162
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
28/01/1957 | To Service | 59060 | NEW | 51A | Darlington | |
04/02/1957 | To Service | 59061 | NEW | 51A | Darlington | |
11/02/1957 | To Service | 59062 | NEW | 51A | Darlington | |
15/02/1957 | To Service | 59063 | NEW | 51A | Darlington | |
28/02/1957 | To Service | 59064 | NEW | 51A | Darlington | |
28/02/1957 | To Service | 59066 | NEW | 51A | Darlington | |
06/03/1957 | To Service | 59067 | NEW | 51A | Darlington | |
14/03/1957 | To Service | 59068 | NEW | 51A | Darlington | |
19/03/1957 | To Service | 59065 | NEW | 51A | Darlington | |
25/03/1957 | To Service | 59069 | NEW | 51A | Darlington | |
29/03/1957 | To Service | 59070 | NEW | 51A | Darlington | |
04/04/1957 | To Service | 59071 | NEW | 51A | Darlington | |
12/04/1957 | To Service | 59072 | NEW | 51A | Darlington | |
13/11/1957 | To Service | 59302 | NEW | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | |
21/11/1957 | To Service | 59303 | NEW | 51A | Darlington | |
26/11/1957 | To Service | 59304 | NEW | 51A | Darlington | |
31/07/1967 | Condemned | 59044 | SGosfo | COND | ||
27/09/1987 | Reallocation | 59069 | 51A | Darlington | NL | Neville Hill |
29/09/1987 | Condemned | 59047 | SGOSFO | COND | ||
29/09/1987 | Condemned | 59088 | SGosfo | COND | ||
15/01/1988 | Condemned | 59060 | 51A | Darlington | COND | |
18/01/1988 | Condemned | 59063 | 51A | Darlington | COND | |
18/01/1988 | Condemned | 59067 | 51A | Darlington | COND | |
18/01/1988 | Condemned | 59071 | 51A | Darlington | COND | |
09/09/1988 | Condemned | 59045 | SGosfo | COND |