LMS Fowler "PAT" Class 4-6-0
Class | Number | Built | Name | Name Date | Notes | Removed | Date Withdrawn |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Patriot | 5971 | 08/11/1930 | PATRIOT | 08/11/1930 | 11/03/1961 | 11/03/1961 | |
Patriot | 5902 | 13/11/1930 | ST. DUNSTAN'S | 13/11/1930 | 26/08/1961 | 26/08/1961 | |
Patriot | 5959 | 01/07/1932 | ROYAL NAVAL DIVISION | 01/07/1932 | 03/09/1960 | 03/09/1960 | |
Patriot | 5985 | 14/07/1932 | THE ROYAL LEICESTERSHIRE REGIMENT (1948) | 14/07/1932 | 12/08/1961 | 12/08/1961 | |
Patriot | 5987 | 18/07/1932 | ROYAL SIGNALS | 18/07/1932 | 17/03/1962 | 16/03/1962 | |
Patriot | 5948 | 26/07/1932 | THE ROYAL ARMY ORDNANCE CORPS | 26/07/1932 | 02/06/1962 | 02/06/1962 | |
Patriot | 5974 | 01/08/1932 | THE ROYAL PIONEER CORPS | 01/08/1932 | 17/03/1962 | 16/03/1962 | |
Patriot | 5936 | 12/08/1932 | ROYAL TANK CORPS | 12/08/1932 | 20/10/1962 | 20/10/1962 | |
Patriot | 6005 | 19/08/1932 | THE DERBYSHIRE YEOMANRY | 19/08/1932 | 12/08/1961 | 12/08/1961 | |
Patriot | 5972 | 09/1932 | ISLE OF MAN | 08/1932 | 11/02/1961 | 11/02/1961 | |
Patriot | 5966 | 14/09/1932 | BUNSEN | 14/09/1932 | 27/03/1965 | 27/03/1965 | |
Patriot | 5983 | 21/09/1932 | HOLYHEAD | 21/09/1932 | 27/05/1961 | 27/05/1961 | |
Patriot | 5992 | 27/09/1932 | CAERNARVON | 27/09/1932 | 09/06/1962 | 09/06/1962 | |
Patriot | 5982 | 10/10/1932 | THE BEDFORDSHIRE AND HERTFORDSHIRE REGIMENT | 10/10/1932 | 22/07/1961 | 22/07/1961 | |
Patriot | 6006 | 20/02/1933 | BRADSHAW | 20/02/1933 | 20/10/1962 | 20/10/1962 | |
Patriot | 6008 | 25/02/1933 | LADY GODIVA | 25/02/1933 | 17/03/1962 | 16/03/1962 | |
Patriot | 5954 | 17/02/1933 | LLANDUDNO | 17/02/1933 | 19/05/1962 | 19/05/1962 | |
Patriot | 5933 | 04/03/1933 | RHYL | 04/03/1933 | 28/09/1963 | 28/09/1963 | |
Patriot | 5972 | 03/03/1933 | PRESTATYN | 03/03/1933 | 19/09/1964 | 19/09/1964 | |
Patriot | 6026 | 08/03/1933 | BANGOR | 08/03/1933 | 25/01/1964 | 25/01/1964 | |
Patriot | 5907 | 14/03/1933 | BLACKPOOL | 14/03/1933 | 15/09/1962 | 15/09/1962 | |
Patriot | 5916 | 22/03/1933 | COLWYN BAY | 22/03/1933 | 11/05/1963 | 11/05/1963 | |
Patriot | 5963 | 22/03/1933 | MORECAMBE AND HEYSHAM | 22/03/1933 | 24/10/1964 | 24/10/1964 | |
Patriot | 5944 | 27/03/1933 | SOUTHPORT | 27/03/1933 | 05/12/1964 | 05/12/1964 | |
Patriot | 5996 | 04/04/1933 | R E M E | 04/04/1933 | 19/01/1963 | 19/01/1963 | |
Patriot | 5926 | 06/04/1933 | STEPHENSON | 06/04/1933 | 22/02/1964 | 22/02/1964 | |
Patriot | 6022 | 03/04/1933 | SIR FRANK REE | 03/04/1933 | 01/01/1965 | 01/01/1965 | |
Patriot | 6027 | 07/04/1933 | SIR FREDERICK HARRISON | 07/04/1933 | 30/10/1965 | 30/10/1965 | |
Patriot | 6011 | 11/04/1933 | ILLUSTRIOUS | 11/04/1933 | 01/02/1964 | 01/02/1964 | |
Patriot | 5905 | 10/04/1933 | LORD RATHMORE | 10/04/1933 | 15/09/1962 | 15/09/1962 | |
Patriot | 5935 | 25/04/1933 | E. TOOTAL BROADHURST | 25/04/1933 | 09/05/1964 | 09/05/1964 | |
Patriot | 5997 | 04/05/1933 | SIR HERBERT WALKER, K.C.B. | 04/05/1933 | 26/10/1963 | 26/10/1963 | |
Patriot | 6018 | 04/05/1933 | PRIVATE W. WOOD, V.C. | 04/05/1933 | 29/12/1962 | 29/12/1962 | |
Patriot | 6015 | 19/07/1933 | PRIVATE E. SYKES, V.C. | 19/07/1933 | 09/06/1962 | 09/06/1962 | |
Patriot | 6000 | 21/07/1933 | GIGGLESWICK | 21/07/1933 | 22/09/1962 | 22/09/1962 | |
Patriot | 5925 | 27/07/1933 | E.C. TRENCH | 27/07/1933 | 16/09/1961 | 16/09/1961 | |
Patriot | 5901 | 07/08/1933 | SIR ROBERT TURNBULL | 07/08/1933 | 06/04/1963 | 06/04/1963 | |
Patriot | 5903 | 15/08/1933 | DUKE OF SUTHERLAND | 15/08/1933 | 09/06/1962 | 09/06/1962 | |
Patriot | 5543 | 16/03/1934 | HOME GUARD | 16/03/1934 | 17/11/1962 | 17/11/1962 | |
Patriot | 5545 | 27/03/1934 | PLANET | 27/03/1934 | 30/05/1964 | 30/05/1964 | |
Patriot | 5546 | 29/03/1934 | FLEETWOOD | 29/03/1934 | 09/06/1962 | 09/06/1962 | |
Patriot | 5548 | 27/04/1934 | LYTHAM ST. ANNES | 27/04/1934 | 09/06/1962 | 09/06/1962 |