104
BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) | Name |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
50424 | ||||||||||
50425 | 27/04/1957 | Longsight | 67.02 | |||||||
50426 | 11/05/1957 | Longsight | 66.98 | |||||||
50427 | 18/05/1957 | Longsight | 66.96 | |||||||
50480 | 25/05/1957 | Longsight | 66.94 | |||||||
50481 | 01/06/1957 | Longsight | 66.92 | |||||||
50482 | 08/06/1957 | Longsight | 66.90 | |||||||
50483 | 15/06/1957 | Longsight | 66.88 | |||||||
50484 | ||||||||||
50485 | ||||||||||
50486 | ||||||||||
50487 | ||||||||||
50488 | ||||||||||
50489 | ||||||||||
50490 | ||||||||||
50491 | ||||||||||
50492 | ||||||||||
50493 | ||||||||||
50494 | ||||||||||
50495 | ||||||||||
50496 | ||||||||||
50497 | ||||||||||
50498 | ||||||||||
50499 | ||||||||||
50500 | ||||||||||
50501 | ||||||||||
50502 | ||||||||||
50503 | ||||||||||
50504 | ||||||||||
50505 | ||||||||||
50506 | ||||||||||
50507 | ||||||||||
50508 | ||||||||||
50509 | ||||||||||
50510 | ||||||||||
50511 | ||||||||||
50512 | ||||||||||
50513 | 16/11/1963 | |||||||||
50514 | ||||||||||
50515 | ||||||||||
50516 | ||||||||||
50517 | ||||||||||
50518 | ||||||||||
50519 | ||||||||||
50520 | ||||||||||
50521 | ||||||||||
50522 | ||||||||||
50523 | ||||||||||
50524 | ||||||||||
50525 | 15/07/1987 | Ayr | ||||||||
50526 | ||||||||||
50527 | ||||||||||
50528 | ||||||||||
50529 | ||||||||||
50530 | ||||||||||
50531 | ||||||||||
50542 | 06/06/1958 | Darlington | 65.91 | |||||||
50543 | 16/06/1958 | 65.88 | ||||||||
50544 | 26/06/1958 | Darlington | 65.85 | |||||||
50545 | 04/07/1958 | 65.83 | ||||||||
50546 | 11/07/1958 | 65.81 | ||||||||
50547 | 18/07/1958 | Hull Springhead | 65.79 | |||||||
50548 | 25/07/1958 | Hull Springhead | 65.78 | |||||||
50549 | 19/08/1958 | Hull Springhead | 65.71 | |||||||
50550 | 28/08/1958 | Hull Springhead | 65.68 | |||||||
50551 | 05/09/1958 | Hull Springhead | 65.66 | |||||||
50552 | 12/09/1958 | Hull Springhead | 27/04/1978 | Neville Hill | 19.58 | 65.64 | ||||
50553 | 19/09/1958 | Hull Springhead | 65.62 | |||||||
50554 | 25/09/1958 | Hull Springhead | 65.61 | |||||||
50555 | 02/10/1958 | 65.59 | ||||||||
50556 | 10/10/1958 | 65.56 | ||||||||
50557 | 18/10/1958 | Hull Springhead | 65.54 | |||||||
50558 | 25/10/1958 | Hull Springhead | 31/07/1967 | 8.75 | 65.52 | |||||
50559 | 04/11/1958 | Hull Springhead | 19/09/1977 | Neville Hill | 18.83 | 65.50 | ||||
50560 | 13/11/1958 | Hull Springhead | 65.47 | |||||||
50561 | 26/11/1958 | Hull Botanic Gardens | 65.44 | |||||||
50562 | 04/12/1958 | Hull Botanic Gardens | 65.41 | |||||||
50563 | 06/06/1958 | Darlington | 65.91 | |||||||
50564 | 16/06/1958 | 65.88 | ||||||||
50565 | 26/06/1958 | Darlington | 65.85 | |||||||
50566 | 04/07/1958 | 65.83 | ||||||||
50567 | 11/07/1958 | 65.81 | ||||||||
50568 | 18/07/1958 | Hull Springhead | 65.79 | |||||||
50569 | 25/07/1958 | Hull Springhead | 23/08/1969 | Neville Hill | 11.08 | 65.78 | ||||
50570 | 19/08/1958 | Hull Springhead | 65.71 | |||||||
50571 | 28/08/1958 | Hull Springhead | 65.68 | |||||||
50572 | 05/09/1958 | Hull Springhead | 65.66 | |||||||
50573 | 12/09/1958 | Hull Springhead | 65.64 | |||||||
50574 | 19/09/1958 | Hull Springhead | 65.62 | |||||||
50575 | 25/09/1958 | Hull Springhead | 65.61 | |||||||
50576 | 02/10/1958 | 65.59 | ||||||||
50577 | 10/10/1958 | 65.56 | ||||||||
50578 | 18/10/1958 | Hull Springhead | 65.54 | |||||||
50579 | 25/10/1958 | Hull Springhead | 65.52 | |||||||
50580 | 04/11/1958 | Hull Springhead | 65.50 | |||||||
50581 | 13/11/1958 | Hull Springhead | 65.47 | |||||||
50582 | 26/11/1958 | Hull Botanic Gardens | 65.44 | |||||||
50583 | 04/12/1958 | Hull Botanic Gardens | 65.41 | |||||||
50584 | 18/12/1958 | York (North) | 65.38 | |||||||
50585 | 29/12/1958 | Hull Botanic Gardens | 65.35 | |||||||
50586 | 15/01/1959 | Neville Hill | 65.30 | |||||||
50587 | 31/01/1959 | 65.25 | ||||||||
50588 | 12/03/1959 | Hull Botanic Gardens | 65.15 | |||||||
50589 | 18/12/1958 | York (North) | 65.38 | |||||||
50590 | 29/12/1958 | Hull Botanic Gardens | 65.35 | |||||||
50591 | 15/01/1959 | Neville Hill | 65.30 | |||||||
50592 | 31/01/1959 | 31/07/1967 | 8.5 | 65.25 | ||||||
50593 | 12/03/1959 | Hull Botanic Gardens | 65.15 |