05 0-6-0
Date | Number (at time) | Depot (at time) | Code | Details | Ref | Link |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sat 11/02/1961 | D2589 | 56A | Darlington Works visit.: Around the works. - Works yard. | |||
Sun 25/03/1962 | D2589 | 56A | Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Crossing. | SLS 5/1962 | ||
Sat 29/04/1967 | D2565, D2568, D2569 |
Wdn, 8F, 8F |
A visit to Wigan Springs Branch shed: On shed A visit to Wigan Springs Branch shed: On shed A visit to Wigan Springs Branch shed: On shed |
John Thickitt | ||
Sat 14/10/1967 | D2586, D2588, D2591, D2594, D2606 |
Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn |
Slag Reduction Co., Ickles scrapyard: Noted still intact in the scrapyard of the Slag Reduction Co., Ickles (Rotherham) Slag Reduction Co., Ickles scrapyard: Noted still intact in the scrapyard of the Slag Reduction Co., Ickles (Rotherham) Slag Reduction Co., Ickles scrapyard: Noted still intact in the scrapyard of the Slag Reduction Co., Ickles (Rotherham) Slag Reduction Co., Ickles scrapyard: Noted still intact in the scrapyard of the Slag Reduction Co., Ickles (Rotherham) Slag Reduction Co., Ickles scrapyard: Noted still intact in the scrapyard of the Slag Reduction Co., Ickles (Rotherham) |
RCTS 1/1968 | ||
Sun 05/11/1967 | D2596 | 64H | Millerhill stabling point: On Millerhill stabling point. | RCTS 1/1968 | ||
Sun 14/04/1968 | D2574, D2575, D2576, D2579, D2582 |
62B, 62B, 62A, 62A, 62A |
Thornton Junction: Stored at Thornton Jct. Thornton Junction: Stored at Thornton Jct. Thornton Junction: Stored at Thornton Jct. Thornton Junction: Stored at Thornton Jct. Thornton Junction: Stored at Thornton Jct. |
RCTS 6/1968 | ||
Mon 01/09/1969 | D2573 | Wdn | Eastfield Triangle: Dumped on Eastfield triangle. | RO 9/1969 | ||
Wed 24/09/1969 | D2573 | Wdn | Departed Eastfield for McWilliams, Shettleston | RO 11/1969 | ||
Tue 03/08/1971 | D2599 | Wdn | NCB Frickley Colliery | RO 3/1972 | ||
Thu 05/08/1971 | D2607 | Wdn | NCB Shireoaks Colliery | RO 4/1972 | ||
Thu 05/08/1971 | D2607 | Wdn | NCB Shireoaks Colliery - Still in BR livery | RO 3/1972 | ||
Fri 06/08/1971 | D2611 | Wdn | NCB Yorkshire Main Colliery | RO 3/1972 | ||
Fri 06/08/1971 | D2598 | Wdn | NCB Askern Colliery - Named 'Sam' | RO 3/1972 | ||
Fri 06/08/1971 | D2616 | Wdn | NCB Halfield Colliery | RO 3/1972 | ||
Thu 23/12/1971 | D2598 | Wdn | NCB Askern Colliery - Named 'Sam' | RO 4/1972 | ||
Tue 04/01/1972 | D2607 | Wdn | NCB Steetley Colliery - Working | RO 4/1972 |