Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 243 Today
» 1018 Yesterday
» 5415 Week
» 16986 Month
» 265279 Year
» 1149660 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LNWR/LMS Cooke "Prince of Wales" Class 4-6-0


Class LNWR LMS (1st) LMS (Dup.) BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
Prince of Wales 819 5600     10/1911 W Withdrawn 21/10/1933 21/10/1933
Prince of Wales 1388 5601 25601   10/1911 W Withdrawn 23/03/1935 23/03/1935
Prince of Wales 1452 5602 25602   10/1911 W Withdrawn 26/06/1937 26/06/1937
Prince of Wales 1454 5603 25603   11/1911 W Withdrawn 19/01/1935 19/01/1935
Prince of Wales 1537 5604 25604   11/1911 W Withdrawn 27/10/1934 27/10/1934
Prince of Wales 1691 5605 25605   11/1911 W Withdrawn 10/11/1934 10/11/1934
Prince of Wales 1704 5606     11/1911 W Withdrawn 25/09/1933 25/09/1933
Prince of Wales 1721 5607 25607   11/1911 W Withdrawn 22/12/1934 22/12/1934
Prince of Wales 2021 5608 25608   12/1911 W Withdrawn 09/02/1935 09/02/1935
Prince of Wales 2359 5609     12/1911 W Withdrawn 14/10/1933 14/10/1933
Prince of Wales 362 5610     10/1913 W Withdrawn 09/10/1933 09/10/1933
Prince of Wales 892 5611 25611   10/1913 W Withdrawn 25/05/1935 25/05/1935
Prince of Wales 1081 5612 25612   10/1913 W Withdrawn 25/01/1936 25/01/1936
Prince of Wales 1089 5613 25613   10/1913 W Withdrawn 16/02/1935 16/02/1935
Prince of Wales 1134 5614 25614   10/1913 W Withdrawn 29/12/1934 29/12/1934
Prince of Wales 2040 5615 25615   11/1913 W Withdrawn 09/03/1935 09/03/1935
Prince of Wales 2075 5616 25616   11/1913 W Withdrawn 01/12/1934 01/12/1934
Prince of Wales 321 5617 25617   11/1913 W Withdrawn 18/01/1935 18/01/1935
Prince of Wales 479 5618 25618   12/1913 W Withdrawn 23/02/1935 23/02/1935
Prince of Wales 951 5619 25619   12/1913 W Withdrawn 04/08/1934 04/08/1934
Prince of Wales 2198 5620 25620   11/1913 W Withdrawn 14/03/1936 14/03/1936
Prince of Wales 2205 5621 25621   11/1913 W Withdrawn 01/09/1934 01/09/1934
Prince of Wales 2213 5622     11/1913 W Withdrawn 18/09/1933 18/09/1933
Prince of Wales 1679 5623 25623   12/1913 W Withdrawn 18/05/1935 18/05/1935
Prince of Wales 2249 5624 25624   12/1913 W Withdrawn 27/02/1937 27/02/1937
Prince of Wales 2283 5625 25625   12/1913 W Withdrawn 12/12/1936 12/12/1936
Prince of Wales 86 5626 25626   01/1914 W Withdrawn 30/05/1936 30/05/1936
Prince of Wales 146 5627 25627   01/1914 W Withdrawn 25/07/1936 25/07/1936
Prince of Wales 307 5628 25628   12/1913 W Withdrawn 01/12/1934 01/12/1934
Prince of Wales 637 5629 25629   12/1913 W Withdrawn 15/12/1934 15/12/1934
Prince of Wales 979 5630 25630   01/1914 W Withdrawn 15/09/1934 15/09/1934
Prince of Wales 1400 5631 25631   01/1914 W Withdrawn 06/06/1936 06/06/1936
Prince of Wales 964 5632     02/1914 W Withdrawn 05/09/1933 05/09/1933
Prince of Wales 985 5633 25633   02/1914 W Withdrawn 07/09/1935 07/09/1935
Prince of Wales 1321 5634 25634   02/1914 W Withdrawn 29/09/1934 29/09/1934
Prince of Wales 2152 5635     02/1914 W Withdrawn 03/1934 03/1934
Prince of Wales 2293 5636 25636   02/1914 W Withdrawn 01/1935 01/1935
Prince of Wales 2377 5637 25637   02/1914 W Withdrawn 12/1936 12/1936
Prince of Wales 2443 5638 25638   03/1914 W Withdrawn 04/1936 04/1936
Prince of Wales 2520 5639     03/1914 W Withdrawn 10/1933 10/1933
Prince of Wales 27 5640 25640   10/1915 W Withdrawn 02/1937 02/1937
Prince of Wales 88 5641 25641   10/1915 W Withdrawn 09/1936 09/1936
Prince of Wales 122 5642 25642   11/1915 W Withdrawn 03/1936 03/1936
Prince of Wales 160 5643 25643   11/1915 W Withdrawn 10/1934 10/1934
Prince of Wales 185 5644 25644   11/1915 W Withdrawn 03/1936 03/1936
Prince of Wales 877 5645 25645   11/1915 W Withdrawn 06/1936 06/1936
Prince of Wales 1333 5646 25646   11/1915 W Withdrawn 12/1934 12/1934
Prince of Wales 2275 5647 25647   11/1915 W Withdrawn 01/1935 01/1935
Prince of Wales 2396 5648 25648 58000 12/1915 5C
W
Stafford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/10/1948
16/10/1948
Prince of Wales 2408 5649     12/1915 W Withdrawn 10/1933 10/1933
Prince of Wales 606 5650 25650   01/1916 W Withdrawn 04/1936 04/1936
Prince of Wales 745 5651 25651   01/1916 W Withdrawn 07/1934 07/1934
Prince of Wales 810 5652     01/1916 W Withdrawn 09/1933 09/1933
Prince of Wales 1352 5653 25653   01/1916 W Withdrawn 10/1935 10/1935
Prince of Wales 1379 5654 25654   01/1916 W Withdrawn 03/1935 03/1935
Prince of Wales 1384 5655 25655   01/1916 W Withdrawn 12/1934 12/1934
Prince of Wales 1084 5656 25656   01/1916 W Withdrawn 08/1938 08/1938
Prince of Wales 1346 5657 25657   01/1916 W Withdrawn 04/1936 04/1936
Prince of Wales 2417 5658 25658   01/1916 W Withdrawn 10/1935 10/1935
Prince of Wales 2442 5659 25659   02/1916 W Withdrawn 03/1935 03/1935
Prince of Wales 90 5660 25660   12/1915 W Withdrawn 08/1936 08/1936
Prince of Wales 95 5661 25661   03/1916 W Withdrawn 02/1935 02/1935
Prince of Wales 126 5662 25662   03/1916 W Withdrawn 08/1936 08/1936
Prince of Wales 136 5663 25663   10/1915 W Withdrawn 01/1935 01/1935
Prince of Wales 173 5664 25664   10/1915 W Withdrawn 02/1935 02/1935
Prince of Wales 233 5665 25665   03/1916 W Withdrawn 04/1936 04/1936
Prince of Wales 257 5666     11/1915 W Withdrawn 09/1934 09/1934
Prince of Wales 401 5667 25667   12/1915 W Withdrawn 11/1934 11/1934
Prince of Wales 446 5668 25668   11/1915 W Withdrawn 08/1935 08/1935
Prince of Wales 525 5669 25669   12/1915 W Withdrawn 04/1937 04/1937
Prince of Wales 610 5670 25670   12/1915 W Withdrawn 10/1935 10/1935
Prince of Wales 849 5671 25671   03/1916 W Withdrawn 12/1936 12/1936
Prince of Wales 867 5672 25672   01/1916 W Withdrawn 12/1936 12/1936
Prince of Wales 1100 5673 25673 58001 03/1916 5C
W
Stafford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/1949
01/1949
Prince of Wales 1132 5674 25674   01/1916 W Withdrawn 02/1946 02/1946
Prince of Wales 1466 5675 25675   01/1916 W Withdrawn 08/1936 08/1936
Prince of Wales 1734 5676 25676   01/1916 W Withdrawn 04/1935 04/1935
Prince of Wales 1749 5677 25677   11/1915 W Withdrawn 01/1935 01/1935
Prince of Wales 2055 5678 25678   01/1916 W Withdrawn 04/1935 04/1935
Prince of Wales 2063 5679 25679   11/1915 W Withdrawn 05/1935 05/1935
Prince of Wales 2175 5680 25680   11/1915 W Withdrawn 06/1937 06/1937
Prince of Wales 2203 5681 25681   11/1915 W Withdrawn 06/1935 06/1935
Prince of Wales 2329 5682 25682   01/1916 W Withdrawn 04/1935 04/1935
Prince of Wales 1324 5683 25683   04/1916 W Withdrawn 01/1946 01/1946
Prince of Wales 2092 5684 25684   04/1916 W Withdrawn 03/1936 03/1936
Prince of Wales 2276 5685 25685   04/1916 W Withdrawn 08/1936 08/1936
Prince of Wales 2295 5686 25686   04/1916 W Withdrawn 11/1934 11/1934
Prince of Wales 2300 5687 25687   12/1915 W Withdrawn 09/1934 09/1934
Prince of Wales 2340 5688     04/1916 W Withdrawn 09/1933 09/1933
Prince of Wales 2392 5689 25689   12/1915 W Withdrawn 09/1936 09/1936
Prince of Wales 28 5690 25690   01/1919 W Withdrawn 11/1934 11/1934
Prince of Wales 263 5691 25691   01/1919 W Withdrawn 09/1936 09/1936
Prince of Wales 295 5692 25692   01/1919 W Withdrawn 07/1937 07/1937
Prince of Wales 391 5693 25693   01/1919 W Withdrawn 05/1937 05/1937
Prince of Wales 740 5694 25694   01/1919 W Withdrawn 11/1947 11/1947
Prince of Wales 805 5695 25695   01/1919 W Withdrawn 11/1934 11/1934
Prince of Wales 863 5696 25696   01/1919 W Withdrawn 12/1934 12/1934
Prince of Wales 940 5697 25697   01/1919 W Withdrawn 07/1936 07/1936
Prince of Wales 1196 5698 25698   01/1919 W Withdrawn 01/1936 01/1936
Prince of Wales 1546 5699 25699   02/1919 W Withdrawn 11/1935 11/1935
Prince of Wales 621 5700 25700   02/1919 W Withdrawn 03/1936 03/1936
Prince of Wales 707 5701 25701   02/1919 W Withdrawn 04/1935 04/1935
Prince of Wales 1373 5702 25702   02/1919 W Withdrawn 05/1936 05/1936
Prince of Wales 1453 5703 25703   03/1919 W Withdrawn 09/1934 09/1934
Prince of Wales 1584 5704 25704   03/1919 W Withdrawn 09/1936 09/1936
Prince of Wales 57 5705 25705   03/1919 W Withdrawn 03/1935 03/1935
Prince of Wales 504 5706 25706   03/1919 W Withdrawn 12/1936 12/1936
Prince of Wales 974 5707 25707   03/1919 W Withdrawn 04/1935 04/1935
Prince of Wales 1673 5708 25708   03/1919 W Withdrawn 08/1936 08/1936
Prince of Wales 2184 5709 25709   03/1919 W Withdrawn 12/1934 12/1934
Prince of Wales 33 5710 25710   04/1919 W Withdrawn 04/1935 04/1935
Prince of Wales 388 5711 25711   04/1919 W Withdrawn 04/1935 04/1935
Prince of Wales 1123 5712 25712   04/1919 W Withdrawn 04/1937 04/1937
Prince of Wales 1215 5713 25713   04/1919 W Withdrawn 06/1935 06/1935
Prince of Wales 1351 5714 25714   04/1919 W Withdrawn 05/1935 05/1935
Prince of Wales 1437 5715 25715   05/1919 W Withdrawn 02/1935 02/1935
Prince of Wales 1670 5716 25716   05/1919 W Withdrawn 08/1935 08/1935
Prince of Wales 1732 5717 25717   05/1919 W Withdrawn 06/1936 06/1936
Prince of Wales 2073 5718 25718   05/1919 W Withdrawn 06/1936 06/1936
Prince of Wales 2285 5719 25719   05/1919 W Withdrawn 11/1934 11/1934
Prince of Wales 444 5720 25720   05/1919 W Withdrawn 11/1935 11/1935
Prince of Wales 497 5721 25721   06/1919 W Withdrawn 07/1936 07/1936
Prince of Wales 501 5722 25722   06/1919 2B
W
Bletchley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/03/1948
06/03/1948
Prince of Wales 522 5723 25723   06/1919 W Withdrawn 01/1936 01/1936
Prince of Wales 601 5724 25724   06/1919 W Withdrawn 06/1935 06/1935
Prince of Wales 783 5725 25725   06/1919 W Withdrawn 12/1945 12/1945
Prince of Wales 56 5726 25726   06/1919 W Withdrawn 07/1936 07/1936
Prince of Wales 924 5727 25727   06/1919 W Withdrawn 05/1935 05/1935
Prince of Wales 1125 5728 25728   07/1919 W Withdrawn 01/1936 01/1936
Prince of Wales 1290 5729 25729   07/1919 W Withdrawn 02/1935 02/1935
Prince of Wales 1307 5730 25730   07/1919 W Withdrawn 12/1936 12/1936
Prince of Wales 67 5731 25731   07/1919 W Withdrawn 08/1935 08/1935
Prince of Wales 635 5732 25732   08/1919 W Withdrawn 11/1938 11/1938
Prince of Wales 686 5733 25733   08/1919 W Withdrawn 08/1935 08/1935
Prince of Wales 812 5734 25734   08/1919 W Withdrawn 07/1935 07/1935
Prince of Wales 969 5735 25735   08/1919 W Withdrawn 09/1934 09/1934
Prince of Wales 1325 5736 25736   08/1919 W Withdrawn 06/1935 06/1935
Prince of Wales 1341 5737 25737   08/1919 W Withdrawn 02/1936 02/1936
Prince of Wales 1355 5738 25738   09/1919 W Withdrawn 05/1935 05/1935
Prince of Wales 1620 5739 25739   09/1919 W Withdrawn 03/1936 03/1936
Prince of Wales 35 5740 25740   09/1919 W Withdrawn 12/1935 12/1935
Prince of Wales 395 5741 25741   09/1919 W Withdrawn 01/1936 01/1936
Prince of Wales 487 5742 25742   09/1919 W Withdrawn 03/1935 03/1935
Prince of Wales 1178 5743 25743   09/1919 W Withdrawn 09/1934 09/1934
Prince of Wales 889 5744 25744   10/1919 W Withdrawn 03/1936 03/1936
Prince of Wales 1113 5745 25745   10/1919 W Withdrawn 12/1934 12/1934
Prince of Wales 1408 5746 25746   10/1919 W Withdrawn 02/1936 02/1936
Prince of Wales 1422 5747 25747   10/1919 W Withdrawn 04/1936 04/1936
Prince of Wales 1478 5748 25748   10/1919 W Withdrawn 10/1936 10/1936
Prince of Wales 1535 5749 25749   10/1919 W Withdrawn 01/1946 01/1946
Prince of Wales 1542 5750 25750   11/1919 W Withdrawn 03/1936 03/1936
Prince of Wales 1549 5751 25751   11/1919 W Withdrawn 07/1944 07/1944
Prince of Wales 1557 5752 25752 58002 11/1919 5C
W
Stafford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/1948
06/1948
Prince of Wales 1694 5753 25753   11/1919 W Withdrawn 02/1936 02/1936
Prince of Wales 2516 5754 25754   11/1919 W Withdrawn 05/1935 05/1935
Prince of Wales 120 5755 25755   06/1921 W Withdrawn 11/1934 11/1934
Prince of Wales 123 5756 25756   08/1921 W Withdrawn 12/1938 12/1938
Prince of Wales 125 5757 25757   08/1921 W Withdrawn 09/1936 09/1936
Prince of Wales 129 5758 25758   08/1921 W Withdrawn 11/1934 11/1934
Prince of Wales 135 5759 25759   08/1921 W Withdrawn 06/1935 06/1935
Prince of Wales 140 5760 25760   08/1921 W Withdrawn 10/1934 10/1934
Prince of Wales 141 5761 25761   08/1921 W Withdrawn 12/1934 12/1934
Prince of Wales 142 5762 25762   08/1921 W Withdrawn 04/1936 04/1936
Prince of Wales 145 5763 25763   08/1921 W Withdrawn 09/1939 09/1939
Prince of Wales 148 5764 25764   08/1921 W Withdrawn 06/1936 06/1936
Prince of Wales 224 5765 25765   08/1921 W Withdrawn 12/1934 12/1934
Prince of Wales 227 5766 25766   08/1921 W Withdrawn 08/1935 08/1935
Prince of Wales 232 5767 25767   09/1921 W Withdrawn 06/1937 06/1937
Prince of Wales 237 5768 25768   09/1921 W Withdrawn 04/1937 04/1937
Prince of Wales 239 5769 25769   09/1921 W Withdrawn 01/1936 01/1936
Prince of Wales 240 5770 25770   09/1921 W Withdrawn 04/1935 04/1935
Prince of Wales 241 5771 25771   09/1921 W Withdrawn 03/1936 03/1936
Prince of Wales 242 5772 25772   09/1921 W Withdrawn 03/1936 03/1936
Prince of Wales 243 5773 25773   09/1921 W Withdrawn 05/1937 05/1937
Prince of Wales 244 5774 25774   09/1921 W Withdrawn 10/1934 10/1934
Prince of Wales 246 5775 25775   09/1921 W Withdrawn 11/1947 11/1947
Prince of Wales 247 5776 25776   09/1921 W Withdrawn 02/1936 02/1936
Prince of Wales 248 5777 25777   09/1921 W Withdrawn 03/1937 03/1937
Prince of Wales 249 5778 25778   10/1921 W Withdrawn 09/1934 09/1934
Prince of Wales 251 5779 25779   10/1921 W Withdrawn 06/1937 06/1937
Prince of Wales 252 5780 25780   10/1921 W Withdrawn 06/1937 06/1937
Prince of Wales 258 5781 25781   10/1921 W Withdrawn 03/1936 03/1936
Prince of Wales 259 5782 25782   10/1921 W Withdrawn 12/1934 12/1934
Prince of Wales 261 5783 25783   10/1921 W Withdrawn 12/1934 12/1934
Prince of Wales 266 5784 25784   10/1921 W Withdrawn 08/1936 08/1936
Prince of Wales 267 5785 25785   10/1921 W Withdrawn 05/1936 05/1936
Prince of Wales 268 5786 25786   10/1921 W Withdrawn 12/1934 12/1934
Prince of Wales 269 5787 25787 58003 10/1921 5C
W
Stafford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/05/1948
29/05/1948
Prince of Wales 270 5788 25788   11/1921 W Withdrawn 04/1937 04/1937
Prince of Wales 272 5789     11/1921 W Withdrawn 03/1934 03/1934
Prince of Wales 273 5790 25790   11/1921 W Withdrawn 10/1936 10/1936
Prince of Wales 274 5791 25791   11/1921 W Withdrawn 12/1947 12/1947
Prince of Wales 394 5792 25792   10/1921 W Withdrawn 05/1937 05/1937
Prince of Wales 277 5793 25793   11/1921 W Withdrawn 05/1935 05/1935
Prince of Wales 281 5794 25794   11/1921 W Withdrawn 12/1936 12/1936
Prince of Wales 284 5795 25795   11/1921 W Withdrawn 01/1936 01/1936
Prince of Wales 292 5796 25796   11/1921 W Withdrawn 07/1936 07/1936
Prince of Wales 293 5797 25797   11/1921 W Withdrawn 06/1947 06/1947
Prince of Wales 296 5798 25798   11/1921 W Withdrawn 06/1945 06/1945
Prince of Wales 313 5799 25799   11/1921 W Withdrawn 07/1935 07/1935
Prince of Wales 324 5800 25800   11/1921 W Withdrawn 04/1937 04/1937
Prince of Wales 325 5801 25801   12/1921 W Withdrawn 03/1936 03/1936
Prince of Wales 331 5802 25802   12/1921 W Withdrawn 03/1947 03/1947
Prince of Wales 355 5803 25803   12/1921 W Withdrawn 03/1936 03/1936
Prince of Wales 357 5804 25804   12/1921 W Withdrawn 02/1946 02/1946
Prince of Wales 359 5805 25805   12/1921 W Withdrawn 06/1945 06/1945
Prince of Wales 435 5806 25806   12/1921 W Withdrawn 10/1934 10/1934
Prince of Wales 436 5807 25807   12/1921 W Withdrawn 11/1934 11/1934
Prince of Wales 438 5808 25808   12/1921 W Withdrawn 04/1935 04/1935
Prince of Wales 440 5809 25809   12/1921 W Withdrawn 11/1934 11/1934
Prince of Wales 442 5810 25810   12/1921 W Withdrawn 05/1935 05/1935
Prince of Wales 443 5811 25811   12/1921 W Withdrawn 01/1935 01/1935
Prince of Wales 452 5812 25812   12/1921 W Withdrawn 12/1936 12/1936
Prince of Wales 483 5813 25813   12/1921 W Withdrawn 05/1936 05/1936
Prince of Wales 489 5814 25814   12/1921 W Withdrawn 02/1935 02/1935
Prince of Wales 490 5815 25815   12/1921 W Withdrawn 07/1935 07/1935
Prince of Wales 492 5816 25816   02/1922 W Withdrawn 03/1936 03/1936
Prince of Wales 17 5817 25817   02/1922 W Withdrawn 03/1936 03/1936
Prince of Wales 153 5818 25818   02/1922 W Withdrawn 08/1946 08/1946
Prince of Wales 198 5819 25819   02/1922 W Withdrawn 02/1937 02/1937
Prince of Wales 354 5820 25820   02/1922 W Withdrawn 04/1936 04/1936
Prince of Wales 491 5821 25821   01/1922 W Withdrawn 03/1937 03/1937
Prince of Wales 493 5822 25822   01/1922 W Withdrawn 03/1936 03/1936
Prince of Wales 518 5823 25823   02/1922 W Withdrawn 03/1936 03/1936
Prince of Wales 551 5824 25824   02/1922 W Withdrawn 11/1934 11/1934
Prince of Wales 554 5825 25825   02/1922 W Withdrawn 12/1936 12/1936
Prince of Wales 549 5826 25826   02/1922 W Withdrawn 02/1936 02/1936
Prince of Wales 557 5827 25827   01/1922 2B
W
Bletchley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/03/1948
06/03/1948
Prince of Wales 558 5828 25828   02/1922 W Withdrawn 11/1936 11/1936
Prince of Wales 778 5829 25829   03/1922 W Withdrawn 01/1937 01/1937
Prince of Wales 1099 5830 25830   03/1922 W Withdrawn 08/1936 08/1936
Prince of Wales 1179 5831 25831   03/1922 W Withdrawn 05/1935 05/1935
Prince of Wales 1316 5832 25832   03/1922 W Withdrawn 10/1936 10/1936
Prince of Wales 1339 5833 25833   03/1922 W Withdrawn 06/1937 06/1937
Prince of Wales 53 5834 25834   03/1922 W Withdrawn 10/1936 10/1936
Prince of Wales 197 5835 25835   03/1922 W Withdrawn 01/1936 01/1936
Prince of Wales 433 5836 25836   04/1922 W Withdrawn 03/1936 03/1936
Prince of Wales 614 5837 25837   04/1922 W Withdrawn 03/1935 03/1935
Prince of Wales 1083 5838 25838   04/1922 W Withdrawn 05/1935 05/1935
Prince of Wales 1320 5839 25839   04/1922 W Withdrawn 01/1937 01/1937
Prince of Wales 1349 5840 25840   03/1922 W Withdrawn 01/1936 01/1936
Prince of Wales 1323 5841 25841   04/1922 W Withdrawn 09/1947 09/1947
Prince of Wales 1344 5842 25842   04/1922 W Withdrawn 06/1936 06/1936
Prince of Wales 1742 5843 25843   04/1922 W Withdrawn 08/1936 08/1936
Prince of Wales 2043 5844 25844   04/1922 W Withdrawn 09/1936 09/1936
Prince of Wales   5845 25845   02/1924 W Withdrawn 11/1947 11/1947