Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 216 Today
» 839 Yesterday
» 1055 Week
» 17034 Month
» 212488 Year
» 1096869 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LNWR/LMS Cooke "Prince of Wales" Class 4-6-0


Class Number Built Name Name Date Notes Removed Date Withdrawn
Prince of Wales 819 10/1911 PRINCE OF WALES 10/1911   02/1924 21/10/1933
Prince of Wales 5600 10/1911 PRINCE OF WALES 12/1924   21/10/1933
Prince of Wales 1388 10/1911 ANDROMEDA 10/1911   23/03/1935
Prince of Wales 1452 10/1911 BONAVENTURE 10/1911   26/06/1937
Prince of Wales 1454 11/1911 COQUETTE 11/1911   19/01/1935
Prince of Wales 1537 11/1911 ENCHANTRESS 11/1911   27/10/1934
Prince of Wales 1691 11/1911 PATHFINDER 11/1911   10/11/1934
Prince of Wales 1704 11/1911 CONQUEROR 11/1911   25/09/1933
Prince of Wales 1721 11/1911 DEFIANCE 11/1911   22/12/1934
Prince of Wales 2021 12/1911 WOLVERINE 12/1911   09/02/1935
Prince of Wales 2359 12/1911 HERMIONE 12/1911   14/10/1933
Prince of Wales 362 10/1913 ROBERT SOUTHEY 10/1913   09/10/1933
Prince of Wales 892 10/1913 CHARLES WOLFE 10/1913   25/05/1935
Prince of Wales 1081 10/1913 JOHN KEATS 10/1913   25/01/1936
Prince of Wales 1089 10/1913 SYDNEY SMITH 10/1913   16/02/1935
Prince of Wales 1134 10/1913 VICTOR HUGO 10/1913   29/12/1934
Prince of Wales 2040 11/1913 OLIVER GOLDSMITH 11/1913   09/03/1935
Prince of Wales 2075 11/1913 ROBERT BURNS 11/1913   01/12/1934
Prince of Wales 321 11/1913 HENRY W. LONGFELLOW 11/1913   18/01/1935
Prince of Wales 479 12/1913 THOMAS B. MACAULAY 12/1913   23/02/1935
Prince of Wales 951 12/1913 BULWER LYTTON 12/1913   04/08/1934
Prince of Wales 2198 11/1913 JOHN RUSKIN 11/1913   14/03/1936
Prince of Wales 2205 11/1913 THOMAS MOORE 11/1913   01/09/1934
Prince of Wales 2213 11/1913 CHARLES KINGSLEY 11/1913   18/09/1933
Prince of Wales 1679 12/1913 LORD BYRON 12/1913   18/05/1935
Prince of Wales 2249 12/1913 THOMAS CAMPBELL 12/1913   27/02/1937
Prince of Wales 2283 12/1913 ROBERT L. STEVENSON 12/1913   12/12/1936
Prince of Wales 86 01/1914 MARK TWAIN 01/1914   30/05/1936
Prince of Wales 146 01/1914 LEWIS CARROLL 01/1914   25/07/1936
Prince of Wales 307 12/1913 R. B. SHERIDAN 12/1913   01/12/1934
Prince of Wales 637 12/1913 THOMAS GRAY 12/1913   15/12/1934
Prince of Wales 979 01/1914 W M. THACKERAY 01/1914   15/09/1934
Prince of Wales 1400 01/1914 FELICIA HEMANS 01/1914   06/06/1936
Prince of Wales 964 02/1914 BRET HARTE 02/1914   05/09/1933
Prince of Wales 985 02/1914 SIR W. S. GILBERT 02/1914   07/09/1935
Prince of Wales 1321 02/1914 WILLIAM COWPER 02/1914   29/09/1934
Prince of Wales 2152 02/1914 CHARLES LAMB 02/1914   03/1934
Prince of Wales 2293 02/1914 PERCY BYSSHE SHELLEY 02/1914   01/1935
Prince of Wales 2377 02/1914 EDWARD GIBBON 02/1914   12/1936
Prince of Wales 2443 03/1914 CHARLES JAMES LEVER 03/1914   04/1936
Prince of Wales 2520 03/1914 G. P. NEELE 03/1914   10/1933
Prince of Wales 27 10/1915 GENERAL JOFFRE 10/1915   02/1937
Prince of Wales 88 10/1915 CZAR OF RUSSIA 10/1915   09/1936
Prince of Wales 122 11/1915 KING OF THE BELGIANS 11/1915   03/1936
Prince of Wales 160 11/1915 KING OF SERBIA 11/1915   10/1934
Prince of Wales 185 11/1915 KING OF ITALY 11/1915   03/1936
Prince of Wales 877 11/1915 RAYMOND POINCARE 11/1915   06/1936
Prince of Wales 1333 11/1915 SIR JOHN FRENCH 11/1915   12/1934
Prince of Wales 2275 11/1915 EDITH CAVELL 11/1915   01/1935
Prince of Wales 2396 12/1915 QUEEN OF THE BELGIANS 12/1915   16/10/1948
Prince of Wales 2408 12/1915 ADMIRAL JELLICOE 12/1915   10/1933
Prince of Wales 606 01/1916 CASTOR 01/1916   04/1936
Prince of Wales 745 01/1916 PLUTO 01/1916   07/1934
Prince of Wales 810 01/1916 ONYX 01/1916   09/1933
Prince of Wales 1352 01/1916 THE NILE 01/1916   10/1935
Prince of Wales 1379 01/1916 WITCH 01/1916   03/1935
Prince of Wales 1384 01/1916 SMEATON 01/1916   12/1934
Prince of Wales 1084 01/1916 SHARK 01/1916   08/1938
Prince of Wales 1346 01/1916 TRENT 01/1916   04/1936
Prince of Wales 2417 01/1916 ATLAS 01/1916   08/1933 10/1935
Prince of Wales 2442 02/1916 ODIN 02/1916   03/1935
Prince of Wales 90 12/1915 KESTREL 12/1915   08/1936
Prince of Wales 95 03/1916 GALLIPOLI 03/1916   02/1935
Prince of Wales 126 03/1916 ANZAC 03/1916   08/1936
Prince of Wales 136 10/1915 MINERVA 10/1915   01/1935
Prince of Wales 173 10/1915 LIVINGSTONE 10/1915   02/1935
Prince of Wales 233 03/1916 SUVLA BAY 03/1916   04/1936
Prince of Wales 257 11/1915 PLYNLIMMON 11/1915   09/1934
Prince of Wales 401 12/1915 ZAMIEL 12/1915   11/1934
Prince of Wales 446 11/1915 PEGASUS 11/1915   08/1935
Prince of Wales 525 12/1915 VULCAN 12/1915   04/1937
Prince of Wales 610 12/1915 ALBION 12/1915   10/1935
Prince of Wales 849 03/1916 ARETHUSA 03/1916   09/1936 12/1936
Prince of Wales 867 01/1916 CONDOR 01/1916   08/1933 12/1936
Prince of Wales 1100 03/1916 LUSITANIA 03/1916   01/1949
Prince of Wales 1132 01/1916 SCOTT 01/1916   02/1946
Prince of Wales 1466 01/1916 SPHINX 01/1916   08/1936
Prince of Wales 1734 01/1916 PETREL 01/1916   04/1935
Prince of Wales 1749 11/1915 PRECEDENT 11/1915   01/1935
Prince of Wales 2055 01/1916 MILTON 01/1916   04/1935
Prince of Wales 2063 11/1915 HIBERNIA 11/1915   05/1935
Prince of Wales 2175 11/1915 LOADSTONE 11/1915   06/1937
Prince of Wales 2203 11/1915 FALSTAFF 11/1915   06/1935
Prince of Wales 2329 01/1916 SAMSON 01/1916   08/1933 04/1935
Prince of Wales 1324 04/1916 FALABA 04/1916   01/1946
Prince of Wales 2092 04/1916 ARABIC 04/1916   03/1936
Prince of Wales 2276 04/1916 PERSIA 04/1916   08/1936
Prince of Wales 2295 04/1916 ANGLIA 04/1916   11/1934
Prince of Wales 2300 12/1915 HOTSPUR 12/1915   09/1934
Prince of Wales 2340 04/1916 TARA 04/1916   09/1933
Prince of Wales 2392 12/1915 CALIBAN 12/1915   09/1936
Prince of Wales 940 01/1919 RICHARD COBDEN 06/1922   07/1936
Prince of Wales 621 02/1919 TELFORD 04/1922   03/1936
Prince of Wales 1584 03/1919 SCOTIA 05/1922   09/1936
Prince of Wales 504 03/1919 CANNING 08/1922   12/1936
Prince of Wales 974 03/1919 HAMPDEN 02/1922   04/1935
Prince of Wales 522 06/1919 STENTOR 07/1922   01/1936
Prince of Wales 1290 07/1919 LUCKNOW 07/1922   02/1935
Prince of Wales 1325 08/1919 DISRAELI 05/1922   06/1935
Prince of Wales 1178 09/1919 PRINCE ALBERT 02/1922   09/1934
Prince of Wales 1542 11/1919 MARATHON 08/1922   03/1936
Prince of Wales 1694 11/1919 PREMIER 08/1922   02/1936
Prince of Wales 2516 11/1919 DALTON 08/1922   05/1935