11/1935 |
To Service |
5219 |
|
NEW |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
|
11/1935 |
To Service |
5220 |
|
NEW |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
|
11/1935 |
To Service |
5221 |
|
NEW |
25F |
Low Moor |
|
02/11/1935 |
Reallocation |
5003 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
02/11/1935 |
Reallocation |
5019 |
|
|
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
02/11/1935 |
Reallocation |
5022 |
|
|
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
02/11/1935 |
Reallocation |
5027 |
|
|
5A |
Crewe North |
|
02/11/1935 |
Reallocation |
5042 |
|
|
19G |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
02/11/1935 |
Reallocation |
5116 |
|
|
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
02/11/1935 |
Reallocation |
5117 |
|
|
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
02/11/1935 |
Reallocation |
5125 |
|
|
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
02/11/1935 |
Reallocation |
5145 |
|
|
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
02/11/1935 |
Reallocation |
5182 |
|
|
17A |
Derby |
|
02/11/1935 |
Reallocation |
5201 |
|
|
19G |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
30/11/1935 |
Reallocation |
5022 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
12/1935 |
To Service |
5223 |
|
NEW |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
12/1935 |
To Service |
5224 |
|
NEW |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
08/02/1936 |
Reallocation |
5019 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
08/02/1936 |
Reallocation |
5066 |
|
|
22B |
Gloucester Barnwood |
|
08/02/1936 |
Reallocation |
5131 |
|
|
5A |
Crewe North |
|
08/02/1936 |
Reallocation |
5151 |
|
|
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
08/02/1936 |
Reallocation |
5152 |
|
|
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
08/02/1936 |
Reallocation |
5153 |
|
|
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
08/02/1936 |
Reallocation |
5154 |
|
|
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
08/02/1936 |
Reallocation |
5155 |
|
|
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
08/02/1936 |
Reallocation |
5156 |
|
|
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
08/02/1936 |
Reallocation |
5184 |
|
|
17A |
Derby |
|
08/02/1936 |
Reallocation |
5200 |
|
|
23A |
Bank Hall |
|
08/02/1936 |
Reallocation |
5201 |
19G |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
23A |
Bank Hall |
|
11/04/1936 |
Reallocation |
5089 |
|
|
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
11/04/1936 |
Reallocation |
5091 |
|
|
1A |
Willesden |
|
11/1936 |
To Service |
5278 |
|
NEW |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
11/1936 |
To Service |
5279 |
|
NEW |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
11/1936 |
To Service |
5280 |
|
NEW |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
11/1936 |
To Service |
5281 |
|
NEW |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
11/1936 |
To Service |
5282 |
|
NEW |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
11/1936 |
To Service |
5283 |
|
NEW |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
12/1936 |
To Service |
5284 |
|
NEW |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
12/1936 |
To Service |
5288 |
|
NEW |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
12/1936 |
To Service |
5289 |
|
NEW |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
12/1936 |
To Service |
5290 |
|
NEW |
2C |
Northampton |
|
12/1936 |
To Service |
5291 |
|
NEW |
2A |
Rugby |
|
12/1936 |
To Service |
5292 |
|
NEW |
4B |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
01/1937 |
To Service |
5299 |
|
NEW |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
01/1937 |
To Service |
5300 |
|
NEW |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
01/1937 |
To Service |
5301 |
|
NEW |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
12/1937 |
To Service |
5293 |
|
NEW |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
12/1937 |
To Service |
5294 |
|
NEW |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
12/1937 |
To Service |
5295 |
|
NEW |
9A |
Longsight |
|
12/1937 |
To Service |
5296 |
|
NEW |
9A |
Longsight |
|
12/1937 |
To Service |
5297 |
|
NEW |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
12/1937 |
To Service |
5298 |
|
NEW |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
08/1945 |
To Service |
4888 |
|
NEW |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
08/1945 |
To Service |
4889 |
|
NEW |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
08/1945 |
To Service |
4890 |
|
NEW |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
08/1945 |
To Service |
4891 |
|
NEW |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
09/1945 |
To Service |
4892 |
|
NEW |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
09/1945 |
To Service |
4893 |
|
NEW |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
09/1945 |
To Service |
4894 |
|
NEW |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
09/1945 |
To Service |
4895 |
|
NEW |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
09/1945 |
To Service |
4896 |
|
NEW |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
|
09/1945 |
To Service |
4897 |
|
NEW |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
09/1945 |
To Service |
4898 |
|
NEW |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
09/1945 |
To Service |
4899 |
|
NEW |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
09/1945 |
To Service |
4932 |
|
NEW |
28B |
Dalry Road |
|
10/1945 |
To Service |
4900 |
|
NEW |
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
10/1945 |
To Service |
4901 |
|
NEW |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
10/1945 |
To Service |
4902 |
|
NEW |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
10/1945 |
To Service |
4933 |
|
NEW |
28B |
Dalry Road |
|
10/1945 |
To Service |
4934 |
|
NEW |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
05/1946 |
To Service |
4960 |
|
NEW |
29A |
Perth South |
|
05/1946 |
To Service |
4975 |
|
NEW |
29A |
Perth South |
|
05/1946 |
To Service |
4976 |
|
NEW |
29A |
Perth South |
|
15/06/1946 |
To Service |
4961 |
|
NEW |
29A |
Perth South |
|
15/06/1946 |
To Service |
4962 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
15/06/1946 |
To Service |
4977 |
|
NEW |
29A |
Perth South |
|
15/06/1946 |
To Service |
4978 |
|
NEW |
27A |
Polmadie |
|
22/06/1946 |
Reallocation |
4829 |
|
|
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
22/06/1946 |
Reallocation |
4830 |
|
|
22C |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
|
22/06/1946 |
Reallocation |
4918 |
|
|
16A |
Nottingham |
|
22/06/1946 |
Reallocation |
4927 |
|
|
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
22/06/1946 |
Reallocation |
4928 |
|
|
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
22/06/1946 |
Reallocation |
4947 |
|
|
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
22/06/1946 |
Reallocation |
4950 |
|
|
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
22/06/1946 |
To Service |
4963 |
|
NEW |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
|
22/06/1946 |
To Service |
4979 |
|
NEW |
27A |
Polmadie |
|
22/06/1946 |
Reallocation |
5009 |
|
|
29A |
Perth South |
|
22/06/1946 |
Reallocation |
5039 |
|
|
11A |
Carnforth |
|
22/06/1946 |
Reallocation |
5091 |
1A |
Willesden |
10B |
Preston |
|
22/06/1946 |
Reallocation |
5138 |
|
|
32A |
Inverness |
|
22/06/1946 |
Reallocation |
5215 |
|
|
23A |
Bank Hall |
|
22/06/1946 |
Reallocation |
5216 |
|
|
23A |
Bank Hall |
|
22/06/1946 |
Reallocation |
5217 |
|
|
23A |
Bank Hall |
|
22/06/1946 |
Reallocation |
5218 |
|
|
23A |
Bank Hall |
|
22/06/1946 |
Reallocation |
5301 |
3E |
Monument Lane |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
22/06/1946 |
Reallocation |
5303 |
|
|
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
|
22/06/1946 |
Reallocation |
5333 |
|
|
11A |
Carnforth |
|
22/06/1946 |
Reallocation |
5343 |
|
|
11A |
Carnforth |
|
22/06/1946 |
Reallocation |
5392 |
|
|
11A |
Carnforth |
|
22/06/1946 |
Reallocation |
5433 |
|
|
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
22/06/1946 |
Reallocation |
5434 |
|
|
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
22/06/1946 |
Reallocation |
5461 |
|
|
28A |
Motherwell |
|
22/06/1946 |
Reallocation |
5462 |
|
|
28A |
Motherwell |
|
25/09/1947 |
To Service |
4761 |
|
NEW |
29A |
Perth South |
|
02/10/1947 |
To Service |
4762 |
|
NEW |
29A |
Perth South |
|
09/10/1947 |
To Service |
4763 |
|
NEW |
32A |
Inverness |
|
27/12/1947 |
Reallocation |
4762 |
|
|
29A |
Crewe North |
|
27/12/1947 |
Reallocation |
4763 |
|
|
32A |
Crewe North |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4758 |
|
|
5A |
Crewe North |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4759 |
|
|
5A |
Crewe North |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4760 |
|
|
5A |
Crewe North |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4761 |
|
|
29A |
Crewe North |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4764 |
|
|
5A |
Crewe North |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4765 |
|
|
5A |
Crewe North |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4766 |
|
|
5A |
Crewe North |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4767 |
|
|
5A |
Crewe North |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4768 |
|
|
29A |
Perth South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4769 |
|
|
29A |
Perth South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4770 |
|
|
29A |
Perth South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4771 |
|
|
32A |
Inverness |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4772 |
|
|
32A |
Inverness |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4773 |
|
|
32A |
Inverness |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4774 |
|
|
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4775 |
|
|
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4776 |
|
|
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4777 |
|
|
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4778 |
|
|
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4779 |
|
|
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4780 |
|
|
25A |
Wakefield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4781 |
|
|
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4782 |
|
|
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4783 |
|
|
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4784 |
|
|
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4785 |
|
|
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4786 |
|
|
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4787 |
|
|
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4788 |
|
|
5A |
Crewe North |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4789 |
|
|
5A |
Crewe North |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4790 |
|
|
5A |
Crewe North |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4791 |
|
|
28A |
Motherwell |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4792 |
|
|
28A |
Motherwell |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4793 |
|
|
27A |
Polmadie |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4794 |
|
|
27A |
Polmadie |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4795 |
|
|
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4796 |
|
|
29A |
Perth South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4797 |
|
|
29A |
Perth South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4798 |
|
|
32A |
Inverness |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4799 |
|
|
32A |
Inverness |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4800 |
|
|
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4801 |
|
|
5A |
Crewe North |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4802 |
|
|
19E |
Belle Vue |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4803 |
|
|
19E |
Belle Vue |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4804 |
|
|
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4805 |
|
|
21A |
Saltley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4806 |
|
|
21A |
Saltley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4807 |
|
|
5A |
Crewe North |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4808 |
|
|
5A |
Crewe North |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4809 |
|
|
17A |
Derby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4810 |
|
|
21A |
Saltley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4811 |
|
|
21A |
Saltley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4812 |
|
|
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4813 |
|
|
21A |
Saltley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4814 |
|
|
21A |
Saltley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4815 |
|
|
17A |
Derby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4816 |
|
|
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4817 |
|
|
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4818 |
|
|
17A |
Derby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4819 |
|
|
17A |
Derby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4820 |
|
|
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4821 |
|
|
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4822 |
|
|
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4823 |
|
|
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4824 |
|
|
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4825 |
|
|
16A |
Nottingham |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4826 |
|
|
22C |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4827 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4828 |
|
|
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4829 |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
18A |
Toton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4830 |
22C |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
22C |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4831 |
|
|
2A |
Rugby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4832 |
|
|
5A |
Crewe North |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4833 |
|
|
5A |
Crewe North |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4834 |
|
|
5A |
Crewe North |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4835 |
|
|
5A |
Crewe North |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4836 |
|
|
5A |
Crewe North |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4837 |
|
|
5A |
Crewe North |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4838 |
|
|
5A |
Crewe North |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4839 |
|
|
17A |
Derby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4840 |
|
|
21A |
Saltley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4841 |
|
|
16A |
Nottingham |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4842 |
|
|
21A |
Saltley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4843 |
|
|
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4844 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4845 |
|
|
19E |
Belle Vue |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4846 |
|
|
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4847 |
|
|
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4848 |
|
|
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4849 |
|
|
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4850 |
|
|
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4851 |
|
|
17A |
Derby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4852 |
|
|
21A |
Saltley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4853 |
|
|
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4854 |
|
|
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4855 |
|
|
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4856 |
|
|
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4857 |
|
|
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4858 |
|
|
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4859 |
|
|
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4860 |
|
|
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4861 |
|
|
16A |
Nottingham |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4862 |
|
|
5A |
Crewe North |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4863 |
|
|
5A |
Crewe North |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4864 |
|
|
5A |
Crewe North |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4865 |
|
|
5A |
Crewe North |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4866 |
|
|
2A |
Rugby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4867 |
|
|
2A |
Rugby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4868 |
|
|
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4869 |
|
|
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4870 |
|
|
9A |
Longsight |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4871 |
|
|
9A |
Longsight |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4872 |
|
|
3D |
Aston |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4873 |
|
|
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4874 |
|
|
5A |
Crewe North |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4875 |
|
|
5A |
Crewe North |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4876 |
|
|
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4877 |
|
|
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4878 |
|
|
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4879 |
|
|
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4880 |
|
|
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4881 |
|
|
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4882 |
|
|
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4883 |
|
|
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4884 |
|
|
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4885 |
|
|
29A |
Perth South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4886 |
|
|
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4887 |
|
|
23C |
Southport |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4888 |
|
|
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4889 |
|
|
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4890 |
|
|
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4891 |
|
|
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4892 |
|
|
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4893 |
|
|
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4894 |
|
|
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4895 |
|
|
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4896 |
|
|
25G |
Farnley Junction |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4897 |
|
|
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4898 |
|
|
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4899 |
|
|
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4900 |
|
|
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4902 |
|
|
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4903 |
|
|
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4904 |
|
|
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4905 |
|
|
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4906 |
|
|
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4907 |
|
|
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4908 |
|
|
5A |
Crewe North |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4909 |
|
|
2A |
Rugby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4910 |
|
|
2A |
Rugby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4911 |
|
|
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4912 |
|
|
25F |
Low Moor |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4913 |
|
|
3A |
Bescot |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4914 |
|
|
3A |
Bescot |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4915 |
|
|
2C |
Northampton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4917 |
|
|
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4918 |
16A |
Nottingham |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4919 |
|
|
21A |
Saltley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4920 |
|
|
21A |
Saltley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4921 |
|
|
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4922 |
|
|
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4923 |
|
|
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4924 |
|
|
29A |
Perth South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4925 |
|
|
29A |
Perth South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4926 |
|
|
23C |
Southport |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4927 |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4928 |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4929 |
|
|
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4930 |
|
|
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4931 |
|
|
28B |
Dalry Road |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4932 |
|
|
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4933 |
|
|
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4934 |
|
|
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4935 |
|
|
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4936 |
|
|
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4937 |
|
|
9A |
Longsight |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4938 |
|
|
9A |
Longsight |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4939 |
|
|
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4940 |
|
|
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4941 |
|
|
BA |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4942 |
|
|
3A |
Bescot |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4943 |
|
|
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4944 |
|
|
19G |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4945 |
|
|
22C |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4946 |
|
|
23A |
Bank Hall |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4947 |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4948 |
|
|
24F |
Fleetwood |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4949 |
|
|
25A |
Wakefield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4950 |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4951 |
|
|
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4952 |
|
|
5A |
Crewe North |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4953 |
|
|
28C |
Carstairs |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4954 |
|
|
5A |
Crewe North |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4955 |
|
|
28C |
Carstairs |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4956 |
|
|
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4957 |
|
|
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4958 |
|
|
29A |
Perth South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4959 |
|
|
29A |
Perth South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4964 |
|
|
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4965 |
|
|
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4966 |
|
|
21A |
Saltley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4967 |
|
|
5A |
Crewe North |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4968 |
|
|
2B |
Bletchley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4969 |
|
|
9A |
Longsight |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4970 |
|
|
9A |
Longsight |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4971 |
|
|
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4972 |
|
|
29A |
Perth South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4973 |
|
|
29A |
Perth South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4974 |
|
|
29A |
Perth South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4980 |
|
|
27A |
Polmadie |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4981 |
|
|
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4982 |
|
|
23A |
Bank Hall |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4983 |
|
|
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4984 |
|
|
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4985 |
|
|
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4986 |
|
|
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4987 |
|
|
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4988 |
|
|
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4989 |
|
|
23C |
Southport |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4990 |
|
|
23A |
Bank Hall |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4991 |
|
|
32A |
Inverness |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4992 |
|
|
32A |
Inverness |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4993 |
|
|
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4994 |
|
|
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4995 |
|
|
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4996 |
|
|
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4997 |
|
|
2A |
Rugby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4998 |
|
|
2A |
Rugby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4999 |
|
|
2A |
Rugby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5000 |
|
|
2A |
Rugby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5001 |
|
|
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5002 |
|
|
2A |
Rugby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5003 |
5B |
Crewe South |
2A |
Rugby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5004 |
|
|
2A |
Rugby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5005 |
|
|
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5006 |
|
|
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5007 |
|
|
28A |
Motherwell |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5008 |
|
|
28A |
Motherwell |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5009 |
29A |
Perth South |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5010 |
|
|
29A |
Perth South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5011 |
|
|
29A |
Perth South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5012 |
|
|
28A |
Motherwell |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5013 |
|
|
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5014 |
|
|
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5015 |
|
|
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5016 |
|
|
28A |
Motherwell |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5017 |
|
|
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5018 |
|
|
28A |
Motherwell |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5019 |
10C |
Patricroft |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5020 |
|
|
2A |
Rugby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5021 |
|
|
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5022 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5023 |
|
|
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5024 |
|
|
1A |
Willesden |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5025 |
|
|
2B |
Bletchley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5026 |
|
|
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5027 |
5A |
Crewe North |
1A |
Willesden |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5028 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5029 |
|
|
28B |
Dalry Road |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5030 |
|
|
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5031 |
|
|
19E |
Belle Vue |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5032 |
|
|
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5033 |
|
|
2A |
Rugby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5034 |
|
|
2A |
Rugby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5035 |
|
|
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5036 |
|
|
29A |
Perth South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5037 |
|
|
10C |
Patricroft |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5038 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5039 |
11A |
Carnforth |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5040 |
|
|
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5041 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5042 |
19G |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5043 |
|
|
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5044 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5045 |
|
|
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5046 |
|
|
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5047 |
|
|
30A |
Corkerhill |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5048 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5049 |
|
|
30A |
Corkerhill |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5050 |
|
|
11A |
Carnforth |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5051 |
|
|
3D |
Aston |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5052 |
|
|
2A |
Rugby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5053 |
|
|
32A |
Inverness |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5054 |
|
|
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5055 |
|
|
10C |
Patricroft |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5056 |
|
|
22C |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5057 |
|
|
2A |
Rugby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5058 |
|
|
3D |
Aston |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5059 |
|
|
16A |
Nottingham |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5060 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5061 |
|
|
23C |
Southport |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5062 |
|
|
25F |
Low Moor |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5063 |
|
|
25G |
Farnley Junction |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5064 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5065 |
|
|
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5066 |
22B |
Gloucester Barnwood |
32A |
Inverness |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5067 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5068 |
|
|
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5069 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5070 |
|
|
1A |
Willesden |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5071 |
|
|
1A |
Willesden |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5072 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5073 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5074 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5075 |
|
|
25G |
Farnley Junction |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5076 |
|
|
25G |
Farnley Junction |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5077 |
|
|
25G |
Farnley Junction |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5078 |
|
|
25G |
Farnley Junction |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5079 |
|
|
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5080 |
|
|
25G |
Farnley Junction |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5081 |
|
|
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5082 |
|
|
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5083 |
|
|
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5084 |
|
|
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5085 |
|
|
29A |
Perth South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5086 |
|
|
29A |
Perth South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5087 |
|
|
29A |
Perth South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5088 |
|
|
17A |
Derby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5089 |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5090 |
19F |
|
32A |
Inverness |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5091 |
10B |
Preston |
10B |
Preston |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5092 |
|
|
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5093 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5094 |
|
|
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5095 |
|
|
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5096 |
|
|
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5097 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5098 |
|
|
32A |
Inverness |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5099 |
|
|
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5100 |
|
|
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5101 |
|
|
24A |
Accrington |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5102 |
|
|
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5103 |
|
|
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5104 |
|
|
26B |
Agecroft |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5105 |
|
|
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5106 |
|
|
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5107 |
|
|
24F |
Fleetwood |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5108 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5109 |
|
|
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5110 |
|
|
7C |
Holyhead |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5111 |
|
|
7C |
Holyhead |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5112 |
|
|
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5113 |
|
|
7C |
Holyhead |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5114 |
|
|
5D |
Stoke |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5115 |
|
|
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5116 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5117 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5118 |
|
|
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5119 |
|
|
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5120 |
|
|
28A |
Motherwell |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5121 |
|
|
28A |
Motherwell |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5122 |
|
|
32A |
Inverness |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5123 |
|
|
32A |
Inverness |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5124 |
|
|
32A |
Inverness |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5125 |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
29A |
Perth South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5126 |
|
|
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5127 |
|
|
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5128 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5129 |
|
|
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5130 |
|
|
2B |
Bletchley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5131 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5132 |
|
|
3D |
Aston |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5133 |
|
|
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5134 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5135 |
|
|
10C |
Patricroft |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5136 |
|
|
32A |
Inverness |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5137 |
|
|
10C |
Patricroft |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5138 |
32A |
Inverness |
32A |
Inverness |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5139 |
|
|
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5140 |
|
|
1A |
Willesden |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5141 |
|
|
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5142 |
|
|
10B |
Preston |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5143 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5144 |
|
|
3A |
Bescot |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5145 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5146 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5147 |
|
|
10C |
Patricroft |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5148 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5149 |
|
|
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5150 |
|
|
2C |
Northampton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5151 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5152 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5153 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5154 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5155 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5156 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5157 |
|
|
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5158 |
|
|
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5159 |
|
|
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5160 |
|
|
32A |
Inverness |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5161 |
|
|
29A |
Perth South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5162 |
|
|
29A |
Perth South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5163 |
|
|
29A |
Perth South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5164 |
|
|
29A |
Perth South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5165 |
|
|
29A |
Perth South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5166 |
|
|
29A |
Perth South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5167 |
|
|
29A |
Perth South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5168 |
|
|
30A |
Corkerhill |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5169 |
|
|
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5170 |
|
|
29A |
Perth South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5171 |
|
|
29A |
Perth South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5172 |
|
|
29A |
Perth South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5173 |
|
|
29A |
Perth South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5174 |
|
|
29A |
Perth South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5175 |
|
|
29A |
Perth South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5176 |
|
|
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5177 |
|
|
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5178 |
|
|
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5179 |
|
|
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5180 |
|
|
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5181 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5182 |
17A |
Derby |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5183 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5184 |
17A |
Derby |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5185 |
|
|
10B |
Preston |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5186 |
|
|
21A |
Saltley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5187 |
|
|
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5188 |
|
|
10C |
Patricroft |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5189 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5190 |
|
|
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5191 |
|
|
2C |
Northampton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5192 |
|
|
32A |
Inverness |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5193 |
|
|
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5194 |
|
|
30A |
Corkerhill |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5195 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5196 |
|
|
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5197 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5198 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5199 |
|
|
10C |
Patricroft |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5200 |
23A |
Bank Hall |
23C |
Southport |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5201 |
23A |
Bank Hall |
25F |
Low Moor |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5202 |
|
|
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5203 |
|
|
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5204 |
|
|
25A |
Wakefield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5205 |
|
|
25A |
Wakefield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5206 |
|
|
25A |
Wakefield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5207 |
|
|
25F |
Low Moor |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5208 |
|
|
25F |
Low Moor |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5209 |
|
|
25F |
Low Moor |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5210 |
|
|
25F |
Low Moor |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5211 |
|
|
25F |
Low Moor |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5212 |
|
|
24F |
Fleetwood |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5213 |
|
|
29A |
Perth South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5214 |
|
|
24F |
Fleetwood |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5215 |
23A |
Bank Hall |
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5216 |
23A |
Bank Hall |
23A |
Bank Hall |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5217 |
23A |
Bank Hall |
23A |
Bank Hall |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5218 |
23A |
Bank Hall |
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5219 |
|
|
26B |
Agecroft |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5220 |
|
|
26B |
Agecroft |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5221 |
|
|
25F |
Low Moor |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5222 |
|
|
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5223 |
|
|
26B |
Agecroft |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5224 |
|
|
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5225 |
|
|
23A |
Bank Hall |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5226 |
|
|
23A |
Bank Hall |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5227 |
|
|
23A |
Bank Hall |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5228 |
|
|
23A |
Bank Hall |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5229 |
|
|
23A |
Bank Hall |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5230 |
|
|
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5231 |
|
|
10C |
Patricroft |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5232 |
|
|
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5233 |
|
|
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5234 |
|
|
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5235 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5236 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5237 |
|
|
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5238 |
|
|
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5239 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5240 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5241 |
|
|
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5242 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5243 |
|
|
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5244 |
|
|
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5245 |
|
|
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5246 |
|
|
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5247 |
|
|
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5248 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5249 |
|
|
7C |
Holyhead |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5250 |
|
|
2A |
Rugby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5251 |
|
|
30A |
Corkerhill |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5252 |
|
|
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5253 |
|
|
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5254 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5255 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5256 |
|
|
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5257 |
|
|
5D |
Stoke |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5258 |
|
|
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5259 |
|
|
10C |
Patricroft |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5260 |
|
|
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5261 |
|
|
17A |
Derby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5262 |
|
|
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5263 |
|
|
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5264 |
|
|
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5265 |
|
|
21A |
Saltley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5266 |
|
|
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5267 |
|
|
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5268 |
|
|
21A |
Saltley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5269 |
|
|
21A |
Saltley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5270 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5271 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5272 |
|
|
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5273 |
|
|
21A |
Saltley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5274 |
|
|
21A |
Saltley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5275 |
|
|
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5276 |
|
|
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5277 |
|
|
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5278 |
14B |
Kentish Town |
5D |
Stoke |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5279 |
14B |
Kentish Town |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5280 |
14B |
Kentish Town |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5281 |
14B |
Kentish Town |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5282 |
16A |
Nottingham |
2C |
Northampton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5283 |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5284 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
19E |
Belle Vue |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5285 |
|
|
17A |
Derby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5286 |
|
|
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5287 |
|
|
3B |
Bushbury |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5288 |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5289 |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5290 |
2C |
Northampton |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5291 |
2A |
Rugby |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5292 |
4B |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5293 |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5294 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
9A |
Longsight |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5295 |
9A |
Longsight |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5296 |
9A |
Longsight |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5297 |
3E |
Monument Lane |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5298 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5299 |
5A |
Crewe North |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5300 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5301 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5302 |
|
|
10C |
Patricroft |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5303 |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5304 |
|
|
10C |
Patricroft |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5305 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5306 |
|
|
11A |
Carnforth |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5307 |
|
|
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5308 |
|
|
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5309 |
|
|
27A |
Polmadie |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5310 |
|
|
1A |
Willesden |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5311 |
|
|
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5312 |
|
|
10C |
Patricroft |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5313 |
|
|
7C |
Holyhead |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5314 |
|
|
2B |
Bletchley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5315 |
|
|
10C |
Patricroft |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5316 |
|
|
2B |
Bletchley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5317 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5318 |
|
|
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5319 |
|
|
32A |
Inverness |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5320 |
|
|
32A |
Inverness |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5321 |
|
|
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5322 |
|
|
3A |
Bescot |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5323 |
|
|
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5324 |
|
|
5D |
Stoke |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5325 |
|
|
5D |
Stoke |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5326 |
|
|
5D |
Stoke |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5327 |
|
|
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5328 |
|
|
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5329 |
|
|
10C |
Patricroft |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5330 |
|
|
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5331 |
|
|
2B |
Bletchley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5332 |
|
|
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5333 |
11A |
Carnforth |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5334 |
|
|
23C |
Southport |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5335 |
|
|
23A |
Bank Hall |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5336 |
|
|
23A |
Bank Hall |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5337 |
|
|
26B |
Agecroft |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5338 |
|
|
26B |
Agecroft |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5339 |
|
|
25A |
Wakefield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5340 |
|
|
25G |
Farnley Junction |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5341 |
|
|
25G |
Farnley Junction |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5342 |
|
|
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5343 |
11A |
Carnforth |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5344 |
|
|
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5345 |
|
|
10B |
Preston |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5346 |
|
|
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5347 |
|
|
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5348 |
|
|
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5349 |
|
|
3D |
Aston |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5350 |
|
|
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5351 |
|
|
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5352 |
|
|
5D |
Stoke |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5353 |
|
|
1A |
Willesden |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5354 |
|
|
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5355 |
|
|
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5356 |
|
|
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5357 |
|
|
29A |
Perth South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5358 |
|
|
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5359 |
|
|
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5360 |
|
|
32A |
Inverness |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5361 |
|
|
32A |
Inverness |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5362 |
|
|
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5363 |
|
|
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5364 |
|
|
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5365 |
|
|
29A |
Perth South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5366 |
|
|
29A |
Perth South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5367 |
|
|
24A |
Accrington |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5368 |
|
|
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5369 |
|
|
5A |
Crewe North |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5370 |
|
|
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5371 |
|
|
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5372 |
|
|
2A |
Rugby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5373 |
|
|
10B |
Preston |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5374 |
|
|
5A |
Crewe North |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5375 |
|
|
2A |
Rugby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5376 |
|
|
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5377 |
|
|
10C |
Patricroft |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5378 |
|
|
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5379 |
|
|
2A |
Rugby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5380 |
|
|
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5381 |
|
|
5D |
Stoke |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5382 |
|
|
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5383 |
|
|
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5384 |
|
|
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5385 |
|
|
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5386 |
|
|
10C |
Patricroft |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5387 |
|
|
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5388 |
|
|
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5389 |
|
|
29A |
Perth South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5390 |
|
|
3D |
Aston |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5391 |
|
|
2A |
Rugby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5392 |
11A |
Carnforth |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5393 |
|
|
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5394 |
|
|
2A |
Rugby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5395 |
|
|
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5396 |
|
|
24A |
Accrington |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5397 |
|
|
3D |
Aston |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5398 |
|
|
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5399 |
|
|
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5400 |
|
|
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5401 |
|
|
10C |
Patricroft |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5402 |
|
|
10C |
Patricroft |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5403 |
|
|
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5404 |
|
|
2A |
Rugby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5405 |
|
|
3B |
Bushbury |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5406 |
|
|
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5407 |
|
|
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5408 |
|
|
10C |
Patricroft |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5409 |
|
|
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5410 |
|
|
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5411 |
|
|
10C |
Patricroft |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5412 |
|
|
5A |
Crewe North |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5413 |
|
|
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5414 |
|
|
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5415 |
|
|
23C |
Southport |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5416 |
|
|
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5417 |
|
|
3A |
Bescot |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5418 |
|
|
3A |
Bescot |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5419 |
|
|
2A |
Rugby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5420 |
|
|
10C |
Patricroft |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5421 |
|
|
10C |
Patricroft |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5422 |
|
|
5A |
Crewe North |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5423 |
|
|
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5424 |
|
|
10C |
Patricroft |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5425 |
|
|
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5426 |
|
|
10C |
Patricroft |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5427 |
|
|
11A |
Carnforth |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5428 |
|
|
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5429 |
|
|
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5430 |
|
|
2A |
Rugby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5431 |
|
|
1A |
Willesden |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5432 |
|
|
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5433 |
3E |
Monument Lane |
3A |
Bescot |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5434 |
3E |
Monument Lane |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5435 |
|
|
23C |
Southport |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5436 |
|
|
5A |
Crewe North |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5437 |
|
|
3B |
Bushbury |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5438 |
|
|
10C |
Patricroft |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5439 |
|
|
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5440 |
|
|
22C |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5441 |
|
|
2A |
Rugby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5442 |
|
|
10C |
Patricroft |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5443 |
|
|
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5444 |
|
|
10C |
Patricroft |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5445 |
|
|
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5446 |
|
|
3D |
Aston |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5447 |
|
|
21A |
Saltley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5448 |
|
|
2A |
Rugby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5449 |
|
|
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5450 |
|
|
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5451 |
|
|
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5452 |
|
|
29A |
Perth South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5453 |
|
|
28A |
Motherwell |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5454 |
|
|
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5455 |
|
|
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5456 |
|
|
29A |
Perth South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5457 |
|
|
29A |
Perth South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5458 |
|
|
29A |
Perth South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5459 |
|
|
29A |
Perth South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5460 |
|
|
29A |
Perth South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5461 |
28A |
Motherwell |
28A |
Motherwell |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5462 |
28A |
Motherwell |
28A |
Motherwell |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5463 |
|
|
29A |
Perth South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5464 |
|
|
29A |
Perth South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5465 |
|
|
29A |
Perth South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5466 |
|
|
29A |
Perth South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5467 |
|
|
29A |
Perth South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5468 |
|
|
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5469 |
|
|
29A |
Perth South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5470 |
|
|
29A |
Perth South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5471 |
|
|
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5472 |
|
|
29A |
Perth South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5473 |
|
|
29A |
Perth South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5474 |
|
|
29A |
Perth South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5475 |
|
|
29A |
Perth South |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5476 |
|
|
32A |
Inverness |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5477 |
|
|
32A |
Inverness |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5478 |
|
|
32A |
Inverness |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5479 |
|
|
32A |
Inverness |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5480 |
|
|
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5481 |
|
|
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5482 |
|
|
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5483 |
|
|
28A |
Motherwell |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5484 |
|
|
27A |
Polmadie |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5485 |
|
|
27A |
Polmadie |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5486 |
|
|
27A |
Polmadie |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5487 |
|
|
27A |
Polmadie |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5488 |
|
|
28A |
Motherwell |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5489 |
|
|
30A |
Corkerhill |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5490 |
|
|
30A |
Corkerhill |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5491 |
|
|
30A |
Corkerhill |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5492 |
|
|
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5493 |
|
|
5A |
Crewe North |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5494 |
|
|
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5495 |
|
|
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5496 |
|
|
28A |
Motherwell |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5497 |
|
|
28A |
Motherwell |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5498 |
|
|
28A |
Motherwell |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5499 |
|
|
28A |
Motherwell |
|
03/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4816 |
14B |
Kentish Town |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
03/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4907 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
03/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4942 |
3A |
Bescot |
3A |
Bescot |
|
17/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4812 |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
17/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4847 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
21A |
Saltley |
|
17/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4848 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
21A |
Saltley |
|
17/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4909 |
2A |
Rugby |
2A |
Rugby |
|
17/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5495 |
3E |
Monument Lane |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
24/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5054 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
24/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5298 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
31/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4758 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
31/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4759 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
31/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4760 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
31/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4761 |
29A |
Perth South |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
31/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4762 |
29A |
Perth South |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
31/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4763 |
32A |
Inverness |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
31/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4764 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
31/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4768 |
29A |
Perth South |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
31/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4769 |
29A |
Perth South |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
31/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4770 |
29A |
Perth South |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
31/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4771 |
32A |
Inverness |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
31/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4772 |
32A |
Inverness |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
31/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4773 |
32A |
Inverness |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
31/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4783 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
32A |
Inverness |
|
31/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4784 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
32A |
Inverness |
|
31/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4785 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
32A |
Inverness |
|
31/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4931 |
28B |
Dalry Road |
28B |
Dalry Road |
|
31/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4953 |
28C |
Carstairs |
28C |
Carstairs |
|
31/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4955 |
28C |
Carstairs |
28C |
Carstairs |
|
31/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4997 |
2A |
Rugby |
29A |
Perth South |
|
31/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4998 |
2A |
Rugby |
29A |
Perth South |
|
31/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4999 |
2A |
Rugby |
29A |
Perth South |
|
31/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5007 |
28A |
Motherwell |
29A |
Perth South |
|
31/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5496 |
28A |
Motherwell |
28A |
Motherwell |
|
31/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5497 |
28A |
Motherwell |
28A |
Motherwell |
|
31/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5498 |
28A |
Motherwell |
28A |
Motherwell |
|
31/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
5499 |
28A |
Motherwell |
28A |
Motherwell |
|
07/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
4802 |
19E |
Belle Vue |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
07/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
4921 |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
19E |
Belle Vue |
|
07/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
4978 |
27A |
Polmadie |
29A |
Perth South |
|
07/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
4979 |
27A |
Polmadie |
29A |
Perth South |
|
07/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
4980 |
27A |
Polmadie |
29A |
Perth South |
|
14/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
4971 |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
14/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
4986 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
|
14/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
5046 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
|
14/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
5054 |
5A |
Crewe North |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
|
21/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
5112 |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
21/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
5292 |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
|
21/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
5294 |
9A |
Longsight |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
28/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
4806 |
21A |
Saltley |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
28/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
4829 |
18A |
Toton |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
28/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
4954 |
5A |
Crewe North |
28C |
Carstairs |
|
28/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
4971 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
28/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
5298 |
5A |
Crewe North |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
28/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
5387 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
3D |
Aston |
|
28/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
5492 |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
28B |
Dalry Road |
|
13/03/1948 |
Reallocation |
5025 |
2B |
Bletchley |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
10/04/1948 |
Reallocation |
4781 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
26B |
Agecroft |
|
10/04/1948 |
Reallocation |
4782 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
26B |
Agecroft |
|
10/04/1948 |
Reallocation |
4870 |
9A |
Longsight |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
10/04/1948 |
Reallocation |
5223 |
26B |
Agecroft |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
17/04/1948 |
Reallocation |
4776 |
14B |
Kentish Town |
21A |
Saltley |
|
24/04/1948 |
Reallocation |
5070 |
1A |
Willesden |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
24/04/1948 |
Reallocation |
5132 |
3D |
Aston |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
24/04/1948 |
Reallocation |
5387 |
3D |
Aston |
9A |
Longsight |
|
01/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
5028 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
01/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
5072 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
01/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
5291 |
11A |
Carnforth |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
|
01/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
5495 |
11A |
Carnforth |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
08/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
4749 |
|
|
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
08/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
4780 |
25A |
Wakefield |
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
|
08/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
4911 |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
7C |
Holyhead |
|
08/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
4949 |
25A |
Wakefield |
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
|
08/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
5052 |
2A |
Rugby |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
08/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
5070 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
08/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
5094 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
15/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
4946 |
23A |
Bank Hall |
25F |
Low Moor |
|
15/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
4948 |
24F |
Fleetwood |
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
|
15/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
4982 |
23A |
Bank Hall |
25F |
Low Moor |
|
15/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
5062 |
25F |
Low Moor |
23A |
Bank Hall |
|
15/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
5099 |
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
24F |
Fleetwood |
|
15/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
5209 |
25F |
Low Moor |
23A |
Bank Hall |
|
29/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
5088 |
17A |
Derby |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
|
29/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
5497 |
28A |
Motherwell |
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
29/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
5498 |
28A |
Motherwell |
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
29/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
5499 |
28A |
Motherwell |
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
05/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
4801 |
5A |
Crewe North |
29A |
Perth South |
|
05/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
4823 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
26B |
Agecroft |
|
05/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
4824 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
25A |
Wakefield |
|
05/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
4835 |
5A |
Crewe North |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
05/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
4836 |
5A |
Crewe North |
2A |
Rugby |
|
05/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
4840 |
21A |
Saltley |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
|
05/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
4862 |
5A |
Crewe North |
1A |
Willesden |
|
05/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
4952 |
5A |
Crewe North |
28C |
Carstairs |
|
05/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
4967 |
5A |
Crewe North |
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
05/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
4968 |
2B |
Bletchley |
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
05/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
4969 |
9A |
Longsight |
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
05/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
4970 |
9A |
Longsight |
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
05/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
45045 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
|
05/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
5048 |
5B |
Crewe South |
1A |
Willesden |
|
05/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
45052 |
5B |
Crewe South |
3D |
Aston |
|
05/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
5064 |
5B |
Crewe South |
1A |
Willesden |
|
05/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
45069 |
5B |
Crewe South |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
|
05/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
5094 |
5B |
Crewe South |
3D |
Aston |
|
05/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
45253 |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
05/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
45261 |
17A |
Derby |
25A |
Wakefield |
|
05/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
45378 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
05/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
5495 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
7C |
Holyhead |
|
12/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
44755 |
|
|
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
12/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
5143 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5C |
Stafford |
|
12/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
5161 |
29A |
Perth South |
32A |
Inverness |
|
12/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
45260 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
17A |
Derby |
|
12/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
45282 |
2C |
Northampton |
2A |
Rugby |
|
19/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
4968 |
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
30A |
Corkerhill |
|
19/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
4969 |
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
30A |
Corkerhill |
|
19/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
45260 |
17A |
Derby |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
19/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
5412 |
5A |
Crewe North |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
19/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
5496 |
28A |
Motherwell |
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
26/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
44740 |
|
|
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
|
26/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
45045 |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
26/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
5418 |
3A |
Bescot |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
03/07/1948 |
Reallocation |
5161 |
32A |
Inverness |
29A |
Perth South |
|
03/07/1948 |
Reallocation |
5468 |
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
31D |
Grangemouth |
|
10/07/1948 |
To Service |
44699 |
|
NEW |
29A |
Perth South |
|
10/07/1948 |
Reallocation |
4829 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
10/07/1948 |
Reallocation |
4860 |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
10/07/1948 |
Reallocation |
45303 |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
17/07/1948 |
Reallocation |
4942 |
3A |
Bescot |
3D |
Aston |
|
17/07/1948 |
Reallocation |
5143 |
5C |
Stafford |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
17/07/1948 |
Reallocation |
5145 |
5B |
Crewe South |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
17/07/1948 |
Reallocation |
5183 |
5B |
Crewe South |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
24/07/1948 |
Reallocation |
45402 |
10C |
Patricroft |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
31/07/1948 |
To Service |
44700 |
|
NEW |
29A |
Perth South |
|
07/08/1948 |
To Service |
44701 |
|
NEW |
29A |
Perth South |
|
07/08/1948 |
To Service |
44746 |
|
NEW |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
14/08/1948 |
Reallocation |
4786 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
14/08/1948 |
Reallocation |
4787 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
27A |
Polmadie |
|
14/08/1948 |
Reallocation |
4788 |
5A |
Crewe North |
32A |
Inverness |
|
14/08/1948 |
Reallocation |
4789 |
5A |
Crewe North |
32A |
Inverness |
|
14/08/1948 |
Reallocation |
4790 |
5A |
Crewe North |
27A |
Polmadie |
|
14/08/1948 |
Reallocation |
5043 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
25F |
Low Moor |
|
14/08/1948 |
Reallocation |
5496 |
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
28A |
Motherwell |
|
14/08/1948 |
Reallocation |
5497 |
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
28A |
Motherwell |
|
14/08/1948 |
Reallocation |
5498 |
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
28A |
Motherwell |
|
21/08/1948 |
To Service |
44702 |
|
NEW |
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
21/08/1948 |
Reallocation |
5070 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
28/08/1948 |
To Service |
44703 |
|
NEW |
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
18/09/1948 |
Reallocation |
45260 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
|
02/10/1948 |
Reallocation |
44700 |
|
|
28C |
Carstairs |
|
02/10/1948 |
Reallocation |
44701 |
|
|
28C |
Carstairs |
|
02/10/1948 |
Reallocation |
44704 |
|
|
29A |
Perth South |
|
02/10/1948 |
Reallocation |
44705 |
|
|
29A |
Perth South |
|
02/10/1948 |
Reallocation |
4776 |
21A |
Saltley |
17A |
Derby |
|
02/10/1948 |
Reallocation |
4840 |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
02/10/1948 |
Reallocation |
4847 |
21A |
Saltley |
17A |
Derby |
|
02/10/1948 |
Reallocation |
4848 |
21A |
Saltley |
17A |
Derby |
|
02/10/1948 |
Reallocation |
4862 |
1A |
Willesden |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
02/10/1948 |
Reallocation |
4871 |
9A |
Longsight |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
02/10/1948 |
Reallocation |
4937 |
9A |
Longsight |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
02/10/1948 |
Reallocation |
45069 |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
02/10/1948 |
Reallocation |
5077 |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
02/10/1948 |
Reallocation |
5310 |
1A |
Willesden |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
02/10/1948 |
Reallocation |
45385 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
16/10/1948 |
Reallocation |
4937 |
5B |
Crewe South |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
|
23/10/1948 |
Reallocation |
5025 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
23/10/1948 |
Reallocation |
5030 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
23/10/1948 |
Reallocation |
5048 |
1A |
Willesden |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
23/10/1948 |
Reallocation |
5129 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
30/10/1948 |
Reallocation |
4937 |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
9A |
Longsight |
|
30/10/1948 |
Reallocation |
5209 |
23A |
Bank Hall |
23C |
Southport |
|
06/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
44833 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
06/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
4969 |
30A |
Corkerhill |
28A |
Motherwell |
|
06/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
45065 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
06/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
5176 |
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
28A |
Motherwell |
|
06/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
45179 |
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
28A |
Motherwell |
|
06/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
5187 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
2A |
Rugby |
|
06/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
45276 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
06/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
45289 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
06/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
45358 |
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
31B |
Stirling |
|
06/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
45359 |
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
31B |
Stirling |
|
06/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
45422 |
5A |
Crewe North |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
06/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
45436 |
5A |
Crewe North |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
13/11/1948 |
To Service |
44714 |
|
NEW |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
13/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
44829 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
13/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
44832 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
13/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
45289 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5A |
Bletchley |
|
13/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
45307 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
9A |
Longsight |
|
20/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
44834 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
20/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
44837 |
5A |
Crewe North |
9A |
Longsight |
|
20/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
44838 |
5A |
Crewe North |
9A |
Longsight |
|
20/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
45185 |
10B |
Preston |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
27/11/1948 |
To Service |
44716 |
|
NEW |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
27/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
45181 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
27/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
45236 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
27/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
45242 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
27/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
45248 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
27/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
45276 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
27/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
5294 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
27/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
45303 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
27/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
5369 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
27/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
5374 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
27/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
5493 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
04/12/1948 |
To Service |
44717 |
|
NEW |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
11/12/1948 |
Reallocation |
44834 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
11/12/1948 |
Reallocation |
44837 |
9A |
Longsight |
9A |
Longsight |
|
11/12/1948 |
Reallocation |
44838 |
9A |
Longsight |
9A |
Longsight |
|
11/12/1948 |
Reallocation |
5025 |
5B |
Crewe South |
1A |
Willesden |
|
11/12/1948 |
Reallocation |
45026 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
11/12/1948 |
Reallocation |
5042 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
|
11/12/1948 |
Reallocation |
45097 |
5B |
Crewe South |
1A |
Willesden |
|
11/12/1948 |
Reallocation |
45181 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
11/12/1948 |
Reallocation |
45185 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
11/12/1948 |
Reallocation |
5198 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
11/12/1948 |
Reallocation |
45236 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
11/12/1948 |
Reallocation |
45242 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
11/12/1948 |
Reallocation |
45248 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
11/12/1948 |
Reallocation |
45276 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
11/12/1948 |
Reallocation |
45289 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
11/12/1948 |
Reallocation |
5294 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
11/12/1948 |
Reallocation |
5301 |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
11/12/1948 |
Reallocation |
45303 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
11/12/1948 |
Reallocation |
5369 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
11/12/1948 |
Reallocation |
5374 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
11/12/1948 |
Reallocation |
5379 |
2A |
Rugby |
2C |
Northampton |
|
11/12/1948 |
Reallocation |
45403 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
11/12/1948 |
Reallocation |
5493 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
18/12/1948 |
Reallocation |
5025 |
1A |
Willesden |
1A |
Willesden |
|
18/12/1948 |
Reallocation |
45026 |
10C |
Patricroft |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
18/12/1948 |
Reallocation |
45097 |
1A |
Willesden |
1A |
Willesden |
|
25/12/1948 |
Reallocation |
4905 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
25/12/1948 |
Reallocation |
44906 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
25/12/1948 |
Reallocation |
45045 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
01/01/1949 |
Reallocation |
5209 |
23C |
Southport |
25A |
Wakefield |
|
08/01/1949 |
Reallocation |
45045 |
5A |
Crewe North |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
15/01/1949 |
Reallocation |
44962 |
17A |
Derby |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
15/01/1949 |
Reallocation |
44971 |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
|
15/01/1949 |
Reallocation |
5088 |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
15/01/1949 |
Reallocation |
45285 |
17A |
Derby |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
12/02/1949 |
Reallocation |
45294 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
12/02/1949 |
Reallocation |
45303 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
12/02/1949 |
Reallocation |
5369 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
12/02/1949 |
Reallocation |
5374 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
19/02/1949 |
Reallocation |
44908 |
5A |
Crewe North |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
19/02/1949 |
Reallocation |
45327 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
10B |
Preston |
|
26/02/1949 |
Reallocation |
45305 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
05/03/1949 |
Reallocation |
45068 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
23A |
Bank Hall |
|
05/03/1949 |
Reallocation |
45092 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
05/03/1949 |
Reallocation |
5369 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
12/03/1949 |
Reallocation |
44708 |
|
|
7C |
Holyhead |
|
19/03/1949 |
Reallocation |
44817 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
19/03/1949 |
Reallocation |
44981 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
19/03/1949 |
Reallocation |
45264 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
19/03/1949 |
Reallocation |
45277 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
26/03/1949 |
Reallocation |
44708 |
7C |
Holyhead |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
26/03/1949 |
Reallocation |
44844 |
5B |
Crewe South |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
26/03/1949 |
Reallocation |
45294 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
26/03/1949 |
Reallocation |
5374 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
26/03/1949 |
Reallocation |
45410 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
23/04/1949 |
Reallocation |
5445 |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
30/04/1949 |
Reallocation |
45005 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
30/04/1949 |
Reallocation |
45013 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
30/04/1949 |
Reallocation |
45014 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
14/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
44971 |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
14/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
45264 |
14B |
Kentish Town |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
|
28/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
44709 |
|
|
11A |
Carnforth |
|
28/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
44811 |
21A |
Saltley |
21B |
Bournville |
|
28/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
44833 |
5B |
Crewe South |
1A |
Willesden |
|
28/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
4852 |
21A |
Saltley |
21B |
Bournville |
|
28/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
44864 |
5A |
Crewe North |
7C |
Holyhead |
|
28/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
44865 |
5A |
Crewe North |
7C |
Holyhead |
|
28/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
44874 |
5A |
Crewe North |
2B |
Bletchley |
|
28/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
44875 |
5A |
Crewe North |
2B |
Bletchley |
|
28/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
44904 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
28/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
4905 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
|
28/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
44911 |
7C |
Holyhead |
1A |
Willesden |
|
28/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
44935 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
9A |
Longsight |
|
28/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
45015 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
28/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
45017 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
28/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
45041 |
5B |
Crewe South |
1A |
Willesden |
|
28/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
45045 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
28/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
45069 |
3B |
Bushbury |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
28/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
45070 |
5A |
Crewe North |
7C |
Holyhead |
|
28/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
45089 |
5B |
Crewe South |
1A |
Willesden |
|
28/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
45095 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
|
28/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
5142 |
10B |
Preston |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
28/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
45146 |
5B |
Crewe South |
1A |
Willesden |
|
28/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
45236 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
|
28/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
45241 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
28/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
45255 |
5B |
Crewe South |
7C |
Holyhead |
|
28/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
45274 |
21A |
Saltley |
21B |
Bournville |
|
28/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
45327 |
10B |
Preston |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
28/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
45345 |
10B |
Preston |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
28/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
45373 |
10B |
Preston |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
28/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
45404 |
2A |
Rugby |
2B |
Bletchley |
|
28/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
45429 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
28/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
5445 |
5A |
Crewe North |
9A |
Longsight |
|
28/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
45454 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
04/06/1949 |
Reallocation |
44868 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
04/06/1949 |
Reallocation |
5450 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
19E |
Belle Vue |
|
11/06/1949 |
Reallocation |
44971 |
14B |
Kentish Town |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
|
18/06/1949 |
To Service |
44663 |
|
NEW |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
18/06/1949 |
Reallocation |
44839 |
17A |
Derby |
22C |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
|
25/06/1949 |
Reallocation |
4913 |
3A |
Bescot |
7B |
Bangor |
|
25/06/1949 |
Reallocation |
45006 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
25/06/1949 |
Reallocation |
45087 |
29A |
Perth South |
60A |
Inverness |
|
25/06/1949 |
Reallocation |
45096 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
25/06/1949 |
Reallocation |
5144 |
3A |
Bescot |
7B |
Bangor |
|
25/06/1949 |
Reallocation |
45161 |
29A |
Perth South |
60A |
Inverness |
|
25/06/1949 |
Reallocation |
45417 |
3A |
Bescot |
7B |
Bangor |
|
02/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
45263 |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
02/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
45429 |
5A |
Crewe North |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
09/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
44743 |
|
|
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
09/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
44744 |
|
|
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
09/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
44745 |
|
|
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
09/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
44746 |
|
|
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
09/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
44747 |
|
|
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
09/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
44804 |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
09/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
44843 |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
09/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
44962 |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
09/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
45272 |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
09/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
45285 |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
09/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
45333 |
11A |
Carnforth |
10B |
Preston |
|
09/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
5493 |
5B |
Crewe South |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
16/07/1949 |
To Service |
44664 |
|
NEW |
18A |
Toton |
|
16/07/1949 |
To Service |
44665 |
|
NEW |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
16/07/1949 |
To Service |
44666 |
|
NEW |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
16/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
44714 |
|
|
5A |
Crewe North |
|
16/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
44743 |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
16/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
44744 |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
16/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
44745 |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
16/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
44746 |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
16/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
44747 |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
16/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
44804 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
16/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
44839 |
22C |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
22C |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
|
16/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
44843 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
16/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
4913 |
7B |
Bangor |
7B |
Bangor |
|
16/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
44962 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
16/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
45087 |
60A |
Inverness |
60A |
Inverness |
|
16/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
5144 |
7B |
Bangor |
7B |
Bangor |
|
16/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
45161 |
60A |
Inverness |
60A |
Inverness |
|
16/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
45263 |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
16/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
45272 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
16/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
45333 |
10B |
Preston |
10B |
Preston |
|
16/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
45417 |
7B |
Bangor |
7B |
Bangor |
|
16/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
45429 |
3E |
Monument Lane |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
16/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
5493 |
3E |
Monument Lane |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
13/08/1949 |
Reallocation |
44962 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
|
20/08/1949 |
Reallocation |
44664 |
18A |
Toton |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
|
20/08/1949 |
Reallocation |
44665 |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
|
20/08/1949 |
Reallocation |
44708 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
10B |
Preston |
|
20/08/1949 |
Reallocation |
45333 |
10B |
Preston |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
27/08/1949 |
Reallocation |
4915 |
2C |
Northampton |
2A |
Rugby |
|
27/08/1949 |
Reallocation |
45150 |
2C |
Northampton |
2A |
Rugby |
|
03/09/1949 |
Reallocation |
44907 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
03/09/1949 |
Reallocation |
45243 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
01/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
44791 |
28A |
Motherwell |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
01/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
4792 |
28A |
Motherwell |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
01/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
45006 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
45013 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
45014 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
45015 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
45056 |
22C |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
01/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
45069 |
3E |
Monument Lane |
3A |
Bescot |
|
01/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
45086 |
29A |
Perth South |
61B |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
|
01/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
45096 |
5A |
Crewe North |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
|
01/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
45127 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
61B |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
|
01/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
45255 |
7C |
Holyhead |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
01/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
5310 |
3E |
Monument Lane |
3A |
Bescot |
|
01/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
45313 |
7C |
Holyhead |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
01/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
45387 |
9A |
Longsight |
10B |
Preston |
|
01/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
45404 |
2B |
Bletchley |
2A |
Rugby |
|
01/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
45429 |
3B |
Bushbury |
2A |
Rugby |
|
01/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
45431 |
1A |
Willesden |
2A |
Rugby |
|
01/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
5445 |
9A |
Longsight |
10B |
Preston |
|
01/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
45454 |
5A |
Crewe North |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
|
01/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
5493 |
3B |
Bushbury |
2A |
Rugby |
|
01/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
45495 |
7C |
Holyhead |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
08/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
44808 |
5A |
Crewe North |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
|
08/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
45014 |
5B |
Crewe South |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
|
22/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
45087 |
60A |
Inverness |
64D |
Carstairs |
|
22/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
45117 |
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
64D |
Carstairs |
|
22/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
45161 |
60A |
Inverness |
64D |
Carstairs |
|
22/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
45362 |
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
64D |
Carstairs |
|
05/11/1949 |
Reallocation |
45021 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
2C |
Northampton |
|
05/11/1949 |
Reallocation |
45091 |
10B |
Preston |
2C |
Northampton |
|
05/11/1949 |
Reallocation |
5445 |
10B |
Preston |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
12/11/1949 |
Reallocation |
44666 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
21A |
Saltley |
|
12/11/1949 |
Reallocation |
44804 |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
21A |
Saltley |
|
12/11/1949 |
Reallocation |
45088 |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
12/11/1949 |
Reallocation |
45263 |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
26/11/1949 |
Reallocation |
45393 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
03/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
44808 |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
7C |
Holyhead |
|
10/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
5018 |
28A |
Motherwell |
60A |
Inverness |
|
10/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
45120 |
28A |
Motherwell |
60A |
Inverness |
|
10/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
45179 |
28A |
Motherwell |
60A |
Inverness |
|
17/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
44662 |
|
|
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
17/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
45340 |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
|
24/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
44808 |
7C |
Holyhead |
7C |
Holyhead |
|
24/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
44860 |
5A |
Crewe North |
1A |
Willesden |
|
24/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
44863 |
5A |
Crewe North |
1A |
Willesden |
|
24/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
45393 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
07/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
44862 |
5A |
Crewe North |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
|
07/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
44917 |
14B |
Kentish Town |
17A |
Derby |
|
07/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
5374 |
5B |
Crewe South |
2A |
Rugby |
|
14/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
44662 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
14/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
44860 |
1A |
Willesden |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
14/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
44862 |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
|
14/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
44863 |
1A |
Willesden |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
14/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
44917 |
17A |
Derby |
17A |
Derby |
|
14/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
44971 |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
9A |
Longsight |
|
14/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
45285 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
14/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
45340 |
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
|
14/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
45367 |
24A |
Accrington |
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
|
14/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
5374 |
2A |
Rugby |
2A |
Rugby |
|
14/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
45495 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
21/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
45285 |
14B |
Kentish Town |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
21/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
45495 |
10C |
Patricroft |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
28/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
44874 |
2B |
Bletchley |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
04/02/1950 |
Reallocation |
45009 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
11/02/1950 |
Reallocation |
44931 |
28B |
Dalry Road |
63A |
Perth South |
|
11/02/1950 |
Reallocation |
45007 |
29A |
Perth South |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
11/02/1950 |
Reallocation |
45010 |
29A |
Perth South |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
11/02/1950 |
Reallocation |
45011 |
29A |
Perth South |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
11/02/1950 |
Reallocation |
45036 |
29A |
Perth South |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
11/02/1950 |
Reallocation |
45085 |
29A |
Perth South |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
11/02/1950 |
Reallocation |
45328 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
11/02/1950 |
Reallocation |
45483 |
28A |
Motherwell |
63A |
Perth South |
|
11/02/1950 |
Reallocation |
45496 |
28A |
Motherwell |
63A |
Perth South |
|
25/02/1950 |
Reallocation |
45460 |
29A |
Perth South |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
04/03/1950 |
Reallocation |
45151 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
04/03/1950 |
Reallocation |
45152 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
04/03/1950 |
Reallocation |
45443 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
11/03/1950 |
Reallocation |
45303 |
5A |
Crewe North |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
18/03/1950 |
Reallocation |
45460 |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
63A |
Perth South |
|
01/04/1950 |
Reallocation |
45163 |
29A |
Perth South |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
01/04/1950 |
Reallocation |
45174 |
29A |
Perth South |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
18/04/1950 |
Reallocation |
45018 |
60A |
Inverness |
60B |
Aviemore |
|
24/04/1950 |
Reallocation |
45482 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
29/04/1950 |
Reallocation |
44710 |
|
|
2A |
Rugby |
|
29/04/1950 |
Reallocation |
44711 |
|
|
2A |
Rugby |
|
29/04/1950 |
Reallocation |
44712 |
|
|
2A |
Rugby |
|
29/04/1950 |
Reallocation |
44713 |
|
|
2A |
Rugby |
|
29/04/1950 |
Reallocation |
44714 |
5A |
Crewe North |
2A |
Rugby |
|
29/04/1950 |
Reallocation |
44715 |
|
|
2A |
Rugby |
|
29/04/1950 |
Reallocation |
44716 |
5A |
Crewe North |
2A |
Rugby |
|
29/04/1950 |
Reallocation |
44768 |
5A |
Crewe North |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
29/04/1950 |
Reallocation |
44769 |
5A |
Crewe North |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
29/04/1950 |
Reallocation |
44772 |
5A |
Crewe North |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
29/04/1950 |
Reallocation |
44773 |
5A |
Crewe North |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
29/04/1950 |
Reallocation |
44807 |
5A |
Crewe North |
9A |
Longsight |
|
29/04/1950 |
Reallocation |
44860 |
5A |
Crewe North |
2A |
Rugby |
|
29/04/1950 |
Reallocation |
44862 |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
2A |
Rugby |
|
29/04/1950 |
Reallocation |
44863 |
5A |
Crewe North |
2A |
Rugby |
|
29/04/1950 |
Reallocation |
44870 |
5A |
Crewe North |
2A |
Rugby |
|
29/04/1950 |
Reallocation |
44874 |
5A |
Crewe North |
10B |
Preston |
|
29/04/1950 |
Reallocation |
45028 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
7C |
Holyhead |
|
29/04/1950 |
Reallocation |
45062 |
23A |
Bank Hall |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
|
29/04/1950 |
Reallocation |
45092 |
5A |
Crewe North |
2A |
Rugby |
|
13/05/1950 |
Reallocation |
44915 |
2A |
Rugby |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
13/05/1950 |
Reallocation |
44951 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
25F |
Low Moor |
|
13/05/1950 |
Reallocation |
44990 |
23A |
Bank Hall |
25F |
Low Moor |
|
13/05/1950 |
Reallocation |
45210 |
25F |
Low Moor |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
13/05/1950 |
Reallocation |
45211 |
25F |
Low Moor |
27A |
Polmadie |
|
13/05/1950 |
Reallocation |
45235 |
5B |
Crewe South |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
10/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
44829 |
5B |
Crewe South |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
10/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
44875 |
2B |
Bletchley |
1A |
Willesden |
|
10/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
44892 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
10B |
Preston |
|
10/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
45015 |
5B |
Crewe South |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
10/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
45043 |
25F |
Low Moor |
28A |
Blackpool Central |
|
10/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
45069 |
3A |
Bescot |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
|
10/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
5104 |
26B |
Agecroft |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
10/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
45107 |
24F |
Fleetwood |
28A |
Blackpool Central |
|
10/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
45214 |
24F |
Fleetwood |
28A |
Blackpool Central |
|
10/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
45218 |
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
|
10/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
45220 |
26B |
Agecroft |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
10/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
45331 |
2B |
Bletchley |
4B |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
10/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
45346 |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
7C |
Holyhead |
|
10/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
45351 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
10/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
45382 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
7C |
Holyhead |
|
10/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
45390 |
3D |
Aston |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
10/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
45448 |
2A |
Rugby |
3D |
Aston |
|
17/06/1950 |
To Service |
44681 |
|
NEW |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
17/06/1950 |
To Service |
44682 |
|
NEW |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
17/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
44759 |
5A |
Crewe North |
9A |
Longsight |
|
17/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
44760 |
5A |
Crewe North |
9A |
Longsight |
|
17/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
44814 |
21A |
Saltley |
21A |
Saltley |
|
17/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
44829 |
3E |
Monument Lane |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
17/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
44855 |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
91S |
To Southern Region |
|
17/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
44875 |
1A |
Willesden |
1A |
Willesden |
|
17/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
44892 |
10B |
Preston |
10B |
Preston |
|
17/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
44915 |
11A |
Carnforth |
2A |
Rugby |
|
17/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
44938 |
9A |
Longsight |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
17/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
44971 |
9A |
Longsight |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
17/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
45012 |
28A |
Motherwell |
60A |
Inverness |
|
17/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
45015 |
3E |
Monument Lane |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
17/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
45043 |
28A |
Blackpool Central |
28A |
Blackpool Central |
|
17/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
45069 |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
|
17/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
5104 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
17/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
45107 |
28A |
Blackpool Central |
28A |
Blackpool Central |
|
17/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
45214 |
28A |
Blackpool Central |
28A |
Blackpool Central |
|
17/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
45218 |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
|
17/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
45220 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
17/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
45235 |
11A |
Carnforth |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
17/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
45289 |
5A |
Crewe North |
9A |
Longsight |
|
17/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
45297 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
|
17/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
45331 |
4B |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
4B |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
17/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
45346 |
7C |
Holyhead |
7C |
Holyhead |
|
17/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
45351 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
17/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
45362 |
64D |
Carstairs |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
17/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
45382 |
7C |
Holyhead |
7C |
Holyhead |
|
17/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
45390 |
3E |
Monument Lane |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
17/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
45448 |
3D |
Aston |
3D |
Aston |
|
17/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
45453 |
28A |
Motherwell |
60A |
Inverness |
|
24/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
44759 |
9A |
Longsight |
9A |
Longsight |
|
24/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
44760 |
9A |
Longsight |
9A |
Longsight |
|
24/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
44938 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
24/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
45289 |
9A |
Longsight |
9A |
Longsight |
|
24/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
45461 |
28A |
Motherwell |
60A |
Inverness |
|
01/07/1950 |
Reallocation |
44944 |
19G |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
01/07/1950 |
Reallocation |
45012 |
60A |
Inverness |
60A |
Inverness |
|
01/07/1950 |
Reallocation |
45362 |
64C |
Dalry Road |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
01/07/1950 |
Reallocation |
45453 |
60A |
Inverness |
60A |
Inverness |
|
02/07/1950 |
Reallocation |
44879 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
63A |
Perth South |
|
02/07/1950 |
Reallocation |
45007 |
65A |
Eastfield |
63A |
Perth South |
|
02/07/1950 |
Reallocation |
45011 |
65A |
Eastfield |
63A |
Perth South |
|
02/07/1950 |
Reallocation |
45118 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
63A |
Perth South |
|
02/07/1950 |
Reallocation |
45119 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
63A |
Perth South |
|
27/08/1950 |
Reallocation |
44791 |
66A |
Polmadie |
65C |
Parkhead |
|
31/08/1950 |
To Service |
44688 |
|
NEW |
27A |
Bank Hall |
|
09/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
44845 |
19E |
Belle Vue |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
09/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
44868 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
7C |
Holyhead |
|
09/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
44971 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
|
09/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
45095 |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
09/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
45225 |
23A |
Bank Hall |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
09/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
45241 |
5A |
Crewe North |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
|
09/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
45396 |
24A |
Accrington |
24A |
Accrington |
|
23/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
44791 |
65C |
Parkhead |
65C |
Parkhead |
|
30/09/1950 |
To Service |
44689 |
|
NEW |
27A |
Bank Hall |
|
30/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
44708 |
10B |
Preston |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
30/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
44807 |
9A |
Longsight |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
30/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
44808 |
7C |
Holyhead |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
|
30/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
44833 |
1A |
Willesden |
2A |
Rugby |
|
30/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
45015 |
3E |
Monument Lane |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
30/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
45026 |
10C |
Patricroft |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
30/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
45040 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
21A |
Saltley |
|
30/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
45069 |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
3A |
Bescot |
|
30/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
45218 |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
|
30/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
45226 |
23A |
Bank Hall |
26G |
Belle Vue |
|
30/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
45289 |
9A |
Longsight |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
30/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
45307 |
9A |
Longsight |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
30/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
45333 |
11A |
Carnforth |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
30/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
45343 |
11A |
Carnforth |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
30/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
45353 |
1A |
Willesden |
4A |
Bletchley |
|
07/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
44708 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
07/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
44807 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
07/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
44808 |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
|
07/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
44833 |
2A |
Rugby |
2A |
Rugby |
|
07/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
44905 |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
07/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
45015 |
3B |
Bushbury |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
07/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
45026 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
07/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
45040 |
21A |
Saltley |
21A |
Saltley |
|
07/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
45069 |
3A |
Bescot |
3A |
Bescot |
|
07/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
45218 |
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
|
07/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
45226 |
26G |
Belle Vue |
26G |
Belle Vue |
|
07/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
45289 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
07/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
45307 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
07/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
45333 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
07/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
45343 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
07/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
45353 |
4A |
Bletchley |
4A |
Bletchley |
|
14/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
44874 |
10B |
Preston |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
14/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
45072 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
14/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
45107 |
28A |
Blackpool Central |
28B |
Fleetwood |
|
14/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
45214 |
28A |
Blackpool Central |
28B |
Fleetwood |
|
14/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
45241 |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
21/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
45028 |
7C |
Holyhead |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
21/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
45335 |
23A |
Bank Hall |
24A |
Accrington |
|
21/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
45336 |
23A |
Bank Hall |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
28/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
44708 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
28/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
45211 |
27A |
Polmadie |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
31/10/1950 |
To Service |
44690 |
|
NEW |
27A |
Bank Hall |
|
31/10/1950 |
To Service |
44691 |
|
NEW |
27A |
Bank Hall |
|
31/10/1950 |
To Service |
44692 |
|
NEW |
27A |
Bank Hall |
|
11/1950 |
To Service |
44693 |
|
NEW |
25F |
Low Moor |
|
11/1950 |
To Service |
44694 |
|
NEW |
25F |
Low Moor |
|
04/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
44708 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
04/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
44845 |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
26G |
Belle Vue |
|
04/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
44874 |
11A |
Carnforth |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
04/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
45004 |
2A |
Rugby |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
04/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
45028 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
04/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
45072 |
11A |
Carnforth |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
04/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
45107 |
28B |
Fleetwood |
28B |
Fleetwood |
|
04/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
45113 |
7C |
Holyhead |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
04/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
45128 |
5B |
Crewe South |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
04/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
45133 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
04/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
45210 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
|
04/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
45211 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
04/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
45214 |
28B |
Fleetwood |
28B |
Fleetwood |
|
04/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
45219 |
26B |
Agecroft |
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
|
04/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
45225 |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
04/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
45241 |
11A |
Carnforth |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
04/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
45335 |
24A |
Accrington |
24A |
Accrington |
|
04/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
45336 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
25/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
45036 |
64A |
St Margarets |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
25/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
45085 |
64A |
St Margarets |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
30/11/1950 |
To Service |
44695 |
|
NEW |
25F |
Low Moor |
|
30/11/1950 |
To Service |
44696 |
|
NEW |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
30/11/1950 |
To Service |
44697 |
|
NEW |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
30/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
44712 |
2A |
Rugby |
2A |
Rugby |
|
30/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
44767 |
5A |
Crewe North |
27A |
Bank Hall |
|
30/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
44773 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
30/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
44827 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
30/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
44868 |
7C |
Holyhead |
7C |
Holyhead |
|
30/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
44911 |
1A |
Willesden |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
30/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
44941 |
BA |
Bricklayers Arms |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
|
30/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
45004 |
11A |
Carnforth |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
30/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
45036 |
64C |
Dalry Road |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
30/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
45041 |
1A |
Willesden |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
30/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
45074 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
30/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
45085 |
64C |
Dalry Road |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
30/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
45095 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
30/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
45113 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
30/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
45133 |
11A |
Carnforth |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
30/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
45217 |
23A |
Bank Hall |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
30/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
45219 |
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
25F |
Low Moor |
|
30/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
45305 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
30/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
45313 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
30/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
45495 |
10C |
Patricroft |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
02/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
44712 |
2A |
Rugby |
4A |
Bletchley |
|
02/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
44773 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
02/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
44827 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
02/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
44911 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
02/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
44921 |
19E |
Belle Vue |
24A |
Accrington |
|
02/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
44941 |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
|
02/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
44971 |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
02/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
45028 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
02/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
45041 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
02/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
45062 |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
02/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
45074 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
02/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
45079 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
|
02/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
45219 |
25F |
Low Moor |
25F |
Low Moor |
|
02/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
45221 |
25F |
Low Moor |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
02/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
45305 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
02/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
45335 |
24A |
Accrington |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
02/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
45495 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
23/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
45036 |
64C |
Dalry Road |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
23/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
45117 |
64D |
Carstairs |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
31/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
44712 |
4A |
Bletchley |
2A |
Rugby |
|
31/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
44717 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
31/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
44837 |
9A |
Longsight |
9A |
Longsight |
|
31/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
44888 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
21A |
Saltley |
|
31/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
44911 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
31/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
44971 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
31/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
45028 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
31/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
45036 |
66A |
Polmadie |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
31/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
45092 |
2A |
Rugby |
1A |
Willesden |
|
31/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
45117 |
66A |
Polmadie |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
31/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
45128 |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
31/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
45210 |
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
25F |
Low Moor |
|
31/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
45211 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
|
31/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
45222 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
|
31/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
45238 |
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
31/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
45297 |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
|
31/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
45374 |
2A |
Rugby |
1A |
Willesden |
|
20/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
45036 |
66A |
Polmadie |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
20/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
45117 |
66A |
Polmadie |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
20/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
45484 |
27A |
Polmadie |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
27/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
44697 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
27A |
Bank Hall |
|
27/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
44971 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
27/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
45014 |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
9A |
Longsight |
|
27/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
45068 |
23A |
Bank Hall |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
27/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
45305 |
5A |
Crewe North |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
31/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
44971 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
31/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
45014 |
9A |
Longsight |
9A |
Longsight |
|
31/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
45036 |
64A |
St Margarets |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
31/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
45117 |
64A |
St Margarets |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
31/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
45305 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
31/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
45484 |
64A |
St Margarets |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
24/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
44710 |
2A |
Rugby |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
24/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
44759 |
9A |
Longsight |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
24/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
44763 |
5A |
Crewe North |
9A |
Longsight |
|
24/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
44770 |
5A |
Crewe North |
2A |
Rugby |
|
24/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
44771 |
5A |
Crewe North |
2A |
Rugby |
|
24/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
44910 |
2A |
Rugby |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
24/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
44945 |
22C |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
|
24/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
45017 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
2A |
Rugby |
|
24/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
45019 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
24/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
45068 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
27A |
Bank Hall |
|
24/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
45070 |
7C |
Holyhead |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
24/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
45181 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
2A |
Rugby |
|
24/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
45216 |
23A |
Bank Hall |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
24/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
45221 |
14B |
Kentish Town |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
24/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
45332 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
24/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
45343 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
7C |
Holyhead |
|
24/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
45350 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
7C |
Holyhead |
|
24/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
45434 |
3B |
Bushbury |
2A |
Rugby |
|
28/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
44710 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
28/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
44759 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
28/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
44763 |
9A |
Longsight |
9A |
Longsight |
|
28/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
44770 |
2A |
Rugby |
2A |
Rugby |
|
28/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
44771 |
2A |
Rugby |
2A |
Rugby |
|
28/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
44910 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
28/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
44945 |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
|
28/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
45017 |
2A |
Rugby |
2A |
Rugby |
|
28/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
45019 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
28/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
45068 |
27A |
Bank Hall |
27A |
Bank Hall |
|
28/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
45070 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
28/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
45181 |
2A |
Rugby |
2A |
Rugby |
|
28/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
45216 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
28/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
45332 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
28/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
45343 |
7C |
Holyhead |
7C |
Holyhead |
|
28/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
45350 |
7C |
Holyhead |
7C |
Holyhead |
|
28/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
45434 |
2A |
Rugby |
2A |
Rugby |
|
24/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
44717 |
5A |
Crewe North |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
24/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
44759 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
24/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
44770 |
2A |
Rugby |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
24/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
44771 |
2A |
Rugby |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
24/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
44829 |
3E |
Monument Lane |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
24/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
44971 |
5A |
Crewe North |
2A |
Rugby |
|
24/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
45010 |
65A |
Eastfield |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
24/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
45017 |
2A |
Rugby |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
24/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
45023 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
24/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
45033 |
2A |
Rugby |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
24/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
45036 |
64A |
St Margarets |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
24/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
45061 |
23C |
Southport |
28A |
Blackpool Central |
|
24/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
45070 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
24/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
45085 |
64C |
Dalry Road |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
24/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
45117 |
64A |
St Margarets |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
24/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
45181 |
2A |
Rugby |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
24/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
45200 |
23C |
Southport |
28A |
Blackpool Central |
|
24/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
45217 |
5A |
Crewe North |
8E |
Brunswick |
|
24/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
45332 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
10B |
Preston |
|
24/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
45343 |
7C |
Holyhead |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
24/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
45346 |
7C |
Holyhead |
8E |
Brunswick |
|
24/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
45434 |
2A |
Rugby |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
24/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
45484 |
64A |
St Margarets |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
31/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
45010 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
31/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
45023 |
66A |
Polmadie |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
31/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
45036 |
66A |
Polmadie |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
31/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
45085 |
66A |
Polmadie |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
31/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
45117 |
66A |
Polmadie |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
31/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
45484 |
66A |
Polmadie |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
07/04/1951 |
Reallocation |
44791 |
65C |
Parkhead |
67B |
Hurlford |
|
07/04/1951 |
Reallocation |
45010 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
67B |
Hurlford |
|
21/04/1951 |
Reallocation |
44791 |
67B |
Hurlford |
67B |
Hurlford |
|
21/04/1951 |
Reallocation |
45010 |
67B |
Hurlford |
67B |
Hurlford |
|
21/04/1951 |
Reallocation |
45029 |
28B |
Dalry Road |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
21/04/1951 |
Reallocation |
45216 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
27A |
Bank Hall |
|
21/04/1951 |
Reallocation |
45362 |
64C |
Dalry Road |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
30/04/1951 |
To Service |
44686 |
|
NEW |
9A |
Longsight |
|
05/05/1951 |
Reallocation |
44945 |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
91M |
To London Midland Region |
|
19/05/1951 |
Reallocation |
44677 |
|
|
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
19/05/1951 |
Reallocation |
44697 |
27A |
Bank Hall |
28A |
Blackpool Central |
|
19/05/1951 |
Reallocation |
44703 |
|
|
68A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
19/05/1951 |
Reallocation |
44778 |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
19/05/1951 |
Reallocation |
44945 |
91M |
To London Midland Region |
91M |
To London Midland Region |
|
19/05/1951 |
Reallocation |
45061 |
28A |
Blackpool Central |
27C |
Southport |
|
19/05/1951 |
Reallocation |
45200 |
28A |
Blackpool Central |
27C |
Southport |
|
19/05/1951 |
Reallocation |
45216 |
27A |
Bank Hall |
27A |
Bank Hall |
|
31/05/1951 |
To Service |
44687 |
|
NEW |
9A |
Longsight |
|
02/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
45096 |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
10B |
Preston |
|
02/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
45454 |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
09/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
44971 |
2A |
Rugby |
3A |
Bescot |
|
09/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
45069 |
3A |
Bescot |
2A |
Rugby |
|
16/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
44697 |
28A |
Blackpool Central |
24A |
Accrington |
|
16/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
44778 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
28A |
Blackpool Central |
|
16/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
44892 |
10B |
Preston |
12B |
Carlisle Canal |
|
16/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
44971 |
3A |
Bescot |
3A |
Bescot |
|
16/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
45061 |
27C |
Southport |
28A |
Blackpool Central |
|
16/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
45069 |
2A |
Rugby |
2A |
Rugby |
|
16/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
45096 |
10B |
Preston |
10B |
Preston |
|
16/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
45141 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
12B |
Carlisle Canal |
|
16/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
45334 |
23C |
Southport |
28A |
Blackpool Central |
|
16/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
45396 |
24A |
Accrington |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
16/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
45454 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
30/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
44892 |
12B |
Carlisle Canal |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
30/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
45061 |
28A |
Blackpool Central |
28A |
Blackpool Central |
|
30/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
45141 |
12B |
Carlisle Canal |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
|
07/07/1951 |
Reallocation |
44763 |
9A |
Longsight |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
07/07/1951 |
Reallocation |
44837 |
9A |
Longsight |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
07/07/1951 |
Reallocation |
45001 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
7C |
Holyhead |
|
07/07/1951 |
Reallocation |
45014 |
9A |
Longsight |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
07/07/1951 |
Reallocation |
45019 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
07/07/1951 |
Reallocation |
45045 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
7C |
Holyhead |
|
07/07/1951 |
Reallocation |
45051 |
3D |
Aston |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
07/07/1951 |
Reallocation |
45057 |
2A |
Rugby |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
07/07/1951 |
Reallocation |
45095 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
7C |
Holyhead |
|
07/07/1951 |
Reallocation |
45247 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
7C |
Holyhead |
|
07/07/1951 |
Reallocation |
45292 |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
7C |
Holyhead |
|
07/07/1951 |
Reallocation |
45425 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
17/07/1951 |
Reallocation |
44763 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
17/07/1951 |
Reallocation |
44837 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
17/07/1951 |
Reallocation |
44892 |
11A |
Carnforth |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
17/07/1951 |
Reallocation |
45001 |
7C |
Holyhead |
7C |
Holyhead |
|
17/07/1951 |
Reallocation |
45014 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
17/07/1951 |
Reallocation |
45019 |
11A |
Carnforth |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
17/07/1951 |
Reallocation |
45045 |
7C |
Holyhead |
7C |
Holyhead |
|
17/07/1951 |
Reallocation |
45051 |
3E |
Monument Lane |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
17/07/1951 |
Reallocation |
45057 |
10C |
Patricroft |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
17/07/1951 |
Reallocation |
45095 |
7C |
Holyhead |
7C |
Holyhead |
|
17/07/1951 |
Reallocation |
45141 |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
|
17/07/1951 |
Reallocation |
45247 |
7C |
Holyhead |
7C |
Holyhead |
|
17/07/1951 |
Reallocation |
45292 |
7C |
Holyhead |
7C |
Holyhead |
|
17/07/1951 |
Reallocation |
45334 |
28A |
Blackpool Central |
28A |
Blackpool Central |
|
17/07/1951 |
Reallocation |
45425 |
10C |
Patricroft |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
28/07/1951 |
Reallocation |
44852 |
21B |
Bournville |
21A |
Saltley |
|
28/07/1951 |
Reallocation |
44986 |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
28/07/1951 |
Reallocation |
45272 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
28/07/1951 |
Reallocation |
45274 |
21B |
Bournville |
21A |
Saltley |
|
04/08/1951 |
Reallocation |
45272 |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
|
11/08/1951 |
Reallocation |
44852 |
21A |
Saltley |
21A |
Saltley |
|
11/08/1951 |
Reallocation |
44986 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
11/08/1951 |
Reallocation |
45007 |
63A |
Perth South |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
11/08/1951 |
Reallocation |
45017 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
11/08/1951 |
Reallocation |
45039 |
11A |
Carnforth |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
11/08/1951 |
Reallocation |
45086 |
63A |
|
64D |
Carstairs |
|
11/08/1951 |
Reallocation |
45119 |
63A |
Perth South |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
11/08/1951 |
Reallocation |
45272 |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
|
11/08/1951 |
Reallocation |
45274 |
21A |
Saltley |
21A |
Saltley |
|
18/08/1951 |
Reallocation |
44763 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
18/08/1951 |
Reallocation |
45033 |
5A |
Crewe North |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
08/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
44697 |
24A |
Accrington |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
08/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
44763 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
08/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
45033 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
08/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
45127 |
63A |
|
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
08/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
45396 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
09/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
44820 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
09/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
44850 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
09/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
44921 |
24A |
Accrington |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
09/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
45007 |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
09/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
45013 |
5B |
Crewe South |
68A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
09/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
45030 |
5B |
Crewe South |
63A |
Perth South |
|
09/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
45043 |
28A |
Blackpool Central |
63A |
Perth South |
|
09/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
45086 |
64D |
Carstairs |
64D |
Carstairs |
|
09/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
45099 |
24F |
Fleetwood |
63A |
Perth South |
|
09/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
45119 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
09/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
45127 |
64C |
Dalry Road |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
09/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
45180 |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
09/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
45214 |
28B |
Fleetwood |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
09/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
45245 |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
61B |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
|
09/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
45318 |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
09/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
45330 |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
62C |
Dunfermline Upper |
|
09/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
45334 |
28A |
Blackpool Central |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
09/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
45367 |
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
61B |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
|
09/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
45396 |
65F |
Grangemouth |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
09/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
45433 |
3A |
Bescot |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
09/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
45436 |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
15/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
44760 |
9A |
Longsight |
8E |
Brunswick |
|
15/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
44837 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
2A |
Rugby |
|
15/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
44859 |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
15/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
44869 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
4A |
Bletchley |
|
15/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
44871 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
15/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
44876 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
3D |
Aston |
|
15/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
45001 |
7C |
Holyhead |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
15/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
45014 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
4B |
Northampton |
|
15/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
45054 |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
15/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
45065 |
5A |
Crewe North |
3D |
Aston |
|
15/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
45095 |
7C |
Holyhead |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
15/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
45111 |
7C |
Holyhead |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
15/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
45205 |
25A |
Wakefield |
24A |
Accrington |
|
15/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
45206 |
25A |
Wakefield |
24A |
Accrington |
|
15/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
45209 |
25A |
Wakefield |
24A |
Accrington |
|
15/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
45247 |
7C |
Holyhead |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
|
15/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
45350 |
7C |
Holyhead |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
15/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
45402 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
29/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
45260 |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
17A |
Derby |
|
29/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
45297 |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
17A |
Derby |
|
06/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
44760 |
8E |
Brunswick |
8E |
Brunswick |
|
06/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
44837 |
2A |
Rugby |
2A |
Rugby |
|
06/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
44859 |
16A |
Nottingham |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
06/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
44869 |
4A |
Bletchley |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
06/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
44871 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
06/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
44876 |
3D |
Aston |
3D |
Aston |
|
06/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
45001 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
06/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
45014 |
4B |
Northampton |
4B |
Northampton |
|
06/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
45023 |
66A |
Polmadie |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
06/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
45036 |
66A |
Polmadie |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
06/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
45054 |
11A |
Carnforth |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
06/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
45065 |
3D |
Aston |
3D |
Aston |
|
06/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
45085 |
66A |
Polmadie |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
06/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
45086 |
64D |
Carstairs |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
06/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
45095 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
06/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
45111 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
06/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
45117 |
66A |
Polmadie |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
06/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
45119 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
06/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
45161 |
64D |
Carstairs |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
06/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
45183 |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
06/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
45205 |
24A |
Accrington |
24A |
Accrington |
|
06/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
45206 |
24A |
Accrington |
24A |
Accrington |
|
06/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
45209 |
24A |
Accrington |
24A |
Accrington |
|
06/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
45247 |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
|
06/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
45260 |
17A |
Derby |
17A |
Derby |
|
06/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
45297 |
17A |
Derby |
17A |
Derby |
|
06/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
45330 |
62C |
Dunfermline Upper |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
06/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
45350 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
06/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
45384 |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
06/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
45402 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
13/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
44869 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
4A |
Bletchley |
|
13/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
45448 |
3D |
Aston |
2A |
Rugby |
|
20/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
44841 |
16A |
Nottingham |
21A |
Saltley |
|
20/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
45059 |
16A |
Nottingham |
21A |
Saltley |
|
20/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
45130 |
2B |
Bletchley |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
20/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
45249 |
7C |
Holyhead |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
27/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
44760 |
8E |
Brunswick |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
27/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
44986 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
17A |
Derby |
|
27/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
45260 |
17A |
Derby |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
27/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
45322 |
3A |
Bescot |
2A |
Rugby |
|
27/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
45333 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
8E |
Brunswick |
|
27/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
45448 |
2A |
Rugby |
3D |
Aston |
|
03/11/1951 |
Reallocation |
45201 |
25F |
Low Moor |
25A |
Wakefield |
|
03/11/1951 |
Reallocation |
45226 |
26G |
Belle Vue |
24A |
Accrington |
|
03/11/1951 |
Reallocation |
45387 |
10B |
Preston |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
04/11/1951 |
Reallocation |
45166 |
29A |
Perth South |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
04/11/1951 |
Reallocation |
45169 |
63A |
|
68B |
Dumfries |
|
04/11/1951 |
Reallocation |
45180 |
64A |
St Margarets |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
04/11/1951 |
Reallocation |
45245 |
61B |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
61B |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
|
04/11/1951 |
Reallocation |
45318 |
64A |
St Margarets |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
04/11/1951 |
Reallocation |
45330 |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
62C |
Dunfermline Upper |
|
04/11/1951 |
Reallocation |
45436 |
64A |
St Margarets |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
01/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
44685 |
|
|
4B |
Northampton |
|
01/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
44840 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
44844 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
44945 |
91M |
To London Midland Region |
17A |
Derby |
|
01/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
44962 |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
21A |
Saltley |
|
01/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
44971 |
3A |
Bescot |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
01/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
45099 |
63A |
Perth South |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
01/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
45112 |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
01/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
45183 |
64C |
Dalry Road |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
01/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
45272 |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
17A |
Derby |
|
01/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
45281 |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
01/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
45309 |
63A |
|
66B |
Motherwell |
|
01/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
45322 |
2A |
Rugby |
3D |
Aston |
|
01/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
45384 |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
01/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
45400 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
01/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
45439 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
3A |
Bescot |
|
29/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
44720 |
68A |
|
63A |
Perth South |
|
29/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
44721 |
68A |
|
63A |
Perth South |
|
29/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
44844 |
5B |
Crewe South |
3D |
Aston |
|
29/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
44917 |
17A |
Derby |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
29/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
44928 |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
25A |
Wakefield |
|
29/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
45011 |
63A |
Perth South |
68A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
29/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
45070 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
3D |
Aston |
|
29/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
45077 |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
25A |
Wakefield |
|
29/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
45112 |
65A |
Eastfield |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
29/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
45118 |
63A |
Perth South |
68A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
29/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
45135 |
10C |
Patricroft |
4A |
Bletchley |
|
29/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
45281 |
65A |
Eastfield |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
29/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
45327 |
10C |
Patricroft |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
29/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
45327 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
29/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
45370 |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
3D |
Aston |
|
29/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
45403 |
10C |
Patricroft |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
29/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
45403 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
29/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
45408 |
10C |
Patricroft |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
29/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
45438 |
10C |
Patricroft |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
29/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
45450 |
19E |
Belle Vue |
28A |
Blackpool Central |
|
01/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
45400 |
65A |
Eastfield |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
26/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
44685 |
4B |
Northampton |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
26/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
44871 |
5A |
Crewe North |
7C |
Holyhead |
|
26/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
44917 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
17A |
Derby |
|
26/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
44932 |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
24A |
Accrington |
|
26/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
44947 |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
24A |
Accrington |
|
26/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
44971 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
1A |
Willesden |
|
26/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
45000 |
2A |
Rugby |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
26/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
45001 |
5A |
Crewe North |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
26/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
45061 |
28A |
Blackpool Central |
24A |
Accrington |
|
26/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
45111 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
26/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
45140 |
1A |
Willesden |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
26/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
45160 |
32A |
Inverness |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
26/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
45249 |
10C |
Patricroft |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
26/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
45327 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
26/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
45400 |
65A |
Eastfield |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
26/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
45425 |
10C |
Patricroft |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
26/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
45450 |
28A |
Blackpool Central |
26G |
Belle Vue |
|
23/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
44697 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
27A |
Bank Hall |
|
23/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
44888 |
21A |
Saltley |
21A |
Saltley |
|
23/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
45000 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
2A |
Rugby |
|
23/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
45001 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
23/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
45062 |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
23/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
45092 |
1A |
Willesden |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
23/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
45130 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
23/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
45221 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
23/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
45238 |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
23/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
45327 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
23/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
45335 |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
23/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
45387 |
11A |
Carnforth |
1A |
Willesden |
|
23/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
45487 |
27A |
Polmadie |
65D |
Dawsholm |
|
19/03/1952 |
Reallocation |
44917 |
17A |
Derby |
71G |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
|
22/03/1952 |
Reallocation |
44897 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
3D |
Aston |
|
22/03/1952 |
Reallocation |
44942 |
3D |
Aston |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
22/03/1952 |
Reallocation |
44947 |
24A |
Accrington |
28A |
Blackpool Central |
|
22/03/1952 |
Reallocation |
45011 |
68A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
22/03/1952 |
Reallocation |
45013 |
68A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
22/03/1952 |
Reallocation |
45069 |
2A |
Rugby |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
22/03/1952 |
Reallocation |
45114 |
5D |
Stoke |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
22/03/1952 |
Reallocation |
45255 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
|
22/03/1952 |
Reallocation |
45325 |
5D |
Stoke |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
22/03/1952 |
Reallocation |
45326 |
5D |
Stoke |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
22/03/1952 |
Reallocation |
45418 |
3E |
Monument Lane |
3D |
Aston |
|
22/03/1952 |
Reallocation |
45430 |
2A |
Rugby |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
19/04/1952 |
Reallocation |
44771 |
5A |
Crewe North |
2A |
Rugby |
|
19/04/1952 |
Reallocation |
44908 |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
19/04/1952 |
Reallocation |
44928 |
25A |
Wakefield |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
|
19/04/1952 |
Reallocation |
44963 |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
17A |
Derby |
|
19/04/1952 |
Reallocation |
44986 |
17A |
Derby |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
|
19/04/1952 |
Reallocation |
44994 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
19/04/1952 |
Reallocation |
45011 |
65F |
Grangemouth |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
19/04/1952 |
Reallocation |
45013 |
65F |
Grangemouth |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
19/04/1952 |
Reallocation |
45077 |
25A |
Wakefield |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
|
19/04/1952 |
Reallocation |
45084 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
63B |
Stirling |
|
19/04/1952 |
Reallocation |
45114 |
11A |
Carnforth |
3D |
Aston |
|
19/04/1952 |
Reallocation |
45117 |
64A |
St Margarets |
63A |
Perth South |
|
19/04/1952 |
Reallocation |
45128 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
19/04/1952 |
Reallocation |
45200 |
27C |
Southport |
24A |
Accrington |
|
19/04/1952 |
Reallocation |
45210 |
25F |
Low Moor |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
|
19/04/1952 |
Reallocation |
45255 |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
6H |
Bangor |
|
19/04/1952 |
Reallocation |
45334 |
64A |
St Margarets |
63A |
Perth South |
|
17/05/1952 |
Reallocation |
44737 |
|
|
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
17/05/1952 |
Reallocation |
44771 |
2A |
Rugby |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
17/05/1952 |
Reallocation |
44790 |
27A |
Polmadie |
68E |
Carlisle Canal |
|
17/05/1952 |
Reallocation |
44792 |
66A |
Polmadie |
68E |
Carlisle Canal |
|
17/05/1952 |
Reallocation |
44840 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
17/05/1952 |
Reallocation |
44871 |
7C |
Holyhead |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
17/05/1952 |
Reallocation |
44908 |
65A |
Eastfield |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
17/05/1952 |
Reallocation |
44921 |
65A |
Eastfield |
68A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
17/05/1952 |
Reallocation |
44926 |
23C |
Southport |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
17/05/1952 |
Reallocation |
44928 |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
25A |
Wakefield |
|
17/05/1952 |
Reallocation |
45007 |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
68A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
17/05/1952 |
Reallocation |
45036 |
64A |
St Margarets |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
17/05/1952 |
Reallocation |
45043 |
63A |
Perth South |
68A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
17/05/1952 |
Reallocation |
45047 |
30A |
Corkerhill |
67C |
Ayr |
|
17/05/1952 |
Reallocation |
45049 |
30A |
Corkerhill |
67C |
Ayr |
|
17/05/1952 |
Reallocation |
45070 |
3D |
Aston |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
17/05/1952 |
Reallocation |
45071 |
1A |
Willesden |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
17/05/1952 |
Reallocation |
45112 |
65A |
Eastfield |
68A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
17/05/1952 |
Reallocation |
45163 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
68A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
17/05/1952 |
Reallocation |
45210 |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
25F |
Low Moor |
|
17/05/1952 |
Reallocation |
45266 |
63A |
|
67B |
Hurlford |
|
17/05/1952 |
Reallocation |
45334 |
63A |
Perth South |
68A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
17/05/1952 |
Reallocation |
45430 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
2A |
Rugby |
|
17/05/1952 |
Reallocation |
45435 |
23C |
Southport |
25A |
Wakefield |
|
14/06/1952 |
Reallocation |
44697 |
27A |
Bank Hall |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
14/06/1952 |
Reallocation |
44737 |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
14/06/1952 |
Reallocation |
44760 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
14/06/1952 |
Reallocation |
44840 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
14/06/1952 |
Reallocation |
44871 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
14/06/1952 |
Reallocation |
44908 |
65A |
Eastfield |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
14/06/1952 |
Reallocation |
44926 |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
14/06/1952 |
Reallocation |
44928 |
25A |
Wakefield |
25A |
Wakefield |
|
14/06/1952 |
Reallocation |
45069 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
2E |
Northampton |
|
14/06/1952 |
Reallocation |
45070 |
1E |
Bletchley |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
14/06/1952 |
Reallocation |
45071 |
1E |
Bletchley |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
14/06/1952 |
Reallocation |
45077 |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
25A |
Wakefield |
|
14/06/1952 |
Reallocation |
45095 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
14/06/1952 |
Reallocation |
45128 |
5A |
Crewe North |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
14/06/1952 |
Reallocation |
45210 |
25F |
Low Moor |
25F |
Low Moor |
|
14/06/1952 |
Reallocation |
45415 |
23C |
Southport |
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
|
14/06/1952 |
Reallocation |
45430 |
2A |
Rugby |
2A |
Rugby |
|
12/07/1952 |
Reallocation |
44838 |
9A |
Longsight |
1A |
Willesden |
|
12/07/1952 |
Reallocation |
44871 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5D |
Stoke |
|
12/07/1952 |
Reallocation |
44971 |
1A |
Willesden |
9A |
Longsight |
|
12/07/1952 |
Reallocation |
45006 |
5B |
Crewe South |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
12/07/1952 |
Reallocation |
45048 |
5B |
Crewe South |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
12/07/1952 |
Reallocation |
45050 |
11A |
Carnforth |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
12/07/1952 |
Reallocation |
45069 |
2E |
Northampton |
2A |
Rugby |
|
12/07/1952 |
Reallocation |
45077 |
25A |
Wakefield |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
12/07/1952 |
Reallocation |
45109 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
9A |
Longsight |
|
12/07/1952 |
Reallocation |
45128 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
12/07/1952 |
Reallocation |
45134 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
12/07/1952 |
Reallocation |
45149 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
5D |
Stoke |
|
12/07/1952 |
Reallocation |
45235 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
10B |
Preston |
|
12/07/1952 |
Reallocation |
45247 |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
12/07/1952 |
Reallocation |
45255 |
6H |
Bangor |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
12/07/1952 |
Reallocation |
45307 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
|
12/07/1952 |
Reallocation |
45325 |
11A |
Carnforth |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
12/07/1952 |
Reallocation |
45369 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
12/07/1952 |
Reallocation |
45402 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
3A |
Bescot |
|
12/07/1952 |
Reallocation |
45404 |
2A |
Rugby |
1A |
Willesden |
|
12/07/1952 |
Reallocation |
45437 |
3B |
Bushbury |
3A |
Bescot |
|
09/08/1952 |
Reallocation |
44958 |
29A |
Perth South |
68A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
09/08/1952 |
Reallocation |
45330 |
62C |
Dunfermline Upper |
68A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
09/08/1952 |
Reallocation |
45466 |
29A |
Perth South |
68A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
09/08/1952 |
Reallocation |
45491 |
30A |
Corkerhill |
68A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
06/09/1952 |
Reallocation |
45013 |
65F |
Grangemouth |
68A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
06/09/1952 |
Reallocation |
45061 |
24A |
Accrington |
24B |
Rose Grove |
|
06/09/1952 |
Reallocation |
45206 |
24A |
Accrington |
24F |
Fleetwood |
|
06/09/1952 |
Reallocation |
45209 |
24A |
Accrington |
24B |
Rose Grove |
|
06/09/1952 |
Reallocation |
45226 |
24A |
Accrington |
24B |
Rose Grove |
|
06/09/1952 |
Reallocation |
45260 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
06/09/1952 |
Reallocation |
45480 |
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
68B |
Dumfries |
|
06/09/1952 |
Reallocation |
45481 |
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
68C |
Stranraer |
|
04/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
44722 |
68A |
|
60A |
Inverness |
|
04/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
44791 |
67B |
Hurlford |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
04/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
44825 |
16A |
Nottingham |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
04/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
44941 |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
9A |
Longsight |
|
04/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
44965 |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
17A |
Derby |
|
04/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
44971 |
9A |
Longsight |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
04/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
45006 |
6J |
Holyhead |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
04/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
45012 |
60A |
Inverness |
68A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
04/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
45055 |
10C |
Patricroft |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
04/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
45134 |
5A |
Crewe North |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
04/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
45235 |
10B |
Preston |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
04/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
45247 |
6J |
Holyhead |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
04/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
45264 |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
17A |
Derby |
|
04/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
45307 |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
04/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
45415 |
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
27C |
Southport |
|
04/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
45421 |
10C |
Patricroft |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
44718 |
68A |
|
60A |
Inverness |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
44719 |
68A |
|
60A |
Inverness |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
44724 |
68A |
|
60A |
Inverness |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
44744 |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
44746 |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
44821 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
21A |
Saltley |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
44855 |
91S |
To Southern Region |
21A |
Saltley |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
45018 |
60B |
Aviemore |
68A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
45028 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
45048 |
6J |
Holyhead |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
45078 |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
27C |
Southport |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
45079 |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
45122 |
32A |
Inverness |
68A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
45132 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
45134 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
45136 |
32A |
Inverness |
60B |
Aviemore |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
45138 |
32A |
Inverness |
68A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
45195 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
45415 |
27C |
Southport |
27C |
Southport |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
45487 |
65D |
Dawsholm |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
29/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
44723 |
68A |
|
60A |
Inverness |
|
29/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
44744 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
29/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
44746 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
29/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
44770 |
5A |
Crewe North |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
29/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
44821 |
21A |
Saltley |
21A |
Saltley |
|
29/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
44855 |
21A |
Saltley |
21A |
Saltley |
|
29/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
44855 |
21A |
Saltley |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
29/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
45028 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
29/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
45048 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
29/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
45078 |
27C |
Southport |
27C |
Southport |
|
29/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
45079 |
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
|
29/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
45132 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
29/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
45134 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
29/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
45195 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
29/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
45434 |
5A |
Crewe North |
1A |
Willesden |
|
27/12/1952 |
Reallocation |
44971 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
27/12/1952 |
Reallocation |
45005 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
27/12/1952 |
Reallocation |
45120 |
60A |
Inverness |
68A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
27/12/1952 |
Reallocation |
45248 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
27/12/1952 |
Reallocation |
45481 |
68C |
Stranraer |
68A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
03/01/1953 |
Reallocation |
44971 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
03/01/1953 |
Reallocation |
45005 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
03/01/1953 |
Reallocation |
45195 |
5A |
Crewe North |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
03/01/1953 |
Reallocation |
45248 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
03/01/1953 |
Reallocation |
45256 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
24/01/1953 |
Reallocation |
44697 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
24/01/1953 |
Reallocation |
44770 |
6J |
Holyhead |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
24/01/1953 |
Reallocation |
44927 |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
24/01/1953 |
Reallocation |
45030 |
63A |
Perth South |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
24/01/1953 |
Reallocation |
45050 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
2A |
Rugby |
|
24/01/1953 |
Reallocation |
45173 |
29A |
Perth South |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
24/01/1953 |
Reallocation |
45195 |
6J |
Holyhead |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
24/01/1953 |
Reallocation |
45256 |
6J |
Holyhead |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
24/01/1953 |
Reallocation |
45434 |
1A |
Willesden |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
24/01/1953 |
Reallocation |
45486 |
27A |
Polmadie |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
21/02/1953 |
Reallocation |
44760 |
5A |
Crewe North |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
21/02/1953 |
Reallocation |
44770 |
5A |
Crewe North |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
21/02/1953 |
Reallocation |
44821 |
21A |
Saltley |
21B |
Bournville |
|
21/02/1953 |
Reallocation |
44889 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
24A |
Accrington |
|
21/02/1953 |
Reallocation |
44987 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
25A |
Wakefield |
|
21/02/1953 |
Reallocation |
45033 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
21/02/1953 |
Reallocation |
45079 |
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
|
21/02/1953 |
Reallocation |
45218 |
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
25A |
Wakefield |
|
21/02/1953 |
Reallocation |
45235 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
21/02/1953 |
Reallocation |
45269 |
21A |
Saltley |
21B |
Bournville |
|
21/02/1953 |
Reallocation |
45446 |
3D |
Aston |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
21/03/1953 |
Reallocation |
44770 |
6J |
Holyhead |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
21/03/1953 |
Reallocation |
44855 |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
21A |
Saltley |
|
21/03/1953 |
Reallocation |
44987 |
25A |
Wakefield |
26B |
Agecroft |
|
21/03/1953 |
Reallocation |
44994 |
64C |
Dalry Road |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
21/03/1953 |
Reallocation |
45053 |
32A |
Inverness |
63A |
Perth South |
|
21/03/1953 |
Reallocation |
45168 |
30A |
Corkerhill |
63A |
Perth South |
|
18/04/1953 |
Reallocation |
44840 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
18/04/1953 |
Reallocation |
44911 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
18/04/1953 |
Reallocation |
45028 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
18/04/1953 |
Reallocation |
45048 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
18/04/1953 |
Reallocation |
45128 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
18/04/1953 |
Reallocation |
45134 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
18/04/1953 |
Reallocation |
45148 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
18/04/1953 |
Reallocation |
45195 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
18/04/1953 |
Reallocation |
45240 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
18/04/1953 |
Reallocation |
45300 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
18/04/1953 |
Reallocation |
45301 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
18/04/1953 |
Reallocation |
45307 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
18/04/1953 |
Reallocation |
45350 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
18/04/1953 |
Reallocation |
45369 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
18/04/1953 |
Reallocation |
45446 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
16/05/1953 |
Reallocation |
44708 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
16/05/1953 |
Reallocation |
44760 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
16/05/1953 |
Reallocation |
44821 |
21B |
Bournville |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
16/05/1953 |
Reallocation |
44827 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
16/05/1953 |
Reallocation |
44855 |
21A |
Saltley |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
16/05/1953 |
Reallocation |
44927 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
16/05/1953 |
Reallocation |
45269 |
21B |
Bournville |
21A |
Saltley |
|
16/05/1953 |
Reallocation |
45447 |
21A |
Saltley |
21A |
Saltley |
|
11/07/1953 |
Reallocation |
44760 |
6J |
Holyhead |
9A |
Longsight |
|
11/07/1953 |
Reallocation |
44776 |
17A |
Derby |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
|
11/07/1953 |
Reallocation |
44807 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
11/07/1953 |
Reallocation |
44808 |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
11/07/1953 |
Reallocation |
44963 |
17A |
Derby |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
|
11/07/1953 |
Reallocation |
44971 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
11/07/1953 |
Reallocation |
44994 |
64A |
St Margarets |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
11/07/1953 |
Reallocation |
45004 |
11A |
Carnforth |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
11/07/1953 |
Reallocation |
45005 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
11/07/1953 |
Reallocation |
45006 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
11/07/1953 |
Reallocation |
45061 |
24B |
Rose Grove |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
11/07/1953 |
Reallocation |
45070 |
1E |
Bletchley |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
11/07/1953 |
Reallocation |
45078 |
27C |
Southport |
27C |
Southport |
|
11/07/1953 |
Reallocation |
45095 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
11/07/1953 |
Reallocation |
45146 |
1A |
Willesden |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
11/07/1953 |
Reallocation |
45162 |
29A |
Perth South |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
11/07/1953 |
Reallocation |
45164 |
29A |
Perth South |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
11/07/1953 |
Reallocation |
45239 |
5B |
Crewe South |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
11/07/1953 |
Reallocation |
45249 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
11/07/1953 |
Reallocation |
45254 |
5B |
Crewe South |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
11/07/1953 |
Reallocation |
45271 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
11/07/1953 |
Reallocation |
45286 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
11/07/1953 |
Reallocation |
45288 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
11/07/1953 |
Reallocation |
45289 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
11/07/1953 |
Reallocation |
45294 |
5B |
Crewe South |
9A |
Longsight |
|
11/07/1953 |
Reallocation |
45307 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
11/07/1953 |
Reallocation |
45315 |
10C |
Patricroft |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
11/07/1953 |
Reallocation |
45316 |
2B |
Bletchley |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
11/07/1953 |
Reallocation |
45327 |
5B |
Crewe South |
9A |
Longsight |
|
11/07/1953 |
Reallocation |
45347 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
11/07/1953 |
Reallocation |
45350 |
5A |
Crewe North |
1A |
Willesden |
|
11/07/1953 |
Reallocation |
45352 |
5D |
Stoke |
9A |
Longsight |
|
11/07/1953 |
Reallocation |
45385 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
11/07/1953 |
Reallocation |
45415 |
27C |
Southport |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
08/08/1953 |
Reallocation |
44697 |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
|
08/08/1953 |
Reallocation |
44851 |
17A |
Derby |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
08/08/1953 |
Reallocation |
44856 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
17A |
Derby |
|
08/08/1953 |
Reallocation |
45063 |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
08/08/1953 |
Reallocation |
45135 |
4A |
Bletchley |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
08/08/1953 |
Reallocation |
45353 |
4A |
Bletchley |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
05/09/1953 |
Reallocation |
44697 |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
05/09/1953 |
Reallocation |
44804 |
21A |
Saltley |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
05/09/1953 |
Reallocation |
44848 |
17A |
Derby |
68A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
05/09/1953 |
Reallocation |
44908 |
65A |
Eastfield |
63A |
Perth South |
|
05/09/1953 |
Reallocation |
45004 |
10C |
Patricroft |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
05/09/1953 |
Reallocation |
45018 |
68A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
05/09/1953 |
Reallocation |
45030 |
66A |
Polmadie |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
05/09/1953 |
Reallocation |
45043 |
68A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
05/09/1953 |
Reallocation |
45063 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
|
05/09/1953 |
Reallocation |
45071 |
1E |
Bletchley |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
05/09/1953 |
Reallocation |
45173 |
66A |
Polmadie |
63A |
Perth South |
|
05/09/1953 |
Reallocation |
45226 |
24B |
Rose Grove |
24A |
Accrington |
|
05/09/1953 |
Reallocation |
45289 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
05/09/1953 |
Reallocation |
45413 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
03/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
44678 |
|
|
6J |
Holyhead |
|
03/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
44681 |
5A |
Crewe North |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
03/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
44708 |
5A |
Crewe North |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
03/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
44741 |
|
|
9A |
Longsight |
|
03/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
44742 |
|
|
9A |
Longsight |
|
03/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
44771 |
41E |
|
1A |
Willesden |
|
03/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
44776 |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
17A |
Derby |
|
03/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
44790 |
68E |
Carlisle Canal |
68A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
03/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
44792 |
68E |
Carlisle Canal |
68A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
03/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
44804 |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
21A |
Saltley |
|
03/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
44808 |
6J |
Holyhead |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
03/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
44826 |
22C |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
03/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
44830 |
22C |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
|
03/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
44839 |
22C |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
17A |
Derby |
|
03/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
44848 |
68A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
|
03/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
44851 |
66A |
Polmadie |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
|
03/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
44869 |
4A |
Bletchley |
1A |
Willesden |
|
03/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
44871 |
5D |
Stoke |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
03/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
44889 |
24A |
Accrington |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
03/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
44916 |
|
|
1A |
Willesden |
|
03/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
44963 |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
17A |
Derby |
|
03/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
44982 |
25F |
Low Moor |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
03/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
45005 |
6J |
Holyhead |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
03/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
45006 |
6J |
Holyhead |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
03/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
45018 |
64A |
St Margarets |
68A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
03/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
45020 |
2A |
Rugby |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
03/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
45030 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
03/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
45043 |
64A |
St Margarets |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
03/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
45069 |
2A |
Rugby |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
03/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
45180 |
64A |
St Margarets |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
03/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
45200 |
24A |
Accrington |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
03/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
45209 |
24B |
Rose Grove |
24A |
Accrington |
|
03/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
45250 |
2A |
Rugby |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
03/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
45254 |
6J |
Holyhead |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
03/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
45271 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
03/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
45281 |
65A |
Eastfield |
68A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
03/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
45294 |
9A |
Longsight |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
03/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
45314 |
2B |
Bletchley |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
03/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
45318 |
64A |
St Margarets |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
03/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
45352 |
9A |
Longsight |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
03/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
45354 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
03/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
45381 |
5D |
Stoke |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
03/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
45385 |
6J |
Holyhead |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
03/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
45388 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
03/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
45436 |
64A |
St Margarets |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
31/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
44871 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5D |
Stoke |
|
31/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
45003 |
2A |
Rugby |
1A |
Willesden |
|
31/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
45059 |
21A |
Saltley |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
31/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
45271 |
5A |
Crewe North |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
31/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
45331 |
4B |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
31/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
45354 |
5A |
Crewe North |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
31/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
45381 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5D |
Stoke |
|
31/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
45403 |
5B |
Crewe South |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
28/11/1953 |
Reallocation |
44775 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
21A |
Saltley |
|
28/11/1953 |
Reallocation |
44776 |
17A |
Derby |
21A |
Saltley |
|
28/11/1953 |
Reallocation |
44777 |
14B |
Kentish Town |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
28/11/1953 |
Reallocation |
44852 |
21A |
Saltley |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
28/11/1953 |
Reallocation |
44908 |
63A |
Perth South |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
28/11/1953 |
Reallocation |
44935 |
9A |
Longsight |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
28/11/1953 |
Reallocation |
44940 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
24B |
Rose Grove |
|
28/11/1953 |
Reallocation |
45004 |
5B |
Crewe South |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
28/11/1953 |
Reallocation |
45088 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
28/11/1953 |
Reallocation |
45135 |
5B |
Crewe South |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
28/11/1953 |
Reallocation |
45186 |
21A |
Saltley |
17A |
Derby |
|
28/11/1953 |
Reallocation |
45205 |
24A |
Accrington |
24B |
Rose Grove |
|
28/11/1953 |
Reallocation |
45209 |
24A |
Accrington |
24B |
Rose Grove |
|
28/11/1953 |
Reallocation |
45260 |
14B |
Kentish Town |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
28/11/1953 |
Reallocation |
45314 |
5B |
Crewe South |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
28/11/1953 |
Reallocation |
45325 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
2A |
Rugby |
|
28/11/1953 |
Reallocation |
45371 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
2A |
Rugby |
|
28/11/1953 |
Reallocation |
45385 |
5A |
Crewe North |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
28/11/1953 |
Reallocation |
45403 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
2A |
Rugby |
|
26/12/1953 |
Reallocation |
45173 |
63A |
Perth South |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
02/01/1954 |
Reallocation |
44935 |
6J |
Holyhead |
9A |
Longsight |
|
02/01/1954 |
Reallocation |
44971 |
5B |
Crewe South |
2A |
Rugby |
|
02/01/1954 |
Reallocation |
45385 |
6J |
Holyhead |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
02/01/1954 |
Reallocation |
45391 |
2A |
Rugby |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
30/01/1954 |
Reallocation |
45238 |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
30/01/1954 |
Reallocation |
45327 |
9A |
Longsight |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
30/01/1954 |
Reallocation |
45371 |
2A |
Rugby |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
30/01/1954 |
Reallocation |
45373 |
10C |
Patricroft |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
30/01/1954 |
Reallocation |
45385 |
5A |
Crewe North |
9A |
Longsight |
|
27/02/1954 |
Reallocation |
45006 |
5A |
Crewe North |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
27/02/1954 |
Reallocation |
45034 |
2A |
Rugby |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
27/03/1954 |
Reallocation |
44664 |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
21A |
Saltley |
|
27/03/1954 |
Reallocation |
44964 |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
21A |
Saltley |
|
27/03/1954 |
Reallocation |
44971 |
2A |
Rugby |
3A |
Bescot |
|
27/03/1954 |
Reallocation |
45056 |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
|
27/03/1954 |
Reallocation |
45310 |
3A |
Bescot |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
27/03/1954 |
Reallocation |
45373 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
27/03/1954 |
Reallocation |
45407 |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
|
27/03/1954 |
Reallocation |
45437 |
3A |
Bescot |
2A |
Rugby |
|
27/03/1954 |
Reallocation |
45439 |
3A |
Bescot |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
24/04/1954 |
Reallocation |
45005 |
10C |
Patricroft |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
24/04/1954 |
Reallocation |
45325 |
2A |
Rugby |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
24/04/1954 |
Reallocation |
45410 |
10C |
Patricroft |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
12/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
44820 |
64A |
St Margarets |
63D |
Fort William |
|
12/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
44921 |
68A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
63D |
Fort William |
|
12/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
44968 |
30A |
Corkerhill |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
12/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
45011 |
65F |
Grangemouth |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
12/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
45047 |
67C |
Ayr |
63D |
Fort William |
|
12/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
45119 |
65F |
Grangemouth |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
12/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
45245 |
61B |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
63D |
Fort William |
|
12/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
45367 |
61B |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
63D |
Fort William |
|
12/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
45396 |
65F |
Grangemouth |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
12/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
45487 |
64A |
St Margarets |
63D |
Fort William |
|
19/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
44964 |
21A |
Saltley |
21A |
Saltley |
|
19/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
44981 |
14B |
Kentish Town |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
19/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
45078 |
27C |
Southport |
24A |
Accrington |
|
19/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
45093 |
5B |
Crewe South |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
19/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
45129 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
19/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
45146 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
19/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
45180 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
19/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
45264 |
17A |
Derby |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
|
19/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
45297 |
17A |
Derby |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
|
19/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
45311 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
19/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
45316 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
19/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
45385 |
9A |
Longsight |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
19/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
45392 |
11A |
Carnforth |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
19/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
45402 |
3A |
Bescot |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
19/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
45415 |
10C |
Patricroft |
27A |
Bank Hall |
|
17/07/1954 |
Reallocation |
44971 |
3A |
Bescot |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
17/07/1954 |
Reallocation |
45195 |
5B |
Crewe South |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
|
17/07/1954 |
Reallocation |
45238 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
17/07/1954 |
Reallocation |
45402 |
10C |
Patricroft |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
17/07/1954 |
Reallocation |
45416 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
3A |
Bescot |
|
17/07/1954 |
Reallocation |
45447 |
21A |
Saltley |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
07/08/1954 |
Reallocation |
45030 |
66A |
Polmadie |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
07/08/1954 |
Reallocation |
45036 |
66A |
Polmadie |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
07/08/1954 |
Reallocation |
45049 |
67C |
Ayr |
63D |
Fort William |
|
07/08/1954 |
Reallocation |
45175 |
29A |
Perth South |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
14/08/1954 |
Reallocation |
45284 |
19E |
Belle Vue |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
04/09/1954 |
Reallocation |
44973 |
29A |
Perth South |
63D |
Fort William |
|
04/09/1954 |
Reallocation |
45162 |
66A |
Polmadie |
61B |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
|
04/09/1954 |
Reallocation |
45173 |
66A |
Polmadie |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
04/09/1954 |
Reallocation |
45367 |
63D |
Fort William |
61B |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
|
11/09/1954 |
Reallocation |
44774 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
11/09/1954 |
Reallocation |
44777 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
11/09/1954 |
Reallocation |
45335 |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
02/10/1954 |
Reallocation |
44793 |
27A |
Polmadie |
64D |
Carstairs |
|
02/10/1954 |
Reallocation |
44794 |
27A |
Polmadie |
61B |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
|
02/10/1954 |
Reallocation |
45164 |
66A |
Polmadie |
63A |
Perth South |
|
02/10/1954 |
Reallocation |
45367 |
61B |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
63A |
Perth South |
|
09/10/1954 |
Reallocation |
45061 |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
27C |
Southport |
|
09/10/1954 |
Reallocation |
45077 |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
27C |
Southport |
|
09/10/1954 |
Reallocation |
45132 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
09/10/1954 |
Reallocation |
45146 |
10C |
Patricroft |
9A |
Longsight |
|
09/10/1954 |
Reallocation |
45231 |
10C |
Patricroft |
2E |
Northampton |
|
09/10/1954 |
Reallocation |
45247 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
09/10/1954 |
Reallocation |
45264 |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
17A |
Derby |
|
09/10/1954 |
Reallocation |
45292 |
7C |
Holyhead |
2E |
Northampton |
|
09/10/1954 |
Reallocation |
45302 |
10C |
Patricroft |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
09/10/1954 |
Reallocation |
45385 |
6J |
Holyhead |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
30/10/1954 |
Reallocation |
45486 |
64A |
St Margarets |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
06/11/1954 |
Reallocation |
45093 |
6J |
Holyhead |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
06/11/1954 |
Reallocation |
45111 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
06/11/1954 |
Reallocation |
45132 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
3D |
Aston |
|
06/11/1954 |
Reallocation |
45186 |
17A |
Derby |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
|
06/11/1954 |
Reallocation |
45231 |
2E |
Northampton |
3D |
Aston |
|
06/11/1954 |
Reallocation |
45255 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
06/11/1954 |
Reallocation |
45273 |
21A |
Saltley |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
06/11/1954 |
Reallocation |
45274 |
21A |
Saltley |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
06/11/1954 |
Reallocation |
45385 |
5B |
Crewe South |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
06/11/1954 |
Reallocation |
45392 |
6J |
Holyhead |
2E |
Northampton |
|
06/11/1954 |
Reallocation |
45407 |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
17A |
Derby |
|
27/11/1954 |
Reallocation |
44820 |
63D |
Fort William |
63A |
Perth South |
|
27/11/1954 |
Reallocation |
44921 |
63D |
Fort William |
63A |
Perth South |
|
27/11/1954 |
Reallocation |
44972 |
29A |
Perth South |
63D |
Fort William |
|
27/11/1954 |
Reallocation |
44974 |
29A |
Perth South |
63D |
Fort William |
|
27/11/1954 |
Reallocation |
44975 |
29A |
Perth South |
63D |
Fort William |
|
27/11/1954 |
Reallocation |
44976 |
29A |
Perth South |
63D |
Fort William |
|
27/11/1954 |
Reallocation |
44977 |
29A |
Perth South |
63D |
Fort William |
|
27/11/1954 |
Reallocation |
45047 |
63D |
Fort William |
63A |
Perth South |
|
27/11/1954 |
Reallocation |
45049 |
63D |
Fort William |
63A |
Perth South |
|
27/11/1954 |
Reallocation |
45245 |
63D |
Fort William |
63A |
Perth South |
|
27/11/1954 |
Reallocation |
45484 |
66A |
Polmadie |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
27/11/1954 |
Reallocation |
45485 |
27A |
Polmadie |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
27/11/1954 |
Reallocation |
45487 |
63D |
Fort William |
63A |
Perth South |
|
04/12/1954 |
Reallocation |
44821 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
21A |
Saltley |
|
04/12/1954 |
Reallocation |
44859 |
16A |
Nottingham |
21A |
Saltley |
|
04/12/1954 |
Reallocation |
44945 |
17A |
Derby |
21A |
Saltley |
|
04/12/1954 |
Reallocation |
44963 |
17A |
Derby |
21A |
Saltley |
|
04/12/1954 |
Reallocation |
44965 |
17A |
Derby |
21A |
Saltley |
|
04/12/1954 |
Reallocation |
45059 |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
04/12/1954 |
Reallocation |
45147 |
10C |
Patricroft |
1A |
Willesden |
|
04/12/1954 |
Reallocation |
45186 |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
21A |
Saltley |
|
04/12/1954 |
Reallocation |
45218 |
25A |
Wakefield |
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
|
04/12/1954 |
Reallocation |
45261 |
25A |
Wakefield |
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
|
04/12/1954 |
Reallocation |
45272 |
17A |
Derby |
21A |
Saltley |
|
04/12/1954 |
Reallocation |
45278 |
5D |
Stoke |
1A |
Willesden |
|
04/12/1954 |
Reallocation |
45280 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
21A |
Saltley |
|
04/12/1954 |
Reallocation |
45324 |
5D |
Stoke |
1A |
Willesden |
|
04/12/1954 |
Reallocation |
45342 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
21A |
Saltley |
|
04/12/1954 |
Reallocation |
45381 |
5D |
Stoke |
1A |
Willesden |
|
04/12/1954 |
Reallocation |
45407 |
17A |
Derby |
21A |
Saltley |
|
25/12/1954 |
Reallocation |
44956 |
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
25/12/1954 |
Reallocation |
44957 |
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
25/12/1954 |
Reallocation |
44995 |
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
25/12/1954 |
Reallocation |
44996 |
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
25/12/1954 |
Reallocation |
45119 |
65A |
Eastfield |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
25/12/1954 |
Reallocation |
45214 |
65A |
Eastfield |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
25/12/1954 |
Reallocation |
45396 |
65A |
Eastfield |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
25/12/1954 |
Reallocation |
45400 |
65A |
Eastfield |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
01/01/1955 |
Reallocation |
45037 |
10C |
Patricroft |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
01/01/1955 |
Reallocation |
45255 |
6J |
Holyhead |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
01/01/1955 |
Reallocation |
45329 |
10C |
Patricroft |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
29/01/1955 |
Reallocation |
44843 |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
17B |
Burton |
|
29/01/1955 |
Reallocation |
44889 |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
24A |
Accrington |
|
29/01/1955 |
Reallocation |
44981 |
14B |
Kentish Town |
17B |
Burton |
|
29/01/1955 |
Reallocation |
45180 |
6J |
Holyhead |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
29/01/1955 |
Reallocation |
45238 |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
17B |
Burton |
|
29/01/1955 |
Reallocation |
45262 |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
17B |
Burton |
|
29/01/1955 |
Reallocation |
45264 |
17A |
Derby |
17B |
Burton |
|
29/01/1955 |
Reallocation |
45382 |
7C |
Holyhead |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
19/02/1955 |
Reallocation |
45164 |
63A |
Perth South |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
26/02/1955 |
Reallocation |
45004 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
26/02/1955 |
Reallocation |
45020 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
26/02/1955 |
Reallocation |
45195 |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
26/02/1955 |
Reallocation |
45307 |
5A |
Crewe North |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
26/02/1955 |
Reallocation |
45317 |
5B |
Crewe South |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
26/02/1955 |
Reallocation |
45331 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
26/02/1955 |
Reallocation |
45388 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
26/02/1955 |
Reallocation |
45393 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
26/03/1955 |
Reallocation |
44811 |
21B |
Bournville |
17B |
Burton |
|
26/03/1955 |
Reallocation |
44981 |
17B |
Burton |
21B |
Bournville |
|
26/03/1955 |
Reallocation |
45218 |
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
25A |
Wakefield |
|
26/03/1955 |
Reallocation |
45261 |
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
25A |
Wakefield |
|
26/03/1955 |
Reallocation |
45382 |
5A |
Crewe North |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
23/04/1955 |
Reallocation |
44911 |
5A |
Crewe North |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
14/05/1955 |
Reallocation |
44707 |
|
|
63D |
Oban |
|
14/05/1955 |
Reallocation |
44787 |
27A |
Polmadie |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
21/05/1955 |
Reallocation |
44744 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
21/05/1955 |
Reallocation |
44746 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
21/05/1955 |
Reallocation |
45055 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
21/05/1955 |
Reallocation |
45204 |
25A |
Wakefield |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
|
21/05/1955 |
Reallocation |
45273 |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
21/05/1955 |
Reallocation |
45274 |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
21/05/1955 |
Reallocation |
45347 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
09/07/1955 |
Reallocation |
45011 |
65A |
Eastfield |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
16/07/1955 |
Reallocation |
44661 |
|
|
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
|
16/07/1955 |
Reallocation |
44847 |
17A |
Derby |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
|
16/07/1955 |
Reallocation |
45028 |
5B |
Crewe South |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
16/07/1955 |
Reallocation |
45034 |
5B |
Crewe South |
3D |
Aston |
|
16/07/1955 |
Reallocation |
45038 |
5B |
Crewe South |
3D |
Aston |
|
16/07/1955 |
Reallocation |
45070 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
16/07/1955 |
Reallocation |
45077 |
27C |
Southport |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
16/07/1955 |
Reallocation |
45133 |
11A |
Carnforth |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
16/07/1955 |
Reallocation |
45184 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
16/07/1955 |
Reallocation |
45228 |
23A |
Bank Hall |
24B |
Rose Grove |
|
16/07/1955 |
Reallocation |
45229 |
23A |
Bank Hall |
24B |
Rose Grove |
|
16/07/1955 |
Reallocation |
45238 |
17B |
Burton |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
16/07/1955 |
Reallocation |
45248 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
16/07/1955 |
Reallocation |
45329 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
16/07/1955 |
Reallocation |
45382 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
16/07/1955 |
Reallocation |
45416 |
3A |
Bescot |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
|
06/08/1955 |
Reallocation |
44703 |
68A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
61B |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
|
06/08/1955 |
Reallocation |
45213 |
29A |
Perth South |
63B |
Stirling |
|
06/08/1955 |
Reallocation |
45357 |
29A |
Perth South |
63B |
Stirling |
|
06/08/1955 |
Reallocation |
45469 |
29A |
Perth South |
61B |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
|
13/08/1955 |
Reallocation |
45139 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
13/08/1955 |
Reallocation |
45329 |
10C |
Patricroft |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
13/08/1955 |
Reallocation |
45435 |
25X |
|
25F |
Low Moor |
|
10/09/1955 |
Reallocation |
44770 |
5A |
Crewe North |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
10/09/1955 |
Reallocation |
44910 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
10/09/1955 |
Reallocation |
45071 |
5A |
Crewe North |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
10/09/1955 |
Reallocation |
45184 |
6J |
Holyhead |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
10/09/1955 |
Reallocation |
45248 |
6J |
Holyhead |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
10/09/1955 |
Reallocation |
45259 |
10C |
Patricroft |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
10/09/1955 |
Reallocation |
45299 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
10/09/1955 |
Reallocation |
45345 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
10/09/1955 |
Reallocation |
45431 |
2A |
Rugby |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
01/10/1955 |
Reallocation |
45119 |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
63B |
Stirling |
|
01/10/1955 |
Reallocation |
45214 |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
63B |
Stirling |
|
01/10/1955 |
Reallocation |
45396 |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
63B |
Stirling |
|
01/10/1955 |
Reallocation |
45400 |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
63B |
Stirling |
|
01/10/1955 |
Reallocation |
45423 |
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
63B |
Stirling |
|
08/10/1955 |
Reallocation |
44848 |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
17A |
Derby |
|
08/10/1955 |
Reallocation |
44851 |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
17A |
Derby |
|
08/10/1955 |
Reallocation |
44910 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
08/10/1955 |
Reallocation |
45043 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
08/10/1955 |
Reallocation |
45228 |
24B |
Rose Grove |
27C |
Southport |
|
08/10/1955 |
Reallocation |
45260 |
16A |
Nottingham |
17A |
Derby |
|
08/10/1955 |
Reallocation |
45263 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
17A |
Derby |
|
08/10/1955 |
Reallocation |
45282 |
2A |
Rugby |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
08/10/1955 |
Reallocation |
45294 |
10C |
Patricroft |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
|
08/10/1955 |
Reallocation |
45299 |
6J |
Holyhead |
9A |
Longsight |
|
08/10/1955 |
Reallocation |
45316 |
10C |
Patricroft |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
08/10/1955 |
Reallocation |
45441 |
2A |
Rugby |
9A |
Longsight |
|
08/10/1955 |
Reallocation |
45450 |
26G |
Belle Vue |
26B |
Agecroft |
|
29/10/1955 |
Reallocation |
44707 |
63D |
Oban |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
29/10/1955 |
Reallocation |
45011 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
64D |
Carstairs |
|
29/10/1955 |
Reallocation |
45030 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
29/10/1955 |
Reallocation |
45036 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
29/10/1955 |
Reallocation |
45433 |
66B |
Motherwell |
66C |
Hamilton (West) |
|
05/11/1955 |
Reallocation |
44689 |
27A |
Bank Hall |
24A |
Accrington |
|
05/11/1955 |
Reallocation |
44692 |
27A |
Bank Hall |
24A |
Accrington |
|
05/11/1955 |
Reallocation |
45068 |
27A |
Bank Hall |
24A |
Accrington |
|
05/11/1955 |
Reallocation |
45097 |
1A |
Willesden |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
05/11/1955 |
Reallocation |
45137 |
10C |
Patricroft |
15D |
Bedford |
|
05/11/1955 |
Reallocation |
45139 |
10C |
Patricroft |
15D |
Bedford |
|
05/11/1955 |
Reallocation |
45227 |
23A |
Bank Hall |
24A |
Accrington |
|
05/11/1955 |
Reallocation |
45290 |
10C |
Patricroft |
15D |
Bedford |
|
05/11/1955 |
Reallocation |
45415 |
27A |
Bank Hall |
24A |
Accrington |
|
05/11/1955 |
Reallocation |
45435 |
25F |
Low Moor |
25A |
Wakefield |
|
03/12/1955 |
Reallocation |
45133 |
6J |
Holyhead |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
03/12/1955 |
Reallocation |
45428 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
03/12/1955 |
Reallocation |
45444 |
10C |
Patricroft |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
31/12/1955 |
Reallocation |
45057 |
10C |
Patricroft |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
31/12/1955 |
Reallocation |
45188 |
10C |
Patricroft |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
31/12/1955 |
Reallocation |
45312 |
10C |
Patricroft |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
31/12/1955 |
Reallocation |
45426 |
10C |
Patricroft |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
21/01/1956 |
Reallocation |
44995 |
65A |
Eastfield |
68B |
Dumfries |
|
28/01/1956 |
Reallocation |
44827 |
5A |
Crewe North |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
28/01/1956 |
Reallocation |
45037 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
28/01/1956 |
Reallocation |
45180 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
28/01/1956 |
Reallocation |
45238 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
15D |
Bedford |
|
28/01/1956 |
Reallocation |
45288 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
1A |
Willesden |
|
28/01/1956 |
Reallocation |
45342 |
21A |
Saltley |
15D |
Bedford |
|
28/01/1956 |
Reallocation |
45401 |
10C |
Patricroft |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
28/01/1956 |
Reallocation |
45444 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
15D |
Bedford |
|
18/02/1956 |
Reallocation |
44911 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
34A |
Kings Cross |
|
18/02/1956 |
Reallocation |
45166 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
64D |
Carstairs |
|
18/02/1956 |
Reallocation |
45175 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
64D |
Carstairs |
|
25/02/1956 |
Reallocation |
44827 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
25/02/1956 |
Reallocation |
45101 |
24A |
Accrington |
25F |
Low Moor |
|
25/02/1956 |
Reallocation |
45304 |
10C |
Patricroft |
9A |
Longsight |
|
25/02/1956 |
Reallocation |
45310 |
3B |
Bushbury |
2A |
Rugby |
|
25/02/1956 |
Reallocation |
45344 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
25/02/1956 |
Reallocation |
45345 |
6J |
Holyhead |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
25/02/1956 |
Reallocation |
45372 |
2A |
Rugby |
1A |
Willesden |
|
25/02/1956 |
Reallocation |
45429 |
2A |
Rugby |
1A |
Willesden |
|
25/02/1956 |
Reallocation |
45437 |
2A |
Rugby |
1A |
Willesden |
|
17/03/1956 |
Reallocation |
45173 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
64D |
Carstairs |
|
24/03/1956 |
Reallocation |
44714 |
2A |
Rugby |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
24/03/1956 |
Reallocation |
44942 |
3E |
Monument Lane |
3D |
Aston |
|
24/03/1956 |
Reallocation |
45000 |
2A |
Rugby |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
24/03/1956 |
Reallocation |
45002 |
2A |
Rugby |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
24/03/1956 |
Reallocation |
45113 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
9A |
Longsight |
|
24/03/1956 |
Reallocation |
45150 |
2A |
Rugby |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
24/03/1956 |
Reallocation |
45304 |
9A |
Longsight |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
24/03/1956 |
Reallocation |
45310 |
2A |
Rugby |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
24/03/1956 |
Reallocation |
45344 |
5A |
Crewe North |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
|
24/03/1956 |
Reallocation |
45390 |
3E |
Monument Lane |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
24/03/1956 |
Reallocation |
45407 |
21A |
Saltley |
17A |
Derby |
|
21/04/1956 |
Reallocation |
44713 |
2A |
Rugby |
1A |
Willesden |
|
21/04/1956 |
Reallocation |
44773 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
21/04/1956 |
Reallocation |
44803 |
19E |
Belle Vue |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
21/04/1956 |
Reallocation |
44845 |
26G |
Belle Vue |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
21/04/1956 |
Reallocation |
45003 |
1A |
Willesden |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
21/04/1956 |
Reallocation |
45031 |
19E |
Belle Vue |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
21/04/1956 |
Reallocation |
45048 |
5B |
Crewe South |
2A |
Rugby |
|
21/04/1956 |
Reallocation |
45113 |
9A |
Longsight |
2A |
Rugby |
|
21/04/1956 |
Reallocation |
45148 |
5A |
Crewe North |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
21/04/1956 |
Reallocation |
45291 |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
21/04/1956 |
Reallocation |
45378 |
10C |
Patricroft |
2A |
Rugby |
|
21/04/1956 |
Reallocation |
45394 |
2A |
Rugby |
1A |
Willesden |
|
21/04/1956 |
Reallocation |
45429 |
1A |
Willesden |
2A |
Rugby |
|
21/04/1956 |
Reallocation |
45487 |
63A |
Perth South |
2A |
Rugby |
|
19/05/1956 |
Reallocation |
44689 |
24A |
Accrington |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
19/05/1956 |
Reallocation |
44773 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
19/05/1956 |
Reallocation |
44840 |
5A |
Crewe North |
9A |
Longsight |
|
19/05/1956 |
Reallocation |
45046 |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
3A |
Bescot |
|
19/05/1956 |
Reallocation |
45051 |
3E |
Monument Lane |
3A |
Bescot |
|
19/05/1956 |
Reallocation |
45148 |
6J |
Holyhead |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
19/05/1956 |
Reallocation |
45301 |
5A |
Crewe North |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
19/05/1956 |
Reallocation |
45310 |
3B |
Bushbury |
2A |
Rugby |
|
19/05/1956 |
Reallocation |
45447 |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
44689 |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
27A |
Bank Hall |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
44819 |
17A |
Derby |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
44928 |
25A |
Wakefield |
27A |
Bank Hall |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
44971 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
44984 |
14B |
Kentish Town |
15D |
Bedford |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
45014 |
4B |
Northampton |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
45046 |
3A |
Bescot |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
45048 |
2A |
Rugby |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
45101 |
25F |
Low Moor |
25A |
Wakefield |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
45113 |
2A |
Rugby |
9A |
Longsight |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
45185 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5D |
Stoke |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
45201 |
25A |
Wakefield |
27A |
Bank Hall |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
45218 |
25A |
Wakefield |
27C |
Southport |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
45230 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
45238 |
15D |
Bedford |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
45260 |
17A |
Derby |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
45261 |
25A |
Wakefield |
27A |
Bank Hall |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
45267 |
14B |
Kentish Town |
15D |
Bedford |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
45286 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
45289 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
45291 |
11A |
Carnforth |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
45301 |
6J |
Holyhead |
5D |
Stoke |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
45305 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
45310 |
2A |
Rugby |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
45339 |
25A |
Wakefield |
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
45378 |
2A |
Rugby |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
45379 |
2C |
Northampton |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
45403 |
2A |
Rugby |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
45407 |
17A |
Derby |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
45416 |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
3D |
Aston |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
45444 |
15D |
Bedford |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
04/08/1956 |
Reallocation |
45167 |
29A |
Perth South |
61B |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
|
04/08/1956 |
Reallocation |
45174 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
64D |
Carstairs |
|
11/08/1956 |
Reallocation |
44689 |
27A |
Bank Hall |
24A |
Accrington |
|
11/08/1956 |
Reallocation |
44780 |
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
24B |
Rose Grove |
|
11/08/1956 |
Reallocation |
44948 |
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
24B |
Rose Grove |
|
11/08/1956 |
Reallocation |
44949 |
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
24B |
Rose Grove |
|
11/08/1956 |
Reallocation |
44971 |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
11/08/1956 |
Reallocation |
45002 |
5A |
Crewe North |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
11/08/1956 |
Reallocation |
45241 |
11A |
Carnforth |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
11/08/1956 |
Reallocation |
45317 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
|
11/08/1956 |
Reallocation |
45353 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
11/08/1956 |
Reallocation |
45369 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
11/08/1956 |
Reallocation |
45394 |
1A |
Willesden |
2A |
Rugby |
|
11/08/1956 |
Reallocation |
45403 |
5A |
Crewe North |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
|
01/09/1956 |
Reallocation |
45049 |
63A |
Perth South |
63B |
Stirling |
|
08/09/1956 |
Reallocation |
44833 |
2A |
Rugby |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
08/09/1956 |
Reallocation |
44916 |
1A |
Willesden |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
08/09/1956 |
Reallocation |
45057 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
08/09/1956 |
Reallocation |
45076 |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
08/09/1956 |
Reallocation |
45101 |
25A |
Wakefield |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
08/09/1956 |
Reallocation |
45210 |
25F |
Low Moor |
27A |
Bank Hall |
|
08/09/1956 |
Reallocation |
45341 |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
08/09/1956 |
Reallocation |
45402 |
5A |
Crewe North |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
08/09/1956 |
Reallocation |
45435 |
25A |
Wakefield |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
06/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
44819 |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
17A |
Derby |
|
06/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
44833 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
2A |
Rugby |
|
06/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
44938 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
9A |
Longsight |
|
06/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
45014 |
10C |
Patricroft |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
06/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
45045 |
7C |
Holyhead |
51B |
Newport (Teeside) |
|
06/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
45046 |
10C |
Patricroft |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
06/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
45050 |
2A |
Rugby |
2E |
Northampton |
|
06/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
45142 |
10C |
Patricroft |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
06/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
45182 |
10C |
Patricroft |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
06/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
45187 |
2A |
Rugby |
1A |
Willesden |
|
06/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
45260 |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
17A |
Derby |
|
06/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
45286 |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
06/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
45289 |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
06/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
45291 |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
06/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
45301 |
5D |
Stoke |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
06/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
45305 |
6J |
Holyhead |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
06/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
45311 |
6J |
Holyhead |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
06/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
45317 |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
06/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
45328 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
06/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
45375 |
2A |
Rugby |
1A |
Willesden |
|
06/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
45394 |
2A |
Rugby |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
06/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
45403 |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
3D |
Aston |
|
06/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
45430 |
2A |
Rugby |
1A |
Willesden |
|
06/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
45441 |
9A |
Longsight |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
03/11/1956 |
Reallocation |
44868 |
7C |
Holyhead |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
03/11/1956 |
Reallocation |
44916 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
12A |
Preston |
|
03/11/1956 |
Reallocation |
45000 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
03/11/1956 |
Reallocation |
45003 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
03/11/1956 |
Reallocation |
45033 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
03/11/1956 |
Reallocation |
45033 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
03/11/1956 |
Reallocation |
45034 |
3D |
Aston |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
03/11/1956 |
Reallocation |
45113 |
9A |
Longsight |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
03/11/1956 |
Reallocation |
45113 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
03/11/1956 |
Reallocation |
45113 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
03/11/1956 |
Reallocation |
45114 |
3D |
Aston |
3D |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
03/11/1956 |
Reallocation |
45114 |
3D |
Aston |
3D |
Aston |
|
03/11/1956 |
Reallocation |
45182 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
03/11/1956 |
Reallocation |
45241 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
03/11/1956 |
Reallocation |
45302 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
03/11/1956 |
Reallocation |
45308 |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
03/11/1956 |
Reallocation |
45328 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
03/11/1956 |
Reallocation |
45353 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
03/11/1956 |
Reallocation |
45390 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
03/11/1956 |
Reallocation |
45403 |
3D |
Aston |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
01/12/1956 |
Reallocation |
44855 |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
01/12/1956 |
Reallocation |
44864 |
7C |
Holyhead |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
01/12/1956 |
Reallocation |
44865 |
7C |
Holyhead |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
01/12/1956 |
Reallocation |
44893 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
27A |
Bank Hall |
|
01/12/1956 |
Reallocation |
44916 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
1A |
Willesden |
|
01/12/1956 |
Reallocation |
44966 |
21A |
Saltley |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
01/12/1956 |
Reallocation |
45040 |
21A |
Saltley |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
01/12/1956 |
Reallocation |
45077 |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
27A |
Bank Hall |
|
01/12/1956 |
Reallocation |
45271 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
6H |
Bangor |
|
01/12/1956 |
Reallocation |
45280 |
21A |
Saltley |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
01/12/1956 |
Reallocation |
45385 |
6J |
Holyhead |
1A |
Willesden |
|
01/12/1956 |
Reallocation |
45437 |
1A |
Willesden |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
22/12/1956 |
Reallocation |
45119 |
63B |
Stirling |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
22/12/1956 |
Reallocation |
45358 |
31B |
Stirling |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
29/12/1956 |
Reallocation |
44678 |
6J |
Holyhead |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
29/12/1956 |
Reallocation |
44714 |
6J |
Holyhead |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
29/12/1956 |
Reallocation |
44806 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
29/12/1956 |
Reallocation |
44812 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
29/12/1956 |
Reallocation |
44855 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
29/12/1956 |
Reallocation |
44893 |
27A |
Bank Hall |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
29/12/1956 |
Reallocation |
45234 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
26B |
Agecroft |
|
29/12/1956 |
Reallocation |
45271 |
6H |
Bangor |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
29/12/1956 |
Reallocation |
45304 |
10C |
Patricroft |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
29/12/1956 |
Reallocation |
45382 |
6J |
Holyhead |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
29/12/1956 |
Reallocation |
45385 |
1A |
Willesden |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
26/01/1957 |
Reallocation |
44663 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
26/01/1957 |
Reallocation |
45003 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
26/01/1957 |
Reallocation |
45077 |
27A |
Bank Hall |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
26/01/1957 |
Reallocation |
45221 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
15D |
Bedford |
|
26/01/1957 |
Reallocation |
45257 |
5D |
Stoke |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
26/01/1957 |
Reallocation |
45274 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
26/01/1957 |
Reallocation |
45304 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
26/01/1957 |
Reallocation |
45390 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
26/01/1957 |
Reallocation |
45429 |
2A |
Rugby |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
26/01/1957 |
Reallocation |
45441 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
23/02/1957 |
Reallocation |
44929 |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
26B |
Agecroft |
|
23/02/1957 |
Reallocation |
44932 |
24A |
Accrington |
26B |
Agecroft |
|
23/02/1957 |
Reallocation |
45000 |
5B |
Crewe South |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
23/02/1957 |
Reallocation |
45041 |
5B |
Crewe South |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
23/02/1957 |
Reallocation |
45073 |
5B |
Crewe South |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
23/02/1957 |
Reallocation |
45185 |
5D |
Stoke |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
23/02/1957 |
Reallocation |
45223 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
26B |
Agecroft |
|
23/02/1957 |
Reallocation |
45261 |
27A |
Bank Hall |
26B |
Agecroft |
|
23/02/1957 |
Reallocation |
45290 |
15D |
Bedford |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
23/02/1957 |
Reallocation |
45353 |
5B |
Crewe South |
1A |
Willesden |
|
23/02/1957 |
Reallocation |
45385 |
6J |
Holyhead |
3D |
Aston |
|
23/03/1957 |
Reallocation |
44665 |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
17F |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
23/03/1957 |
Reallocation |
45114 |
3D |
Aston |
3A |
Bescot |
|
23/03/1957 |
Reallocation |
45116 |
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
26B |
Agecroft |
|
23/03/1957 |
Reallocation |
45385 |
3D |
Aston |
3A |
Bescot |
|
23/03/1957 |
Reallocation |
45464 |
29A |
Perth South |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
13/04/1957 |
Reallocation |
44702 |
|
|
65A |
Eastfield |
|
13/04/1957 |
Reallocation |
44967 |
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
20/04/1957 |
Reallocation |
44966 |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
21A |
Saltley |
|
20/04/1957 |
Reallocation |
45040 |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
21A |
Saltley |
|
20/04/1957 |
Reallocation |
45154 |
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
20/04/1957 |
Reallocation |
45156 |
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
20/04/1957 |
Reallocation |
45189 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5D |
Stoke |
|
20/04/1957 |
Reallocation |
45280 |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
21A |
Saltley |
|
11/05/1957 |
Reallocation |
44970 |
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
11/05/1957 |
Reallocation |
45389 |
29A |
Perth South |
63B |
Stirling |
|
18/05/1957 |
Reallocation |
44743 |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
17A |
Derby |
|
18/05/1957 |
Reallocation |
44744 |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
17A |
Derby |
|
18/05/1957 |
Reallocation |
44745 |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
17A |
Derby |
|
18/05/1957 |
Reallocation |
44911 |
34A |
Kings Cross |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
08/06/1957 |
Reallocation |
45007 |
68A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
08/06/1957 |
Reallocation |
45245 |
63A |
Perth South |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
16/06/1957 |
Reallocation |
44746 |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
16/06/1957 |
Reallocation |
44807 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
16/06/1957 |
Reallocation |
44839 |
17A |
Derby |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
|
16/06/1957 |
Reallocation |
45260 |
17A |
Derby |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
|
16/06/1957 |
Reallocation |
45263 |
17A |
Derby |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
16/06/1957 |
Reallocation |
45426 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
06/07/1957 |
Reallocation |
45245 |
64A |
St Margarets |
64D |
Carstairs |
|
10/08/1957 |
Reallocation |
44678 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
10/08/1957 |
Reallocation |
44714 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
10/08/1957 |
Reallocation |
44747 |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
17A |
Derby |
|
10/08/1957 |
Reallocation |
44770 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
10/08/1957 |
Reallocation |
44807 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5D |
Stoke |
|
10/08/1957 |
Reallocation |
44837 |
2A |
Rugby |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
|
10/08/1957 |
Reallocation |
44904 |
11A |
Carnforth |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
10/08/1957 |
Reallocation |
44911 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
3A |
Bescot |
|
10/08/1957 |
Reallocation |
44944 |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
19C |
Canklow |
|
10/08/1957 |
Reallocation |
45021 |
2C |
Northampton |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
10/08/1957 |
Reallocation |
45033 |
5A |
Crewe North |
9A |
Longsight |
|
10/08/1957 |
Reallocation |
45067 |
5B |
Crewe South |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
|
10/08/1957 |
Reallocation |
45071 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
10/08/1957 |
Reallocation |
45073 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
3D |
Aston |
|
10/08/1957 |
Reallocation |
45106 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
10/08/1957 |
Reallocation |
45113 |
5A |
Crewe North |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
|
10/08/1957 |
Reallocation |
45130 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
3D |
Aston |
|
10/08/1957 |
Reallocation |
45133 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
10/08/1957 |
Reallocation |
45150 |
5A |
Crewe North |
9A |
Longsight |
|
10/08/1957 |
Reallocation |
45188 |
5B |
Crewe South |
9A |
Longsight |
|
10/08/1957 |
Reallocation |
45249 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
3D |
Aston |
|
10/08/1957 |
Reallocation |
45303 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
10/08/1957 |
Reallocation |
45307 |
1E |
Bletchley |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
|
10/08/1957 |
Reallocation |
45328 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
|
10/08/1957 |
Reallocation |
45403 |
3B |
Bushbury |
9A |
Longsight |
|
10/08/1957 |
Reallocation |
45419 |
2A |
Rugby |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
|
10/08/1957 |
Reallocation |
45424 |
10C |
Patricroft |
3D |
Aston |
|
10/08/1957 |
Reallocation |
45437 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
10/08/1957 |
Reallocation |
45441 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
10/08/1957 |
Reallocation |
45454 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
10B |
Preston |
|
31/08/1957 |
Reallocation |
45433 |
66C |
Hamilton (West) |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
07/09/1957 |
Reallocation |
44663 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
07/09/1957 |
Reallocation |
44834 |
5B |
Crewe South |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
07/09/1957 |
Reallocation |
44911 |
3A |
Bescot |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
07/09/1957 |
Reallocation |
45002 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
07/09/1957 |
Reallocation |
45067 |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
07/09/1957 |
Reallocation |
45073 |
3D |
Aston |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
07/09/1957 |
Reallocation |
45113 |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
07/09/1957 |
Reallocation |
45130 |
3D |
Aston |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
07/09/1957 |
Reallocation |
45147 |
1A |
Willesden |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
07/09/1957 |
Reallocation |
45150 |
9A |
Longsight |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
07/09/1957 |
Reallocation |
45188 |
9A |
Longsight |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
07/09/1957 |
Reallocation |
45195 |
1E |
Bletchley |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
07/09/1957 |
Reallocation |
45238 |
14B |
Kentish Town |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
07/09/1957 |
Reallocation |
45249 |
3D |
Aston |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
07/09/1957 |
Reallocation |
45271 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
07/09/1957 |
Reallocation |
45307 |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
07/09/1957 |
Reallocation |
45308 |
3E |
Monument Lane |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
07/09/1957 |
Reallocation |
45328 |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
07/09/1957 |
Reallocation |
45424 |
3D |
Aston |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
05/10/1957 |
Reallocation |
44681 |
6J |
Holyhead |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
05/10/1957 |
Reallocation |
44760 |
9A |
Longsight |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
05/10/1957 |
Reallocation |
44807 |
5D |
Stoke |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
05/10/1957 |
Reallocation |
44824 |
25A |
Wakefield |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
05/10/1957 |
Reallocation |
44827 |
5B |
Crewe South |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
05/10/1957 |
Reallocation |
44839 |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
17A |
Derby |
|
05/10/1957 |
Reallocation |
44840 |
9A |
Longsight |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
05/10/1957 |
Reallocation |
44904 |
6J |
Holyhead |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
05/10/1957 |
Reallocation |
44935 |
9A |
Longsight |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
05/10/1957 |
Reallocation |
44938 |
9A |
Longsight |
2A |
Rugby |
|
05/10/1957 |
Reallocation |
45002 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
05/10/1957 |
Reallocation |
45021 |
10C |
Patricroft |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
05/10/1957 |
Reallocation |
45033 |
9A |
Longsight |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
05/10/1957 |
Reallocation |
45062 |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
17A |
Derby |
|
05/10/1957 |
Reallocation |
45070 |
10C |
Patricroft |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
05/10/1957 |
Reallocation |
45106 |
10C |
Patricroft |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
05/10/1957 |
Reallocation |
45147 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
1A |
Willesden |
|
05/10/1957 |
Reallocation |
45150 |
3E |
Monument Lane |
9A |
Longsight |
|
05/10/1957 |
Reallocation |
45189 |
5D |
Stoke |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
05/10/1957 |
Reallocation |
45195 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
05/10/1957 |
Reallocation |
45260 |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
17A |
Derby |
|
05/10/1957 |
Reallocation |
45271 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
05/10/1957 |
Reallocation |
45308 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
05/10/1957 |
Reallocation |
45397 |
3D |
Aston |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
05/10/1957 |
Reallocation |
45403 |
9A |
Longsight |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
05/10/1957 |
Reallocation |
45437 |
6J |
Holyhead |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
26/10/1957 |
Reallocation |
44908 |
65A |
Eastfield |
67D |
Ardrossan |
|
26/10/1957 |
Reallocation |
45117 |
63A |
Perth South |
60A |
Inverness |
|
26/10/1957 |
Reallocation |
45460 |
63A |
Perth South |
60A |
Inverness |
|
30/11/1957 |
Reallocation |
44806 |
14B |
Kentish Town |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
30/11/1957 |
Reallocation |
44809 |
17A |
Derby |
17F |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
30/11/1957 |
Reallocation |
44810 |
21A |
Saltley |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
30/11/1957 |
Reallocation |
44821 |
21A |
Saltley |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
30/11/1957 |
Reallocation |
44827 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
30/11/1957 |
Reallocation |
45003 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
30/11/1957 |
Reallocation |
45006 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
17A |
Derby |
|
30/11/1957 |
Reallocation |
45021 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
30/11/1957 |
Reallocation |
45073 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
30/11/1957 |
Reallocation |
45111 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
30/11/1957 |
Reallocation |
45188 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
30/11/1957 |
Reallocation |
45253 |
14B |
Kentish Town |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
30/11/1957 |
Reallocation |
45305 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
28/12/1957 |
Reallocation |
45000 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
18/01/1958 |
Reallocation |
44908 |
67D |
Ardrossan |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
18/01/1958 |
Reallocation |
45155 |
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
25/01/1958 |
Reallocation |
45333 |
8E |
Brunswick |
1A |
Willesden |
|
25/01/1958 |
Reallocation |
45344 |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
25/01/1958 |
Reallocation |
45416 |
3D |
Aston |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
22/02/1958 |
Reallocation |
45201 |
27A |
Bank Hall |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
22/02/1958 |
Reallocation |
45263 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
22/02/1958 |
Reallocation |
45344 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
|
22/02/1958 |
Reallocation |
45416 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
3D |
Aston |
|
22/03/1958 |
Reallocation |
44871 |
5D |
Stoke |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
22/03/1958 |
Reallocation |
45149 |
5D |
Stoke |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
22/03/1958 |
Reallocation |
45299 |
9A |
Longsight |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
22/03/1958 |
Reallocation |
45416 |
3D |
Aston |
9A |
Longsight |
|
12/04/1958 |
Reallocation |
45155 |
64A |
St Margarets |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
19/04/1958 |
Reallocation |
45072 |
11A |
Carnforth |
2A |
Rugby |
|
19/04/1958 |
Reallocation |
45148 |
5A |
Crewe North |
2A |
Rugby |
|
19/04/1958 |
Reallocation |
45240 |
5A |
Crewe North |
2A |
Rugby |
|
17/05/1958 |
Reallocation |
44661 |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
17/05/1958 |
Reallocation |
44802 |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
17/05/1958 |
Reallocation |
44830 |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
14D |
Neasden |
|
17/05/1958 |
Reallocation |
44847 |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
14D |
Neasden |
|
17/05/1958 |
Reallocation |
44858 |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
17/05/1958 |
Reallocation |
44944 |
19C |
Canklow |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
17/05/1958 |
Reallocation |
44986 |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
17/05/1958 |
Reallocation |
45056 |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
17/05/1958 |
Reallocation |
45280 |
21A |
Saltley |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
17/05/1958 |
Reallocation |
45297 |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
17/05/1958 |
Reallocation |
45299 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
17/05/1958 |
Reallocation |
45300 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
44688 |
27A |
Bank Hall |
8E |
Northwich |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
44690 |
27A |
Bank Hall |
17A |
Derby |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
44691 |
27A |
Bank Hall |
17A |
Derby |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
44713 |
1A |
Willesden |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
44743 |
17A |
Derby |
27A |
Bank Hall |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
44744 |
17A |
Derby |
27A |
Bank Hall |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
44745 |
17A |
Derby |
27A |
Bank Hall |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
44746 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
9A |
Longsight |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
44747 |
17A |
Derby |
9A |
Longsight |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
44770 |
5A |
Crewe North |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
44807 |
3E |
Monument Lane |
3D |
Aston |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
44821 |
14B |
Kentish Town |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
44827 |
5A |
Crewe North |
9A |
Longsight |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
44873 |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
3A |
Bescot |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
44917 |
71G |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
44941 |
9A |
Longsight |
17A |
Derby |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
45004 |
1E |
Bletchley |
9A |
Longsight |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
45032 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
45041 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
26F |
Patricroft |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
45092 |
11A |
Carnforth |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
45093 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5D |
Stoke |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
45111 |
5A |
Crewe North |
9A |
Longsight |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
45180 |
5B |
Crewe South |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
45184 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
26F |
Patricroft |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
45186 |
21A |
Saltley |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
45254 |
5A |
Crewe North |
9A |
Longsight |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
45257 |
3E |
Monument Lane |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
45280 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
21A |
Saltley |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
45302 |
5A |
Crewe North |
9A |
Longsight |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
45305 |
5A |
Crewe North |
9A |
Longsight |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
45311 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5D |
Stoke |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
45344 |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
3A |
Bescot |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
45382 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
45395 |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
45403 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
45409 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
26F |
Patricroft |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
45416 |
9A |
Longsight |
17A |
Derby |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
45419 |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
3A |
Bescot |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
45426 |
5A |
Crewe North |
9A |
Longsight |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
45429 |
3E |
Monument Lane |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
45440 |
22C |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
05/07/1958 |
Reallocation |
45458 |
29A |
Perth South |
60A |
Inverness |
|
05/07/1958 |
Reallocation |
45459 |
29A |
Perth South |
60A |
Inverness |
|
12/07/1958 |
Reallocation |
45025 |
1A |
Willesden |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
12/07/1958 |
Reallocation |
45072 |
2A |
Rugby |
11A |
Barrow in Furness |
|
12/07/1958 |
Reallocation |
45089 |
1A |
Willesden |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
12/07/1958 |
Reallocation |
45148 |
2A |
Rugby |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
12/07/1958 |
Reallocation |
45240 |
2A |
Rugby |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
02/08/1958 |
Reallocation |
45007 |
64C |
Dalry Road |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
02/08/1958 |
Reallocation |
45161 |
64C |
Dalry Road |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
09/08/1958 |
Reallocation |
44688 |
8E |
Northwich |
17A |
Derby |
|
09/08/1958 |
Reallocation |
44892 |
11A |
Carnforth |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
09/08/1958 |
Reallocation |
44917 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
09/08/1958 |
Reallocation |
45420 |
10C |
Patricroft |
2A |
Rugby |
|
06/09/1958 |
Reallocation |
45072 |
11A |
Barrow in Furness |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
06/09/1958 |
Reallocation |
45420 |
2A |
Rugby |
26F |
Patricroft |
|
06/09/1958 |
Reallocation |
45431 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
1A |
Willesden |
|
04/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
44664 |
21A |
Saltley |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
04/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
44807 |
3D |
Aston |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
04/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
44839 |
17A |
Derby |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
04/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
44841 |
21A |
Saltley |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
04/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
44842 |
21A |
Saltley |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
04/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
44892 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
04/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
44917 |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
04/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
45004 |
9A |
Longsight |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
04/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
45038 |
3D |
Aston |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
04/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
45041 |
26F |
Patricroft |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
04/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
45042 |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
04/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
45052 |
3D |
Aston |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
04/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
45089 |
6J |
Holyhead |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
04/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
45092 |
6J |
Holyhead |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
04/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
45093 |
5D |
Stoke |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
04/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
45180 |
6J |
Holyhead |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
04/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
45184 |
26F |
Patricroft |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
04/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
45250 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
04/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
45254 |
9A |
Longsight |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
04/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
45256 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
04/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
45257 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
04/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
45305 |
9A |
Longsight |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
04/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
45311 |
5D |
Stoke |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
04/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
45348 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
04/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
45409 |
26F |
Patricroft |
2E |
Northampton |
|
11/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
45243 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
11/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
45256 |
5A |
Crewe North |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
25/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
45125 |
29A |
Perth South |
63B |
Stirling |
|
25/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
45458 |
60A |
Inverness |
63A |
Perth South |
|
25/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
45459 |
60A |
Inverness |
63A |
Perth South |
|
08/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
44841 |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
21A |
Saltley |
|
08/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
45215 |
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
08/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
45222 |
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
2E |
Northampton |
|
08/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
45237 |
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
2E |
Northampton |
|
08/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
45339 |
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
08/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
45340 |
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
24K |
Preston |
|
08/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
45344 |
3A |
Bescot |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
15/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
44770 |
6J |
Holyhead |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
15/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
44839 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
17A |
Derby |
|
15/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
44894 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
27A |
Bank Hall |
|
15/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
45297 |
6J |
Holyhead |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
22/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
44712 |
2A |
Rugby |
2E |
Northampton |
|
22/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
45142 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
22/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
45147 |
1A |
Willesden |
2E |
Northampton |
|
22/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
45353 |
1A |
Willesden |
3D |
Aston |
|
22/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
45403 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
22/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
45430 |
1A |
Willesden |
3D |
Aston |
|
22/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
45458 |
63A |
Perth South |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
22/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
45459 |
63A |
Perth South |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
29/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
44842 |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
21A |
Saltley |
|
29/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
45146 |
9A |
Longsight |
1B |
Camden |
|
06/12/1958 |
Reallocation |
44664 |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
21A |
Saltley |
|
13/12/1958 |
Reallocation |
44821 |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
20/12/1958 |
Reallocation |
45125 |
63B |
Stirling |
68C |
Stranraer |
|
27/12/1958 |
Reallocation |
45146 |
1B |
Camden |
9A |
Longsight |
|
27/12/1958 |
Reallocation |
45431 |
1A |
Willesden |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
03/01/1959 |
Reallocation |
45186 |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
21A |
Saltley |
|
10/01/1959 |
Reallocation |
44667 |
|
|
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
10/01/1959 |
Reallocation |
44690 |
17A |
Derby |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
10/01/1959 |
Reallocation |
44811 |
17B |
Burton |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
10/01/1959 |
Reallocation |
44815 |
17A |
Derby |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
10/01/1959 |
Reallocation |
44816 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
10/01/1959 |
Reallocation |
44843 |
17B |
Burton |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
10/01/1959 |
Reallocation |
44848 |
17A |
Derby |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
10/01/1959 |
Reallocation |
44941 |
17A |
Derby |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
10/01/1959 |
Reallocation |
45006 |
17A |
Derby |
14D |
Neasden |
|
10/01/1959 |
Reallocation |
45062 |
17A |
Derby |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
10/01/1959 |
Reallocation |
45146 |
9A |
Longsight |
2A |
Rugby |
|
10/01/1959 |
Reallocation |
45260 |
17A |
Derby |
14D |
Neasden |
|
10/01/1959 |
Reallocation |
45262 |
17B |
Burton |
27F |
Brunswick |
|
10/01/1959 |
Reallocation |
45264 |
17B |
Burton |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
07/02/1959 |
Reallocation |
45317 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
07/02/1959 |
Reallocation |
45494 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
14/02/1959 |
Reallocation |
44747 |
9A |
Longsight |
26F |
Patricroft |
|
14/02/1959 |
Reallocation |
44894 |
27A |
Bank Hall |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
14/02/1959 |
Reallocation |
45112 |
68A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
14/02/1959 |
Reallocation |
45307 |
1E |
Bletchley |
2E |
Northampton |
|
14/02/1959 |
Reallocation |
45440 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
26F |
Patricroft |
|
14/02/1959 |
Reallocation |
45444 |
14B |
Kentish Town |
27F |
Brunswick |
|
21/02/1959 |
Reallocation |
44691 |
17A |
Derby |
14D |
Neasden |
|
21/02/1959 |
Reallocation |
44819 |
17A |
Derby |
14D |
Neasden |
|
21/02/1959 |
Reallocation |
45215 |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
14D |
Neasden |
|
21/02/1959 |
Reallocation |
45281 |
68A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
21/02/1959 |
Reallocation |
45317 |
24L |
Carnforth |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
21/02/1959 |
Reallocation |
45416 |
17A |
Derby |
14D |
Neasden |
|
21/02/1959 |
Reallocation |
45494 |
24L |
Carnforth |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
14/03/1959 |
Reallocation |
45456 |
29A |
Perth South |
67D |
Ardrossan |
|
14/03/1959 |
Reallocation |
45457 |
29A |
Perth South |
67D |
Ardrossan |
|
21/03/1959 |
Reallocation |
44824 |
5B |
Crewe South |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
28/03/1959 |
Reallocation |
45440 |
26F |
Patricroft |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
04/04/1959 |
Reallocation |
44842 |
21A |
Saltley |
27F |
Brunswick |
|
11/04/1959 |
Reallocation |
45301 |
5B |
Crewe South |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
18/04/1959 |
Reallocation |
45096 |
10B |
Preston |
26F |
Patricroft |
|
25/04/1959 |
Reallocation |
45428 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
55C |
Farnley Junction |
|
02/05/1959 |
Reallocation |
45017 |
11A |
Carnforth |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
02/05/1959 |
Reallocation |
45019 |
11A |
Carnforth |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
02/05/1959 |
Reallocation |
45327 |
11A |
Carnforth |
3D |
Aston |
|
09/05/1959 |
Reallocation |
44747 |
26F |
Patricroft |
9A |
Longsight |
|
30/05/1959 |
Reallocation |
44664 |
21A |
Saltley |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
30/05/1959 |
Reallocation |
44714 |
5A |
Crewe North |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
30/05/1959 |
Reallocation |
44780 |
24B |
Rose Grove |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
30/05/1959 |
Reallocation |
44905 |
11A |
Carnforth |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
44682 |
5A |
Crewe North |
24K |
Preston |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
44714 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
44758 |
5A |
Crewe North |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
44760 |
5A |
Crewe North |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
44766 |
5A |
Crewe North |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
44771 |
1A |
Willesden |
2A |
Rugby |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
44842 |
27F |
Brunswick |
27F |
Brunswick |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
44842 |
27F |
Brunswick |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
44868 |
5B |
Crewe South |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
44905 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
44917 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
44935 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
44939 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
44981 |
21B |
Bournville |
21A |
Saltley |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
45000 |
5B |
Crewe South |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
45002 |
5B |
Crewe South |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
45003 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5D |
Stoke |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
45042 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
45044 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5D |
Stoke |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
45051 |
3A |
Bescot |
3D |
Aston |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
45060 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5D |
Stoke |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
45108 |
5B |
Crewe South |
9A |
Longsight |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
45112 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
45113 |
5A |
Crewe North |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
45114 |
3A |
Bescot |
3D |
Aston |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
45237 |
2E |
Northampton |
6E |
Chester West |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
45248 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
24K |
Preston |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
45289 |
5A |
Crewe North |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
45324 |
1A |
Willesden |
2A |
Rugby |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
45329 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
45333 |
1A |
Willesden |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
45372 |
1A |
Willesden |
9A |
Longsight |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
45373 |
5A |
Crewe North |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
45395 |
3B |
Bushbury |
3D |
Aston |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
45451 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
24K |
Preston |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
45494 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
27/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
44939 |
24L |
Carnforth |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
27/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
45252 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
26F |
Patricroft |
|
27/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
45255 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
26F |
Patricroft |
|
27/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
45409 |
2E |
Northampton |
26F |
Patricroft |
|
27/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
45431 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
04/07/1959 |
Reallocation |
45053 |
63A |
Perth South |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
04/07/1959 |
Reallocation |
45195 |
1E |
Bletchley |
26F |
Patricroft |
|
04/07/1959 |
Reallocation |
45452 |
29A |
Perth South |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
04/07/1959 |
Reallocation |
45456 |
67D |
Ardrossan |
67C |
Ayr |
|
04/07/1959 |
Reallocation |
45457 |
67D |
Ardrossan |
67C |
Ayr |
|
11/07/1959 |
Reallocation |
44681 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
18/07/1959 |
Reallocation |
45390 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/08/1959 |
Reallocation |
45125 |
68C |
Stranraer |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
08/08/1959 |
Reallocation |
44775 |
21A |
Saltley |
27F |
Brunswick |
|
15/08/1959 |
Reallocation |
44905 |
24L |
Carnforth |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
15/08/1959 |
Reallocation |
44964 |
21A |
Saltley |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
15/08/1959 |
Reallocation |
45348 |
5A |
Crewe North |
24K |
Preston |
|
22/08/1959 |
Reallocation |
44888 |
21A |
Saltley |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
22/08/1959 |
Reallocation |
45114 |
3D |
Aston |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
29/08/1959 |
Reallocation |
45281 |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
91W |
To Western Region / GWR |
|
05/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
45114 |
5A |
Crewe North |
3D |
Aston |
|
05/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
45132 |
3D |
Aston |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
12/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
44824 |
56F |
Low Moor |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
12/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
44827 |
9A |
Longsight |
24K |
Preston |
|
12/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
44844 |
3D |
Aston |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
12/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
44905 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
12/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
45003 |
5D |
Stoke |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
12/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
45065 |
3D |
Aston |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
12/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
45108 |
9A |
Longsight |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
12/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
45109 |
9A |
Longsight |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
12/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
45150 |
9A |
Longsight |
24K |
Preston |
|
12/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
45223 |
26B |
Agecroft |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
12/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
45281 |
91W |
To Western Region / GWR |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
12/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
45302 |
9A |
Longsight |
24K |
Preston |
|
12/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
45348 |
24K |
Preston |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
12/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
45370 |
3D |
Aston |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
12/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
45372 |
9A |
Longsight |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
19/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
44868 |
6J |
Holyhead |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
19/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
44935 |
6J |
Holyhead |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
19/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
45000 |
6J |
Holyhead |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
19/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
45002 |
6J |
Holyhead |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
19/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
45042 |
6J |
Holyhead |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
19/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
45146 |
2A |
Rugby |
1A |
Willesden |
|
19/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
45237 |
6E |
Chester West |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
19/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
45289 |
6J |
Holyhead |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
19/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
45324 |
2A |
Rugby |
1A |
Willesden |
|
26/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
44888 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
21A |
Saltley |
|
26/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
45146 |
1A |
Willesden |
2A |
Rugby |
|
26/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
45324 |
1A |
Willesden |
2A |
Rugby |
|
26/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
45456 |
67C |
Ayr |
67D |
Ardrossan |
|
26/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
45457 |
67C |
Ayr |
67D |
Ardrossan |
|
03/10/1959 |
Reallocation |
44678 |
5A |
Crewe North |
2A |
Rugby |
|
03/10/1959 |
Reallocation |
44862 |
2A |
Rugby |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
03/10/1959 |
Reallocation |
45291 |
11A |
Carnforth |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
03/10/1959 |
Reallocation |
45370 |
24L |
Carnforth |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
03/10/1959 |
Reallocation |
45494 |
24L |
Carnforth |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
10/10/1959 |
Reallocation |
44775 |
27F |
Brunswick |
21A |
Saltley |
|
10/10/1959 |
Reallocation |
45116 |
26B |
Agecroft |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
17/10/1959 |
Reallocation |
45234 |
26B |
Agecroft |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
24/10/1959 |
Reallocation |
44932 |
26B |
Agecroft |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
24/10/1959 |
Reallocation |
45251 |
30A |
Corkerhill |
67D |
Ardrossan |
|
24/10/1959 |
Reallocation |
45450 |
26B |
Agecroft |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
24/10/1959 |
Reallocation |
45490 |
30A |
Corkerhill |
67D |
Ardrossan |
|
07/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
44678 |
2A |
Rugby |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
07/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
44760 |
3E |
Monument Lane |
2E |
Northampton |
|
07/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
44780 |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
07/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
44862 |
5A |
Crewe North |
2A |
Rugby |
|
07/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
44932 |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
07/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
45001 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
07/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
45037 |
11A |
Carnforth |
9A |
Longsight |
|
07/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
45046 |
11A |
Carnforth |
9A |
Longsight |
|
07/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
45065 |
3E |
Monument Lane |
3D |
Aston |
|
07/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
45116 |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
07/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
45130 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
07/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
45184 |
1E |
Bletchley |
2A |
Rugby |
|
07/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
45223 |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
07/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
45234 |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
07/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
45236 |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
07/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
45237 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
07/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
45256 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
07/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
45276 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
07/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
45339 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
9A |
Longsight |
|
07/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
45340 |
24K |
Preston |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
07/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
45343 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
07/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
45380 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
07/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
45398 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
07/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
45410 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
07/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
45431 |
24L |
Carnforth |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
07/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
45450 |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
07/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
45451 |
24K |
Preston |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
21/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
44663 |
14B |
Kentish Town |
21A |
Saltley |
|
21/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
44688 |
17A |
Derby |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
21/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
44810 |
14B |
Kentish Town |
21A |
Saltley |
|
21/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
44812 |
14B |
Kentish Town |
21A |
Saltley |
|
21/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
44818 |
17A |
Derby |
21A |
Saltley |
|
21/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
44825 |
14B |
Kentish Town |
21A |
Saltley |
|
21/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
44839 |
17A |
Derby |
21A |
Saltley |
|
21/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
44856 |
17A |
Derby |
21A |
Saltley |
|
21/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
44858 |
16A |
Nottingham |
21A |
Saltley |
|
21/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
44944 |
16A |
Nottingham |
21A |
Saltley |
|
21/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
45088 |
16A |
Nottingham |
21A |
Saltley |
|
21/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
45160 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
67C |
Ayr |
|
21/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
45161 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
64D |
Carstairs |
|
21/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
45194 |
30A |
Corkerhill |
67C |
Ayr |
|
21/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
45253 |
16A |
Nottingham |
21A |
Saltley |
|
21/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
45263 |
16A |
Nottingham |
21A |
Saltley |
|
21/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
45447 |
14B |
Kentish Town |
21A |
Saltley |
|
21/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
45452 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
64D |
Carstairs |
|
05/12/1959 |
Reallocation |
45146 |
2A |
Rugby |
1A |
Willesden |
|
05/12/1959 |
Reallocation |
45324 |
2A |
Rugby |
1A |
Willesden |
|
12/12/1959 |
Reallocation |
45333 |
16A |
Nottingham |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
09/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
44911 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
09/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
44932 |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
16D |
Annesley |
|
09/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
45037 |
9A |
Longsight |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
09/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
45041 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
09/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
45046 |
9A |
Longsight |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
09/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
45078 |
24A |
Accrington |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
09/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
45116 |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
16D |
Annesley |
|
09/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
45223 |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
16D |
Annesley |
|
09/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
45227 |
24A |
Accrington |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
09/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
45234 |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
16D |
Annesley |
|
09/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
45312 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
09/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
45415 |
24A |
Accrington |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
09/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
45450 |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
16D |
Annesley |
|
23/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
45031 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
23/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
45216 |
27A |
Bank Hall |
24B |
Rose Grove |
|
23/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
45221 |
15D |
Bedford |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
23/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
45225 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
23/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
45284 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
1A |
Willesden |
|
23/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
45377 |
10C |
Patricroft |
24F |
Fleetwood |
|
23/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
45407 |
14B |
Kentish Town |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
23/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
45442 |
10C |
Patricroft |
24F |
Fleetwood |
|
30/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
44770 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
30/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
45070 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
06/02/1960 |
Reallocation |
44658 |
|
|
16A |
Nottingham |
|
06/02/1960 |
Reallocation |
44712 |
2E |
Northampton |
2A |
Rugby |
|
06/02/1960 |
Reallocation |
44760 |
2E |
Northampton |
2A |
Rugby |
|
06/02/1960 |
Reallocation |
44842 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
9A |
Longsight |
|
06/02/1960 |
Reallocation |
44855 |
14B |
Kentish Town |
9A |
Longsight |
|
06/02/1960 |
Reallocation |
44984 |
15D |
Bedford |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
06/02/1960 |
Reallocation |
45137 |
15D |
Bedford |
1A |
Willesden |
|
06/02/1960 |
Reallocation |
45139 |
15D |
Bedford |
1A |
Willesden |
|
27/02/1960 |
Reallocation |
44710 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
3D |
Aston |
|
27/02/1960 |
Reallocation |
44910 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
3D |
Aston |
|
12/03/1960 |
Reallocation |
44856 |
21A |
Saltley |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
12/03/1960 |
Reallocation |
45066 |
32A |
Inverness |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
12/03/1960 |
Reallocation |
45090 |
32A |
Inverness |
63A |
Perth South |
|
12/03/1960 |
Reallocation |
45478 |
32A |
Inverness |
63A |
Perth South |
|
19/03/1960 |
Reallocation |
45137 |
1A |
Willesden |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
02/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
44840 |
3E |
Monument Lane |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
02/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
44869 |
1A |
Willesden |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
02/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
45092 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
02/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
45097 |
11A |
Carnforth |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
02/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
45137 |
5A |
Crewe North |
1A |
Willesden |
|
02/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
45196 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
02/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
45292 |
2E |
Northampton |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
02/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
45395 |
3D |
Aston |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
02/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
45414 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
09/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
45098 |
32A |
Inverness |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
09/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
45320 |
32A |
Inverness |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
09/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
45380 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
09/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
45398 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
09/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
45429 |
6J |
Holyhead |
6H |
Bangor |
|
09/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
45459 |
66A |
Polmadie |
66C |
Hamilton (West) |
|
23/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
44682 |
24K |
Preston |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
23/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
44827 |
24K |
Preston |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
23/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
45225 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6H |
Bangor |
|
23/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
45247 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6H |
Bangor |
|
23/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
45248 |
24K |
Preston |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
23/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
45302 |
24K |
Preston |
6H |
Bangor |
|
23/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
45345 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6H |
Bangor |
|
30/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
44686 |
9A |
Longsight |
21E |
Monument Lane |
|
30/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
44746 |
9A |
Longsight |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
30/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
44842 |
9A |
Longsight |
21E |
Monument Lane |
|
30/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
44889 |
24A |
Accrington |
24B |
Rose Grove |
|
30/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
45111 |
9A |
Longsight |
21E |
Monument Lane |
|
30/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
45226 |
24A |
Accrington |
24F |
Fleetwood |
|
30/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
45267 |
15D |
Bedford |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
30/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
45339 |
9A |
Longsight |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
30/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
45342 |
15D |
Bedford |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
07/05/1960 |
Reallocation |
44855 |
9A |
Longsight |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
07/05/1960 |
Reallocation |
44875 |
1A |
Willesden |
21B |
Bescot |
|
07/05/1960 |
Reallocation |
44910 |
3D |
Aston |
21B |
Bescot |
|
07/05/1960 |
Reallocation |
44954 |
62B |
|
66E |
Carstairs |
|
07/05/1960 |
Reallocation |
45064 |
1A |
Willesden |
21B |
Bescot |
|
07/05/1960 |
Reallocation |
45146 |
1A |
Willesden |
21B |
Bescot |
|
07/05/1960 |
Reallocation |
45164 |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
07/05/1960 |
Reallocation |
45384 |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
07/05/1960 |
Reallocation |
45387 |
1A |
Willesden |
21B |
Bescot |
|
07/05/1960 |
Reallocation |
45426 |
9A |
Longsight |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
07/05/1960 |
Reallocation |
45486 |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
14/05/1960 |
Reallocation |
44686 |
21E |
Monument Lane |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
14/05/1960 |
Reallocation |
44838 |
1A |
Willesden |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
14/05/1960 |
Reallocation |
45072 |
24L |
Carnforth |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
14/05/1960 |
Reallocation |
45187 |
1A |
Willesden |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
14/05/1960 |
Reallocation |
45269 |
21A |
Saltley |
27F |
Brunswick |
|
14/05/1960 |
Reallocation |
45440 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
21/05/1960 |
Reallocation |
45180 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
21E |
Monument Lane |
|
21/05/1960 |
Reallocation |
45412 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
21/05/1960 |
Reallocation |
45438 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
04/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
44723 |
60A |
Inverness |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
04/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
44798 |
32A |
Inverness |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
04/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
44885 |
29A |
Perth South |
68B |
Dumfries |
|
04/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
45124 |
32A |
Inverness |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
04/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
45167 |
61B |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
|
04/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
45168 |
63A |
Perth South |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
04/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
45172 |
29A |
Perth South |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
04/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
45460 |
60A |
Inverness |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
04/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
45478 |
63A |
Perth South |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
11/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
44869 |
5A |
Crewe North |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
11/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
45070 |
5A |
Crewe North |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
11/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
45072 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
11/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
45438 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
13/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
44894 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
24B |
Rose Grove |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
44691 |
14D |
Neasden |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
44758 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
9A |
Longsight |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
44780 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
9A |
Longsight |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
44807 |
3E |
Monument Lane |
24K |
Preston |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
44819 |
14D |
Neasden |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
44830 |
14D |
Neasden |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
44847 |
14D |
Neasden |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
44871 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5D |
Stoke |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
44982 |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
24F |
Fleetwood |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
44988 |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
24F |
Fleetwood |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
45006 |
14D |
Neasden |
17A |
Derby |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
45024 |
1A |
Willesden |
2A |
Rugby |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
45044 |
5D |
Stoke |
5D |
Stoke |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
45134 |
5B |
Crewe South |
21E |
Monument Lane |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
45139 |
1A |
Willesden |
2A |
Rugby |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
45188 |
5B |
Crewe South |
21E |
Monument Lane |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
45215 |
14D |
Neasden |
16D |
Annesley |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
45260 |
14D |
Neasden |
17A |
Derby |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
45270 |
5B |
Crewe South |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
45273 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
55C |
Farnley Junction |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
45287 |
3B |
Bushbury |
21B |
Bescot |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
45315 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
24K |
Preston |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
45324 |
1A |
Willesden |
2A |
Rugby |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
45329 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
45342 |
14B |
Kentish Town |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
45351 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
24K |
Preston |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
45370 |
5B |
Crewe South |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
45377 |
24F |
Fleetwood |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
45390 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5D |
Stoke |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
45394 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
45416 |
14D |
Neasden |
17A |
Derby |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
45429 |
6H |
Bangor |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
45442 |
24F |
Fleetwood |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
45445 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
12E |
Barrow in Furness |
|
25/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
44766 |
3E |
Monument Lane |
21B |
Bescot |
|
25/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
44840 |
5A |
Crewe North |
21B |
Bescot |
|
25/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
45092 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
25/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
45097 |
5B |
Crewe South |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
25/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
45180 |
21E |
Monument Lane |
21B |
Bescot |
|
25/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
45196 |
5A |
Crewe North |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
25/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
45217 |
8E |
Brunswick |
16D |
Annesley |
|
25/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
45292 |
5B |
Crewe South |
2E |
Northampton |
|
25/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
45395 |
5A |
Crewe North |
21D |
Aston |
|
25/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
45414 |
5B |
Crewe South |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
02/07/1960 |
Reallocation |
44820 |
63A |
Perth South |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
02/07/1960 |
Reallocation |
44992 |
32A |
Inverness |
68C |
Stranraer |
|
02/07/1960 |
Reallocation |
45038 |
3E |
Monument Lane |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
02/07/1960 |
Reallocation |
45052 |
3E |
Monument Lane |
21D |
Aston |
|
02/07/1960 |
Reallocation |
45102 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
02/07/1960 |
Reallocation |
45103 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
26F |
Patricroft |
|
02/07/1960 |
Reallocation |
45350 |
1A |
Willesden |
5D |
Stoke |
|
02/07/1960 |
Reallocation |
45365 |
29A |
Perth South |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
02/07/1960 |
Reallocation |
45444 |
27F |
Brunswick |
16D |
Annesley |
|
02/07/1960 |
Reallocation |
45467 |
29A |
Perth South |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
02/07/1960 |
Reallocation |
45469 |
61B |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
|
09/07/1960 |
Reallocation |
45196 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
09/07/1960 |
Reallocation |
45258 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
12E |
Barrow in Furness |
|
09/07/1960 |
Reallocation |
45351 |
24K |
Preston |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
09/07/1960 |
Reallocation |
45414 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
24K |
Preston |
|
16/07/1960 |
Reallocation |
45269 |
27F |
Brunswick |
21A |
Saltley |
|
23/07/1960 |
Reallocation |
45276 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
23/07/1960 |
Reallocation |
45390 |
5D |
Stoke |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
30/07/1960 |
Reallocation |
44788 |
32A |
Inverness |
63A |
Perth South |
|
30/07/1960 |
Reallocation |
44789 |
32A |
Inverness |
68C |
Stranraer |
|
30/07/1960 |
Reallocation |
44992 |
68C |
Stranraer |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
30/07/1960 |
Reallocation |
45192 |
32A |
Inverness |
63A |
Perth South |
|
30/07/1960 |
Reallocation |
45459 |
66C |
Hamilton (West) |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
30/07/1960 |
Reallocation |
45461 |
60A |
Inverness |
63A |
Perth South |
|
27/08/1960 |
Reallocation |
44722 |
60A |
Inverness |
63A |
Perth South |
|
27/08/1960 |
Reallocation |
44724 |
60A |
Inverness |
63A |
Perth South |
|
27/08/1960 |
Reallocation |
44799 |
32A |
Inverness |
63A |
Perth South |
|
27/08/1960 |
Reallocation |
45136 |
60B |
Aviemore |
63A |
Perth South |
|
27/08/1960 |
Reallocation |
45140 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
24K |
Preston |
|
27/08/1960 |
Reallocation |
45179 |
60A |
Inverness |
63A |
Perth South |
|
27/08/1960 |
Reallocation |
45188 |
21E |
Monument Lane |
24K |
Preston |
|
27/08/1960 |
Reallocation |
45319 |
32A |
Inverness |
63A |
Perth South |
|
27/08/1960 |
Reallocation |
45360 |
32A |
Inverness |
63A |
Perth South |
|
27/08/1960 |
Reallocation |
45361 |
32A |
Inverness |
63A |
Perth South |
|
27/08/1960 |
Reallocation |
45453 |
60A |
Inverness |
63A |
Perth South |
|
27/08/1960 |
Reallocation |
45476 |
32A |
Inverness |
63A |
Perth South |
|
27/08/1960 |
Reallocation |
45477 |
32A |
Inverness |
63A |
Perth South |
|
27/08/1960 |
Reallocation |
45479 |
32A |
Inverness |
63A |
Perth South |
|
27/08/1960 |
Reallocation |
45486 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
68C |
Stranraer |
|
03/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
45060 |
5D |
Stoke |
21B |
Bescot |
|
10/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
44687 |
9A |
Longsight |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
10/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
44741 |
9A |
Longsight |
1A |
Willesden |
|
10/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
44742 |
9A |
Longsight |
21D |
Aston |
|
10/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
44749 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
10/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
44750 |
|
|
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
10/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
44758 |
9A |
Longsight |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
10/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
45060 |
21B |
Bescot |
5D |
Stoke |
|
10/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
45140 |
24K |
Preston |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
10/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
45188 |
24K |
Preston |
21E |
Monument Lane |
|
17/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
44746 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
17/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
44807 |
24K |
Preston |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
17/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
44842 |
21E |
Monument Lane |
1A |
Willesden |
|
17/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
44855 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
17/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
45070 |
6J |
Holyhead |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
17/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
45071 |
3E |
Monument Lane |
21C |
Bushbury |
|
17/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
45072 |
6J |
Holyhead |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
17/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
45113 |
3E |
Monument Lane |
2A |
Rugby |
|
17/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
45134 |
21E |
Monument Lane |
21B |
Bescot |
|
17/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
45148 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
17/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
45186 |
21A |
Saltley |
17A |
Derby |
|
17/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
45188 |
21E |
Monument Lane |
1A |
Willesden |
|
17/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
45191 |
2C |
Northampton |
2A |
Rugby |
|
17/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
45221 |
16A |
Nottingham |
17A |
Derby |
|
17/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
45222 |
2E |
Northampton |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
17/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
45270 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
17/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
45276 |
6J |
Holyhead |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
17/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
45292 |
2E |
Northampton |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
17/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
45301 |
3E |
Monument Lane |
21D |
Aston |
|
17/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
45308 |
3E |
Monument Lane |
21C |
Bushbury |
|
17/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
45370 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
17/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
45386 |
10C |
Patricroft |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
17/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
45390 |
6J |
Holyhead |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
17/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
45429 |
6J |
Holyhead |
6H |
Bangor |
|
17/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
45438 |
6J |
Holyhead |
6H |
Bangor |
|
24/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
44855 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
24/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
45007 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
67B |
Hurlford |
|
24/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
45329 |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
24/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
45342 |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
17A |
Derby |
|
24/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
45394 |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
24/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
45426 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
9A |
Longsight |
|
24/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
45489 |
30A |
Corkerhill |
67B |
Hurlford |
|
01/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
44742 |
21D |
Aston |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
01/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
44746 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
01/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
44749 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
01/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
44842 |
1A |
Willesden |
21D |
Aston |
|
01/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
45292 |
1E |
Bletchley |
21D |
Aston |
|
08/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
44682 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
08/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
44687 |
5B |
Crewe South |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
08/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
44741 |
1A |
Willesden |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
08/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
44750 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
08/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
44827 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
08/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
44864 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
08/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
44865 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
21D |
Aston |
|
08/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
45038 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
21D |
Aston |
|
08/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
45248 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
15/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
44986 |
6J |
Holyhead |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
15/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
45370 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
15/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
45381 |
1A |
Willesden |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
22/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
44691 |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
17A |
Derby |
|
22/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
45053 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
67D |
Ardrossan |
|
22/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
45177 |
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
22/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
45178 |
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
22/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
45188 |
1A |
Willesden |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
22/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
45360 |
63A |
Perth South |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
22/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
45367 |
63A |
Perth South |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
22/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
45384 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
67D |
Ardrossan |
|
29/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
45034 |
3E |
Monument Lane |
9A |
Longsight |
|
29/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
45044 |
5D |
Stoke |
9A |
Longsight |
|
29/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
45111 |
21E |
Monument Lane |
9A |
Longsight |
|
29/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
45284 |
1A |
Willesden |
2A |
Rugby |
|
29/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
45288 |
1A |
Willesden |
2A |
Rugby |
|
29/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
45374 |
1A |
Willesden |
2A |
Rugby |
|
29/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
45375 |
1A |
Willesden |
2A |
Rugby |
|
29/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
45404 |
1A |
Willesden |
2A |
Rugby |
|
29/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
45410 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
05/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
45020 |
1E |
Bletchley |
2E |
Northampton |
|
05/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
45222 |
1E |
Bletchley |
2E |
Northampton |
|
05/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
45282 |
5A |
Crewe North |
9A |
Longsight |
|
05/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
45305 |
5A |
Crewe North |
9A |
Longsight |
|
05/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
45388 |
1E |
Bletchley |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
05/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
45434 |
5A |
Crewe North |
9A |
Longsight |
|
12/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
44688 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
12/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
44842 |
21D |
Aston |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
12/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
44985 |
14B |
Kentish Town |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
12/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
45103 |
26F |
Patricroft |
26B |
Agecroft |
|
19/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
45020 |
2E |
Northampton |
1A |
Willesden |
|
19/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
45044 |
9A |
Longsight |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
19/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
45050 |
2E |
Northampton |
1A |
Willesden |
|
19/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
45091 |
2C |
Northampton |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
19/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
45111 |
9A |
Longsight |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
19/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
45147 |
2E |
Northampton |
1A |
Willesden |
|
19/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
45222 |
2E |
Northampton |
1A |
Willesden |
|
19/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
45282 |
9A |
Longsight |
12F |
Workington |
|
19/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
45284 |
2A |
Rugby |
1A |
Willesden |
|
19/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
45288 |
2A |
Rugby |
1A |
Willesden |
|
19/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
45305 |
9A |
Longsight |
12F |
Workington |
|
19/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
45307 |
2E |
Northampton |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
19/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
45374 |
2A |
Rugby |
1A |
Willesden |
|
19/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
45375 |
2A |
Rugby |
1A |
Willesden |
|
19/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
45392 |
2E |
Northampton |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
19/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
45404 |
2A |
Rugby |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
19/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
45434 |
9A |
Longsight |
12F |
Workington |
|
19/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
45486 |
68C |
Stranraer |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
19/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
45486 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
67C |
Ayr |
|
26/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
44780 |
9A |
Longsight |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
26/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
44937 |
9A |
Longsight |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
26/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
45034 |
9A |
Longsight |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
26/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
45426 |
9A |
Longsight |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
10/12/1960 |
Reallocation |
45024 |
2A |
Rugby |
24K |
Preston |
|
24/12/1960 |
Reallocation |
45292 |
21D |
Aston |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
31/12/1960 |
Reallocation |
45045 |
51B |
Newport (Teeside) |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
31/12/1960 |
Reallocation |
45270 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
31/12/1960 |
Reallocation |
45380 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
31/12/1960 |
Reallocation |
45381 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
31/12/1960 |
Reallocation |
45394 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
07/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
44676 |
|
|
12E |
Barrow in Furness |
|
07/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
45020 |
1A |
Willesden |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
14/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
45050 |
1A |
Willesden |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
14/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
45137 |
1A |
Willesden |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
14/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
45147 |
1A |
Willesden |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
14/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
45255 |
26F |
Patricroft |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
14/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
45279 |
14B |
Kentish Town |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
14/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
45284 |
1A |
Willesden |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
14/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
45285 |
14B |
Kentish Town |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
14/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
45375 |
1A |
Willesden |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
28/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
45105 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
27C |
Southport |
|
11/02/1961 |
Reallocation |
45124 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
67B |
Hurlford |
|
11/02/1961 |
Reallocation |
45184 |
2A |
Rugby |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
11/02/1961 |
Reallocation |
45191 |
2A |
Rugby |
1A |
Willesden |
|
11/02/1961 |
Reallocation |
45467 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
67B |
Hurlford |
|
04/03/1961 |
Reallocation |
44689 |
24A |
Accrington |
24B |
Rose Grove |
|
04/03/1961 |
Reallocation |
44692 |
24A |
Accrington |
24B |
Rose Grove |
|
04/03/1961 |
Reallocation |
45006 |
17A |
Derby |
21A |
Saltley |
|
04/03/1961 |
Reallocation |
45032 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
04/03/1961 |
Reallocation |
45068 |
24A |
Accrington |
24B |
Rose Grove |
|
04/03/1961 |
Reallocation |
45186 |
17A |
Derby |
21A |
Saltley |
|
04/03/1961 |
Reallocation |
45221 |
17A |
Derby |
21A |
Saltley |
|
04/03/1961 |
Reallocation |
45260 |
17A |
Derby |
21A |
Saltley |
|
04/03/1961 |
Reallocation |
45301 |
21D |
Aston |
2E |
Northampton |
|
11/03/1961 |
Reallocation |
45355 |
65B |
|
64B |
Haymarket |
|
18/03/1961 |
Reallocation |
45302 |
6H |
Bangor |
21D |
Aston |
|
25/03/1961 |
Reallocation |
45297 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
24K |
Preston |
|
08/04/1961 |
Reallocation |
45020 |
1E |
Bletchley |
1A |
Willesden |
|
08/04/1961 |
Reallocation |
45125 |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
08/04/1961 |
Reallocation |
45302 |
21D |
Aston |
6H |
Bangor |
|
08/04/1961 |
Reallocation |
45438 |
6H |
Bangor |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
08/04/1961 |
Reallocation |
45482 |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
11/04/1961 |
Reallocation |
44869 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
2E |
Northampton |
|
11/04/1961 |
Reallocation |
45056 |
6J |
Holyhead |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
11/04/1961 |
Reallocation |
45332 |
10B |
Preston |
2E |
Northampton |
|
11/04/1961 |
Reallocation |
45364 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
12F |
Workington |
|
11/04/1961 |
Reallocation |
45454 |
10B |
Preston |
2E |
Northampton |
|
15/04/1961 |
Reallocation |
45340 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
24K |
Preston |
|
15/04/1961 |
Reallocation |
45410 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
21B |
Bescot |
|
06/05/1961 |
Reallocation |
44780 |
5A |
Crewe North |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
06/05/1961 |
Reallocation |
44992 |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
67B |
Hurlford |
|
06/05/1961 |
Reallocation |
45037 |
5A |
Crewe North |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
06/05/1961 |
Reallocation |
45192 |
63A |
Perth South |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
06/05/1961 |
Reallocation |
45379 |
5A |
Crewe North |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
06/05/1961 |
Reallocation |
45438 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
2A |
Rugby |
|
03/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
44718 |
60A |
Inverness |
67B |
Hurlford |
|
03/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
45167 |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
67D |
Ardrossan |
|
03/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
45463 |
29A |
Perth South |
67B |
Hurlford |
|
10/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
44691 |
17A |
Derby |
14E |
Bedford |
|
10/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
44751 |
|
|
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
10/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
44752 |
CMERugby |
|
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
10/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
44780 |
1E |
Bletchley |
1A |
Willesden |
|
10/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
44844 |
5A |
Crewe North |
1A |
Willesden |
|
10/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
44868 |
5B |
Crewe South |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
10/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
44911 |
5A |
Crewe North |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
10/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
44971 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
10/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
45000 |
5B |
Crewe South |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
10/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
45002 |
5B |
Crewe South |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
10/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
45003 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5D |
Stoke |
|
10/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
45028 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
10/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
45034 |
5A |
Crewe North |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
10/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
45041 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
10/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
45073 |
5A |
Crewe North |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
10/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
45130 |
5B |
Crewe South |
1A |
Willesden |
|
10/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
45131 |
5B |
Crewe South |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
10/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
45142 |
5B |
Crewe South |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
10/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
45147 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
10/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
45148 |
5B |
Crewe South |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
10/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
45149 |
5B |
Crewe South |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
10/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
45184 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
10/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
45198 |
5B |
Crewe South |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
10/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
45276 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
1A |
Willesden |
|
10/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
45284 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
10/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
45291 |
5B |
Crewe South |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
10/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
45386 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
10/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
45390 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
10/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
45438 |
2A |
Rugby |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
17/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
44689 |
24B |
Rose Grove |
27C |
Southport |
|
17/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
44692 |
24B |
Rose Grove |
27C |
Southport |
|
17/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
44882 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
12E |
Barrow in Furness |
|
17/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
44897 |
3D |
Aston |
21E |
Monument Lane |
|
17/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
44936 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
24K |
Preston |
|
17/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
45071 |
21C |
Bushbury |
21E |
Monument Lane |
|
17/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
45195 |
26F |
Patricroft |
26B |
Agecroft |
|
17/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
45344 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
17/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
45416 |
17A |
Derby |
14E |
Bedford |
|
24/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
44766 |
21B |
Bescot |
21B |
Bescot |
|
01/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
44699 |
|
|
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
01/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
44936 |
24K |
Preston |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
01/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
45050 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
01/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
45051 |
3D |
Aston |
21E |
Monument Lane |
|
01/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
45053 |
67D |
Ardrossan |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
01/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
45171 |
29A |
Perth South |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
01/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
45271 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
01/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
45340 |
24K |
Preston |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
01/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
45361 |
63A |
Perth South |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
01/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
45366 |
29A |
Perth South |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
01/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
45469 |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
61B |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
|
01/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
45477 |
63A |
Perth South |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
08/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
44807 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
08/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
44867 |
2A |
Rugby |
5D |
Stoke |
|
08/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
45386 |
6J |
Holyhead |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
15/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
44910 |
21B |
Bescot |
21E |
Monument Lane |
|
15/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
45002 |
24L |
Carnforth |
24K |
Preston |
|
22/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
45419 |
3A |
Bescot |
2A |
Rugby |
|
29/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
45192 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
67B |
Hurlford |
|
29/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
45271 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
05/08/1961 |
Reallocation |
44842 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
5D |
Stoke |
|
05/08/1961 |
Reallocation |
44874 |
11A |
Carnforth |
5D |
Stoke |
|
05/08/1961 |
Reallocation |
44916 |
1A |
Willesden |
5D |
Stoke |
|
05/08/1961 |
Reallocation |
45231 |
3D |
Aston |
5D |
Stoke |
|
05/08/1961 |
Reallocation |
45295 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
5D |
Stoke |
|
05/08/1961 |
Reallocation |
45321 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
5D |
Stoke |
|
05/08/1961 |
Reallocation |
45324 |
2A |
Rugby |
5D |
Stoke |
|
05/08/1961 |
Reallocation |
45375 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
5D |
Stoke |
|
05/08/1961 |
Reallocation |
45408 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
5D |
Stoke |
|
19/08/1961 |
Reallocation |
44804 |
21A |
Saltley |
27F |
Brunswick |
|
19/08/1961 |
Reallocation |
44842 |
5D |
Stoke |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
19/08/1961 |
Reallocation |
44874 |
5D |
Stoke |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
19/08/1961 |
Reallocation |
44916 |
5D |
Stoke |
1A |
Willesden |
|
19/08/1961 |
Reallocation |
45231 |
5D |
Stoke |
21D |
Aston |
|
19/08/1961 |
Reallocation |
45295 |
5D |
Stoke |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
19/08/1961 |
Reallocation |
45321 |
5D |
Stoke |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
19/08/1961 |
Reallocation |
45324 |
5D |
Stoke |
2A |
Rugby |
|
19/08/1961 |
Reallocation |
45375 |
5D |
Stoke |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
19/08/1961 |
Reallocation |
45408 |
5D |
Stoke |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
26/08/1961 |
Reallocation |
44912 |
25F |
Low Moor |
56C |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
26/08/1961 |
Reallocation |
44951 |
25F |
Low Moor |
56D |
Mirfield |
|
26/08/1961 |
Reallocation |
45207 |
25F |
Low Moor |
56D |
Mirfield |
|
26/08/1961 |
Reallocation |
45208 |
25F |
Low Moor |
56D |
Mirfield |
|
26/08/1961 |
Reallocation |
45219 |
25F |
Low Moor |
56C |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
26/08/1961 |
Reallocation |
45463 |
67B |
Hurlford |
67D |
Ardrossan |
|
02/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
44897 |
21E |
Monument Lane |
2A |
Rugby |
|
02/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
44910 |
21E |
Monument Lane |
21B |
Bescot |
|
02/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
45051 |
21E |
Monument Lane |
21B |
Bescot |
|
09/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
44804 |
27F |
Brunswick |
21A |
Saltley |
|
09/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
45002 |
24K |
Preston |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
09/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
45020 |
1A |
Willesden |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
09/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
45024 |
24K |
Preston |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
09/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
45034 |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
09/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
45073 |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
09/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
45130 |
1A |
Willesden |
2A |
Rugby |
|
09/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
45150 |
24K |
Preston |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
09/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
45222 |
1A |
Willesden |
2A |
Rugby |
|
09/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
45223 |
16D |
Annesley |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
09/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
45297 |
24K |
Preston |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
09/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
45315 |
24K |
Preston |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
09/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
45414 |
24K |
Preston |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
16/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
44664 |
16A |
Nottingham |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
16/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
44754 |
|
|
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
16/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
44755 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
16/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
44985 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
14E |
Bedford |
|
16/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
45000 |
24L |
Carnforth |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
16/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
45069 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
16/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
45225 |
6H |
Bangor |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
16/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
45238 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
14E |
Bedford |
|
16/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
45241 |
11A |
Carnforth |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
16/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
45262 |
27F |
Brunswick |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
16/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
45281 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
16/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
45302 |
6H |
Bangor |
2E |
Northampton |
|
16/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
45344 |
24L |
Carnforth |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
16/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
45346 |
8E |
Brunswick |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
16/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
45392 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
2E |
Northampton |
|
16/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
45427 |
11A |
Carnforth |
2E |
Northampton |
|
16/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
45429 |
6H |
Bangor |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
23/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
44741 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
23/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
44742 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
23/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
44936 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
2E |
Northampton |
|
23/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
44971 |
6J |
Holyhead |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
23/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
45028 |
6J |
Holyhead |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
23/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
45050 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
2A |
Rugby |
|
23/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
45056 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
2A |
Rugby |
|
23/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
45142 |
6J |
Holyhead |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
23/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
45147 |
6J |
Holyhead |
2E |
Northampton |
|
23/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
45148 |
6J |
Holyhead |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
23/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
45184 |
6J |
Holyhead |
2E |
Northampton |
|
14/10/1961 |
Reallocation |
44664 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
17A |
Derby |
|
14/10/1961 |
Reallocation |
45051 |
21B |
Bescot |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
14/10/1961 |
Reallocation |
45134 |
21B |
Bescot |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
14/10/1961 |
Reallocation |
45346 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
17A |
Derby |
|
14/10/1961 |
Reallocation |
45385 |
3A |
Bescot |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
21/10/1961 |
Reallocation |
44801 |
29A |
Perth South |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
21/10/1961 |
Reallocation |
45090 |
63A |
Perth South |
66C |
Hamilton (West) |
|
21/10/1961 |
Reallocation |
45094 |
3D |
Aston |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
21/10/1961 |
Reallocation |
45165 |
29A |
Perth South |
66C |
Hamilton (West) |
|
21/10/1961 |
Reallocation |
45168 |
66A |
Polmadie |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
21/10/1961 |
Reallocation |
45170 |
29A |
Perth South |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
21/10/1961 |
Reallocation |
45172 |
66A |
Polmadie |
66E |
Carstairs |
|
21/10/1961 |
Reallocation |
45179 |
63A |
Perth South |
66C |
Hamilton (West) |
|
21/10/1961 |
Reallocation |
45319 |
63A |
Perth South |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
21/10/1961 |
Reallocation |
45327 |
3D |
Aston |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
21/10/1961 |
Reallocation |
45340 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
21/10/1961 |
Reallocation |
45476 |
63A |
Perth South |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
21/10/1961 |
Reallocation |
45483 |
63A |
Perth South |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
21/10/1961 |
Reallocation |
45487 |
2A |
Rugby |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
21/10/1961 |
Reallocation |
45488 |
28A |
Motherwell |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
21/10/1961 |
Reallocation |
45492 |
28B |
Dalry Road |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
21/10/1961 |
Reallocation |
45496 |
63A |
Perth South |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
21/10/1961 |
Reallocation |
45497 |
28A |
Motherwell |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
28/10/1961 |
Reallocation |
45041 |
6J |
Holyhead |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
28/10/1961 |
Reallocation |
45071 |
21E |
Monument Lane |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
28/10/1961 |
Reallocation |
45131 |
6J |
Holyhead |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
28/10/1961 |
Reallocation |
45284 |
6J |
Holyhead |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
28/10/1961 |
Reallocation |
45390 |
6J |
Holyhead |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
04/11/1961 |
Reallocation |
45147 |
2E |
Northampton |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
11/11/1961 |
Reallocation |
44749 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
11/11/1961 |
Reallocation |
44750 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
11/11/1961 |
Condemned |
45401 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
18/11/1961 |
Reallocation |
44751 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
18/11/1961 |
Reallocation |
44754 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
18/11/1961 |
Reallocation |
44937 |
5A |
Crewe North |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
18/11/1961 |
Reallocation |
45015 |
3B |
Bushbury |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
18/11/1961 |
Reallocation |
45470 |
29A |
Perth South |
60A |
Inverness |
|
18/11/1961 |
Reallocation |
45479 |
63A |
Perth South |
60A |
Inverness |
|
25/11/1961 |
Reallocation |
44837 |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
21D |
Aston |
|
25/11/1961 |
Reallocation |
45184 |
2E |
Northampton |
2A |
Rugby |
|
25/11/1961 |
Reallocation |
45382 |
6J |
Holyhead |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
02/12/1961 |
Reallocation |
45332 |
2E |
Northampton |
21D |
Aston |
|
09/12/1961 |
Reallocation |
45024 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
09/12/1961 |
Reallocation |
45069 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
09/12/1961 |
Reallocation |
45281 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
09/12/1961 |
Reallocation |
45385 |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
9A |
Longsight |
|
16/12/1961 |
Reallocation |
45024 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
9A |
Longsight |
|
16/12/1961 |
Reallocation |
45302 |
2E |
Northampton |
9A |
Longsight |
|
30/12/1961 |
Reallocation |
44972 |
63D |
Fort William |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
30/12/1961 |
Reallocation |
44973 |
63D |
Fort William |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
30/12/1961 |
Reallocation |
44974 |
63D |
Fort William |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
30/12/1961 |
Reallocation |
45024 |
9A |
Longsight |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
30/12/1961 |
Reallocation |
45302 |
9A |
Longsight |
2E |
Northampton |
|
30/12/1961 |
Reallocation |
45497 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
67D |
Ardrossan |
|
06/01/1962 |
Reallocation |
44742 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
27A |
Bank Hall |
|
06/01/1962 |
Reallocation |
45004 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
06/01/1962 |
Reallocation |
45033 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
06/01/1962 |
Reallocation |
45045 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
06/01/1962 |
Reallocation |
45142 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
06/01/1962 |
Reallocation |
45254 |
5A |
Crewe North |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
13/01/1962 |
Reallocation |
44837 |
21D |
Aston |
21C |
Bushbury |
|
13/01/1962 |
Reallocation |
44928 |
27A |
Bank Hall |
26B |
Agecroft |
|
13/01/1962 |
Reallocation |
45051 |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
2E |
Northampton |
|
13/01/1962 |
Reallocation |
45134 |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
2E |
Northampton |
|
13/01/1962 |
Reallocation |
45332 |
21D |
Aston |
21C |
Bushbury |
|
10/02/1962 |
Reallocation |
45059 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
17A |
Derby |
|
10/02/1962 |
Reallocation |
45290 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
26C |
Bolton |
|
17/02/1962 |
Reallocation |
45062 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
17A |
Derby |
|
03/03/1962 |
Reallocation |
45148 |
5A |
Crewe North |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
10/03/1962 |
Reallocation |
45012 |
68A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
10/03/1962 |
Reallocation |
45081 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
10/03/1962 |
Reallocation |
45149 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
10/03/1962 |
Reallocation |
45197 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
10/03/1962 |
Reallocation |
45295 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
10/03/1962 |
Reallocation |
45316 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
17/03/1962 |
Reallocation |
44690 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
17/03/1962 |
Reallocation |
44692 |
27C |
Southport |
27B |
Aintree |
|
17/03/1962 |
Reallocation |
44729 |
|
|
27B |
Aintree |
|
17/03/1962 |
Reallocation |
44742 |
27A |
Bank Hall |
27C |
Southport |
|
17/03/1962 |
Reallocation |
44743 |
27A |
Bank Hall |
27C |
Southport |
|
17/03/1962 |
Reallocation |
44744 |
27A |
Bank Hall |
27C |
Southport |
|
17/03/1962 |
Reallocation |
44745 |
27A |
Bank Hall |
27C |
Southport |
|
17/03/1962 |
Reallocation |
44767 |
27A |
Bank Hall |
27C |
Southport |
|
17/03/1962 |
Reallocation |
44821 |
14B |
Kentish Town |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
17/03/1962 |
Reallocation |
44848 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
17/03/1962 |
Reallocation |
44887 |
23C |
Southport |
27B |
Aintree |
|
17/03/1962 |
Reallocation |
44984 |
14B |
Kentish Town |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
17/03/1962 |
Reallocation |
45061 |
27C |
Southport |
27B |
Aintree |
|
17/03/1962 |
Reallocation |
45210 |
27A |
Bank Hall |
27B |
Aintree |
|
17/03/1962 |
Reallocation |
45223 |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
17/03/1962 |
Reallocation |
45228 |
27C |
Southport |
27B |
Aintree |
|
17/03/1962 |
Reallocation |
45262 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
17/03/1962 |
Reallocation |
45374 |
1A |
Willesden |
21B |
Bescot |
|
24/03/1962 |
Reallocation |
44816 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
17A |
Derby |
|
24/03/1962 |
Reallocation |
45335 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
17A |
Derby |
|
31/03/1962 |
Reallocation |
45044 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
1A |
Willesden |
|
31/03/1962 |
Reallocation |
45111 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
1A |
Willesden |
|
31/03/1962 |
Reallocation |
45282 |
12F |
Workington |
1A |
Willesden |
|
31/03/1962 |
Reallocation |
45305 |
12F |
Workington |
1A |
Willesden |
|
31/03/1962 |
Reallocation |
45434 |
12F |
Workington |
1A |
Willesden |
|
07/04/1962 |
Reallocation |
44818 |
21A |
Saltley |
17B |
Burton |
|
07/04/1962 |
Reallocation |
44822 |
14B |
Kentish Town |
17B |
Burton |
|
07/04/1962 |
Reallocation |
44825 |
21A |
Saltley |
17A |
Derby |
|
07/04/1962 |
Reallocation |
44839 |
21A |
Saltley |
17A |
Derby |
|
07/04/1962 |
Reallocation |
44858 |
21A |
Saltley |
17A |
Derby |
|
07/04/1962 |
Reallocation |
44918 |
16A |
Nottingham |
17B |
Burton |
|
07/04/1962 |
Reallocation |
45198 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
1A |
Willesden |
|
07/04/1962 |
Reallocation |
45407 |
16A |
Nottingham |
17B |
Burton |
|
14/04/1962 |
Reallocation |
44746 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
26C |
Bolton |
|
14/04/1962 |
Reallocation |
44777 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
17A |
Derby |
|
14/04/1962 |
Reallocation |
44817 |
14B |
Kentish Town |
17B |
Burton |
|
14/04/1962 |
Reallocation |
44986 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
14/04/1962 |
Reallocation |
45277 |
14B |
Kentish Town |
17B |
Burton |
|
14/04/1962 |
Reallocation |
45279 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
17A |
Derby |
|
21/04/1962 |
Reallocation |
44784 |
32A |
Inverness |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
21/04/1962 |
Reallocation |
44784 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
67C |
Ayr |
|
21/04/1962 |
Reallocation |
44785 |
32A |
Inverness |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
21/04/1962 |
Reallocation |
44785 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
67C |
Ayr |
|
21/04/1962 |
Reallocation |
44977 |
63D |
Fort William |
67D |
Ardrossan |
|
21/04/1962 |
Reallocation |
45117 |
60A |
Inverness |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
21/04/1962 |
Reallocation |
45117 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
67B |
Hurlford |
|
21/04/1962 |
Reallocation |
45123 |
32A |
Inverness |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
21/04/1962 |
Reallocation |
45123 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
67B |
Hurlford |
|
21/04/1962 |
Reallocation |
45277 |
17B |
Burton |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
21/04/1962 |
Reallocation |
45470 |
60A |
Inverness |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
21/04/1962 |
Reallocation |
45470 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
67D |
Ardrossan |
|
21/04/1962 |
Reallocation |
45479 |
60A |
Inverness |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
21/04/1962 |
Reallocation |
45479 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
67D |
Ardrossan |
|
28/04/1962 |
Reallocation |
44774 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
17A |
Derby |
|
28/04/1962 |
Reallocation |
44941 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
17A |
Derby |
|
28/04/1962 |
Reallocation |
45274 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
17A |
Derby |
|
28/04/1962 |
Reallocation |
45285 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
17A |
Derby |
|
05/05/1962 |
Reallocation |
45197 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
05/05/1962 |
Reallocation |
45235 |
5A |
Crewe North |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
05/05/1962 |
Reallocation |
45237 |
5A |
Crewe North |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
05/05/1962 |
Reallocation |
45289 |
5A |
Crewe North |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
05/05/1962 |
Reallocation |
45311 |
5A |
Crewe North |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
05/05/1962 |
Reallocation |
45348 |
5A |
Crewe North |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
05/05/1962 |
Reallocation |
45369 |
5A |
Crewe North |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
12/05/1962 |
Reallocation |
44665 |
17F |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
16D |
Annesley |
|
19/05/1962 |
Reallocation |
44682 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
19/05/1962 |
Reallocation |
44827 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
19/05/1962 |
Reallocation |
44991 |
32A |
Inverness |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
19/05/1962 |
Condemned |
45265 |
21A |
Saltley |
|
COND |
|
26/05/1962 |
Reallocation |
44877 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
26/05/1962 |
Reallocation |
44951 |
56D |
Mirfield |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
26/05/1962 |
Reallocation |
45059 |
17A |
Derby |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
26/05/1962 |
Reallocation |
45207 |
56D |
Mirfield |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
26/05/1962 |
Reallocation |
45208 |
56D |
Mirfield |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
02/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
45014 |
11A |
Carnforth |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
02/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
45193 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
16/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
45092 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
16/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
45453 |
63A |
Perth South |
68B |
Dumfries |
|
16/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
45485 |
66B |
Motherwell |
68C |
Stranraer |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
44714 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
44758 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
44780 |
1A |
Willesden |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
44916 |
1A |
Willesden |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
44951 |
56A |
Wakefield |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
45021 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
45027 |
1A |
Willesden |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
45046 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
45059 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
17A |
Derby |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
45069 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
45131 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
45181 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
45188 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
45189 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
45207 |
56A |
Wakefield |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
45208 |
56A |
Wakefield |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
45225 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5D |
Stoke |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
45256 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
45257 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
45278 |
1A |
Willesden |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
45282 |
1A |
Willesden |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
45295 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
45316 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
45329 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
45332 |
21C |
Bushbury |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
45340 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
45354 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
45380 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
45390 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
45398 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
45399 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
45412 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
6H |
Bangor |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
45413 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
6H |
Bangor |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
45421 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
12E |
Barrow in Furness |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
45426 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
30/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
44728 |
|
|
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
07/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
44918 |
17B |
Burton |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
14/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
44760 |
2A |
Rugby |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
14/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
44784 |
67C |
Ayr |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
14/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
44785 |
67C |
Ayr |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
14/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
45222 |
2A |
Rugby |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
14/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
45469 |
61B |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
21/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
44717 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
21/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
45073 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
21/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
45140 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
21/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
45374 |
21B |
Bescot |
21D |
Aston |
|
28/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
44937 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
28/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
45018 |
68A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
28/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
45139 |
2A |
Rugby |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
04/08/1962 |
Reallocation |
44750 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
5D |
Stoke |
|
04/08/1962 |
Reallocation |
44831 |
2A |
Rugby |
5D |
Stoke |
|
04/08/1962 |
Reallocation |
44844 |
1A |
Willesden |
5D |
Stoke |
|
04/08/1962 |
Reallocation |
45082 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
04/08/1962 |
Reallocation |
45083 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
04/08/1962 |
Reallocation |
45139 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
5D |
Stoke |
|
04/08/1962 |
Reallocation |
45306 |
11A |
Carnforth |
5D |
Stoke |
|
04/08/1962 |
Reallocation |
45414 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
5D |
Stoke |
|
04/08/1962 |
Reallocation |
45437 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
5D |
Stoke |
|
18/08/1962 |
Reallocation |
44750 |
5D |
Stoke |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
18/08/1962 |
Reallocation |
44831 |
5D |
Stoke |
2A |
Rugby |
|
18/08/1962 |
Reallocation |
44844 |
5D |
Stoke |
1A |
Willesden |
|
18/08/1962 |
Reallocation |
45100 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
12C |
Carlisle Canal |
|
18/08/1962 |
Reallocation |
45139 |
5D |
Stoke |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
18/08/1962 |
Reallocation |
45306 |
5D |
Stoke |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
18/08/1962 |
Reallocation |
45414 |
5D |
Stoke |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
18/08/1962 |
Reallocation |
45437 |
5D |
Stoke |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
08/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
44786 |
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
66C |
Hamilton (West) |
|
08/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
44976 |
63D |
Fort William |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
08/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
44977 |
67D |
Ardrossan |
67C |
Ayr |
|
08/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
45164 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
67C |
Ayr |
|
08/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
45356 |
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
08/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
45384 |
67D |
Ardrossan |
67C |
Ayr |
|
08/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
45460 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
67C |
Ayr |
|
08/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
45490 |
67D |
Ardrossan |
67C |
Ayr |
|
08/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
45497 |
67D |
Ardrossan |
67C |
Ayr |
|
15/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
44714 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
15/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
44717 |
14B |
Kentish Town |
16D |
Annesley |
|
15/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
44889 |
24B |
Rose Grove |
24F |
Fleetwood |
|
15/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
44894 |
24B |
Rose Grove |
24F |
Fleetwood |
|
15/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
45021 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
15/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
45046 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
15/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
45055 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
15/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
45069 |
6J |
Holyhead |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
15/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
45070 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
15/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
45188 |
6J |
Holyhead |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
15/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
45189 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
15/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
45199 |
10C |
Patricroft |
26C |
Bolton |
|
15/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
45257 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
15/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
45267 |
14B |
Kentish Town |
16D |
Annesley |
|
15/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
45278 |
6J |
Holyhead |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
15/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
45301 |
2E |
Northampton |
1A |
Willesden |
|
15/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
45304 |
10C |
Patricroft |
26C |
Bolton |
|
15/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
45329 |
6J |
Holyhead |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
15/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
45332 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
15/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
45354 |
6J |
Holyhead |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
15/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
45378 |
10C |
Patricroft |
26C |
Bolton |
|
15/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
45380 |
6J |
Holyhead |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
15/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
45427 |
2E |
Northampton |
1A |
Willesden |
|
22/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
44688 |
14B |
Kentish Town |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
22/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
44691 |
14E |
Bedford |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
22/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
44774 |
17A |
Derby |
17B |
Burton |
|
22/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
44777 |
17A |
Derby |
17B |
Burton |
|
22/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
44816 |
17A |
Derby |
17B |
Burton |
|
22/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
44825 |
17A |
Derby |
17B |
Burton |
|
22/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
44839 |
17A |
Derby |
17B |
Burton |
|
22/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
44846 |
14B |
Kentish Town |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
22/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
44851 |
17A |
Derby |
17B |
Burton |
|
22/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
44858 |
17A |
Derby |
17B |
Burton |
|
22/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
44941 |
17A |
Derby |
17B |
Burton |
|
22/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
45059 |
17A |
Derby |
17B |
Burton |
|
22/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
45062 |
17A |
Derby |
17B |
Burton |
|
22/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
45238 |
14E |
Bedford |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
22/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
45279 |
17A |
Derby |
17B |
Burton |
|
22/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
45285 |
17A |
Derby |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
22/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
45335 |
17A |
Derby |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
22/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
45342 |
17A |
Derby |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
29/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
44667 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
29/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
44975 |
63D |
Fort William |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
29/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
45262 |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
13/10/1962 |
Reallocation |
44776 |
21A |
Saltley |
17A |
Derby |
|
13/10/1962 |
Reallocation |
44851 |
17B |
Burton |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
13/10/1962 |
Reallocation |
44916 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
9A |
Longsight |
|
13/10/1962 |
Reallocation |
45131 |
6J |
Holyhead |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
13/10/1962 |
Reallocation |
45181 |
6J |
Holyhead |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
13/10/1962 |
Reallocation |
45253 |
21A |
Saltley |
17A |
Derby |
|
13/10/1962 |
Reallocation |
45256 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
9A |
Longsight |
|
13/10/1962 |
Reallocation |
45412 |
6H |
Bangor |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
13/10/1962 |
Reallocation |
45413 |
6H |
Bangor |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
13/10/1962 |
Reallocation |
45439 |
3B |
Bushbury |
21D |
Aston |
|
13/10/1962 |
Reallocation |
45441 |
6J |
Holyhead |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
10/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
44676 |
12E |
Barrow in Furness |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
10/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
44677 |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
10/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
44713 |
5B |
Crewe South |
2E |
Northampton |
|
10/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
44774 |
17B |
Burton |
14E |
Bedford |
|
10/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
44802 |
6J |
Holyhead |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
10/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
45020 |
1E |
Bletchley |
1A |
Willesden |
|
10/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
45028 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
10/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
45037 |
1E |
Bletchley |
1A |
Willesden |
|
10/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
45072 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
10/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
45097 |
24L |
Carnforth |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
10/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
45148 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
10/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
45254 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
10/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
45421 |
12E |
Barrow in Furness |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
17/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
45050 |
2A |
Rugby |
2E |
Northampton |
|
24/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
44786 |
66C |
Hamilton (West) |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
24/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
44788 |
63A |
Perth South |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
24/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
45090 |
66C |
Hamilton (West) |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
24/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
45168 |
66B |
Motherwell |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
24/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
45179 |
66C |
Hamilton (West) |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
24/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
45225 |
5D |
Stoke |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
24/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
45467 |
67B |
Hurlford |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
01/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
44867 |
5D |
Stoke |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
01/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
44871 |
5D |
Stoke |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
01/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
45262 |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
17A |
Derby |
|
08/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
44777 |
17B |
Burton |
17A |
Derby |
|
08/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
44819 |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
17A |
Derby |
|
08/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
45045 |
5B |
Crewe South |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
15/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
44837 |
21C |
Bushbury |
21D |
Aston |
|
15/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
45074 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5D |
Stoke |
|
15/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
45439 |
21D |
Aston |
21C |
Bushbury |
|
22/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
44960 |
29A |
Perth South |
63B |
Fort William |
|
22/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
45156 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
26C |
Bolton |
|
22/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
45165 |
66C |
Hamilton (West) |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
22/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
45224 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
26C |
Bolton |
|
22/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
45232 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
26C |
Bolton |
|
22/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
45240 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5D |
Stoke |
|
22/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
45395 |
21D |
Aston |
5D |
Stoke |
|
29/12/1962 |
Condemned |
45030 |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
COND |
|
29/12/1962 |
Condemned |
45036 |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
COND |
|
29/12/1962 |
Condemned |
45085 |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
COND |
|
29/12/1962 |
Condemned |
45086 |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
COND |
|
29/12/1962 |
Condemned |
45098 |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
COND |
|
29/12/1962 |
Condemned |
45119 |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
COND |
|
29/12/1962 |
Condemned |
45125 |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
COND |
|
29/12/1962 |
Condemned |
45151 |
68A |
|
|
COND |
|
29/12/1962 |
Condemned |
45152 |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
COND |
|
29/12/1962 |
Condemned |
45157 |
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
COND |
|
29/12/1962 |
Condemned |
45159 |
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
COND |
|
29/12/1962 |
Condemned |
45165 |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
COND |
|
29/12/1962 |
Condemned |
45169 |
68B |
Dumfries |
|
COND |
|
29/12/1962 |
Condemned |
45174 |
64D |
Carstairs |
|
COND |
|
29/12/1962 |
Condemned |
45179 |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
COND |
|
29/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
45191 |
1A |
Willesden |
5D |
Stoke |
|
29/12/1962 |
Condemned |
45266 |
67B |
Hurlford |
|
COND |
|
29/12/1962 |
Condemned |
45355 |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
COND |
|
29/12/1962 |
Condemned |
45452 |
64D |
Carstairs |
|
COND |
|
29/12/1962 |
Condemned |
45453 |
68B |
Dumfries |
|
COND |
|
29/12/1962 |
Condemned |
45458 |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
COND |
|
12/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
45195 |
26B |
Agecroft |
12C |
Carlisle Canal |
|
12/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
45218 |
27C |
Southport |
12C |
Carlisle Canal |
|
12/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
45238 |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
12/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
45335 |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
12/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
45342 |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
19/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
44702 |
65A |
Eastfield |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
19/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
44707 |
65A |
Eastfield |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
19/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
44787 |
65A |
Eastfield |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
19/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
44880 |
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
19/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
44881 |
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
19/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
44908 |
65A |
Eastfield |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
19/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
44956 |
65A |
Eastfield |
66E |
Carstairs |
|
19/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
44957 |
65A |
Eastfield |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
19/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
44967 |
65A |
Eastfield |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
19/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
44968 |
65A |
Eastfield |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
19/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
44996 |
65A |
Eastfield |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
19/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
45027 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
2A |
Rugby |
|
19/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
45031 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
2A |
Rugby |
|
19/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
45103 |
26B |
Agecroft |
12C |
Carlisle Canal |
|
19/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
45178 |
65F |
Grangemouth |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
19/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
45241 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5D |
Stoke |
|
19/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
45429 |
5A |
Crewe North |
2A |
Rugby |
|
19/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
45496 |
65F |
Grangemouth |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
26/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
44932 |
16D |
Annesley |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
26/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
45064 |
21B |
Bescot |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
26/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
45105 |
27C |
Southport |
12C |
Carlisle Canal |
|
26/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
45116 |
16D |
Annesley |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
26/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
45299 |
5B |
Crewe South |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
26/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
45444 |
16D |
Annesley |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
02/02/1963 |
Reallocation |
44932 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
16D |
Annesley |
|
02/02/1963 |
Reallocation |
44948 |
24B |
Rose Grove |
24H |
Hellifield |
|
02/02/1963 |
Reallocation |
45209 |
24B |
Rose Grove |
24H |
Hellifield |
|
02/02/1963 |
Reallocation |
45234 |
16D |
Annesley |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
09/02/1963 |
Reallocation |
44661 |
6J |
Holyhead |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
09/02/1963 |
Reallocation |
45044 |
1A |
Willesden |
2E |
Northampton |
|
09/02/1963 |
Reallocation |
45142 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
09/02/1963 |
Reallocation |
45197 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
09/02/1963 |
Reallocation |
45289 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
09/02/1963 |
Reallocation |
45348 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
09/02/1963 |
Reallocation |
45353 |
3D |
Aston |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
09/02/1963 |
Reallocation |
45369 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
16/02/1963 |
Reallocation |
44789 |
68C |
Stranraer |
67B |
Hurlford |
|
16/02/1963 |
Reallocation |
44801 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
67B |
Hurlford |
|
16/02/1963 |
Reallocation |
45069 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
16/02/1963 |
Reallocation |
45358 |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
67B |
Hurlford |
|
23/02/1963 |
Reallocation |
44809 |
17F |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
9A |
Longsight |
|
23/02/1963 |
Reallocation |
45065 |
3D |
Aston |
2A |
Rugby |
|
23/02/1963 |
Reallocation |
45139 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
23/02/1963 |
Reallocation |
45231 |
21D |
Aston |
2A |
Rugby |
|
23/02/1963 |
Reallocation |
45256 |
9A |
Longsight |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
23/02/1963 |
Reallocation |
45418 |
3D |
Aston |
2A |
Rugby |
|
23/02/1963 |
Reallocation |
45448 |
3D |
Aston |
2A |
Rugby |
|
02/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
45033 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
02/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
45045 |
6J |
Holyhead |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
02/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
45091 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
02/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
45282 |
6J |
Holyhead |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
02/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
45301 |
1A |
Willesden |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
02/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
45327 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
09/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
44776 |
17A |
Derby |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
09/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
44777 |
17A |
Derby |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
09/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
44821 |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
09/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
44846 |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
16D |
Annesley |
|
09/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
44851 |
16A |
Nottingham |
17B |
Burton |
|
09/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
45146 |
21B |
Bescot |
5D |
Stoke |
|
09/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
45223 |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
09/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
45234 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
16D |
Annesley |
|
09/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
45253 |
17A |
Derby |
21A |
Saltley |
|
09/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
45262 |
17A |
Derby |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
09/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
45267 |
16D |
Annesley |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
09/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
45277 |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
09/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
45279 |
17B |
Burton |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
09/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
45346 |
17A |
Derby |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
09/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
45364 |
12F |
Workington |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
09/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
45387 |
21B |
Bescot |
5D |
Stoke |
|
16/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
44808 |
10C |
Patricroft |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
16/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
45095 |
10C |
Patricroft |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
16/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
45196 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
16/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
45253 |
21A |
Saltley |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
16/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
45257 |
5A |
Crewe North |
1A |
Willesden |
|
16/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
45270 |
5A |
Crewe North |
1A |
Willesden |
|
30/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
45065 |
2A |
Rugby |
2E |
Northampton |
|
30/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
45353 |
5A |
Crewe North |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
30/03/1963 |
Reallocation |
45380 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
06/04/1963 |
Reallocation |
44851 |
17B |
Burton |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
06/04/1963 |
Reallocation |
45221 |
21A |
Saltley |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
06/04/1963 |
Reallocation |
45403 |
5B |
Crewe South |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
13/04/1963 |
Reallocation |
44707 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
67E |
Dumfries |
|
13/04/1963 |
Condemned |
44740 |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
|
COND |
|
13/04/1963 |
Reallocation |
44957 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
67E |
Dumfries |
|
13/04/1963 |
Reallocation |
44967 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
67E |
Dumfries |
|
13/04/1963 |
Reallocation |
44996 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
67E |
Dumfries |
|
13/04/1963 |
Reallocation |
45238 |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
20/04/1963 |
Reallocation |
45020 |
1A |
Willesden |
5D |
Stoke |
|
20/04/1963 |
Reallocation |
45037 |
1A |
Willesden |
5D |
Stoke |
|
20/04/1963 |
Reallocation |
45257 |
1A |
Willesden |
5D |
Stoke |
|
27/04/1963 |
Reallocation |
45111 |
1A |
Willesden |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
27/04/1963 |
Reallocation |
45427 |
1A |
Willesden |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
04/05/1963 |
Condemned |
44747 |
9A |
Longsight |
|
COND |
|
11/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
44661 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
11/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
44855 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
11/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
44960 |
63B |
Fort William |
63A |
Perth South |
|
11/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
44964 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
11/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
45197 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
11/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
45210 |
27B |
Aintree |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
11/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
45289 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
11/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
45330 |
68A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
27B |
Aintree |
|
11/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
45348 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
11/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
45369 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
18/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
44659 |
|
|
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
18/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
44676 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
27B |
Aintree |
|
18/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
44689 |
27C |
Southport |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
18/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
44692 |
27B |
Aintree |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
18/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
44729 |
27B |
Aintree |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
18/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
44744 |
27C |
Southport |
9A |
Longsight |
|
18/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
44777 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
18/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
44804 |
21A |
Saltley |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
18/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
44809 |
9A |
Longsight |
27C |
Southport |
|
18/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
44815 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
21A |
Saltley |
|
18/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
44856 |
16A |
Nottingham |
21A |
Saltley |
|
18/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
44887 |
27B |
Aintree |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
18/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
44888 |
21A |
Saltley |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
18/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
44920 |
21A |
Saltley |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
18/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
44958 |
68A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
27B |
Aintree |
|
18/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
44962 |
21A |
Saltley |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
18/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
44984 |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
14E |
Bedford |
|
18/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
45018 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
26C |
Bolton |
|
18/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
45061 |
27B |
Aintree |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
18/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
45083 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
27C |
Southport |
|
18/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
45112 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
27B |
Aintree |
|
18/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
45116 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
18/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
45118 |
68A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
27B |
Aintree |
|
18/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
45120 |
68A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
27B |
Aintree |
|
18/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
45156 |
26C |
Bolton |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
18/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
45228 |
27B |
Aintree |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
18/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
45264 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
21A |
Saltley |
|
18/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
45269 |
21A |
Saltley |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
18/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
45279 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
18/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
45333 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
21A |
Saltley |
|
18/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
45416 |
14E |
Bedford |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
18/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
45444 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
25/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
44664 |
17A |
Derby |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
25/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
44774 |
14E |
Bedford |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
25/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
44816 |
17B |
Burton |
27C |
Southport |
|
25/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
44817 |
17B |
Burton |
26C |
Bolton |
|
25/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
44818 |
17B |
Burton |
26C |
Bolton |
|
25/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
44819 |
17A |
Derby |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
25/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
44821 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
6H |
Bangor |
|
25/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
44822 |
17B |
Burton |
26C |
Bolton |
|
25/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
44985 |
14E |
Bedford |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
25/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
44989 |
23C |
Southport |
17B |
Burton |
|
25/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
45102 |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
17A |
Derby |
|
25/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
45144 |
7B |
Bangor |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
25/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
45197 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
14E |
Bedford |
|
25/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
45199 |
26C |
Bolton |
17B |
Burton |
|
25/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
45217 |
16D |
Annesley |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
25/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
45223 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
6H |
Bangor |
|
25/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
45224 |
26C |
Bolton |
17B |
Burton |
|
25/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
45232 |
26C |
Bolton |
17B |
Burton |
|
25/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
45274 |
17A |
Derby |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
25/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
45277 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
25/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
45289 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
14E |
Bedford |
|
25/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
45301 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
25/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
45334 |
68A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
16D |
Annesley |
|
25/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
45417 |
7B |
Bangor |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
25/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
45442 |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
17A |
Derby |
|
25/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
45464 |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
17A |
Derby |
|
08/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45443 |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
08/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45490 |
67C |
Ayr |
67B |
Hurlford |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
44676 |
27B |
Aintree |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
44688 |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
17B |
Burton |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
44689 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
44711 |
2A |
Rugby |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
44712 |
2A |
Rugby |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
44770 |
5A |
Crewe North |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
44776 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
21A |
Saltley |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
44808 |
66B |
Motherwell |
26F |
Patricroft |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
44815 |
21A |
Saltley |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
44817 |
26C |
Bolton |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
44818 |
26C |
Bolton |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
44822 |
26C |
Bolton |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
44829 |
3B |
Bushbury |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
44864 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
44865 |
21D |
Aston |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
44871 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
44884 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
44889 |
24F |
Fleetwood |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
44894 |
24F |
Fleetwood |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
44897 |
2A |
Rugby |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
44912 |
56C |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
44939 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
44948 |
24H |
Hellifield |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45000 |
5B |
Crewe South |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45004 |
5B |
Crewe South |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45012 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45020 |
5D |
Stoke |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45025 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45028 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45031 |
2A |
Rugby |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45035 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45042 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45043 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45065 |
2E |
Northampton |
1A |
Willesden |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45069 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45072 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45081 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45082 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45092 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45095 |
66B |
Motherwell |
26F |
Patricroft |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45103 |
12C |
Carlisle Canal |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45105 |
12C |
Carlisle Canal |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45106 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45118 |
27B |
Aintree |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45130 |
2A |
Rugby |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45156 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45181 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45184 |
2A |
Rugby |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45185 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45195 |
12C |
Carlisle Canal |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45209 |
24H |
Hellifield |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45218 |
12C |
Carlisle Canal |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45219 |
56C |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45226 |
24F |
Fleetwood |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45231 |
2A |
Rugby |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45236 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45244 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45246 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45257 |
5D |
Stoke |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45259 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45267 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45286 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45293 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45295 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45296 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
26F |
Patricroft |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45300 |
5B |
Crewe South |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45312 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45316 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
26F |
Patricroft |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45317 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45323 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45329 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45333 |
21A |
Saltley |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45351 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45353 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45354 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45368 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45375 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45387 |
5D |
Stoke |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45392 |
2E |
Northampton |
1A |
Willesden |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45397 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45402 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45404 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45413 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45419 |
2A |
Rugby |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45429 |
2A |
Rugby |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45437 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45438 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45444 |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45451 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45493 |
2A |
Rugby |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
29/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45020 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
5D |
Stoke |
|
29/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45257 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
5D |
Stoke |
|
29/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45385 |
9A |
Longsight |
26F |
Patricroft |
|
29/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
45387 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
5D |
Stoke |
|
06/07/1963 |
Reallocation |
44984 |
14E |
Bedford |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
06/07/1963 |
Reallocation |
45069 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
06/07/1963 |
Reallocation |
45197 |
14E |
Bedford |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
06/07/1963 |
Reallocation |
45289 |
14E |
Bedford |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
06/07/1963 |
Reallocation |
45312 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
06/07/1963 |
Reallocation |
45375 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
27C |
Southport |
|
06/07/1963 |
Reallocation |
45384 |
67C |
Ayr |
67F |
Stranraer |
|
06/07/1963 |
Reallocation |
45413 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
26F |
Patricroft |
|
13/07/1963 |
Reallocation |
44843 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
21A |
Saltley |
|
13/07/1963 |
Reallocation |
44864 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
13/07/1963 |
Reallocation |
45103 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
13/07/1963 |
Reallocation |
45181 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
13/07/1963 |
Condemned |
45189 |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
COND |
|
13/07/1963 |
Reallocation |
45195 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
13/07/1963 |
Reallocation |
45244 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
13/07/1963 |
Reallocation |
45329 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
20/07/1963 |
Reallocation |
45017 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
27C |
Southport |
|
20/07/1963 |
Reallocation |
45055 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
27C |
Southport |
|
20/07/1963 |
Reallocation |
45347 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
20/07/1963 |
Reallocation |
45373 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
26/07/1963 |
Condemned |
45087 |
64D |
Carstairs |
|
COND |
|
26/07/1963 |
Condemned |
45175 |
64D |
Carstairs |
|
COND |
|
27/07/1963 |
Reallocation |
45026 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
27/07/1963 |
Reallocation |
45057 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
27/07/1963 |
Reallocation |
45073 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
27/07/1963 |
Reallocation |
45109 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
27/07/1963 |
Reallocation |
45380 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
27/07/1963 |
Reallocation |
45388 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
03/08/1963 |
Reallocation |
44667 |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
03/08/1963 |
Reallocation |
44777 |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
03/08/1963 |
Condemned |
45244 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
10/08/1963 |
Reallocation |
44691 |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
10/08/1963 |
Reallocation |
45088 |
21A |
Saltley |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
10/08/1963 |
Reallocation |
45260 |
21A |
Saltley |
17A |
Derby |
|
17/08/1963 |
Reallocation |
45044 |
2E |
Northampton |
2A |
Rugby |
|
17/08/1963 |
Reallocation |
45065 |
1A |
Willesden |
2A |
Rugby |
|
17/08/1963 |
Reallocation |
45135 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
27C |
Southport |
|
17/08/1963 |
Reallocation |
45188 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
17/08/1963 |
Reallocation |
45276 |
1A |
Willesden |
5D |
Stoke |
|
24/08/1963 |
Reallocation |
45109 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
27C |
Southport |
|
24/08/1963 |
Reallocation |
45337 |
26B |
Agecroft |
27C |
Southport |
|
24/08/1963 |
Reallocation |
45380 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
9A |
Longsight |
|
29/08/1963 |
Condemned |
45010 |
67B |
Hurlford |
|
COND |
|
29/08/1963 |
Condemned |
45049 |
63B |
Stirling |
|
COND |
|
31/08/1963 |
Condemned |
45315 |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
COND |
|
09/1963 |
Condemned |
44750 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
COND |
|
09/1963 |
Condemned |
45199 |
17B |
Burton |
|
COND |
|
07/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
44702 |
66B |
Motherwell |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
07/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
44972 |
66A |
Polmadie |
67B |
Hurlford |
|
07/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
44974 |
66A |
Polmadie |
67D |
Ardrossan |
|
07/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
45168 |
66B |
Motherwell |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
07/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
45320 |
66A |
Polmadie |
65J |
Stirling |
|
07/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
45459 |
66A |
Polmadie |
67B |
Hurlford |
|
14/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
44686 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
8M |
Southport |
|
14/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
44687 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
8M |
Southport |
|
14/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
44823 |
26B |
Agecroft |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
14/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
44824 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
55C |
Farnley Junction |
|
14/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
44826 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
55C |
Farnley Junction |
|
14/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
44837 |
21D |
Aston |
1F |
Rugby |
|
14/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
44865 |
6J |
Holyhead |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
14/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
44912 |
56F |
Low Moor |
55D |
Royston |
|
14/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
44943 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
55C |
Farnley Junction |
|
14/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
45021 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
14/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
45033 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
14/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
45035 |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
10C |
Fleetwood |
|
14/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
45042 |
6J |
Holyhead |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
14/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
45043 |
6J |
Holyhead |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
14/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
45046 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
14/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
45093 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
14/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
45132 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5D |
Stoke |
|
14/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
45142 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
14/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
45181 |
24L |
Carnforth |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
14/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
45207 |
56F |
Low Moor |
55D |
Royston |
|
14/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
45219 |
56F |
Low Moor |
55D |
Royston |
|
14/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
45261 |
26B |
Agecroft |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
14/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
45288 |
1A |
Willesden |
1F |
Rugby |
|
14/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
45329 |
24L |
Carnforth |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
14/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
45338 |
26B |
Agecroft |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
14/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
45344 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5C |
Stafford |
|
14/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
45347 |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
10C |
Fleetwood |
|
14/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
45349 |
3D |
Aston |
1H |
Northampton |
|
14/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
45353 |
6J |
Holyhead |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
14/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
45373 |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
10J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
14/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
45392 |
1A |
Willesden |
1F |
Rugby |
|
14/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
45397 |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
10C |
Fleetwood |
|
14/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
45434 |
1A |
Willesden |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
14/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
45438 |
6J |
Holyhead |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
14/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
45446 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5D |
Stoke |
|
16/09/1963 |
Condemned |
45022 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1963 |
Condemned |
45023 |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1963 |
Condemned |
45099 |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1963 |
Condemned |
45123 |
67B |
Hurlford |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1963 |
Condemned |
45166 |
64D |
Carstairs |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1963 |
Condemned |
45457 |
67D |
Ardrossan |
|
COND |
|
21/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
44897 |
6J |
Holyhead |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
28/09/1963 |
Condemned |
45100 |
12C |
Carlisle Canal |
|
COND |
|
05/10/1963 |
Reallocation |
44829 |
6J |
Holyhead |
2E |
Saltley |
|
05/10/1963 |
Reallocation |
45057 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
05/10/1963 |
Reallocation |
45103 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
05/10/1963 |
Reallocation |
45118 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
05/10/1963 |
Reallocation |
45195 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
05/10/1963 |
Reallocation |
45309 |
66B |
Motherwell |
66E |
Carstairs |
|
05/10/1963 |
Reallocation |
45369 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
2E |
Saltley |
|
05/10/1963 |
Reallocation |
45388 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
12/10/1963 |
Reallocation |
45109 |
27C |
Southport |
8K |
Bank Hall |
|
12/10/1963 |
Reallocation |
45250 |
5A |
Crewe North |
2E |
Saltley |
|
12/10/1963 |
Reallocation |
45256 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
19/10/1963 |
Reallocation |
45041 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
8K |
Bank Hall |
|
19/10/1963 |
Reallocation |
45129 |
10C |
Patricroft |
8K |
Bank Hall |
|
19/10/1963 |
Reallocation |
45188 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
19/10/1963 |
Reallocation |
45411 |
10C |
Patricroft |
9K |
Bolton |
|
26/10/1963 |
Reallocation |
45044 |
2A |
Rugby |
1A |
Willesden |
|
26/10/1963 |
Reallocation |
45096 |
26F |
Patricroft |
9J |
Agecroft |
|
26/10/1963 |
Reallocation |
45270 |
1A |
Willesden |
1F |
Rugby |
|
26/10/1963 |
Reallocation |
45296 |
26F |
Patricroft |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
26/10/1963 |
Reallocation |
45385 |
26F |
Patricroft |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
26/10/1963 |
Reallocation |
45404 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
9A |
Longsight |
|
28/10/1963 |
Condemned |
45320 |
65J |
Stirling |
|
COND |
|
28/10/1963 |
Condemned |
45485 |
68C |
Stranraer |
|
COND |
|
02/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
44667 |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
10J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
02/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
44691 |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
2E |
Saltley |
|
02/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
44718 |
67B |
Hurlford |
65D |
Dawsholm |
|
02/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
44777 |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
2E |
Saltley |
|
02/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
44844 |
1A |
Willesden |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
02/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
45000 |
6J |
Holyhead |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
02/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
45044 |
1A |
Willesden |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
02/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
45116 |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
02/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
45192 |
67B |
Hurlford |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
02/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
45198 |
1A |
Willesden |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
02/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
45279 |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
02/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
45285 |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
02/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
45305 |
1A |
Willesden |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
02/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
45362 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
02/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
45488 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
09/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
44738 |
|
|
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
09/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
44739 |
|
|
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
09/11/1963 |
Condemned |
44744 |
9A |
Longsight |
|
COND |
|
09/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
44753 |
|
|
10H |
Lower Darwen |
|
09/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
44756 |
|
|
10H |
Lower Darwen |
|
09/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
44757 |
|
|
10H |
Lower Darwen |
|
09/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
45026 |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
10C |
Fleetwood |
|
09/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
45095 |
26F |
Patricroft |
9J |
Agecroft |
|
09/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
45133 |
10C |
Patricroft |
9J |
Agecroft |
|
09/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
45227 |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
10C |
Fleetwood |
|
09/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
45274 |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
10C |
Fleetwood |
|
09/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
45294 |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
9J |
Agecroft |
|
09/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
45420 |
26F |
Patricroft |
9J |
Agecroft |
|
09/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
45424 |
10C |
Patricroft |
9J |
Agecroft |
|
16/11/1963 |
Condemned |
44755 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
COND |
|
16/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
44888 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
16C |
Derby |
|
23/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
44690 |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
16C |
Derby |
|
23/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
44811 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
16C |
Derby |
|
23/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
44815 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
16C |
Derby |
|
23/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
44817 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
9J |
Agecroft |
|
23/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
44822 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
9J |
Agecroft |
|
23/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
44830 |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
16C |
Derby |
|
23/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
44889 |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
10J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
23/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
44920 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
16C |
Derby |
|
23/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
44962 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
16C |
Derby |
|
23/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
45018 |
26C |
Bolton |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
23/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
45062 |
17B |
Burton |
16C |
Derby |
|
23/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
45077 |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
10C |
Fleetwood |
|
23/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
45112 |
27B |
Aintree |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
23/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
45120 |
27B |
Aintree |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
23/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
45221 |
16A |
Nottingham |
16C |
Derby |
|
23/11/1963 |
Condemned |
45317 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
23/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
45368 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
9J |
Agecroft |
|
23/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
45437 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
9J |
Agecroft |
|
29/11/1963 |
Condemned |
45367 |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
COND |
|
30/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
44659 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
16C |
Derby |
|
30/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
44753 |
10H |
Lower Darwen |
8M |
Southport |
|
30/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
44756 |
10H |
Lower Darwen |
8M |
Southport |
|
30/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
44757 |
10H |
Lower Darwen |
8M |
Southport |
|
30/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
44804 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
16C |
Derby |
|
30/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
44894 |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
10J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
30/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
45088 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
16C |
Derby |
|
30/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
45358 |
67B |
Hurlford |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
30/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
45361 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
65J |
Stirling |
|
07/12/1963 |
Reallocation |
45209 |
24L |
Carnforth |
10J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
07/12/1963 |
Reallocation |
45354 |
24L |
Carnforth |
10J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
07/12/1963 |
Reallocation |
45451 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
8L |
Aintree |
|
14/12/1963 |
Reallocation |
45323 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
8L |
Aintree |
|
14/12/1963 |
Reallocation |
45351 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
9K |
Bolton |
|
21/12/1963 |
Reallocation |
45253 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
16C |
Derby |
|
26/12/1963 |
Condemned |
44885 |
68B |
Dumfries |
|
COND |
|
28/12/1963 |
Condemned |
44706 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
28/12/1963 |
Condemned |
44969 |
28A |
Motherwell |
|
COND |
|
28/12/1963 |
Condemned |
45251 |
67D |
Ardrossan |
|
COND |
|
28/12/1963 |
Condemned |
45358 |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
COND |
|
04/01/1964 |
Reallocation |
45239 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
9J |
Agecroft |
|
11/01/1964 |
Reallocation |
44736 |
|
|
9H |
Patricroft |
|
11/01/1964 |
Reallocation |
44893 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
11/01/1964 |
Reallocation |
45103 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
11/01/1964 |
Reallocation |
45104 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
8L |
Aintree |
|
11/01/1964 |
Reallocation |
45154 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
8L |
Aintree |
|
18/01/1964 |
Reallocation |
44824 |
55C |
Farnley Junction |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
18/01/1964 |
Reallocation |
45079 |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
18/01/1964 |
Reallocation |
45211 |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
25/01/1964 |
Reallocation |
44935 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
8K |
Bank Hall |
|
25/01/1964 |
Reallocation |
45068 |
24B |
Rose Grove |
8L |
Aintree |
|
25/01/1964 |
Reallocation |
45153 |
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
67E |
Dumfries |
|
25/01/1964 |
Reallocation |
45158 |
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
67D |
Ardrossan |
|
25/01/1964 |
Reallocation |
45229 |
24B |
Rose Grove |
8L |
Aintree |
|
25/01/1964 |
Reallocation |
45270 |
1F |
Rugby |
1H |
Northampton |
|
02/1964 |
Condemned |
45487 |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
COND |
|
02/1964 |
Condemned |
45497 |
67C |
Ayr |
|
COND |
|
01/02/1964 |
Condemned |
44746 |
26C |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
01/02/1964 |
Reallocation |
44984 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
15D |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
01/02/1964 |
Reallocation |
45402 |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
10C |
Fleetwood |
|
03/02/1964 |
Condemned |
44976 |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
COND |
|
06/02/1964 |
Condemned |
45066 |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
COND |
|
08/02/1964 |
Condemned |
45032 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
COND |
|
08/02/1964 |
Reallocation |
45261 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
08/02/1964 |
Reallocation |
45338 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
08/02/1964 |
Reallocation |
45414 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
13/02/1964 |
Condemned |
45361 |
65J |
Stirling |
|
COND |
|
13/02/1964 |
Condemned |
45465 |
29A |
Perth South |
|
COND |
|
13/02/1964 |
Condemned |
45484 |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
COND |
|
15/02/1964 |
Reallocation |
44714 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5D |
Stoke |
|
15/02/1964 |
Reallocation |
45253 |
16C |
Derby |
16D |
Nottingham |
|
15/02/1964 |
Reallocation |
45321 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
22/02/1964 |
Reallocation |
44673 |
|
|
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
22/02/1964 |
Reallocation |
44674 |
|
|
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
22/02/1964 |
Reallocation |
44675 |
|
|
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
22/02/1964 |
Reallocation |
44696 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
22/02/1964 |
Reallocation |
45220 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
07/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
44684 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
07/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
44714 |
5D |
Stoke |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
07/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
44759 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
07/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
45027 |
2A |
Rugby |
5E |
Nuneaton |
|
07/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
45056 |
2A |
Rugby |
5E |
Nuneaton |
|
07/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
45063 |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
55H |
Neville Hill |
|
07/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
45110 |
7C |
Holyhead |
5C |
Stafford |
|
07/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
45147 |
1E |
Bletchley |
5C |
Stafford |
|
07/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
45204 |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
55H |
Neville Hill |
|
07/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
45292 |
1E |
Bletchley |
1A |
Willesden |
|
07/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
45299 |
1E |
Bletchley |
1A |
Willesden |
|
07/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
45331 |
1E |
Bletchley |
1A |
Willesden |
|
07/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
45353 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
07/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
45379 |
1E |
Bletchley |
1A |
Willesden |
|
07/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
45438 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
07/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
45446 |
5D |
Stoke |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
14/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
44725 |
68A |
|
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
14/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
45064 |
1E |
Bletchley |
2F |
Bescot |
|
14/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
45089 |
1E |
Bletchley |
2F |
Bescot |
|
14/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
45218 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
8P |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
|
14/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
45222 |
1E |
Bletchley |
2F |
Bescot |
|
14/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
45393 |
1E |
Bletchley |
1A |
Willesden |
|
14/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
45434 |
1E |
Bletchley |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
14/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
45466 |
68A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
21/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
45201 |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
28/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
44723 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
67D |
Ardrossan |
|
28/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
45238 |
16A |
Nottingham |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
28/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
45269 |
16A |
Nottingham |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
28/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
45365 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
67D |
Ardrossan |
|
31/03/1964 |
Condemned |
45170 |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
COND |
|
11/04/1964 |
Condemned |
44754 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
COND |
|
11/04/1964 |
Condemned |
45122 |
68A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
17/04/1964 |
Condemned |
44996 |
67E |
Dumfries |
|
COND |
|
17/04/1964 |
Condemned |
45366 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
COND |
|
18/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
44693 |
25F |
Low Moor |
56D |
Mirfield |
|
18/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
44694 |
25F |
Low Moor |
56D |
Mirfield |
|
18/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
44695 |
25F |
Low Moor |
56D |
Mirfield |
|
18/04/1964 |
Condemned |
44752 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
COND |
|
18/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
44813 |
21A |
Saltley |
1F |
Rugby |
|
18/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
44814 |
21A |
Saltley |
1F |
Rugby |
|
18/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
44859 |
21A |
Saltley |
2J |
Aston |
|
18/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
44945 |
21A |
Saltley |
2J |
Aston |
|
18/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
44946 |
25F |
Low Moor |
56D |
Mirfield |
|
18/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
44951 |
56F |
Low Moor |
56D |
Mirfield |
|
18/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
44963 |
21A |
Saltley |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
18/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
44966 |
21A |
Saltley |
2J |
Aston |
|
18/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
44990 |
25F |
Low Moor |
56D |
Mirfield |
|
18/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
45208 |
56F |
Low Moor |
56D |
Mirfield |
|
18/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
45209 |
10J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
18/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
45218 |
8P |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
18/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
45250 |
2E |
Saltley |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
18/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
45268 |
21A |
Saltley |
5D |
Stoke |
|
18/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
45272 |
21A |
Saltley |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
|
05/1964 |
Condemned |
44783 |
32A |
Inverness |
|
COND |
|
05/1964 |
Condemned |
44801 |
67B |
Hurlford |
|
COND |
|
05/1964 |
Condemned |
44922 |
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
COND |
|
05/1964 |
Condemned |
44957 |
67E |
Dumfries |
|
COND |
|
05/1964 |
Condemned |
44967 |
67E |
Dumfries |
|
COND |
|
05/1964 |
Condemned |
44968 |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
COND |
|
05/1964 |
Condemned |
45008 |
28A |
Motherwell |
|
COND |
|
05/1964 |
Condemned |
45121 |
28A |
Motherwell |
|
COND |
|
05/1964 |
Condemned |
45153 |
67E |
Dumfries |
|
COND |
|
05/1964 |
Condemned |
45172 |
66E |
Carstairs |
|
COND |
|
05/1964 |
Condemned |
45356 |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
COND |
|
05/1964 |
Condemned |
45468 |
65B |
|
|
COND |
|
05/1964 |
Condemned |
45479 |
67D |
Ardrossan |
|
COND |
|
02/05/1964 |
Condemned |
44742 |
27C |
Southport |
|
COND |
|
02/05/1964 |
Reallocation |
45197 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
02/05/1964 |
Reallocation |
45289 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
02/05/1964 |
Reallocation |
45417 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
04/05/1964 |
Condemned |
45400 |
63B |
Stirling |
|
COND |
|
09/05/1964 |
Reallocation |
45095 |
9J |
Agecroft |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
09/05/1964 |
Reallocation |
45294 |
9J |
Agecroft |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
14/05/1964 |
Condemned |
45459 |
67B |
Hurlford |
|
COND |
|
16/05/1964 |
Reallocation |
45144 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
16C |
Derby |
|
16/05/1964 |
Reallocation |
45262 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
16C |
Derby |
|
16/05/1964 |
Reallocation |
45301 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
16D |
Nottingham |
|
16/05/1964 |
Reallocation |
45346 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
16D |
Nottingham |
|
30/05/1964 |
Reallocation |
44699 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
67E |
Dumfries |
|
30/05/1964 |
Reallocation |
44723 |
67D |
Ardrossan |
67E |
Dumfries |
|
30/05/1964 |
Reallocation |
44784 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
67E |
Dumfries |
|
30/05/1964 |
Reallocation |
44973 |
66A |
Polmadie |
66E |
Carstairs |
|
30/05/1964 |
Reallocation |
45090 |
66A |
Polmadie |
66E |
Carstairs |
|
30/05/1964 |
Reallocation |
45158 |
67D |
Ardrossan |
67E |
Dumfries |
|
30/05/1964 |
Reallocation |
45456 |
67D |
Ardrossan |
67E |
Dumfries |
|
30/05/1964 |
Reallocation |
45463 |
67D |
Ardrossan |
67E |
Dumfries |
|
30/05/1964 |
Reallocation |
45467 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
67E |
Dumfries |
|
30/05/1964 |
Reallocation |
45478 |
66A |
Polmadie |
66E |
Carstairs |
|
30/05/1964 |
Reallocation |
45492 |
66B |
Motherwell |
66E |
Carstairs |
|
06/1964 |
Condemned |
44784 |
67E |
Dumfries |
|
COND |
|
06/06/1964 |
Condemned |
44738 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
COND |
|
08/06/1964 |
Condemned |
45496 |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
COND |
|
13/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
45063 |
55H |
Neville Hill |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
13/06/1964 |
Condemned |
45144 |
16C |
Derby |
|
COND |
|
13/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
45273 |
55C |
Farnley Junction |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
18/06/1964 |
Condemned |
44701 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
20/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
44682 |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
20/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
44684 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
20/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
44713 |
2E |
Northampton |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
20/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
44714 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
20/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
44759 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
20/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
44816 |
27C |
Southport |
8K |
Bank Hall |
|
20/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
44827 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
20/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
44833 |
2A |
Rugby |
1A |
Willesden |
|
20/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
44860 |
2A |
Rugby |
1A |
Willesden |
|
20/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
44862 |
2A |
Rugby |
1A |
Willesden |
|
20/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
45001 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
20/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
45017 |
27C |
Southport |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
20/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
45034 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
20/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
45048 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
20/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
45050 |
2E |
Northampton |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
20/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
45067 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
20/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
45083 |
27C |
Southport |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
20/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
45132 |
5D |
Stoke |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
20/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
45145 |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
6H |
Bangor |
|
20/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
45150 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
20/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
45154 |
8L |
Aintree |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
20/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
45257 |
5D |
Stoke |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
20/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
45270 |
1H |
Northampton |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
20/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
45271 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
20/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
45272 |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
20/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
45288 |
1F |
Rugby |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
20/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
45298 |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
6H |
Bangor |
|
20/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
45324 |
2A |
Rugby |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
20/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
45328 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
20/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
45335 |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
20/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
45343 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
20/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
45344 |
5C |
Stafford |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
20/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
45381 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
20/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
45395 |
5D |
Stoke |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
20/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
45418 |
2A |
Rugby |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
20/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
45466 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
20/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
45495 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
10B |
Blackpool Central |
|
27/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
44718 |
65D |
Dawsholm |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
27/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
44719 |
60A |
Inverness |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
27/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
44736 |
9H |
Patricroft |
9K |
Bolton |
|
27/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
44816 |
8K |
Bank Hall |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
27/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
44893 |
9H |
Patricroft |
9K |
Bolton |
|
27/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
44911 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
27/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
44939 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
27/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
44955 |
28C |
Carstairs |
67B |
Hurlford |
|
27/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
45081 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
27/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
45104 |
8L |
Aintree |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
27/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
45161 |
64D |
Carstairs |
67C |
Ayr |
|
27/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
45218 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
27/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
45221 |
16C |
Derby |
16D |
Nottingham |
|
27/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
45256 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
27/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
45262 |
16C |
Derby |
16F |
Burton |
|
27/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
45291 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
27/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
45451 |
8L |
Aintree |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
29/06/1964 |
Condemned |
44785 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
COND |
|
29/06/1964 |
Condemned |
44923 |
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
COND |
|
29/06/1964 |
Condemned |
44961 |
29A |
Perth South |
|
COND |
|
29/06/1964 |
Condemned |
45384 |
67F |
Stranraer |
|
COND |
|
29/06/1964 |
Condemned |
45462 |
28A |
Motherwell |
|
COND |
|
29/06/1964 |
Condemned |
45482 |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
COND |
|
04/07/1964 |
Condemned |
44676 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
11/07/1964 |
Reallocation |
44692 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
11/07/1964 |
Reallocation |
44729 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
10C |
Fleetwood |
|
11/07/1964 |
Reallocation |
44802 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
11/07/1964 |
Reallocation |
44847 |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
16B |
Annesley |
|
11/07/1964 |
Reallocation |
44848 |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
16B |
Annesley |
|
11/07/1964 |
Reallocation |
44984 |
15D |
Leicester (G.C.) |
16B |
Annesley |
|
11/07/1964 |
Reallocation |
45034 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
11/07/1964 |
Reallocation |
45106 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
11/07/1964 |
Reallocation |
45154 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
11/07/1964 |
Reallocation |
45197 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
11/07/1964 |
Reallocation |
45256 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
10B |
Blackpool Central |
|
11/07/1964 |
Reallocation |
45342 |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
16B |
Annesley |
|
11/07/1964 |
Reallocation |
45416 |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
16B |
Annesley |
|
11/07/1964 |
Reallocation |
45451 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
13/07/1964 |
Condemned |
44994 |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
COND |
|
18/07/1964 |
Reallocation |
45027 |
5E |
Nuneaton |
2J |
Aston |
|
18/07/1964 |
Reallocation |
45056 |
5E |
Nuneaton |
1F |
Rugby |
|
18/07/1964 |
Reallocation |
45154 |
10A |
Carnforth |
10J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
18/07/1964 |
Reallocation |
45250 |
5A |
Crewe North |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
18/07/1964 |
Reallocation |
45272 |
5A |
Crewe North |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
18/07/1964 |
Reallocation |
45301 |
16D |
Nottingham |
16B |
Annesley |
|
18/07/1964 |
Reallocation |
45303 |
11A |
Carnforth |
10J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
18/07/1964 |
Reallocation |
45346 |
16D |
Nottingham |
16B |
Annesley |
|
18/07/1964 |
Reallocation |
45394 |
24L |
Carnforth |
10J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
18/07/1964 |
Reallocation |
45421 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
10C |
Fleetwood |
|
18/07/1964 |
Reallocation |
45451 |
10A |
Carnforth |
12C |
Barrow in Furness |
|
23/07/1964 |
Condemned |
45007 |
67B |
Hurlford |
|
COND |
|
23/07/1964 |
Condemned |
45158 |
67E |
Dumfries |
|
COND |
|
23/07/1964 |
Condemned |
45173 |
64D |
Carstairs |
|
COND |
|
25/07/1964 |
Reallocation |
44689 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
25/07/1964 |
Reallocation |
44999 |
29A |
Perth South |
67F |
Stranraer |
|
25/07/1964 |
Reallocation |
45238 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
10B |
Blackpool Central |
|
01/08/1964 |
Reallocation |
45210 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
10B |
Blackpool Central |
|
01/08/1964 |
Reallocation |
45286 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
10B |
Blackpool Central |
|
08/08/1964 |
Reallocation |
44855 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
08/08/1964 |
Reallocation |
45252 |
26F |
Patricroft |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
08/08/1964 |
Reallocation |
45409 |
26F |
Patricroft |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
15/08/1964 |
Reallocation |
44808 |
26F |
Patricroft |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
15/08/1964 |
Reallocation |
45210 |
10B |
Blackpool Central |
10J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
15/08/1964 |
Reallocation |
45303 |
10J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
10B |
Blackpool Central |
|
22/08/1964 |
Reallocation |
44793 |
64D |
Carstairs |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
22/08/1964 |
Reallocation |
45162 |
61B |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
09/1964 |
Condemned |
44660 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
09/1964 |
Condemned |
44751 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
COND |
|
09/1964 |
Condemned |
44756 |
8M |
Southport |
|
COND |
|
09/1964 |
Condemned |
45103 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
05/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
44696 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
05/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
44730 |
|
|
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
05/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
44731 |
|
|
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
05/09/1964 |
Condemned |
44748 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
05/09/1964 |
Condemned |
44749 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
COND |
|
05/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
44819 |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
05/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
44930 |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
05/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
45078 |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
05/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
45238 |
10B |
Blackpool Central |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
05/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
45256 |
10B |
Blackpool Central |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
05/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
45291 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
05/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
45303 |
10B |
Blackpool Central |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
05/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
45436 |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
10/09/1964 |
Condemned |
45470 |
67D |
Ardrossan |
|
COND |
|
12/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
44806 |
16A |
Nottingham |
16F |
Burton |
|
12/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
44851 |
16A |
Nottingham |
16F |
Burton |
|
12/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
44888 |
16C |
Derby |
16F |
Burton |
|
12/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
44962 |
16C |
Derby |
16F |
Burton |
|
12/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
45062 |
16C |
Derby |
16F |
Burton |
|
12/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
45075 |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
12/09/1964 |
Condemned |
45088 |
16C |
Derby |
|
COND |
|
12/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
45204 |
55H |
Neville Hill |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
12/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
45253 |
16D |
Nottingham |
16F |
Burton |
|
12/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
45260 |
17A |
Derby |
16F |
Burton |
|
12/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
45442 |
17A |
Derby |
16F |
Burton |
|
12/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
45464 |
17A |
Derby |
16F |
Burton |
|
19/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
44664 |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
9K |
Bolton |
|
19/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
44682 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
5D |
Stoke |
|
19/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
44684 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
19/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
44713 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
5D |
Stoke |
|
19/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
44714 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
19/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
44728 |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
9K |
Bolton |
|
19/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
44732 |
|
|
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
19/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
44737 |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
9K |
Bolton |
|
19/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
44759 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
19/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
44779 |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
9M |
Bury |
|
19/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
44926 |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
9K |
Bolton |
|
19/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
44927 |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
9K |
Bolton |
|
19/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
44945 |
2J |
Aston |
2E |
Saltley |
|
19/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
44947 |
28A |
Blackpool Central |
9K |
Bolton |
|
19/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
44950 |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
19/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
44963 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5C |
Stafford |
|
19/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
44966 |
2J |
Aston |
2E |
Saltley |
|
19/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
45001 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
19/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
45048 |
5A |
Crewe North |
2F |
Bescot |
|
19/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
45050 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
5D |
Stoke |
|
19/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
45065 |
2A |
Rugby |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
19/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
45067 |
5A |
Crewe North |
2F |
Bescot |
|
19/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
45113 |
2A |
Rugby |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
19/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
45257 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
5D |
Stoke |
|
19/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
45270 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
5D |
Stoke |
|
19/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
45283 |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
19/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
45288 |
5A |
Crewe North |
2F |
Bescot |
|
19/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
45318 |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
9M |
Bury |
|
19/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
45324 |
5A |
Crewe North |
2F |
Bescot |
|
19/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
45335 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
16B |
Annesley |
|
19/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
45377 |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
9M |
Bury |
|
19/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
45392 |
1F |
Rugby |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
19/09/1964 |
Condemned |
45413 |
26F |
Patricroft |
|
COND |
|
19/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
45415 |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
9M |
Bury |
|
19/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
45422 |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
19/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
45448 |
2A |
Rugby |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
26/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
44733 |
|
|
10A |
Carnforth |
|
26/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
44778 |
28A |
Blackpool Central |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
26/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
44970 |
65A |
Eastfield |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
26/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
45286 |
10B |
Blackpool Central |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
26/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
45409 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
9K |
Bolton |
|
26/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
45495 |
10B |
Blackpool Central |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
10/1964 |
Condemned |
45476 |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
COND |
|
03/10/1964 |
Reallocation |
45212 |
24F |
Fleetwood |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
03/10/1964 |
Reallocation |
45227 |
10C |
Fleetwood |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
10/10/1964 |
Reallocation |
44674 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
10/10/1964 |
Reallocation |
44692 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
10/10/1964 |
Reallocation |
44835 |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
16B |
Annesley |
|
10/10/1964 |
Reallocation |
45143 |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
10/10/1964 |
Reallocation |
45190 |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
16B |
Annesley |
|
10/10/1964 |
Reallocation |
45406 |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
16B |
Annesley |
|
17/10/1964 |
Reallocation |
45289 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
16B |
Annesley |
|
24/10/1964 |
Condemned |
44745 |
27C |
Southport |
|
COND |
|
24/10/1964 |
Reallocation |
45267 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
16B |
Annesley |
|
24/10/1964 |
Reallocation |
45333 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
16B |
Annesley |
|
30/10/1964 |
Condemned |
44719 |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
COND |
|
30/10/1964 |
Condemned |
45136 |
63A |
Perth South |
|
COND |
|
30/10/1964 |
Condemned |
45183 |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
COND |
|
31/10/1964 |
Reallocation |
44894 |
10J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
31/10/1964 |
Reallocation |
45196 |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
07/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
44689 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
07/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
44802 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
07/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
44808 |
6J |
Holyhead |
2F |
Bescot |
|
07/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
44911 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
07/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
45106 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
07/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
45239 |
9J |
Agecroft |
9K |
Bolton |
|
07/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
45272 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
2E |
Saltley |
|
07/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
45283 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
2E |
Saltley |
|
07/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
45422 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
2E |
Saltley |
|
07/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
45426 |
5B |
Crewe South |
1H |
Northampton |
|
07/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
45493 |
6J |
Holyhead |
2F |
Bescot |
|
12/11/1964 |
Condemned |
45155 |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
COND |
|
14/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
44708 |
10C |
Patricroft |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
14/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
44735 |
|
|
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
14/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
44743 |
27C |
Southport |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
14/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
44753 |
8M |
Southport |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
14/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
44767 |
27C |
Southport |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
14/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
44895 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
14/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
45017 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
14/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
45104 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
9M |
Bury |
|
14/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
45135 |
27C |
Southport |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
14/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
45150 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
14/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
45182 |
10C |
Patricroft |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
14/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
45233 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
14/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
45316 |
26F |
Patricroft |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
14/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
45337 |
27C |
Southport |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
14/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
45352 |
10C |
Patricroft |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
14/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
45381 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
9M |
Bury |
|
21/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
44861 |
16A |
Nottingham |
16C |
Derby |
|
21/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
44935 |
8K |
Bank Hall |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
21/11/1964 |
Condemned |
45035 |
10C |
Fleetwood |
|
COND |
|
21/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
45041 |
8K |
Bank Hall |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
21/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
45109 |
8K |
Bank Hall |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
21/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
45129 |
8K |
Bank Hall |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
21/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
45210 |
10J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
28/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
44844 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
1A |
Willesden |
|
28/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
45001 |
5B |
Crewe South |
1F |
Rugby |
|
28/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
45065 |
5B |
Crewe South |
1F |
Rugby |
|
28/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
45073 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
28/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
45113 |
5B |
Crewe South |
1F |
Rugby |
|
28/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
45349 |
1H |
Northampton |
1A |
Willesden |
|
28/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
45392 |
5B |
Crewe South |
1F |
Rugby |
|
28/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
45418 |
5A |
Crewe North |
1A |
Willesden |
|
28/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
45426 |
1H |
Northampton |
1A |
Willesden |
|
28/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
45448 |
5B |
Crewe South |
1F |
Rugby |
|
28/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
45454 |
2E |
Northampton |
1A |
Willesden |
|
05/12/1964 |
Reallocation |
45026 |
10C |
Fleetwood |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
05/12/1964 |
Reallocation |
45077 |
10C |
Fleetwood |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
05/12/1964 |
Reallocation |
45252 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
9M |
Bury |
|
05/12/1964 |
Reallocation |
45397 |
10C |
Fleetwood |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
05/12/1964 |
Reallocation |
45402 |
10C |
Fleetwood |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
05/12/1964 |
Reallocation |
45444 |
16A |
Nottingham |
10C |
Fleetwood |
|
07/12/1964 |
Condemned |
45456 |
67E |
Dumfries |
|
COND |
|
10/12/1964 |
Condemned |
44789 |
67B |
Hurlford |
|
COND |
|
10/12/1964 |
Condemned |
44793 |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
COND |
|
12/12/1964 |
Reallocation |
45344 |
5A |
Crewe North |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
19/12/1964 |
Reallocation |
44888 |
16F |
Burton |
15E |
Coalville |
|
19/12/1964 |
Reallocation |
45260 |
16F |
Burton |
15E |
Coalville |
|
19/12/1964 |
Reallocation |
45442 |
16F |
Burton |
15E |
Coalville |
|
21/12/1964 |
Condemned |
44849 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
COND |
|
26/12/1964 |
Reallocation |
44721 |
63A |
Perth South |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
26/12/1964 |
Reallocation |
44796 |
29A |
Perth South |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
09/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
45056 |
1F |
Rugby |
1H |
Northampton |
|
09/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
45113 |
1F |
Rugby |
1H |
Northampton |
|
09/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
45349 |
1A |
Willesden |
1H |
Northampton |
|
09/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
45392 |
1F |
Rugby |
1H |
Northampton |
|
09/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
45426 |
1A |
Willesden |
1H |
Northampton |
|
09/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
45454 |
1A |
Willesden |
1H |
Northampton |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
44762 |
5A |
Crewe North |
1G |
Woodford Halse |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
44763 |
5A |
Crewe North |
1G |
Woodford Halse |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
44764 |
5A |
Crewe North |
1G |
Woodford Halse |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
44814 |
1F |
Rugby |
1G |
Woodford Halse |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
44837 |
1F |
Rugby |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
44859 |
2J |
Aston |
2E |
Saltley |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
44863 |
2A |
Rugby |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
44870 |
2A |
Rugby |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
44909 |
2A |
Rugby |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
44915 |
2A |
Rugby |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
44938 |
2A |
Rugby |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
45027 |
2J |
Aston |
1G |
Woodford Halse |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
45052 |
21D |
Aston |
2E |
Saltley |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
45058 |
3D |
Aston |
2E |
Saltley |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
45182 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
12C |
Barrow in Furness |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
45374 |
21D |
Aston |
5C |
Stafford |
|
23/01/1965 |
Condemned |
44739 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
COND |
|
23/01/1965 |
Condemned |
45327 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
COND |
|
30/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
44930 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
30/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
44935 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
30/01/1965 |
Condemned |
45102 |
17A |
Derby |
|
COND |
|
30/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
45115 |
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
67E |
Dumfries |
|
30/01/1965 |
Condemned |
45178 |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
COND |
|
30/01/1965 |
Condemned |
45306 |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
COND |
|
30/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
45471 |
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
67E |
Dumfries |
|
06/02/1965 |
Reallocation |
44661 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
1A |
Willesden |
|
06/02/1965 |
Reallocation |
44673 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
06/02/1965 |
Reallocation |
44760 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
1A |
Willesden |
|
06/02/1965 |
Reallocation |
44774 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
1A |
Willesden |
|
06/02/1965 |
Reallocation |
44780 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
1A |
Willesden |
|
06/02/1965 |
Reallocation |
44865 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
1A |
Willesden |
|
06/02/1965 |
Reallocation |
44985 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
1A |
Willesden |
|
06/02/1965 |
Reallocation |
45026 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
06/02/1965 |
Condemned |
45313 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
06/02/1965 |
Condemned |
45337 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
06/02/1965 |
Condemned |
45414 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
13/02/1965 |
Reallocation |
44888 |
15E |
Coalville |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
13/02/1965 |
Reallocation |
44949 |
24B |
Rose Grove |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
13/02/1965 |
Reallocation |
45077 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
13/02/1965 |
Reallocation |
45260 |
15E |
Coalville |
9K |
Bolton |
|
13/02/1965 |
Reallocation |
45338 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
13/02/1965 |
Reallocation |
45375 |
27C |
Southport |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
13/02/1965 |
Reallocation |
45442 |
15E |
Coalville |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
13/02/1965 |
Reallocation |
45466 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
20/02/1965 |
Reallocation |
44916 |
9A |
Longsight |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
20/02/1965 |
Reallocation |
45380 |
9A |
Longsight |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
20/02/1965 |
Reallocation |
45404 |
9A |
Longsight |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
26/02/1965 |
Condemned |
44921 |
63A |
Perth South |
|
COND |
|
27/02/1965 |
Reallocation |
44974 |
67D |
Ardrossan |
67C |
Ayr |
|
27/02/1965 |
Reallocation |
45027 |
1G |
Woodford Halse |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
27/02/1965 |
Reallocation |
45056 |
1H |
Northampton |
1F |
Rugby |
|
27/02/1965 |
Reallocation |
45113 |
1H |
Northampton |
1F |
Rugby |
|
27/02/1965 |
Reallocation |
45167 |
67D |
Ardrossan |
67C |
Ayr |
|
27/02/1965 |
Reallocation |
45365 |
67D |
Ardrossan |
67C |
Ayr |
|
06/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
44658 |
16A |
Nottingham |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
06/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
44810 |
21A |
Saltley |
5D |
Stoke |
|
06/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
44859 |
2E |
Saltley |
2J |
Aston |
|
06/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
44877 |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
06/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
44888 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
06/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
44918 |
16A |
Nottingham |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
06/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
44926 |
9K |
Bolton |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
06/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
45052 |
2E |
Saltley |
2J |
Aston |
|
06/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
45058 |
2E |
Saltley |
2J |
Aston |
|
06/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
45154 |
10J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
06/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
45212 |
10A |
Carnforth |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
06/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
45221 |
16D |
Nottingham |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
06/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
45294 |
10A |
Carnforth |
12C |
Barrow in Furness |
|
06/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
45340 |
24L |
Carnforth |
12C |
Barrow in Furness |
|
06/03/1965 |
Condemned |
45378 |
26C |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
06/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
45422 |
2E |
Saltley |
5D |
Stoke |
|
13/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
44675 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
10C |
Fleetwood |
|
13/03/1965 |
Condemned |
44741 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
COND |
|
13/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
44806 |
16F |
Burton |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
13/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
45059 |
17B |
Burton |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
13/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
45190 |
16B |
Annesley |
16C |
Derby |
|
13/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
45267 |
16B |
Annesley |
16C |
Derby |
|
13/03/1965 |
Condemned |
45286 |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
COND |
|
13/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
45289 |
16B |
Annesley |
16C |
Derby |
|
13/03/1965 |
Condemned |
45387 |
5D |
Stoke |
|
COND |
|
13/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
45407 |
17B |
Burton |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
20/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
44714 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5D |
Stoke |
|
20/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
44779 |
9M |
Bury |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
27/03/1965 |
Condemned |
45380 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
COND |
|
03/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
44691 |
2E |
Saltley |
2B |
Oxley |
|
03/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
44805 |
21A |
Saltley |
2B |
Oxley |
|
03/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
44808 |
2F |
Bescot |
2B |
Oxley |
|
03/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
44812 |
21A |
Saltley |
2B |
Oxley |
|
03/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
44841 |
21A |
Saltley |
2B |
Oxley |
|
03/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
44856 |
21A |
Saltley |
2B |
Oxley |
|
03/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
44873 |
3A |
Bescot |
2E |
Saltley |
|
03/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
44910 |
21B |
Bescot |
2E |
Saltley |
|
03/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
44919 |
21A |
Saltley |
2B |
Oxley |
|
03/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
45006 |
21A |
Saltley |
2B |
Oxley |
|
03/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
45040 |
21A |
Saltley |
2B |
Oxley |
|
03/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
45180 |
21B |
Bescot |
2E |
Saltley |
|
03/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
45186 |
21A |
Saltley |
2B |
Oxley |
|
03/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
45263 |
21A |
Saltley |
2B |
Oxley |
|
03/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
45272 |
2E |
Saltley |
2B |
Oxley |
|
03/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
45283 |
2E |
Saltley |
2B |
Oxley |
|
03/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
45410 |
21B |
Bescot |
2E |
Saltley |
|
10/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
44658 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
10/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
44761 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
10/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
44813 |
1F |
Rugby |
5C |
Stafford |
|
10/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
44913 |
7B |
Bangor |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
10/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
44930 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
10/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
44935 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
10/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
45056 |
1F |
Rugby |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
10/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
45104 |
9M |
Bury |
9K |
Bolton |
|
10/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
45247 |
6H |
Bangor |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
10/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
45252 |
9M |
Bury |
9K |
Bolton |
|
10/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
45318 |
9M |
Bury |
9K |
Bolton |
|
10/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
45377 |
9M |
Bury |
9K |
Bolton |
|
10/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
45381 |
9M |
Bury |
9K |
Bolton |
|
10/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
45415 |
9M |
Bury |
9K |
Bolton |
|
17/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
45310 |
3B |
Bushbury |
2J |
Aston |
|
17/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
45405 |
3B |
Bushbury |
2J |
Aston |
|
17/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
45439 |
21C |
Bushbury |
2J |
Aston |
|
24/04/1965 |
Condemned |
45142 |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
COND |
|
24/04/1965 |
Condemned |
45194 |
67C |
Ayr |
|
COND |
|
08/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
44715 |
2A |
Rugby |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
08/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
44716 |
2A |
Rugby |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
08/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
44763 |
1G |
Woodford Halse |
1A |
Willesden |
|
08/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
44836 |
2A |
Rugby |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
08/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
45091 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
08/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
45116 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
08/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
45277 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
15/05/1965 |
Condemned |
44673 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
COND |
|
15/05/1965 |
Condemned |
45163 |
68A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
22/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
44888 |
9H |
Patricroft |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
29/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
44678 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
29/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
44679 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
29/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
44680 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
29/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
44681 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
29/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
44683 |
|
|
5B |
Crewe South |
|
29/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
44685 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
29/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
44765 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
29/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
44771 |
2A |
Rugby |
5E |
Nuneaton |
|
29/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
44831 |
2A |
Rugby |
5E |
Nuneaton |
|
29/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
44866 |
2A |
Rugby |
5E |
Nuneaton |
|
29/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
45001 |
1F |
Rugby |
5E |
Nuneaton |
|
29/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
45065 |
1F |
Rugby |
5E |
Nuneaton |
|
29/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
45113 |
1F |
Rugby |
5E |
Nuneaton |
|
29/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
45243 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
29/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
45448 |
1F |
Rugby |
5E |
Nuneaton |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
44696 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
44762 |
1G |
Woodford Halse |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
44764 |
1G |
Woodford Halse |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
44775 |
21A |
Saltley |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
44814 |
1G |
Woodford Halse |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
44821 |
6H |
Bangor |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
44822 |
9J |
Agecroft |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
44829 |
2E |
Saltley |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
44833 |
1A |
Willesden |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
44843 |
21A |
Saltley |
2B |
Oxley |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
44844 |
1A |
Willesden |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
44873 |
2E |
Saltley |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
44894 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
10C |
Fleetwood |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
44910 |
2E |
Saltley |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
44926 |
9H |
Patricroft |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
44940 |
24B |
Rose Grove |
10C |
Fleetwood |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
44949 |
9H |
Patricroft |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
44966 |
2E |
Saltley |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
44981 |
21A |
Saltley |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
45026 |
9H |
Patricroft |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
45077 |
9H |
Patricroft |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
45133 |
9J |
Agecroft |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
45145 |
6H |
Bangor |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
19/06/1965 |
Condemned |
45146 |
5D |
Stoke |
|
COND |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
45180 |
2E |
Saltley |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
45218 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
10C |
Fleetwood |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
45223 |
6H |
Bangor |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
45258 |
12E |
Barrow in Furness |
10J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
45264 |
21A |
Saltley |
2B |
Oxley |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
45280 |
21A |
Saltley |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
45298 |
6H |
Bangor |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
45310 |
2J |
Aston |
5E |
Nuneaton |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
45345 |
6H |
Bangor |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
45369 |
2E |
Saltley |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
45382 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
45393 |
1A |
Willesden |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
45405 |
2J |
Aston |
5E |
Nuneaton |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
45410 |
2E |
Saltley |
2F |
Bescot |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
45420 |
9J |
Agecroft |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
45447 |
21A |
Saltley |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
26/06/1965 |
Condemned |
44702 |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
COND |
|
26/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
44779 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
26/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
44791 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
66E |
Carstairs |
|
26/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
44855 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
26/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
44970 |
65F |
Grangemouth |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
26/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
45070 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
26/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
45171 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
66E |
Carstairs |
|
26/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
45212 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
26/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
45221 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
26/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
45291 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
26/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
45351 |
9K |
Bolton |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
26/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
45375 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
26/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
45402 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
26/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
45445 |
12E |
Barrow in Furness |
10J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
26/06/1965 |
Condemned |
45460 |
67C |
Ayr |
|
COND |
|
26/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
45467 |
67E |
Dumfries |
67C |
Ayr |
|
26/06/1965 |
Condemned |
45498 |
28A |
Motherwell |
|
COND |
|
07/1965 |
Condemned |
44721 |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
COND |
|
07/1965 |
Condemned |
44769 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
07/1965 |
Condemned |
44955 |
67B |
Hurlford |
|
COND |
|
07/1965 |
Condemned |
45334 |
16D |
Annesley |
|
COND |
|
07/1965 |
Condemned |
45499 |
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
COND |
|
03/07/1965 |
Condemned |
44799 |
63A |
Perth South |
|
COND |
|
03/07/1965 |
Condemned |
44827 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
03/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
44918 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
03/07/1965 |
Condemned |
44924 |
29A |
Perth South |
|
COND |
|
03/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
44932 |
16D |
Annesley |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
03/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
44958 |
27B |
Aintree |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
03/07/1965 |
Condemned |
44979 |
29A |
Perth South |
|
COND |
|
03/07/1965 |
Condemned |
44980 |
29A |
Perth South |
|
COND |
|
03/07/1965 |
Condemned |
45002 |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
COND |
|
03/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
45062 |
16F |
Burton |
9J |
Agecroft |
|
03/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
45068 |
8L |
Aintree |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
03/07/1965 |
Condemned |
45113 |
5E |
Nuneaton |
|
COND |
|
03/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
45215 |
16D |
Annesley |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
03/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
45234 |
16D |
Annesley |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
03/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
45323 |
8L |
Aintree |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
03/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
45342 |
16B |
Annesley |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
03/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
45346 |
16B |
Annesley |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
03/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
45450 |
16D |
Annesley |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
03/07/1965 |
Condemned |
45471 |
67E |
Dumfries |
|
COND |
|
10/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
44804 |
16C |
Derby |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
10/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
44815 |
16C |
Derby |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
10/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
44837 |
1E |
Bletchley |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
10/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
44861 |
16C |
Derby |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
10/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
44863 |
1E |
Bletchley |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
10/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
44870 |
1E |
Bletchley |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
10/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
44894 |
10C |
Fleetwood |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
10/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
44909 |
1E |
Bletchley |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
10/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
44915 |
1E |
Bletchley |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
10/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
44938 |
1E |
Bletchley |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
10/07/1965 |
Condemned |
44959 |
29A |
Perth South |
|
COND |
|
10/07/1965 |
Condemned |
44978 |
29A |
Perth South |
|
COND |
|
10/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
45027 |
1E |
Bletchley |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
10/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
45206 |
24F |
Fleetwood |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
10/07/1965 |
Condemned |
45301 |
16B |
Annesley |
|
COND |
|
10/07/1965 |
Condemned |
45335 |
16B |
Annesley |
|
COND |
|
10/07/1965 |
Condemned |
45416 |
16B |
Annesley |
|
COND |
|
17/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
44932 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
16B |
Annesley |
|
17/07/1965 |
Condemned |
45491 |
68A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
24/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
44688 |
17B |
Burton |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
24/07/1965 |
Condemned |
44753 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
COND |
|
24/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
44809 |
27C |
Southport |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
24/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
44813 |
5C |
Stafford |
5D |
Stoke |
|
24/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
44873 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
24/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
44963 |
5C |
Stafford |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
24/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
44989 |
17B |
Burton |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
24/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
45091 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
24/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
45110 |
5C |
Stafford |
9K |
Bolton |
|
24/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
45128 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
24/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
45147 |
5C |
Stafford |
8L |
Aintree |
|
24/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
45253 |
16F |
Burton |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
24/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
45267 |
16C |
Derby |
16B |
Annesley |
|
24/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
45321 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
24/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
45374 |
5C |
Stafford |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
31/07/1965 |
Condemned |
44716 |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
COND |
|
31/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
44717 |
16D |
Annesley |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
31/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
44724 |
63A |
Perth South |
67C |
Ayr |
|
31/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
44846 |
16D |
Annesley |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
31/07/1965 |
Condemned |
45379 |
1A |
Willesden |
|
COND |
|
31/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
45474 |
29A |
Perth South |
67C |
Ayr |
|
07/08/1965 |
Reallocation |
44809 |
10A |
Carnforth |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
07/08/1965 |
Reallocation |
45210 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
07/08/1965 |
Condemned |
45351 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
07/08/1965 |
Condemned |
45429 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
COND |
|
14/08/1965 |
Reallocation |
44858 |
17B |
Burton |
16C |
Derby |
|
14/08/1965 |
Condemned |
45077 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
14/08/1965 |
Reallocation |
45190 |
16C |
Derby |
16B |
Annesley |
|
14/08/1965 |
Reallocation |
45224 |
17B |
Burton |
16C |
Derby |
|
14/08/1965 |
Condemned |
45230 |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
COND |
|
14/08/1965 |
Reallocation |
45258 |
10J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
14/08/1965 |
Reallocation |
45262 |
16F |
Burton |
16C |
Derby |
|
21/08/1965 |
Reallocation |
44678 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
21/08/1965 |
Reallocation |
44679 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
21/08/1965 |
Reallocation |
44836 |
5B |
Crewe South |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
21/08/1965 |
Reallocation |
44862 |
1A |
Willesden |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
21/08/1965 |
Condemned |
44901 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
21/08/1965 |
Reallocation |
44910 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8L |
Aintree |
|
21/08/1965 |
Reallocation |
45017 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
21/08/1965 |
Reallocation |
45046 |
5B |
Crewe South |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
21/08/1965 |
Condemned |
45192 |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
COND |
|
21/08/1965 |
Condemned |
45293 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
21/08/1965 |
Reallocation |
45305 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
21/08/1965 |
Reallocation |
45437 |
9J |
Agecroft |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
28/08/1965 |
Reallocation |
45016 |
63B |
|
67C |
Ayr |
|
28/08/1965 |
Condemned |
45245 |
64D |
Carstairs |
|
COND |
|
28/08/1965 |
Reallocation |
45423 |
63B |
Stirling |
67C |
Ayr |
|
28/08/1965 |
Condemned |
45443 |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
COND |
|
09/1965 |
Condemned |
44764 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
COND |
|
09/1965 |
Condemned |
45398 |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
COND |
|
03/09/1965 |
Condemned |
45360 |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
COND |
|
04/09/1965 |
Condemned |
45229 |
8L |
Aintree |
|
COND |
|
11/09/1965 |
Reallocation |
44809 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
8M |
Southport |
|
18/09/1965 |
Reallocation |
44816 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
9K |
Bolton |
|
18/09/1965 |
Reallocation |
44918 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
18/09/1965 |
Reallocation |
44982 |
24F |
Fleetwood |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
18/09/1965 |
Condemned |
45074 |
5D |
Stoke |
|
COND |
|
18/09/1965 |
Condemned |
45184 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
COND |
|
18/09/1965 |
Reallocation |
45218 |
10C |
Fleetwood |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
18/09/1965 |
Reallocation |
45258 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
9K |
Bolton |
|
18/09/1965 |
Reallocation |
45274 |
10C |
Fleetwood |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
18/09/1965 |
Reallocation |
45340 |
12C |
Barrow in Furness |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
18/09/1965 |
Reallocation |
45346 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
18/09/1965 |
Reallocation |
45451 |
12C |
Barrow in Furness |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
20/09/1965 |
Condemned |
44970 |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
COND |
|
20/09/1965 |
Condemned |
44973 |
66E |
Carstairs |
|
COND |
|
20/09/1965 |
Condemned |
44975 |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
COND |
|
25/09/1965 |
Reallocation |
44675 |
10C |
Fleetwood |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
25/09/1965 |
Reallocation |
44925 |
29A |
Perth South |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
25/09/1965 |
Reallocation |
45027 |
10A |
Carnforth |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
25/09/1965 |
Reallocation |
45047 |
63A |
Perth South |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
25/09/1965 |
Condemned |
45180 |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
COND |
|
25/09/1965 |
Reallocation |
45212 |
10A |
Carnforth |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
25/09/1965 |
Condemned |
45237 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
COND |
|
25/09/1965 |
Reallocation |
45437 |
10A |
Carnforth |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
10/1965 |
Condemned |
45093 |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
COND |
|
10/1965 |
Condemned |
45257 |
5D |
Stoke |
|
COND |
|
10/1965 |
Condemned |
45314 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
10/1965 |
Condemned |
45354 |
10J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
COND |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
44661 |
1A |
Willesden |
2A |
Tyseley |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
44663 |
21A |
Saltley |
2A |
Tyseley |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
44666 |
21A |
Saltley |
2A |
Tyseley |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
44710 |
3D |
Aston |
2D |
Banbury |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
44760 |
1A |
Willesden |
2A |
Tyseley |
|
02/10/1965 |
Condemned |
44763 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
44774 |
1A |
Willesden |
2A |
Tyseley |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
44776 |
21A |
Saltley |
2A |
Tyseley |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
44777 |
2E |
Saltley |
2A |
Tyseley |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
44780 |
1A |
Willesden |
2A |
Tyseley |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
44814 |
6J |
Holyhead |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
44821 |
6J |
Holyhead |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
44860 |
1A |
Willesden |
2D |
Banbury |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
44865 |
1A |
Willesden |
2A |
Tyseley |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
44869 |
2E |
Northampton |
2D |
Banbury |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
44936 |
2E |
Northampton |
2D |
Banbury |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
44942 |
3D |
Aston |
2D |
Banbury |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
44944 |
21A |
Saltley |
2B |
Oxley |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
44945 |
2E |
Saltley |
2B |
Oxley |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
44965 |
21A |
Saltley |
2B |
Oxley |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
44966 |
6J |
Holyhead |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
44981 |
6J |
Holyhead |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
44985 |
1A |
Willesden |
2A |
Tyseley |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
45038 |
21D |
Aston |
2A |
Tyseley |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
45045 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
45051 |
2E |
Northampton |
2A |
Tyseley |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
45052 |
2J |
Aston |
2A |
Tyseley |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
45089 |
2F |
Bescot |
2D |
Banbury |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
45111 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
45114 |
3D |
Aston |
2D |
Banbury |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
45130 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
45132 |
6J |
Holyhead |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
45134 |
2E |
Northampton |
2A |
Tyseley |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
45143 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
45145 |
6J |
Holyhead |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
45185 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
45198 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
45287 |
21B |
Bescot |
2A |
Tyseley |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
45288 |
2F |
Bescot |
2D |
Banbury |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
45292 |
1A |
Willesden |
2A |
Tyseley |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
45299 |
1A |
Willesden |
2D |
Banbury |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
45302 |
2E |
Northampton |
2A |
Tyseley |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
45308 |
21C |
Bushbury |
2D |
Banbury |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
45311 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
45331 |
1A |
Willesden |
2D |
Banbury |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
45344 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
45348 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
45349 |
1H |
Northampton |
2A |
Tyseley |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
45392 |
1H |
Northampton |
2D |
Banbury |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
45418 |
1A |
Willesden |
2D |
Banbury |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
45426 |
1H |
Northampton |
2D |
Banbury |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
45454 |
1H |
Northampton |
2D |
Banbury |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
45493 |
2F |
Bescot |
2D |
Banbury |
|
08/10/1965 |
Condemned |
45389 |
63B |
Stirling |
|
COND |
|
09/10/1965 |
Condemned |
45026 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
09/10/1965 |
Condemned |
45272 |
2B |
Oxley |
|
COND |
|
12/10/1965 |
Condemned |
44931 |
63A |
Perth South |
|
COND |
|
16/10/1965 |
Condemned |
44686 |
8M |
Southport |
|
COND |
|
16/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
44859 |
2J |
Aston |
2A |
Tyseley |
|
16/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
44872 |
3D |
Aston |
2D |
Banbury |
|
16/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
44876 |
3D |
Aston |
2B |
Oxley |
|
16/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
45058 |
2J |
Aston |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
|
16/10/1965 |
Condemned |
45081 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
COND |
|
16/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
45322 |
3D |
Aston |
5D |
Stoke |
|
16/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
45430 |
3D |
Aston |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
|
22/10/1965 |
Condemned |
45117 |
67B |
Hurlford |
|
COND |
|
23/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
44665 |
16D |
Annesley |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
23/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
44835 |
16B |
Annesley |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
23/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
44847 |
16B |
Annesley |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
23/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
45190 |
16B |
Annesley |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
23/10/1965 |
Condemned |
45291 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
23/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
45333 |
16B |
Annesley |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
23/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
45406 |
16B |
Annesley |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
29/10/1965 |
Condemned |
45171 |
66E |
Carstairs |
|
COND |
|
29/10/1965 |
Condemned |
45362 |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
COND |
|
30/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
44788 |
65F |
Grangemouth |
67C |
Ayr |
|
30/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
44925 |
64C |
Dalry Road |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
30/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
45047 |
64C |
Dalry Road |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
30/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
45053 |
64C |
Dalry Road |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
30/10/1965 |
Condemned |
45078 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
COND |
|
30/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
45127 |
64C |
Dalry Road |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
30/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
45162 |
64C |
Dalry Road |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
30/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
45168 |
64C |
Dalry Road |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
30/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
45177 |
65F |
Grangemouth |
67C |
Ayr |
|
30/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
45319 |
65F |
Grangemouth |
66E |
Carstairs |
|
30/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
45362 |
98W |
|
65J |
Stirling |
|
30/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
45469 |
64C |
Dalry Road |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
30/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
45477 |
64C |
Dalry Road |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
30/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
45483 |
64C |
Dalry Road |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
30/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
45488 |
65F |
Grangemouth |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
11/1965 |
Condemned |
45439 |
2J |
Aston |
|
COND |
|
06/11/1965 |
Reallocation |
44871 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
06/11/1965 |
Reallocation |
45139 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
13/11/1965 |
Condemned |
44757 |
8M |
Southport |
|
COND |
|
13/11/1965 |
Reallocation |
45261 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
13/11/1965 |
Reallocation |
45264 |
2B |
Oxley |
2A |
Tyseley |
|
13/11/1965 |
Reallocation |
45298 |
6J |
Holyhead |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
13/11/1965 |
Reallocation |
45345 |
6J |
Holyhead |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
20/11/1965 |
Condemned |
44823 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
22/11/1965 |
Condemned |
44787 |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
COND |
|
22/11/1965 |
Condemned |
45009 |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
COND |
|
27/11/1965 |
Condemned |
45037 |
5D |
Stoke |
|
COND |
|
27/11/1965 |
Reallocation |
45045 |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
27/11/1965 |
Reallocation |
45111 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
27/11/1965 |
Reallocation |
45298 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
12/1965 |
Condemned |
44939 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
COND |
|
12/1965 |
Condemned |
45068 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
COND |
|
12/1965 |
Condemned |
45300 |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
COND |
|
04/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
45111 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
04/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
45277 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
06/12/1965 |
Condemned |
45090 |
66E |
Carstairs |
|
COND |
|
06/12/1965 |
Condemned |
45486 |
67C |
Ayr |
|
COND |
|
11/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
44762 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
2A |
Tyseley |
|
11/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
44775 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
|
11/12/1965 |
Condemned |
45020 |
5D |
Stoke |
|
COND |
|
11/12/1965 |
Condemned |
45108 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
11/12/1965 |
Condemned |
45143 |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
|
COND |
|
18/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
44847 |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
40E |
Colwick |
|
18/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
45267 |
16B |
Annesley |
40E |
Colwick |
|
18/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
45406 |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
40E |
Colwick |
|
25/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
44659 |
16C |
Derby |
40E |
Colwick |
|
25/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
44665 |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
40E |
Colwick |
|
25/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
44707 |
67E |
Dumfries |
66E |
Carstairs |
|
25/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
44811 |
16C |
Derby |
40E |
Colwick |
|
25/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
44825 |
17B |
Burton |
40E |
Colwick |
|
25/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
44830 |
16C |
Derby |
40E |
Colwick |
|
25/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
44835 |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
40E |
Colwick |
|
25/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
44839 |
17B |
Burton |
40E |
Colwick |
|
25/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
44848 |
16B |
Annesley |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
25/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
44848 |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
40E |
Colwick |
|
25/12/1965 |
Condemned |
44904 |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
COND |
|
25/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
44920 |
16C |
Derby |
40E |
Colwick |
|
25/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
44932 |
16B |
Annesley |
16C |
Derby |
|
25/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
44941 |
17B |
Burton |
40E |
Colwick |
|
25/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
44984 |
16B |
Annesley |
16A |
Toton |
|
25/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
44984 |
16A |
Toton |
40E |
Colwick |
|
25/12/1965 |
Condemned |
45148 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
25/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
45190 |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
40E |
Colwick |
|
25/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
45333 |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
40E |
Colwick |
|
25/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
45464 |
16F |
Burton |
40E |
Colwick |
|
28/12/1965 |
Condemned |
45011 |
64D |
Carstairs |
|
COND |
|
03/01/1966 |
Reallocation |
44840 |
21B |
Bescot |
2D |
Banbury |
|
03/01/1966 |
Reallocation |
44914 |
3A |
Bescot |
2D |
Banbury |
|
03/01/1966 |
Reallocation |
45222 |
2F |
Bescot |
2D |
Banbury |
|
03/01/1966 |
Reallocation |
45324 |
2F |
Bescot |
2D |
Banbury |
|
08/01/1966 |
Condemned |
44743 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
COND |
|
08/01/1966 |
Reallocation |
44926 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
10J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
08/01/1966 |
Reallocation |
44933 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
10J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
08/01/1966 |
Reallocation |
44987 |
26B |
Agecroft |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
08/01/1966 |
Reallocation |
45424 |
9J |
Agecroft |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
15/01/1966 |
Condemned |
44670 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
15/01/1966 |
Condemned |
45181 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
COND |
|
15/01/1966 |
Condemned |
45235 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
COND |
|
15/01/1966 |
Reallocation |
45435 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
10J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
17/01/1966 |
Condemned |
44960 |
63A |
Perth South |
|
COND |
|
22/01/1966 |
Reallocation |
44678 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
22/01/1966 |
Reallocation |
44679 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
22/01/1966 |
Condemned |
44687 |
8M |
Southport |
|
COND |
|
24/01/1966 |
Condemned |
44707 |
66E |
Carstairs |
|
COND |
|
29/01/1966 |
Reallocation |
44718 |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
67C |
Ayr |
|
29/01/1966 |
Reallocation |
44760 |
2A |
Tyseley |
5D |
Stoke |
|
29/01/1966 |
Reallocation |
44985 |
2A |
Tyseley |
5D |
Stoke |
|
29/01/1966 |
Reallocation |
45038 |
2A |
Tyseley |
5D |
Stoke |
|
29/01/1966 |
Reallocation |
45302 |
2A |
Tyseley |
5D |
Stoke |
|
01/02/1966 |
Condemned |
45396 |
63B |
Stirling |
|
COND |
|
05/02/1966 |
Reallocation |
44842 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
05/02/1966 |
Reallocation |
45223 |
6J |
Holyhead |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
05/02/1966 |
Reallocation |
45395 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
12/02/1966 |
Reallocation |
45205 |
24B |
Rose Grove |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
12/02/1966 |
Condemned |
45216 |
24B |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
12/02/1966 |
Reallocation |
45234 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
12/02/1966 |
Reallocation |
45312 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
12/02/1966 |
Condemned |
45418 |
2D |
Banbury |
|
COND |
|
19/02/1966 |
Reallocation |
44729 |
10C |
Fleetwood |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
19/02/1966 |
Reallocation |
44936 |
2D |
Banbury |
16B |
Colwick |
|
19/02/1966 |
Reallocation |
44940 |
10C |
Fleetwood |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
19/02/1966 |
Reallocation |
44988 |
24F |
Fleetwood |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
19/02/1966 |
Reallocation |
45107 |
28B |
Fleetwood |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
19/02/1966 |
Reallocation |
45114 |
2D |
Banbury |
16B |
Colwick |
|
19/02/1966 |
Reallocation |
45200 |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
19/02/1966 |
Reallocation |
45222 |
2D |
Banbury |
16B |
Colwick |
|
19/02/1966 |
Reallocation |
45258 |
9K |
Bolton |
9J |
Agecroft |
|
19/02/1966 |
Reallocation |
45288 |
2D |
Banbury |
16B |
Colwick |
|
19/02/1966 |
Reallocation |
45324 |
2D |
Banbury |
16B |
Colwick |
|
19/02/1966 |
Reallocation |
45347 |
10C |
Fleetwood |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
19/02/1966 |
Reallocation |
45392 |
2D |
Banbury |
16B |
Colwick |
|
19/02/1966 |
Reallocation |
45426 |
2D |
Banbury |
16B |
Colwick |
|
19/02/1966 |
Reallocation |
45444 |
10C |
Fleetwood |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
19/02/1966 |
Reallocation |
45454 |
2D |
Banbury |
16B |
Colwick |
|
26/02/1966 |
Condemned |
45248 |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
COND |
|
03/03/1966 |
Condemned |
45433 |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
COND |
|
05/03/1966 |
Reallocation |
44690 |
16C |
Derby |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
05/03/1966 |
Reallocation |
44851 |
16F |
Burton |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
05/03/1966 |
Reallocation |
44932 |
16C |
Derby |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
05/03/1966 |
Reallocation |
45232 |
17B |
Burton |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
05/03/1966 |
Reallocation |
45262 |
16C |
Derby |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
12/03/1966 |
Condemned |
45182 |
12C |
Barrow in Furness |
|
COND |
|
12/03/1966 |
Reallocation |
45346 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
19/03/1966 |
Reallocation |
44855 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
19/03/1966 |
Reallocation |
45421 |
10C |
Fleetwood |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
26/03/1966 |
Reallocation |
44766 |
21B |
Bescot |
2C |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
26/03/1966 |
Reallocation |
44875 |
21B |
Bescot |
2C |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
26/03/1966 |
Reallocation |
45048 |
2F |
Bescot |
2C |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
26/03/1966 |
Reallocation |
45064 |
2F |
Bescot |
2C |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
26/03/1966 |
Reallocation |
45067 |
2F |
Bescot |
2E |
Saltley |
|
26/03/1966 |
Condemned |
45252 |
9K |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
26/03/1966 |
Reallocation |
45410 |
2F |
Bescot |
2E |
Saltley |
|
02/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
44848 |
40E |
Colwick |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
02/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
44962 |
16F |
Burton |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
02/04/1966 |
Condemned |
45210 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
09/04/1966 |
Condemned |
44668 |
68A |
|
|
COND |
|
16/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
44777 |
2A |
Tyseley |
2B |
Oxley |
|
16/04/1966 |
Condemned |
45218 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
16/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
45264 |
2A |
Tyseley |
2B |
Oxley |
|
23/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
44667 |
10J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
23/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
44758 |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
23/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
44800 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
|
23/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
44889 |
10J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
23/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
44897 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
|
23/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
44917 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
23/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
44926 |
10J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
23/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
44933 |
10J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
23/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
44971 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
23/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
45012 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
12C |
Barrow in Furness |
|
23/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
45014 |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
23/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
45025 |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
23/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
45042 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
23/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
45043 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
23/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
45055 |
27C |
Southport |
51C |
West Hartlepool |
|
23/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
45055 |
51C |
West Hartlepool |
50A |
York (North) |
|
23/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
45111 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
23/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
45116 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
23/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
45193 |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
23/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
45275 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
23/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
45325 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
23/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
45369 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
23/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
45373 |
10J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
23/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
45394 |
10J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
23/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
45435 |
10J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
23/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
45445 |
10J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
30/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
44659 |
40E |
Colwick |
8L |
Aintree |
|
30/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
44722 |
63A |
Perth South |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
30/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
44736 |
9K |
Bolton |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
30/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
44816 |
9K |
Bolton |
8K |
Bank Hall |
|
30/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
44879 |
63A |
Perth South |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
30/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
44893 |
9K |
Bolton |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
30/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
45214 |
63B |
Stirling |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
30/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
45239 |
9K |
Bolton |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
30/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
45357 |
63B |
Stirling |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
30/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
45409 |
9K |
Bolton |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
30/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
45411 |
9K |
Bolton |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
30/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
45432 |
68B |
|
67C |
Ayr |
|
30/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
45473 |
29A |
Perth South |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
05/1966 |
Condemned |
44731 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
COND |
|
07/05/1966 |
Condemned |
45233 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
COND |
|
14/05/1966 |
Condemned |
44692 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
14/05/1966 |
Reallocation |
44737 |
9K |
Bolton |
8K |
Bank Hall |
|
28/05/1966 |
Reallocation |
44732 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
28/05/1966 |
Reallocation |
44766 |
2C |
Stourbridge Junction |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
28/05/1966 |
Reallocation |
44839 |
40E |
Colwick |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
28/05/1966 |
Reallocation |
44869 |
2D |
Banbury |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
28/05/1966 |
Reallocation |
44875 |
2C |
Stourbridge Junction |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
28/05/1966 |
Reallocation |
45048 |
2C |
Stourbridge Junction |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
28/05/1966 |
Reallocation |
45064 |
2C |
Stourbridge Junction |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
28/05/1966 |
Reallocation |
45065 |
5E |
Nuneaton |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
28/05/1966 |
Reallocation |
45067 |
2E |
Saltley |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
28/05/1966 |
Reallocation |
45114 |
16B |
Colwick |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
28/05/1966 |
Reallocation |
45190 |
40E |
Colwick |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
28/05/1966 |
Reallocation |
45288 |
16B |
Colwick |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
28/05/1966 |
Reallocation |
45392 |
16B |
Colwick |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
28/05/1966 |
Reallocation |
45448 |
5E |
Nuneaton |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
06/1966 |
Condemned |
45185 |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
|
COND |
|
06/1966 |
Condemned |
45333 |
40E |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
02/06/1966 |
Condemned |
44908 |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
COND |
|
04/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
44771 |
5E |
Nuneaton |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
04/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
44831 |
5E |
Nuneaton |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
04/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
44866 |
5E |
Nuneaton |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
04/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
45001 |
5E |
Nuneaton |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
04/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
45310 |
5E |
Nuneaton |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
04/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
45405 |
5E |
Nuneaton |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
14/06/1966 |
Condemned |
44956 |
66E |
Carstairs |
|
COND |
|
18/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
44809 |
8M |
Southport |
8K |
Bank Hall |
|
18/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
44903 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
18/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
44912 |
55D |
Royston |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
18/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
45055 |
50A |
York (North) |
8K |
Bank Hall |
|
18/06/1966 |
Condemned |
45097 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
18/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
45219 |
55D |
Royston |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
25/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
44665 |
40E |
Colwick |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
25/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
44699 |
67E |
Dumfries |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
25/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
44723 |
67E |
Dumfries |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
25/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
44995 |
68B |
Dumfries |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
25/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
45084 |
63B |
Stirling |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
25/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
45084 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
66E |
Carstairs |
|
25/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
45115 |
67E |
Dumfries |
67B |
Hurlford |
|
25/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
45213 |
63B |
Stirling |
67C |
Ayr |
|
25/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
45333 |
98W |
|
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
25/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
45359 |
31B |
Stirling |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
25/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
45454 |
16B |
Colwick |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
25/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
45463 |
67E |
Dumfries |
67F |
Stranraer |
|
26/06/1966 |
Condemned |
44974 |
67C |
Ayr |
|
COND |
|
09/07/1966 |
Condemned |
45082 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
14/07/1966 |
Condemned |
44698 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
14/07/1966 |
Condemned |
44700 |
28C |
Carstairs |
|
COND |
|
14/07/1966 |
Condemned |
44850 |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
COND |
|
14/07/1966 |
Condemned |
45016 |
67C |
Ayr |
|
COND |
|
14/07/1966 |
Condemned |
45177 |
67C |
Ayr |
|
COND |
|
17/07/1966 |
Condemned |
44881 |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
COND |
|
17/07/1966 |
Condemned |
45047 |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
COND |
|
23/07/1966 |
Reallocation |
44971 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
30/07/1966 |
Condemned |
45195 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
08/1966 |
Condemned |
45434 |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
COND |
|
08/1966 |
Condemned |
45438 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
COND |
|
06/08/1966 |
Reallocation |
44934 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
06/08/1966 |
Reallocation |
44965 |
2B |
Oxley |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
06/08/1966 |
Reallocation |
45045 |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
06/08/1966 |
Reallocation |
45133 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
06/08/1966 |
Reallocation |
45339 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
06/08/1966 |
Reallocation |
45343 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
06/08/1966 |
Reallocation |
45382 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
09/08/1966 |
Condemned |
45164 |
67C |
Ayr |
|
COND |
|
13/08/1966 |
Condemned |
44810 |
5D |
Stoke |
|
COND |
|
13/08/1966 |
Condemned |
45348 |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
|
COND |
|
13/08/1966 |
Condemned |
45364 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
13/08/1966 |
Condemned |
45370 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
COND |
|
17/08/1966 |
Condemned |
44786 |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
COND |
|
17/08/1966 |
Condemned |
45176 |
28A |
Motherwell |
|
COND |
|
17/08/1966 |
Condemned |
45477 |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
COND |
|
20/08/1966 |
Reallocation |
44666 |
2A |
Tyseley |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
20/08/1966 |
Condemned |
44688 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
20/08/1966 |
Reallocation |
44691 |
2B |
Oxley |
12C |
Barrow in Furness |
|
20/08/1966 |
Reallocation |
44710 |
2D |
Banbury |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
20/08/1966 |
Reallocation |
44774 |
2A |
Tyseley |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
20/08/1966 |
Reallocation |
44830 |
40E |
Colwick |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
20/08/1966 |
Reallocation |
44835 |
40E |
Colwick |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
20/08/1966 |
Reallocation |
44920 |
40E |
Colwick |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
20/08/1966 |
Reallocation |
45111 |
6J |
Holyhead |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
20/08/1966 |
Reallocation |
45275 |
6J |
Holyhead |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
20/08/1966 |
Reallocation |
45324 |
16B |
Colwick |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
20/08/1966 |
Condemned |
45325 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
COND |
|
20/08/1966 |
Reallocation |
45331 |
2D |
Banbury |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
20/08/1966 |
Condemned |
45344 |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
COND |
|
20/08/1966 |
Reallocation |
45426 |
16B |
Colwick |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
20/08/1966 |
Condemned |
45427 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
COND |
|
22/08/1966 |
Condemned |
45461 |
63A |
Perth South |
|
COND |
|
22/08/1966 |
Condemned |
45480 |
68B |
Dumfries |
|
COND |
|
27/08/1966 |
Reallocation |
44858 |
16C |
Derby |
16B |
Colwick |
|
27/08/1966 |
Reallocation |
45224 |
16C |
Derby |
16B |
Colwick |
|
27/08/1966 |
Reallocation |
45289 |
16C |
Derby |
16B |
Colwick |
|
27/08/1966 |
Condemned |
45442 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
09/1966 |
Condemned |
44869 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
09/1966 |
Condemned |
45004 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
COND |
|
09/1966 |
Condemned |
45138 |
68A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
09/1966 |
Condemned |
45140 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
09/1966 |
Condemned |
45220 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
COND |
|
09/1966 |
Condemned |
45430 |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
|
COND |
|
02/09/1966 |
Condemned |
44704 |
29A |
Perth South |
|
COND |
|
02/09/1966 |
Condemned |
44705 |
29A |
Perth South |
|
COND |
|
02/09/1966 |
Condemned |
44797 |
29A |
Perth South |
|
COND |
|
02/09/1966 |
Condemned |
44798 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
COND |
|
02/09/1966 |
Condemned |
44925 |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
COND |
|
02/09/1966 |
Condemned |
44999 |
67F |
Stranraer |
|
COND |
|
02/09/1966 |
Condemned |
45160 |
67C |
Ayr |
|
COND |
|
02/09/1966 |
Condemned |
45472 |
29A |
Perth South |
|
COND |
|
02/09/1966 |
Condemned |
45474 |
67C |
Ayr |
|
COND |
|
02/09/1966 |
Condemned |
45475 |
29A |
Perth South |
|
COND |
|
03/09/1966 |
Condemned |
44813 |
5D |
Stoke |
|
COND |
|
10/09/1966 |
Reallocation |
44694 |
56D |
Mirfield |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
10/09/1966 |
Reallocation |
44840 |
2D |
Banbury |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
10/09/1966 |
Reallocation |
44859 |
2A |
Tyseley |
5D |
Stoke |
|
10/09/1966 |
Reallocation |
44946 |
56D |
Mirfield |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
10/09/1966 |
Reallocation |
44951 |
56D |
Mirfield |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
10/09/1966 |
Reallocation |
45089 |
2D |
Banbury |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
10/09/1966 |
Condemned |
45091 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
10/09/1966 |
Condemned |
45128 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
10/09/1966 |
Reallocation |
45310 |
6J |
Holyhead |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
|
10/09/1966 |
Condemned |
45322 |
5D |
Stoke |
|
COND |
|
10/09/1966 |
Condemned |
45403 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
COND |
|
10/09/1966 |
Condemned |
45410 |
2E |
Saltley |
|
COND |
|
10/09/1966 |
Condemned |
45419 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
COND |
|
10/09/1966 |
Condemned |
45422 |
5D |
Stoke |
|
COND |
|
11/09/1966 |
Condemned |
45207 |
55D |
Royston |
|
COND |
|
17/09/1966 |
Reallocation |
44711 |
6J |
Holyhead |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
|
17/09/1966 |
Reallocation |
44777 |
2B |
Oxley |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
|
17/09/1966 |
Reallocation |
44780 |
2A |
Tyseley |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
|
17/09/1966 |
Reallocation |
44860 |
2D |
Banbury |
5D |
Stoke |
|
17/09/1966 |
Reallocation |
44942 |
2D |
Banbury |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
|
17/09/1966 |
Condemned |
44966 |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
|
COND |
|
17/09/1966 |
Reallocation |
44971 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
|
17/09/1966 |
Condemned |
45129 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
COND |
|
17/09/1966 |
Reallocation |
45134 |
2A |
Tyseley |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
|
17/09/1966 |
Reallocation |
45149 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
|
17/09/1966 |
Reallocation |
45279 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
|
17/09/1966 |
Reallocation |
45287 |
2A |
Tyseley |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
|
17/09/1966 |
Condemned |
45393 |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
COND |
|
17/09/1966 |
Reallocation |
45447 |
6J |
Holyhead |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
|
17/09/1966 |
Reallocation |
45493 |
2D |
Banbury |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
|
23/09/1966 |
Condemned |
44954 |
66E |
Carstairs |
|
COND |
|
24/09/1966 |
Reallocation |
44720 |
63A |
Perth South |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
24/09/1966 |
Reallocation |
45127 |
64A |
St Margarets |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
26/09/1966 |
Condemned |
45168 |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
COND |
|
26/09/1966 |
Condemned |
45309 |
66E |
Carstairs |
|
COND |
|
10/1966 |
Condemned |
45044 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
COND |
|
10/1966 |
Condemned |
45385 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
08/10/1966 |
Condemned |
44726 |
68A |
|
|
COND |
|
08/10/1966 |
Condemned |
44729 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
COND |
|
08/10/1966 |
Reallocation |
44766 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
08/10/1966 |
Condemned |
44811 |
40E |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
08/10/1966 |
Reallocation |
44872 |
2D |
Banbury |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
08/10/1966 |
Reallocation |
44875 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
08/10/1966 |
Reallocation |
44914 |
2D |
Banbury |
2B |
Oxley |
|
08/10/1966 |
Condemned |
45012 |
12C |
Barrow in Furness |
|
COND |
|
08/10/1966 |
Reallocation |
45042 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
08/10/1966 |
Condemned |
45058 |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
|
COND |
|
08/10/1966 |
Reallocation |
45064 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
08/10/1966 |
Reallocation |
45080 |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
55B |
Stourton |
|
08/10/1966 |
Condemned |
45118 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
08/10/1966 |
Reallocation |
45211 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
55B |
Stourton |
|
08/10/1966 |
Reallocation |
45277 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
08/10/1966 |
Reallocation |
45282 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
08/10/1966 |
Reallocation |
45298 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
08/10/1966 |
Reallocation |
45299 |
2D |
Banbury |
5D |
Stoke |
|
08/10/1966 |
Reallocation |
45308 |
2D |
Banbury |
5D |
Stoke |
|
08/10/1966 |
Reallocation |
45345 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
08/10/1966 |
Reallocation |
45428 |
55C |
Farnley Junction |
55B |
Stourton |
|
10/10/1966 |
Condemned |
45063 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
COND |
|
15/10/1966 |
Condemned |
44935 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
COND |
|
15/10/1966 |
Condemned |
45112 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
15/10/1966 |
Condemned |
45338 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
COND |
|
19/10/1966 |
Condemned |
44723 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
COND |
|
19/10/1966 |
Condemned |
44724 |
67C |
Ayr |
|
COND |
|
19/10/1966 |
Condemned |
44952 |
28C |
Carstairs |
|
COND |
|
19/10/1966 |
Condemned |
45029 |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
COND |
|
19/10/1966 |
Condemned |
45432 |
67C |
Ayr |
|
COND |
|
22/10/1966 |
Reallocation |
44737 |
8K |
Bank Hall |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
22/10/1966 |
Condemned |
44760 |
5D |
Stoke |
|
COND |
|
22/10/1966 |
Reallocation |
44781 |
26B |
Agecroft |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
22/10/1966 |
Reallocation |
44782 |
26B |
Agecroft |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
22/10/1966 |
Reallocation |
44809 |
8K |
Bank Hall |
8L |
Aintree |
|
22/10/1966 |
Reallocation |
44816 |
8K |
Bank Hall |
8L |
Aintree |
|
22/10/1966 |
Reallocation |
44817 |
9J |
Agecroft |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
22/10/1966 |
Condemned |
44841 |
2B |
Oxley |
|
COND |
|
22/10/1966 |
Reallocation |
44928 |
26B |
Agecroft |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
22/10/1966 |
Reallocation |
44929 |
26B |
Agecroft |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
22/10/1966 |
Condemned |
44987 |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
COND |
|
22/10/1966 |
Reallocation |
45055 |
8K |
Bank Hall |
8L |
Aintree |
|
22/10/1966 |
Reallocation |
45062 |
9J |
Agecroft |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
22/10/1966 |
Reallocation |
45096 |
9J |
Agecroft |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
22/10/1966 |
Reallocation |
45258 |
9J |
Agecroft |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
22/10/1966 |
Condemned |
45464 |
40E |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
27/10/1966 |
Condemned |
44720 |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
COND |
|
29/10/1966 |
Condemned |
44945 |
2B |
Oxley |
|
COND |
|
29/10/1966 |
Condemned |
45045 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
29/10/1966 |
Condemned |
45105 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
29/10/1966 |
Condemned |
45205 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
29/10/1966 |
Condemned |
45311 |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
|
COND |
|
12/11/1966 |
Reallocation |
44661 |
2A |
Tyseley |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
|
12/11/1966 |
Reallocation |
44663 |
2A |
Tyseley |
2B |
Oxley |
|
12/11/1966 |
Condemned |
44712 |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
COND |
|
12/11/1966 |
Reallocation |
44762 |
2A |
Tyseley |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
12/11/1966 |
Reallocation |
44776 |
2A |
Tyseley |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
12/11/1966 |
Reallocation |
44825 |
40E |
Colwick |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
12/11/1966 |
Condemned |
44847 |
40E |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
12/11/1966 |
Reallocation |
44858 |
16B |
Colwick |
8L |
Aintree |
|
12/11/1966 |
Reallocation |
44865 |
2A |
Tyseley |
2B |
Oxley |
|
12/11/1966 |
Reallocation |
44936 |
16B |
Colwick |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
12/11/1966 |
Condemned |
44941 |
40E |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
12/11/1966 |
Condemned |
44984 |
40E |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
12/11/1966 |
Reallocation |
45051 |
2A |
Tyseley |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
|
12/11/1966 |
Reallocation |
45052 |
2A |
Tyseley |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
|
12/11/1966 |
Condemned |
45154 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
COND |
|
12/11/1966 |
Reallocation |
45222 |
16B |
Colwick |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
12/11/1966 |
Condemned |
45224 |
16B |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
12/11/1966 |
Reallocation |
45267 |
40E |
Colwick |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
12/11/1966 |
Condemned |
45289 |
16B |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
12/11/1966 |
Reallocation |
45292 |
2A |
Tyseley |
5D |
Stoke |
|
12/11/1966 |
Condemned |
45329 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
COND |
|
12/11/1966 |
Reallocation |
45349 |
2A |
Tyseley |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
12/11/1966 |
Condemned |
45451 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
COND |
|
19/11/1966 |
Condemned |
44714 |
5D |
Stoke |
|
COND |
|
19/11/1966 |
Condemned |
45051 |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
|
COND |
|
19/11/1966 |
Condemned |
45053 |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
COND |
|
19/11/1966 |
Condemned |
45127 |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
COND |
|
19/11/1966 |
Condemned |
45162 |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
COND |
|
19/11/1966 |
Condemned |
45332 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
COND |
|
19/11/1966 |
Condemned |
45469 |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
COND |
|
19/11/1966 |
Condemned |
45473 |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
COND |
|
26/11/1966 |
Reallocation |
44703 |
61B |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
26/11/1966 |
Reallocation |
44722 |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
63A |
Perth South |
|
26/11/1966 |
Condemned |
44762 |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
COND |
|
26/11/1966 |
Reallocation |
44879 |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
63A |
Perth South |
|
26/11/1966 |
Reallocation |
45161 |
67C |
Ayr |
66E |
Carstairs |
|
26/11/1966 |
Reallocation |
45167 |
67C |
Ayr |
66E |
Carstairs |
|
26/11/1966 |
Reallocation |
45167 |
66E |
Carstairs |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
26/11/1966 |
Reallocation |
45213 |
67C |
Ayr |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
26/11/1966 |
Condemned |
45217 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
26/11/1966 |
Reallocation |
45319 |
66E |
Carstairs |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
26/11/1966 |
Reallocation |
45365 |
67C |
Ayr |
66E |
Carstairs |
|
26/11/1966 |
Condemned |
45372 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
26/11/1966 |
Condemned |
45408 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
26/11/1966 |
Reallocation |
45423 |
67C |
Ayr |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
26/11/1966 |
Reallocation |
45467 |
67C |
Ayr |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
26/11/1966 |
Reallocation |
45490 |
67B |
Hurlford |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
26/11/1966 |
Reallocation |
45492 |
66E |
Carstairs |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
29/11/1966 |
Condemned |
44718 |
67C |
Ayr |
|
COND |
|
29/11/1966 |
Condemned |
44788 |
67C |
Ayr |
|
COND |
|
29/11/1966 |
Condemned |
44791 |
66E |
Carstairs |
|
COND |
|
29/11/1966 |
Condemned |
44880 |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
COND |
|
29/11/1966 |
Condemned |
44972 |
67B |
Hurlford |
|
COND |
|
29/11/1966 |
Condemned |
44977 |
67C |
Ayr |
|
COND |
|
29/11/1966 |
Condemned |
44995 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
COND |
|
29/11/1966 |
Condemned |
45084 |
66E |
Carstairs |
|
COND |
|
29/11/1966 |
Condemned |
45115 |
67B |
Hurlford |
|
COND |
|
29/11/1966 |
Condemned |
45161 |
66E |
Carstairs |
|
COND |
|
29/11/1966 |
Condemned |
45463 |
67F |
Stranraer |
|
COND |
|
29/11/1966 |
Condemned |
45488 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
COND |
|
29/11/1966 |
Condemned |
45489 |
67B |
Hurlford |
|
COND |
|
03/12/1966 |
Reallocation |
44693 |
56D |
Mirfield |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
03/12/1966 |
Reallocation |
44695 |
56D |
Mirfield |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
03/12/1966 |
Reallocation |
44826 |
55C |
Farnley Junction |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
03/12/1966 |
Reallocation |
44896 |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
03/12/1966 |
Reallocation |
44943 |
55C |
Farnley Junction |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
03/12/1966 |
Reallocation |
44990 |
56D |
Mirfield |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
03/12/1966 |
Reallocation |
45208 |
56D |
Mirfield |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
10/12/1966 |
Reallocation |
44663 |
2B |
Oxley |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
10/12/1966 |
Condemned |
44703 |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
COND |
|
10/12/1966 |
Reallocation |
44770 |
6J |
Holyhead |
5D |
Stoke |
|
10/12/1966 |
Reallocation |
44771 |
6J |
Holyhead |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
10/12/1966 |
Reallocation |
44775 |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
10/12/1966 |
Reallocation |
44831 |
6J |
Holyhead |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
10/12/1966 |
Condemned |
44839 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
10/12/1966 |
Reallocation |
44914 |
2B |
Oxley |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
10/12/1966 |
Condemned |
44953 |
28C |
Carstairs |
|
COND |
|
10/12/1966 |
Reallocation |
45001 |
6J |
Holyhead |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
10/12/1966 |
Reallocation |
45043 |
6J |
Holyhead |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
10/12/1966 |
Reallocation |
45048 |
6J |
Holyhead |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
10/12/1966 |
Reallocation |
45116 |
6J |
Holyhead |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
10/12/1966 |
Reallocation |
45134 |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
10/12/1966 |
Condemned |
45223 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
COND |
|
10/12/1966 |
Reallocation |
45247 |
6J |
Holyhead |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
10/12/1966 |
Condemned |
45249 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
10/12/1966 |
Reallocation |
45263 |
2B |
Oxley |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
10/12/1966 |
Reallocation |
45280 |
6J |
Holyhead |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
10/12/1966 |
Condemned |
45365 |
66E |
Carstairs |
|
COND |
|
10/12/1966 |
Reallocation |
45405 |
6J |
Holyhead |
5D |
Stoke |
|
10/12/1966 |
Condemned |
45478 |
66E |
Carstairs |
|
COND |
|
14/12/1966 |
Condemned |
44951 |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
COND |
|
17/12/1966 |
Reallocation |
44691 |
12C |
Barrow in Furness |
12D |
Workington |
|
17/12/1966 |
Condemned |
44779 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
COND |
|
17/12/1966 |
Reallocation |
44882 |
12E |
Barrow in Furness |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
17/12/1966 |
Condemned |
44919 |
2B |
Oxley |
|
COND |
|
17/12/1966 |
Reallocation |
44937 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
17/12/1966 |
Reallocation |
45141 |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
17/12/1966 |
Reallocation |
45294 |
12C |
Barrow in Furness |
12D |
Workington |
|
17/12/1966 |
Reallocation |
45340 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
17/12/1966 |
Reallocation |
45371 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
17/12/1966 |
Reallocation |
45383 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
24/12/1966 |
Condemned |
44710 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
24/12/1966 |
Condemned |
44782 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
COND |
|
24/12/1966 |
Condemned |
45018 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
24/12/1966 |
Condemned |
45033 |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
COND |
|
24/12/1966 |
Condemned |
45238 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
COND |
|
24/12/1966 |
Condemned |
45399 |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
COND |
|
31/12/1966 |
Reallocation |
44794 |
61B |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
63A |
Perth South |
|
31/12/1966 |
Condemned |
44808 |
2B |
Oxley |
|
COND |
|
31/12/1966 |
Condemned |
44820 |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
COND |
|
31/12/1966 |
Reallocation |
44946 |
56F |
Low Moor |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
31/12/1966 |
Reallocation |
44951 |
98W |
|
56A |
Wakefield |
|
31/12/1966 |
Reallocation |
44963 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
31/12/1966 |
Reallocation |
44990 |
56F |
Low Moor |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
31/12/1966 |
Condemned |
44992 |
67B |
Hurlford |
|
COND |
|
31/12/1966 |
Reallocation |
45124 |
67B |
Hurlford |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
31/12/1966 |
Condemned |
45137 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
COND |
|
31/12/1966 |
Condemned |
45213 |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
COND |
|
31/12/1966 |
Condemned |
45214 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
COND |
|
31/12/1966 |
Reallocation |
45232 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
31/12/1966 |
Condemned |
45357 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
COND |
|
31/12/1966 |
Condemned |
45467 |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
COND |
|
31/12/1966 |
Condemned |
45483 |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
COND |
|
31/12/1966 |
Condemned |
45490 |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
COND |
|
31/12/1966 |
Condemned |
45492 |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
COND |
|
07/01/1967 |
Condemned |
45341 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
09/01/1967 |
Condemned |
45204 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
COND |
|
14/01/1967 |
Condemned |
44737 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
14/01/1967 |
Condemned |
44981 |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
|
COND |
|
14/01/1967 |
Condemned |
45106 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
14/01/1967 |
Condemned |
45197 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
14/01/1967 |
Condemned |
45336 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
14/01/1967 |
Reallocation |
45371 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
12D |
Workington |
|
21/01/1967 |
Reallocation |
44730 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
21/01/1967 |
Condemned |
44918 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
COND |
|
21/01/1967 |
Condemned |
45240 |
5D |
Stoke |
|
COND |
|
21/01/1967 |
Condemned |
45276 |
5D |
Stoke |
|
COND |
|
21/01/1967 |
Condemned |
45283 |
2B |
Oxley |
|
COND |
|
21/01/1967 |
Reallocation |
45436 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
28/01/1967 |
Condemned |
44860 |
5D |
Stoke |
|
COND |
|
28/01/1967 |
Reallocation |
45080 |
55B |
Stourton |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
28/01/1967 |
Reallocation |
45124 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
28/01/1967 |
Reallocation |
45141 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
28/01/1967 |
Reallocation |
45211 |
55B |
Stourton |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
28/01/1967 |
Reallocation |
45406 |
40E |
Colwick |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
28/01/1967 |
Reallocation |
45428 |
55B |
Stourton |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
04/02/1967 |
Condemned |
44989 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
04/02/1967 |
Reallocation |
45339 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
04/02/1967 |
Condemned |
45441 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
COND |
|
11/02/1967 |
Condemned |
45222 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
11/02/1967 |
Condemned |
45383 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
11/02/1967 |
Condemned |
45446 |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
COND |
|
18/02/1967 |
Condemned |
44666 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
18/02/1967 |
Condemned |
44671 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
18/02/1967 |
Condemned |
44856 |
2B |
Oxley |
|
COND |
|
25/02/1967 |
Condemned |
45094 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
25/02/1967 |
Condemned |
45277 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
COND |
|
25/02/1967 |
Condemned |
45466 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
COND |
|
04/03/1967 |
Condemned |
44689 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
04/03/1967 |
Condemned |
44958 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
04/03/1967 |
Condemned |
45060 |
5D |
Stoke |
|
COND |
|
04/03/1967 |
Condemned |
45132 |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
|
COND |
|
04/03/1967 |
Condemned |
45369 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
COND |
|
04/03/1967 |
Condemned |
45495 |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
COND |
|
08/03/1967 |
Condemned |
45079 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
COND |
|
11/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
44661 |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
11/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
44711 |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
11/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
44770 |
5D |
Stoke |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
11/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
44800 |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
11/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
44805 |
2B |
Oxley |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
11/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
44812 |
2B |
Oxley |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
11/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
44814 |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
11/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
44821 |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
11/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
44843 |
2B |
Oxley |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
11/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
44865 |
2B |
Oxley |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
11/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
44876 |
2B |
Oxley |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
11/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
44942 |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
11/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
44944 |
2B |
Oxley |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
11/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
45006 |
2B |
Oxley |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
11/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
45052 |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
11/03/1967 |
Condemned |
45064 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
COND |
|
11/03/1967 |
Condemned |
45141 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
11/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
45145 |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
11/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
45149 |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
11/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
45186 |
2B |
Oxley |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
11/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
45198 |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
11/03/1967 |
Condemned |
45250 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
COND |
|
11/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
45264 |
2B |
Oxley |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
11/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
45279 |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
11/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
45282 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
11/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
45285 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
11/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
45310 |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
11/03/1967 |
Condemned |
45326 |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
COND |
|
11/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
45350 |
5D |
Stoke |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
11/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
45447 |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
11/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
45493 |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
18/03/1967 |
Condemned |
44771 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
COND |
|
18/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
44777 |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
18/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
44780 |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
18/03/1967 |
Condemned |
44790 |
68A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
18/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
44897 |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
18/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
45031 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
18/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
45056 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
18/03/1967 |
Condemned |
45228 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
18/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
45287 |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
25/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
44834 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
25/03/1967 |
Condemned |
45028 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
25/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
45040 |
2B |
Oxley |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
01/04/1967 |
Condemned |
44691 |
12D |
Workington |
|
COND |
|
01/04/1967 |
Reallocation |
44971 |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
01/04/1967 |
Condemned |
45109 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
COND |
|
01/04/1967 |
Reallocation |
45227 |
10A |
Carnforth |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
01/04/1967 |
Reallocation |
45231 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
01/04/1967 |
Reallocation |
45373 |
10A |
Carnforth |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
04/04/1967 |
Condemned |
44998 |
29A |
Perth South |
|
COND |
|
08/04/1967 |
Condemned |
44892 |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
COND |
|
08/04/1967 |
Condemned |
45247 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
COND |
|
08/04/1967 |
Condemned |
45352 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
COND |
|
15/04/1967 |
Reallocation |
44661 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
5D |
Stoke |
|
15/04/1967 |
Reallocation |
44715 |
5B |
Crewe South |
12D |
Workington |
|
15/04/1967 |
Reallocation |
44759 |
5B |
Crewe South |
12D |
Workington |
|
15/04/1967 |
Reallocation |
44805 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
5D |
Stoke |
|
15/04/1967 |
Reallocation |
44840 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
5D |
Stoke |
|
15/04/1967 |
Reallocation |
44876 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
5D |
Stoke |
|
15/04/1967 |
Reallocation |
45052 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
5D |
Stoke |
|
15/04/1967 |
Condemned |
45062 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
COND |
|
15/04/1967 |
Condemned |
45371 |
12D |
Workington |
|
COND |
|
22/04/1967 |
Condemned |
44685 |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
COND |
|
22/04/1967 |
Condemned |
44722 |
63A |
Perth South |
|
COND |
|
22/04/1967 |
Condemned |
44794 |
63A |
Perth South |
|
COND |
|
22/04/1967 |
Condemned |
44879 |
63A |
Perth South |
|
COND |
|
22/04/1967 |
Condemned |
45340 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
22/04/1967 |
Condemned |
45402 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
29/04/1967 |
Reallocation |
44766 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
29/04/1967 |
Reallocation |
44829 |
5B |
Crewe South |
12D |
Workington |
|
29/04/1967 |
Reallocation |
44844 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
29/04/1967 |
Reallocation |
44913 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
29/04/1967 |
Reallocation |
44944 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
29/04/1967 |
Reallocation |
45089 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
29/04/1967 |
Reallocation |
45124 |
66B |
Motherwell |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
29/04/1967 |
Reallocation |
45130 |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
29/04/1967 |
Reallocation |
45280 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
01/05/1967 |
Condemned |
44699 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
COND |
|
01/05/1967 |
Condemned |
44796 |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
COND |
|
01/05/1967 |
Condemned |
44991 |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
COND |
|
01/05/1967 |
Condemned |
44997 |
29A |
Perth South |
|
COND |
|
01/05/1967 |
Condemned |
45124 |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
COND |
|
01/05/1967 |
Condemned |
45167 |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
COND |
|
01/05/1967 |
Condemned |
45319 |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
COND |
|
01/05/1967 |
Condemned |
45359 |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
COND |
|
01/05/1967 |
Condemned |
45423 |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
COND |
|
06/05/1967 |
Condemned |
44863 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
06/05/1967 |
Condemned |
44982 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
06/05/1967 |
Condemned |
45404 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
COND |
|
07/05/1967 |
Condemned |
44986 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
COND |
|
13/05/1967 |
Condemned |
44696 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
13/05/1967 |
Condemned |
44937 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
13/05/1967 |
Condemned |
45019 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
13/05/1967 |
Condemned |
45024 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
13/05/1967 |
Reallocation |
45055 |
8L |
Aintree |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
13/05/1967 |
Condemned |
45274 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
13/05/1967 |
Reallocation |
45330 |
27B |
Aintree |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
17/05/1967 |
Condemned |
45211 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
COND |
|
20/05/1967 |
Reallocation |
44658 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
20/05/1967 |
Reallocation |
44819 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
20/05/1967 |
Reallocation |
44831 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
20/05/1967 |
Reallocation |
44872 |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
20/05/1967 |
Condemned |
44875 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
COND |
|
20/05/1967 |
Reallocation |
44920 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
20/05/1967 |
Condemned |
44930 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
COND |
|
20/05/1967 |
Reallocation |
44985 |
5D |
Stoke |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
20/05/1967 |
Condemned |
45070 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
COND |
|
20/05/1967 |
Reallocation |
45116 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
20/05/1967 |
Condemned |
45126 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
20/05/1967 |
Condemned |
45147 |
8L |
Aintree |
|
COND |
|
20/05/1967 |
Reallocation |
45268 |
5D |
Stoke |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
20/05/1967 |
Reallocation |
45345 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
22/05/1967 |
Condemned |
44946 |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
COND |
|
27/05/1967 |
Reallocation |
44776 |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
27/05/1967 |
Reallocation |
45000 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
29/05/1967 |
Condemned |
44693 |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
COND |
|
06/1967 |
Condemned |
44768 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
06/1967 |
Condemned |
44928 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
06/1967 |
Condemned |
45003 |
5D |
Stoke |
|
COND |
|
06/1967 |
Condemned |
45031 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
COND |
|
06/1967 |
Condemned |
45120 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
06/1967 |
Condemned |
45256 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
COND |
|
06/1967 |
Condemned |
45339 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
06/1967 |
Condemned |
45346 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
COND |
|
03/06/1967 |
Condemned |
45242 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
10/06/1967 |
Condemned |
44821 |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
COND |
|
10/06/1967 |
Reallocation |
44917 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
10/06/1967 |
Reallocation |
45042 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
10/06/1967 |
Condemned |
45278 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
10/06/1967 |
Reallocation |
45298 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
10/06/1967 |
Condemned |
45303 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
COND |
|
10/06/1967 |
Reallocation |
45353 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
12/06/1967 |
Condemned |
44853 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
COND |
|
17/06/1967 |
Condemned |
44659 |
8L |
Aintree |
|
COND |
|
17/06/1967 |
Reallocation |
44809 |
8L |
Aintree |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
17/06/1967 |
Reallocation |
44816 |
8L |
Aintree |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
17/06/1967 |
Reallocation |
44858 |
8L |
Aintree |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
17/06/1967 |
Condemned |
44867 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
COND |
|
17/06/1967 |
Condemned |
44870 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
17/06/1967 |
Reallocation |
44910 |
8L |
Aintree |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
24/06/1967 |
Reallocation |
44683 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
24/06/1967 |
Condemned |
44695 |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
COND |
|
24/06/1967 |
Reallocation |
44713 |
5D |
Stoke |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
24/06/1967 |
Condemned |
44733 |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
COND |
|
24/06/1967 |
Reallocation |
44761 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
24/06/1967 |
Condemned |
44900 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
24/06/1967 |
Condemned |
45014 |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
COND |
|
24/06/1967 |
Reallocation |
45038 |
5D |
Stoke |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
24/06/1967 |
Condemned |
45069 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
24/06/1967 |
Reallocation |
45285 |
5B |
Crewe South |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
24/06/1967 |
Reallocation |
45310 |
5B |
Crewe South |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
24/06/1967 |
Condemned |
45343 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
08/07/1967 |
Condemned |
45059 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
COND |
|
08/07/1967 |
Condemned |
45406 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
COND |
|
15/07/1967 |
Reallocation |
44662 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
15/07/1967 |
Condemned |
44732 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
15/07/1967 |
Reallocation |
44824 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
55E |
Normanton |
|
15/07/1967 |
Reallocation |
44854 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
55E |
Normanton |
|
15/07/1967 |
Reallocation |
44857 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
55E |
Normanton |
|
15/07/1967 |
Condemned |
44882 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
15/07/1967 |
Condemned |
44883 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
15/07/1967 |
Reallocation |
44990 |
56A |
Wakefield |
55E |
Normanton |
|
15/07/1967 |
Reallocation |
45075 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
55E |
Normanton |
|
22/07/1967 |
Condemned |
44835 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
COND |
|
22/07/1967 |
Condemned |
45040 |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
COND |
|
22/07/1967 |
Condemned |
45071 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
COND |
|
22/07/1967 |
Condemned |
45188 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
COND |
|
22/07/1967 |
Condemned |
45191 |
5D |
Stoke |
|
COND |
|
22/07/1967 |
Condemned |
45302 |
5D |
Stoke |
|
COND |
|
22/07/1967 |
Reallocation |
45405 |
5D |
Stoke |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
22/07/1967 |
Condemned |
45417 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
COND |
|
29/07/1967 |
Condemned |
44795 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
29/07/1967 |
Condemned |
44862 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
29/07/1967 |
Condemned |
44913 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
COND |
|
29/07/1967 |
Condemned |
45116 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
08/1967 |
Condemned |
44667 |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
COND |
|
08/1967 |
Condemned |
45193 |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
COND |
|
08/1967 |
Condemned |
45454 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
COND |
|
08/1967 |
Condemned |
45455 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
05/08/1967 |
Condemned |
45412 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
COND |
|
12/08/1967 |
Condemned |
44661 |
5D |
Stoke |
|
COND |
|
12/08/1967 |
Reallocation |
44805 |
5D |
Stoke |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
12/08/1967 |
Condemned |
44817 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
12/08/1967 |
Reallocation |
44840 |
5D |
Stoke |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
12/08/1967 |
Reallocation |
44859 |
5D |
Stoke |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
12/08/1967 |
Reallocation |
44876 |
5D |
Stoke |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
12/08/1967 |
Reallocation |
44897 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
12/08/1967 |
Condemned |
44936 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
12/08/1967 |
Reallocation |
44963 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
12/08/1967 |
Condemned |
45050 |
5D |
Stoke |
|
COND |
|
12/08/1967 |
Reallocation |
45052 |
5D |
Stoke |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
12/08/1967 |
Condemned |
45057 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
COND |
|
12/08/1967 |
Reallocation |
45241 |
5D |
Stoke |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
12/08/1967 |
Reallocation |
45270 |
5D |
Stoke |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
12/08/1967 |
Reallocation |
45292 |
5D |
Stoke |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
12/08/1967 |
Reallocation |
45299 |
5D |
Stoke |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
12/08/1967 |
Condemned |
45308 |
5D |
Stoke |
|
COND |
|
12/08/1967 |
Condemned |
45324 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
12/08/1967 |
Reallocation |
45391 |
5B |
Crewe South |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
12/08/1967 |
Condemned |
45409 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
COND |
|
19/08/1967 |
Reallocation |
44682 |
5D |
Stoke |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
19/08/1967 |
Condemned |
44766 |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
COND |
|
19/08/1967 |
Reallocation |
44780 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
19/08/1967 |
Reallocation |
44800 |
5B |
Crewe South |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
19/08/1967 |
Condemned |
44830 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
19/08/1967 |
Reallocation |
44833 |
5B |
Crewe South |
29F |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
|
19/08/1967 |
Condemned |
44914 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
19/08/1967 |
Condemned |
45056 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
COND |
|
19/08/1967 |
Condemned |
45139 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
COND |
|
19/08/1967 |
Reallocation |
45353 |
5B |
Crewe South |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
19/08/1967 |
Reallocation |
45436 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
26/08/1967 |
Condemned |
44717 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
26/08/1967 |
Condemned |
44774 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
26/08/1967 |
Condemned |
45039 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
26/08/1967 |
Condemned |
45089 |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
COND |
|
26/08/1967 |
Condemned |
45304 |
26C |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
26/08/1967 |
Condemned |
45405 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
COND |
|
26/08/1967 |
Condemned |
45448 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
09/09/1967 |
Condemned |
44828 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
COND |
|
09/09/1967 |
Condemned |
44837 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
09/09/1967 |
Condemned |
44852 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
COND |
|
09/09/1967 |
Condemned |
44866 |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
COND |
|
09/09/1967 |
Condemned |
44896 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
COND |
|
09/09/1967 |
Condemned |
44912 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
COND |
|
09/09/1967 |
Condemned |
45072 |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
COND |
|
09/09/1967 |
Condemned |
45075 |
55E |
Normanton |
|
COND |
|
09/09/1967 |
Condemned |
45186 |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
COND |
|
09/09/1967 |
Condemned |
45234 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1967 |
Condemned |
44680 |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1967 |
Condemned |
44681 |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1967 |
Condemned |
44684 |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1967 |
Condemned |
44765 |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1967 |
Condemned |
44805 |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1967 |
Condemned |
44812 |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1967 |
Condemned |
44814 |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1967 |
Condemned |
44832 |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1967 |
Condemned |
44833 |
29F |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1967 |
Condemned |
44843 |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1967 |
Condemned |
44865 |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1967 |
Condemned |
44927 |
9K |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1967 |
Condemned |
44944 |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1967 |
Condemned |
44948 |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1967 |
Condemned |
45006 |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1967 |
Condemned |
45015 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1967 |
Condemned |
45021 |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1967 |
Condemned |
45042 |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1967 |
Condemned |
45107 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1967 |
Condemned |
45226 |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1967 |
Condemned |
45239 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1967 |
Condemned |
45241 |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1967 |
Condemned |
45243 |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1967 |
Condemned |
45264 |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1967 |
Condemned |
45270 |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1967 |
Condemned |
45297 |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1967 |
Condemned |
45298 |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1967 |
Condemned |
45440 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1967 |
Condemned |
45494 |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
COND |
|
23/09/1967 |
Condemned |
44675 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
23/09/1967 |
Condemned |
44679 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
23/09/1967 |
Condemned |
44736 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
23/09/1967 |
Reallocation |
44759 |
12D |
Workington |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
23/09/1967 |
Condemned |
44792 |
68A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
23/09/1967 |
Condemned |
45271 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
23/09/1967 |
Condemned |
45328 |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
COND |
|
23/09/1967 |
Condemned |
45373 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
30/09/1967 |
Condemned |
44872 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
30/09/1967 |
Condemned |
44909 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
30/09/1967 |
Condemned |
44934 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
COND |
|
30/09/1967 |
Condemned |
45052 |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
COND |
|
30/09/1967 |
Condemned |
45198 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
30/09/1967 |
Condemned |
45323 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
COND |
|
30/09/1967 |
Condemned |
45481 |
68A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
10/1967 |
Condemned |
44662 |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
COND |
|
10/1967 |
Condemned |
44694 |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
COND |
|
10/1967 |
Condemned |
44770 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
10/1967 |
Condemned |
44772 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
10/1967 |
Condemned |
44775 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
10/1967 |
Condemned |
44824 |
55E |
Normanton |
|
COND |
|
10/1967 |
Condemned |
44826 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
COND |
|
10/1967 |
Condemned |
44854 |
55E |
Normanton |
|
COND |
|
10/1967 |
Condemned |
44857 |
55E |
Normanton |
|
COND |
|
10/1967 |
Condemned |
44902 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
10/1967 |
Condemned |
44907 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
10/1967 |
Condemned |
44911 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
10/1967 |
Condemned |
44943 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
COND |
|
10/1967 |
Condemned |
44983 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
COND |
|
10/1967 |
Condemned |
44985 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
10/1967 |
Condemned |
44990 |
55E |
Normanton |
|
COND |
|
10/1967 |
Condemned |
45080 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
COND |
|
10/1967 |
Condemned |
45219 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
COND |
|
10/1967 |
Condemned |
45273 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
COND |
|
10/1967 |
Condemned |
45374 |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
COND |
|
10/1967 |
Condemned |
45415 |
9K |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
10/1967 |
Condemned |
45428 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
COND |
|
01/10/1967 |
Condemned |
45208 |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
COND |
|
07/10/1967 |
Reallocation |
44809 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
07/10/1967 |
Reallocation |
44816 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
07/10/1967 |
Condemned |
44825 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
07/10/1967 |
Reallocation |
45041 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
07/10/1967 |
Reallocation |
45055 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
07/10/1967 |
Reallocation |
45133 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
07/10/1967 |
Condemned |
45135 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
07/10/1967 |
Condemned |
45215 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
07/10/1967 |
Reallocation |
45221 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
07/10/1967 |
Condemned |
45307 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
07/10/1967 |
Reallocation |
45312 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
07/10/1967 |
Condemned |
45321 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
07/10/1967 |
Reallocation |
45330 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
07/10/1967 |
Reallocation |
45375 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
14/10/1967 |
Condemned |
44669 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
14/10/1967 |
Condemned |
44725 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
COND |
|
14/10/1967 |
Condemned |
44933 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
14/10/1967 |
Condemned |
44938 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
14/10/1967 |
Condemned |
44964 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
14/10/1967 |
Condemned |
45225 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
COND |
|
14/10/1967 |
Condemned |
45267 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
14/10/1967 |
Condemned |
45437 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
21/10/1967 |
Condemned |
44727 |
68A |
|
|
COND |
|
21/10/1967 |
Condemned |
44776 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
21/10/1967 |
Condemned |
44822 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
21/10/1967 |
Condemned |
44886 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
21/10/1967 |
Condemned |
45067 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
21/10/1967 |
Condemned |
45261 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
COND |
|
21/10/1967 |
Condemned |
45263 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
21/10/1967 |
Condemned |
45275 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
21/10/1967 |
Condemned |
45425 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
28/10/1967 |
Condemned |
44677 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
28/10/1967 |
Reallocation |
44781 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
28/10/1967 |
Condemned |
44898 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
28/10/1967 |
Condemned |
45000 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
28/10/1967 |
Reallocation |
45073 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
28/10/1967 |
Condemned |
45111 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
28/10/1967 |
Condemned |
45363 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
11/1967 |
Condemned |
44682 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
11/1967 |
Condemned |
44819 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
11/1967 |
Condemned |
44831 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
11/1967 |
Condemned |
44861 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
11/1967 |
Condemned |
44873 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
11/1967 |
Condemned |
44893 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
11/1967 |
Condemned |
44905 |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
COND |
|
11/1967 |
Condemned |
44920 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
11/1967 |
Condemned |
45048 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
11/1967 |
Condemned |
45281 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
11/1967 |
Condemned |
45288 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
11/1967 |
Condemned |
45331 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
11/1967 |
Condemned |
45449 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
11/11/1967 |
Condemned |
44730 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
COND |
|
11/11/1967 |
Condemned |
44840 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
COND |
|
11/11/1967 |
Condemned |
44844 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
COND |
|
11/11/1967 |
Condemned |
44859 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
COND |
|
11/11/1967 |
Condemned |
44876 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
COND |
|
11/11/1967 |
Condemned |
44917 |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
COND |
|
11/11/1967 |
Condemned |
45130 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
COND |
|
11/11/1967 |
Condemned |
45145 |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
COND |
|
11/11/1967 |
Condemned |
45232 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
COND |
|
11/11/1967 |
Condemned |
45280 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
COND |
|
11/11/1967 |
Condemned |
45292 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
COND |
|
11/11/1967 |
Condemned |
45299 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
COND |
|
11/11/1967 |
Condemned |
45347 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
11/11/1967 |
Condemned |
45349 |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
COND |
|
11/11/1967 |
Condemned |
45368 |
9J |
Agecroft |
|
COND |
|
18/11/1967 |
Condemned |
44658 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
18/11/1967 |
Condemned |
44697 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
18/11/1967 |
Condemned |
44759 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
18/11/1967 |
Condemned |
44778 |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
COND |
|
18/11/1967 |
Condemned |
45061 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
18/11/1967 |
Condemned |
45450 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
25/11/1967 |
Condemned |
44678 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
25/11/1967 |
Condemned |
45043 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
COND |
|
02/12/1967 |
Condemned |
45431 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
09/12/1967 |
Reallocation |
44683 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
09/12/1967 |
Reallocation |
44711 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
09/12/1967 |
Reallocation |
44761 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
09/12/1967 |
Reallocation |
44780 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
09/12/1967 |
Condemned |
44834 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
09/12/1967 |
Reallocation |
44842 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
09/12/1967 |
Condemned |
44887 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
09/12/1967 |
Condemned |
44895 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
COND |
|
09/12/1967 |
Condemned |
44915 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
09/12/1967 |
Reallocation |
44962 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
09/12/1967 |
Condemned |
45041 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
09/12/1967 |
Reallocation |
45268 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
09/12/1967 |
Reallocation |
45282 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
09/12/1967 |
Reallocation |
45296 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
09/12/1967 |
Reallocation |
45305 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
09/12/1967 |
Reallocation |
45310 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
09/12/1967 |
Reallocation |
45350 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
09/12/1967 |
Condemned |
45377 |
9K |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
09/12/1967 |
Reallocation |
45395 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
16/12/1967 |
Condemned |
44734 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
16/12/1967 |
Condemned |
44773 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
16/12/1967 |
Condemned |
44916 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
COND |
|
16/12/1967 |
Condemned |
44993 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
16/12/1967 |
Condemned |
45083 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
16/12/1967 |
Condemned |
45092 |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
COND |
|
23/12/1967 |
Condemned |
45236 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
30/12/1967 |
Condemned |
44674 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
30/12/1967 |
Condemned |
44767 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
30/12/1967 |
Condemned |
44858 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
30/12/1967 |
Condemned |
44962 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
30/12/1967 |
Condemned |
44988 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
COND |
|
30/12/1967 |
Condemned |
45196 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
30/12/1967 |
Condemned |
45221 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
COND |
|
30/12/1967 |
Condemned |
45246 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
30/12/1967 |
Condemned |
45259 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
30/12/1967 |
Condemned |
45285 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
30/12/1967 |
Condemned |
45295 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
06/01/1968 |
Reallocation |
44672 |
|
|
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
06/01/1968 |
Reallocation |
44715 |
12D |
Workington |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
06/01/1968 |
Condemned |
44728 |
9K |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
06/01/1968 |
Reallocation |
44802 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
9K |
Bolton |
|
06/01/1968 |
Reallocation |
44829 |
12D |
Workington |
9K |
Bolton |
|
06/01/1968 |
Reallocation |
44878 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
06/01/1968 |
Reallocation |
44884 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
06/01/1968 |
Reallocation |
44899 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
06/01/1968 |
Reallocation |
44910 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
06/01/1968 |
Reallocation |
45013 |
68A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
06/01/1968 |
Reallocation |
45038 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
06/01/1968 |
Reallocation |
45212 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
06/01/1968 |
Reallocation |
45253 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
06/01/1968 |
Reallocation |
45254 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
06/01/1968 |
Reallocation |
45279 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
06/01/1968 |
Reallocation |
45294 |
12D |
Workington |
9K |
Bolton |
|
06/01/1968 |
Reallocation |
45447 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
06/01/1968 |
Condemned |
45493 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
COND |
|
13/01/1968 |
Condemned |
44846 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
13/01/1968 |
Condemned |
45114 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
13/01/1968 |
Condemned |
45227 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
20/01/1968 |
Condemned |
44708 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
COND |
|
27/01/1968 |
Condemned |
44715 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
COND |
|
27/01/1968 |
Condemned |
44842 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
COND |
|
27/01/1968 |
Condemned |
44889 |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
COND |
|
27/01/1968 |
Condemned |
45005 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
27/01/1968 |
Condemned |
45375 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
03/02/1968 |
Condemned |
45034 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
COND |
|
03/02/1968 |
Condemned |
45133 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
03/02/1968 |
Condemned |
45391 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
10/02/1968 |
Condemned |
45054 |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
COND |
|
10/02/1968 |
Condemned |
45296 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
10/02/1968 |
Condemned |
45421 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
17/02/1968 |
Condemned |
44848 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
17/02/1968 |
Condemned |
45038 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
COND |
|
24/02/1968 |
Condemned |
44815 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
COND |
|
02/03/1968 |
Condemned |
44665 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
COND |
|
02/03/1968 |
Condemned |
44672 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
02/03/1968 |
Condemned |
44804 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
COND |
|
02/03/1968 |
Condemned |
44807 |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
COND |
|
02/03/1968 |
Condemned |
44906 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
02/03/1968 |
Condemned |
45150 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
COND |
|
02/03/1968 |
Condemned |
45258 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
COND |
|
02/03/1968 |
Condemned |
45294 |
9K |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
02/03/1968 |
Condemned |
45316 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
COND |
|
09/03/1968 |
Reallocation |
44735 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
09/03/1968 |
Condemned |
44838 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
09/03/1968 |
Reallocation |
44851 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
09/03/1968 |
Reallocation |
44888 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
09/03/1968 |
Reallocation |
44929 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
9K |
Bolton |
|
09/03/1968 |
Reallocation |
44965 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
9K |
Bolton |
|
09/03/1968 |
Reallocation |
45096 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
09/03/1968 |
Reallocation |
45269 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
16/03/1968 |
Condemned |
44800 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
16/03/1968 |
Condemned |
44940 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
COND |
|
16/03/1968 |
Condemned |
45001 |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
COND |
|
16/03/1968 |
Condemned |
45101 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
23/03/1968 |
Condemned |
45279 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
23/03/1968 |
Condemned |
45395 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
23/03/1968 |
Condemned |
45426 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
04/1968 |
Condemned |
44851 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
04/1968 |
Condemned |
44965 |
9K |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
04/1968 |
Condemned |
45253 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
04/1968 |
Condemned |
45376 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
06/04/1968 |
Condemned |
44903 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
13/04/1968 |
Condemned |
44683 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
13/04/1968 |
Condemned |
44761 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
13/04/1968 |
Reallocation |
45073 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
9K |
Bolton |
|
13/04/1968 |
Condemned |
45436 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
20/04/1968 |
Reallocation |
44806 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
20/04/1968 |
Condemned |
44926 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
20/04/1968 |
Reallocation |
44950 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
20/04/1968 |
Condemned |
45131 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
COND |
|
20/04/1968 |
Condemned |
45424 |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
COND |
|
05/1968 |
Condemned |
45013 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
COND |
|
05/1968 |
Condemned |
45065 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
05/1968 |
Condemned |
45201 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
COND |
|
05/1968 |
Condemned |
45254 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
04/05/1968 |
Condemned |
44663 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
04/05/1968 |
Condemned |
44711 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
04/05/1968 |
Condemned |
44836 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
COND |
|
04/05/1968 |
Condemned |
44855 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
COND |
|
04/05/1968 |
Condemned |
44864 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
04/05/1968 |
Condemned |
44868 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
COND |
|
04/05/1968 |
Condemned |
45027 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
COND |
|
04/05/1968 |
Condemned |
45190 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
04/05/1968 |
Condemned |
45282 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
04/05/1968 |
Condemned |
45284 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
04/05/1968 |
Condemned |
45381 |
9K |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
04/05/1968 |
Condemned |
45392 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
11/05/1968 |
Condemned |
44664 |
9K |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
11/05/1968 |
Reallocation |
44777 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
11/05/1968 |
Reallocation |
44781 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
9K |
Bolton |
|
11/05/1968 |
Condemned |
44829 |
9K |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
11/05/1968 |
Reallocation |
44871 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
9K |
Bolton |
|
11/05/1968 |
Reallocation |
44877 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
11/05/1968 |
Reallocation |
44888 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
9K |
Bolton |
|
11/05/1968 |
Reallocation |
45046 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
9K |
Bolton |
|
11/05/1968 |
Reallocation |
45055 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
11/05/1968 |
Reallocation |
45156 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
11/05/1968 |
Reallocation |
45187 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
11/05/1968 |
Reallocation |
45200 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
11/05/1968 |
Reallocation |
45231 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
11/05/1968 |
Reallocation |
45269 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
9K |
Bolton |
|
11/05/1968 |
Reallocation |
45287 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
11/05/1968 |
Reallocation |
45305 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
11/05/1968 |
Reallocation |
45312 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
9K |
Bolton |
|
11/05/1968 |
Reallocation |
45386 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
11/05/1968 |
Reallocation |
45388 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
11/05/1968 |
Reallocation |
45407 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
06/1968 |
Condemned |
44803 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
06/1968 |
Condemned |
45187 |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
COND |
|
06/1968 |
Condemned |
45345 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
06/1968 |
Condemned |
45411 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
22/06/1968 |
Condemned |
44777 |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
COND |
|
22/06/1968 |
Condemned |
44942 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
22/06/1968 |
Condemned |
45046 |
9K |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
22/06/1968 |
Condemned |
45149 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
29/06/1968 |
Condemned |
44780 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
29/06/1968 |
Condemned |
44802 |
9K |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
29/06/1968 |
Condemned |
44818 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
29/06/1968 |
Condemned |
44845 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
29/06/1968 |
Condemned |
44884 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
29/06/1968 |
Condemned |
44890 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
29/06/1968 |
Condemned |
44891 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
29/06/1968 |
Condemned |
44910 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
29/06/1968 |
Condemned |
44929 |
9K |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
29/06/1968 |
Condemned |
44947 |
9K |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
29/06/1968 |
Condemned |
44949 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
29/06/1968 |
Condemned |
45076 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
29/06/1968 |
Condemned |
45104 |
9K |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
29/06/1968 |
Condemned |
45202 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
29/06/1968 |
Condemned |
45203 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
29/06/1968 |
Condemned |
45209 |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
COND |
|
29/06/1968 |
Condemned |
45255 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
29/06/1968 |
Condemned |
45290 |
26C |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
29/06/1968 |
Condemned |
45312 |
9K |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
29/06/1968 |
Condemned |
45382 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
29/06/1968 |
Condemned |
45420 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
29/06/1968 |
Condemned |
45435 |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
COND |
|
29/06/1968 |
Condemned |
45445 |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
COND |
|
06/07/1968 |
Reallocation |
44735 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
06/07/1968 |
Reallocation |
44781 |
9K |
Bolton |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
06/07/1968 |
Reallocation |
44809 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
06/07/1968 |
Reallocation |
44871 |
9K |
Bolton |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
06/07/1968 |
Condemned |
44878 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
06/07/1968 |
Reallocation |
44888 |
9K |
Bolton |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
06/07/1968 |
Reallocation |
45055 |
9H |
Patricroft |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
06/07/1968 |
Reallocation |
45073 |
9K |
Bolton |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
06/07/1968 |
Reallocation |
45110 |
9K |
Bolton |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
06/07/1968 |
Reallocation |
45156 |
9H |
Patricroft |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
06/07/1968 |
Reallocation |
45200 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
06/07/1968 |
Reallocation |
45206 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
06/07/1968 |
Reallocation |
45260 |
9K |
Bolton |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
06/07/1968 |
Reallocation |
45268 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
06/07/1968 |
Reallocation |
45269 |
9K |
Bolton |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
06/07/1968 |
Reallocation |
45287 |
9H |
Patricroft |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
06/07/1968 |
Reallocation |
45310 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
06/07/1968 |
Reallocation |
45318 |
9K |
Bolton |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
06/07/1968 |
Reallocation |
45330 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
20/07/1968 |
Condemned |
44758 |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
COND |
|
20/07/1968 |
Condemned |
44816 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
20/07/1968 |
Condemned |
44899 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
20/07/1968 |
Condemned |
44963 |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
COND |
|
20/07/1968 |
Condemned |
45200 |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
COND |
|
20/07/1968 |
Condemned |
45353 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
20/07/1968 |
Condemned |
45394 |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
COND |
|
03/08/1968 |
Condemned |
44690 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
03/08/1968 |
Condemned |
44709 |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
COND |
|
03/08/1968 |
Condemned |
44713 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
03/08/1968 |
Condemned |
44735 |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
COND |
|
03/08/1968 |
Condemned |
44806 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
03/08/1968 |
Condemned |
44809 |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
COND |
|
03/08/1968 |
Condemned |
44874 |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
COND |
|
03/08/1968 |
Condemned |
44877 |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
COND |
|
03/08/1968 |
Condemned |
44888 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
03/08/1968 |
Condemned |
44897 |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
COND |
|
03/08/1968 |
Condemned |
44932 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
03/08/1968 |
Condemned |
44950 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
03/08/1968 |
Condemned |
44971 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
03/08/1968 |
Condemned |
45055 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
03/08/1968 |
Condemned |
45073 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
03/08/1968 |
Condemned |
45095 |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
COND |
|
03/08/1968 |
Condemned |
45096 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
03/08/1968 |
Condemned |
45134 |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
COND |
|
03/08/1968 |
Condemned |
45206 |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
COND |
|
03/08/1968 |
Condemned |
45212 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
03/08/1968 |
Condemned |
45231 |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
COND |
|
03/08/1968 |
Condemned |
45260 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
03/08/1968 |
Condemned |
45262 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
03/08/1968 |
Condemned |
45268 |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
COND |
|
03/08/1968 |
Condemned |
45269 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
03/08/1968 |
Condemned |
45287 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
03/08/1968 |
Condemned |
45310 |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
COND |
|
03/08/1968 |
Condemned |
45330 |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
COND |
|
03/08/1968 |
Condemned |
45342 |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
COND |
|
03/08/1968 |
Condemned |
45350 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
03/08/1968 |
Condemned |
45386 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
03/08/1968 |
Condemned |
45397 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
03/08/1968 |
Condemned |
45444 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
03/08/1968 |
Condemned |
45447 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
10/08/1968 |
Condemned |
44894 |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
COND |
|
10/08/1968 |
Condemned |
45017 |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
COND |
|
10/08/1968 |
Condemned |
45025 |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
COND |
|
10/08/1968 |
Condemned |
45156 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
10/08/1968 |
Condemned |
45305 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
10/08/1968 |
Condemned |
45318 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
10/08/1968 |
Condemned |
45388 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
10/08/1968 |
Condemned |
45390 |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
COND |
|
10/08/1968 |
Condemned |
45407 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
17/08/1968 |
Condemned |
44781 |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
COND |
|
17/08/1968 |
Condemned |
44871 |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
COND |
|
17/08/1968 |
Condemned |
45110 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|