LMS Stanier "6P" Class 4-6-0 - 'Jubilee'
Class | Number | Built | Name | Name Date | Notes | Removed | Date Withdrawn |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
6P | 5552 | 01/12/1934 | SILVER JUBILEE | 01/12/1934 | 30/09/1964 | 26/09/1964 | |
6P | 5553 | 29/05/1934 | CANADA | 29/05/1934 | 07/11/1964 | 07/11/1964 | |
6P | 5554 | 05/06/1934 | ONTARIO | 05/06/1934 | 07/11/1964 | 07/11/1964 | |
6P | 5555 | 18/06/1934 | QUEBEC | 18/06/1934 | 17/08/1963 | 17/08/1963 | |
6P | 5556 | 22/06/1934 | NOVA SCOTIA | 22/06/1934 | 05/09/1964 | 05/09/1964 | |
6P | 5557 | 29/06/1934 | NEW BRUNSWICK | 29/06/1934 | 19/09/1964 | 19/09/1964 | |
6P | 5556 | 06/07/1934 | MANITOBA | 06/07/1934 | 15/08/1964 | 15/08/1964 | |
6P | 5559 | 09/07/1934 | BRITISH COLUMBIA | 09/07/1934 | 20/10/1962 | 20/10/1962 | |
6P | 5560 | 11/07/1934 | PRINCE EDWARD ISLAND | 11/07/1934 | 30/11/1963 | 30/11/1963 | |
6P | 5561 | 13/07/1934 | SASKATCHEWAN | 13/07/1934 | 19/09/1964 | 19/09/1964 | |
6P | 5562 | 08/08/1934 | ALBERTA | 08/08/1934 | 31/10/1967 | 04/11/1967 | |
6P | 5563 | 09/08/1934 | AUSTRALIA | 09/08/1934 | 27/11/1965 | 27/11/1965 | |
6P | 5564 | 18/08/1934 | NEW SOUTH WALES | 18/08/1934 | 18/07/1964 | 18/07/1964 | |
6P | 5565 | 18/08/1934 | VICTORIA | 18/08/1934 | 31/01/1967 | 06/01/1967 | |
6P | 5566 | 25/08/1934 | QUEENSLAND | 25/08/1934 | 17/11/1962 | 12/11/1962 | |
6P | 5567 | 18/08/1934 | SOUTH AUSTRALIA | 18/08/1934 | 30/01/1965 | 30/01/1965 | |
6P | 5568 | 25/08/1934 | WESTERN AUSTRALIA | 25/08/1934 | 25/04/1964 | 25/04/1964 | |
6P | 5569 | 25/08/1934 | TASMANIA | 25/08/1934 | 25/04/1964 | 25/04/1964 | |
6P | 5570 | 25/08/1934 | NEW ZEALAND | 25/08/1934 | 29/12/1962 | 29/12/1962 | |
6P | 5571 | 01/09/1934 | SOUTH AFRICA | 01/09/1934 | 16/05/1964 | 16/05/1964 | |
6P | 5572 | 01/09/1934 | EIRE | 01/09/1934 | 04/01/1964 | 04/01/1964 | |
6P | 5573 | 29/09/1934 | NEWFOUNDLAND | 29/09/1934 | 31/08/1965 | 01/09/1965 | |
6P | 5574 | 29/09/1934 | INDIA | 29/09/1934 | 31/03/1966 | 20/03/1966 | |
6P | 5575 | 29/09/1934 | MADRAS | 29/09/1934 | 15/06/1963 | 15/06/1963 | |
6P | 5576 | 29/09/1934 | BOMBAY | 29/09/1934 | 29/12/1962 | 29/12/1962 | |
6P | 5577 | 29/09/1934 | BENGAL | 29/09/1934 | 05/09/1964 | 05/09/1964 | |
6P | 5578 | 29/09/1934 | UNITED PROVINCES | 29/09/1934 | 30/05/1964 | 30/05/1964 | |
6P | 5579 | 29/09/1934 | PUNJAB | 29/09/1934 | 15/08/1964 | 15/08/1964 | |
6P | 5580 | 06/10/1934 | BURMA | 06/10/1934 | 12/12/1964 | 12/12/1964 | |
6P | 5581 | 06/10/1934 | BIHAR AND ORISSA | 06/10/1934 | 31/08/1966 | 07/08/1966 | |
6P | 5582 | 24/11/1934 | CENTRAL PROVINCES | 24/11/1934 | 08/12/1962 | 08/12/1962 | |
6P | 5583 | 24/11/1934 | ASSAM | 24/11/1934 | 24/10/1964 | 24/10/1964 | |
6P | 5584 | 01/12/1934 | NORTH WEST FRONTIER | 01/12/1934 | 03/10/1964 | 03/10/1964 | |
6P | 5585 | 01/12/1934 | HYDERABAD | 01/12/1934 | 09/05/1964 | 09/05/1964 | |
6P | 5586 | 15/12/1934 | MYSORE | 15/12/1934 | 23/01/1965 | 23/01/1965 | |
6P | 5587 | 08/12/1934 | BARODA | 08/12/1934 | 15/12/1962 | 15/12/1962 | |
6P | 5588 | 15/12/1934 | KASHMIR | 15/12/1934 | 01/05/1965 | 01/05/1965 | |
6P | 5589 | 15/12/1934 | GWALIOR | 15/12/1934 | 31/03/1965 | 22/03/1965 | |
6P | 5590 | 22/12/1934 | TRAVANCORE | 22/12/1934 | 11/12/1965 | 11/12/1965 | |
6P | 5591 | 22/12/1934 | UDAIPUR | 22/12/1934 | 26/10/1963 | 26/10/1963 | |
6P | 5592 | 29/12/1934 | INDORE | 29/12/1934 | 26/09/1964 | 26/09/1964 | |
6P | 5593 | 12/1934 | KOLHAPUR | 12/1934 | 31/10/1967 | 15/10/1967 | |
6P | 5594 | 12/01/1935 | BHOPAL | 12/01/1935 | 29/12/1962 | 29/12/1962 | |
6P | 5595 | 05/01/1935 | SOUTHERN RHODESIA | 05/01/1935 | 30/01/1965 | 30/01/1965 | |
6P | 5596 | 12/01/1935 | BAHAMAS | 12/01/1935 | 23/07/1966 | 23/07/1966 | |
6P | 5597 | 12/01/1935 | BARBADOS | 12/01/1935 | 31/01/1965 | 11/01/1965 | |
6P | 5598 | 02/02/1935 | BASUTOLAND | 02/02/1935 | 24/10/1964 | 24/10/1964 | |
6P | 5599 | 26/01/1935 | BECHUANALAND | 26/01/1935 | 15/08/1964 | 15/08/1964 | |
6P | 5600 | 02/02/1935 | BERMUDA | 02/02/1935 | 18/12/1965 | 18/12/1965 | |
6P | 5601 | 13/04/1935 | BRITISH GUIANA | 13/04/1935 | 26/09/1964 | 26/09/1964 | |
6P | 5602 | 06/04/1935 | BRITISH HONDURAS | 06/04/1935 | 30/04/1965 | 18/03/1965 | |
6P | 5603 | 17/05/1935 | SOLOMON ISLANDS | 17/05/1935 | 08/12/1962 | 08/12/1962 | |
6P | 5604 | 02/03/1935 | CEYLON | 02/03/1935 | 17/07/1965 | 17/07/1965 | |
6P | 5605 | 06/04/1935 | CYPRUS | 06/04/1935 | 29/02/1964 | 03/1964 | |
6P | 5606 | 13/04/1935 | FALKLAND ISLANDS | 13/04/1935 | 27/06/1964 | 27/06/1964 | |
6P | 5607 | 29/06/1934 | FIJI | 29/06/1934 | 01/12/1962 | 01/12/1962 | |
6P | 5608 | 13/07/1934 | GIBRALTAR | 13/07/1934 | 31/08/1965 | 01/09/1965 | |
6P | 5609 | 17/07/1934 | GILBERT AND ELLIS ISLANDS | 17/07/1934 | 02/09/1960 | 02/09/1960 | |
6P | 5610 | 19/07/1934 | GHANA (1958) | 19/07/1934 | 11/01/1964 | 11/01/1964 | |
6P | 5611 | 27/07/1934 | HONG KONG | 27/07/1934 | 19/09/1964 | 19/09/1964 | |
6P | 5612 | 08/1934 | JAMAICA | 07/1934 | 28/03/1964 | 28/03/1964 | |
6P | 5613 | 06/08/1934 | KENYA | 06/08/1934 | 12/09/1964 | 12/09/1964 | |
6P | 5614 | 09/08/1934 | LEEWARD ISLANDS | 09/08/1934 | 11/01/1964 | 11/01/1964 | |
6P | 5615 | 15/08/1934 | MALAY STATES | 15/08/1934 | 08/12/1962 | 08/12/1962 | |
6P | 5616 | 16/08/1934 | MALTA G.C. | 16/08/1934 | 21/01/1961 | 21/01/1961 | |
6P | 5617 | 24/09/1934 | MAURITIUS | 24/09/1934 | 07/11/1964 | 07/11/1964 | |
6P | 5618 | 02/10/1934 | NEW HEBRIDES | 02/10/1934 | 29/02/1964 | 03/1964 | |
6P | 5619 | 05/10/1934 | NIGERIA | 05/10/1934 | 19/08/1961 | 19/08/1961 | |
6P | 5620 | 11/10/1934 | NORTH BORNEO | 11/10/1934 | 12/09/1964 | 12/09/1964 | |
6P | 5621 | 11/10/1934 | NORTHERN RHODESIA | 11/10/1934 | 31/10/1962 | 29/12/1962 | |
6P | 5622 | 17/10/1934 | NYASALAND | 17/10/1934 | 19/09/1964 | 19/09/1964 | |
6P | 5623 | 19/10/1934 | PALESTINE | 19/10/1934 | 25/07/1964 | 25/07/1964 | |
6P | 5624 | 19/10/1934 | ST. HELENA | 19/10/1934 | 23/11/1963 | 23/11/1963 | |
6P | 5625 | 24/10/1934 | SARAWAK | 24/10/1934 | 07/09/1963 | 07/09/1963 | |
6P | 5626 | 09/11/1934 | SEYCHELLES | 09/11/1934 | 30/11/1965 | 11/10/1965 | |
6P | 5627 | 13/11/1934 | SIERRA LEONE | 13/11/1934 | 17/09/1966 | 17/09/1966 | |
6P | 5628 | 13/11/1934 | SOMALILAND | 13/11/1934 | 08/12/1962 | 08/12/1962 | |
6P | 5629 | 10/11/1934 | STRAITS SETTLEMENTS | 10/11/1934 | 01/05/1965 | 01/05/1965 | |
6P | 5630 | 13/11/1934 | SWAZILAND | 13/11/1934 | 18/11/1961 | 18/11/1961 | |
6P | 5631 | 14/11/1934 | TANGANYIKA | 14/11/1934 | 22/08/1964 | 22/08/1964 | |
6P | 5632 | 11/11/1934 | TONGA | 11/11/1934 | 09/10/1965 | 09/10/1965 | |
6P | 5633 | 21/11/1934 | ADEN | 21/11/1934 | 16/10/1965 | 16/10/1965 | |
6P | 5634 | 22/11/1934 | TRINIDAD | 22/11/1934 | 11/05/1963 | 11/05/1963 | |
6P | 5635 | 24/11/1934 | TOBAGO | 24/11/1934 | 12/09/1964 | 12/09/1964 | |
6P | 5636 | 18/12/1934 | UGANDA | 18/12/1934 | 08/12/1962 | 08/12/1962 | |
6P | 5637 | 19/12/1934 | WINDWARD ISLANDS | 19/12/1934 | 13/12/1952 | 13/12/1952 | |
6P | 5638 | 19/12/1934 | ZANZIBAR | 19/12/1934 | 14/03/1964 | 14/03/1964 | |
6P | 5639 | 28/12/1934 | RALEIGH | 28/12/1934 | 30/11/1963 | 10/1963 | |
6P | 5640 | 12/1934 | FROBISHER | 12/1934 | 07/03/1964 | 07/03/1964 | |
6P | 5641 | 12/1934 | SANDWICH | 12/1934 | 19/09/1964 | 19/09/1964 | |
6P | 5642 | 10/05/1934 | BOSCAWEN | 10/05/1934 | 09/01/1965 | 09/01/1965 | |
6P | 5643 | 04/12/1934 | RODNEY | 04/12/1934 | 31/01/1966 | 19/01/1966 | |
6P | 5644 | 07/12/1934 | HOWE | 07/12/1934 | 23/11/1963 | 23/11/1963 | |
6P | 5645 | 07/12/1934 | COLLINGWOOD | 07/12/1934 | 19/10/1963 | 19/10/1963 | |
6P | 5646 | 14/12/1934 | NAPIER | 14/12/1934 | 28/12/1963 | 28/12/1963 | |
6P | 5647 | 04/01/1935 | STURDEE | 04/01/1935 | 30/04/1967 | 26/04/1967 | |
6P | 5648 | 10/01/1935 | WEMYSS | 10/01/1935 | 09/02/1963 | 09/02/1963 | |
6P | 5649 | 10/01/1935 | HAWKINS | 10/01/1935 | 05/10/1963 | 05/10/1963 | |
6P | 5650 | 14/01/1935 | BLAKE | 14/01/1935 | 19/01/1963 | 19/01/1963 | |
6P | 5651 | 16/01/1935 | SHOVELL | 16/01/1935 | 24/11/1962 | 23/11/1962 | |
6P | 5652 | 21/01/1935 | HAWKE | 21/01/1935 | 16/01/1965 | 16/01/1965 | |
6P | 5653 | 22/01/1935 | BARHAM | 22/01/1935 | 03/04/1965 | 03/04/1965 | |
6P | 5654 | 07/02/1935 | HOOD | 07/02/1935 | 25/06/1966 | 25/06/1966 | |
6P | 5655 | 13/12/1934 | KEITH | 13/12/1934 | 17/04/1965 | 17/04/1965 | |
6P | 5656 | 17/12/1934 | COCHRANE | 17/12/1934 | 29/12/1962 | 29/12/1962 | |
6P | 5657 | 17/12/1934 | TYRWHITT | 17/12/1934 | 26/09/1964 | 26/09/1964 | |
6P | 5658 | 18/12/1934 | KEYES | 18/12/1934 | 30/09/1965 | 13/09/1965 | |
6P | 5659 | 20/12/1934 | DRAKE | 20/12/1934 | 25/05/1963 | 25/05/1963 | |
6P | 5660 | 27/12/1934 | ROOKE | 27/12/1934 | 31/07/1966 | 26/06/1966 | |
6P | 5661 | 27/12/1934 | VERNON | 27/12/1934 | 31/05/1965 | 17/05/1965 | |
6P | 5662 | 28/12/1934 | KEMPENFELT | 28/12/1934 | 24/11/1962 | 23/11/1962 | |
6P | 5663 | 01/01/1935 | JERVIS | 01/01/1935 | 24/10/1964 | 24/10/1964 | |
6P | 5664 | 01/01/1935 | NELSON | 01/01/1935 | 31/05/1965 | 03/05/1965 | |
6P | 5665 | 18/11/1935 | LORD RUTHERFORD OF NELSON | 18/11/1935 | 31/10/1962 | 29/12/1962 | |
6P | 5666 | 18/11/1935 | CORNWALLIS | 18/11/1935 | 17/04/1965 | 17/04/1965 | |
6P | 5667 | 25/11/1935 | JELLICOE | 25/11/1935 | 23/01/1965 | 23/01/1965 | |
6P | 5668 | 02/12/1935 | MADDEN | 02/12/1935 | 21/12/1963 | 21/12/1963 | |
6P | 5669 | 04/12/1935 | FISHER | 04/12/1935 | 01/06/1963 | 01/06/1963 | |
6P | 5670 | 17/12/1935 | HOWARD OF EFFINGHAM | 17/12/1935 | 24/10/1964 | 24/10/1964 | |
6P | 5671 | 06/12/1935 | PRINCE RUPERT | 06/12/1935 | 09/11/1963 | 09/11/1963 | |
6P | 5672 | 10/12/1935 | ANSON | 10/12/1935 | 07/11/1964 | 07/11/1964 | |
6P | 5673 | 12/12/1935 | KEPPEL | 12/12/1935 | 31/10/1962 | 29/12/1962 | |
6P | 5674 | 16/12/1935 | DUNCAN | 16/12/1935 | 10/10/1964 | 10/10/1964 | |
6P | 5675 | 17/12/1935 | HARDY | 17/12/1935 | 31/07/1967 | 24/06/1967 | |
6P | 5676 | 18/12/1935 | CODRINGTON | 18/12/1935 | 26/09/1964 | 26/09/1964 | |
6P | 5677 | 19/12/1935 | BEATTY | 19/12/1935 | 31/10/1962 | 29/12/1962 | |
6P | 5678 | 24/12/1935 | DE ROBECK | 24/12/1935 | 08/12/1962 | 08/12/1962 | |
6P | 5679 | 24/12/1935 | ARMADA | 24/12/1935 | 29/12/1962 | 29/12/1962 | |
6P | 5680 | 12/1935 | CAMPERDOWN | 12/1935 | 12/01/1963 | 12/01/1963 | |
6P | 5681 | 12/1935 | ABOUKIR | 12/1935 | 19/09/1964 | 19/09/1964 | |
6P | 5682 | 06/01/1936 | TRAFALGAR | 06/01/1936 | 30/06/1964 | 01/06/1964 | |
6P | 5683 | 16/01/1936 | HOGUE | 16/01/1936 | 29/12/1962 | 29/12/1962 | |
6P | 5684 | 06/02/1936 | JUTLAND | 06/02/1936 | 11/12/1965 | 11/12/1965 | |
6P | 5685 | 02/1936 | BARFLEUR | 01/1936 | 30/04/1964 | 01/04/1964 | |
6P | 5686 | 05/02/1936 | ST. VINCENT | 05/02/1936 | 17/11/1962 | 17/11/1962 | |
6P | 5687 | 10/02/1936 | NEPTUNE | 10/02/1936 | 31/10/1962 | 29/12/1962 | |
6P | 5688 | 24/02/1936 | POLYPHEMUS | 24/02/1936 | 15/12/1962 | 15/12/1962 | |
6P | 5689 | 28/02/1936 | AJAX | 28/02/1936 | 12/12/1964 | 12/12/1964 | |
6P | 5690 | 09/03/1936 | LEANDER | 09/03/1936 | 31/03/1964 | 17/03/1964 | |
6P | 5691 | 11/03/1936 | ORION | 11/03/1936 | 29/12/1962 | 29/12/1962 | |
6P | 5692 | 19/03/1936 | CYCLOPS | 19/03/1936 | 31/10/1962 | 29/12/1962 | |
6P | 5693 | 19/03/1936 | AGAMEMNON | 19/03/1936 | 31/10/1962 | 29/12/1962 | |
6P | 5694 | 25/03/1936 | BELLEROPHON | 25/03/1936 | 31/12/1966 | 04/01/1967 | |
6P | 5695 | 26/03/1936 | MINOTAUR | 26/03/1936 | 29/02/1964 | 02/1964 | |
6P | 5696 | 02/04/1936 | ARETHUSA | 02/04/1936 | 18/07/1964 | 18/07/1964 | |
6P | 5697 | 07/04/1936 | ACHILLIES | 07/04/1936 | 30/09/1967 | 05/09/1967 | |
6P | 5698 | 08/04/1936 | MARS | 08/04/1936 | 23/10/1965 | 23/10/1965 | |
6P | 5699 | 15/04/1936 | GALATEA | 15/04/1936 | 21/11/1964 | 21/11/1964 | |
6P | 5700 | 20/04/1936 | AMETHYST | 20/04/1936 | 04/07/1964 | 04/07/1964 | |
6P | 5701 | 24/04/1936 | CONQUEROR | 24/04/1936 | 23/02/1963 | 23/02/1963 | |
6P | 5702 | 05/05/1936 | COLOSSUS | 05/05/1936 | 27/04/1963 | 27/04/1963 | |
6P | 5703 | 05/05/1936 | THUNDERER | 05/05/1936 | 21/11/1964 | 21/11/1964 | |
6P | 5704 | 11/05/1936 | LEVIATHAN | 11/05/1936 | 23/01/1965 | 23/01/1965 | |
6P | 5705 | 21/05/1936 | SEAHORSE | 21/05/1936 | 06/11/1965 | 06/11/1965 | |
6P | 5706 | 26/05/1936 | EXPRESS | 26/05/1936 | 28/09/1963 | 28/09/1963 | |
6P | 5707 | 27/05/1936 | VALIANT | 27/05/1936 | 31/10/1962 | 29/12/1962 | |
6P | 5708 | 01/06/1936 | RESOLUTION | 01/06/1936 | 29/02/1964 | 03/1964 | |
6P | 5709 | 03/06/1936 | IMPLACABLE | 03/06/1936 | 23/11/1963 | 23/11/1963 | |
6P | 5710 | 08/06/1936 | IRRESISTIBLE | 08/06/1936 | 06/06/1964 | 06/06/1964 | |
6P | 5711 | 19/06/1936 | COURAGEOUS | 19/06/1936 | 31/10/1962 | 29/12/1962 | |
6P | 5712 | 24/06/1936 | VICTORY | 24/06/1936 | 30/11/1963 | 30/11/1963 | |
6P | 5713 | 29/06/1936 | RENOWN | 29/06/1936 | 20/10/1962 | 20/10/1962 | |
6P | 5714 | 01/07/1936 | REVENGE | 01/07/1936 | 20/07/1963 | 20/07/1963 | |
6P | 5715 | 03/07/1936 | INVINCIBLE | 03/07/1936 | 29/12/1962 | 29/12/1962 | |
6P | 5716 | 04/07/1936 | SWIFTSURE | 04/07/1936 | 12/09/1964 | 12/09/1964 | |
6P | 5717 | 21/07/1936 | DAUNTLESS | 21/07/1936 | 26/10/1963 | 26/10/1963 | |
6P | 5718 | 30/07/1936 | DREADNOUGHT | 30/07/1936 | 20/10/1962 | 20/10/1962 | |
6P | 5719 | 03/08/1936 | GLORIOUS | 03/08/1936 | 23/03/1963 | 23/03/1963 | |
6P | 5720 | 17/08/1936 | INDOMITABLE | 17/08/1936 | 31/10/1962 | 29/12/1962 | |
6P | 5721 | 26/08/1936 | IMPREGNABLE | 26/08/1936 | 09/10/1965 | 09/10/1965 | |
6P | 5722 | 24/08/1936 | DEFENCE | 24/08/1936 | 01/12/1962 | 01/12/1962 | |
6P | 5723 | 26/08/1936 | FEARLESS | 26/08/1936 | 22/08/1964 | 22/08/1964 | |
6P | 5724 | 02/09/1936 | WARSPITE | 02/09/1936 | 03/11/1962 | 03/11/1962 | |
6P | 5725 | 25/09/1936 | REPULSE | 25/09/1936 | 29/12/1962 | 29/12/1962 | |
6P | 5726 | 09/10/1936 | VINDICTIVE | 09/10/1936 | 20/03/1965 | 20/03/1965 | |
6P | 5727 | 12/10/1936 | INFLEXIBLE | 12/10/1936 | 31/10/1962 | 29/12/1962 | |
6P | 5728 | 07/10/1936 | DEFIANCE | 07/10/1936 | 20/10/1962 | 20/10/1962 | |
6P | 5729 | 13/10/1936 | FURIOUS | 13/10/1936 | 20/10/1962 | 20/10/1962 | |
6P | 5730 | 16/10/1936 | OCEAN | 16/10/1936 | 05/10/1963 | 05/10/1963 | |
6P | 5731 | 21/10/1936 | PERSEVEREANCE | 21/10/1936 | 20/10/1962 | 20/10/1962 | |
6P | 5732 | 29/10/1936 | SANSPAREIL | 29/10/1936 | 29/02/1964 | 03/1964 | |
6P | 5733 | 02/11/1936 | NOVELTY | 02/11/1936 | 19/09/1964 | 19/09/1964 | |
6P | 5734 | 11/11/1936 | METEOR | 11/11/1936 | 28/12/1963 | 28/12/1963 | |
6P | 5735 | 16/11/1936 | COMET | 16/11/1936 | 03/10/1964 | 03/10/1964 | |
6P | 5736 | 25/11/1936 | PHOENIX | 25/11/1936 | 26/09/1964 | 26/09/1964 | |
6P | 5737 | 23/11/1936 | ATLAS | 23/11/1936 | 30/05/1964 | 30/05/1964 | |
6P | 5738 | 12/1936 | SAMSON | 11/1936 | 28/12/1963 | 28/12/1963 | |
6P | 5739 | 10/12/1936 | ULSTER | 10/12/1936 | 31/01/1967 | 04/01/1967 | |
6P | 5740 | 19/12/1936 | MUNSTER | 19/12/1936 | 26/10/1963 | 26/10/1963 | |
6P | 5741 | 29/12/1936 | LEINSTER | 29/12/1936 | 01/02/1964 | 01/02/1964 | |
6P | 5742 | 12/1936 | CONNAUGHT | 12/1936 | 01/05/1965 | 01/05/1965 |