Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 97 Today
» 1006 Yesterday
» 2032 Week
» 17034 Month
» 361213 Year
» 872315 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LMS "Royal Scot (Scot)" Class 4-6-0


LMS BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
6100 46100 19/06/1930 13/10/1962 Carlisle Kingmoor 32.33 Prs Preserved
6101 46101 11/09/1927 09/1963 Annesley 36 36.62
6102 46102 11/09/1927 29/12/1962 Corkerhill 35.25 36.87
6103 46103 11/09/1927 19/12/1962 Holbeck (MR) 35.25 36.04
6104 46104 11/09/1927 29/12/1962 Corkerhill 35.25 36.87
6105 46105 11/09/1927 29/12/1962 Polmadie 35.25 36.70
6106 46106 11/09/1927 08/12/1962 Leicester (G.C.) 35.25 35.65
6107 46107 11/09/1927 29/12/1962 Polmadie 35.25 36.70
6108 46108 11/09/1927 26/01/1963 Carlisle Kingmoor 35.33 35.66
6109 46109 11/09/1927 27/12/1962 Holbeck (MR) 35.25 36.28
6110 46110 11/09/1927 22/02/1964 Carlisle Kingmoor 36.42 37.29
6111 46111 09/10/1927 28/09/1963 Annesley 35.92 36.13
6112 46112 09/10/1927 09/05/1964 Annesley 36.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1964 36.96
6113 46113 09/10/1927 17/12/1962 Holbeck (MR) 35.17 35.72
6114 46114 09/10/1927 28/09/1963 Annesley 35.92 36.54
6115 46115 09/10/1927 01/01/1966 Carlisle Kingmoor 38.25 Prs Preserved
6116 46116 09/10/1927 17/08/1963 Carlisle Kingmoor 35.83 35.96
6117 46117 06/11/1927 26/11/1962 Holbeck (MR) 35 36.13
6118 46118 06/11/1927 13/06/1964 Carlisle Kingmoor 36.58 37.05
6119 46119 06/11/1927 16/11/1963 Edge Hill 36 36.05
6120 46120 04/12/1927 06/07/1963 Crewe North 35.58 35.89
6121 46121 06/11/1927 29/12/1962 Polmadie 35.08 36.55
6122 46122 06/11/1927 17/10/1964 Carlisle Kingmoor 36.92 37.30
6123 46123 06/11/1927 03/11/1962 Carlisle Kingmoor 35 35.51
6124 46124 06/11/1927 29/12/1962 Carlisle Kingmoor 35.08 35.49
6125 46125 11/09/1927 03/10/1964 Annesley 37.08 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1965 37.37
6126 46126 11/09/1927 05/10/1963 Annesley 36.08 36.20
6127 46127 11/09/1927 08/12/1962 Carlisle Kingmoor 35.25 35.66
6128 46128 11/09/1927 01/05/1965 Carlisle Kingmoor 37.67 37.87
6129 46129 06/11/1927 06/06/1964 Longsight 36.58 37.05
6130 46130 06/11/1927 17/12/1962 Holbeck (MR) 35.08 35.96
6131 46131 11/09/1927 03/11/1962 Llandudno Junction 35.17 35.20
6132 46132 11/09/1927 01/02/1964 Carlisle Kingmoor 36.42 Cut Arnott Young (Troon) 04/1965 37.62
6133 46133 09/10/1927 23/02/1963 Newton Heath 35.33 35.65
6134 46134 09/10/1927 01/12/1962 Carlisle Kingmoor 35.17 35.56
6135 46135 09/10/1927 24/12/1962 Holbeck (MR) 35.17 35.57
6136 46136 09/10/1927 28/03/1964 Carlisle Kingmoor 36.42 36.54
6137 46137 09/10/1927 03/11/1962 Carlisle Kingmoor 35.08 35.61
6138 46138 09/10/1927 09/02/1963 Carlisle Kingmoor 35.33 35.61
6139 46139 09/10/1927 13/10/1962 Newton Heath 35 35.59
6140 46140 09/10/1927 30/10/1965 Carlisle Kingmoor 38 38.46
6141 46141 06/11/1927 18/04/1964 Carlisle Kingmoor 36.42 36.72
6142 46142 06/11/1927 11/01/1964 Longsight 36.17 36.22
6143 46143 06/11/1927 21/12/1963 Annesley 36.08 36.22
6144 46144 06/11/1927 11/01/1964 Crewe North 36.17 36.22
6145 46145 10/1927 03/12/1962 Holbeck (MR) 35.17 36.02
6146 46146 06/11/1927 01/12/1962 Willesden 35.08 35.37
6147 46147 06/11/1927 01/12/1962 Willesden 35.08 35.38
6148 46148 04/12/1927 14/11/1964 Holyhead 36.92 37.14
6149 46149 04/12/1927 09/1963 Longsight 35.75 35.97
6150 46150 02/06/1930 23/11/1963 Carlisle Kingmoor 33.42 33.56
6151 46151 11/06/1930 29/12/1962 Sheffield Darnall 32.5 33.20
6152 46152 14/08/1927 17/04/1965 Toton 37.67 37.95
6153 46153 07/1930 22/12/1962 Annesley 32.42 32.85
6154 46154 07/07/1930 01/12/1962 Willesden 32.42 32.71
6155 46155 14/07/1930 12/12/1964 Carlisle Kingmoor 34.42 Cut Arnott Young (Troon) 02/1965 34.62
6156 46156 21/07/1930 10/10/1964 Annesley 34.25 34.60
6157 46157 28/07/1930 04/01/1964 Carlisle Kingmoor 33.5 33.58
6158 46158 04/08/1930 19/10/1963 Annesley 33.17 33.30
6159 46159 11/08/1930 01/12/1962 Willesden 32.33 32.61
6160 46160 27/08/1930 01/05/1965 Carlisle Kingmoor 34.75 34.91
6161 46161 08/09/1930 26/11/1962 Holbeck (MR) 32.17 33.29
6162 46162 09/09/1930 30/05/1964 Carlisle Kingmoor 33.67 34.04
6163 46163 15/09/1930 29/08/1964 Annesley 33.92 34.44
6164 46164 22/09/1930 29/12/1962 Sheffield Darnall 32.25 32.51
6165 46165 29/09/1930 21/11/1964 Crewe North 34.17 34.48
6166 46166 06/10/1930 19/09/1964 Carlisle Kingmoor 33.92 Cut Arnott Young (Troon) 12/1964 34.22
6167 46167 13/10/1930 11/04/1964 Annesley 33.5 33.61
6168 46168 20/10/1930 02/05/1964 Carnforth 33.58 33.84
6169 46169 27/10/1930 25/05/1963 Annesley 32.58 32.82
6170 46170 12/1929 01/12/1962 Holyhead 33 33.10