55 Co-Co
BR (Pre Tops) | BR (Tops) | Date To Service | Bld | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) | Name |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
D9000 | 55022 | 28/02/1961 | EE | Haymarket | 02/01/1982 | 20.92 | Prs | Preserved | 63.18 | ROYAL SCOTS GREY | ||
D9001 | 55001 | 23/02/1961 | EE | Finsbury Park | 05/01/1980 | 18.92 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 23/02/1980 | 19.01 | ST. PADDY | |
D9002 | 55002 | 19/03/1961 | EE | Gateshead | 02/01/1982 | 20.83 | Prs | Preserved | 63.13 | THE KING'S OWN YORKSHIRE LIGHT INFANTRY | ||
D9003 | 55003 | 27/03/1961 | EE | Finsbury Park | 31/12/1980 | 19.75 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 03/1981 | 19.98 | MELD | |
D9004 | 55004 | 10/05/1961 | EE | Haymarket | 28/10/1981 | York (North) | 20.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 23/07/1983 | 22.22 | QUEEN'S OWN HIGHLANDER |
D9005 | 55005 | 25/05/1961 | EE | Gateshead | 08/02/1981 | 19.75 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 22/02/1983 | 21.76 | THE PRINCE OF WALES'S OWN REGIMENT OF YORKSHIRE | |
D9006 | 55006 | 29/06/1961 | EE | Haymarket | 08/02/1981 | 19.67 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 07/1981 | 20.06 | THE FIFE & FORFAR YEOMANRY | |
D9007 | 55007 | 22/06/1961 | EE | Finsbury Park | 31/12/1981 | 20.5 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 08/1982 | 21.16 | PINZA | |
D9008 | 55008 | 07/07/1961 | EE | Gateshead | 31/12/1981 | 20.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 08/1982 | 21.12 | THE GREEN HOWARDS | |
D9009 | 55009 | 21/07/1961 | EE | Finsbury Park | 02/01/1982 | 20.5 | Prs | Preserved | 62.79 | ALYCIDON | ||
D9010 | 55010 | 21/07/1961 | EE | Haymarket | 24/12/1981 | 20.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 05/1982 | 20.83 | THE KING'S OWN SCOTTISH BORDERER | |
D9011 | 55011 | 24/08/1961 | EE | Gateshead | 08/11/1981 | York (North) | 20.25 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 04/11/1982 | 21.21 | THE ROYAL NORTHUMBERLAND FUSILIERS |
D9012 | 55012 | 04/09/1961 | EE | Finsbury Park | 18/05/1981 | 19.67 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 09/1981 | 20.04 | CREPELLO | |
D9013 | 55013 | 14/09/1961 | EE | Haymarket | 20/12/1981 | 20.25 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 12/1982 | 21.27 | THE BLACK WATCH | |
D9014 | 55014 | 29/09/1961 | EE | Gateshead | 22/11/1981 | York (North) | 20.17 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 02/1982 | 20.39 | THE DUKE OF WELLINGTON'S REGIMENT |
D9015 | 55015 | 13/10/1961 | EE | Finsbury Park | 02/01/1982 | 20.25 | Prs | Preserved | 62.56 | TULYAR | ||
D9016 | 55016 | 27/10/1961 | EE | Haymarket | 30/12/1981 | 20.17 | Prs | Preserved | 62.52 | GORDON HIGHLANDER | ||
D9017 | 55017 | 09/11/1961 | EE | Gateshead | 31/12/1981 | 20.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 29/01/1983 | 21.24 | THE DURHAM LIGHT INFANTRY | |
D9018 | 55018 | 24/11/1961 | EE | Finsbury Park | 13/10/1981 | York (North) | 19.92 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 01/1982 | 20.16 | BALLYMOSS |
D9019 | 55019 | 11/12/1961 | EE | Haymarket | 31/12/1981 | 20 | Prs | Preserved | 62.39 | ROYAL HIGHLAND FUSILIER | ||
D9020 | 55020 | 12/02/1962 | EE | Finsbury Park | 06/01/1980 | 17.92 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 02/02/1980 | 17.98 | NIMBUS | |
D9021 | 55021 | 16/03/1962 | EE | Haymarket | 31/12/1981 | 19.75 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 18/09/1982 | 20.52 | ARGYLL & SUTHERLAND HIGHLANDER |