Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1893 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 15936 Week
» 80890 Month
» 283554 Year
» 3310407 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
"PETRO" Class 0-4-0
BR |
Date To Service |
Depot Delivered To |
Date Withdrawn |
Depot Withdrawn From |
Svc Age (Yrs) |
Fate |
Where |
When |
Tot Age (Yrs) |
15
|
01/01/1923 |
|
01/01/1951 |
|
28 |
|
|
|
|
23
|
01/01/1925 |
|
05/07/1960 |
|
35.5 |
|
|
|
|
24
|
01/01/1926 |
|
01/01/1960 |
|
34 |
|
|
|
|
26
|
01/01/1927 |
|
05/07/1960 |
|
33.5 |
|
|
|
|
27
|
01/01/1926 |
|
05/07/1960 |
|
34.5 |
|
|
|
|