
11/1947 |
|
LNER |
3546 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
8751 |
|
m/e |
11/1947 |
|
LNER |
3556 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
8761 |
|
m/e |
11/1947 |
|
LNER |
3563 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
8768 |
|
m/e |
11/1947 |
|
LNER |
3501 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
8706 |
|
m/e |
12/1947 |
|
LNER |
3508 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
8713 |
|
m/e |
12/1947 |
|
LNER |
3547 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
8752 |
|
m/e |
12/1947 |
|
LNER |
3554 |
renumbered to |
LMS |
8759 |
|
m/e |
01/1948 |
|
LMS |
8184 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48184 |
|
w/e |
27/03/1948 |
|
LMS |
8729 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48729 |
|
w/e |
10/04/1948 |
|
LMS |
8085 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48085 |
|
w/e |
17/04/1948 |
|
LMS |
8099 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48099 |
|
w/e |
17/04/1948 |
|
LMS |
8121 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48121 |
|
w/e |
17/04/1948 |
|
LMS |
8144 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48144 |
|
w/e |
17/04/1948 |
|
LMS |
8508 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48508 |
|
w/e |
17/04/1948 |
|
LMS |
8605 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48605 |
|
w/e |
17/04/1948 |
|
LMS |
8636 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48636 |
|
w/e |
17/04/1948 |
|
LMS |
8693 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48693 |
|
w/e |
17/04/1948 |
|
LMS |
8004 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48004 |
|
w/e |
24/04/1948 |
|
LMS |
8114 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48114 |
|
w/e |
24/04/1948 |
|
LMS |
8223 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48223 |
|
w/e |
24/04/1948 |
|
LMS |
8457 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48457 |
|
w/e |
24/04/1948 |
|
LMS |
8470 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48470 |
|
w/e |
24/04/1948 |
|
LMS |
8474 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48474 |
|
w/e |
24/04/1948 |
|
LMS |
8500 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48500 |
|
w/e |
24/04/1948 |
|
LMS |
8614 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48614 |
|
w/e |
24/04/1948 |
|
LMS |
8639 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48639 |
|
w/e |
24/04/1948 |
|
LMS |
8037 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48037 |
|
w/e |
01/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
8133 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48133 |
|
w/e |
01/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
8183 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48183 |
|
w/e |
01/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
8414 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48414 |
|
w/e |
01/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
8618 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48618 |
|
w/e |
01/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
8627 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48627 |
|
w/e |
01/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
8761 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48761 |
|
w/e |
01/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
8017 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48017 |
|
w/e |
08/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
8131 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48131 |
|
w/e |
08/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
8285 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48285 |
|
w/e |
08/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
8341 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48341 |
|
w/e |
08/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
8676 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48676 |
|
w/e |
08/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
8751 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48751 |
|
w/e |
08/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
8770 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48770 |
|
w/e |
08/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
8033 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48033 |
|
w/e |
15/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
8050 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48050 |
|
w/e |
15/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
8053 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48053 |
|
w/e |
15/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
8188 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48188 |
|
w/e |
15/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
8343 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48343 |
|
w/e |
15/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
8453 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48453 |
|
w/e |
15/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
8604 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48604 |
|
w/e |
15/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
8642 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48642 |
|
w/e |
15/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
8003 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48003 |
|
w/e |
22/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
8168 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48168 |
|
w/e |
22/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
8406 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48406 |
|
w/e |
22/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
8009 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48009 |
|
w/e |
29/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
8153 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48153 |
|
w/e |
29/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
8320 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48320 |
|
w/e |
29/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
8385 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48385 |
|
w/e |
29/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
8538 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48538 |
|
w/e |
29/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
8101 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48101 |
|
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
8145 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48145 |
|
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
8146 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48146 |
|
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
8768 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48768 |
|
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
8035 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48035 |
|
w/e |
12/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
8139 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48139 |
|
w/e |
12/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
8155 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48155 |
|
w/e |
12/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
8167 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48167 |
|
w/e |
12/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
8178 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48178 |
|
w/e |
12/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
8308 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48308 |
|
w/e |
12/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
8319 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48319 |
|
w/e |
12/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
8330 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48330 |
|
w/e |
12/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
8653 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48653 |
|
w/e |
12/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
8082 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48082 |
|
w/e |
19/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
8111 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48111 |
|
w/e |
19/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
8125 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48125 |
|
w/e |
19/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
8164 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48164 |
|
w/e |
19/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
8293 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48293 |
|
w/e |
19/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
8353 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48353 |
|
w/e |
19/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
8660 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48660 |
|
w/e |
19/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
8688 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48688 |
|
w/e |
19/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
8730 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48730 |
|
w/e |
19/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
8165 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48165 |
|
w/e |
26/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
8189 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48189 |
|
w/e |
26/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
8332 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48332 |
|
w/e |
26/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
8364 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48364 |
|
w/e |
26/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
8392 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48392 |
|
w/e |
26/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
8400 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48400 |
|
w/e |
26/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
8532 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48532 |
|
w/e |
26/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
8721 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48721 |
|
w/e |
26/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
8000 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48000 |
|
w/e |
03/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
8008 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48008 |
|
w/e |
03/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
8083 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48083 |
|
w/e |
03/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
8117 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48117 |
|
w/e |
03/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
8123 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48123 |
|
w/e |
03/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
8140 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48140 |
|
w/e |
03/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
8204 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48204 |
|
w/e |
03/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
8277 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48277 |
|
w/e |
03/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
8306 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48306 |
|
w/e |
03/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
8472 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48472 |
|
w/e |
03/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
8629 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48629 |
|
w/e |
03/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
8753 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48753 |
|
w/e |
03/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
8357 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48357 |
|
w/e |
24/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
8443 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48443 |
|
w/e |
24/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
8612 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48612 |
|
w/e |
24/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
8755 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48755 |
|
w/e |
24/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
8029 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48029 |
|
w/e |
31/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
8192 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48192 |
|
w/e |
31/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
8415 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48415 |
|
w/e |
31/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
8674 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48674 |
|
w/e |
31/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
8765 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48765 |
|
w/e |
31/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
8078 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48078 |
|
w/e |
07/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
8187 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48187 |
|
w/e |
07/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
8214 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48214 |
|
w/e |
07/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
8268 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48268 |
|
w/e |
07/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
8685 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48685 |
|
w/e |
07/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
8076 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48076 |
|
w/e |
14/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
8346 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48346 |
|
w/e |
14/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
8465 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48465 |
|
w/e |
14/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
8600 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48600 |
|
w/e |
14/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
8079 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48079 |
|
w/e |
21/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
8171 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48171 |
|
w/e |
21/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
8198 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48198 |
|
w/e |
21/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
8213 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48213 |
|
w/e |
21/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
8215 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48215 |
|
w/e |
21/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
8218 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48218 |
|
w/e |
21/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
8601 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48601 |
|
w/e |
21/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
8615 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48615 |
|
w/e |
21/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
8677 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48677 |
|
w/e |
21/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
8766 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48766 |
|
w/e |
21/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
8110 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48110 |
|
w/e |
28/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
8163 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48163 |
|
w/e |
28/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
8507 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48507 |
|
w/e |
28/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
8536 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48536 |
|
w/e |
28/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
8724 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48724 |
|
w/e |
28/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
8135 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48135 |
|
w/e |
04/09/1948 |
|
LMS |
8326 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48326 |
|
w/e |
04/09/1948 |
|
LMS |
8366 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48366 |
|
w/e |
04/09/1948 |
|
LMS |
8478 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48478 |
|
w/e |
04/09/1948 |
|
LMS |
8541 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48541 |
|
w/e |
04/09/1948 |
|
LMS |
8683 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48683 |
|
w/e |
04/09/1948 |
|
LMS |
8769 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48769 |
|
w/e |
04/09/1948 |
|
LMS |
8116 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48116 |
|
w/e |
11/09/1948 |
|
LMS |
8635 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48635 |
|
w/e |
11/09/1948 |
|
LMS |
8664 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48664 |
|
w/e |
11/09/1948 |
|
LMS |
8108 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48108 |
|
w/e |
18/09/1948 |
|
LMS |
8170 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48170 |
|
w/e |
18/09/1948 |
|
LMS |
8209 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48209 |
|
w/e |
18/09/1948 |
|
LMS |
8402 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48402 |
|
w/e |
18/09/1948 |
|
LMS |
8633 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48633 |
|
w/e |
18/09/1948 |
|
LMS |
8640 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48640 |
|
w/e |
18/09/1948 |
|
LMS |
8772 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48772 |
|
w/e |
18/09/1948 |
|
LMS |
8073 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48073 |
|
w/e |
25/09/1948 |
|
LMS |
8176 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48176 |
|
w/e |
25/09/1948 |
|
LMS |
8195 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48195 |
|
w/e |
25/09/1948 |
|
LMS |
8349 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48349 |
|
w/e |
25/09/1948 |
|
LMS |
8680 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48680 |
|
w/e |
25/09/1948 |
|
LMS |
8119 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48119 |
|
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
8201 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48201 |
|
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
8760 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48760 |
|
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
8129 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48129 |
|
w/e |
09/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
8369 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48369 |
|
w/e |
09/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
8527 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48527 |
|
w/e |
09/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
8608 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48608 |
|
w/e |
09/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
8675 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48675 |
|
w/e |
09/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
8692 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48692 |
|
w/e |
09/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
8748 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48748 |
|
w/e |
09/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
8758 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48758 |
|
w/e |
09/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
8282 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48282 |
|
w/e |
16/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
8305 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48305 |
|
w/e |
16/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
8382 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48382 |
|
w/e |
16/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
8393 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48393 |
|
w/e |
16/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
8064 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48064 |
|
w/e |
23/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
8699 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48699 |
|
w/e |
23/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
8180 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48180 |
|
w/e |
30/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
8371 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48371 |
|
w/e |
30/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
8467 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48467 |
|
w/e |
30/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
8512 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48512 |
|
w/e |
30/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
8617 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48617 |
|
w/e |
30/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
8100 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48100 |
|
w/e |
06/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
8190 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48190 |
|
w/e |
06/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
8379 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48379 |
|
w/e |
06/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
8708 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48708 |
|
w/e |
06/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
8055 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48055 |
|
w/e |
13/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
8069 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48069 |
|
w/e |
13/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
8174 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48174 |
|
w/e |
13/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
8182 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48182 |
|
w/e |
13/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
8191 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48191 |
|
w/e |
13/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
8203 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48203 |
|
w/e |
13/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
8279 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48279 |
|
w/e |
13/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
8352 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48352 |
|
w/e |
13/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
8370 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48370 |
|
w/e |
13/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
8624 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48624 |
|
w/e |
13/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
8661 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48661 |
|
w/e |
13/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
8172 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48172 |
|
w/e |
20/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
8358 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48358 |
|
w/e |
20/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
8413 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48413 |
|
w/e |
20/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
8648 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48648 |
|
w/e |
20/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
8655 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48655 |
|
w/e |
20/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
8762 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48762 |
|
w/e |
20/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
8005 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48005 |
|
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
8092 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48092 |
|
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
8222 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48222 |
|
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
8348 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48348 |
|
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
8386 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48386 |
|
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
8679 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48679 |
|
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
8682 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48682 |
|
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
8702 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48702 |
|
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
8002 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48002 |
|
w/e |
11/12/1948 |
|
LMS |
8115 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48115 |
|
w/e |
11/12/1948 |
|
LMS |
8154 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48154 |
|
w/e |
11/12/1948 |
|
LMS |
8194 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48194 |
|
w/e |
11/12/1948 |
|
LMS |
8210 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48210 |
|
w/e |
11/12/1948 |
|
LMS |
8266 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48266 |
|
w/e |
11/12/1948 |
|
LMS |
8502 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48502 |
|
w/e |
11/12/1948 |
|
LMS |
8613 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48613 |
|
w/e |
11/12/1948 |
|
LMS |
8690 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48690 |
|
w/e |
11/12/1948 |
|
LMS |
8273 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48273 |
|
w/e |
18/12/1948 |
|
LMS |
8363 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48363 |
|
w/e |
18/12/1948 |
|
LMS |
8411 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48411 |
|
w/e |
18/12/1948 |
|
LMS |
8666 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48666 |
|
w/e |
18/12/1948 |
|
LMS |
8716 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48716 |
|
w/e |
18/12/1948 |
|
LMS |
8063 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48063 |
|
w/e |
25/12/1948 |
|
LMS |
8321 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48321 |
|
w/e |
25/12/1948 |
|
LMS |
8409 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48409 |
|
w/e |
25/12/1948 |
|
LMS |
8417 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48417 |
|
w/e |
25/12/1948 |
|
LMS |
8420 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48420 |
|
w/e |
25/12/1948 |
|
LMS |
8606 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48606 |
|
w/e |
25/12/1948 |
|
LMS |
8621 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48621 |
|
w/e |
25/12/1948 |
|
LMS |
8638 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48638 |
|
w/e |
25/12/1948 |
|
LMS |
8197 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48197 |
|
w/e |
01/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
8644 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48644 |
|
w/e |
01/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
8001 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48001 |
|
w/e |
08/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
8062 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48062 |
|
w/e |
08/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
8439 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48439 |
|
w/e |
08/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
8509 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48509 |
|
w/e |
08/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
8718 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48718 |
|
w/e |
08/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
8143 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48143 |
|
w/e |
15/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
8200 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48200 |
|
w/e |
15/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
8271 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48271 |
|
w/e |
15/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
8373 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48373 |
|
w/e |
15/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
8462 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48462 |
|
w/e |
15/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
8520 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48520 |
|
w/e |
15/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
8634 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48634 |
|
w/e |
15/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
8651 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48651 |
|
w/e |
15/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
8098 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48098 |
|
w/e |
22/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
8345 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48345 |
|
w/e |
22/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
8659 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48659 |
|
w/e |
22/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
8700 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48700 |
|
w/e |
22/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
8703 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48703 |
|
w/e |
22/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
8705 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48705 |
|
w/e |
22/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
8177 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48177 |
|
w/e |
29/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
8199 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48199 |
|
w/e |
29/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
8220 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48220 |
|
w/e |
29/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
8280 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48280 |
|
w/e |
29/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
8344 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48344 |
|
w/e |
29/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
8503 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48503 |
|
w/e |
29/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
8607 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48607 |
|
w/e |
29/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
8696 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48696 |
|
w/e |
29/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
8723 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48723 |
|
w/e |
29/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
8225 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48225 |
|
w/e |
05/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
8338 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48338 |
|
w/e |
05/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
8435 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48435 |
|
w/e |
05/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
8442 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48442 |
|
w/e |
05/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
8649 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48649 |
|
w/e |
05/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
8754 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48754 |
|
w/e |
05/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
8024 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48024 |
|
w/e |
12/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
8093 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48093 |
|
w/e |
12/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
8424 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48424 |
|
w/e |
12/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
8501 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48501 |
|
w/e |
12/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
8080 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48080 |
|
w/e |
19/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
8096 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48096 |
|
w/e |
19/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
8337 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48337 |
|
w/e |
19/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
8347 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48347 |
|
w/e |
19/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
8405 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48405 |
|
w/e |
19/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
8628 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48628 |
|
w/e |
19/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
8097 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48097 |
|
w/e |
26/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
8327 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48327 |
|
w/e |
26/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
8656 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48656 |
|
w/e |
26/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
8668 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48668 |
|
w/e |
26/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
8695 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48695 |
|
w/e |
26/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
8698 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48698 |
|
w/e |
26/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
8007 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48007 |
|
w/e |
05/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
8309 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48309 |
|
w/e |
05/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
8312 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48312 |
|
w/e |
05/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
8404 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48404 |
|
w/e |
05/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
8551 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48551 |
|
w/e |
05/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
8611 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48611 |
|
w/e |
05/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
8637 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48637 |
|
w/e |
05/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
8767 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48767 |
|
w/e |
05/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
8212 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48212 |
|
w/e |
12/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
8375 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48375 |
|
w/e |
12/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
8384 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48384 |
|
w/e |
12/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
8429 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48429 |
|
w/e |
12/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
8505 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48505 |
|
w/e |
12/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
8706 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48706 |
|
w/e |
12/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
8747 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48747 |
|
w/e |
12/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
8207 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48207 |
|
w/e |
19/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
8368 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48368 |
|
w/e |
19/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
8475 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48475 |
|
w/e |
19/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
8555 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48555 |
|
w/e |
19/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
8643 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48643 |
|
w/e |
19/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
8075 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48075 |
|
w/e |
26/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
8148 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48148 |
|
w/e |
26/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
8301 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48301 |
|
w/e |
26/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
8313 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48313 |
|
w/e |
26/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
8335 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48335 |
|
w/e |
26/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
8408 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48408 |
|
w/e |
26/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
8531 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48531 |
|
w/e |
26/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
8559 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48559 |
|
w/e |
26/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
8752 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48752 |
|
w/e |
26/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
8132 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48132 |
|
w/e |
02/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
8150 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48150 |
|
w/e |
02/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
8316 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48316 |
|
w/e |
02/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
8317 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48317 |
|
w/e |
02/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
8324 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48324 |
|
w/e |
02/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
8610 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48610 |
|
w/e |
02/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
8725 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48725 |
|
w/e |
02/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
8060 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48060 |
|
w/e |
09/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
8151 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48151 |
|
w/e |
09/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
8161 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48161 |
|
w/e |
09/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
8206 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48206 |
|
w/e |
09/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
8270 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48270 |
|
w/e |
09/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
8331 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48331 |
|
w/e |
09/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
8495 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48495 |
|
w/e |
09/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
8546 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48546 |
|
w/e |
09/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
8691 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48691 |
|
w/e |
09/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
8026 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48026 |
|
w/e |
16/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
8302 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48302 |
|
w/e |
16/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
8303 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48303 |
|
w/e |
16/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
8367 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48367 |
|
w/e |
16/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
8645 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48645 |
|
w/e |
16/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
8112 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48112 |
|
w/e |
23/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
8361 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48361 |
|
w/e |
23/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
8522 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48522 |
|
w/e |
23/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
8141 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48141 |
|
w/e |
30/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
8350 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48350 |
|
w/e |
30/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
8425 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48425 |
|
w/e |
30/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
8545 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48545 |
|
w/e |
30/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
8657 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48657 |
|
w/e |
30/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
8169 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48169 |
|
w/e |
07/05/1949 |
|
LMS |
8304 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48304 |
|
w/e |
07/05/1949 |
|
LMS |
8322 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48322 |
|
w/e |
07/05/1949 |
|
LMS |
8359 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48359 |
|
w/e |
07/05/1949 |
|
LMS |
8553 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48553 |
|
w/e |
07/05/1949 |
|
LMS |
8665 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48665 |
|
w/e |
07/05/1949 |
|
LMS |
8678 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48678 |
|
w/e |
07/05/1949 |
|
LMS |
8722 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48722 |
|
w/e |
07/05/1949 |
|
LMS |
8122 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48122 |
|
w/e |
14/05/1949 |
|
LMS |
8219 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48219 |
|
w/e |
14/05/1949 |
|
LMS |
8336 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48336 |
|
w/e |
14/05/1949 |
|
LMS |
8452 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48452 |
|
w/e |
14/05/1949 |
|
LMS |
8654 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48654 |
|
w/e |
14/05/1949 |
|
LMS |
8081 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48081 |
|
w/e |
21/05/1949 |
|
LMS |
8130 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48130 |
|
w/e |
21/05/1949 |
|
LMS |
8193 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48193 |
|
w/e |
21/05/1949 |
|
LMS |
8362 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48362 |
|
w/e |
21/05/1949 |
|
LMS |
8632 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48632 |
|
w/e |
21/05/1949 |
|
LMS |
8672 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48672 |
|
w/e |
21/05/1949 |
|
LMS |
8006 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48006 |
|
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
|
LMS |
8011 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48011 |
|
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
|
LMS |
8185 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48185 |
|
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
|
LMS |
8397 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48397 |
|
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
|
LMS |
8517 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48517 |
|
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
|
LMS |
8552 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48552 |
|
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
|
LMS |
8103 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48103 |
|
w/e |
04/06/1949 |
|
LMS |
8109 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48109 |
|
w/e |
04/06/1949 |
|
LMS |
8149 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48149 |
|
w/e |
04/06/1949 |
|
LMS |
8418 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48418 |
|
w/e |
04/06/1949 |
|
LMS |
8423 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48423 |
|
w/e |
04/06/1949 |
|
LMS |
8646 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48646 |
|
w/e |
04/06/1949 |
|
LMS |
8095 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48095 |
|
w/e |
11/06/1949 |
|
LMS |
8211 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48211 |
|
w/e |
11/06/1949 |
|
LMS |
8315 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48315 |
|
w/e |
11/06/1949 |
|
LMS |
8609 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48609 |
|
w/e |
11/06/1949 |
|
LMS |
8630 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48630 |
|
w/e |
11/06/1949 |
|
LMS |
8662 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48662 |
|
w/e |
11/06/1949 |
|
LMS |
8710 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48710 |
|
w/e |
11/06/1949 |
|
LMS |
8736 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48736 |
|
w/e |
11/06/1949 |
|
LMS |
8403 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48403 |
|
w/e |
18/06/1949 |
|
LMS |
8426 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48426 |
|
w/e |
18/06/1949 |
|
LMS |
8446 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48446 |
|
w/e |
18/06/1949 |
|
LMS |
8530 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48530 |
|
w/e |
18/06/1949 |
|
LMS |
8427 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48427 |
|
w/e |
25/06/1949 |
|
LMS |
8550 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48550 |
|
w/e |
25/06/1949 |
|
LMS |
8027 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48027 |
|
w/e |
02/07/1949 |
|
LMS |
8054 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48054 |
|
w/e |
02/07/1949 |
|
LMS |
8084 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48084 |
|
w/e |
02/07/1949 |
|
LMS |
8186 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48186 |
|
w/e |
02/07/1949 |
|
LMS |
8272 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48272 |
|
w/e |
02/07/1949 |
|
LMS |
8378 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48378 |
|
w/e |
02/07/1949 |
|
LMS |
8383 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48383 |
|
w/e |
02/07/1949 |
|
LMS |
8407 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48407 |
|
w/e |
02/07/1949 |
|
LMS |
8714 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48714 |
|
w/e |
09/07/1949 |
|
WD |
70573 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48045 |
|
w/e |
23/07/1949 |
|
LMS |
8365 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48365 |
|
w/e |
23/07/1949 |
|
LMS |
8380 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48380 |
|
w/e |
23/07/1949 |
|
LMS |
8430 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48430 |
|
w/e |
23/07/1949 |
|
LMS |
8432 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48432 |
|
w/e |
23/07/1949 |
|
LMS |
8118 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48118 |
|
w/e |
30/07/1949 |
|
LMS |
8323 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48323 |
|
w/e |
30/07/1949 |
|
LMS |
8377 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48377 |
|
w/e |
30/07/1949 |
|
LMS |
8494 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48494 |
|
w/e |
30/07/1949 |
|
LMS |
8556 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48556 |
|
w/e |
30/07/1949 |
|
LMS |
8727 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48727 |
|
w/e |
30/07/1949 |
|
LMS |
8089 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48089 |
|
w/e |
06/08/1949 |
|
LMS |
8162 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48162 |
|
w/e |
06/08/1949 |
|
LMS |
8217 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48217 |
|
w/e |
06/08/1949 |
|
LMS |
8307 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48307 |
|
w/e |
06/08/1949 |
|
LMS |
8410 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48410 |
|
w/e |
06/08/1949 |
|
WD |
70403 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48288 |
|
w/e |
13/08/1949 |
|
LMS |
8057 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48057 |
|
w/e |
13/08/1949 |
|
LMS |
8088 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48088 |
|
w/e |
13/08/1949 |
|
LMS |
8142 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48142 |
|
w/e |
13/08/1949 |
|
LMS |
8147 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48147 |
|
w/e |
13/08/1949 |
|
LMS |
8160 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48160 |
|
w/e |
13/08/1949 |
|
LMS |
8387 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48387 |
|
w/e |
13/08/1949 |
|
LMS |
8518 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48518 |
|
w/e |
13/08/1949 |
|
LMS |
8673 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48673 |
|
w/e |
13/08/1949 |
|
LMS |
8274 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48274 |
|
w/e |
20/08/1949 |
|
LMS |
8436 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48436 |
|
w/e |
20/08/1949 |
|
LMS |
8539 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48539 |
|
w/e |
20/08/1949 |
|
LMS |
8543 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48543 |
|
w/e |
20/08/1949 |
|
LMS |
8548 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48548 |
|
w/e |
20/08/1949 |
|
WD |
70599 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48046 |
|
w/e |
27/08/1949 |
|
LMS |
8156 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48156 |
|
w/e |
27/08/1949 |
|
LMS |
8314 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48314 |
|
w/e |
27/08/1949 |
|
LMS |
8422 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48422 |
|
w/e |
27/08/1949 |
|
LMS |
8449 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48449 |
|
w/e |
27/08/1949 |
|
LMS |
8461 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48461 |
|
w/e |
27/08/1949 |
|
LMS |
8473 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48473 |
|
w/e |
27/08/1949 |
|
LMS |
8506 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48506 |
|
w/e |
27/08/1949 |
|
LMS |
8715 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48715 |
|
w/e |
27/08/1949 |
|
WD |
70438 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48290 |
|
w/e |
03/09/1949 |
|
LMS |
8010 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48010 |
|
w/e |
03/09/1949 |
|
LMS |
8152 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48152 |
|
w/e |
03/09/1949 |
|
LMS |
8175 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48175 |
|
w/e |
03/09/1949 |
|
LMS |
8276 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48276 |
|
w/e |
03/09/1949 |
|
LMS |
8513 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48513 |
|
w/e |
03/09/1949 |
|
LMS |
8533 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48533 |
|
w/e |
03/09/1949 |
|
WD |
70398 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48258 |
|
w/e |
10/09/1949 |
|
LMS |
8460 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48460 |
|
w/e |
10/09/1949 |
|
WD |
70584 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48263 |
|
w/e |
17/09/1949 |
|
WD |
70614 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48061 |
|
w/e |
17/09/1949 |
|
LMS |
8136 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48136 |
|
w/e |
17/09/1949 |
|
LMS |
8208 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48208 |
|
w/e |
17/09/1949 |
|
LMS |
8281 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48281 |
|
w/e |
17/09/1949 |
|
LMS |
8514 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48514 |
|
w/e |
17/09/1949 |
|
LMS |
8667 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48667 |
|
w/e |
17/09/1949 |
|
LMS |
8701 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48701 |
|
w/e |
17/09/1949 |
|
LMS |
8726 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48726 |
|
w/e |
17/09/1949 |
|
WD |
70301 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48247 |
|
w/e |
24/09/1949 |
|
WD |
70395 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48257 |
|
w/e |
24/09/1949 |
|
WD |
70402 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48287 |
|
w/e |
24/09/1949 |
|
LMS |
8113 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48113 |
|
w/e |
24/09/1949 |
|
LMS |
8224 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48224 |
|
w/e |
24/09/1949 |
|
LMS |
8328 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48328 |
|
w/e |
24/09/1949 |
|
LMS |
8339 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48339 |
|
w/e |
24/09/1949 |
|
LMS |
8476 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48476 |
|
w/e |
24/09/1949 |
|
LMS |
8641 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48641 |
|
w/e |
24/09/1949 |
|
LMS |
8734 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48734 |
|
w/e |
24/09/1949 |
|
WD |
70442 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48292 |
|
w/e |
01/10/1949 |
|
WD |
70576 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48262 |
|
w/e |
01/10/1949 |
|
LMS |
8166 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48166 |
|
w/e |
01/10/1949 |
|
LMS |
8491 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48491 |
|
w/e |
01/10/1949 |
|
LMS |
8515 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48515 |
|
w/e |
01/10/1949 |
|
LMS |
8534 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48534 |
|
w/e |
01/10/1949 |
|
LMS |
8713 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48713 |
|
w/e |
01/10/1949 |
|
LMS |
8717 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48717 |
|
w/e |
01/10/1949 |
|
WD |
70318 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48250 |
|
w/e |
08/10/1949 |
|
WD |
70518 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48260 |
|
w/e |
08/10/1949 |
|
LMS |
8056 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48056 |
|
w/e |
08/10/1949 |
|
LMS |
8126 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48126 |
|
w/e |
08/10/1949 |
|
LMS |
8391 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48391 |
|
w/e |
08/10/1949 |
|
LMS |
8493 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48493 |
|
w/e |
08/10/1949 |
|
LMS |
8523 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48523 |
|
w/e |
08/10/1949 |
|
WD |
70588 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48039 |
|
w/e |
15/10/1949 |
|
LMS |
8158 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48158 |
|
w/e |
15/10/1949 |
|
LMS |
8205 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48205 |
|
w/e |
15/10/1949 |
|
LMS |
8412 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48412 |
|
w/e |
15/10/1949 |
|
LMS |
8469 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48469 |
|
w/e |
15/10/1949 |
|
LMS |
8521 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48521 |
|
w/e |
15/10/1949 |
|
LMS |
8529 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48529 |
|
w/e |
15/10/1949 |
|
LMS |
8540 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48540 |
|
w/e |
15/10/1949 |
|
LMS |
8631 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48631 |
|
w/e |
15/10/1949 |
|
LMS |
8733 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48733 |
|
w/e |
15/10/1949 |
|
LMS |
8750 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48750 |
|
w/e |
15/10/1949 |
|
WD |
70376 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48253 |
|
w/e |
22/10/1949 |
|
WD |
70394 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48256 |
|
w/e |
22/10/1949 |
|
LMS |
8138 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48138 |
|
w/e |
22/10/1949 |
|
LMS |
8284 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48284 |
|
w/e |
22/10/1949 |
|
LMS |
8447 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48447 |
|
w/e |
22/10/1949 |
|
WD |
70447 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48296 |
|
w/e |
29/10/1949 |
|
WD |
70591 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48016 |
|
w/e |
29/10/1949 |
|
LMS |
8372 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48372 |
|
w/e |
29/10/1949 |
|
LMS |
8416 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48416 |
|
w/e |
29/10/1949 |
|
LMS |
8440 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48440 |
|
w/e |
29/10/1949 |
|
LMS |
8684 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48684 |
|
w/e |
29/10/1949 |
|
LMS |
8697 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48697 |
|
w/e |
29/10/1949 |
|
WD |
70443 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48294 |
|
w/e |
05/11/1949 |
|
WD |
70449 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48297 |
|
w/e |
05/11/1949 |
|
LMS |
8067 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48067 |
|
w/e |
05/11/1949 |
|
LMS |
8107 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48107 |
|
w/e |
05/11/1949 |
|
LMS |
8269 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48269 |
|
w/e |
05/11/1949 |
|
LMS |
8329 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48329 |
|
w/e |
05/11/1949 |
|
LMS |
8333 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48333 |
|
w/e |
05/11/1949 |
|
LMS |
8389 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48389 |
|
w/e |
05/11/1949 |
|
LMS |
8431 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48431 |
|
w/e |
05/11/1949 |
|
LMS |
8490 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48490 |
|
w/e |
05/11/1949 |
|
LMS |
8516 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48516 |
|
w/e |
05/11/1949 |
|
LMS |
8528 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48528 |
|
w/e |
05/11/1949 |
|
LMS |
8554 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48554 |
|
w/e |
05/11/1949 |
|
WD |
70311 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48248 |
|
w/e |
12/11/1949 |
|
LMS |
8159 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48159 |
|
w/e |
12/11/1949 |
|
LMS |
8394 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48394 |
|
w/e |
12/11/1949 |
|
LMS |
8401 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48401 |
|
w/e |
12/11/1949 |
|
LMS |
8689 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48689 |
|
w/e |
12/11/1949 |
|
WD |
70314 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48249 |
|
w/e |
19/11/1949 |
|
WD |
70446 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48295 |
|
w/e |
19/11/1949 |
|
LMS |
8283 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48283 |
|
w/e |
19/11/1949 |
|
LMS |
8419 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48419 |
|
w/e |
19/11/1949 |
|
LMS |
8444 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48444 |
|
w/e |
19/11/1949 |
|
LMS |
8542 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48542 |
|
w/e |
19/11/1949 |
|
LMS |
8687 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48687 |
|
w/e |
19/11/1949 |
|
LMS |
8704 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48704 |
|
w/e |
19/11/1949 |
|
LMS |
8741 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48741 |
|
w/e |
19/11/1949 |
|
WD |
70363 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48252 |
|
w/e |
26/11/1949 |
|
WD |
70413 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48289 |
|
w/e |
26/11/1949 |
|
LMS |
8216 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48216 |
|
w/e |
26/11/1949 |
|
LMS |
8388 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48388 |
|
w/e |
26/11/1949 |
|
LMS |
8669 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48669 |
|
w/e |
26/11/1949 |
|
WD |
70504 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48259 |
|
w/e |
03/12/1949 |
|
WD |
70577 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48012 |
|
w/e |
03/12/1949 |
|
WD |
70582 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48018 |
|
w/e |
03/12/1949 |
|
LMS |
8342 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48342 |
|
w/e |
03/12/1949 |
|
LMS |
8663 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48663 |
|
w/e |
03/12/1949 |
|
WD |
70300 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48246 |
|
w/e |
10/12/1949 |
|
WD |
70332 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48251 |
|
w/e |
10/12/1949 |
|
LMS |
8065 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48065 |
|
w/e |
10/12/1949 |
|
LMS |
8127 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48127 |
|
w/e |
10/12/1949 |
|
LMS |
8537 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48537 |
|
w/e |
10/12/1949 |
|
LMS |
8658 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48658 |
|
w/e |
10/12/1949 |
|
WD |
70384 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48255 |
|
w/e |
17/12/1949 |
|
WD |
70579 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48020 |
|
w/e |
17/12/1949 |
|
LMS |
8070 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48070 |
|
w/e |
17/12/1949 |
|
LMS |
8137 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48137 |
|
w/e |
17/12/1949 |
|
LMS |
8157 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48157 |
|
w/e |
17/12/1949 |
|
LMS |
8374 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48374 |
|
w/e |
17/12/1949 |
|
LMS |
8434 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48434 |
|
w/e |
17/12/1949 |
|
LMS |
8459 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48459 |
|
w/e |
17/12/1949 |
|
LMS |
8707 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48707 |
|
w/e |
17/12/1949 |
|
WD |
70606 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48094 |
|
w/e |
24/12/1949 |
|
WD |
70611 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48077 |
|
w/e |
24/12/1949 |
|
LMS |
8437 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48437 |
|
w/e |
24/12/1949 |
|
LMS |
8455 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48455 |
|
w/e |
24/12/1949 |
|
LMS |
8458 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48458 |
|
w/e |
24/12/1949 |
|
WD |
70378 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48254 |
|
w/e |
31/12/1949 |
|
WD |
70401 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48286 |
|
w/e |
31/12/1949 |
|
WD |
70440 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48291 |
|
w/e |
31/12/1949 |
|
WD |
70544 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48261 |
|
w/e |
31/12/1949 |
|
LMS |
8399 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48399 |
|
w/e |
31/12/1949 |
|
LMS |
8421 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48421 |
|
w/e |
31/12/1949 |
|
LMS |
8694 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48694 |
|
w/e |
31/12/1949 |
|
LMS |
8711 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48711 |
|
w/e |
31/12/1949 |
|
LMS |
8743 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48743 |
|
w/e |
31/12/1949 |
|
LMS |
8547 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48547 |
|
w/e |
07/01/1950 |
|
LMS |
8558 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48558 |
|
w/e |
07/01/1950 |
|
LMS |
8623 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48623 |
|
w/e |
07/01/1950 |
|
LMS |
8740 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48740 |
|
w/e |
07/01/1950 |
|
LMS |
8102 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48102 |
|
w/e |
14/01/1950 |
|
LMS |
8311 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48311 |
|
w/e |
14/01/1950 |
|
LMS |
8454 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48454 |
|
w/e |
14/01/1950 |
|
LMS |
8712 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48712 |
|
w/e |
14/01/1950 |
|
LMS |
8739 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48739 |
|
w/e |
14/01/1950 |
|
LMS |
8105 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48105 |
|
w/e |
21/01/1950 |
|
LMS |
8275 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48275 |
|
w/e |
21/01/1950 |
|
LMS |
8360 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48360 |
|
w/e |
21/01/1950 |
|
LMS |
8448 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48448 |
|
w/e |
21/01/1950 |
|
LMS |
8544 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48544 |
|
w/e |
21/01/1950 |
|
LMS |
8720 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48720 |
|
w/e |
21/01/1950 |
|
LMS |
8735 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48735 |
|
w/e |
21/01/1950 |
|
LMS |
8104 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48104 |
|
w/e |
28/01/1950 |
|
LMS |
8463 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48463 |
|
w/e |
28/01/1950 |
|
LMS |
8511 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48511 |
|
w/e |
28/01/1950 |
|
LMS |
8619 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48619 |
|
w/e |
28/01/1950 |
|
LMS |
8756 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48756 |
|
w/e |
28/01/1950 |
|
LMS |
8036 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48036 |
|
w/e |
04/02/1950 |
|
LMS |
8074 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48074 |
|
w/e |
04/02/1950 |
|
LMS |
8128 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48128 |
|
w/e |
04/02/1950 |
|
LMS |
8340 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48340 |
|
w/e |
04/02/1950 |
|
LMS |
8376 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48376 |
|
w/e |
04/02/1950 |
|
LMS |
8438 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48438 |
|
w/e |
04/02/1950 |
|
LMS |
8650 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48650 |
|
w/e |
04/02/1950 |
|
LMS |
8441 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48441 |
|
w/e |
11/02/1950 |
|
LMS |
8492 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48492 |
|
w/e |
11/02/1950 |
|
LMS |
8525 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48525 |
|
w/e |
11/02/1950 |
|
LMS |
8671 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48671 |
|
w/e |
11/02/1950 |
|
LMS |
8173 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48173 |
|
w/e |
18/02/1950 |
|
LMS |
8445 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48445 |
|
w/e |
18/02/1950 |
|
LMS |
8450 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48450 |
|
w/e |
18/02/1950 |
|
LMS |
8616 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48616 |
|
w/e |
18/02/1950 |
|
LMS |
8686 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48686 |
|
w/e |
18/02/1950 |
|
LMS |
8709 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48709 |
|
w/e |
18/02/1950 |
|
LMS |
8742 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48742 |
|
w/e |
18/02/1950 |
|
LMS |
8355 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48355 |
|
w/e |
25/02/1950 |
|
LMS |
8620 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48620 |
|
w/e |
25/02/1950 |
|
LMS |
8681 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48681 |
|
w/e |
25/02/1950 |
|
LMS |
8398 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48398 |
|
w/e |
04/03/1950 |
|
LMS |
8433 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48433 |
|
w/e |
04/03/1950 |
|
LMS |
8451 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48451 |
|
w/e |
04/03/1950 |
|
LMS |
8504 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48504 |
|
w/e |
04/03/1950 |
|
LMS |
8526 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48526 |
|
w/e |
04/03/1950 |
|
LMS |
8428 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48428 |
|
w/e |
11/03/1950 |
|
LMS |
8728 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48728 |
|
w/e |
11/03/1950 |
|
LMS |
8746 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48746 |
|
w/e |
11/03/1950 |
|
LMS |
8759 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48759 |
|
w/e |
11/03/1950 |
|
LMS |
8106 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48106 |
|
w/e |
18/03/1950 |
|
LMS |
8196 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48196 |
|
w/e |
18/03/1950 |
|
LMS |
8325 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48325 |
|
w/e |
18/03/1950 |
|
LMS |
8356 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48356 |
|
w/e |
18/03/1950 |
|
LMS |
8381 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48381 |
|
w/e |
18/03/1950 |
|
LMS |
8466 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48466 |
|
w/e |
18/03/1950 |
|
LMS |
8557 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48557 |
|
w/e |
18/03/1950 |
|
LMS |
8652 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48652 |
|
w/e |
18/03/1950 |
|
LMS |
8549 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48549 |
|
w/e |
25/03/1950 |
|
LMS |
8471 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48471 |
|
w/e |
01/04/1950 |
|
LMS |
8524 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48524 |
|
w/e |
01/04/1950 |
|
LMS |
8737 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48737 |
|
w/e |
01/04/1950 |
|
LMS |
8179 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48179 |
|
w/e |
08/04/1950 |
|
LMS |
8351 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48351 |
|
w/e |
08/04/1950 |
|
LMS |
8354 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48354 |
|
w/e |
08/04/1950 |
|
LMS |
8603 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48603 |
|
w/e |
08/04/1950 |
|
LMS |
8395 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48395 |
|
w/e |
22/04/1950 |
|
LMS |
8468 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48468 |
|
w/e |
22/04/1950 |
|
LMS |
8719 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48719 |
|
w/e |
22/04/1950 |
|
LMS |
8090 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48090 |
|
w/e |
29/04/1950 |
|
LMS |
8134 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48134 |
|
w/e |
29/04/1950 |
|
LMS |
8738 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48738 |
|
w/e |
29/04/1950 |
|
LMS |
8749 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48749 |
|
w/e |
29/04/1950 |
|
LMS |
8264 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48264 |
|
w/e |
06/05/1950 |
|
LMS |
8535 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48535 |
|
w/e |
06/05/1950 |
|
LMS |
8519 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48519 |
|
w/e |
13/05/1950 |
|
LMS |
8390 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48390 |
|
w/e |
20/05/1950 |
|
LMS |
8396 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48396 |
|
w/e |
20/05/1950 |
|
LMS |
8477 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48477 |
|
w/e |
20/05/1950 |
|
LMS |
8731 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48731 |
|
w/e |
20/05/1950 |
|
LMS |
8318 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48318 |
|
w/e |
27/05/1950 |
|
LMS |
8622 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48622 |
|
w/e |
27/05/1950 |
|
LMS |
8221 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48221 |
|
w/e |
03/06/1950 |
|
LMS |
8670 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48670 |
|
w/e |
03/06/1950 |
|
LMS |
8744 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48744 |
|
w/e |
03/06/1950 |
|
LMS |
8757 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48757 |
|
w/e |
03/06/1950 |
|
LMS |
8456 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48456 |
|
w/e |
10/06/1950 |
|
LMS |
8464 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48464 |
|
w/e |
17/06/1950 |
|
LMS |
8625 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48625 |
|
w/e |
01/07/1950 |
|
LMS |
8120 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48120 |
|
w/e |
22/07/1950 |
|
LMS |
8334 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48334 |
|
w/e |
05/08/1950 |
|
LMS |
8479 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48479 |
|
w/e |
26/08/1950 |
|
LMS |
8732 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48732 |
|
w/e |
02/09/1950 |
|
LMS |
8647 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48647 |
|
w/e |
23/09/1950 |
|
LMS |
8202 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48202 |
|
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
|
LMS |
8764 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48764 |
|
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
|
LMS |
8181 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48181 |
|
w/e |
28/10/1950 |
|
LMS |
8626 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48626 |
|
w/e |
18/11/1950 |
|
LMS |
8771 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48771 |
|
w/e |
18/11/1950 |
|
LMS |
8265 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48265 |
|
m/e |
31/12/1950 |
|
LMS |
8267 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48267 |
|
m/e |
31/12/1950 |
|
LMS |
8763 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48763 |
|
w/e |
03/03/1951 |
|
LMS |
8124 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48124 |
|
w/e |
01/12/1951 |
|
LMS |
8278 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48278 |
|
w/e |
02/08/1952 |
|
LMS |
8745 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48745 |
|
w/e |
23/08/1952 |
|
LMS |
8510 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48510 |
|
w/e |
18/10/1952 |
|
LMS |
8310 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48310 |
|
w/e |
21/02/1953 |
|
LMS |
8602 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48602 |
|
w/e |
18/04/1953 |
|
WD |
70500 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48773 |
|
m/e |
09/1957 |
|
WD |
70501 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48774 |
|
m/e |
09/1957 |
|
WD |
70512 |
renumbered to |
BR |
48775 |
|
m/e |
09/1957 |
|