76 Bo+Bo
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
27/10/1950 | To Service | 26001 | NEW | 39A | Gorton | ||
27/10/1950 | To Service | 26002 | NEW | 39A | Gorton | ||
15/11/1950 | To Service | 26003 | NEW | 39A | Gorton | ||
17/02/1951 | To Service | 26004 | NEW | 39A | Gorton | ||
04/1952 | Reallocation | 26001 | 39A | Gorton | 30a | Ilford | |
30/04/1952 | Reallocation | 26002 | 39A | Gorton | 36b | Wath | |
30/04/1952 | Reallocation | 26003 | 39A | Gorton | 30a | Ilford | |
30/04/1952 | Reallocation | 26004 | 30a | Ilford | |||
19/07/1952 | Reallocation | 26003 | 30a | Ilford | 36b | Wath | |
19/07/1952 | Reallocation | 26004 | 30a | Ilford | 36b | Wath | |
01/03/1953 | Reallocation | 26001 | 30a | Ilford | 39A | Gorton | |
01/03/1953 | Reallocation | 26002 | 36b | Wath | 39A | Gorton | |
01/03/1953 | Reallocation | 26003 | 36b | Wath | 39A | Gorton | |
01/03/1953 | Reallocation | 26004 | 36b | Wath | 39A | Gorton | |
05/05/1953 | Reallocation | 26002 | 39A | Gorton | 36b | Wath | |
18/12/1953 | Reallocation | 26002 | 36b | Wath | 39A | Gorton | |
19/03/1954 | Reallocation | 26003 | 39A | Gorton | 36b | Wath | |
12/06/1954 | Reallocation | 26001 | 39A | Gorton | 39a | Reddish | |
12/06/1954 | Reallocation | 26002 | 39A | Gorton | 39a | Reddish | |
12/06/1954 | Reallocation | 26003 | 36b | Wath | 39a | Reddish | |
12/06/1954 | Reallocation | 26004 | 39A | Gorton | 39a | Reddish | |
21/07/1967 | Reallocation | 26001 | 39a | Reddish | 98S | Reddish | |
09/1967 | Reallocation | 26001 | 98S | 9C | Reddish | ||
21/07/1968 | Reallocation | 26002 | 39a | Reddish | 98S | Reddish | |
09/1968 | Reallocation | 26002 | 98S | 9C | Reddish | ||
22/03/1970 | Condemned | 26000 | COND | ||||
22/03/1970 | Condemned | 26005 | COND | ||||
22/03/1970 | Condemned | 26017 | COND | ||||
22/03/1970 | Condemned | 26035 | COND | ||||
22/03/1970 | Condemned | 26042 | COND | ||||
09/10/1971 | Condemned | 26019 | COND | ||||
09/10/1971 | Condemned | 26031 | 98W | COND | |||
28/11/1971 | Reallocation | 26037 | 9C | Reddish | |||
28/11/1971 | Condemned | 26045 | COND | ||||
06/02/1977 | Condemned | 76050 | 98W | COND | |||
06/02/1977 | Condemned | 76048 | 98W | COND | |||
06/02/1977 | Condemned | 76055 | 98W | COND | |||
06/02/1977 | Condemned | 76057 | 98W | COND | |||
07/1977 | Reallocation | 76002 | 9C | Reddish | 98S | Reddish | |
07/1977 | Reallocation | 76020 | 98S | Reddish | |||
07/1977 | Reallocation | 76043 | 98S | Reddish | |||
11/08/1977 | Condemned | 76020 | 98S | COND | |||
14/08/1977 | Reallocation | 76004 | 98W | RS | Reddish | ||
09/04/1978 | Reallocation | 76054 | 98S | RS | Reddish | ||
25/06/1978 | Condemned | 76002 | 98S | COND | |||
25/06/1978 | Condemned | 76004 | 98W | COND | |||
25/06/1978 | Condemned | 76043 | 98W | COND | |||
25/06/1978 | Condemned | 76052 | 98W | COND | |||
25/06/1978 | Condemned | 76056 | 98W | COND | |||
22/08/1980 | Reallocation | 76036 | 39a | Reddish | 98S | Reddish | |
02/11/1980 | Condemned | 76001 | 9C | Reddish | COND | ||
02/11/1980 | Condemned | 76041 | 98W | COND | |||
02/11/1980 | Condemned | 76046 | 98W | COND | |||
02/11/1980 | Condemned | 76047 | 98W | COND | |||
02/11/1980 | Condemned | 76049 | 98W | COND | |||
02/11/1980 | Condemned | 76053 | 98W | COND | |||
20/07/1981 | Condemned | 76036 | 98S | COND | |||
20/07/1981 | Condemned | 76006 | 98W | COND | |||
20/07/1981 | Condemned | 76007 | 98W | COND | |||
20/07/1981 | Condemned | 76008 | 98W | COND | |||
20/07/1981 | Condemned | 76009 | 98W | COND | |||
20/07/1981 | Condemned | 76010 | 98W | COND | |||
20/07/1981 | Condemned | 76011 | 98W | COND | |||
20/07/1981 | Condemned | 76012 | 98W | COND | |||
20/07/1981 | Condemned | 76013 | 98W | COND | |||
20/07/1981 | Condemned | 76014 | 98W | COND | |||
20/07/1981 | Condemned | 76015 | 98W | COND | |||
20/07/1981 | Condemned | 76016 | 98W | COND | |||
20/07/1981 | Condemned | 76035 | 98W | COND | |||
20/07/1981 | Condemned | 76021 | 98W | COND | |||
20/07/1981 | Condemned | 76022 | 98W | COND | |||
20/07/1981 | Condemned | 76023 | 98W | COND | |||
20/07/1981 | Condemned | 76024 | 98W | COND | |||
20/07/1981 | Condemned | 76025 | 98W | COND | |||
20/07/1981 | Condemned | 76026 | 98W | COND | |||
20/07/1981 | Condemned | 76027 | 98W | COND | |||
20/07/1981 | Condemned | 76028 | 98W | COND | |||
20/07/1981 | Condemned | 76029 | 98W | COND | |||
20/07/1981 | Condemned | 76030 | 98W | COND | |||
20/07/1981 | Condemned | 76032 | 98W | COND | |||
20/07/1981 | Condemned | 76033 | 98W | COND | |||
20/07/1981 | Condemned | 76034 | 98W | COND | |||
20/07/1981 | Condemned | 76003 | 98W | COND | |||
20/07/1981 | Condemned | 76037 | 98W | COND | |||
20/07/1981 | Condemned | 76040 | 98W | COND | |||
20/07/1981 | Condemned | 76031 | 98W | COND | |||
20/07/1981 | Condemned | 76039 | 98W | COND | |||
20/07/1981 | Condemned | 76038 | 98W | COND | |||
20/07/1981 | Condemned | 76051 | 98W | COND | |||
20/07/1981 | Condemned | 76054 | 98W | COND |