57 Co-Co
BR (Pre Tops) | BR (47/0) | BR (47/3) | BR (47/4) | BR (47/7) | BR (47/8) | BR (57/0) | BR (57/6) | BR (57/3) | Date To Service | Bld | Rebuilt From | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) | Name |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
D1611 | 47032 | 47662 | 47817 | 57311 | 18/08/1964 | CW | 31/07/2003 from 47 |
Landore | 59.39 | |||||||||||
D1618 | 47037 | 47563 | 47831 | 57310 | 05/09/1964 | CW | 30/08/2003 from 47 |
Toton | 59.34 | |||||||||||
D1639 | 47055 | 47652 | 47807 | 57304 | 14/12/1964 | CW | 30/08/2002 from 47 |
Cardiff Canton | 59.07 | |||||||||||
D1644 | 47060 | 57008 | 23/12/1964 | CW | 26/11/1999 from 47 |
Cardiff Canton | 59.04 | Freightliner Explorer | ||||||||||||
D1653 | 47069 | 47638 | 47845 | 57301 | 16/01/1965 | CW | 31/05/2002 from 47 |
Cardiff Canton | 58.98 | |||||||||||
D1664 | 47079 | 57009 | 27/02/1965 | CW | 22/12/1999 from 47 |
Landore | 58.86 | GEORGE JACKSON CHURCHWARD | ||||||||||||
D1677 | 47091 | 47647 | 47846 | 57308 | 24/04/1965 | CW | 08/05/2003 from 47 |
Cardiff Canton | 58.71 | THOR | ||||||||||
D1758 | 47164 | 47571 | 47822 | 57305 | 23/05/1964 | BH | 19/12/2002 from 47 |
Tinsley | 59.63 | |||||||||||
D1759 | 47165 | 47590 | 47825 | 57601 | 25/08/1964 | BH | 12/04/2001 from 47 |
Tinsley | 59.37 | |||||||||||
D1798 | 47317 | 57003 | 29/01/1965 | BH | 07/01/1999 from 47 |
Tinsley | 58.94 | Freightliner Evolution | ||||||||||||
D1803 | 47322 | 57002 | 21/01/1965 | BH | 23/11/1998 from 47 |
Tinsley | 58.96 | Freightliner Phoenix | ||||||||||||
D1810 | 47329 | 57011 | 09/02/1965 | BH | 20/02/2000 from 47 |
Nottingham Division | 58.91 | Freightliner Challenger | ||||||||||||
D1811 | 47330 | 57312 | 09/02/1965 | BH | 31/10/2003 from 47 |
Nottingham Division | 58.91 | |||||||||||||
D1813 | 47332 | 57007 | 22/02/1965 | BH | 28/10/1999 from 47 |
Nottingham Division | 58.88 | Freightliner Bond | ||||||||||||
D1818 | 47337 | 57602 | 18/02/1965 | BH | 30/11/2003 from 47 |
Nottingham Division | 58.89 | |||||||||||||
D1828 | 47347 | 57004 | 10/03/1965 | BH | 25/02/1999 from 47 |
Nottingham Division | 58.83 | Freightliner Quality | ||||||||||||
D1830 | 47349 | 57603 | 18/03/1965 | BH | 31/12/2003 from 47 |
Nottingham Division | 58.81 | |||||||||||||
D1831 | 47350 | 57005 | 27/04/1965 | BH | 01/04/1999 from 47 |
Nottingham Division | 58.70 | Freightliner Excellence | ||||||||||||
D1837 | 47187 | 57006 | 04/05/1965 | BH | 04/05/1999 from 47 |
Crewe North | 58.68 | Freightliner Reliance | ||||||||||||
D1854 | 47204 | 57012 | 02/07/1965 | CW | 20/03/2000 from 47 |
Crewe Diesel | 58.52 | Freightliner Envoy | ||||||||||||
D1856 | 47206 | 57605 | 06/08/1965 | CW | 30/09/2004 from 47 |
Crewe Diesel | 58.42 | |||||||||||||
D1859 | 47209 | 57604 | 21/08/1965 | CW | 28/02/2004 from 47 |
Crewe Diesel | 58.38 | |||||||||||||
D1875 | 47356 | 57001 | 02/07/1965 | BH | 17/07/1998 from 47 |
Immingham | 58.52 | Freightliner Pioneer | ||||||||||||
D1890 | 47371 | 57313 | 23/07/1965 | BH | 04/10/2004 from 47 |
Tinsley | 58.46 | |||||||||||||
D1891 | 47372 | 57314 | 06/08/1965 | BH | 25/10/2004 from 47 |
Tinsley | 58.42 | |||||||||||||
D1901 | 47225 | 57307 | 20/09/1965 | BH | 31/08/2003 from 47 |
Cardiff Canton | 58.30 | |||||||||||||
D1907 | 47231 | 57010 | 17/09/1965 | BH | 24/01/2000 from 47 |
Cardiff Canton | 58.31 | Freightliner Crusader | ||||||||||||
D1911 | 47234 | 57315 | 26/10/1965 | BH | 23/11/2004 from 47 |
Cardiff Canton | 58.20 | |||||||||||||
D1919 | 47242 | 47659 | 47814 | 57306 | 22/11/1965 | BH | 31/03/2003 from 47 |
Cardiff Canton | 58.13 | |||||||||||
D1928 | 47251 | 47589 | 47827 | 57302 | 21/01/1966 | BH | 31/07/2002 from 47 |
Bristol Bath Road | 57.96 | |||||||||||
D1931 | 47254 | 47651 | 47806 | 57309 | 21/02/1966 | BH | 30/06/2003 from 47 |
Bristol Bath Road | 57.88 | |||||||||||
D1957 | 47261 | 47554 | 47705 | 57303 | 28/01/1967 | BH | 27/02/2003 from 47 |
Western Lines (LMR) | 56.95 | |||||||||||
D1992 | 47290 | 57316 | 15/03/1966 | CW | 20/12/2004 from 47 |
York (North) | 57.82 |