162
BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) | Name |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
59042 | 17/10/1956 | 67.49 | ||||||||
59043 | 17/10/1956 | 67.49 | ||||||||
59044 | 23/10/1956 | 31/07/1967 | 10.75 | 67.48 | ||||||
59045 | 09/11/1956 | 09/09/1988 | Haymarket | 31.83 | 67.43 | |||||
59046 | 09/11/1956 | 67.43 | ||||||||
59047 | 21/11/1956 | 29/09/1987 | Ayr | 30.83 | 67.40 | |||||
59048 | 30/11/1956 | 67.37 | ||||||||
59060 | 28/01/1957 | Darlington | 15/01/1988 | 31 | 67.21 | |||||
59061 | 04/02/1957 | Darlington | 67.19 | |||||||
59062 | 11/02/1957 | Darlington | 67.17 | |||||||
59063 | 15/02/1957 | Darlington | 18/01/1988 | Ayr | 30.92 | 67.16 | ||||
59064 | 28/02/1957 | Darlington | 67.13 | |||||||
59065 | 19/03/1957 | Darlington | 67.07 | |||||||
59066 | 28/02/1957 | Darlington | 67.13 | |||||||
59067 | 06/03/1957 | Darlington | 18/01/1988 | Ayr | 30.83 | 67.11 | ||||
59068 | 14/03/1957 | Darlington | 67.09 | |||||||
59069 | 25/03/1957 | Darlington | 67.06 | |||||||
59070 | 29/03/1957 | Darlington | 67.05 | |||||||
59071 | 04/04/1957 | Darlington | 18/01/1988 | Ayr | 30.75 | 67.03 | ||||
59072 | 12/04/1957 | Darlington | 67.01 | |||||||
59086 | 17/09/1957 | 66.58 | ||||||||
59087 | 24/09/1957 | 66.56 | ||||||||
59088 | 01/10/1957 | 29/09/1987 | Ayr | 29.92 | 66.54 | |||||
59089 | 08/10/1957 | 66.52 | ||||||||
59090 | 15/10/1957 | 66.50 | ||||||||
59091 | 22/10/1957 | 66.48 | ||||||||
59302 | 13/11/1957 | Bradford Hammerton Street | 66.42 | |||||||
59303 | 21/11/1957 | Darlington | 66.40 | |||||||
59304 | 26/11/1957 | Darlington | 66.38 | |||||||
59305 | 05/11/1957 | 66.44 | ||||||||
59306 | 12/11/1957 | 66.42 |