05 0-6-0
BR (1955 Num) | BR (Pre Tops) | BR | BR (Tops) | Date To Service | Bld | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) | Name | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
D2574 | 18/07/1958 | HU | Stranraer | 08/06/1968 | 9.92 | Cut | Campbells (Airdrie) | 12/1968 | 10.42 | ||||||
D2575 | 30/07/1958 | HU | Stranraer | 08/06/1968 | 9.92 | Cut | Campbells (Airdrie) | 12/1968 | 10.39 | ||||||
D2576 | 30/07/1958 | HU | Thornton Junction | 08/06/1968 | 9.92 | Cut | Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) | 08/1968 | 10.05 | ||||||
D2577 | 30/07/1958 | HU | Thornton Junction | 24/06/1967 | 8.92 | Cut | Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) | 09/1967 | 9.13 | ||||||
D2578 | 18/11/1958 | HU | Thornton Junction | 07/07/1967 | 8.67 | Prs | Preserved | 65.16 | |||||||
D2579 | 25/11/1958 | HU | Thornton Junction | 08/06/1968 | 9.58 | Cut | Campbells (Airdrie) | 01/1969 | 10.15 | ||||||
D2580 | 01/12/1958 | HU | Thornton Junction | 08/06/1968 | 9.5 | Cut | Campbells (Airdrie) | 12/1968 | 10.05 | ||||||
D2581 | 09/12/1958 | HU | Thornton Junction | 08/06/1968 | 9.5 | Cut | Campbells (Airdrie) | 12/1968 | 10.02 | ||||||
D2582 | 30/01/1959 | HU | Thornton Junction | 08/06/1968 | 9.42 | Cut | Campbells (Airdrie) | 01/1969 | 9.97 | ||||||
D2583 | 30/01/1959 | HU | Thornton Junction | 08/06/1968 | 9.42 | Cut | Campbells (Airdrie) | 01/1969 | 9.97 | ||||||
D2584 | 28/02/1959 | HU | Thornton Junction | 07/07/1967 | 8.42 | Cut | Hunslet (Leeds) | 08/1968 | 9.47 | ||||||
D2585 | 13/04/1959 | HU | Thornton Junction | 08/06/1968 | 9.17 | Cut | Campbells (Airdrie) | 01/1969 | 9.77 | ||||||
D2586 | 05/11/1959 | HU | Ardsley | 12/03/1967 | 7.33 | Cut | Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) | 15/10/1967 | 7.95 | ||||||
D2587 | 10/11/1959 | HU | Wakefield | 30/12/1967 | 8.08 | Prs | Preserved | 64.18 | |||||||
D2588 | 24/11/1959 | HU | Wakefield | 12/03/1967 | 7.33 | Cut | Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) | 07/1967 | 7.64 | ||||||
D2589 | 01/12/1959 | HU | Wakefield | 30/12/1967 | 8 | Cut | Campbells (Airdrie) | 12/1968 | 9.05 | ||||||
D2590 | 14/12/1959 | HU | Wakefield | 08/06/1968 | 8.5 | Cut | Campbells (Airdrie) | 01/1969 | 9.10 | ||||||
D2591 | 08/12/1959 | HU | Wakefield | 12/03/1967 | 7.25 | Cut | Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) | 15/10/1969 | 9.86 | ||||||
D2592 | 18/12/1959 | HU | Wakefield | 02/03/1968 | 8.25 | Cut | Campbells (Airdrie) | 02/1969 | 9.17 | ||||||
D2593 | 30/12/1959 | HU | Wakefield | 30/12/1967 | 8 | Cut | Hunslet (Leeds) | 10/1968 | 8.80 | ||||||
D2594 | 19/01/1960 | HU | Percy Main | 12/03/1967 | 7.17 | Cut | Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) | 07/1967 | 7.49 | ||||||
D2595 | 30/01/1960 | HU | York (North) | 08/06/1968 | 8.42 | Prs | Preserved | 63.96 | |||||||
D2596 | 15/02/1960 | HU | Holbeck (MR) | 08/06/1968 | 8.33 | Cut | Campbells (Airdrie) | 01/1969 | 8.92 | ||||||
D2597 | 28/06/1960 | HU | Holbeck (MR) | 30/12/1967 | 7.5 | Cut | Campbells (Airdrie) | 01/1969 | 8.56 | ||||||
D2598 | 30/06/1960 | HU | York (North) | 30/12/1967 | 7.5 | Cut | National Coal Board (Philadelphia) | 05/1975 | 14.88 | ||||||
D2599 | 08/07/1960 | HU | York (North) | 30/12/1967 | 7.42 | Cut | National Coal Board (Askern) | 05/1981 | 20.87 | ||||||
D2600 | 13/07/1960 | HU | York (North) | 30/12/1967 | 7.42 | Cut | Duport Steels (Briton Ferry) | 06/1971 | 10.93 | ||||||
D2601 | 20/07/1960 | HU | York (North) | 30/12/1967 | 7.42 | Cut | Duport Steels (Llanelli) | 09/1979 | 19.17 | ||||||
D2602 | 28/07/1960 | HU | York (North) | 06/07/1967 | 7 | Cut | Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) | 12/1967 | 7.39 | ||||||
D2603 | 16/09/1960 | HU | Ardsley | 12/08/1967 | 6.92 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 03/1968 | 7.50 | ||||||
D2604 | 30/09/1960 | HU | Ardsley | 30/12/1967 | 7.25 | Cut | Cohens (Morriston) | 06/1968 | 7.71 | ||||||
D2605 | 24/09/1960 | HU | Ardsley | 30/12/1967 | 7.25 | Cut | Cohens (Morriston) | 06/1968 | 7.73 | ||||||
D2606 | 08/10/1960 | HU | Ardsley | 11/02/1967 | 6.33 | Cut | Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) | 12/1967 | 7.19 | ||||||
D2607 | 18/10/1960 | HU | Ardsley | 30/12/1967 | 7.17 | Cut | Coopers Metals (Sheffield) | 06/1984 | 23.67 | ||||||
D2608 | 09/12/1960 | HU | Ardsley | 30/12/1967 | 7 | Cut | Campbells (Airdrie) | 01/1969 | 8.11 | ||||||
D2609 | 13/12/1960 | HU | Goole | 30/12/1967 | 7 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 05/1968 | 7.42 | ||||||
D2610 | 21/12/1960 | HU | Goole | 04/12/1967 | 7 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 08/1968 | 7.65 | ||||||
D2611 | 16/01/1961 | HU | Goole | 30/12/1967 | 6.92 | Cut | National Coal Board (Yorkshire Main) | 11/1976 | 15.84 | ||||||
D2612 | 88 | 30/01/1961 | HU | Darlington | 23/09/1967 | 6.67 | Cut | Argosy Salvage (Shettleston) | 12/1967 | 6.88 | |||||
D2613 | 21/02/1961 | HU | Goole | 30/12/1967 | 6.83 | Cut | National Coal Board (Bentley) | 06/1977 | 16.32 | ||||||
D2614 | 27/02/1961 | HU | Goole | 12/03/1967 | 6.08 | Cut | Drapers (Hull) | 06/1967 | 6.30 | ||||||
89 | D2615 | 08/03/1961 | HU | Percy Main | 30/12/1967 | 6.75 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 08/1968 | 7.44 | |||||
D2616 | 17/03/1961 | HU | Percy Main | 30/12/1967 | 6.75 | Cut | National Coal Board (Hatfield Main) | 06/1973 | 12.25 | ||||||
D2617 | 28/03/1961 | HU | Darlington | 30/12/1967 | 6.75 | Cut | Hunslet (Leeds) | 04/1976 | 15.06 | ||||||
D2618 | 11/04/1961 | HU | Darlington | 08/06/1968 | 7.17 | Cut | Campbells (Airdrie) | 01/1969 | 7.77 |