166
BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) | Name |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
59209 | 06/06/1958 | Darlington | 65.85 | |||||||
59210 | 16/06/1958 | 65.83 | ||||||||
59211 | 26/06/1958 | Darlington | 65.80 | |||||||
59212 | 04/07/1958 | 65.78 | ||||||||
59213 | 11/07/1958 | 65.76 | ||||||||
59214 | 18/07/1958 | Hull Springhead | 65.74 | |||||||
59215 | 25/07/1958 | Hull Springhead | 65.72 | |||||||
59216 | 19/08/1958 | Hull Springhead | 65.65 | |||||||
59217 | 28/08/1958 | Hull Springhead | 65.63 | |||||||
59218 | 05/09/1958 | Hull Springhead | 65.61 | |||||||
59219 | 12/09/1958 | Hull Springhead | 65.59 | |||||||
59220 | 19/09/1958 | Hull Springhead | 65.57 | |||||||
59221 | 25/09/1958 | Hull Springhead | 65.55 | |||||||
59222 | 02/10/1958 | 09/03/1963 | 4.42 | 65.53 | ||||||
59223 | 10/10/1958 | 65.51 | ||||||||
59224 | 18/10/1958 | Hull Springhead | 65.49 | |||||||
59225 | 25/10/1958 | Hull Springhead | 18/01/1988 | Ayr | 29.25 | 65.47 | ||||
59226 | 04/11/1958 | Hull Springhead | 65.44 | |||||||
59227 | 13/11/1958 | Hull Springhead | 09/07/1984 | Buxton (LNWR) | 25.67 | 65.42 | ||||
59228 | 26/11/1958 | Hull Botanic Gardens | 65.38 | |||||||
59229 | 04/12/1958 | Hull Botanic Gardens | 65.36 | |||||||
59240 | 18/12/1958 | York (North) | 65.32 | |||||||
59241 | 29/12/1958 | Hull Botanic Gardens | 65.29 | |||||||
59242 | 15/01/1959 | Neville Hill | 65.24 | |||||||
59243 | 31/01/1959 | 65.20 | ||||||||
59244 | 12/03/1959 | Hull Botanic Gardens | 65.09 |