LNWR/LMS Cooke "POFW" Class 4-6-0
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
09/1933 | Condemned | 5652 | COND | ||||
09/1933 | Condemned | 5688 | COND | ||||
05/09/1933 | Condemned | 5632 | COND | ||||
18/09/1933 | Condemned | 5622 | COND | ||||
25/09/1933 | Condemned | 5606 | COND | ||||
10/1933 | Condemned | 5639 | COND | ||||
10/1933 | Condemned | 5649 | COND | ||||
09/10/1933 | Condemned | 5610 | COND | ||||
14/10/1933 | Condemned | 5609 | COND | ||||
21/10/1933 | Condemned | 5600 | COND | ||||
03/1934 | Condemned | 5635 | COND | ||||
03/1934 | Condemned | 5789 | COND | ||||
07/1934 | Condemned | 25651 | COND | ||||
04/08/1934 | Condemned | 25619 | COND | ||||
09/1934 | Condemned | 5666 | COND | ||||
09/1934 | Condemned | 5687 | COND | ||||
09/1934 | Condemned | 25703 | COND | ||||
09/1934 | Condemned | 5735 | COND | ||||
09/1934 | Condemned | 5743 | COND | ||||
09/1934 | Condemned | 5778 | COND | ||||
01/09/1934 | Condemned | 25621 | COND | ||||
15/09/1934 | Condemned | 25630 | COND | ||||
29/09/1934 | Condemned | 25634 | COND | ||||
10/1934 | Condemned | 25643 | COND | ||||
10/1934 | Condemned | 5760 | COND | ||||
10/1934 | Condemned | 5774 | COND | ||||
10/1934 | Condemned | 5806 | COND | ||||
27/10/1934 | Condemned | 25604 | COND | ||||
11/1934 | Condemned | 5667 | COND | ||||
11/1934 | Condemned | 5686 | COND | ||||
11/1934 | Condemned | 25690 | COND | ||||
11/1934 | Condemned | 25695 | COND | ||||
11/1934 | Condemned | 5719 | COND | ||||
11/1934 | Condemned | 5755 | COND | ||||
11/1934 | Condemned | 25758 | COND | ||||
11/1934 | Condemned | 5807 | COND | ||||
11/1934 | Condemned | 5809 | COND | ||||
11/1934 | Condemned | 5824 | COND | ||||
10/11/1934 | Condemned | 25605 | COND | ||||
12/1934 | Condemned | 25646 | COND | ||||
12/1934 | Condemned | 25655 | COND | ||||
12/1934 | Condemned | 25696 | COND | ||||
12/1934 | Condemned | 5709 | COND | ||||
12/1934 | Condemned | 5745 | COND | ||||
12/1934 | Condemned | 5761 | COND | ||||
12/1934 | Condemned | 5765 | COND | ||||
12/1934 | Condemned | 5782 | COND | ||||
12/1934 | Condemned | 5783 | COND | ||||
12/1934 | Condemned | 5786 | COND | ||||
01/12/1934 | Condemned | 25616 | COND | ||||
01/12/1934 | Condemned | 25628 | COND | ||||
15/12/1934 | Condemned | 25629 | COND | ||||
22/12/1934 | Condemned | 25607 | COND | ||||
29/12/1934 | Condemned | 25614 | COND | ||||
01/1935 | Condemned | 25636 | COND | ||||
01/1935 | Condemned | 25647 | COND | ||||
01/1935 | Condemned | 25663 | COND | ||||
01/1935 | Condemned | 5677 | COND | ||||
01/1935 | Condemned | 25811 | COND | ||||
18/01/1935 | Condemned | 25617 | COND | ||||
19/01/1935 | Condemned | 25603 | COND | ||||
02/1935 | Condemned | 25661 | COND | ||||
02/1935 | Condemned | 25664 | COND | ||||
02/1935 | Condemned | 5715 | COND | ||||
02/1935 | Condemned | 25729 | COND | ||||
02/1935 | Condemned | 5814 | COND | ||||
09/02/1935 | Condemned | 25608 | COND | ||||
16/02/1935 | Condemned | 25613 | COND | ||||
23/02/1935 | Condemned | 25618 | COND | ||||
03/1935 | Condemned | 25654 | COND | ||||
03/1935 | Condemned | 25659 | COND | ||||
03/1935 | Condemned | 25705 | COND | ||||
03/1935 | Condemned | 5742 | COND | ||||
03/1935 | Condemned | 25837 | COND | ||||
09/03/1935 | Condemned | 25615 | COND | ||||
23/03/1935 | Condemned | 25601 | COND | ||||
04/1935 | Condemned | 25676 | COND | ||||
04/1935 | Condemned | 25678 | COND | ||||
04/1935 | Condemned | 25682 | COND | ||||
04/1935 | Condemned | 25701 | COND | ||||
04/1935 | Condemned | 25707 | COND | ||||
04/1935 | Condemned | 25710 | COND | ||||
04/1935 | Condemned | 25711 | COND | ||||
04/1935 | Condemned | 5770 | COND | ||||
04/1935 | Condemned | 25808 | COND | ||||
05/1935 | Condemned | 25679 | COND | ||||
05/1935 | Condemned | 5714 | COND | ||||
05/1935 | Condemned | 25727 | COND | ||||
05/1935 | Condemned | 25738 | COND | ||||
05/1935 | Condemned | 25754 | COND | ||||
05/1935 | Condemned | 25793 | COND | ||||
05/1935 | Condemned | 25810 | COND | ||||
05/1935 | Condemned | 25831 | COND | ||||
05/1935 | Condemned | 25838 | COND | ||||
18/05/1935 | Condemned | 25623 | COND | ||||
25/05/1935 | Condemned | 25611 | COND | ||||
06/1935 | Condemned | 25681 | COND | ||||
06/1935 | Condemned | 5713 | COND | ||||
06/1935 | Condemned | 25724 | COND | ||||
06/1935 | Condemned | 25736 | COND | ||||
06/1935 | Condemned | 25759 | COND | ||||
07/1935 | Condemned | 25734 | COND | ||||
07/1935 | Condemned | 25799 | COND | ||||
07/1935 | Condemned | 25815 | COND | ||||
08/1935 | Condemned | 25668 | COND | ||||
08/1935 | Condemned | 25716 | COND | ||||
08/1935 | Condemned | 25731 | COND | ||||
08/1935 | Condemned | 25733 | COND | ||||
08/1935 | Condemned | 25766 | COND | ||||
07/09/1935 | Condemned | 25633 | COND | ||||
10/1935 | Condemned | 25653 | COND | ||||
10/1935 | Condemned | 25658 | COND | ||||
10/1935 | Condemned | 25670 | COND | ||||
11/1935 | Condemned | 25699 | COND | ||||
11/1935 | Condemned | 25720 | COND | ||||
02/11/1935 | Reallocation | 25645 | 4A | Shrewsbury | |||
02/11/1935 | Reallocation | 25717 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | |||
02/11/1935 | Reallocation | 25728 | 5A | Crewe North | |||
02/11/1935 | Reallocation | 25775 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | |||
02/11/1935 | Reallocation | 25800 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | |||
30/11/1935 | Reallocation | 25625 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | |||
30/11/1935 | Reallocation | 25645 | 4A | Shrewsbury | 6A | Chester (MR) | |
30/11/1935 | Reallocation | 25665 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | |||
30/11/1935 | Reallocation | 25698 | 5A | Crewe North | |||
30/11/1935 | Reallocation | 25706 | 2B | Bletchley | |||
30/11/1935 | Reallocation | 25802 | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | |||
30/11/1935 | Reallocation | 25835 | 5A | Crewe North | |||
30/11/1935 | Reallocation | 25839 | 26D | Bury | |||
30/11/1935 | Reallocation | 25840 | 5A | Crewe North | |||
30/11/1935 | Reallocation | 25841 | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | |||
30/11/1935 | Reallocation | 25842 | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | |||
12/1935 | Condemned | 25740 | COND | ||||
01/1936 | Condemned | 25698 | 5A | Crewe North | COND | ||
01/1936 | Condemned | 25723 | COND | ||||
01/1936 | Condemned | 25728 | 5A | Crewe North | COND | ||
01/1936 | Condemned | 25741 | COND | ||||
01/1936 | Condemned | 25769 | COND | ||||
01/1936 | Condemned | 25795 | COND | ||||
01/1936 | Condemned | 25835 | 5A | Crewe North | COND | ||
01/1936 | Condemned | 25840 | 5A | Crewe North | COND | ||
25/01/1936 | Condemned | 25612 | COND | ||||
02/1936 | Condemned | 25737 | COND | ||||
02/1936 | Condemned | 25746 | COND | ||||
02/1936 | Condemned | 25753 | COND | ||||
02/1936 | Condemned | 25776 | COND | ||||
02/1936 | Condemned | 25826 | COND | ||||
08/02/1936 | Reallocation | 25648 | 5C | Stafford | |||
08/02/1936 | Reallocation | 25730 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |||
08/02/1936 | Reallocation | 25756 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |||
08/02/1936 | Reallocation | 25839 | 26D | Bury | 26D | Bury | |
08/02/1936 | Reallocation | 25842 | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | 26D | Bury | |
03/1936 | Condemned | 25642 | COND | ||||
03/1936 | Condemned | 25644 | COND | ||||
03/1936 | Condemned | 25684 | COND | ||||
03/1936 | Condemned | 25700 | COND | ||||
03/1936 | Condemned | 25739 | COND | ||||
03/1936 | Condemned | 25744 | COND | ||||
03/1936 | Condemned | 25750 | COND | ||||
03/1936 | Condemned | 25771 | COND | ||||
03/1936 | Condemned | 25772 | COND | ||||
03/1936 | Condemned | 25781 | COND | ||||
03/1936 | Condemned | 25801 | COND | ||||
03/1936 | Condemned | 25803 | COND | ||||
03/1936 | Condemned | 25816 | COND | ||||
03/1936 | Condemned | 25817 | COND | ||||
03/1936 | Condemned | 25822 | COND | ||||
03/1936 | Condemned | 25823 | COND | ||||
03/1936 | Condemned | 25836 | COND | ||||
14/03/1936 | Condemned | 25620 | COND | ||||
04/1936 | Condemned | 25638 | COND | ||||
04/1936 | Condemned | 25650 | COND | ||||
04/1936 | Condemned | 25657 | COND | ||||
04/1936 | Condemned | 25665 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | COND | ||
04/1936 | Condemned | 25747 | COND | ||||
04/1936 | Condemned | 25762 | COND | ||||
04/1936 | Condemned | 25820 | COND | ||||
11/04/1936 | Reallocation | 25675 | 2A | Rugby | |||
11/04/1936 | Reallocation | 25773 | 6A | Chester (MR) | |||
05/1936 | Condemned | 25702 | COND | ||||
05/1936 | Condemned | 25785 | COND | ||||
05/1936 | Condemned | 25813 | COND | ||||
30/05/1936 | Condemned | 25626 | COND | ||||
06/1936 | Condemned | 25645 | 6A | Chester (MR) | COND | ||
06/1936 | Condemned | 25717 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | COND | ||
06/1936 | Condemned | 25718 | COND | ||||
06/1936 | Condemned | 25764 | COND | ||||
06/1936 | Condemned | 25842 | 26D | Bury | COND | ||
06/06/1936 | Condemned | 25631 | COND | ||||
07/1936 | Condemned | 25697 | COND | ||||
07/1936 | Condemned | 25721 | COND | ||||
07/1936 | Condemned | 25726 | COND | ||||
07/1936 | Condemned | 25796 | COND | ||||
25/07/1936 | Condemned | 25627 | COND | ||||
08/1936 | Condemned | 25660 | COND | ||||
08/1936 | Condemned | 25662 | COND | ||||
08/1936 | Condemned | 25675 | 2A | Rugby | COND | ||
08/1936 | Condemned | 25685 | COND | ||||
08/1936 | Condemned | 25708 | COND | ||||
08/1936 | Condemned | 25784 | COND | ||||
08/1936 | Condemned | 25830 | COND | ||||
08/1936 | Condemned | 25843 | COND | ||||
09/1936 | Condemned | 25641 | COND | ||||
09/1936 | Condemned | 25689 | COND | ||||
09/1936 | Condemned | 25691 | COND | ||||
09/1936 | Condemned | 25704 | COND | ||||
09/1936 | Condemned | 25757 | COND | ||||
09/1936 | Condemned | 25844 | COND | ||||
10/1936 | Condemned | 25748 | COND | ||||
10/1936 | Condemned | 25790 | COND | ||||
10/1936 | Condemned | 25832 | COND | ||||
10/1936 | Condemned | 25834 | COND | ||||
11/1936 | Condemned | 25828 | COND | ||||
12/1936 | Condemned | 25637 | COND | ||||
12/1936 | Condemned | 25671 | COND | ||||
12/1936 | Condemned | 25672 | COND | ||||
12/1936 | Condemned | 25706 | 2B | Bletchley | COND | ||
12/1936 | Condemned | 25730 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | COND | ||
12/1936 | Condemned | 25794 | COND | ||||
12/1936 | Condemned | 25812 | COND | ||||
12/1936 | Condemned | 25825 | COND | ||||
12/12/1936 | Condemned | 25625 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | COND | ||
01/1937 | Condemned | 25829 | COND | ||||
01/1937 | Condemned | 25839 | 26D | Bury | COND | ||
02/1937 | Condemned | 25640 | COND | ||||
02/1937 | Condemned | 25819 | COND | ||||
27/02/1937 | Condemned | 25624 | COND | ||||
03/1937 | Condemned | 25777 | COND | ||||
03/1937 | Condemned | 25821 | COND | ||||
04/1937 | Condemned | 25669 | COND | ||||
04/1937 | Condemned | 25712 | COND | ||||
04/1937 | Condemned | 25768 | COND | ||||
04/1937 | Condemned | 25788 | COND | ||||
04/1937 | Condemned | 25800 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | COND | ||
05/1937 | Condemned | 25693 | COND | ||||
05/1937 | Condemned | 25773 | 6A | Chester (MR) | COND | ||
05/1937 | Condemned | 25792 | COND | ||||
06/1937 | Condemned | 25680 | COND | ||||
06/1937 | Condemned | 25767 | COND | ||||
06/1937 | Condemned | 25779 | COND | ||||
06/1937 | Condemned | 25780 | COND | ||||
06/1937 | Condemned | 25833 | COND | ||||
26/06/1937 | Condemned | 25602 | COND | ||||
07/1937 | Condemned | 25692 | COND | ||||
08/1938 | Condemned | 25656 | COND | ||||
11/1938 | Condemned | 25732 | COND | ||||
12/1938 | Condemned | 25756 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | COND | ||
09/1939 | Condemned | 25763 | COND | ||||
07/1944 | Condemned | 25751 | COND | ||||
06/1945 | Condemned | 25798 | COND | ||||
06/1945 | Condemned | 25805 | COND | ||||
12/1945 | Condemned | 25725 | COND | ||||
01/1946 | Condemned | 25683 | COND | ||||
01/1946 | Condemned | 25749 | COND | ||||
02/1946 | Condemned | 25674 | COND | ||||
02/1946 | Condemned | 25804 | COND | ||||
08/1946 | Condemned | 25818 | COND | ||||
03/1947 | Condemned | 25802 | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | COND | ||
06/1947 | Condemned | 25797 | COND | ||||
13/09/1947 | Condemned | 25841 | 98W | COND | |||
11/1947 | Condemned | 25694 | COND | ||||
11/1947 | Condemned | 25775 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | COND | ||
11/1947 | Condemned | 25845 | COND | ||||
12/1947 | Condemned | 25791 | COND | ||||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 25648 | 5C | Stafford | 5C | Stafford | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 25673 | 5C | Stafford | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 25722 | 2B | Bletchley | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 25752 | 5C | Stafford | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 25787 | 5C | Stafford | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 25827 | 2B | Bletchley | |||
28/02/1948 | Reallocation | 25722 | 2B | Bletchley | 5C | Stafford | |
28/02/1948 | Reallocation | 25827 | 2B | Bletchley | 5C | Stafford | |
06/03/1948 | Condemned | 25722 | 5C | Stafford | COND | ||
06/03/1948 | Condemned | 25827 | 5C | Stafford | COND | ||
29/05/1948 | Condemned | 25787 | 5C | Stafford | COND | ||
06/1948 | Condemned | 25752 | 5C | Stafford | COND | ||
16/10/1948 | Condemned | 25648 | 5C | Stafford | COND | ||
01/1949 | Condemned | 58001 | 5C | Stafford | COND |