LMS "7P" Class 4-6-0 - 'Royal Scot'
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/11/1935 | Reallocation | 6102 | 5A | Crewe North | |||
02/11/1935 | Reallocation | 6117 | 7C | Holyhead | |||
02/11/1935 | Reallocation | 6120 | 7B | Bangor | |||
02/11/1935 | Reallocation | 6129 | 5A | Crewe North | |||
02/11/1935 | Reallocation | 6135 | 5A | Crewe North | |||
02/11/1935 | Reallocation | 6159 | 5A | Crewe North | |||
08/06/1946 | Reallocation | 6100 | 1B | Camden | |||
22/06/1946 | Reallocation | 6100 | 1B | Camden | 8A | Edge Hill | |
22/06/1946 | Reallocation | 6126 | 5A | Crewe North | |||
22/06/1946 | Reallocation | 6151 | 1B | Camden | |||
22/06/1946 | Reallocation | 6157 | 5A | Crewe North | |||
22/06/1946 | Reallocation | 6163 | 8A | Edge Hill | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6101 | 1B | Camden | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6102 | 5A | Crewe North | 27A | Polmadie | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6103 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6104 | 27A | Polmadie | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6105 | 27A | Polmadie | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6106 | 8A | Edge Hill | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6107 | 27A | Polmadie | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6108 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6109 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6110 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6111 | 8A | Edge Hill | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6112 | 7C | Holyhead | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6113 | 5A | Crewe North | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6114 | 9A | Longsight | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6115 | 5A | Crewe North | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6116 | 1B | Camden | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6117 | 7C | Holyhead | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6118 | 1B | Camden | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6119 | 1B | Camden | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6120 | 7B | Bangor | 9A | Longsight | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6121 | 9A | Longsight | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6122 | 9A | Longsight | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6123 | 1B | Camden | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6124 | 8A | Edge Hill | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6125 | 5A | Crewe North | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6126 | 5A | Crewe North | 5A | Crewe North | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6127 | 7C | Holyhead | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6128 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6129 | 5A | Crewe North | 9A | Longsight | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6130 | 1B | Camden | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6131 | 9A | Longsight | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6132 | 7C | Holyhead | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6133 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6134 | 8A | Edge Hill | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6135 | 5A | Crewe North | 8A | Edge Hill | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6136 | 8A | Edge Hill | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6137 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6138 | 8A | Edge Hill | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6139 | 1B | Camden | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6140 | 1B | Camden | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6141 | 1B | Camden | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6142 | 1B | Camden | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6143 | 27A | Polmadie | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6144 | 8A | Edge Hill | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6145 | 9A | Longsight | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6146 | 5A | Crewe North | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6147 | 5A | Crewe North | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6148 | 1B | Camden | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6149 | 9A | Longsight | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6150 | 9A | Longsight | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6151 | 1B | Camden | 1B | Camden | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6152 | 1B | Camden | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6153 | 1B | Camden | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6154 | 5A | Crewe North | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6155 | 5A | Crewe North | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6156 | 8A | Edge Hill | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6157 | 5A | Crewe North | 7C | Holyhead | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6158 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6159 | 5A | Crewe North | 1B | Camden | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6160 | 9A | Longsight | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6161 | 5A | Crewe North | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6162 | 5A | Crewe North | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6163 | 8A | Edge Hill | 5A | Crewe North | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6164 | 8A | Edge Hill | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6165 | 5A | Crewe North | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6166 | 5A | Crewe North | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6167 | 5A | Crewe North | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6168 | 1B | Camden | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6169 | 9A | Longsight | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 6170 | 1B | Camden | |||
13/03/1948 | Reallocation | 6123 | 1B | Camden | 8A | Edge Hill | |
24/04/1948 | Reallocation | 46154 | 5A | Crewe North | 1B | Camden | |
24/04/1948 | Reallocation | 46162 | 5A | Crewe North | 1B | Camden | |
22/05/1948 | Reallocation | 6153 | 1B | Camden | 5A | Crewe North | |
05/06/1948 | Reallocation | 6134 | 8A | Edge Hill | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | |
05/06/1948 | Reallocation | 6136 | 8A | Edge Hill | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | |
05/06/1948 | Reallocation | 6157 | 7C | Holyhead | 7C | Holyhead | |
12/06/1948 | Reallocation | 6147 | 5A | Crewe North | 8A | Edge Hill | |
12/06/1948 | Reallocation | 6153 | 5A | Crewe North | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | |
10/07/1948 | Reallocation | 6126 | 5A | Crewe North | 1B | Camden | |
07/08/1948 | Reallocation | 6112 | 7C | Holyhead | 5A | Crewe North | |
02/10/1948 | Reallocation | 46112 | 5A | Crewe North | 7C | Holyhead | |
02/10/1948 | Reallocation | 6128 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | 5A | Crewe North | |
02/10/1948 | Reallocation | 46130 | 1B | Camden | 5A | Crewe North | |
02/10/1948 | Reallocation | 6157 | 7C | Holyhead | 5A | Crewe North | |
13/11/1948 | Reallocation | 46101 | 1B | Camden | Longsight | ||
13/11/1948 | Reallocation | 46119 | 1B | Camden | 1B | Longsight | |
13/11/1948 | Reallocation | 46137 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | 12B | Edge Hill | |
27/11/1948 | Reallocation | 46148 | 1B | Camden | 5A | Crewe North | |
11/12/1948 | Reallocation | 46101 | 8A | Edge Hill | |||
11/12/1948 | Reallocation | 46119 | 1B | Camden | 5A | Crewe North | |
11/12/1948 | Reallocation | 46120 | 9A | Longsight | 9A | Longsight | |
11/12/1948 | Reallocation | 46126 | 1B | Camden | 8A | Edge Hill | |
11/12/1948 | Reallocation | 46137 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | |
11/12/1948 | Reallocation | 46148 | 5A | Crewe North | 5A | Crewe North | |
11/12/1948 | Reallocation | 46149 | 9A | Longsight | 7C | Holyhead | |
11/12/1948 | Reallocation | 46166 | 5A | Crewe North | 7C | Holyhead | |
15/01/1949 | Reallocation | 46138 | 8A | Edge Hill | 1B | Camden | |
12/02/1949 | Reallocation | 46158 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | |
12/03/1949 | Reallocation | 46137 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | 8A | Edge Hill | |
12/03/1949 | Reallocation | 46147 | 8A | Edge Hill | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | |
12/03/1949 | Reallocation | 46158 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | 5A | Crewe North | |
28/05/1949 | Reallocation | 46166 | 7C | Holyhead | 7C | Holyhead | |
16/07/1949 | Reallocation | 46120 | 9A | Longsight | 17A | Derby | |
16/07/1949 | Reallocation | 46121 | 9A | Longsight | 91X | To Scottish Region | |
16/07/1949 | Reallocation | 46143 | 27A | Polmadie | 9A | Longsight | |
16/07/1949 | Reallocation | 46146 | 5A | Crewe North | 5A | Crewe North | |
16/07/1949 | Reallocation | 46157 | 5A | Crewe North | 5A | Crewe North | |
23/07/1949 | Reallocation | 46121 | 91X | To Scottish Region | 66A | Polmadie | |
23/07/1949 | Reallocation | 46143 | 9A | Longsight | 9A | Longsight | |
01/10/1949 | Reallocation | 46115 | 5A | Crewe North | 9A | Longsight | |
01/10/1949 | Reallocation | 46136 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | 8A | Edge Hill | |
01/10/1949 | Reallocation | 46166 | 7C | Holyhead | 5A | Crewe North | |
01/10/1949 | Reallocation | 46167 | 5A | Crewe North | 9A | Longsight | |
15/10/1949 | Reallocation | 46136 | 8A | Edge Hill | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | |
15/10/1949 | Reallocation | 46153 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | 8A | Edge Hill | |
24/12/1949 | Reallocation | 46120 | 17A | Derby | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | |
24/12/1949 | Reallocation | 46128 | 5A | Crewe North | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | |
14/01/1950 | Reallocation | 46128 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | 5A | Crewe North | |
14/01/1950 | Reallocation | 46166 | 5A | Crewe North | 9A | Longsight | |
29/04/1950 | Reallocation | 46119 | 5A | Crewe North | 7C | Holyhead | |
29/04/1950 | Reallocation | 46161 | 5A | Crewe North | 7C | Holyhead | |
10/06/1950 | Reallocation | 46148 | 5A | Crewe North | 1B | Camden | |
10/06/1950 | Reallocation | 46163 | 5A | Crewe North | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | |
10/06/1950 | Reallocation | 46166 | 9A | Longsight | 7C | Holyhead | |
17/06/1950 | Reallocation | 46130 | 5A | Crewe North | 7C | Holyhead | |
17/06/1950 | Reallocation | 46148 | 1B | Camden | 1B | Camden | |
17/06/1950 | Reallocation | 46163 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | |
17/06/1950 | Reallocation | 46166 | 7C | Holyhead | 7C | Holyhead | |
09/09/1950 | Reallocation | 46165 | 5A | Crewe North | 7C | Holyhead | |
30/09/1950 | Reallocation | 46101 | 8A | Edge Hill | 5A | Crewe North | |
30/09/1950 | Reallocation | 46110 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | 3B | Bushbury | |
30/09/1950 | Reallocation | 46118 | 1B | Camden | 5A | Crewe North | |
30/09/1950 | Reallocation | 46140 | 1B | Camden | 3B | Bushbury | |
30/09/1950 | Reallocation | 46148 | 1B | Camden | 5A | Crewe North | |
30/09/1950 | Reallocation | 46163 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 3B | Bushbury | |
30/09/1950 | Reallocation | 46165 | 7C | Holyhead | 3B | Bushbury | |
07/10/1950 | Reallocation | 46101 | 5A | Crewe North | 5A | Crewe North | |
07/10/1950 | Reallocation | 46110 | 3B | Bushbury | 3B | Bushbury | |
07/10/1950 | Reallocation | 46118 | 5A | Crewe North | 5A | Crewe North | |
07/10/1950 | Reallocation | 46140 | 3B | Bushbury | 3B | Bushbury | |
07/10/1950 | Reallocation | 46148 | 5A | Crewe North | 5A | Crewe North | |
07/10/1950 | Reallocation | 46163 | 3B | Bushbury | 3B | Bushbury | |
07/10/1950 | Reallocation | 46165 | 3B | Bushbury | 3B | Bushbury | |
14/10/1950 | Reallocation | 46148 | 5A | Crewe North | 3B | Bushbury | |
28/10/1950 | Reallocation | 46151 | 1B | Camden | 3B | Bushbury | |
04/11/1950 | Reallocation | 46130 | 7C | Holyhead | 7C | Holyhead | |
04/11/1950 | Reallocation | 46148 | 3B | Bushbury | 3B | Bushbury | |
04/11/1950 | Reallocation | 46151 | 3B | Bushbury | 3B | Bushbury | |
04/11/1950 | Reallocation | 46158 | 5A | Crewe North | 5A | Crewe North | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 46158 | 5A | Crewe North | 3B | Bushbury | |
02/12/1950 | Reallocation | 46158 | 3B | Bushbury | 3B | Bushbury | |
31/12/1950 | Reallocation | 46130 | 7C | Holyhead | 5A | Crewe North | |
27/01/1951 | Reallocation | 46134 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | 3B | Bushbury | |
31/01/1951 | Reallocation | 46134 | 3B | Bushbury | 3B | Bushbury | |
24/02/1951 | Reallocation | 46113 | 5A | Crewe North | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | |
24/02/1951 | Reallocation | 46127 | 7C | Holyhead | 5A | Crewe North | |
24/02/1951 | Reallocation | 46141 | 1B | Camden | 9A | Longsight | |
24/02/1951 | Reallocation | 46143 | 9A | Longsight | 5A | Crewe North | |
24/02/1951 | Reallocation | 46144 | 8A | Edge Hill | 5A | Crewe North | |
24/02/1951 | Reallocation | 46152 | 1B | Camden | 9A | Longsight | |
24/02/1951 | Reallocation | 46153 | 8A | Edge Hill | 5A | Crewe North | |
24/02/1951 | Reallocation | 46165 | 3B | Bushbury | 5A | Crewe North | |
24/02/1951 | Reallocation | 46166 | 7C | Holyhead | 5A | Crewe North | |
28/02/1951 | Reallocation | 46113 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | |
28/02/1951 | Reallocation | 46127 | 5A | Crewe North | 5A | Crewe North | |
28/02/1951 | Reallocation | 46141 | 9A | Longsight | 9A | Longsight | |
28/02/1951 | Reallocation | 46143 | 5A | Crewe North | 5A | Crewe North | |
28/02/1951 | Reallocation | 46144 | 5A | Crewe North | 5A | Crewe North | |
28/02/1951 | Reallocation | 46152 | 9A | Longsight | 9A | Longsight | |
28/02/1951 | Reallocation | 46153 | 5A | Crewe North | 5A | Crewe North | |
28/02/1951 | Reallocation | 46165 | 5A | Crewe North | 5A | Crewe North | |
28/02/1951 | Reallocation | 46166 | 5A | Crewe North | 5A | Crewe North | |
03/03/1951 | Reallocation | 46113 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | |
24/03/1951 | Reallocation | 46127 | 5A | Crewe North | 7C | Holyhead | |
24/03/1951 | Reallocation | 46141 | 9A | Longsight | 1B | Camden | |
24/03/1951 | Reallocation | 46143 | 5A | Crewe North | 1B | Camden | |
24/03/1951 | Reallocation | 46144 | 5A | Crewe North | 8A | Edge Hill | |
24/03/1951 | Reallocation | 46153 | 5A | Crewe North | 8A | Edge Hill | |
24/03/1951 | Reallocation | 46157 | 5A | Crewe North | 7C | Holyhead | |
24/03/1951 | Reallocation | 46165 | 5A | Crewe North | 3B | Bushbury | |
19/05/1951 | Reallocation | 46166 | 5A | Crewe North | 8A | Edge Hill | |
07/07/1951 | Reallocation | 46110 | 3B | Bushbury | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | |
07/07/1951 | Reallocation | 46134 | 3B | Bushbury | 5A | Crewe North | |
07/07/1951 | Reallocation | 46140 | 3B | Bushbury | 5A | Crewe North | |
07/07/1951 | Reallocation | 46146 | 5A | Crewe North | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | |
07/07/1951 | Reallocation | 46148 | 3B | Bushbury | 5A | Crewe North | |
07/07/1951 | Reallocation | 46151 | 3B | Bushbury | 8A | Edge Hill | |
07/07/1951 | Reallocation | 46155 | 5A | Crewe North | 7C | Holyhead | |
07/07/1951 | Reallocation | 46158 | 3B | Bushbury | 8A | Edge Hill | |
07/07/1951 | Reallocation | 46163 | 3B | Bushbury | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | |
07/07/1951 | Reallocation | 46165 | 3B | Bushbury | 8A | Edge Hill | |
17/07/1951 | Reallocation | 46110 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | |
17/07/1951 | Reallocation | 46134 | 5A | Crewe North | 5A | Crewe North | |
17/07/1951 | Reallocation | 46140 | 5A | Crewe North | 5A | Crewe North | |
17/07/1951 | Reallocation | 46146 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | |
17/07/1951 | Reallocation | 46148 | 5A | Crewe North | 5A | Crewe North | |
17/07/1951 | Reallocation | 46151 | 8A | Edge Hill | 8A | Edge Hill | |
17/07/1951 | Reallocation | 46155 | 7C | Holyhead | 7C | Holyhead | |
17/07/1951 | Reallocation | 46158 | 8A | Edge Hill | 8A | Edge Hill | |
17/07/1951 | Reallocation | 46163 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | |
17/07/1951 | Reallocation | 46165 | 8A | Edge Hill | 8A | Edge Hill | |
17/07/1951 | Reallocation | 46166 | 8A | Edge Hill | 5A | Crewe North | |
11/08/1951 | Reallocation | 46145 | 9A | Longsight | 7C | Holyhead | |
11/08/1951 | Reallocation | 46150 | 9A | Longsight | 7C | Holyhead | |
08/09/1951 | Reallocation | 46155 | 7C | Holyhead | 5A | Crewe North | |
15/09/1951 | Reallocation | 46138 | 1B | Camden | 7C | Holyhead | |
15/09/1951 | Reallocation | 46151 | 8A | Edge Hill | 5A | Crewe North | |
15/09/1951 | Reallocation | 46155 | 5A | Crewe North | 5A | Crewe North | |
15/09/1951 | Reallocation | 46165 | 8A | Edge Hill | 5A | Crewe North | |
29/09/1951 | Reallocation | 46150 | 7C | Holyhead | 7C | Holyhead | |
06/10/1951 | Reallocation | 46138 | 7C | Holyhead | 7C | Holyhead | |
06/10/1951 | Reallocation | 46145 | 7C | Holyhead | 9A | Longsight | |
06/10/1951 | Reallocation | 46151 | 5A | Crewe North | 5A | Crewe North | |
06/10/1951 | Reallocation | 46165 | 5A | Crewe North | 5A | Crewe North | |
20/10/1951 | Reallocation | 46161 | 7C | Holyhead | 5A | Crewe North | |
01/12/1951 | Reallocation | 46145 | 9A | Longsight | 9A | Longsight | |
29/12/1951 | Reallocation | 46167 | 9A | Longsight | 5A | Crewe North | |
23/02/1952 | Reallocation | 46101 | 5A | Crewe North | 7C | Holyhead | |
19/04/1952 | Reallocation | 46110 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 5A | Crewe North | |
19/04/1952 | Reallocation | 46138 | 7C | Holyhead | 1B | Camden | |
19/04/1952 | Reallocation | 46146 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 1B | Camden | |
19/04/1952 | Reallocation | 46147 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | 1B | Camden | |
17/05/1952 | Reallocation | 46101 | 7C | Holyhead | 5A | Crewe North | |
17/05/1952 | Reallocation | 46138 | 1B | Camden | 5A | Crewe North | |
14/06/1952 | Reallocation | 46101 | 5A | Crewe North | 5A | Crewe North | |
14/06/1952 | Reallocation | 46132 | 7C | Holyhead | 5A | Crewe North | |
14/06/1952 | Reallocation | 46138 | 5A | Crewe North | 5A | Crewe North | |
12/07/1952 | Reallocation | 46101 | 5A | Crewe North | 1B | Camden | |
12/07/1952 | Reallocation | 46125 | 5A | Crewe North | 1B | Camden | |
12/07/1952 | Reallocation | 46128 | 5A | Crewe North | 6J | Holyhead | |
12/07/1952 | Reallocation | 46132 | 5A | Crewe North | 6J | Holyhead | |
12/07/1952 | Reallocation | 46155 | 5A | Crewe North | 1B | Camden | |
12/07/1952 | Reallocation | 46161 | 5A | Crewe North | 1B | Camden | |
12/07/1952 | Reallocation | 46163 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 5A | Crewe North | |
12/07/1952 | Reallocation | 46165 | 5A | Crewe North | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | |
12/07/1952 | Reallocation | 46166 | 5A | Crewe North | 1B | Camden | |
04/10/1952 | Reallocation | 46101 | 1B | Camden | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | |
04/10/1952 | Reallocation | 46101 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | |
04/10/1952 | Reallocation | 46106 | 8A | Edge Hill | 5A | Crewe North | |
04/10/1952 | Reallocation | 46111 | 8A | Edge Hill | 5A | Crewe North | |
04/10/1952 | Reallocation | 46125 | 1B | Camden | 5A | Crewe North | |
04/10/1952 | Reallocation | 46126 | 8A | Edge Hill | 5A | Crewe North | |
04/10/1952 | Reallocation | 46143 | 1B | Camden | 6J | Holyhead | |
04/10/1952 | Reallocation | 46155 | 1B | Camden | 5A | Crewe North | |
04/10/1952 | Reallocation | 46161 | 1B | Camden | 5A | Crewe North | |
04/10/1952 | Reallocation | 46162 | 1B | Camden | 5A | Crewe North | |
04/10/1952 | Reallocation | 46166 | 1B | Camden | 5A | Crewe North | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 46128 | 6J | Holyhead | 5A | Crewe North | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 46143 | 6J | Holyhead | 5A | Crewe North | |
29/11/1952 | Reallocation | 46101 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 5A | Crewe North | |
29/11/1952 | Reallocation | 46128 | 5A | Crewe North | 5A | Crewe North | |
29/11/1952 | Reallocation | 46143 | 5A | Crewe North | 5A | Crewe North | |
29/11/1952 | Reallocation | 46162 | 5A | Crewe North | 1B | Camden | |
27/12/1952 | Reallocation | 46143 | 5A | Crewe North | 9A | Longsight | |
27/12/1952 | Reallocation | 46144 | 8A | Edge Hill | 1B | Camden | |
03/01/1953 | Reallocation | 46143 | 9A | Longsight | 9A | Longsight | |
03/01/1953 | Reallocation | 46144 | 1B | Camden | 1B | Camden | |
24/01/1953 | Reallocation | 46126 | 5A | Crewe North | 1B | Camden | |
24/01/1953 | Reallocation | 46137 | 8A | Edge Hill | 5A | Crewe North | |
24/01/1953 | Reallocation | 46145 | 9A | Longsight | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | |
24/01/1953 | Reallocation | 46149 | 7C | Holyhead | 8A | Edge Hill | |
24/01/1953 | Reallocation | 46152 | 9A | Longsight | 8A | Edge Hill | |
24/01/1953 | Reallocation | 46156 | 8A | Edge Hill | 5A | Crewe North | |
21/02/1953 | Reallocation | 46112 | 7C | Holyhead | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | |
21/02/1953 | Reallocation | 46118 | 5A | Crewe North | 6J | Holyhead | |
21/02/1953 | Reallocation | 46125 | 5A | Crewe North | 6J | Holyhead | |
21/02/1953 | Reallocation | 46129 | 9A | Longsight | 6J | Holyhead | |
21/03/1953 | Reallocation | 46125 | 6J | Holyhead | 5A | Crewe North | |
21/03/1953 | Reallocation | 46167 | 5A | Crewe North | 1B | Camden | |
18/04/1953 | Reallocation | 46110 | 5A | Crewe North | 6J | Holyhead | |
18/04/1953 | Reallocation | 46118 | 6J | Holyhead | 5A | Crewe North | |
18/04/1953 | Reallocation | 46119 | 7C | Holyhead | 5A | Crewe North | |
16/05/1953 | Reallocation | 46119 | 5A | Crewe North | 1B | Camden | |
16/05/1953 | Reallocation | 46138 | 5A | Crewe North | 1B | Camden | |
11/07/1953 | Reallocation | 46101 | 5A | Crewe North | 1B | Camden | |
11/07/1953 | Reallocation | 46106 | 5A | Crewe North | 8A | Edge Hill | |
11/07/1953 | Reallocation | 46111 | 5A | Crewe North | 9A | Longsight | |
11/07/1953 | Reallocation | 46119 | 1B | Camden | 5A | Crewe North | |
11/07/1953 | Reallocation | 46125 | 5A | Crewe North | 1B | Camden | |
11/07/1953 | Reallocation | 46128 | 5A | Crewe North | 1B | Camden | |
11/07/1953 | Reallocation | 46130 | 5A | Crewe North | 9A | Longsight | |
11/07/1953 | Reallocation | 46138 | 1B | Camden | 1B | Camden | |
11/07/1953 | Reallocation | 46159 | 1B | Camden | 6J | Holyhead | |
11/07/1953 | Reallocation | 46161 | 5A | Crewe North | 6J | Holyhead | |
11/07/1953 | Reallocation | 46166 | 5A | Crewe North | 8A | Edge Hill | |
05/09/1953 | Reallocation | 46111 | 9A | Longsight | 6J | Holyhead | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 46101 | 1B | Camden | 5A | Crewe North | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 46106 | 8A | Edge Hill | 5A | Crewe North | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 46111 | 6J | Holyhead | 9A | Longsight | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 46125 | 1B | Camden | 5A | Crewe North | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 46128 | 1B | Camden | 5A | Crewe North | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 46138 | 1B | Camden | 5A | Crewe North | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 46161 | 6J | Holyhead | 9A | Longsight | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 46166 | 8A | Edge Hill | 5A | Crewe North | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 46167 | 1B | Camden | 5A | Crewe North | |
28/11/1953 | Reallocation | 46159 | 6J | Holyhead | 5A | Crewe North | |
30/01/1954 | Reallocation | 46125 | 5A | Crewe North | 9A | Longsight | |
30/01/1954 | Reallocation | 46146 | 1B | Camden | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | |
27/02/1954 | Reallocation | 46125 | 9A | Longsight | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | |
27/03/1954 | Reallocation | 46110 | 6J | Holyhead | 8A | Edge Hill | |
27/03/1954 | Reallocation | 46125 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 5A | Crewe North | |
27/03/1954 | Reallocation | 46146 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 1B | Camden | |
24/04/1954 | Reallocation | 46119 | 5A | Crewe North | 6J | Holyhead | |
24/04/1954 | Reallocation | 46135 | 8A | Edge Hill | 6J | Holyhead | |
19/06/1954 | Reallocation | 46119 | 6J | Holyhead | 1B | Camden | |
19/06/1954 | Reallocation | 46128 | 5A | Crewe North | 1B | Camden | |
19/06/1954 | Reallocation | 46140 | 5A | Crewe North | 9A | Longsight | |
19/06/1954 | Reallocation | 46159 | 5A | Crewe North | 1B | Camden | |
19/06/1954 | Reallocation | 46163 | 5A | Crewe North | 1B | Camden | |
19/06/1954 | Reallocation | 46166 | 5A | Crewe North | 1B | Camden | |
19/06/1954 | Reallocation | 46167 | 5A | Crewe North | 1B | Camden | |
17/07/1954 | Reallocation | 46120 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | 6J | Holyhead | |
14/08/1954 | Reallocation | 46101 | 5A | Crewe North | 1B | Camden | |
14/08/1954 | Reallocation | 46120 | 6J | Holyhead | 9A | Longsight | |
14/08/1954 | Reallocation | 46129 | 6J | Holyhead | 5A | Crewe North | |
14/08/1954 | Reallocation | 46135 | 6J | Holyhead | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | |
14/08/1954 | Reallocation | 46150 | 7C | Holyhead | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | |
14/08/1954 | Reallocation | 46157 | 7C | Holyhead | 1B | Camden | |
11/09/1954 | Reallocation | 46118 | 5A | Crewe North | 1B | Camden | |
09/10/1954 | Reallocation | 46101 | 1B | Camden | 5A | Crewe North | |
09/10/1954 | Reallocation | 46116 | 1B | Camden | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | |
09/10/1954 | Reallocation | 46118 | 1B | Camden | 5A | Crewe North | |
09/10/1954 | Reallocation | 46119 | 1B | Camden | 5A | Crewe North | |
09/10/1954 | Reallocation | 46126 | 1B | Camden | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | |
09/10/1954 | Reallocation | 46127 | 7C | Holyhead | 5A | Crewe North | |
09/10/1954 | Reallocation | 46128 | 1B | Camden | 5A | Crewe North | |
09/10/1954 | Reallocation | 46132 | 6J | Holyhead | 8A | Edge Hill | |
09/10/1954 | Reallocation | 46141 | 1B | Camden | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | |
09/10/1954 | Reallocation | 46157 | 1B | Camden | 8A | Edge Hill | |
09/10/1954 | Reallocation | 46159 | 1B | Camden | 5A | Crewe North | |
09/10/1954 | Reallocation | 46163 | 1B | Camden | 5A | Crewe North | |
09/10/1954 | Reallocation | 46166 | 1B | Camden | 5A | Crewe North | |
09/10/1954 | Reallocation | 46167 | 1B | Camden | 5A | Crewe North | |
06/11/1954 | Reallocation | 46101 | 5A | Crewe North | 1B | Camden | |
06/11/1954 | Reallocation | 46120 | 9A | Longsight | 5A | Crewe North | |
06/11/1954 | Reallocation | 46134 | 5A | Crewe North | 1B | Camden | |
04/12/1954 | Reallocation | 46128 | 5A | Crewe North | 9A | Longsight | |
04/12/1954 | Reallocation | 46132 | 8A | Edge Hill | 9A | Longsight | |
04/12/1954 | Reallocation | 46134 | 1B | Camden | 6J | Holyhead | |
04/12/1954 | Reallocation | 46138 | 5A | Crewe North | 9A | Longsight | |
04/12/1954 | Reallocation | 46166 | 5A | Crewe North | 9A | Longsight | |
01/01/1955 | Reallocation | 46101 | 1B | Camden | 5A | Crewe North | |
01/01/1955 | Reallocation | 46138 | 9A | Longsight | 5A | Crewe North | |
01/01/1955 | Reallocation | 46166 | 9A | Longsight | 5A | Crewe North | |
29/01/1955 | Reallocation | 46132 | 9A | Longsight | 8A | Edge Hill | |
29/01/1955 | Reallocation | 46150 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 5A | Crewe North | |
26/02/1955 | Reallocation | 46134 | 6J | Holyhead | 5A | Crewe North | |
26/03/1955 | Reallocation | 46126 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | |
26/03/1955 | Reallocation | 46128 | 9A | Longsight | 5A | Crewe North | |
23/04/1955 | Reallocation | 46126 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | |
21/05/1955 | Reallocation | 46114 | 9A | Longsight | 1B | Camden | |
21/05/1955 | Reallocation | 46130 | 9A | Longsight | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | |
16/07/1955 | Reallocation | 46119 | 5A | Crewe North | 1B | Camden | |
16/07/1955 | Reallocation | 46127 | 5A | Crewe North | 1B | Camden | |
16/07/1955 | Reallocation | 46151 | 5A | Crewe North | 6J | Holyhead | |
16/07/1955 | Reallocation | 46153 | 8A | Edge Hill | 9A | Longsight | |
16/07/1955 | Reallocation | 46158 | 8A | Edge Hill | 9A | Longsight | |
16/07/1955 | Reallocation | 46159 | 5A | Crewe North | 1B | Camden | |
08/10/1955 | Reallocation | 46114 | 1B | Camden | 8A | Edge Hill | |
08/10/1955 | Reallocation | 46119 | 1B | Camden | 5A | Crewe North | |
08/10/1955 | Reallocation | 46127 | 1B | Camden | 5A | Crewe North | |
08/10/1955 | Reallocation | 46142 | 1B | Camden | 8A | Edge Hill | |
08/10/1955 | Reallocation | 46147 | 1B | Camden | 6J | Holyhead | |
08/10/1955 | Reallocation | 46159 | 1B | Camden | 5A | Crewe North | |
05/11/1955 | Reallocation | 46143 | 9A | Longsight | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | |
05/11/1955 | Reallocation | 46166 | 5A | Crewe North | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | |
03/12/1955 | Reallocation | 46120 | M&EE, Derby | 17A | Derby | ||
03/12/1955 | Reallocation | 46143 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | 9A | Longsight | |
03/12/1955 | Reallocation | 46166 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 5A | Crewe North | |
31/12/1955 | Reallocation | 46165 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | Rugby Testing Station | ||
28/01/1956 | Reallocation | 46141 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | |
25/02/1956 | Reallocation | 46120 | 17A | Derby | 9A | Longsight | |
25/02/1956 | Reallocation | 46141 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | |
19/05/1956 | Reallocation | 46116 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 6J | Holyhead | |
19/05/1956 | Reallocation | 46150 | 5A | Crewe North | 6J | Holyhead | |
16/06/1956 | Reallocation | 46116 | 6J | Holyhead | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | |
16/06/1956 | Reallocation | 46120 | 9A | Longsight | 5A | Crewe North | |
16/06/1956 | Reallocation | 46147 | 6J | Holyhead | 8A | Edge Hill | |
16/06/1956 | Reallocation | 46151 | 6J | Holyhead | 1B | Camden | |
16/06/1956 | Reallocation | 46161 | 9A | Longsight | 1B | Camden | |
16/06/1956 | Reallocation | 46165 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | |||
11/08/1956 | Reallocation | 46110 | 8A | Edge Hill | 1B | Camden | |
11/08/1956 | Reallocation | 46138 | 5A | Crewe North | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | |
11/08/1956 | Reallocation | 46147 | 8A | Edge Hill | 6J | Holyhead | |
11/08/1956 | Reallocation | 46149 | 8A | Edge Hill | 9A | Longsight | |
11/08/1956 | Reallocation | 46165 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 5A | Crewe North | |
08/09/1956 | Reallocation | 46147 | 6J | Holyhead | 9A | Longsight | |
08/09/1956 | Reallocation | 46150 | 6J | Holyhead | 5A | Crewe North | |
06/10/1956 | Reallocation | 46110 | 1B | Camden | 5A | Crewe North | |
06/10/1956 | Reallocation | 46135 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 9A | Longsight | |
06/10/1956 | Reallocation | 46147 | 9A | Longsight | 6J | Holyhead | |
06/10/1956 | Reallocation | 46149 | 9A | Longsight | 6J | Holyhead | |
06/10/1956 | Reallocation | 46150 | 5A | Crewe North | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | |
06/10/1956 | Reallocation | 46151 | 1B | Camden | 5A | Crewe North | |
06/10/1956 | Reallocation | 46161 | 1B | Camden | 5A | Crewe North | |
03/11/1956 | Reallocation | 46138 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 5A | Crewe North | |
03/11/1956 | Reallocation | 46150 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 5A | Crewe North | |
03/11/1956 | Reallocation | 46159 | 5A | Crewe North | 1B | Camden | |
03/11/1956 | Reallocation | 46165 | 5A | Crewe North | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | |
03/11/1956 | Reallocation | 46167 | 5A | Crewe North | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | |
01/12/1956 | Reallocation | 46137 | 5A | Crewe North | 9A | Longsight | |
29/12/1956 | Reallocation | 46159 | 1B | Camden | 5A | Crewe North | |
23/02/1957 | Reallocation | 46135 | 9A | Longsight | 5A | Crewe North | |
23/02/1957 | Reallocation | 46137 | 9A | Longsight | 5A | Crewe North | |
23/03/1957 | Reallocation | 46136 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | 9A | Longsight | |
20/04/1957 | Reallocation | 46136 | 9A | Longsight | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | |
18/05/1957 | Reallocation | 46128 | 5A | Crewe North | 5A | Crewe North | |
18/05/1957 | Reallocation | 46137 | 5A | Crewe North | 6J | Holyhead | |
10/08/1957 | Reallocation | 46106 | 5A | Crewe North | 1B | Camden | |
10/08/1957 | Reallocation | 46127 | 5A | Crewe North | 1B | Camden | |
10/08/1957 | Reallocation | 46129 | 5A | Crewe North | 1B | Camden | |
10/08/1957 | Reallocation | 46130 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 6J | Holyhead | |
10/08/1957 | Reallocation | 46148 | 5A | Crewe North | 1B | Camden | |
10/08/1957 | Reallocation | 46150 | 5A | Crewe North | 1B | Camden | |
07/09/1957 | Reallocation | 46137 | 6J | Holyhead | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | |
05/10/1957 | Reallocation | 46106 | 1B | Camden | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | |
05/10/1957 | Reallocation | 46127 | 1B | Camden | 5A | Crewe North | |
05/10/1957 | Reallocation | 46130 | 6J | Holyhead | 8A | Edge Hill | |
05/10/1957 | Reallocation | 46137 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 9A | Longsight | |
05/10/1957 | Reallocation | 46150 | 1B | Camden | 5A | Crewe North | |
30/11/1957 | Reallocation | 46110 | 5A | Crewe North | 14B | Kentish Town | |
30/11/1957 | Reallocation | 46116 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 14B | Kentish Town | |
30/11/1957 | Reallocation | 46127 | 5A | Crewe North | 14B | Kentish Town | |
30/11/1957 | Reallocation | 46129 | 1B | Camden | 6J | Holyhead | |
30/11/1957 | Reallocation | 46131 | 9A | Longsight | 14B | Kentish Town | |
30/11/1957 | Reallocation | 46137 | 9A | Longsight | 8A | Edge Hill | |
30/11/1957 | Reallocation | 46147 | 6J | Holyhead | 6J | Holyhead | |
30/11/1957 | Reallocation | 46148 | 1B | Camden | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | |
30/11/1957 | Reallocation | 46152 | 8A | Edge Hill | 14B | Kentish Town | |
30/11/1957 | Reallocation | 46157 | 8A | Edge Hill | 14B | Kentish Town | |
28/12/1957 | Reallocation | 46137 | 8A | Edge Hill | 9A | Longsight | |
25/01/1958 | Reallocation | 46126 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 6J | Holyhead | |
22/02/1958 | Reallocation | 46126 | 6J | Holyhead | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | |
14/06/1958 | Reallocation | 46106 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 9A | Longsight | |
14/06/1958 | Reallocation | 46110 | 14B | Kentish Town | 1B | Camden | |
14/06/1958 | Reallocation | 46119 | 5A | Crewe North | 1B | Camden | |
14/06/1958 | Reallocation | 46120 | 5A | Crewe North | 1B | Camden | |
14/06/1958 | Reallocation | 46147 | 6J | Holyhead | 8A | Edge Hill | |
14/06/1958 | Reallocation | 46155 | 5A | Crewe North | 8A | Edge Hill | |
14/06/1958 | Reallocation | 46156 | 5A | Crewe North | 8A | Edge Hill | |
14/06/1958 | Reallocation | 46157 | 14B | Kentish Town | 1B | Camden | |
14/06/1958 | Reallocation | 46166 | 5A | Crewe North | 9A | Longsight | |
12/07/1958 | Reallocation | 46116 | 14B | Kentish Town | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | |
12/07/1958 | Reallocation | 46127 | 14B | Kentish Town | 6J | Holyhead | |
12/07/1958 | Reallocation | 46131 | 14B | Kentish Town | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | |
12/07/1958 | Reallocation | 46152 | 14B | Kentish Town | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | |
09/08/1958 | Reallocation | 46116 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 1B | Camden | |
09/08/1958 | Reallocation | 46131 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 1B | Camden | |
09/08/1958 | Reallocation | 46152 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 1B | Camden | |
04/10/1958 | Reallocation | 46110 | 1B | Camden | 5A | Crewe North | |
04/10/1958 | Reallocation | 46116 | 1B | Camden | 5A | Crewe North | |
04/10/1958 | Reallocation | 46119 | 1B | Camden | 5A | Crewe North | |
04/10/1958 | Reallocation | 46120 | 1B | Camden | 5A | Crewe North | |
04/10/1958 | Reallocation | 46131 | 1B | Camden | 5A | Crewe North | |
04/10/1958 | Reallocation | 46152 | 1B | Camden | 5A | Crewe North | |
04/10/1958 | Reallocation | 46157 | 1B | Camden | 5A | Crewe North | |
04/10/1958 | Reallocation | 46170 | 1B | Camden | 5A | Crewe North | |
11/10/1958 | Reallocation | 46103 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | 14B | Kentish Town | |
18/10/1958 | Reallocation | 46119 | 5A | Crewe North | 8A | Edge Hill | |
18/10/1958 | Reallocation | 46131 | 5A | Crewe North | 9A | Longsight | |
18/10/1958 | Reallocation | 46133 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | 14B | Kentish Town | |
18/10/1958 | Reallocation | 46170 | 5A | Crewe North | 1B | Camden | |
01/11/1958 | Reallocation | 46103 | 14B | Kentish Town | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | |
01/11/1958 | Reallocation | 46133 | 14B | Kentish Town | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | |
29/11/1958 | Reallocation | 46103 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 14B | Kentish Town | |
29/11/1958 | Reallocation | 46133 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 14B | Kentish Town | |
06/12/1958 | Reallocation | 46108 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | 9A | Longsight | |
10/01/1959 | Reallocation | 46148 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 9A | Longsight | |
07/02/1959 | Reallocation | 46130 | 8A | Edge Hill | 14B | Kentish Town | |
14/02/1959 | Reallocation | 46148 | 9A | Longsight | 14B | Kentish Town | |
11/04/1959 | Reallocation | 46148 | 14B | Kentish Town | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | |
18/04/1959 | Reallocation | 46130 | 14B | Kentish Town | 8A | Edge Hill | |
25/04/1959 | Reallocation | 46122 | 9A | Longsight | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | |
25/04/1959 | Reallocation | 46158 | 9A | Longsight | 14B | Kentish Town | |
09/05/1959 | Reallocation | 46154 | 1B | Camden | 14B | Kentish Town | |
13/06/1959 | Reallocation | 46122 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 9A | Longsight | |
13/06/1959 | Reallocation | 46154 | 14B | Kentish Town | 1B | Camden | |
13/06/1959 | Reallocation | 46158 | 14B | Kentish Town | 9A | Longsight | |
20/06/1959 | Reallocation | 46101 | 5A | Crewe North | 1B | Camden | |
20/06/1959 | Reallocation | 46118 | 5A | Crewe North | 1B | Camden | |
20/06/1959 | Reallocation | 46122 | 9A | Longsight | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | |
20/06/1959 | Reallocation | 46135 | 5A | Crewe North | 1B | Camden | |
20/06/1959 | Reallocation | 46161 | 5A | Crewe North | 1B | Camden | |
20/06/1959 | Reallocation | 46163 | 5A | Crewe North | 1B | Camden | |
18/07/1959 | Reallocation | 46151 | 5A | Crewe North | 9A | Longsight | |
18/07/1959 | Reallocation | 46169 | 9A | Longsight | 5A | Crewe North | |
12/09/1959 | Reallocation | 46135 | 1B | Camden | 5A | Crewe North | |
12/09/1959 | Reallocation | 46147 | 8A | Edge Hill | 5A | Crewe North | |
12/09/1959 | Reallocation | 46154 | 1B | Camden | 24K | Preston | |
12/09/1959 | Reallocation | 46155 | 8A | Edge Hill | 5A | Crewe North | |
12/09/1959 | Reallocation | 46161 | 1B | Camden | 24K | Preston | |
12/09/1959 | Reallocation | 46163 | 1B | Camden | 24K | Preston | |
12/09/1959 | Reallocation | 46164 | 8A | Edge Hill | 5A | Crewe North | |
12/09/1959 | Reallocation | 46168 | 1B | Camden | 24K | Preston | |
19/09/1959 | Reallocation | 46130 | 8A | Edge Hill | 14B | Kentish Town | |
19/09/1959 | Reallocation | 46132 | 8A | Edge Hill | 14B | Kentish Town | |
19/09/1959 | Reallocation | 46142 | 8A | Edge Hill | 14B | Kentish Town | |
19/09/1959 | Reallocation | 46160 | 9A | Longsight | 14B | Kentish Town | |
26/09/1959 | Reallocation | 46123 | 8A | Edge Hill | 14B | Kentish Town | |
26/09/1959 | Reallocation | 46140 | 9A | Longsight | 14B | Kentish Town | |
05/11/1959 | Reallocation | 46100 | 8A | Edge Hill | 1B | Nottingham | |
07/11/1959 | Reallocation | 46122 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | 3B | Bushbury | |
07/11/1959 | Reallocation | 46126 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | 24K | Preston | |
07/11/1959 | Reallocation | 46136 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 24K | Preston | |
07/11/1959 | Reallocation | 46138 | 5A | Crewe North | 6G | Llandudno Junction | |
07/11/1959 | Reallocation | 46139 | 1B | Camden | 14B | Kentish Town | |
07/11/1959 | Reallocation | 46140 | 14B | Kentish Town | 16A | Nottingham | |
07/11/1959 | Reallocation | 46141 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 3B | Bushbury | |
07/11/1959 | Reallocation | 46143 | 9A | Longsight | 3B | Bushbury | |
07/11/1959 | Reallocation | 46150 | 5A | Crewe North | 6G | Llandudno Junction | |
07/11/1959 | Reallocation | 46153 | 9A | Longsight | 3B | Bushbury | |
07/11/1959 | Reallocation | 46156 | 8A | Edge Hill | 6G | Llandudno Junction | |
07/11/1959 | Reallocation | 46158 | 9A | Longsight | 3B | Bushbury | |
07/11/1959 | Reallocation | 46162 | 1B | Camden | 14B | Kentish Town | |
07/11/1959 | Reallocation | 46165 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 24K | Preston | |
07/11/1959 | Reallocation | 46167 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 24K | Preston | |
28/11/1959 | Reallocation | 46108 | 9A | Longsight | 24K | Preston | |
28/11/1959 | Reallocation | 46170 | 1B | Camden | 5A | Crewe North | |
05/12/1959 | Reallocation | 46170 | 5A | Crewe North | 24K | Preston | |
19/12/1959 | Reallocation | 46112 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | 16A | Nottingham | |
19/12/1959 | Reallocation | 46130 | 14B | Kentish Town | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | |
19/12/1959 | Reallocation | 46140 | 16A | Nottingham | 14B | Kentish Town | |
27/12/1959 | Reallocation | 46100 | 1B | Camden | 16A | Nottingham | |
02/01/1960 | Reallocation | 46118 | 1B | Camden | 16A | Nottingham | |
23/01/1960 | Reallocation | 46108 | 24K | Preston | 9A | Longsight | |
23/01/1960 | Reallocation | 46170 | 24K | Preston | 5A | Crewe North | |
06/02/1960 | Reallocation | 46131 | 9A | Longsight | 41C | Sheffield Millhouses | |
06/02/1960 | Reallocation | 46147 | 5A | Crewe North | 41C | Sheffield Millhouses | |
06/02/1960 | Reallocation | 46148 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | 41C | Sheffield Millhouses | |
06/02/1960 | Reallocation | 46151 | 9A | Longsight | 41C | Sheffield Millhouses | |
27/02/1960 | Reallocation | 46156 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | 9A | Longsight | |
26/03/1960 | Reallocation | 46156 | 9A | Longsight | 6G | Llandudno Junction | |
02/04/1960 | Reallocation | 46163 | 24K | Preston | 6J | Holyhead | |
30/04/1960 | Reallocation | 46106 | 9A | Longsight | 26A | Newton Heath | |
30/04/1960 | Reallocation | 46127 | 6J | Holyhead | 5A | Crewe North | |
30/04/1960 | Reallocation | 46137 | 9A | Longsight | 26A | Newton Heath | |
30/04/1960 | Reallocation | 46149 | 6J | Holyhead | 5A | Crewe North | |
30/04/1960 | Reallocation | 46163 | 6J | Holyhead | 5A | Crewe North | |
11/06/1960 | Reallocation | 46120 | 5A | Crewe North | 9A | Longsight | |
11/06/1960 | Reallocation | 46127 | 5A | Crewe North | 9A | Longsight | |
11/06/1960 | Reallocation | 46135 | 5A | Crewe North | 9A | Longsight | |
11/06/1960 | Reallocation | 46163 | 5A | Crewe North | 6J | Holyhead | |
11/06/1960 | Reallocation | 46170 | 5A | Crewe North | 6J | Holyhead | |
18/06/1960 | Reallocation | 46138 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | 6J | Holyhead | |
18/06/1960 | Reallocation | 46150 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | 6J | Holyhead | |
18/06/1960 | Reallocation | 46156 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | 6J | Holyhead | |
09/07/1960 | Reallocation | 46170 | 6J | Holyhead | 5A | Crewe North | |
16/07/1960 | Reallocation | 46152 | 5A | Crewe North | 6J | Holyhead | |
13/08/1960 | Reallocation | 46152 | 6J | Holyhead | 5A | Crewe North | |
13/08/1960 | Reallocation | 46170 | 5A | Crewe North | 1B | Camden | |
03/09/1960 | Reallocation | 46170 | 1B | Camden | 5A | Crewe North | |
10/09/1960 | Reallocation | 46108 | 9A | Longsight | 5A | Crewe North | |
10/09/1960 | Reallocation | 46111 | 9A | Longsight | 5A | Crewe North | |
10/09/1960 | Reallocation | 46115 | 9A | Longsight | 5A | Crewe North | |
10/09/1960 | Reallocation | 46120 | 9A | Longsight | 1B | Camden | |
10/09/1960 | Reallocation | 46127 | 9A | Longsight | 5A | Crewe North | |
10/09/1960 | Reallocation | 46135 | 9A | Longsight | 5A | Crewe North | |
10/09/1960 | Reallocation | 46166 | 9A | Longsight | 5A | Crewe North | |
17/09/1960 | Reallocation | 46106 | 26A | Newton Heath | 26A | Newton Heath | |
17/09/1960 | Reallocation | 46126 | 24K | Preston | 8A | Edge Hill | |
17/09/1960 | Reallocation | 46136 | 24K | Preston | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | |
17/09/1960 | Reallocation | 46137 | 26A | Newton Heath | 26A | Newton Heath | |
17/09/1960 | Reallocation | 46138 | 6J | Holyhead | 6G | Llandudno Junction | |
17/09/1960 | Reallocation | 46154 | 24K | Preston | 8A | Edge Hill | |
17/09/1960 | Reallocation | 46163 | 6J | Holyhead | 6G | Llandudno Junction | |
17/09/1960 | Reallocation | 46167 | 24K | Preston | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | |
22/10/1960 | Reallocation | 46170 | 5A | Crewe North | 1B | Camden | |
29/10/1960 | Reallocation | 46136 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | 5A | Crewe North | |
05/11/1960 | Reallocation | 46108 | 5A | Crewe North | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | |
03/12/1960 | Reallocation | 46122 | 3B | Bushbury | 1A | Willesden | |
03/12/1960 | Reallocation | 46141 | 3B | Bushbury | 1A | Willesden | |
03/12/1960 | Reallocation | 46158 | 3B | Bushbury | 1A | Willesden | |
03/12/1960 | Reallocation | 46170 | 1B | Camden | 5A | Crewe North | |
17/12/1960 | Reallocation | 46122 | 1A | Willesden | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | |
17/12/1960 | Reallocation | 46143 | 3B | Bushbury | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | |
24/12/1960 | Reallocation | 46155 | 5A | Crewe North | 1B | Camden | |
31/12/1960 | Reallocation | 46106 | 26A | Newton Heath | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | |
31/12/1960 | Reallocation | 46141 | 1A | Willesden | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | |
31/12/1960 | Reallocation | 46155 | 1B | Camden | 5A | Crewe North | |
31/12/1960 | Reallocation | 46158 | 1A | Willesden | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | |
07/01/1961 | Reallocation | 46153 | 3B | Bushbury | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | |
14/01/1961 | Reallocation | 46114 | 8A | Edge Hill | 1A | Willesden | |
14/01/1961 | Reallocation | 46126 | 8A | Edge Hill | 1A | Willesden | |
14/01/1961 | Reallocation | 46137 | 26A | Newton Heath | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | |
14/01/1961 | Reallocation | 46159 | 5A | Crewe North | 1A | Willesden | |
21/01/1961 | Reallocation | 46120 | 1B | Camden | 1A | Willesden | |
21/01/1961 | Reallocation | 46146 | 1B | Camden | 1A | Willesden | |
04/02/1961 | Reallocation | 46106 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | |
04/03/1961 | Reallocation | 46114 | 1A | Willesden | 21C | Bushbury | |
04/03/1961 | Reallocation | 46161 | 24K | Preston | 21C | Bushbury | |
04/03/1961 | Reallocation | 46167 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | 21C | Bushbury | |
11/04/1961 | Reallocation | 46138 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | 6J | Holyhead | |
11/04/1961 | Reallocation | 46163 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | 6J | Holyhead | |
06/05/1961 | Reallocation | 46115 | 5A | Crewe North | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | |
10/06/1961 | Reallocation | 46101 | 1B | Camden | 1A | Willesden | |
10/06/1961 | Reallocation | 46111 | 5A | Crewe North | 1A | Willesden | |
10/06/1961 | Reallocation | 46114 | 21C | Bushbury | 6G | Llandudno Junction | |
10/06/1961 | Reallocation | 46144 | 1B | Camden | 1A | Willesden | |
10/06/1961 | Reallocation | 46152 | 5A | Crewe North | 1A | Willesden | |
10/06/1961 | Reallocation | 46161 | 21C | Bushbury | 24K | Preston | |
10/06/1961 | Reallocation | 46167 | 21C | Bushbury | 24K | Preston | |
12/06/1961 | Reallocation | 46100 | 16A | Nottingham | 16A | Derby | |
17/06/1961 | Reallocation | 46103 | 14B | Kentish Town | 21A | Saltley | |
17/06/1961 | Reallocation | 46106 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 17A | Derby | |
17/06/1961 | Reallocation | 46118 | 16A | Nottingham | 17A | Derby | |
17/06/1961 | Reallocation | 46122 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 21A | Saltley | |
17/06/1961 | Reallocation | 46123 | 14B | Kentish Town | 21A | Saltley | |
17/06/1961 | Reallocation | 46137 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 17A | Derby | |
17/06/1961 | Reallocation | 46141 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 21A | Saltley | |
17/06/1961 | Reallocation | 46157 | 5A | Crewe North | 21A | Saltley | |
17/06/1961 | Reallocation | 46160 | 14B | Kentish Town | 21A | Saltley | |
17/06/1961 | Reallocation | 46162 | 14B | Kentish Town | 21A | Saltley | |
24/06/1961 | Reallocation | 46149 | 5A | Crewe North | 9A | Longsight | |
24/06/1961 | Reallocation | 46166 | 5A | Crewe North | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | |
01/07/1961 | Reallocation | 46129 | 6J | Holyhead | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | |
01/07/1961 | Reallocation | 46166 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | 5A | Crewe North | |
08/07/1961 | Reallocation | 46154 | 8A | Edge Hill | 1A | Willesden | |
15/07/1961 | Reallocation | 46115 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | 9A | Longsight | |
11/08/1961 | Reallocation | 46100 | 16A | Nottingham | 16A | Nottingham | |
26/08/1961 | Reallocation | 46118 | 17A | Derby | 16A | Nottingham | |
26/08/1961 | Reallocation | 46118 | 16A | Nottingham | 21A | Saltley | |
02/09/1961 | Reallocation | 46106 | 17A | Derby | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | |
02/09/1961 | Reallocation | 46106 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 21A | Saltley | |
02/09/1961 | Reallocation | 46137 | 17A | Derby | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | |
02/09/1961 | Reallocation | 46137 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 21A | Saltley | |
09/09/1961 | Reallocation | 46114 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | 6J | Holyhead | |
09/09/1961 | Reallocation | 46161 | 24K | Preston | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
09/09/1961 | Reallocation | 46165 | 24K | Preston | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
09/09/1961 | Reallocation | 46167 | 24K | Preston | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
09/09/1961 | Reallocation | 46168 | 24K | Preston | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
16/09/1961 | Reallocation | 46109 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | 56F | Low Moor | |
16/09/1961 | Reallocation | 46113 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | 56F | Low Moor | |
16/09/1961 | Reallocation | 46117 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | 56F | Low Moor | |
16/09/1961 | Reallocation | 46130 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | 56F | Low Moor | |
16/09/1961 | Reallocation | 46133 | 14B | Kentish Town | 26A | Newton Heath | |
16/09/1961 | Reallocation | 46139 | 14B | Kentish Town | 26A | Newton Heath | |
16/09/1961 | Reallocation | 46140 | 14B | Kentish Town | 26A | Newton Heath | |
16/09/1961 | Reallocation | 46142 | 14B | Kentish Town | 26A | Newton Heath | |
16/09/1961 | Reallocation | 46145 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | 56F | Low Moor | |
23/09/1961 | Reallocation | 46101 | 1A | Willesden | 6G | Llandudno Junction | |
23/09/1961 | Reallocation | 46120 | 1A | Willesden | 6G | Llandudno Junction | |
23/09/1961 | Reallocation | 46144 | 1A | Willesden | 6G | Llandudno Junction | |
23/09/1961 | Reallocation | 46152 | 1A | Willesden | 6G | Llandudno Junction | |
23/09/1961 | Reallocation | 46154 | 1A | Willesden | 6G | Llandudno Junction | |
30/09/1961 | Reallocation | 46129 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | |
14/10/1961 | Reallocation | 46132 | 14B | Kentish Town | 21A | Saltley | |
28/10/1961 | Reallocation | 46110 | 5A | Crewe North | 8A | Edge Hill | |
28/10/1961 | Reallocation | 46116 | 5A | Crewe North | 8A | Edge Hill | |
28/10/1961 | Reallocation | 46134 | 5A | Crewe North | 8A | Edge Hill | |
16/12/1961 | Reallocation | 46110 | 8A | Edge Hill | 9A | Longsight | |
30/12/1961 | Reallocation | 46110 | 9A | Longsight | 8A | Edge Hill | |
06/01/1962 | Reallocation | 46131 | 41C | Sheffield Millhouses | 41D | Canklow | |
06/01/1962 | Reallocation | 46147 | 41C | Sheffield Millhouses | 41D | Canklow | |
06/01/1962 | Reallocation | 46148 | 41C | Sheffield Millhouses | 41D | Canklow | |
06/01/1962 | Reallocation | 46151 | 41C | Sheffield Millhouses | 41D | Canklow | |
06/01/1962 | Reallocation | 46164 | 5A | Crewe North | 41D | Canklow | |
13/01/1962 | Reallocation | 46113 | 56F | Low Moor | 56D | Mirfield | |
13/01/1962 | Reallocation | 46117 | 56F | Low Moor | 56D | Mirfield | |
13/01/1962 | Reallocation | 46145 | 56F | Low Moor | 56D | Mirfield | |
03/03/1962 | Reallocation | 46131 | 41D | Canklow | 6G | Llandudno Junction | |
03/03/1962 | Reallocation | 46147 | 41D | Canklow | 1A | Willesden | |
03/03/1962 | Reallocation | 46148 | 41D | Canklow | 1A | Willesden | |
10/03/1962 | Reallocation | 46129 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | 5A | Crewe North | |
10/03/1962 | Reallocation | 46152 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | 6J | Holyhead | |
10/03/1962 | Reallocation | 46154 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | 6J | Holyhead | |
21/04/1962 | Reallocation | 46148 | 1A | Willesden | 5A | Crewe North | |
21/04/1962 | Reallocation | 46169 | 5A | Crewe North | 1A | Willesden | |
05/05/1962 | Reallocation | 46125 | 5A | Crewe North | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | |
05/05/1962 | Reallocation | 46127 | 5A | Crewe North | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | |
05/05/1962 | Reallocation | 46128 | 5A | Crewe North | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | |
12/05/1962 | Reallocation | 46106 | 21A | Saltley | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | |
19/05/1962 | Reallocation | 46118 | 21A | Saltley | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | |
26/05/1962 | Reallocation | 46125 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | 5A | Crewe North | |
26/05/1962 | Reallocation | 46128 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | 5A | Crewe North | |
26/05/1962 | Reallocation | 46134 | 8A | Edge Hill | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | |
26/05/1962 | Reallocation | 46166 | 5A | Crewe North | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | |
23/06/1962 | Reallocation | 46101 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | 1A | Willesden | |
23/06/1962 | Reallocation | 46109 | 56F | Low Moor | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | |
23/06/1962 | Reallocation | 46113 | 56D | Mirfield | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | |
23/06/1962 | Reallocation | 46117 | 56D | Mirfield | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | |
23/06/1962 | Reallocation | 46130 | 56F | Low Moor | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | |
23/06/1962 | Reallocation | 46145 | 56D | Mirfield | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | |
23/06/1962 | Reallocation | 46151 | 41D | Canklow | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | |
23/06/1962 | Reallocation | 46154 | 6J | Holyhead | 1A | Willesden | |
23/06/1962 | Reallocation | 46163 | 6J | Holyhead | 1A | Willesden | |
23/06/1962 | Reallocation | 46164 | 41D | Canklow | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | |
30/06/1962 | Reallocation | 46103 | 21A | Saltley | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | |
30/06/1962 | Reallocation | 46106 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | 21A | Saltley | |
30/06/1962 | Reallocation | 46106 | 21A | Saltley | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | |
30/06/1962 | Reallocation | 46118 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | 21A | Saltley | |
30/06/1962 | Reallocation | 46118 | 21A | Saltley | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | |
30/06/1962 | Reallocation | 46122 | 21A | Saltley | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | |
30/06/1962 | Reallocation | 46123 | 21A | Saltley | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | |
30/06/1962 | Reallocation | 46132 | 21A | Saltley | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | |
30/06/1962 | Reallocation | 46137 | 21A | Saltley | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | |
30/06/1962 | Reallocation | 46157 | 21A | Saltley | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | |
30/06/1962 | Reallocation | 46160 | 21A | Saltley | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | |
30/06/1962 | Reallocation | 46162 | 21A | Saltley | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | |
30/06/1962 | Reallocation | 46167 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 5A | Crewe North | |
07/07/1962 | Reallocation | 46141 | 21A | Saltley | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | |
14/07/1962 | Reallocation | 46161 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 5A | Crewe North | |
14/07/1962 | Reallocation | 46165 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 5A | Crewe North | |
18/08/1962 | Reallocation | 46135 | 5A | Crewe North | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | |
18/08/1962 | Reallocation | 46136 | 5A | Crewe North | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | |
18/08/1962 | Reallocation | 46161 | 5A | Crewe North | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | |
15/09/1962 | Reallocation | 46103 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | |
15/09/1962 | Reallocation | 46128 | 5A | Crewe North | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
15/09/1962 | Reallocation | 46129 | 5A | Crewe North | 9A | Longsight | |
15/09/1962 | Reallocation | 46136 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | |
15/09/1962 | Reallocation | 46155 | 5A | Crewe North | 6G | Llandudno Junction | |
22/09/1962 | Reallocation | 46125 | 5A | Crewe North | 6J | Holyhead | |
22/09/1962 | Reallocation | 46148 | 5A | Crewe North | 6G | Llandudno Junction | |
22/09/1962 | Reallocation | 46165 | 5A | Crewe North | 6G | Llandudno Junction | |
22/09/1962 | Reallocation | 46167 | 5A | Crewe North | 6J | Holyhead | |
22/09/1962 | Reallocation | 46170 | 5A | Crewe North | 6G | Llandudno Junction | |
29/09/1962 | Reallocation | 46112 | 16A | Nottingham | 16D | Annesley | |
29/09/1962 | Reallocation | 46143 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 16D | Annesley | |
29/09/1962 | Reallocation | 46153 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 16D | Annesley | |
29/09/1962 | Reallocation | 46158 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 16D | Annesley | |
13/10/1962 | Condemned | 46100 | 16A | Nottingham | COND | ||
13/10/1962 | Condemned | 46139 | 26A | Newton Heath | COND | ||
03/11/1962 | Condemned | 46123 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | COND | ||
03/11/1962 | Condemned | 46131 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | COND | ||
03/11/1962 | Condemned | 46137 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | COND | ||
10/11/1962 | Reallocation | 46138 | 6J | Holyhead | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | |
26/11/1962 | Condemned | 46117 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | COND | ||
26/11/1962 | Condemned | 46161 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | COND | ||
01/12/1962 | Reallocation | 46126 | 1A | Willesden | 16D | Annesley | |
01/12/1962 | Condemned | 46134 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | COND | ||
01/12/1962 | Condemned | 46146 | 1A | Willesden | COND | ||
01/12/1962 | Condemned | 46147 | 1A | Willesden | COND | ||
01/12/1962 | Condemned | 46154 | 1A | Willesden | COND | ||
01/12/1962 | Condemned | 46159 | 1A | Willesden | COND | ||
01/12/1962 | Condemned | 46170 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | COND | ||
03/12/1962 | Condemned | 46145 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | COND | ||
08/12/1962 | Condemned | 46106 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | COND | ||
08/12/1962 | Condemned | 46127 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | COND | ||
15/12/1962 | Reallocation | 46122 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | 16D | Annesley | |
17/12/1962 | Condemned | 46113 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | COND | ||
17/12/1962 | Condemned | 46130 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | COND | ||
19/12/1962 | Condemned | 46103 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | COND | ||
22/12/1962 | Condemned | 46153 | 16D | Annesley | COND | ||
24/12/1962 | Condemned | 46135 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | COND | ||
27/12/1962 | Condemned | 46109 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 46102 | 27A | Polmadie | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 46104 | 27A | Polmadie | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 46105 | 27A | Polmadie | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 46107 | 27A | Polmadie | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 46121 | 66A | Polmadie | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 46124 | 8A | Edge Hill | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 46151 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 46164 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
05/01/1963 | Reallocation | 46101 | 1A | Willesden | 16D | Annesley | |
05/01/1963 | Reallocation | 46169 | 1A | Willesden | 16D | Annesley | |
12/01/1963 | Reallocation | 46111 | 1A | Willesden | 16D | Annesley | |
12/01/1963 | Reallocation | 46163 | 1A | Willesden | 16D | Annesley | |
26/01/1963 | Condemned | 46108 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | COND | ||
09/02/1963 | Condemned | 46138 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | COND | ||
23/02/1963 | Condemned | 46133 | 26A | Newton Heath | COND | ||
09/03/1963 | Reallocation | 46150 | 6J | Holyhead | 5A | Crewe North | |
09/03/1963 | Reallocation | 46156 | 6J | Holyhead | 1B | Camden | |
09/03/1963 | Reallocation | 46167 | 6J | Holyhead | 5A | Crewe North | |
16/03/1963 | Reallocation | 46125 | 6J | Holyhead | 5A | Crewe North | |
20/04/1963 | Reallocation | 46125 | 5A | Crewe North | 6J | Holyhead | |
20/04/1963 | Reallocation | 46150 | 5A | Crewe North | 6J | Holyhead | |
20/04/1963 | Reallocation | 46156 | 1B | Camden | 6J | Holyhead | |
20/04/1963 | Reallocation | 46167 | 5A | Crewe North | 6J | Holyhead | |
25/05/1963 | Condemned | 46169 | 16D | Annesley | COND | ||
22/06/1963 | Reallocation | 46114 | 6J | Holyhead | 1A | Willesden | |
22/06/1963 | Reallocation | 46120 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | 5A | Crewe North | |
22/06/1963 | Reallocation | 46125 | 6J | Holyhead | 1A | Willesden | |
22/06/1963 | Reallocation | 46140 | 26A | Newton Heath | 9A | Longsight | |
22/06/1963 | Reallocation | 46142 | 26A | Newton Heath | 9A | Longsight | |
22/06/1963 | Reallocation | 46144 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | 5A | Crewe North | |
22/06/1963 | Reallocation | 46150 | 6J | Holyhead | 1A | Willesden | |
22/06/1963 | Reallocation | 46155 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | 5A | Crewe North | |
22/06/1963 | Reallocation | 46156 | 6J | Holyhead | 1A | Willesden | |
22/06/1963 | Reallocation | 46157 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | |
22/06/1963 | Reallocation | 46160 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | |
22/06/1963 | Reallocation | 46165 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | 5A | Crewe North | |
22/06/1963 | Reallocation | 46167 | 6J | Holyhead | 1A | Willesden | |
29/06/1963 | Reallocation | 46110 | 8A | Edge Hill | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
06/07/1963 | Reallocation | 46110 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | |
06/07/1963 | Condemned | 46120 | 5A | Crewe North | COND | ||
17/08/1963 | Condemned | 46116 | 8A | Edge Hill | COND | ||
24/08/1963 | Reallocation | 46155 | 5A | Crewe North | 6J | Holyhead | |
09/1963 | Condemned | 46101 | 16D | Annesley | COND | ||
09/1963 | Condemned | 46149 | 9A | Longsight | COND | ||
14/09/1963 | Reallocation | 46114 | 1A | Willesden | 16B | Annesley | |
14/09/1963 | Reallocation | 46125 | 1A | Willesden | 16B | Annesley | |
14/09/1963 | Reallocation | 46150 | 1A | Willesden | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | |
14/09/1963 | Reallocation | 46155 | 6J | Holyhead | 5A | Crewe North | |
21/09/1963 | Reallocation | 46114 | 16B | Annesley | 1A | Willesden | |
21/09/1963 | Reallocation | 46167 | 1A | Willesden | 16B | Annesley | |
28/09/1963 | Condemned | 46111 | 16D | Annesley | COND | ||
28/09/1963 | Reallocation | 46114 | 1A | Willesden | 16D | Nottingham | |
28/09/1963 | Condemned | 46114 | 1A | Willesden | COND | ||
28/09/1963 | Reallocation | 46132 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | |
28/09/1963 | Reallocation | 46162 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | |
28/09/1963 | Reallocation | 46166 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | |
05/10/1963 | Condemned | 46126 | 16D | Annesley | COND | ||
12/10/1963 | Reallocation | 46156 | 1A | Willesden | 16B | Annesley | |
19/10/1963 | Condemned | 46158 | 16D | Annesley | COND | ||
16/11/1963 | Condemned | 46119 | 8A | Edge Hill | COND | ||
23/11/1963 | Condemned | 46150 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | COND | ||
07/12/1963 | Reallocation | 46148 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | 6J | Holyhead | |
21/12/1963 | Condemned | 46143 | 16D | Annesley | COND | ||
04/01/1964 | Condemned | 46157 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | COND | ||
11/01/1964 | Condemned | 46142 | 9A | Longsight | COND | ||
11/01/1964 | Condemned | 46144 | 5A | Crewe North | COND | ||
18/01/1964 | Reallocation | 46148 | 6J | Holyhead | 6G | Llandudno Junction | |
01/02/1964 | Condemned | 46132 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | COND | ||
22/02/1964 | Condemned | 46110 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | COND | ||
22/02/1964 | Reallocation | 46165 | 5A | Crewe North | 16B | Annesley | |
28/03/1964 | Condemned | 46136 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | COND | ||
11/04/1964 | Reallocation | 46148 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | 6J | Holyhead | |
11/04/1964 | Condemned | 46167 | 16B | Annesley | COND | ||
18/04/1964 | Condemned | 46141 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | COND | ||
02/05/1964 | Condemned | 46168 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | COND | ||
09/05/1964 | Condemned | 46112 | 16D | Annesley | COND | ||
30/05/1964 | Condemned | 46162 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | COND | ||
06/06/1964 | Reallocation | 46115 | 9A | Longsight | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | |
06/06/1964 | Condemned | 46129 | 9A | Longsight | COND | ||
13/06/1964 | Condemned | 46118 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | COND | ||
25/07/1964 | Reallocation | 46115 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | |
29/08/1964 | Condemned | 46163 | 16D | Annesley | COND | ||
19/09/1964 | Condemned | 46166 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | COND | ||
03/10/1964 | Condemned | 46125 | 16B | Annesley | COND | ||
10/10/1964 | Reallocation | 46140 | 9A | Longsight | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | |
10/10/1964 | Reallocation | 46155 | 5A | Crewe North | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | |
10/10/1964 | Condemned | 46156 | 16B | Annesley | COND | ||
17/10/1964 | Reallocation | 46122 | 16D | Annesley | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | |
17/10/1964 | Condemned | 46122 | 16D | Annesley | COND | ||
07/11/1964 | Reallocation | 46115 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | |
14/11/1964 | Condemned | 46148 | 6J | Holyhead | COND | ||
21/11/1964 | Reallocation | 46165 | 16B | Annesley | 5A | Crewe North | |
21/11/1964 | Condemned | 46165 | 16B | Annesley | COND | ||
12/12/1964 | Condemned | 46155 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | COND | ||
02/01/1965 | Reallocation | 46152 | 6J | Holyhead | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | |
17/04/1965 | Condemned | 46152 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | COND | ||
01/05/1965 | Condemned | 46128 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | COND | ||
01/05/1965 | Condemned | 46160 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | COND | ||
30/10/1965 | Condemned | 46140 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | COND | ||
01/01/1966 | Condemned | 46115 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | COND |