Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 936 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14342 Week
» 67358 Month
» 186885 Year
» 3213738 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
76 Bo+Bo
Class |
LNER (Orig) |
LNER (1946) |
BR (Pre Tops) |
BR (Tops) |
BR (AB/MU) |
Built |
Date Withdrawn |
Modification |
Modification Date |
EM1 |
|
|
26003
|
76003
|
76036
|
15/11/1950 |
20/07/1981 |
Multiple Working Fitted |
14/09/1977 |
EM1 |
|
|
26018
|
76018
|
76035
|
18/05/1951 |
20/07/1981 |
Vacuum Brakes removed |
25/06/1976 |
EM1 |
|
|
26032
|
76032
|
|
19/04/1952 |
20/07/1981 |
Multiple Working Fitted |
14/01/1977 |
EM1 |
|
|
26033
|
76033
|
|
19/04/1952 |
20/07/1981 |
Air Brakes fitted |
07/1976 |
EM1 |
|
|
26034
|
76034
|
|
19/04/1952 |
20/07/1981 |
Vacuum Brakes removed |
02/1975 |
EM1 |
|
|
26037
|
76037
|
|
16/02/1952 |
20/07/1981 |
Clear Call equipment fitted |
25/01/1976 |
EM1 |
|
|
26044
|
76044
|
76031
|
19/06/1952 |
20/07/1981 |
Multiple Working Fitted |
18/03/1976 |
EM1 |
|
|
26048
|
76048
|
76039
|
18/10/1952 |
20/07/1981 |
Air Brakes fitted |
17/10/1977 |
EM1 |
|
|
26049
|
76049
|
|
18/10/1952 |
02/11/1980 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
04/1972 |
EM1 |
|
|
26050
|
76050
|
76038
|
16/11/1952 |
20/07/1981 |
Vacuum Brakes removed |
01/06/1977 |
EM1 |
|
|
26051
|
76051
|
|
17/01/1953 |
20/07/1981 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
04/1972 |
EM1 |
|
|
26053
|
76053
|
|
14/03/1953 |
02/11/1980 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
10/1976 |
EM1 |
|
|
26056
|
76056
|
|
25/07/1953 |
25/06/1978 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
04/1972 |
EM1 |
|
|
26057
|
76057
|
|
10/09/1953 |
06/02/1977 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
10/1976 |