LMS "7P" Class 4-6-0 - 'Royal Scot'
Class | Number | Built | Name | Name Date | Notes | Removed | Date Withdrawn |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
7P | 6100 | 19/06/1930 | THE KING'S DRAGOON GUARDSMAN | 19/06/1930 | 13/10/1962 | ||
7P | 6100 | 19/06/1930 | ROYAL SCOT | 12/1933 | 17/04/1965 | 13/10/1962 | |
7P | 6101 | 11/09/1927 | ROYAL SCOTS GREY | 11/09/1927 | 31/08/1963 | 09/1963 | |
7P | 6102 | 11/09/1927 | BLACK WATCH | 11/09/1927 | 29/12/1962 | 29/12/1962 | |
7P | 6103 | 11/09/1927 | ROYAL SCOTS FUSILIER | 11/09/1927 | 22/12/1962 | 19/12/1962 | |
7P | 6104 | 11/09/1927 | SCOTTISH BORDERER | 11/09/1927 | 29/12/1962 | 29/12/1962 | |
7P | 6105 | 11/09/1927 | CAMERON HIGHLANDER | 11/09/1927 | 29/12/1962 | 29/12/1962 | |
7P | 6106 | 11/09/1927 | GORDON HIGHLANDER | 11/09/1927 | 08/12/1962 | 08/12/1962 | |
7P | 6107 | 11/09/1927 | ARGYLL AND SUTHERLAND HIGHLANDER | 11/09/1927 | 29/12/1962 | 29/12/1962 | |
7P | 6108 | 11/09/1927 | SEAFORTH HIGHLANDER | 11/09/1927 | 26/01/1963 | 26/01/1963 | |
7P | 6109 | 11/09/1927 | ROYAL ENGINEER | 11/09/1927 | 29/12/1962 | 27/12/1962 | |
7P | 6110 | 11/09/1927 | GRENADIER GUARDSMAN | 11/09/1927 | 22/02/1964 | 22/02/1964 | |
7P | 6111 | 09/10/1927 | ROYAL FUSILIER | 09/10/1927 | 28/09/1963 | 28/09/1963 | |
7P | 6112 | 09/10/1927 | SHERWOOD FORESTER | 09/10/1927 | Name removed and bestowed upon D100 instead (new casting) | 09/09/1961 | 09/05/1964 |
7P | 6113 | 09/10/1927 | CAMERONIAN | 09/10/1927 | 22/12/1962 | 17/12/1962 | |
7P | 6114 | 09/10/1927 | COLDSTREAM GUARDSMAN | 09/10/1927 | 28/09/1963 | 28/09/1963 | |
7P | 6115 | 09/10/1927 | SCOTS GUARDSMAN | 09/10/1927 | 01/01/1966 | 01/01/1966 | |
7P | 6116 | 09/10/1927 | IRISH GUARDSMAN | 09/10/1927 | 17/08/1963 | 17/08/1963 | |
7P | 6117 | 06/11/1927 | WELSH GUARDSMAN | 06/11/1927 | 01/12/1962 | 26/11/1962 | |
7P | 6118 | 06/11/1927 | ROYAL WELCH FUSILIER | 06/11/1927 | 13/06/1964 | 13/06/1964 | |
7P | 6119 | 06/11/1927 | LANCASHIRE FUSILIER | 06/11/1927 | 16/11/1963 | 16/11/1963 | |
7P | 6120 | 04/12/1927 | ROYAL INNISKILLING FUSILIER | 04/12/1927 | 06/07/1963 | 06/07/1963 | |
7P | 6121 | 06/11/1927 | HIGHLAND LIGHT INFANTRY, CITY OF GLASGOW REGIMENT | 06/11/1927 | 29/12/1962 | 29/12/1962 | |
7P | 6122 | 06/11/1927 | ROYAL ULSTER RIFLEMAN | 06/11/1927 | 17/10/1964 | 17/10/1964 | |
7P | 6123 | 06/11/1927 | ROYAL IRISH FUSILIER | 06/11/1927 | 03/11/1962 | 03/11/1962 | |
7P | 6124 | 06/11/1927 | LONDON SCOTTISH | 06/11/1927 | 29/12/1962 | 29/12/1962 | |
7P | 6125 | 11/09/1927 | 3RD CARABINIER | 11/09/1927 | 03/10/1964 | 03/10/1964 | |
7P | 6126 | 11/09/1927 | ROYAL ARMY SERVICE CORPS | 11/09/1927 | 05/10/1963 | 05/10/1963 | |
7P | 6127 | 11/09/1927 | OLD CONTEMPTIBLES | 11/09/1927 | 08/12/1962 | 08/12/1962 | |
7P | 6128 | 11/09/1927 | THE LOVAT SCOUTS | 11/09/1927 | 01/05/1965 | 01/05/1965 | |
7P | 6129 | 06/11/1927 | THE SCOTTISH HORSE | 06/11/1927 | 06/06/1964 | 06/06/1964 | |
7P | 6130 | 06/11/1927 | THE WEST YORKSHIRE REGIMENT | 06/11/1927 | 22/12/1962 | 17/12/1962 | |
7P | 6131 | 11/09/1927 | THE ROYAL WARWICKSHIRE REGIMENT | 11/09/1927 | 03/11/1962 | 03/11/1962 | |
7P | 6132 | 11/09/1927 | THE KING'S REGIMENT LIVERPOOL | 11/09/1927 | 01/02/1964 | 01/02/1964 | |
7P | 6133 | 09/10/1927 | THE GREEN HOWARDS | 09/10/1927 | 23/02/1963 | 23/02/1963 | |
7P | 6134 | 09/10/1927 | THE CHESHIRE REGIMENT | 09/10/1927 | 01/12/1962 | 01/12/1962 | |
7P | 6135 | 09/10/1927 | THE EAST LANCASHIRE REGIMENT | 09/10/1927 | 29/12/1962 | 24/12/1962 | |
7P | 6136 | 09/10/1927 | THE BORDER REGIMENT | 09/10/1927 | 28/03/1964 | 28/03/1964 | |
7P | 6137 | 09/10/1927 | THE PRINCE OF WALES'S VOLUNTEERS (SOUTH LANCASHIRE) | 09/10/1927 | 03/11/1962 | 03/11/1962 | |
7P | 6138 | 09/10/1927 | THE LONDON IRISH RIFLEMAN | 09/10/1927 | 09/02/1963 | 09/02/1963 | |
7P | 6139 | 09/10/1927 | THE WELCH REGIMENT | 09/10/1927 | 13/10/1962 | 13/10/1962 | |
7P | 6140 | 09/10/1927 | THE KING'S ROYAL RIFLE CORPS | 09/10/1927 | 30/10/1965 | 30/10/1965 | |
7P | 6141 | 06/11/1927 | THE NORTH STAFFORDSHIRE REGIMENT | 06/11/1927 | 18/04/1964 | 18/04/1964 | |
7P | 6142 | 06/11/1927 | THE YORK AND LANCASTER REGIMENT | 06/11/1927 | 11/01/1964 | 11/01/1964 | |
7P | 6143 | 06/11/1927 | THE SOUTH STAFFORDSHIRE REGIMENT | 06/11/1927 | 21/12/1963 | 21/12/1963 | |
7P | 6144 | 06/11/1927 | HONOURABLE ARTILLERY COMPANY | 06/11/1927 | 11/01/1964 | 11/01/1964 | |
7P | 6145 | 10/1927 | THE DUKE OF WELLINGTON'S REGT. (WEST RIDING) | 12/1927 | 08/12/1962 | 03/12/1962 | |
7P | 6146 | 06/11/1927 | THE RIFLE BRIGADE | 06/11/1927 | 01/12/1962 | 01/12/1962 | |
7P | 6147 | 06/11/1927 | THE NORTHAMPTONSHIRE REGIMENT | 06/11/1927 | 01/12/1962 | 01/12/1962 | |
7P | 6148 | 04/12/1927 | THE MANCHESTER REGIMENT | 04/12/1927 | 14/11/1964 | 14/11/1964 | |
7P | 6149 | 04/12/1927 | THE MIDDLESEX REGIMENT | 04/12/1927 | 31/08/1963 | 09/1963 | |
7P | 6150 | 02/06/1930 | THE LIFE GUARDSMAN | 02/06/1930 | 23/11/1963 | 23/11/1963 | |
7P | 6151 | 11/06/1930 | THE ROYAL HORSE GUARDSMAN | 11/06/1930 | 29/12/1962 | 29/12/1962 | |
7P | 6152 | 14/08/1927 | ROYAL SCOT | 14/08/1927 | 12/1933 | 17/04/1965 | |
7P | 6152 | 14/08/1927 | THE KING'S DRAGOON GUARDSMAN | 12/1933 | 13/10/1962 | 17/04/1965 | |
7P | 6153 | 07/1930 | THE ROYAL DRAGOON | 06/1930 | 22/12/1962 | 22/12/1962 | |
7P | 6154 | 07/07/1930 | THE HUSSAR | 07/07/1930 | 01/12/1962 | 01/12/1962 | |
7P | 6155 | 14/07/1930 | THE LANCER | 14/07/1930 | 12/12/1964 | 12/12/1964 | |
7P | 6156 | 21/07/1930 | THE SOUTH WALES BORDERER | 21/07/1930 | 10/10/1964 | 10/10/1964 | |
7P | 6157 | 28/07/1930 | THE ROYAL ARTILLERYMAN | 28/07/1930 | 04/01/1964 | 04/01/1964 | |
7P | 6158 | 04/08/1930 | THE LOYAL REGIMENT | 04/08/1930 | 19/10/1963 | 19/10/1963 | |
7P | 6159 | 11/08/1930 | THE ROYAL AIR FORCE | 11/08/1930 | 01/12/1962 | 01/12/1962 | |
7P | 6160 | 27/08/1930 | QUEEN VICTORIA'S RIFLEMAN | 27/08/1930 | 01/05/1965 | 01/05/1965 | |
7P | 6161 | 08/09/1930 | KING'S OWN | 08/09/1930 | 01/12/1962 | 26/11/1962 | |
7P | 6162 | 09/09/1930 | QUEEN'S WESTMINSTER RIFLEMAN | 09/09/1930 | 30/05/1964 | 30/05/1964 | |
7P | 6163 | 15/09/1930 | CIVIL SERVICE RIFLEMAN | 15/09/1930 | 29/08/1964 | 29/08/1964 | |
7P | 6164 | 22/09/1930 | THE ARTISTS' RIFLEMAN | 22/09/1930 | 29/12/1962 | 29/12/1962 | |
7P | 6165 | 29/09/1930 | THE RANGER (12TH LONDON REGT.) | 29/09/1930 | 21/11/1964 | 21/11/1964 | |
7P | 6166 | 06/10/1930 | LONDON RIFLE BRIGADE | 06/10/1930 | 19/09/1964 | 19/09/1964 | |
7P | 6167 | 13/10/1930 | THE HERTFORDSHIRE REGIMENT | 13/10/1930 | 11/04/1964 | 11/04/1964 | |
7P | 6168 | 20/10/1930 | THE GIRL GUIDE | 20/10/1930 | 02/05/1964 | 02/05/1964 | |
7P | 6169 | 27/10/1930 | THE BOY SCOUT | 27/10/1930 | 25/05/1963 | 25/05/1963 |