Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 54 Today
» 1018 Yesterday
» 54 Week
» 8796 Month
» 352975 Year
» 864077 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

CR/LMS McIntosh "Dock" Class 0-6-0T


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
01/01/1948 Reallocation 16151     31A St Rollox (Balornock)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 16152     31D Grangemouth  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 16153     27A Polmadie  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 16154     31E Dawsholm  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 16155     28A Motherwell  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 16156     27B Greenock Ladyburn  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 16157     27B Greenock Ladyburn  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 16158     31E Dawsholm  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 16159     27A Polmadie  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 16160     27A Polmadie  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 16161     31E Dawsholm  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 16162     27A Polmadie  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 16163     27B Greenock Ladyburn  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 16164     31D Grangemouth  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 16165     27B Greenock Ladyburn  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 16166     27B Greenock Ladyburn  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 16167     27A Polmadie  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 16168     31E Dawsholm  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 16169     31E Dawsholm  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 16170     31E Dawsholm  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 16171     31E Dawsholm  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 16172     27A Polmadie  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 16173     27B Greenock Ladyburn  
11/12/1948 Reallocation 16157 27B Greenock Ladyburn 31A St Rollox (Balornock)  
17/06/1950 Reallocation 56157 31A St Rollox (Balornock) 66D Greenock Ladyburn  
21/04/1951 Reallocation 56169 31E Dawsholm 65B St Rollox (Balornock)  
26/01/1952 Reallocation 56172 27A Polmadie 65E Kipps  
06/09/1952 Reallocation 56155 28A Motherwell 66A Polmadie  
17/04/1954 Reallocation 56167 27A Polmadie 65D Dawsholm  
01/10/1955 Reallocation 56152 31D Grangemouth 65A Eastfield  
12/04/1958 Reallocation 56156 27B Greenock Ladyburn 67A Corkerhill  
09/1958 Condemned 56155 66A Polmadie   COND  
27/09/1958 Reallocation 56164 31D Grangemouth 65B St Rollox (Balornock)  
11/1958 Condemned 56164 65B St Rollox (Balornock)   COND  
22/11/1958 Reallocation 56161 31E Dawsholm 65E Kipps  
12/1958 Condemned 56157 66D Greenock Ladyburn   COND  
12/1958 Condemned 56161 65E Kipps   COND  
20/12/1958 Reallocation 56170 31E Dawsholm 65E Kipps  
17/01/1959 Reallocation 56158 31E Dawsholm 65A Eastfield  
17/01/1959 Reallocation 56162 27A Polmadie 66D Greenock Ladyburn  
17/01/1959 Reallocation 56167 65D Dawsholm 66D Greenock Ladyburn  
02/1959 Condemned 56162 66D Greenock Ladyburn   COND  
14/03/1959 Reallocation 56170 65E Kipps 66D Greenock Ladyburn  
04/1959 Condemned 56152 65A Eastfield   COND  
11/04/1959 Reallocation 56158 65A Eastfield 66A Polmadie  
06/1959 Condemned 56153 27A Polmadie   COND  
06/1959 Condemned 56154 31E Dawsholm   COND  
06/1959 Condemned 56163 27B Greenock Ladyburn   COND  
06/1959 Condemned 56166 27B Greenock Ladyburn   COND  
07/1959 Condemned 56160 27A Polmadie   COND  
01/08/1959 Reallocation 56172 65E Kipps 66A Polmadie  
10/1959 Condemned 56156 67A Corkerhill   COND  
01/1960 Condemned 56165 27B Greenock Ladyburn   COND  
02/1960 Condemned 56170 66D Greenock Ladyburn   COND  
12/03/1960 Reallocation 56172 66A Polmadie 66D Greenock Ladyburn  
11/1960 Condemned 56172 66D Greenock Ladyburn   COND  
02/1961 Condemned 56158 66A Polmadie   COND  
03/1961 Condemned 56169 65B St Rollox (Balornock)   COND  
03/1961 Condemned 56171 31E Dawsholm   COND  
11/03/1961 Reallocation 56151 31A St Rollox (Balornock) 65D Dawsholm  
11/03/1961 Reallocation 56168 31E Dawsholm 65D Dawsholm  
04/1961 Condemned 56167 66D Greenock Ladyburn   COND  
04/1961 Condemned 56168 65D Dawsholm   COND  
05/1961 Condemned 56173 27B Greenock Ladyburn   COND  
09/1961 Condemned 56151 65D Dawsholm   COND  
02/04/1962 Condemned 56159 27A Polmadie   COND