WD (Orig) |
WD (7xxxx) |
NS |
KCR |
LNER (1946) |
BR (1st BR) |
BR |
Date To Service |
Depot Delivered To |
Date Withdrawn |
Depot Withdrawn From |
Svc Age (Yrs) |
Fate |
Where |
When |
Tot Age (Yrs) |
800
|
70800
|
|
|
3044
|
63044
|
90044
|
03/1944 |
|
01/12/1966 |
|
22.75 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
02/1967 |
22.94 |
801
|
70801
|
|
|
|
|
90312
|
03/1944 |
|
21/12/1963 |
|
19.75 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
03/1964 |
20.01 |
802
|
70802
|
|
|
|
|
90313
|
03/1944 |
|
25/04/1964 |
|
20.08 |
Cut |
W.E.Smiths (Ecclesfield) |
07/1964 |
20.35 |
803
|
70803
|
4301
|
|
|
|
|
03/1944 |
|
09/1953 |
|
9.5 |
|
|
|
|
804
|
70804
|
|
|
3045
|
63045
|
90045
|
03/1944 |
|
27/10/1965 |
|
21.58 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
02/1966 |
21.94 |
805
|
70805
|
|
23
|
|
|
|
03/1944 |
|
20/08/1959 |
|
15.42 |
|
|
|
|
806
|
70806
|
4302
|
|
|
|
|
03/1944 |
|
05/1949 |
|
5.17 |
|
|
|
|
807
|
70807
|
|
|
|
|
90314
|
03/1944 |
|
24/04/1965 |
|
21.08 |
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
08/1965 |
21.43 |
808
|
70808
|
|
|
|
|
90315
|
03/1944 |
|
21/11/1965 |
|
21.67 |
Cut |
Garnham, Harris and Elton (Chesterfield) |
05/1966 |
22.18 |
809
|
70809
|
|
|
|
|
90316
|
03/1944 |
|
26/12/1965 |
|
21.75 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
04/1966 |
22.10 |
810
|
70810
|
|
|
3046
|
63046
|
90046
|
03/1944 |
|
23/03/1963 |
|
19 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
06/1963 |
19.26 |
811
|
70811
|
|
|
|
|
90317
|
03/1944 |
|
13/03/1965 |
|
21 |
Cut |
T W Ward (Beighton) |
05/1965 |
21.18 |
812
|
70812
|
4303
|
|
|
|
|
03/1944 |
|
11/1957 |
|
13.67 |
|
|
|
|
813
|
70813
|
|
|
3047
|
63047
|
90047
|
03/1944 |
|
08/06/1967 |
|
23.25 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
28/02/1968 |
23.97 |
814
|
70814
|
|
|
|
|
90318
|
03/1944 |
|
09/09/1967 |
|
23.5 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
28/02/1968 |
23.97 |
815
|
70815
|
|
|
3048
|
63048
|
90048
|
03/1944 |
|
06/05/1963 |
|
19.17 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
06/1963 |
19.26 |
816
|
70816
|
|
|
3049
|
63049
|
90049
|
04/1944 |
|
16/09/1963 |
|
19.42 |
Cut |
Campbells (Airdrie) |
12/1963 |
19.68 |
817
|
70817
|
|
|
|
|
90319
|
04/1944 |
|
13/06/1964 |
|
20.17 |
Cut |
Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) |
01/1965 |
20.77 |
818
|
70818
|
|
|
3050
|
63050
|
90050
|
04/1944 |
|
18/05/1963 |
|
19.08 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
07/1963 |
19.26 |
819
|
70819
|
4304
|
|
|
|
|
04/1944 |
|
10/1956 |
|
12.5 |
|
|
|
|
820
|
70820
|
|
28
|
|
|
|
04/1944 |
|
27/08/1957 |
|
13.33 |
|
|
|
|
821
|
70821
|
|
|
3051
|
63051
|
90051
|
04/1944 |
|
03/10/1965 |
|
21.5 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
01/1966 |
21.77 |
822
|
70822
|
|
|
3052
|
63052
|
90052
|
04/1944 |
|
05/03/1964 |
|
19.92 |
Cut |
T W Ward (Beighton) |
04/1964 |
20.01 |
823
|
70823
|
|
|
3053
|
63053
|
90053
|
04/1944 |
|
04/07/1965 |
|
21.25 |
Cut |
Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) |
02/1966 |
21.85 |
824
|
70824
|
|
|
3054
|
63054
|
90054
|
04/1944 |
|
21/01/1967 |
|
22.75 |
Cut |
T W Ward (Killamarsh) |
03/1967 |
22.93 |
825
|
70825
|
|
|
|
|
90320
|
04/1944 |
|
16/07/1962 |
|
18.25 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) |
09/1962 |
18.43 |
826
|
70826
|
|
|
3055
|
63055
|
90055
|
05/1944 |
|
14/03/1965 |
|
20.83 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
06/1965 |
21.10 |
827
|
70827
|
|
|
3056
|
63056
|
90056
|
05/1944 |
|
03/05/1967 |
|
23 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
08/1967 |
23.27 |
828
|
70828
|
|
|
3057
|
63057
|
90057
|
05/1944 |
|
24/06/1967 |
|
23.08 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
01/1968 |
23.68 |
829
|
70829
|
|
|
|
|
90321
|
05/1944 |
|
01/07/1967 |
|
23.17 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
12/1967 |
23.60 |
830
|
70830
|
|
|
3058
|
63058
|
90058
|
05/1944 |
|
28/12/1963 |
|
19.58 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Inverurie) |
02/1964 |
19.77 |
831
|
70831
|
|
|
3059
|
63059
|
90059
|
05/1944 |
|
04/04/1965 |
|
20.92 |
Cut |
Arnott Young (Dinsdale) |
10/1965 |
21.43 |
832
|
70832
|
|
|
3060
|
63060
|
90060
|
05/1944 |
|
11/06/1962 |
|
18.08 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) |
08/1963 |
19.26 |
833
|
70833
|
|
|
|
|
90322
|
05/1944 |
|
17/08/1964 |
|
20.25 |
Cut |
W.E.Smiths (Ecclesfield) |
12/1964 |
20.60 |
834
|
70834
|
|
|
|
|
90323
|
05/1944 |
|
04/1964 |
|
19.92 |
Cut |
Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) |
10/1964 |
20.43 |
835
|
70835
|
4305
|
|
|
|
|
05/1944 |
|
12/1953 |
|
9.58 |
|
|
|
|
836
|
70836
|
|
|
|
|
90324
|
05/1944 |
|
04/1964 |
|
19.92 |
Cut |
Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) |
07/1964 |
20.18 |
837
|
70837
|
|
|
3061
|
63061
|
90061
|
05/1944 |
|
27/06/1967 |
|
23.08 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
10/1967 |
23.43 |
838
|
70838
|
|
|
|
|
90325
|
05/1944 |
|
13/09/1965 |
|
21.33 |
Cut |
Garnham, Harris and Elton (Chesterfield) |
11/1965 |
21.52 |
839
|
70839
|
|
|
|
|
90326
|
05/1944 |
|
11/11/1963 |
|
19.5 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Horwich) |
12/1963 |
19.60 |
840
|
70840
|
|
|
3062
|
63062
|
90062
|
05/1944 |
|
07/01/1960 |
|
15.67 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Stratford) |
28/02/1960 |
15.80 |
841
|
70841
|
|
|
3063
|
63063
|
90063
|
05/1944 |
|
17/04/1966 |
|
21.92 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
08/1966 |
22.27 |
842
|
70842
|
|
|
3064
|
63064
|
90064
|
05/1944 |
|
15/01/1964 |
|
19.67 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
03/1964 |
19.85 |
843
|
70843
|
|
|
|
|
90327
|
06/1944 |
|
16/01/1965 |
|
20.58 |
Cut |
Cohens (Morriston) |
05/1965 |
20.93 |
844
|
70844
|
|
|
3065
|
63065
|
90065
|
06/1944 |
|
28/03/1964 |
|
19.75 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
05/1964 |
19.93 |
845
|
70845
|
|
|
|
|
90328
|
06/1944 |
|
09/05/1964 |
|
19.92 |
Cut |
Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) |
09/1964 |
20.27 |
846
|
70846
|
|
|
3066
|
63066
|
90066
|
06/1944 |
|
24/05/1963 |
|
18.92 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
09/1963 |
19.26 |
847
|
70847
|
|
|
3067
|
63067
|
90067
|
06/1944 |
|
05/10/1964 |
|
20.33 |
Cut |
T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) |
01/1965 |
20.60 |
848
|
70848
|
|
|
3068
|
63068
|
90068
|
06/1944 |
|
10/07/1966 |
|
22.08 |
Cut |
R A Kings (Norwich) |
10/1966 |
22.35 |
849
|
70849
|
|
|
|
|
90329
|
06/1944 |
|
27/09/1965 |
|
21.25 |
Cut |
Garnham, Harris and Elton (Chesterfield) |
12/1965 |
21.52 |
850
|
70850
|
|
|
|
|
90330
|
06/1944 |
|
19/12/1965 |
|
21.5 |
Cut |
W George, Station Steel (Wath) |
03/1966 |
21.76 |
851
|
70851
|
|
|
|
|
90331
|
06/1944 |
|
30/11/1963 |
|
19.42 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
02/1964 |
19.68 |
852
|
70852
|
|
|
3071
|
63071
|
90071
|
06/1944 |
|
22/04/1967 |
|
22.83 |
Cut |
Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) |
09/1967 |
23.27 |
853
|
70853
|
|
|
|
|
90332
|
06/1944 |
|
21/01/1967 |
|
22.58 |
Cut |
T W Ward (Killamarsh) |
03/1967 |
22.76 |
854
|
70854
|
|
|
3069
|
63069
|
90069
|
06/1944 |
|
30/01/1966 |
|
21.58 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
05/1966 |
21.93 |
855
|
70855
|
4306
|
|
|
|
|
06/1944 |
|
12/1955 |
|
11.5 |
|
|
|
|
856
|
70856
|
4307
|
|
|
|
|
06/1944 |
|
09/1953 |
|
9.25 |
|
|
|
|
857
|
70857
|
|
|
|
|
90333
|
07/1944 |
|
25/10/1965 |
|
21.25 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
02/1966 |
21.60 |
858
|
70858
|
|
|
3072
|
63072
|
90072
|
07/1944 |
|
27/12/1965 |
|
21.42 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
04/1966 |
21.76 |
859
|
70859
|
|
|
|
|
90334
|
07/1944 |
|
18/11/1963 |
|
19.33 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
12/1963 |
19.43 |
860
|
70860
|
|
|
|
|
90335
|
07/1944 |
|
09/11/1963 |
|
19.33 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Horwich) |
12/1963 |
19.43 |
861
|
70861
|
4308
|
|
|
|
|
07/1944 |
|
11/1949 |
|
5.33 |
|
|
|
|
862
|
70862
|
4309
|
|
|
|
|
07/1944 |
|
07/1957 |
|
13 |
|
|
|
|
863
|
70863
|
4310
|
|
|
|
|
07/1944 |
|
02/1958 |
|
13.58 |
|
|
|
|
864
|
70864
|
|
|
|
|
90336
|
07/1944 |
|
09/01/1966 |
|
21.5 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
04/1966 |
21.76 |
865
|
70865
|
|
|
|
|
90337
|
08/1944 |
|
09/01/1967 |
|
22.42 |
Cut |
Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) |
08/1967 |
23.01 |
866
|
70866
|
|
|
|
|
90338
|
08/1944 |
|
16/11/1963 |
|
19.25 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
11/1963 |
19.26 |
867
|
70867
|
|
|
|
|
90339
|
08/1944 |
|
01/07/1967 |
|
22.92 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
10/1967 |
23.18 |
868
|
70868
|
4311
|
|
|
|
|
08/1944 |
|
11/1949 |
|
5.25 |
|
|
|
|
869
|
70869
|
4312
|
|
|
|
|
08/1944 |
|
03/1956 |
|
11.58 |
|
|
|
|
870
|
70870
|
|
|
3073
|
63073
|
90073
|
08/1944 |
|
27/02/1966 |
|
21.5 |
Cut |
W George, Station Steel (Wath) |
08/1966 |
22.01 |
871
|
70871
|
|
|
|
|
90340
|
08/1944 |
|
11/07/1965 |
|
20.92 |
Cut |
Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) |
11/1965 |
21.27 |
872
|
70872
|
|
|
3074
|
63074
|
90074
|
08/1944 |
|
09/09/1967 |
|
23.08 |
Cut |
Arnott Young (Dinsdale) |
11/1967 |
23.27 |
873
|
70873
|
4313
|
|
|
|
|
08/1944 |
|
01/1954 |
|
9.42 |
|
|
|
|
874
|
70874
|
|
|
|
|
90341
|
08/1944 |
|
15/07/1965 |
|
20.92 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
11/1965 |
21.27 |
875
|
70875
|
|
|
|
|
90342
|
08/1944 |
|
07/11/1965 |
|
21.25 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
03/1966 |
21.59 |
876
|
70876
|
|
|
|
|
90343
|
08/1944 |
|
21/12/1963 |
|
19.33 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
01/1964 |
19.43 |
877
|
70877
|
|
|
|
|
90344
|
08/1944 |
|
20/11/1964 |
|
20.25 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
12/1964 |
20.35 |
878
|
70878
|
|
|
|
|
90345
|
08/1944 |
|
24/06/1967 |
|
22.83 |
Cut |
Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) |
11/1967 |
23.27 |
879
|
70879
|
4314
|
|
|
|
|
09/1944 |
|
09/1953 |
|
9 |
|
|
|
|
7000
|
77000
|
|
|
|
|
90101
|
25/01/1943 |
|
16/05/1964 |
|
21.33 |
Cut |
|
20/09/1964 |
21.67 |
7001
|
77001
|
|
|
|
|
90102
|
05/02/1943 |
|
12/10/1963 |
|
20.67 |
Cut |
T W Ward (Killamarsh) |
01/1964 |
20.96 |
7002
|
77002
|
|
|
3001
|
63001
|
90001
|
02/1943 |
|
17/04/1966 |
|
23.17 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
08/1966 |
23.51 |
7003
|
77003
|
|
|
|
|
90103
|
02/1943 |
|
21/11/1965 |
|
22.75 |
Cut |
Garnham, Harris and Elton (Chesterfield) |
04/1966 |
23.18 |
7004
|
77004
|
|
|
|
|
90104
|
02/1943 |
|
12/02/1966 |
|
23 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
06/1966 |
23.35 |
7005
|
77005
|
|
|
|
|
90105
|
17/02/1943 |
|
29/12/1962 |
|
19.83 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Horwich) |
05/1963 |
20.25 |
7006
|
77006
|
|
|
|
|
90106
|
02/1943 |
|
16/09/1962 |
|
19.58 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
12/1962 |
19.84 |
7007
|
77007
|
|
|
|
|
90107
|
02/1943 |
|
16/11/1963 |
|
20.75 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
12/1963 |
20.84 |
7008
|
77008
|
|
|
|
|
90108
|
02/1943 |
|
01/08/1965 |
|
22.5 |
Cut |
Arnott Young (Parkgate) |
10/1965 |
22.68 |
7009
|
77009
|
|
|
3000
|
63000
|
90000
|
02/1943 |
|
06/06/1965 |
|
22.33 |
Cut |
Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) |
11/1965 |
22.76 |
7010
|
77010
|
|
|
|
|
90109
|
04/1943 |
|
04/1964 |
|
21 |
Cut |
Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) |
09/1964 |
21.44 |
7011
|
77011
|
4533
|
|
|
|
|
05/1943 |
|
10/1957 |
|
14.42 |
|
|
|
|
7012
|
77012
|
|
|
|
|
90110
|
03/1943 |
|
07/03/1964 |
|
21 |
Cut |
Albert Looms (Spondon) |
12/1964 |
21.77 |
7013
|
77013
|
|
|
|
|
90111
|
03/1943 |
|
06/04/1964 |
|
21.08 |
Cut |
W.E.Smiths (Ecclesfield) |
07/1964 |
21.35 |
7014
|
77014
|
|
|
|
|
90112
|
26/03/1943 |
|
10/01/1967 |
|
23.83 |
Cut |
Arnott Young (Dinsdale) |
12/1967 |
24.74 |
7015
|
77015
|
|
|
|
|
90113
|
03/1943 |
|
04/09/1966 |
|
23.5 |
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
11/1966 |
23.69 |
7016
|
77016
|
|
|
|
|
90114
|
03/1943 |
|
07/07/1964 |
|
21.33 |
Cut |
Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) |
10/1964 |
21.60 |
7017
|
77017
|
|
|
|
|
90115
|
03/1943 |
|
09/05/1965 |
|
22.17 |
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
08/1965 |
22.44 |
7018
|
77018
|
|
|
|
|
90116
|
03/1943 |
|
27/06/1967 |
|
24.25 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
10/1967 |
24.60 |
7019
|
77019
|
|
|
|
|
90117
|
03/1943 |
|
20/01/1967 |
|
23.83 |
Cut |
J McWilliams (Shettleston) |
05/1967 |
24.18 |
7020
|
77020
|
|
|
|
|
90118
|
03/1943 |
|
25/11/1963 |
|
20.67 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
02/1964 |
20.94 |
7021
|
77021
|
|
|
3002
|
63002
|
90002
|
03/1943 |
|
17/04/1966 |
|
23.08 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
08/1966 |
23.44 |
7022
|
77022
|
|
|
|
|
90119
|
03/1943 |
|
17/01/1965 |
|
21.83 |
Cut |
T W Ward (Beighton) |
05/1965 |
22.18 |
7023
|
77023
|
|
|
|
|
90120
|
03/1943 |
|
04/04/1965 |
|
22.08 |
Cut |
Arnott Young (Dinsdale) |
07/1965 |
22.35 |
7024
|
77024
|
|
|
|
|
90121
|
03/1943 |
|
20/06/1965 |
|
22.25 |
Cut |
Arnott Young (Parkgate) |
09/1965 |
22.52 |
7025
|
77025
|
|
|
|
|
90122
|
04/1943 |
|
27/09/1965 |
|
22.42 |
Cut |
Garnham, Harris and Elton (Chesterfield) |
11/1965 |
22.60 |
7026
|
77026
|
|
|
|
|
90123
|
04/1943 |
|
27/03/1965 |
|
21.92 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
07/1965 |
22.27 |
7027
|
77027
|
|
|
|
|
90124
|
08/04/1943 |
|
21/06/1965 |
|
22.17 |
Cut |
Ellis Metals (Derwenthaugh Road, Swalwell) |
10/1965 |
22.54 |
7028
|
77028
|
|
|
|
|
90125
|
04/1943 |
|
17/07/1965 |
|
22.25 |
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
11/1965 |
22.60 |
7029
|
77029
|
|
|
|
|
90126
|
04/1943 |
|
03/01/1967 |
|
23.75 |
Cut |
Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) |
06/1967 |
24.18 |
7030
|
77030
|
|
|
|
|
90127
|
04/1943 |
|
26/10/1964 |
|
21.5 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
12/1965 |
22.68 |
7031
|
77031
|
|
|
|
|
90128
|
04/1943 |
|
05/11/1962 |
|
19.58 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) |
02/1963 |
19.85 |
7032
|
77032
|
|
|
|
|
90129
|
04/1943 |
|
06/1964 |
|
21.17 |
Cut |
T W Ward (Killamarsh) |
01/1965 |
21.77 |
7033
|
77033
|
|
|
3004
|
63004
|
90004
|
04/1943 |
|
28/12/1963 |
|
20.67 |
Cut |
T W Ward (Inverkeithing) |
05/1964 |
21.10 |
7034
|
77034
|
|
|
|
|
90130
|
04/1943 |
|
17/10/1965 |
|
22.5 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
02/1966 |
22.85 |
7035
|
77035
|
|
|
|
|
90131
|
04/1943 |
|
21/03/1965 |
|
21.92 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
07/1965 |
22.27 |
7036
|
77036
|
|
|
|
|
90132
|
04/1943 |
|
10/04/1967 |
|
24 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
08/1967 |
24.35 |
7037
|
77037
|
|
|
|
|
90133
|
04/1943 |
|
17/10/1965 |
|
22.5 |
Cut |
Arnott Young (Dinsdale) |
04/1966 |
23.02 |
7038
|
77038
|
4534
|
|
|
|
|
04/1943 |
|
06/1955 |
|
12.17 |
|
|
|
|
7039
|
77039
|
|
|
|
|
90134
|
05/1943 |
|
30/07/1962 |
|
19.17 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) |
01/1963 |
19.68 |
7040
|
77040
|
|
|
|
|
90135
|
09/05/1943 |
|
09/09/1967 |
|
24.33 |
Cut |
Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) |
10/1967 |
24.45 |
7041
|
77041
|
|
|
|
|
90136
|
05/1943 |
|
11/04/1965 |
|
21.92 |
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
07/1965 |
22.18 |
7042
|
77042
|
|
|
|
|
90137
|
05/1943 |
|
22/12/1962 |
|
19.58 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
05/1963 |
20.01 |
7043
|
77043
|
4325
|
|
|
|
|
05/1943 |
|
12/1954 |
|
11.58 |
|
|
|
|
7044
|
77044
|
|
|
|
|
90138
|
05/1943 |
|
28/03/1964 |
|
20.83 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
05/1964 |
21.02 |
7045
|
77045
|
4326
|
|
|
|
|
05/1943 |
|
09/1954 |
|
11.33 |
|
|
|
|
7046
|
77046
|
|
|
3005
|
63005
|
90005
|
05/1943 |
|
25/04/1965 |
|
21.92 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
07/1965 |
22.18 |
7047
|
77047
|
|
|
|
|
90139
|
05/1943 |
|
02/05/1965 |
|
22 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
07/1965 |
22.18 |
7048
|
77048
|
|
|
|
|
90140
|
05/1943 |
|
19/09/1964 |
|
21.33 |
Cut |
Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) |
01/1965 |
21.69 |
7049
|
77049
|
|
|
|
|
90141
|
21/05/1943 |
|
22/02/1964 |
|
20.75 |
Cut |
J Routledge (Bootle) |
08/1964 |
21.25 |
7050
|
77050
|
|
|
|
|
90521
|
05/1943 |
|
11/10/1964 |
|
21.42 |
Cut |
W.E.Smiths (Ecclesfield) |
01/1965 |
21.69 |
7051
|
77051
|
|
|
|
|
90522
|
05/1943 |
|
02/05/1965 |
|
22 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
07/1965 |
22.18 |
7052
|
77052
|
|
|
|
|
90523
|
05/1943 |
|
29/12/1962 |
|
19.58 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
10/1963 |
20.43 |
7053
|
77053
|
|
|
|
|
90524
|
05/1943 |
|
25/05/1963 |
|
20 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
09/1963 |
20.35 |
7054
|
77054
|
|
|
|
|
90525
|
05/1943 |
|
04/1964 |
|
20.92 |
Cut |
Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) |
01/1965 |
21.69 |
7055
|
77055
|
|
|
|
|
90526
|
05/1943 |
|
29/12/1962 |
|
19.58 |
Cut |
Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) |
01/1964 |
20.68 |
7056
|
77056
|
|
|
|
|
90527
|
05/1943 |
|
11/05/1963 |
|
20 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Horwich) |
06/1963 |
20.10 |
7057
|
77057
|
|
|
|
|
90528
|
06/1943 |
|
26/09/1965 |
|
22.25 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
01/1966 |
22.60 |
7058
|
77058
|
|
|
|
|
90529
|
06/1943 |
|
14/11/1965 |
|
22.42 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
02/1966 |
22.69 |
7059
|
77059
|
|
|
|
|
90530
|
06/1943 |
|
18/05/1963 |
|
19.92 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
08/1963 |
20.18 |
7060
|
77060
|
|
|
|
|
90531
|
06/1943 |
|
02/09/1963 |
|
20.25 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
09/1963 |
20.27 |
7061
|
77061
|
|
|
|
|
90532
|
06/1943 |
|
01/12/1962 |
|
19.5 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Gorton) |
01/1963 |
19.60 |
7062
|
77062
|
|
|
|
|
90533
|
06/1943 |
|
12/02/1966 |
|
22.67 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
06/1966 |
23.02 |
7063
|
77063
|
|
|
|
|
90534
|
06/1943 |
|
27/10/1966 |
|
23.33 |
Cut |
Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) |
02/1967 |
23.69 |
7064
|
77064
|
|
|
|
|
90535
|
06/1943 |
|
17/10/1964 |
|
21.33 |
Cut |
T W Ward (Beighton) |
03/1965 |
21.76 |
7065
|
77065
|
4327
|
|
|
|
|
06/1943 |
|
05/1956 |
|
12.92 |
|
|
|
|
7066
|
77066
|
|
|
|
|
90536
|
06/1943 |
|
08/1963 |
|
20.17 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Inverurie) |
10/1963 |
20.35 |
7067
|
77067
|
|
|
|
|
90537
|
06/1943 |
|
27/02/1966 |
|
22.67 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
07/1966 |
23.10 |
7068
|
77068
|
|
|
|
|
90538
|
06/1943 |
|
17/04/1966 |
|
22.83 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
10/1966 |
23.35 |
7069
|
77069
|
4329
|
|
|
|
|
07/1943 |
|
11/1957 |
|
14.33 |
|
|
|
|
7070
|
77070
|
|
|
|
|
90539
|
07/1943 |
|
29/11/1963 |
|
20.33 |
Cut |
J McWilliams (Shettleston) |
06/1964 |
20.93 |
7071
|
77071
|
|
|
|
|
90540
|
07/1943 |
|
04/07/1965 |
|
22 |
Cut |
Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) |
04/1966 |
22.77 |
7072
|
77072
|
|
|
|
|
90541
|
07/1943 |
|
08/05/1965 |
|
21.83 |
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
08/1965 |
22.10 |
7073
|
77073
|
|
|
|
|
90542
|
07/1943 |
|
08/07/1963 |
|
20 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Inverurie) |
09/1963 |
20.18 |
7074
|
77074
|
|
|
|
|
90543
|
07/1943 |
|
22/02/1965 |
|
21.58 |
Cut |
T W Ward (Beighton) |
08/1965 |
22.10 |
7075
|
77075
|
|
|
|
|
90544
|
07/1943 |
|
11/06/1964 |
|
20.92 |
Cut |
T W Ward (Killamarsh) |
10/1964 |
21.27 |
7076
|
77076
|
|
|
|
|
90545
|
07/1943 |
|
03/10/1965 |
|
22.25 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
01/1966 |
22.52 |
7077
|
77077
|
|
|
|
|
90546
|
07/1943 |
|
08/02/1964 |
|
20.58 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
03/1964 |
20.68 |
7078
|
77078
|
|
|
|
|
90547
|
07/1943 |
|
27/10/1966 |
|
23.25 |
Cut |
Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) |
02/1967 |
23.61 |
7079
|
77079
|
|
|
|
|
90548
|
08/1943 |
|
04/1964 |
|
20.67 |
Cut |
Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) |
07/1964 |
20.93 |
7080
|
77080
|
|
|
|
|
90549
|
08/1943 |
|
17/12/1962 |
|
19.33 |
Cut |
Campbells (Shieldhall) |
12/1963 |
20.35 |
7081
|
77081
|
|
|
|
|
90550
|
08/1943 |
|
16/09/1962 |
|
19.08 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
12/1962 |
19.35 |
7082
|
77082
|
4331
|
|
|
|
|
08/1943 |
|
04/1955 |
|
11.67 |
|
|
|
|
7083
|
77083
|
|
|
3101
|
63101
|
90422
|
08/1943 |
|
06/06/1965 |
|
21.83 |
Cut |
Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) |
11/1965 |
22.27 |
7084
|
77084
|
4401
|
|
|
|
|
08/1943 |
|
09/1953 |
|
10.08 |
|
|
|
|
7085
|
77085
|
|
|
|
|
90551
|
08/1943 |
|
17/04/1966 |
|
22.67 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
10/1966 |
23.18 |
7086
|
77086
|
|
|
|
|
90552
|
08/1943 |
|
04/1964 |
|
20.67 |
Cut |
Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) |
10/1964 |
21.18 |
7087
|
77087
|
|
|
|
|
90553
|
08/1943 |
|
18/10/1965 |
|
22.17 |
Cut |
Campbells (Airdrie) |
02/1966 |
22.52 |
7088
|
77088
|
|
|
|
|
90554
|
08/1943 |
|
16/09/1962 |
|
19.08 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
11/1962 |
19.27 |
7089
|
77089
|
|
|
|
|
90555
|
08/1943 |
|
06/06/1964 |
|
20.83 |
Cut |
Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) |
12/1964 |
21.35 |
7090
|
77090
|
|
|
|
|
90556
|
08/1943 |
|
20/03/1965 |
|
21.58 |
Cut |
T W Ward (Beighton) |
05/1965 |
21.76 |
7091
|
77091
|
|
|
3102
|
63102
|
90423
|
08/1943 |
|
26/12/1965 |
|
22.33 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
04/1966 |
22.68 |
7092
|
77092
|
|
|
|
|
90557
|
08/1943 |
|
26/09/1965 |
|
22.08 |
Cut |
T W Ward (Beighton) |
11/1965 |
22.27 |
7093
|
77093
|
|
|
3103
|
63103
|
90424
|
08/1943 |
|
09/12/1963 |
|
20.33 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
12/1963 |
20.35 |
7094
|
77094
|
|
|
|
|
90558
|
09/1943 |
|
14/11/1965 |
|
22.17 |
Cut |
W George, Station Steel (Wath) |
02/1966 |
22.44 |
7095
|
77095
|
|
|
|
|
90559
|
09/1943 |
|
29/12/1962 |
|
19.25 |
Cut |
Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) |
12/1963 |
20.26 |
7096
|
77096
|
|
|
|
|
90560
|
09/1943 |
|
22/04/1967 |
|
23.58 |
Cut |
Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) |
09/1967 |
24.02 |
7097
|
77097
|
|
|
|
|
90561
|
09/1943 |
|
27/03/1965 |
|
21.5 |
Cut |
T W Ward (Beighton) |
08/1965 |
21.93 |
7098
|
77098
|
|
|
|
|
90562
|
09/1943 |
|
12/11/1962 |
|
19.17 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Gorton) |
03/1963 |
19.51 |
7099
|
77099
|
|
|
|
|
90563
|
09/1943 |
|
07/08/1965 |
|
21.92 |
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
01/1966 |
22.35 |
7100
|
77100
|
|
|
3104
|
63104
|
90425
|
09/1943 |
|
29/12/1962 |
|
19.25 |
Cut |
Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) |
12/1963 |
20.26 |
7101
|
77101
|
|
|
|
|
90564
|
09/1943 |
|
25/04/1964 |
|
20.58 |
Cut |
Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) |
01/1965 |
21.35 |
7102
|
77102
|
|
|
|
|
90565
|
09/1943 |
|
12/11/1962 |
|
19.17 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
01/1964 |
20.35 |
7103
|
77103
|
|
|
|
|
90566
|
09/1943 |
|
11/07/1964 |
|
20.83 |
Cut |
Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) |
11/1964 |
21.18 |
7104
|
77104
|
|
|
|
|
90567
|
09/1943 |
|
15/11/1964 |
|
21.17 |
Cut |
W.E.Smiths (Ecclesfield) |
03/1965 |
21.51 |
7105
|
77105
|
4334
|
|
|
|
|
09/1943 |
|
02/1958 |
|
14.42 |
|
|
|
|
7106
|
77106
|
|
|
|
|
90568
|
09/1943 |
|
18/01/1964 |
|
20.33 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
03/1964 |
20.51 |
7107
|
77107
|
|
|
|
|
90569
|
09/1943 |
|
31/10/1965 |
|
22.08 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
03/1966 |
22.51 |
7108
|
77108
|
|
|
|
|
90570
|
10/1943 |
|
25/04/1964 |
|
20.5 |
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
10/1964 |
21.02 |
7109
|
77109
|
4402
|
|
|
|
|
10/1943 |
|
02/1958 |
|
14.33 |
|
|
|
|
7110
|
77110
|
|
|
3105
|
63105
|
90426
|
10/1943 |
|
01/03/1965 |
|
21.42 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
04/1965 |
21.52 |
7111
|
77111
|
|
|
|
|
90571
|
10/1943 |
|
18/11/1963 |
|
20.08 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
12/1963 |
20.18 |
7112
|
77112
|
|
|
3106
|
63106
|
90427
|
10/1943 |
|
24/06/1967 |
|
23.67 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
01/1968 |
24.27 |
7113
|
77113
|
|
|
3107
|
63107
|
90428
|
10/1943 |
|
02/01/1966 |
|
22.25 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
04/1966 |
22.52 |
7114
|
77114
|
4403
|
|
|
|
|
10/1943 |
|
08/1957 |
|
13.83 |
|
|
|
|
7115
|
77115
|
|
|
|
|
90572
|
10/1943 |
|
10/02/1966 |
|
22.33 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
06/1966 |
22.68 |
7116
|
77116
|
|
|
|
|
90573
|
10/1943 |
|
15/08/1965 |
|
21.83 |
Cut |
Garnham, Harris and Elton (Chesterfield) |
10/1965 |
22.02 |
7117
|
77117
|
4335
|
|
|
|
|
10/1943 |
|
08/1956 |
|
12.83 |
|
|
|
|
7118
|
77118
|
|
|
|
|
90574
|
10/1943 |
|
15/02/1964 |
|
20.33 |
Cut |
Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) |
06/1964 |
20.68 |
7119
|
77119
|
|
|
|
|
90575
|
10/1943 |
|
16/07/1962 |
|
18.75 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) |
03/1963 |
19.43 |
7120
|
77120
|
|
|
|
|
90576
|
10/1943 |
|
23/03/1963 |
|
19.42 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
03/1963 |
19.43 |
7121
|
77121
|
|
|
|
|
90577
|
10/1943 |
|
02/05/1965 |
|
21.58 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
07/1965 |
21.76 |
7122
|
77122
|
|
|
|
|
90578
|
10/1943 |
|
09/12/1963 |
|
20.17 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
01/1964 |
20.27 |
7123
|
77123
|
|
|
|
|
90579
|
10/1943 |
|
21/02/1965 |
|
21.33 |
Cut |
Arnott Young (Parkgate) |
07/1965 |
21.76 |
7124
|
77124
|
|
|
|
|
90580
|
10/1943 |
|
08/08/1965 |
|
21.83 |
Cut |
T W Ward (Beighton) |
11/1965 |
22.10 |
7125
|
77125
|
|
|
|
|
|
10/1943 |
|
08/1945 |
|
1.83 |
|
|
|
|
7126
|
77126
|
|
|
|
|
90581
|
10/1943 |
|
23/11/1964 |
|
21.08 |
Cut |
T W Ward (Beighton) |
04/1965 |
21.52 |
7127
|
77127
|
|
|
|
|
90582
|
11/1943 |
|
01/03/1964 |
|
20.33 |
Cut |
T W Ward (Beighton) |
06/1964 |
20.60 |
7128
|
77128
|
|
|
|
|
90583
|
11/1943 |
|
18/04/1964 |
|
20.42 |
Cut |
W.E.Smiths (Ecclesfield) |
07/1964 |
20.68 |
7129
|
77129
|
|
|
|
|
90584
|
11/1943 |
|
05/09/1964 |
|
20.83 |
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
02/1965 |
21.27 |
7130
|
77130
|
|
|
|
|
90585
|
11/1943 |
|
03/1965 |
|
21.33 |
Cut |
T W Ward (Beighton) |
07/1965 |
21.68 |
7131
|
77131
|
|
|
3108
|
63108
|
90429
|
11/1943 |
|
24/04/1967 |
|
23.42 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
08/1967 |
23.76 |
7132
|
77132
|
4404
|
|
|
|
|
11/1943 |
|
09/1953 |
|
9.83 |
|
|
|
|
7133
|
77133
|
|
|
3109
|
63109
|
90430
|
11/1943 |
|
09/09/1967 |
|
23.83 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
04/1968 |
24.43 |
7134
|
77134
|
4405
|
|
|
|
|
11/1943 |
|
12/1954 |
|
11.08 |
|
|
|
|
7135
|
77135
|
|
|
|
|
90586
|
11/1943 |
|
13/02/1966 |
|
22.25 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
06/1966 |
22.60 |
7136
|
77136
|
|
|
3110
|
63110
|
90431
|
11/1943 |
|
29/12/1962 |
|
19.08 |
Cut |
Arnott Young (Avonmour Ironworks, Bilston) |
04/1963 |
19.43 |
7137
|
77137
|
4406
|
|
|
|
|
11/1943 |
|
10/1956 |
|
12.92 |
|
|
|
|
7138
|
77138
|
|
|
|
|
90587
|
11/1943 |
|
14/11/1965 |
|
22 |
Cut |
W George, Station Steel (Wath) |
02/1966 |
22.27 |
7139
|
77139
|
4407
|
|
|
|
|
11/1943 |
|
12/1953 |
|
10.08 |
|
|
|
|
7140
|
77140
|
4408
|
|
|
|
|
11/1943 |
|
11/1949 |
|
6 |
|
|
|
|
7141
|
77141
|
|
|
|
|
90588
|
11/1943 |
|
12/02/1967 |
|
23.25 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
10/1967 |
23.93 |
7142
|
77142
|
|
|
|
|
90589
|
11/1943 |
|
25/04/1964 |
|
20.42 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
06/1964 |
20.60 |
7143
|
77143
|
4338
|
|
|
|
|
11/1943 |
|
11/1949 |
|
6 |
|
|
|
|
7144
|
77144
|
|
|
|
|
90590
|
12/1943 |
|
01/03/1964 |
|
20.25 |
Cut |
T W Ward (Beighton) |
05/1964 |
20.43 |
7145
|
77145
|
|
|
|
|
90591
|
12/1943 |
|
12/11/1962 |
|
18.92 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
08/1963 |
19.68 |
7146
|
77146
|
|
|
3111
|
63111
|
90432
|
12/1943 |
|
03/10/1965 |
|
21.83 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
01/1966 |
22.10 |
7147
|
77147
|
|
|
|
|
90592
|
12/1943 |
|
06/06/1964 |
|
20.5 |
Cut |
Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) |
09/1964 |
20.77 |
7148
|
77148
|
|
|
|
|
90593
|
12/1943 |
|
24/07/1966 |
|
22.58 |
Cut |
T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) |
10/1966 |
22.85 |
7149
|
77149
|
|
|
|
|
90594
|
12/1943 |
|
16/09/1962 |
|
18.75 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Gorton) |
11/1962 |
18.93 |
7150
|
77150
|
|
|
|
|
90142
|
05/1943 |
|
12/12/1965 |
|
22.58 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
05/1966 |
23.02 |
7151
|
77151
|
|
|
|
|
90143
|
25/05/1943 |
|
30/05/1964 |
|
21 |
Cut |
Connels (Calder) |
09/1964 |
21.33 |
7152
|
77152
|
|
|
|
|
90144
|
05/1943 |
|
12/1963 |
|
20.58 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
03/1964 |
20.85 |
7153
|
77153
|
4479
|
|
|
|
|
05/1943 |
|
03/1953 |
|
9.83 |
|
|
|
|
7154
|
77154
|
4480
|
|
|
|
|
05/1943 |
|
12/1956 |
|
13.58 |
|
|
|
|
7155
|
77155
|
|
|
|
|
90145
|
06/1943 |
|
23/06/1964 |
|
21 |
Cut |
T W Ward (Killamarsh) |
10/1964 |
21.35 |
7156
|
77156
|
4481
|
|
|
|
|
06/1943 |
|
11/1949 |
|
6.42 |
|
|
|
|
7157
|
77157
|
|
|
|
|
90146
|
06/1943 |
|
13/06/1965 |
|
22 |
Cut |
T W Ward (Killamarsh) |
08/1965 |
22.18 |
7158
|
77158
|
4409
|
|
|
|
|
06/1943 |
|
11/1949 |
|
6.42 |
|
|
|
|
7159
|
77159
|
4410
|
|
|
|
|
06/1943 |
|
09/1955 |
|
12.25 |
|
|
|
|
7160
|
77160
|
|
|
|
|
90147
|
06/1943 |
|
04/1964 |
|
20.83 |
Cut |
Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) |
08/1964 |
21.18 |
7161
|
77161
|
|
|
|
|
90148
|
06/1943 |
|
27/03/1966 |
|
22.75 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
09/1966 |
23.27 |
7162
|
77162
|
|
|
|
|
90149
|
06/1943 |
|
23/01/1966 |
|
22.58 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
05/1966 |
22.93 |
7163
|
77163
|
|
|
|
|
90150
|
06/1943 |
|
16/09/1962 |
|
19.25 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
12/1962 |
19.52 |
7164
|
77164
|
|
|
|
|
90151
|
06/1943 |
|
18/05/1963 |
|
19.92 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
07/1963 |
20.10 |
7165
|
77165
|
|
|
|
|
90152
|
06/1943 |
|
22/05/1965 |
|
21.92 |
Cut |
Arnott Young (Dinsdale) |
08/1965 |
22.18 |
7166
|
77166
|
|
|
|
|
90153
|
06/1943 |
|
10/02/1966 |
|
22.67 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
05/1966 |
22.93 |
7167
|
77167
|
|
|
|
|
90154
|
06/1943 |
|
17/04/1966 |
|
22.83 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
09/1966 |
23.27 |
7168
|
77168
|
4340
|
|
|
|
|
06/1943 |
|
09/1954 |
|
11.25 |
|
|
|
|
7169
|
77169
|
|
|
|
|
90155
|
06/1943 |
|
09/01/1967 |
|
23.58 |
Cut |
Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) |
05/1967 |
23.93 |
7170
|
77170
|
|
|
|
|
90156
|
06/1943 |
|
17/04/1966 |
|
22.83 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
09/1966 |
23.27 |
7171
|
77171
|
|
|
|
|
90157
|
06/1943 |
|
04/07/1964 |
|
21.08 |
Cut |
Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) |
04/1965 |
21.85 |
7172
|
77172
|
4341
|
|
|
|
|
06/1943 |
|
04/1955 |
|
11.83 |
|
|
|
|
7173
|
77173
|
|
|
|
|
90158
|
07/1943 |
|
19/12/1965 |
|
22.42 |
Cut |
W George, Station Steel (Wath) |
02/1966 |
22.61 |
7174
|
77174
|
|
|
|
|
90159
|
07/1943 |
|
16/11/1963 |
|
20.33 |
Cut |
Butlers (Otley) |
07/1964 |
21.02 |
7175
|
77175
|
|
|
|
|
90160
|
07/1943 |
|
08/06/1967 |
|
23.92 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
28/02/1968 |
24.64 |
7176
|
77176
|
|
|
|
|
90161
|
07/1943 |
|
07/02/1964 |
|
20.58 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
03/1964 |
20.68 |
7177
|
77177
|
4343
|
|
|
|
|
07/1943 |
|
01/1954 |
|
10.5 |
|
|
|
|
7178
|
77178
|
|
|
|
|
90162
|
07/1943 |
|
24/02/1964 |
|
20.58 |
Cut |
T W Ward (Beighton) |
05/1964 |
20.85 |
7179
|
77179
|
|
|
|
|
90163
|
07/1943 |
|
29/12/1962 |
|
19.42 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
10/1963 |
20.27 |
7180
|
77180
|
|
|
|
|
90164
|
07/1943 |
|
11/04/1965 |
|
21.75 |
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
07/1965 |
22.02 |
7181
|
77181
|
|
|
|
|
90165
|
07/1943 |
|
25/04/1964 |
|
20.75 |
Cut |
W.E.Smiths (Ecclesfield) |
01/1965 |
21.52 |
7182
|
77182
|
|
|
|
|
90166
|
07/1943 |
|
09/05/1965 |
|
21.83 |
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
08/1965 |
22.10 |
7183
|
77183
|
4485
|
|
|
|
|
07/1943 |
|
01/1947 |
|
3.5 |
|
|
|
|
7184
|
77184
|
|
|
|
|
90167
|
07/1943 |
|
29/03/1962 |
|
18.67 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
05/1962 |
18.85 |
7185
|
77185
|
|
|
|
|
90168
|
08/1943 |
|
22/08/1966 |
|
23 |
Cut |
J McWilliams (Shettleston) |
11/1966 |
23.27 |
7186
|
77186
|
|
|
|
|
90169
|
08/1943 |
|
22/08/1965 |
|
22 |
Cut |
Garnham, Harris and Elton (Chesterfield) |
11/1965 |
22.27 |
7187
|
77187
|
|
|
|
|
90170
|
08/1943 |
|
07/1963 |
|
19.92 |
Cut |
W.E.Smiths (Ecclesfield) |
02/1965 |
21.52 |
7188
|
77188
|
4535
|
|
|
|
|
08/1943 |
|
09/1954 |
|
11.08 |
|
|
|
|
7189
|
77189
|
4486
|
|
|
|
|
08/1943 |
|
09/1954 |
|
11.08 |
|
|
|
|
7190
|
77190
|
4536
|
|
|
|
|
08/1943 |
|
03/1956 |
|
12.58 |
|
|
|
|
7191
|
77191
|
4487
|
|
|
|
|
08/1943 |
|
06/1955 |
|
11.83 |
|
|
|
|
7192
|
77192
|
|
|
|
|
90171
|
08/1943 |
|
03/07/1965 |
|
21.92 |
Cut |
T W Ward (Killamarsh) |
10/1965 |
22.18 |
7193
|
77193
|
4530
|
|
|
|
|
08/1943 |
|
10/1956 |
|
13.17 |
|
|
|
|
7194
|
77194
|
4531
|
|
|
|
|
08/1943 |
|
05/1955 |
|
11.75 |
|
|
|
|
7195
|
77195
|
|
|
|
|
90172
|
09/1943 |
|
24/06/1967 |
|
23.75 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
12/1967 |
24.27 |
7196
|
77196
|
|
|
|
|
90173
|
08/1943 |
|
11/07/1964 |
|
20.92 |
Cut |
Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) |
11/1964 |
21.27 |
7197
|
77197
|
4532
|
|
|
|
|
08/1943 |
|
05/1956 |
|
12.75 |
|
|
|
|
7198
|
77198
|
|
|
|
|
90174
|
08/1943 |
|
12/11/1962 |
|
19.25 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
06/1963 |
19.85 |
7199
|
77199
|
|
|
|
|
90175
|
09/1943 |
|
04/1965 |
|
21.58 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
08/1965 |
21.93 |
7200
|
77200
|
|
|
|
|
90176
|
08/1943 |
|
16/02/1963 |
|
19.5 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
06/1963 |
19.85 |
7201
|
77201
|
|
|
|
|
90177
|
08/1943 |
|
06/1963 |
|
19.83 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) |
07/1963 |
19.93 |
7202
|
77202
|
|
|
|
|
90178
|
08/1943 |
|
27/02/1966 |
|
22.5 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
07/1966 |
22.93 |
7203
|
77203
|
|
|
|
|
90179
|
08/1943 |
|
25/04/1964 |
|
20.67 |
Cut |
Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) |
10/1964 |
21.18 |
7204
|
77204
|
|
|
|
|
90180
|
08/1943 |
|
14/03/1965 |
|
21.58 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
04/1965 |
21.68 |
7205
|
77205
|
|
|
|
|
90181
|
09/1943 |
|
08/05/1965 |
|
21.67 |
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
08/1965 |
21.93 |
7206
|
77206
|
|
|
|
|
90182
|
09/1943 |
|
28/12/1963 |
|
20.25 |
Cut |
T W Ward (Inverkeithing) |
06/1964 |
20.76 |
7207
|
77207
|
|
|
|
|
90183
|
09/1943 |
|
29/08/1965 |
|
21.92 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
11/1965 |
22.18 |
7208
|
77208
|
|
|
|
|
90184
|
09/1943 |
|
05/10/1964 |
|
21.08 |
Cut |
Arnott Young (Dinsdale) |
10/1965 |
22.10 |
7209
|
77209
|
|
|
|
|
90185
|
09/1943 |
|
14/03/1965 |
|
21.5 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
04/1965 |
21.60 |
7210
|
77210
|
|
|
|
|
90186
|
09/1943 |
|
22/08/1963 |
|
19.92 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
09/1963 |
20.01 |
7211
|
77211
|
|
|
3012
|
63012
|
90012
|
09/1943 |
|
24/02/1964 |
|
20.42 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
04/1964 |
20.60 |
7212
|
77212
|
|
|
|
|
90187
|
09/1943 |
|
27/02/1966 |
|
22.42 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
07/1966 |
22.85 |
7213
|
77213
|
|
|
3013
|
63013
|
90013
|
09/1943 |
|
17/04/1966 |
|
22.58 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
08/1966 |
22.93 |
7214
|
77214
|
|
|
|
|
90188
|
09/1943 |
|
11/04/1965 |
|
21.58 |
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
07/1965 |
21.85 |
7215
|
77215
|
|
|
|
|
90189
|
09/1943 |
|
14/11/1965 |
|
22.17 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
03/1966 |
22.51 |
7216
|
77216
|
4412
|
|
|
|
|
09/1943 |
|
01/1954 |
|
10.33 |
|
|
|
|
7217
|
77217
|
4488
|
|
|
|
|
09/1943 |
|
04/1955 |
|
11.58 |
|
|
|
|
7218
|
77218
|
|
|
|
|
90190
|
09/1943 |
|
10/02/1966 |
|
22.42 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
06/1966 |
22.76 |
7219
|
77219
|
4489
|
|
|
|
|
09/1943 |
|
12/1954 |
|
11.25 |
|
|
|
|
7220
|
77220
|
|
|
3014
|
63014
|
90014
|
09/1943 |
|
24/04/1967 |
|
23.58 |
Cut |
Arnott Young (Dinsdale) |
07/1967 |
23.85 |
7221
|
77221
|
|
|
|
|
90191
|
09/1943 |
|
05/02/1960 |
|
16.42 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Stratford) |
28/02/1960 |
16.47 |
7222
|
77222
|
|
|
|
|
90192
|
09/1943 |
|
04/05/1963 |
|
19.67 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
10/1963 |
20.10 |
7223
|
77223
|
|
|
3020
|
63020
|
90020
|
10/1943 |
|
06/1967 |
|
23.67 |
Cut |
Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) |
09/1967 |
23.93 |
7224
|
77224
|
4414
|
|
|
|
|
10/1943 |
|
11/1949 |
|
6.08 |
|
|
|
|
7225
|
77225
|
|
|
|
|
90193
|
10/1943 |
|
19/08/1963 |
|
19.83 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Inverurie) |
09/1963 |
19.93 |
7226
|
77226
|
|
|
|
|
90194
|
10/1943 |
|
21/03/1964 |
|
20.42 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
05/1964 |
20.60 |
7227
|
77227
|
|
|
|
|
90195
|
10/1943 |
|
03/10/1965 |
|
22 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
01/1966 |
22.27 |
7228
|
77228
|
|
|
|
|
90196
|
10/1943 |
|
05/09/1962 |
|
18.92 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Stratford) |
11/1962 |
19.10 |
7229
|
77229
|
|
|
|
|
90197
|
10/1943 |
|
04/1964 |
|
20.5 |
Cut |
Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) |
12/1964 |
21.18 |
7230
|
77230
|
|
|
|
|
90198
|
10/1943 |
|
17/12/1962 |
|
19.17 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) |
04/1963 |
19.51 |
7231
|
77231
|
|
|
|
|
90199
|
10/1943 |
|
24/11/1966 |
|
23.08 |
Cut |
Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) |
05/1967 |
23.60 |
7232
|
77232
|
|
|
|
|
90200
|
10/1943 |
|
01/07/1967 |
|
23.75 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
10/1967 |
24.02 |
7233
|
77233
|
|
|
3021
|
63021
|
90021
|
10/1943 |
|
12/11/1962 |
|
19.08 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
03/1963 |
19.43 |
7234
|
77234
|
|
|
|
|
90201
|
10/1943 |
|
11/07/1964 |
|
20.75 |
Cut |
Garrex Metals (Rochdale) |
02/1965 |
21.35 |
7235
|
77235
|
|
|
|
|
90202
|
10/1943 |
|
11/04/1965 |
|
21.5 |
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
07/1965 |
21.76 |
7236
|
77236
|
|
|
3022
|
63022
|
90022
|
10/1943 |
|
31/10/1962 |
|
19 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
12/1962 |
19.18 |
7237
|
77237
|
|
|
|
|
90203
|
10/1943 |
|
17/10/1965 |
|
22 |
Cut |
Arnott Young (Dinsdale) |
04/1966 |
22.52 |
7238
|
77238
|
|
|
|
|
|
10/1943 |
|
08/1945 |
|
1.83 |
|
|
|
|
7239
|
77239
|
|
|
|
|
90204
|
10/1943 |
|
19/06/1965 |
|
21.67 |
Cut |
T W Ward (Killamarsh) |
10/1965 |
22.02 |
7240
|
77240
|
4417
|
|
|
|
|
10/1943 |
|
11/1954 |
|
11.08 |
|
|
|
|
7241
|
77241
|
|
|
|
|
90205
|
01/1943 |
|
07/03/1964 |
|
21.17 |
Cut |
Albert Looms (Spondon) |
11/1964 |
21.85 |
7242
|
77242
|
|
|
|
|
90206
|
01/1943 |
|
27/04/1963 |
|
20.25 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Horwich) |
09/1964 |
21.68 |
7243
|
77243
|
|
|
3027
|
63027
|
90027
|
01/1943 |
|
27/05/1963 |
|
20.33 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
06/1963 |
20.43 |
7244
|
77244
|
4418
|
|
|
|
|
11/1943 |
|
10/1957 |
|
13.92 |
|
|
|
|
7245
|
77245
|
4419
|
|
|
|
|
11/1943 |
|
01/1954 |
|
10.17 |
|
|
|
|
7246
|
77246
|
4420
|
|
|
|
|
11/1943 |
|
12/1954 |
|
11.08 |
|
|
|
|
7247
|
77247
|
|
|
|
|
90207
|
01/1943 |
|
22/05/1965 |
|
22.33 |
Cut |
Arnott Young (Dinsdale) |
08/1965 |
22.60 |
7248
|
77248
|
|
|
|
|
90208
|
01/1943 |
|
01/01/1964 |
|
21 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
03/1964 |
21.18 |
7249
|
77249
|
|
|
|
|
90209
|
01/1943 |
|
06/1964 |
|
21.42 |
Cut |
T W Ward (Killamarsh) |
02/1965 |
22.10 |
7250
|
77250
|
|
|
3028
|
63028
|
90028
|
01/1943 |
|
29/12/1962 |
|
19.92 |
Cut |
Arnott Young (Parkgate) |
04/1963 |
20.26 |
7251
|
77251
|
|
|
3029
|
63029
|
90029
|
01/1943 |
|
04/07/1965 |
|
22.5 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
11/1965 |
22.85 |
7252
|
77252
|
|
|
|
|
90210
|
01/1943 |
|
01/07/1967 |
|
24.5 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
12/1967 |
24.93 |
7253
|
77253
|
|
|
|
|
90211
|
01/1943 |
|
18/07/1965 |
|
22.5 |
Cut |
T W Ward (Beighton) |
10/1965 |
22.76 |
7254
|
77254
|
|
|
3030
|
63030
|
90030
|
01/1943 |
|
17/04/1967 |
|
24.25 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
08/1967 |
24.60 |
7255
|
77255
|
|
|
|
|
90212
|
01/1943 |
|
15/08/1965 |
|
22.58 |
Cut |
Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) |
10/1965 |
22.76 |
7256
|
77256
|
|
|
|
|
90213
|
01/1943 |
|
13/02/1966 |
|
23.08 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
06/1966 |
23.43 |
7257
|
77257
|
|
|
|
|
90214
|
01/1943 |
|
07/03/1964 |
|
21.17 |
Cut |
Hesslewoods (Attercliffe) |
12/1964 |
21.93 |
7258
|
77258
|
|
|
|
|
90215
|
01/1943 |
|
04/1965 |
|
22.25 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
08/1965 |
22.60 |
7259
|
77259
|
|
|
|
|
90216
|
02/1943 |
|
07/1964 |
|
21.42 |
Cut |
Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) |
12/1964 |
21.85 |
7260
|
77260
|
|
|
|
|
90217
|
02/1943 |
|
21/06/1965 |
|
22.33 |
Cut |
Ellis Metals (Derwenthaugh Road, Swalwell) |
10/1965 |
22.68 |
7261
|
77261
|
|
|
|
|
90218
|
02/1943 |
|
25/04/1964 |
|
21.17 |
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
10/1964 |
21.68 |
7262
|
77262
|
4421
|
|
|
|
|
12/1943 |
|
11/1949 |
|
5.92 |
|
|
|
|
7263
|
77263
|
|
|
|
|
90346
|
06/1944 |
|
24/10/1965 |
|
21.33 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
02/1966 |
21.68 |
7264
|
77264
|
4346
|
|
|
|
|
07/1944 |
|
12/1953 |
|
9.42 |
|
|
|
|
7265
|
77265
|
|
|
3070
|
63070
|
90070
|
06/1944 |
|
21/02/1965 |
|
20.67 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
05/1965 |
20.93 |
7266
|
77266
|
4347
|
|
|
|
|
07/1944 |
|
04/1957 |
|
12.75 |
|
|
|
|
7267
|
77267
|
4348
|
|
|
|
|
07/1944 |
|
11/1955 |
|
11.33 |
|
|
|
|
7268
|
77268
|
|
22
|
|
|
|
07/1944 |
|
27/08/1957 |
|
13.08 |
|
|
|
|
7269
|
77269
|
|
27
|
|
|
|
07/1944 |
|
03/1962 |
|
17.67 |
|
|
|
|
7270
|
77270
|
|
|
|
|
90347
|
07/1944 |
|
24/05/1967 |
|
22.83 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
09/1967 |
23.18 |
7271
|
77271
|
|
|
|
|
90348
|
07/1944 |
|
09/09/1967 |
|
23.17 |
Cut |
Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) |
10/1967 |
23.27 |
7272
|
77272
|
|
|
3075
|
63075
|
90075
|
08/1944 |
|
17/04/1966 |
|
21.67 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
09/1966 |
22.10 |
7273
|
77273
|
4349
|
|
|
|
|
08/1944 |
|
09/1953 |
|
9.08 |
|
|
|
|
7274
|
77274
|
|
|
|
|
90349
|
08/1944 |
|
13/06/1965 |
|
20.83 |
Cut |
Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) |
02/1966 |
21.52 |
7275
|
77275
|
4422
|
|
|
|
|
08/1944 |
|
12/1956 |
|
12.33 |
|
|
|
|
7276
|
77276
|
|
|
3076
|
63076
|
90076
|
08/1944 |
|
09/09/1967 |
|
23.08 |
Cut |
Arnott Young (Dinsdale) |
11/1967 |
23.27 |
7277
|
77277
|
|
|
3077
|
63077
|
90077
|
08/1944 |
|
06/05/1963 |
|
18.75 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Inverurie) |
07/1963 |
18.93 |
7278
|
77278
|
|
|
|
|
90350
|
08/1944 |
|
22/08/1966 |
|
22 |
Cut |
J McWilliams (Shettleston) |
11/1966 |
22.27 |
7279
|
77279
|
|
|
3078
|
63078
|
90078
|
08/1944 |
|
27/11/1966 |
|
22.25 |
Cut |
W Willoughby (Choppington) |
07/1967 |
22.93 |
7280
|
77280
|
|
|
|
|
90351
|
08/1944 |
|
22/09/1967 |
|
23.08 |
Cut |
Arnott Young (Parkgate) |
12/1967 |
23.35 |
7281
|
77281
|
|
|
3079
|
63079
|
90079
|
08/1944 |
|
17/01/1964 |
|
19.42 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
02/1964 |
19.52 |
7282
|
77282
|
4350
|
|
|
|
|
08/1944 |
|
11/1949 |
|
5.25 |
|
|
|
|
7283
|
77283
|
|
|
|
|
90352
|
08/1944 |
|
24/06/1967 |
|
22.83 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
12/1967 |
23.35 |
7284
|
77284
|
|
|
3080
|
63080
|
90080
|
08/1944 |
|
27/02/1966 |
|
21.5 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
07/1966 |
21.93 |
7285
|
77285
|
|
|
|
|
90353
|
08/1944 |
|
22/02/1965 |
|
20.5 |
Cut |
T W Ward (Killamarsh) |
08/1965 |
21.01 |
7286
|
77286
|
|
|
|
|
90354
|
08/1944 |
|
10/10/1964 |
|
20.17 |
Cut |
T W Ward (Killamarsh) |
02/1965 |
20.52 |
7287
|
77287
|
4351
|
|
|
|
|
08/1944 |
|
01/1954 |
|
9.42 |
|
|
|
|
7288
|
77288
|
|
|
|
|
90355
|
08/1944 |
|
12/11/1962 |
|
18.25 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
11/1962 |
18.26 |
7289
|
77289
|
|
|
|
|
90356
|
08/1944 |
|
12/11/1962 |
|
18.25 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
11/1962 |
18.26 |
7290
|
77290
|
|
|
3081
|
63081
|
90081
|
08/1944 |
|
24/06/1967 |
|
22.83 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
12/1967 |
23.35 |
7291
|
77291
|
|
|
|
|
90357
|
09/1944 |
|
13/09/1966 |
|
22 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
12/1966 |
22.26 |
7292
|
77292
|
|
|
|
|
90358
|
09/1944 |
|
25/11/1963 |
|
19.17 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
02/1964 |
19.43 |
7293
|
77293
|
4352
|
|
|
|
|
09/1944 |
|
09/1953 |
|
9 |
|
|
|
|
7294
|
77294
|
|
|
|
|
90359
|
09/1944 |
|
19/09/1964 |
|
20 |
Cut |
Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) |
01/1965 |
20.35 |
7295
|
77295
|
4353
|
|
|
|
|
09/1944 |
|
04/1957 |
|
12.58 |
|
|
|
|
7296
|
77296
|
|
|
|
|
90360
|
09/1944 |
|
09/09/1967 |
|
23 |
Cut |
Arnott Young (Dinsdale) |
11/1967 |
23.18 |
7297
|
77297
|
|
|
|
|
90361
|
09/1944 |
|
24/04/1967 |
|
22.58 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
08/1967 |
22.93 |
7298
|
77298
|
|
|
3082
|
63082
|
90082
|
09/1944 |
|
24/07/1966 |
|
21.83 |
Cut |
T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) |
10/1966 |
22.10 |
7299
|
77299
|
|
|
|
|
90362
|
09/1944 |
|
24/06/1967 |
|
22.75 |
Cut |
Arnott Young (Parkgate) |
11/1967 |
23.18 |
7300
|
77300
|
|
|
3003
|
63003
|
90003
|
03/1943 |
|
25/06/1964 |
|
21.25 |
Cut |
T W Ward (Beighton) |
08/1964 |
21.44 |
7301
|
77301
|
4423
|
|
|
|
|
04/1943 |
|
12/1954 |
|
11.67 |
|
|
|
|
7302
|
77302
|
|
|
|
|
90219
|
04/1943 |
|
16/05/1964 |
|
21.08 |
Cut |
Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) |
06/1964 |
21.18 |
7303
|
77303
|
|
|
|
|
90220
|
04/1943 |
|
14/11/1965 |
|
22.58 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
03/1966 |
22.93 |
7304
|
77304
|
4355
|
|
|
|
|
04/1943 |
|
07/1956 |
|
13.25 |
|
|
|
|
7305
|
77305
|
|
|
|
|
90221
|
04/1943 |
|
31/01/1965 |
|
21.75 |
Cut |
Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) |
04/1965 |
22.02 |
7306
|
77306
|
|
|
|
|
90222
|
04/1943 |
|
07/08/1965 |
|
22.33 |
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
01/1966 |
22.77 |
7307
|
77307
|
|
|
|
|
90223
|
04/1943 |
|
03/1965 |
|
21.92 |
Cut |
Garnham, Harris and Elton (Chesterfield) |
10/1965 |
22.52 |
7308
|
77308
|
4356
|
|
|
|
|
04/1943 |
|
12/1956 |
|
13.67 |
|
|
|
|
7309
|
77309
|
|
|
|
|
90224
|
05/1943 |
|
24/03/1964 |
|
20.83 |
Cut |
T W Ward (Killamarsh) |
07/1964 |
21.18 |
7310
|
77310
|
|
|
|
|
90225
|
05/1943 |
|
11/04/1965 |
|
21.92 |
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
07/1965 |
22.18 |
7311
|
77311
|
|
|
|
|
90226
|
05/1943 |
|
21/12/1963 |
|
20.58 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
02/1964 |
20.77 |
7312
|
77312
|
|
|
|
|
90227
|
05/1943 |
|
26/09/1965 |
|
22.33 |
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
02/1966 |
22.77 |
7313
|
77313
|
|
|
|
|
90228
|
05/1943 |
|
02/09/1963 |
|
20.33 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
09/1963 |
20.35 |
7314
|
77314
|
|
|
|
|
90229
|
05/1943 |
|
02/09/1966 |
|
23.33 |
Cut |
J McWilliams (Shettleston) |
12/1966 |
23.60 |
7315
|
77315
|
|
|
|
|
90230
|
05/1943 |
|
24/05/1967 |
|
24 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
10/1967 |
24.44 |
7316
|
77316
|
|
|
3006
|
63006
|
90006
|
05/1943 |
|
02/09/1963 |
|
20.33 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
09/1963 |
20.35 |
7317
|
77317
|
|
|
|
|
90231
|
05/1943 |
|
17/08/1963 |
|
20.25 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Horwich) |
10/1963 |
20.43 |
7318
|
77318
|
|
|
3007
|
63007
|
90007
|
05/1943 |
|
11/07/1965 |
|
22.17 |
Cut |
Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) |
02/1966 |
22.77 |
7319
|
77319
|
|
|
|
|
90232
|
05/1943 |
|
02/01/1966 |
|
22.67 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
04/1966 |
22.93 |
7320
|
77320
|
|
|
|
|
90233
|
06/1943 |
|
24/05/1967 |
|
23.92 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
12/1967 |
24.52 |
7321
|
77321
|
|
|
|
|
90234
|
06/1943 |
|
29/11/1963 |
|
20.42 |
Cut |
J McWilliams (Shettleston) |
05/1964 |
20.93 |
7322
|
77322
|
|
|
3008
|
63008
|
90008
|
06/1943 |
|
10/04/1967 |
|
23.83 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
06/1967 |
24.02 |
7323
|
77323
|
|
|
|
|
90235
|
06/1943 |
|
03/10/1965 |
|
22.33 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
01/1966 |
22.60 |
7324
|
77324
|
|
|
|
|
90236
|
06/1943 |
|
09/09/1967 |
|
24.25 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
28/02/1968 |
24.72 |
7325
|
77325
|
|
|
|
|
90237
|
06/1943 |
|
25/01/1964 |
|
20.58 |
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
07/1964 |
21.10 |
7326
|
77326
|
|
|
|
|
90238
|
06/1943 |
|
16/03/1963 |
|
19.75 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
06/1963 |
20.01 |
7327
|
77327
|
|
|
|
|
90239
|
06/1943 |
|
25/11/1963 |
|
20.42 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
01/1964 |
20.60 |
7328
|
77328
|
|
|
|
|
90240
|
06/1943 |
|
09/01/1967 |
|
23.58 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
06/1967 |
24.02 |
7329
|
77329
|
|
|
|
|
90241
|
06/1943 |
|
09/01/1966 |
|
22.58 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
05/1966 |
22.93 |
7330
|
77330
|
|
|
|
|
90242
|
06/1943 |
|
19/09/1965 |
|
22.25 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
01/1966 |
22.60 |
7331
|
77331
|
4359
|
|
|
|
|
06/1943 |
|
11/1949 |
|
6.42 |
|
|
|
|
7332
|
77332
|
|
|
|
|
90243
|
07/1943 |
|
24/06/1967 |
|
23.92 |
Cut |
Arnott Young (Parkgate) |
11/1967 |
24.35 |
7333
|
77333
|
4491
|
|
|
|
|
07/1943 |
|
11/1949 |
|
6.33 |
|
|
|
|
7334
|
77334
|
|
|
|
|
90244
|
07/1943 |
|
09/08/1962 |
|
19.08 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Stratford) |
11/1962 |
19.35 |
7335
|
77335
|
|
|
|
|
90245
|
07/1943 |
|
04/1964 |
|
20.75 |
Cut |
Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) |
08/1964 |
21.10 |
7336
|
77336
|
|
|
3009
|
63009
|
90009
|
07/1943 |
|
01/09/1967 |
|
24.17 |
Cut |
Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) |
11/1967 |
24.35 |
7337
|
77337
|
|
|
|
|
|
07/1943 |
|
1965 |
|
21.42 |
|
|
|
|
7338
|
77338
|
|
|
|
|
90246
|
07/1943 |
|
04/1965 |
|
21.75 |
Cut |
Arnott Young (Dinsdale) |
07/1965 |
22.02 |
7339
|
77339
|
|
|
3010
|
63010
|
90010
|
07/1943 |
|
06/02/1965 |
|
21.58 |
Cut |
T W Ward (Beighton) |
08/1965 |
22.10 |
7340
|
77340
|
|
|
|
|
90247
|
08/1943 |
|
12/11/1962 |
|
19.25 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Gorton) |
03/1963 |
19.59 |
7341
|
77341
|
4361
|
|
|
|
|
08/1943 |
|
11/1949 |
|
6.25 |
|
|
|
|
7342
|
77342
|
|
|
|
|
90248
|
08/1943 |
|
07/11/1965 |
|
22.25 |
Cut |
W George, Station Steel (Wath) |
03/1966 |
22.60 |
7343
|
77343
|
|
|
3011
|
63011
|
90011
|
08/1943 |
|
05/06/1966 |
|
22.83 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
10/1966 |
23.18 |
7344
|
77344
|
4492
|
|
|
|
|
08/1943 |
|
11/1949 |
|
6.25 |
|
|
|
|
7345
|
77345
|
4424
|
|
|
|
|
08/1943 |
|
11/1949 |
|
6.25 |
|
|
|
|
7346
|
77346
|
4425
|
|
|
|
|
08/1943 |
|
11/1949 |
|
6.25 |
|
|
|
|
7347
|
77347
|
4426
|
|
|
|
|
08/1943 |
|
11/1949 |
|
6.25 |
|
|
|
|
7348
|
77348
|
|
|
|
|
90249
|
08/1943 |
|
23/12/1963 |
|
20.33 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
02/1964 |
20.52 |
7349
|
77349
|
4427
|
|
|
|
|
08/1943 |
|
11/1949 |
|
6.25 |
|
|
|
|
7350
|
77350
|
|
|
|
|
90250
|
08/1943 |
|
24/03/1963 |
|
19.58 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
05/1963 |
19.76 |
7351
|
77351
|
|
|
|
|
90251
|
08/1943 |
|
11/05/1963 |
|
19.75 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
10/1963 |
20.18 |
7352
|
77352
|
|
|
|
|
90252
|
09/1943 |
|
26/09/1965 |
|
22 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
12/1965 |
22.27 |
7353
|
77353
|
|
|
|
|
90253
|
09/1943 |
|
29/12/1962 |
|
19.25 |
Cut |
T W Ward (Beighton) |
05/1963 |
19.68 |
7354
|
77354
|
|
|
3015
|
63015
|
90015
|
09/1943 |
|
18/05/1963 |
|
19.67 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
07/1963 |
19.84 |
7355
|
77355
|
|
|
|
|
90254
|
09/1943 |
|
31/01/1967 |
|
23.33 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
09/1967 |
24.02 |
7356
|
77356
|
|
|
|
|
90255
|
09/1943 |
|
26/12/1965 |
|
22.25 |
Cut |
W George, Station Steel (Wath) |
03/1966 |
22.51 |
7357
|
77357
|
|
|
3016
|
63016
|
90016
|
09/1943 |
|
24/06/1967 |
|
23.75 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
11/1967 |
24.18 |
7358
|
77358
|
|
|
|
|
90256
|
09/1943 |
|
27/08/1962 |
|
18.92 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Stratford) |
11/1962 |
19.18 |
7359
|
77359
|
|
|
|
|
90257
|
09/1943 |
|
07/1964 |
|
20.83 |
Cut |
Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) |
01/1965 |
21.35 |
7360
|
77360
|
|
|
3017
|
63017
|
90017
|
09/1943 |
|
16/09/1963 |
|
20 |
Cut |
Campbells (Airdrie) |
12/1963 |
20.26 |
7361
|
77361
|
4428
|
|
|
|
|
09/1943 |
|
11/1957 |
|
14.17 |
|
|
|
|
7362
|
77362
|
|
|
|
|
90258
|
09/1943 |
|
23/01/1966 |
|
22.33 |
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
06/1966 |
22.76 |
7363
|
77363
|
|
|
3018
|
63018
|
90018
|
09/1943 |
|
17/04/1966 |
|
22.58 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
08/1966 |
22.93 |
7364
|
77364
|
|
|
|
|
90259
|
09/1943 |
|
03/10/1965 |
|
22.08 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
01/1966 |
22.35 |
7365
|
77365
|
|
|
|
|
90260
|
09/1943 |
|
02/09/1963 |
|
20 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
09/1963 |
20.01 |
7366
|
77366
|
4429
|
|
|
|
|
09/1943 |
|
01/1954 |
|
10.33 |
|
|
|
|
7367
|
77367
|
|
|
3019
|
63019
|
90019
|
09/1943 |
|
17/12/1963 |
|
20.25 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Inverurie) |
12/1963 |
20.26 |
7368
|
77368
|
|
|
|
|
90261
|
09/1943 |
|
10/07/1965 |
|
21.83 |
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
12/1965 |
22.27 |
7369
|
77369
|
|
|
3023
|
63023
|
90023
|
10/1943 |
|
05/09/1962 |
|
18.92 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Stratford) |
12/1962 |
19.18 |
7370
|
77370
|
|
|
3024
|
63024
|
90024
|
10/1943 |
|
27/02/1966 |
|
22.33 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
06/1966 |
22.68 |
7371
|
77371
|
|
|
|
|
90262
|
10/1943 |
|
24/06/1967 |
|
23.67 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
01/1968 |
24.27 |
7372
|
77372
|
|
|
|
|
90263
|
10/1943 |
|
05/01/1964 |
|
20.25 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
05/1964 |
20.60 |
7373
|
77373
|
|
|
3025
|
63025
|
90025
|
10/1943 |
|
01/08/1965 |
|
21.83 |
Cut |
Arnott Young (Parkgate) |
10/1965 |
22.02 |
7374
|
77374
|
|
|
|
|
90264
|
10/1943 |
|
29/08/1964 |
|
20.83 |
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
02/1965 |
21.35 |
7375
|
77375
|
|
|
|
|
90265
|
10/1943 |
|
24/06/1967 |
|
23.67 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
12/1967 |
24.18 |
7376
|
77376
|
4526
|
|
|
|
|
10/1943 |
|
11/1949 |
|
6.08 |
|
|
|
|
7377
|
77377
|
4527
|
|
|
|
|
10/1943 |
|
09/1955 |
|
11.92 |
|
|
|
|
7378
|
77378
|
|
|
|
|
90266
|
10/1943 |
|
25/07/1965 |
|
21.75 |
Cut |
Arnott Young (Parkgate) |
09/1965 |
21.93 |
7379
|
77379
|
|
|
|
|
90267
|
10/1943 |
|
13/03/1965 |
|
21.42 |
Cut |
T W Ward (Beighton) |
06/1965 |
21.68 |
7380
|
77380
|
|
|
|
|
90268
|
10/1943 |
|
10/04/1965 |
|
21.5 |
Cut |
Hayes (Bridgend) |
08/1965 |
21.85 |
7381
|
77381
|
|
|
|
|
90269
|
10/1943 |
|
18/05/1963 |
|
19.58 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
07/1963 |
19.76 |
7382
|
77382
|
|
|
3026
|
63026
|
90026
|
10/1943 |
|
09/12/1963 |
|
20.17 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
01/1964 |
20.27 |
7383
|
77383
|
4430
|
|
|
|
|
10/1943 |
|
09/1954 |
|
10.92 |
|
|
|
|
7384
|
77384
|
4431
|
|
|
|
|
10/1943 |
|
07/1957 |
|
13.75 |
|
|
|
|
7385
|
77385
|
|
|
3031
|
63031
|
90031
|
11/1943 |
|
18/05/1963 |
|
19.5 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
07/1963 |
19.68 |
7386
|
77386
|
|
|
|
|
90270
|
11/1943 |
|
29/12/1962 |
|
19.08 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
07/1963 |
19.68 |
7387
|
77387
|
4432
|
|
|
|
|
11/1943 |
|
09/1953 |
|
9.83 |
|
|
|
|
7388
|
77388
|
|
|
|
|
90271
|
11/1943 |
|
18/07/1965 |
|
21.67 |
Cut |
T W Ward (Beighton) |
11/1965 |
22.02 |
7389
|
77389
|
4433
|
|
|
|
|
11/1943 |
|
06/1955 |
|
11.58 |
|
|
|
|
7390
|
77390
|
|
|
|
|
90272
|
11/1943 |
|
24/06/1967 |
|
23.58 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
12/1967 |
24.10 |
7391
|
77391
|
|
|
3032
|
63032
|
90032
|
11/1943 |
|
27/02/1966 |
|
22.25 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
06/1966 |
22.60 |
7392
|
77392
|
|
|
|
|
90273
|
11/1943 |
|
25/10/1965 |
|
21.92 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
02/1966 |
22.27 |
7393
|
77393
|
|
|
|
|
90274
|
16/11/1943 |
|
02/01/1966 |
|
22.17 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
04/1966 |
22.43 |
7394
|
77394
|
|
|
|
|
90275
|
11/1943 |
|
04/07/1965 |
|
21.67 |
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
11/1965 |
22.02 |
7395
|
77395
|
|
|
|
|
90276
|
11/1943 |
|
28/02/1965 |
|
21.25 |
Cut |
Steelbreaking and Dismantling Co. (Chesterfield) |
08/1965 |
21.76 |
7396
|
77396
|
4493
|
|
|
|
|
11/1943 |
|
11/1949 |
|
6 |
|
|
|
|
7397
|
77397
|
|
|
3033
|
63033
|
90033
|
11/1943 |
|
25/05/1963 |
|
19.5 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
09/1963 |
19.85 |
7398
|
77398
|
|
|
|
|
90277
|
11/1943 |
|
31/10/1965 |
|
21.92 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
03/1966 |
22.35 |
7399
|
77399
|
|
|
|
|
90278
|
11/1943 |
|
29/12/1962 |
|
19.08 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Horwich) |
05/1963 |
19.51 |
7400
|
77400
|
4434
|
|
|
|
|
11/1943 |
|
11/1957 |
|
14 |
|
|
|
|
7401
|
77401
|
|
|
|
|
90279
|
12/1943 |
|
27/06/1965 |
|
21.5 |
Cut |
Arnott Young (Parkgate) |
10/1965 |
21.85 |
7402
|
77402
|
|
|
|
|
90280
|
12/1943 |
|
05/09/1965 |
|
21.75 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
12/1965 |
22.02 |
7403
|
77403
|
4435
|
|
|
|
|
12/1943 |
|
02/1957 |
|
13.17 |
|
|
|
|
7404
|
77404
|
|
|
|
|
90281
|
12/1943 |
|
24/06/1967 |
|
23.5 |
Cut |
Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) |
11/1967 |
23.93 |
7405
|
77405
|
4436
|
|
|
|
|
12/1943 |
|
12/1954 |
|
11 |
|
|
|
|
7406
|
77406
|
|
|
|
|
90282
|
12/1943 |
|
10/01/1965 |
|
21.08 |
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
03/1965 |
21.26 |
7407
|
77407
|
|
|
|
|
90283
|
14/12/1943 |
|
03/10/1965 |
|
21.83 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
01/1966 |
22.10 |
7408
|
77408
|
|
|
|
|
90284
|
12/1943 |
|
06/03/1965 |
|
21.25 |
Cut |
T W Ward (Beighton) |
05/1965 |
21.43 |
7409
|
77409
|
4437
|
|
|
|
|
12/1943 |
|
03/1955 |
|
11.25 |
|
|
|
|
7410
|
77410
|
|
|
3034
|
63034
|
90034
|
12/1943 |
|
05/09/1962 |
|
18.75 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Stratford) |
01/1963 |
19.10 |
7411
|
77411
|
|
|
|
|
90285
|
12/1943 |
|
13/06/1965 |
|
21.5 |
Cut |
Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) |
09/1965 |
21.77 |
7412
|
77412
|
|
|
3035
|
63035
|
90035
|
12/1943 |
|
27/02/1966 |
|
22.17 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
07/1966 |
22.60 |
7413
|
77413
|
|
|
|
|
90286
|
12/1943 |
|
15/08/1962 |
|
18.67 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Gorton) |
09/1962 |
18.76 |
7414
|
77414
|
|
|
|
|
90287
|
12/1943 |
|
29/12/1962 |
|
19 |
Cut |
Arnott Young (Avonmour Ironworks, Bilston) |
04/1963 |
19.35 |
7415
|
77415
|
|
|
|
|
90288
|
12/1943 |
|
16/09/1962 |
|
18.75 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
12/1962 |
19.01 |
7416
|
77416
|
|
|
|
|
90289
|
12/1943 |
|
21/11/1964 |
|
20.92 |
Cut |
W.E.Smiths (Ecclesfield) |
05/1965 |
21.43 |
7417
|
77417
|
4438
|
|
|
|
|
01/1944 |
|
11/1955 |
|
11.83 |
|
|
|
|
7418
|
77418
|
|
|
|
|
90290
|
01/1944 |
|
02/05/1965 |
|
21.33 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
07/1965 |
21.51 |
7419
|
77419
|
|
|
|
|
90291
|
01/1944 |
|
06/02/1965 |
|
21.08 |
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
05/1965 |
21.35 |
7420
|
77420
|
|
|
3036
|
63036
|
90036
|
01/1944 |
|
19/12/1965 |
|
21.92 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
04/1966 |
22.26 |
7421
|
77421
|
|
|
|
|
90292
|
01/1944 |
|
17/10/1965 |
|
21.75 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
01/1966 |
22.02 |
7422
|
77422
|
|
|
3037
|
63037
|
90037
|
01/1944 |
|
17/04/1966 |
|
22.25 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
08/1966 |
22.60 |
7423
|
77423
|
|
|
3038
|
63038
|
90038
|
01/1944 |
|
01/08/1965 |
|
21.58 |
Cut |
Arnott Young (Parkgate) |
11/1965 |
21.85 |
7424
|
77424
|
|
|
|
|
90293
|
01/1944 |
|
26/09/1965 |
|
21.67 |
Cut |
T W Ward (Beighton) |
10/1965 |
21.76 |
7425
|
77425
|
|
|
|
|
90294
|
01/1944 |
|
11/07/1965 |
|
21.5 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
10/1965 |
21.76 |
7426
|
77426
|
|
|
|
|
90295
|
01/1944 |
|
02/01/1966 |
|
22 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
05/1966 |
22.35 |
7427
|
77427
|
|
|
3039
|
63039
|
90039
|
01/1944 |
|
02/09/1966 |
|
22.67 |
Cut |
J McWilliams (Shettleston) |
12/1966 |
22.93 |
7428
|
77428
|
|
|
|
|
90296
|
01/1944 |
|
08/08/1965 |
|
21.58 |
Cut |
T W Ward (Beighton) |
11/1965 |
21.85 |
7429
|
77429
|
|
|
|
|
90297
|
01/1944 |
|
05/09/1964 |
|
20.67 |
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
02/1965 |
21.10 |
7430
|
77430
|
|
|
3040
|
63040
|
90040
|
01/1944 |
|
31/07/1965 |
|
21.5 |
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
12/1965 |
21.93 |
7431
|
77431
|
|
|
|
|
90298
|
01/1944 |
|
06/08/1962 |
|
18.58 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Stratford) |
09/1962 |
18.68 |
7432
|
77432
|
|
|
|
|
90299
|
02/1944 |
|
25/04/1964 |
|
20.17 |
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
10/1964 |
20.68 |
7433
|
77433
|
|
|
|
|
90300
|
02/1944 |
|
24/06/1967 |
|
23.33 |
Cut |
Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) |
10/1967 |
23.68 |
7434
|
77434
|
|
|
|
|
90301
|
02/1944 |
|
26/09/1965 |
|
21.58 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
11/1965 |
21.76 |
7435
|
77435
|
|
|
3041
|
63041
|
90041
|
02/1944 |
|
31/12/1966 |
|
22.83 |
Cut |
J McWilliams (Shettleston) |
04/1967 |
23.18 |
7436
|
77436
|
|
|
|
|
90302
|
02/1944 |
|
18/08/1964 |
|
20.5 |
Cut |
T W Ward (Killamarsh) |
11/1964 |
20.76 |
7437
|
77437
|
|
|
3042
|
63042
|
90042
|
02/1944 |
|
10/01/1965 |
|
20.92 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
04/1965 |
21.18 |
7438
|
77438
|
4371
|
|
|
|
|
02/1944 |
|
04/1955 |
|
11.17 |
|
|
|
|
7439
|
77439
|
|
|
|
|
90303
|
02/1944 |
|
29/12/1962 |
|
18.83 |
Cut |
Arnott Young (Avonmour Ironworks, Bilston) |
04/1963 |
19.18 |
7440
|
77440
|
|
|
|
|
90304
|
02/1944 |
|
07/09/1964 |
|
20.58 |
Cut |
T W Ward (Killamarsh) |
01/1965 |
20.93 |
7441
|
77441
|
|
|
|
|
90305
|
02/1944 |
|
06/03/1966 |
|
22.08 |
Cut |
W George, Station Steel (Wath) |
08/1966 |
22.51 |
7442
|
77442
|
|
|
|
|
90306
|
02/1944 |
|
27/06/1965 |
|
21.33 |
Cut |
T W Ward (Beighton) |
11/1965 |
21.76 |
7443
|
77443
|
|
|
|
|
90307
|
02/1944 |
|
29/12/1962 |
|
18.83 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
06/1963 |
19.34 |
7444
|
77444
|
|
|
|
|
90308
|
02/1944 |
|
12/11/1962 |
|
18.75 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
05/1963 |
19.26 |
7445
|
77445
|
|
|
|
|
90309
|
02/1944 |
|
01/07/1967 |
|
23.42 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
10/1967 |
23.68 |
7446
|
77446
|
4372
|
|
|
|
|
02/1944 |
|
05/1956 |
|
12.25 |
|
|
|
|
7447
|
77447
|
|
|
|
|
90310
|
02/1944 |
|
19/12/1966 |
|
22.83 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
03/1967 |
23.09 |
7448
|
77448
|
|
|
3043
|
63043
|
90043
|
03/1944 |
|
12/12/1965 |
|
21.75 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
04/1966 |
22.10 |
7449
|
77449
|
|
|
|
|
90311
|
03/1944 |
|
18/08/1964 |
|
20.42 |
Cut |
T W Ward (Killamarsh) |
11/1964 |
20.68 |
7450
|
77450
|
|
30
|
|
|
|
12/1943 |
|
08/1957 |
|
13.67 |
|
|
|
|
7451
|
77451
|
|
|
|
|
90595
|
12/1943 |
|
08/02/1964 |
|
20.17 |
Cut |
Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) |
09/1964 |
20.77 |
7452
|
77452
|
|
|
|
|
90596
|
12/1943 |
|
04/04/1967 |
|
23.33 |
Cut |
Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) |
09/1967 |
23.77 |
7453
|
77453
|
|
|
|
|
90597
|
12/1943 |
|
08/07/1963 |
|
19.58 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
07/1963 |
19.59 |
7454
|
77454
|
|
|
|
|
90598
|
12/1943 |
|
25/02/1964 |
|
20.17 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
03/1964 |
20.26 |
7455
|
77455
|
|
|
|
|
90599
|
12/1943 |
|
25/07/1964 |
|
20.58 |
Cut |
Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) |
12/1964 |
21.02 |
7456
|
77456
|
|
|
|
|
90600
|
12/1943 |
|
08/1966 |
|
22.67 |
Cut |
J McWilliams (Shettleston) |
11/1966 |
22.93 |
7457
|
77457
|
|
|
|
|
90601
|
12/1943 |
|
06/06/1965 |
|
21.5 |
Cut |
Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) |
12/1965 |
22.02 |
7458
|
77458
|
|
|
|
|
90602
|
12/1943 |
|
10/01/1965 |
|
21.08 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
03/1965 |
21.26 |
7459
|
77459
|
|
|
|
|
90603
|
12/1943 |
|
12/02/1962 |
|
18.17 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
02/1962 |
18.18 |
7460
|
77460
|
|
|
|
|
90604
|
12/1943 |
|
28/12/1963 |
|
20 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
03/1964 |
20.26 |
7461
|
77461
|
|
|
|
|
90605
|
12/1943 |
|
09/09/1967 |
|
23.75 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
04/1968 |
24.35 |
7462
|
77462
|
|
|
|
|
90606
|
12/1943 |
|
12/02/1966 |
|
22.17 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
06/1966 |
22.52 |
7463
|
77463
|
|
|
|
|
90607
|
12/1943 |
|
06/11/1962 |
|
18.92 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
12/1962 |
19.01 |
7464
|
77464
|
|
|
|
|
90608
|
12/1943 |
|
29/12/1962 |
|
19 |
Cut |
Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) |
12/1963 |
20.01 |
7465
|
77465
|
|
|
|
|
90609
|
01/1944 |
|
17/08/1963 |
|
19.58 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
10/1963 |
19.76 |
7466
|
77466
|
|
|
|
|
90610
|
01/1944 |
|
12/05/1967 |
|
23.33 |
Cut |
Arnott Young (Parkgate) |
09/1967 |
23.68 |
7467
|
77467
|
|
|
|
|
90611
|
01/1944 |
|
17/08/1967 |
|
23.58 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
06/1968 |
24.43 |
7468
|
77468
|
|
|
|
|
90612
|
01/1944 |
|
01/03/1964 |
|
20.17 |
Cut |
T W Ward (Killamarsh) |
08/1964 |
20.60 |
7469
|
77469
|
|
|
|
|
90613
|
01/1944 |
|
30/05/1965 |
|
21.33 |
Cut |
Arnott Young (Parkgate) |
08/1965 |
21.60 |
7470
|
77470
|
|
|
|
|
90614
|
01/1944 |
|
29/11/1963 |
|
19.83 |
Cut |
J McWilliams (Shettleston) |
06/1964 |
20.43 |
7471
|
77471
|
|
|
|
|
90615
|
01/1944 |
|
30/09/1967 |
|
23.67 |
Cut |
Arnott Young (Parkgate) |
01/1968 |
24.02 |
7472
|
77472
|
4375
|
|
|
|
|
01/1944 |
|
01/1954 |
|
10 |
|
|
|
|
7473
|
77473
|
|
|
3112
|
63112
|
90433
|
01/1944 |
|
25/04/1964 |
|
20.25 |
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
10/1964 |
20.76 |
7474
|
77474
|
|
|
3113
|
63113
|
90434
|
01/1944 |
|
27/06/1967 |
|
23.42 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
10/1967 |
23.76 |
7475
|
77475
|
4439
|
|
|
|
|
01/1944 |
|
12/1957 |
|
13.92 |
|
|
|
|
7476
|
77476
|
|
|
|
|
90616
|
01/1944 |
|
11/06/1962 |
|
18.42 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) |
11/1962 |
18.85 |
7477
|
77477
|
4440
|
|
|
|
|
01/1944 |
|
07/1957 |
|
13.5 |
|
|
|
|
7478
|
77478
|
|
26
|
|
|
|
01/1944 |
|
05/1963 |
|
19.33 |
|
|
|
|
7479
|
77479
|
|
|
|
|
90617
|
01/1944 |
|
24/06/1967 |
|
23.42 |
Cut |
Arnott Young (Parkgate) |
11/1967 |
23.85 |
7480
|
77480
|
|
|
|
|
90618
|
02/1944 |
|
13/05/1964 |
|
20.25 |
Cut |
Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) |
01/1965 |
20.93 |
7481
|
77481
|
|
|
|
|
90619
|
02/1944 |
|
25/10/1965 |
|
21.67 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
03/1966 |
22.09 |
7482
|
77482
|
|
|
|
|
90620
|
02/1944 |
|
08/06/1967 |
|
23.33 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
03/1968 |
24.10 |
7483
|
77483
|
4441
|
|
|
|
|
02/1944 |
|
12/1956 |
|
12.83 |
|
|
|
|
7484
|
77484
|
|
|
|
|
90621
|
02/1944 |
|
16/11/1965 |
|
21.75 |
Cut |
Ellis Metals (Derwenthaugh Road, Swalwell) |
05/1966 |
22.26 |
7485
|
77485
|
|
|
|
|
90622
|
02/1944 |
|
04/09/1966 |
|
22.58 |
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
01/1967 |
22.93 |
7486
|
77486
|
|
|
3114
|
63114
|
90435
|
02/1944 |
|
02/09/1963 |
|
19.58 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
09/1963 |
19.59 |
7487
|
77487
|
|
|
3115
|
63115
|
90436
|
02/1944 |
|
11/06/1962 |
|
18.33 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
11/1963 |
19.76 |
7488
|
77488
|
|
|
|
|
90623
|
02/1944 |
|
09/12/1963 |
|
19.83 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
03/1964 |
20.09 |
7489
|
77489
|
|
|
|
|
90624
|
02/1944 |
|
16/12/1963 |
|
19.83 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
03/1964 |
20.09 |
7490
|
77490
|
|
25
|
|
|
|
02/1944 |
|
08/1957 |
|
13.5 |
|
|
|
|
7491
|
77491
|
|
|
3116
|
63116
|
90437
|
02/1944 |
|
17/04/1966 |
|
22.17 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
09/1966 |
22.60 |
7492
|
77492
|
|
|
|
|
90625
|
02/1944 |
|
05/1967 |
|
23.25 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
12/1967 |
23.85 |
7493
|
77493
|
|
|
3117
|
63117
|
90438
|
02/1944 |
|
03/10/1965 |
|
21.67 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
01/1966 |
21.93 |
7494
|
77494
|
|
|
|
|
90626
|
02/1944 |
|
27/03/1965 |
|
21.08 |
Cut |
T W Ward (Beighton) |
08/1965 |
21.51 |
7495
|
77495
|
4376
|
|
|
|
|
02/1944 |
|
09/1954 |
|
10.58 |
|
|
|
|
7496
|
77496
|
|
|
3118
|
63118
|
90439
|
03/1944 |
|
07/11/1965 |
|
21.67 |
Cut |
W George, Station Steel (Wath) |
03/1966 |
22.01 |
7497
|
77497
|
|
|
|
|
90627
|
03/1944 |
|
08/1967 |
|
23.42 |
Cut |
Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) |
09/1967 |
23.52 |
7498
|
77498
|
|
|
3119
|
63119
|
90440
|
03/1944 |
|
17/08/1963 |
|
19.42 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Horwich) |
11/1963 |
19.68 |
7499
|
77499
|
|
|
|
|
90628
|
03/1944 |
|
20/01/1967 |
|
22.83 |
Cut |
J McWilliams (Shettleston) |
05/1967 |
23.18 |
7500
|
77500
|
4377
|
|
|
|
|
03/1944 |
|
11/1949 |
|
5.67 |
|
|
|
|
7501
|
77501
|
|
|
3120
|
63120
|
90441
|
03/1944 |
|
19/10/1966 |
|
22.58 |
Cut |
Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) |
05/1967 |
23.18 |
7502
|
77502
|
|
|
3121
|
63121
|
90442
|
03/1944 |
|
04/04/1965 |
|
21.08 |
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
07/1965 |
21.35 |
7503
|
77503
|
|
|
|
|
90629
|
03/1944 |
|
26/09/1965 |
|
21.5 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
12/1965 |
21.77 |
7504
|
77504
|
|
|
3122
|
63122
|
90443
|
03/1944 |
|
27/06/1965 |
|
21.25 |
Cut |
Arnott Young (Parkgate) |
10/1965 |
21.60 |
7505
|
77505
|
|
|
3123
|
63123
|
90444
|
03/1944 |
|
20/01/1967 |
|
22.83 |
Cut |
J McWilliams (Shettleston) |
05/1967 |
23.18 |
7506
|
77506
|
|
|
3124
|
63124
|
90445
|
03/1944 |
|
24/07/1966 |
|
22.33 |
Cut |
T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) |
10/1966 |
22.60 |
7507
|
77507
|
|
|
3125
|
63125
|
90446
|
03/1944 |
|
18/11/1963 |
|
19.67 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
01/1964 |
19.85 |
7508
|
77508
|
|
|
|
|
90630
|
03/1944 |
|
12/11/1962 |
|
18.67 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
11/1963 |
19.68 |
7509
|
77509
|
|
24
|
|
|
|
03/1944 |
|
08/1957 |
|
13.42 |
|
|
|
|
8510
|
78510
|
|
|
|
|
90363
|
09/1944 |
|
24/06/1967 |
|
22.75 |
Cut |
Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) |
11/1967 |
23.18 |
8511
|
78511
|
4378
|
|
|
|
|
09/1944 |
|
04/1955 |
|
10.58 |
|
|
|
|
8512
|
78512
|
|
|
|
|
90364
|
08/09/1944 |
|
05/12/1965 |
|
21.25 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
05/1966 |
21.70 |
8513
|
78513
|
|
|
3083
|
63083
|
90083
|
09/1944 |
|
28/12/1959 |
|
15.25 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
28/02/1960 |
15.46 |
8514
|
78514
|
|
|
|
|
90365
|
09/1944 |
|
20/06/1965 |
|
20.75 |
Cut |
Arnott Young (Parkgate) |
11/1965 |
21.18 |
8515
|
78515
|
|
|
3084
|
63084
|
90084
|
09/1944 |
|
06/06/1965 |
|
20.75 |
Cut |
Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) |
11/1965 |
21.18 |
8516
|
78516
|
|
|
3085
|
63085
|
90085
|
09/1944 |
|
16/05/1965 |
|
20.67 |
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
08/1965 |
20.93 |
8517
|
78517
|
4379
|
|
|
|
|
09/1944 |
|
07/1957 |
|
12.83 |
|
|
|
|
|
78518
|
4380
|
|
|
|
|
09/1944 |
|
09/1953 |
|
9 |
|
|
|
|
|
78519
|
4494
|
|
|
|
|
09/1944 |
|
07/1956 |
|
11.83 |
|
|
|
|
|
78520
|
|
|
3086
|
63086
|
90086
|
09/1944 |
|
12/08/1963 |
|
18.92 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
10/1963 |
19.09 |
|
78521
|
|
|
|
|
90366
|
09/1944 |
|
18/01/1964 |
|
19.33 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
02/1964 |
19.43 |
|
78522
|
|
|
|
|
90367
|
10/1944 |
|
27/02/1966 |
|
21.33 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
07/1966 |
21.76 |
|
78523
|
4381
|
|
|
|
|
10/1944 |
|
05/1956 |
|
11.58 |
|
|
|
|
|
78524
|
4382
|
|
|
|
|
10/1944 |
|
02/1954 |
|
9.33 |
|
|
|
|
|
78525
|
|
|
|
|
90368
|
10/1944 |
|
20/06/1965 |
|
20.67 |
Cut |
Arnott Young (Parkgate) |
09/1965 |
20.93 |
|
78526
|
|
|
|
|
90369
|
10/1944 |
|
17/04/1966 |
|
21.5 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
09/1966 |
21.93 |
|
78527
|
|
|
3089
|
63089
|
90089
|
10/1944 |
|
09/01/1967 |
|
22.25 |
Cut |
Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) |
06/1967 |
22.68 |
|
78528
|
|
|
3090
|
63090
|
90090
|
10/1944 |
|
30/05/1963 |
|
18.58 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
11/1963 |
19.10 |
|
78529
|
4383
|
|
|
|
|
10/1944 |
|
01/1973 |
|
28.25 |
|
|
|
|
|
78530
|
4384
|
|
|
|
|
11/1944 |
|
11/1955 |
|
11 |
|
|
|
|
|
78531
|
|
|
|
|
90408
|
01/1945 |
|
28/03/1964 |
|
19.17 |
Cut |
Albert Looms (Spondon) |
12/1964 |
19.93 |
|
78532
|
|
|
|
|
90409
|
01/1945 |
|
24/06/1967 |
|
22.42 |
Cut |
Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) |
11/1967 |
22.85 |
|
78533
|
4442
|
|
|
|
|
01/1945 |
|
01/1954 |
|
9 |
|
|
|
|
|
78534
|
|
|
3098
|
63098
|
90098
|
01/1945 |
|
10/11/1964 |
|
19.83 |
Cut |
T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) |
02/1965 |
20.10 |
|
78535
|
4443
|
|
|
|
|
02/1945 |
|
09/1955 |
|
10.58 |
|
|
|
|
|
78536
|
4385
|
|
|
|
|
02/1945 |
|
03/1956 |
|
11.08 |
|
|
|
|
|
78537
|
|
|
|
|
90410
|
02/1945 |
|
17/04/1966 |
|
21.17 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
09/1966 |
21.59 |
|
78538
|
|
|
|
|
90411
|
02/1945 |
|
18/08/1964 |
|
19.5 |
Cut |
T W Ward (Killamarsh) |
11/1964 |
19.76 |
|
78539
|
4444
|
|
|
|
|
02/1945 |
|
12/1954 |
|
9.83 |
|
|
|
|
|
78540
|
|
|
3099
|
63099
|
90099
|
02/1945 |
|
24/06/1967 |
|
22.33 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
01/1968 |
22.93 |
|
78541
|
|
|
|
|
90412
|
02/1945 |
|
26/10/1964 |
|
19.67 |
Cut |
Ellis Metals (Derwenthaugh Road, Swalwell) |
12/1965 |
20.84 |
|
78542
|
|
|
|
|
90413
|
02/1945 |
|
12/02/1966 |
|
21 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
06/1966 |
21.34 |
|
78543
|
|
|
|
|
90414
|
02/1945 |
|
29/12/1962 |
|
17.83 |
Cut |
Arnott Young (Avonmour Ironworks, Bilston) |
04/1963 |
18.17 |
|
78544
|
|
|
|
|
90415
|
02/1945 |
|
15/01/1967 |
|
21.92 |
Cut |
Arnott Young (Parkgate) |
06/1967 |
22.34 |
|
78545
|
4445
|
|
|
|
|
02/1945 |
|
03/1953 |
|
8.08 |
|
|
|
|
|
78546
|
|
|
|
|
90416
|
02/1945 |
|
04/1964 |
|
19.17 |
Cut |
Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) |
08/1964 |
19.51 |
|
78547
|
4495
|
|
|
|
|
02/1945 |
|
09/1953 |
|
8.58 |
|
|
|
|
|
78548
|
4446
|
|
|
|
|
02/1945 |
|
09/1953 |
|
8.58 |
|
|
|
|
|
78549
|
4447
|
|
|
|
|
02/1945 |
|
11/1949 |
|
4.75 |
|
|
|
|
|
78550
|
|
|
3100
|
63100
|
90100
|
03/1945 |
|
13/01/1964 |
|
18.83 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
02/1964 |
18.93 |
|
78551
|
|
|
|
|
90417
|
03/1945 |
|
09/09/1967 |
|
22.5 |
Cut |
Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) |
10/1967 |
22.60 |
|
78552
|
4448
|
|
|
|
|
03/1945 |
|
07/1957 |
|
12.33 |
|
|
|
|
|
78553
|
|
|
|
|
90418
|
03/1945 |
|
16/01/1966 |
|
20.83 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
05/1966 |
21.18 |
|
78554
|
|
|
|
|
90419
|
03/1945 |
|
11/04/1965 |
|
20.08 |
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
07/1965 |
20.35 |
|
78555
|
4386
|
|
|
|
|
03/1945 |
|
04/1955 |
|
10.08 |
|
|
|
|
|
78556
|
|
|
|
|
90420
|
03/1945 |
|
06/1965 |
|
20.25 |
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
02/1966 |
20.94 |
|
78557
|
4387
|
|
|
|
|
03/1945 |
|
11/1949 |
|
4.67 |
|
|
|
|
|
78558
|
4480
|
|
|
|
|
03/1945 |
|
09/1953 |
|
8.5 |
|
|
|
|
|
78559
|
|
|
|
|
90421
|
03/1945 |
|
01/08/1965 |
|
20.42 |
Cut |
T W Ward (Beighton) |
12/1965 |
20.77 |
|
78560
|
|
|
|
|
90370
|
09/1944 |
|
15/05/1967 |
|
22.67 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
09/1967 |
23.01 |
|
78561
|
|
|
|
|
90371
|
09/1944 |
|
25/04/1964 |
|
19.58 |
Cut |
Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) |
01/1965 |
20.35 |
|
78562
|
|
|
3087
|
63087
|
90087
|
09/1944 |
|
25/10/1962 |
|
18.08 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
11/1962 |
18.18 |
|
78563
|
|
|
|
|
90372
|
09/1944 |
|
19/12/1965 |
|
21.25 |
Cut |
W George, Station Steel (Wath) |
07/1966 |
21.84 |
|
78564
|
|
|
|
|
90373
|
09/1944 |
|
11/09/1966 |
|
22 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
11/1966 |
22.18 |
|
78565
|
|
|
3088
|
63088
|
90088
|
09/1944 |
|
25/07/1965 |
|
20.83 |
Cut |
T W Ward (Beighton) |
11/1965 |
21.18 |
|
78566
|
4450
|
|
|
|
|
10/1944 |
|
04/1955 |
|
10.5 |
|
|
|
|
|
78567
|
4388
|
|
|
|
|
10/1944 |
|
02/1958 |
|
13.33 |
|
|
|
|
|
78568
|
|
|
|
|
90374
|
10/1944 |
|
28/03/1964 |
|
19.42 |
Cut |
Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) |
09/1964 |
19.93 |
|
78569
|
|
|
|
|
90375
|
10/1944 |
|
04/07/1964 |
|
19.75 |
Cut |
Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) |
11/1964 |
20.10 |
|
78570
|
|
|
3091
|
63091
|
90091
|
10/1944 |
|
24/06/1967 |
|
22.67 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
12/1967 |
23.18 |
|
78571
|
4389
|
|
|
|
|
10/1944 |
|
01/1954 |
|
9.25 |
|
|
|
|
|
78572
|
|
|
|
|
90376
|
10/1944 |
|
29/12/1962 |
|
18.17 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Horwich) |
06/1963 |
18.68 |
|
78573
|
4390
|
|
|
|
|
10/1944 |
|
11/1949 |
|
5.08 |
|
|
|
|
|
78574
|
4391
|
|
|
|
|
10/1944 |
|
02/1957 |
|
12.33 |
|
|
|
|
|
78575
|
|
|
|
|
90377
|
10/1944 |
|
13/02/1966 |
|
21.33 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
06/1966 |
21.68 |
|
78576
|
4392
|
|
|
|
|
10/1944 |
|
11/1949 |
|
5.08 |
|
|
|
|
|
78577
|
|
|
3092
|
63092
|
90092
|
10/1944 |
|
11/10/1965 |
|
21 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
01/1966 |
21.27 |
|
78578
|
|
|
|
|
90378
|
10/1944 |
|
09/09/1967 |
|
22.92 |
Cut |
Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) |
10/1967 |
23.01 |
|
78579
|
4393
|
|
|
|
|
10/1944 |
|
09/1953 |
|
8.92 |
|
|
|
|
|
78580
|
|
|
|
|
90379
|
10/1944 |
|
21/03/1966 |
|
21.42 |
Cut |
Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) |
06/1966 |
21.68 |
|
78581
|
|
|
|
|
90380
|
01/1944 |
|
20/03/1966 |
|
22.17 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
08/1966 |
22.60 |
|
78582
|
|
|
3093
|
63093
|
90093
|
01/1944 |
|
27/08/1962 |
|
18.58 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Stratford) |
11/1962 |
18.85 |
|
78583
|
|
|
|
|
90381
|
01/1944 |
|
24/10/1965 |
|
21.75 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
02/1966 |
22.10 |
|
78584
|
|
|
3094
|
63094
|
90094
|
01/1944 |
|
24/06/1967 |
|
23.42 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
01/1968 |
24.02 |
|
78585
|
|
|
|
|
90382
|
01/1944 |
|
09/09/1967 |
|
23.67 |
Cut |
Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) |
10/1967 |
23.76 |
|
78586
|
4451
|
|
|
|
|
11/1944 |
|
12/1955 |
|
11.08 |
|
|
|
|
|
78587
|
|
|
|
|
90383
|
01/1944 |
|
18/04/1965 |
|
21.25 |
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
07/1965 |
21.51 |
|
78588
|
|
|
|
|
90384
|
01/1944 |
|
27/02/1966 |
|
22.08 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
07/1966 |
22.51 |
|
78589
|
4496
|
|
|
|
|
11/1944 |
|
11/1949 |
|
5 |
|
|
|
|
|
78590
|
|
|
|
|
90385
|
01/1944 |
|
02/1967 |
|
23.08 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
06/1967 |
23.43 |
|
78591
|
|
|
3095
|
63095
|
90095
|
01/1944 |
|
15/06/1963 |
|
19.42 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
09/1963 |
19.68 |
|
78592
|
|
|
|
|
90386
|
01/1944 |
|
22/04/1967 |
|
23.25 |
Cut |
Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) |
09/1967 |
23.68 |
|
78593
|
4394
|
|
|
|
|
11/1944 |
|
07/1956 |
|
11.67 |
|
|
|
|
|
78594
|
|
|
|
|
90387
|
01/1944 |
|
02/08/1962 |
|
18.58 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) |
09/1962 |
18.68 |
|
78595
|
|
|
|
|
90388
|
01/1944 |
|
11/07/1964 |
|
20.5 |
Cut |
Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) |
11/1964 |
20.85 |
|
78596
|
|
|
|
|
90389
|
01/1944 |
|
31/10/1964 |
|
20.75 |
Cut |
W.E.Smiths (Ecclesfield) |
03/1965 |
21.18 |
|
78597
|
|
|
|
|
90390
|
01/1944 |
|
19/09/1965 |
|
21.67 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
12/1965 |
21.93 |
|
78598
|
|
|
|
|
90391
|
02/1944 |
|
30/08/1962 |
|
18.5 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Gorton) |
10/1962 |
18.68 |
|
78599
|
|
|
|
|
90392
|
02/1944 |
|
05/12/1964 |
|
20.83 |
Cut |
T W Ward (Broughton Lane, Sheffield) |
03/1965 |
21.09 |
|
78600
|
|
|
|
|
90393
|
02/1944 |
|
22/08/1965 |
|
21.5 |
Cut |
Ellis Metals (Derwenthaugh Road, Swalwell) |
01/1966 |
21.93 |
|
78601
|
|
|
|
|
90394
|
02/1944 |
|
21/04/1964 |
|
20.17 |
Cut |
W.E.Smiths (Ecclesfield) |
12/1964 |
20.85 |
|
78602
|
|
|
|
|
90395
|
02/1944 |
|
28/10/1966 |
|
22.67 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
03/1967 |
23.09 |
|
78603
|
|
|
3096
|
63096
|
90096
|
02/1944 |
|
19/09/1965 |
|
21.58 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
12/1965 |
21.85 |
|
78604
|
|
|
|
|
90396
|
02/1944 |
|
24/06/1967 |
|
23.33 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
11/1967 |
23.76 |
|
78605
|
|
|
|
|
90397
|
02/1944 |
|
11/05/1967 |
|
23.25 |
Cut |
Arnott Young (Parkgate) |
08/1967 |
23.51 |
|
78606
|
|
|
|
|
90398
|
02/1944 |
|
04/07/1965 |
|
21.42 |
Cut |
Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) |
09/1965 |
21.60 |
|
78607
|
|
|
|
|
90399
|
16/12/1944 |
|
27/03/1965 |
|
20.25 |
Cut |
T W Ward (Beighton) |
08/1965 |
20.68 |
|
78608
|
|
|
3097
|
63097
|
90097
|
02/1944 |
|
05/08/1963 |
|
19.5 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) |
09/1963 |
19.59 |
|
78609
|
|
|
|
|
90400
|
02/1944 |
|
02/12/1963 |
|
19.83 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
01/1964 |
19.93 |
|
78610
|
|
|
|
|
90401
|
02/1944 |
|
14/11/1965 |
|
21.75 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
03/1966 |
22.09 |
|
78611
|
4452
|
|
|
|
|
12/1944 |
|
10/1957 |
|
12.83 |
|
|
|
|
|
78612
|
|
|
|
|
90402
|
02/1944 |
|
28/03/1964 |
|
20.08 |
Cut |
Hesslewoods (Attercliffe) |
12/1964 |
20.85 |
|
78613
|
4453
|
|
|
|
|
12/1944 |
|
12/1953 |
|
9 |
|
|
|
|
|
78614
|
|
|
|
|
90403
|
02/1944 |
|
04/1964 |
|
20.17 |
Cut |
Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) |
01/1965 |
20.93 |
|
78615
|
|
|
|
|
90404
|
01/1945 |
|
08/06/1967 |
|
22.42 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
02/1966 |
21.10 |
|
78616
|
|
|
|
|
90405
|
01/1945 |
|
30/09/1967 |
|
22.67 |
Cut |
Arnott Young (Parkgate) |
12/1967 |
22.93 |
|
78617
|
4395
|
|
|
|
|
01/1945 |
|
09/1953 |
|
8.67 |
|
|
|
|
|
78618
|
4454
|
|
|
|
|
01/1945 |
|
01/1954 |
|
9 |
|
|
|
|
|
78619
|
4497
|
|
|
|
|
01/1945 |
|
09/1955 |
|
10.67 |
|
|
|
|
|
78620
|
4396
|
|
|
|
|
01/1945 |
|
10/1956 |
|
11.75 |
|
|
|
|
|
78621
|
|
|
|
|
90406
|
01/1945 |
|
24/06/1967 |
|
22.42 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
12/1967 |
22.93 |
|
78622
|
4397
|
|
|
|
|
01/1945 |
|
01/1954 |
|
9 |
|
|
|
|
|
78623
|
4455
|
|
|
|
|
01/1945 |
|
09/1953 |
|
8.67 |
|
|
|
|
|
78624
|
|
|
|
|
90407
|
01/1945 |
|
12/05/1967 |
|
22.33 |
Cut |
Arnott Young (Parkgate) |
08/1967 |
22.59 |
8625
|
78625
|
|
|
3126
|
63126
|
90447
|
03/1944 |
|
18/11/1963 |
|
19.67 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
11/1963 |
19.68 |
8626
|
78626
|
|
|
|
|
90631
|
03/1944 |
|
15/01/1967 |
|
22.83 |
Cut |
Arnott Young (Parkgate) |
04/1967 |
23.10 |
8627
|
78627
|
|
|
3127
|
63127
|
90448
|
03/1944 |
|
05/12/1965 |
|
21.75 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
05/1966 |
22.18 |
8628
|
78628
|
|
|
3128
|
63128
|
90449
|
03/1944 |
|
16/01/1966 |
|
21.83 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
05/1966 |
22.18 |
8629
|
78629
|
|
|
|
|
90632
|
03/1944 |
|
08/05/1965 |
|
21.17 |
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
08/1965 |
21.43 |
8630
|
78630
|
|
|
3129
|
63129
|
90450
|
03/1944 |
|
24/06/1967 |
|
23.25 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
01/1968 |
23.85 |
8631
|
78631
|
4398
|
|
|
|
|
04/1944 |
|
12/1956 |
|
12.67 |
|
|
|
|
8632
|
78632
|
|
|
|
|
90633
|
04/1944 |
|
12/07/1967 |
|
23.25 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
01/1968 |
23.77 |
8633
|
78633
|
|
|
3130
|
63130
|
90451
|
04/1944 |
|
23/12/1966 |
|
22.67 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
03/1967 |
22.93 |
8634
|
78634
|
|
|
3131
|
63131
|
90452
|
04/1944 |
|
21/06/1965 |
|
21.17 |
Cut |
Ellis Metals (Derwenthaugh Road, Swalwell) |
10/1965 |
21.52 |
8635
|
78635
|
|
|
3132
|
63132
|
90453
|
04/1944 |
|
04/10/1963 |
|
19.5 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
12/1963 |
19.68 |
8636
|
78636
|
4399
|
|
|
|
|
04/1944 |
|
09/1954 |
|
10.42 |
|
|
|
|
8637
|
78637
|
|
|
|
|
90634
|
04/1944 |
|
29/12/1962 |
|
18.67 |
Cut |
Arnott Young (Avonmour Ironworks, Bilston) |
04/1963 |
19.01 |
8638
|
78638
|
|
|
|
|
90635
|
04/1944 |
|
06/01/1964 |
|
19.75 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
30/03/1964 |
19.97 |
8639
|
78639
|
|
|
3133
|
63133
|
90454
|
04/1944 |
|
13/06/1965 |
|
21.17 |
Cut |
Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) |
02/1966 |
21.85 |
8640
|
78640
|
4500
|
|
|
|
|
04/1944 |
|
11/1949 |
|
5.58 |
|
|
|
|
8641
|
78641
|
|
|
3134
|
63134
|
90455
|
04/1944 |
|
10/09/1962 |
|
18.42 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) |
09/1962 |
18.43 |
8642
|
78642
|
|
|
3135
|
63135
|
90456
|
04/1944 |
|
27/02/1966 |
|
21.83 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
07/1966 |
22.26 |
8643
|
78643
|
|
|
|
|
90636
|
04/1944 |
|
17/04/1966 |
|
22 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
10/1966 |
22.52 |
8644
|
78644
|
|
|
|
|
90637
|
04/1944 |
|
12/11/1962 |
|
18.58 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
08/1963 |
19.35 |
8645
|
78645
|
|
|
3136
|
63136
|
90457
|
05/1944 |
|
05/01/1966 |
|
21.67 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
05/1966 |
22.01 |
8646
|
78646
|
|
|
3137
|
63137
|
90458
|
05/1944 |
|
24/06/1967 |
|
23.08 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
12/1967 |
23.60 |
8647
|
78647
|
4501
|
|
|
|
|
05/1944 |
|
09/1953 |
|
9.33 |
|
|
|
|
8648
|
78648
|
|
|
3138
|
63138
|
90459
|
05/1944 |
|
19/06/1967 |
|
23.08 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
10/1967 |
23.43 |
8649
|
78649
|
|
|
3139
|
63139
|
90460
|
05/1944 |
|
13/06/1965 |
|
21.08 |
Cut |
Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) |
11/1965 |
21.52 |
8650
|
78650
|
|
|
|
|
90638
|
05/1944 |
|
22/12/1962 |
|
18.58 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
06/1963 |
19.10 |
8651
|
78651
|
|
|
3140
|
63140
|
90461
|
05/1944 |
|
02/09/1963 |
|
19.33 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
09/1963 |
19.35 |
8652
|
78652
|
|
|
|
|
90639
|
05/1944 |
|
05/01/1967 |
|
22.67 |
Cut |
Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) |
05/1967 |
23.01 |
8653
|
78653
|
|
|
3141
|
63141
|
90462
|
05/1944 |
|
23/01/1967 |
|
22.67 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
06/1967 |
23.10 |
8654
|
78654
|
|
|
3142
|
63142
|
90463
|
05/1944 |
|
14/11/1963 |
|
19.5 |
Cut |
P.W. McLellan (Coatbridge) |
07/1964 |
20.18 |
8655
|
78655
|
|
|
3143
|
63143
|
90464
|
05/1944 |
|
21/03/1964 |
|
19.83 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
04/1964 |
19.93 |
8656
|
78656
|
|
|
3144
|
63144
|
90465
|
05/1944 |
|
21/01/1967 |
|
22.67 |
Cut |
T W Ward (Killamarsh) |
03/1967 |
22.85 |
8657
|
78657
|
4502
|
|
|
|
|
05/1944 |
|
12/1956 |
|
12.58 |
|
|
|
|
8658
|
78658
|
|
|
|
|
90640
|
05/1944 |
|
09/08/1966 |
|
22.25 |
Cut |
Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) |
01/1967 |
22.68 |
8659
|
78659
|
|
31
|
|
|
|
05/1944 |
|
08/1957 |
|
13.25 |
|
|
|
|
8660
|
78660
|
|
21
|
|
|
|
05/1944 |
|
08/1957 |
|
13.25 |
|
|
|
|
8661
|
78661
|
|
|
3145
|
63145
|
90466
|
05/1944 |
|
26/12/1965 |
|
21.58 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
04/1966 |
21.93 |
8662
|
78662
|
|
|
3146
|
63146
|
90467
|
05/1944 |
|
18/11/1963 |
|
19.5 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
01/1964 |
19.68 |
8663
|
78663
|
|
|
3147
|
63147
|
90468
|
06/1944 |
|
22/04/1967 |
|
22.83 |
Cut |
Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) |
09/1967 |
23.27 |
8664
|
78664
|
|
|
3148
|
63148
|
90469
|
06/1944 |
|
08/11/1964 |
|
20.42 |
Cut |
Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) |
03/1965 |
20.76 |
8665
|
78665
|
|
|
3149
|
63149
|
90470
|
06/1944 |
|
21/12/1966 |
|
22.5 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
03/1967 |
22.76 |
8666
|
78666
|
|
|
|
|
90641
|
06/1944 |
|
07/08/1965 |
|
21.17 |
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
01/1966 |
21.60 |
8667
|
78667
|
|
|
3150
|
63150
|
90471
|
06/1944 |
|
17/04/1966 |
|
21.83 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
09/1966 |
22.27 |
8668
|
78668
|
|
|
3151
|
63151
|
90472
|
06/1944 |
|
28/12/1963 |
|
19.5 |
Cut |
T W Ward (Inverkeithing) |
06/1964 |
20.01 |
8669
|
78669
|
4503
|
|
|
|
|
06/1944 |
|
09/1954 |
|
10.25 |
|
|
|
|
8670
|
78670
|
|
|
3152
|
63152
|
90473
|
06/1944 |
|
16/09/1962 |
|
18.25 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Gorton) |
12/1962 |
18.51 |
8671
|
78671
|
|
|
|
|
90642
|
06/1944 |
|
09/09/1967 |
|
23.25 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
05/1968 |
23.93 |
8672
|
78672
|
|
|
|
|
90643
|
06/1944 |
|
08/02/1964 |
|
19.67 |
Cut |
J Routledge (Bootle) |
08/1964 |
20.18 |
8673
|
78673
|
|
|
3153
|
63153
|
90474
|
06/1944 |
|
18/07/1965 |
|
21.08 |
Cut |
T W Ward (Killamarsh) |
10/1965 |
21.35 |
8674
|
78674
|
|
|
3154
|
63154
|
90475
|
06/1944 |
|
13/08/1963 |
|
19.17 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
09/1963 |
19.26 |
8675
|
78675
|
|
|
|
|
90644
|
06/1944 |
|
24/06/1967 |
|
23 |
Cut |
Arnott Young (Parkgate) |
11/1967 |
23.43 |
8676
|
78676
|
|
|
3155
|
63155
|
90476
|
06/1944 |
|
11/07/1965 |
|
21.08 |
Cut |
Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) |
02/1966 |
21.68 |
8677
|
78677
|
|
|
3156
|
63156
|
90477
|
06/1944 |
|
20/03/1966 |
|
21.75 |
Cut |
Arnott Young (Parkgate) |
06/1966 |
22.01 |
8678
|
78678
|
|
|
|
|
|
06/1944 |
|
06/1945 |
|
1 |
|
|
|
|
8679
|
78679
|
|
|
3157
|
63157
|
90478
|
06/1944 |
|
09/09/1967 |
|
23.25 |
Cut |
Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) |
09/1967 |
23.27 |
8680
|
78680
|
|
|
3158
|
63158
|
90479
|
06/1944 |
|
11/09/1966 |
|
22.25 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
11/1966 |
22.43 |
8681
|
78681
|
|
|
|
|
90645
|
06/1944 |
|
21/01/1967 |
|
22.58 |
Cut |
T W Ward (Killamarsh) |
04/1967 |
22.85 |
8682
|
78682
|
|
|
|
|
90646
|
07/1944 |
|
05/05/1964 |
|
19.83 |
Cut |
Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) |
01/1965 |
20.52 |
8683
|
78683
|
|
|
|
|
90647
|
07/1944 |
|
07/03/1965 |
|
20.67 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
07/1965 |
21.01 |
8684
|
78684
|
|
|
|
|
90648
|
07/1944 |
|
30/08/1962 |
|
18.08 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Gorton) |
09/1962 |
18.18 |
8685
|
78685
|
|
|
|
|
90649
|
07/1944 |
|
21/01/1967 |
|
22.5 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
05/1967 |
22.85 |
8686
|
78686
|
|
|
3159
|
63159
|
90480
|
07/1944 |
|
01/08/1965 |
|
21.08 |
Cut |
W George, Station Steel (Wath) |
09/1965 |
21.18 |
8687
|
78687
|
|
|
3160
|
63160
|
90481
|
07/1944 |
|
02/10/1966 |
|
22.25 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
12/1966 |
22.43 |
8688
|
78688
|
|
|
|
|
90650
|
07/1944 |
|
24/06/1967 |
|
22.92 |
Cut |
Arnott Young (Parkgate) |
11/1967 |
23.35 |
8689
|
78689
|
|
|
|
|
90651
|
07/1944 |
|
02/10/1966 |
|
22.25 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
12/1966 |
22.43 |
8690
|
78690
|
|
|
3161
|
63161
|
90482
|
07/1944 |
|
12/07/1967 |
|
23 |
Cut |
Arnott Young (Dinsdale) |
11/1967 |
23.35 |
8691
|
78691
|
|
|
3162
|
63162
|
90483
|
07/1944 |
|
02/03/1964 |
|
19.67 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
03/1964 |
19.68 |
8692
|
78692
|
|
|
3163
|
63163
|
90484
|
07/1944 |
|
13/03/1966 |
|
21.67 |
Cut |
W George, Station Steel (Wath) |
05/1966 |
21.85 |
8693
|
78693
|
4505
|
|
|
|
|
07/1944 |
|
01/1947 |
|
2.5 |
|
|
|
|
8694
|
78694
|
|
29
|
|
|
|
07/1944 |
|
03/1963 |
|
18.67 |
|
|
|
|
8695
|
78695
|
|
|
|
|
90652
|
07/1944 |
|
11/09/1966 |
|
22.17 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
11/1966 |
22.35 |
8696
|
78696
|
|
|
3164
|
63164
|
90485
|
08/1944 |
|
09/08/1964 |
|
20 |
Cut |
T W Ward (Killamarsh) |
11/1964 |
20.27 |
8697
|
78697
|
|
|
3165
|
63165
|
90486
|
08/1944 |
|
03/04/1965 |
|
20.67 |
Cut |
T W Ward (Killamarsh) |
07/1965 |
20.93 |
8698
|
78698
|
|
|
3166
|
63166
|
90487
|
08/1944 |
|
26/08/1963 |
|
19 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
10/1963 |
19.18 |
8699
|
78699
|
|
|
3167
|
63167
|
90488
|
08/1944 |
|
07/12/1964 |
|
20.33 |
Cut |
T W Ward (Beighton) |
05/1965 |
20.76 |
8700
|
78700
|
|
|
|
|
90653
|
08/1944 |
|
05/09/1962 |
|
18.08 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Stratford) |
03/1963 |
18.59 |
8701
|
78701
|
4506
|
|
|
|
|
08/1944 |
|
06/1955 |
|
10.83 |
|
|
|
|
8702
|
78702
|
|
|
3168
|
63168
|
90489
|
08/1944 |
|
22/04/1967 |
|
22.67 |
Cut |
Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) |
09/1967 |
23.10 |
8703
|
78703
|
|
|
3169
|
63169
|
90490
|
08/1944 |
|
18/02/1964 |
|
19.5 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
04/1964 |
19.68 |
8704
|
78704
|
|
|
|
|
90654
|
08/1944 |
|
24/06/1967 |
|
22.83 |
Cut |
Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) |
11/1967 |
23.27 |
8705
|
78705
|
|
|
|
|
90655
|
08/1944 |
|
24/04/1967 |
|
22.67 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
09/1967 |
23.10 |
8706
|
78706
|
|
|
3170
|
63170
|
90491
|
08/1944 |
|
26/09/1965 |
|
21.08 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
12/1965 |
21.35 |
8707
|
78707
|
|
|
3171
|
63171
|
90492
|
08/1944 |
|
17/10/1965 |
|
21.17 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
02/1966 |
21.52 |
8708
|
78708
|
|
|
3172
|
63172
|
90493
|
08/1944 |
|
27/02/1966 |
|
21.5 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
07/1966 |
21.93 |
8709
|
78709
|
|
|
3173
|
63173
|
90494
|
08/1944 |
|
16/09/1962 |
|
18.08 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Gorton) |
12/1962 |
18.35 |
8710
|
78710
|
|
|
3174
|
63174
|
90495
|
08/1944 |
|
29/12/1962 |
|
18.33 |
Cut |
Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) |
01/1964 |
19.43 |
8711
|
78711
|
|
|
3175
|
63175
|
90496
|
08/1944 |
|
11/04/1965 |
|
20.67 |
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
07/1965 |
20.93 |
8712
|
78712
|
|
|
3176
|
63176
|
90497
|
08/1944 |
|
25/03/1963 |
|
18.58 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Horwich) |
05/1963 |
18.76 |
8713
|
78713
|
|
|
3177
|
63177
|
90498
|
09/1944 |
|
27/02/1966 |
|
21.42 |
Cut |
W George, Station Steel (Wath) |
08/1966 |
21.93 |
8714
|
78714
|
|
|
|
|
90656
|
09/1944 |
|
01/02/1965 |
|
20.42 |
Cut |
T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) |
03/1965 |
20.51 |
|
78715
|
|
|
|
|
90657
|
09/1944 |
|
07/09/1962 |
|
18 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Gorton) |
10/1962 |
18.09 |
|
78716
|
|
|
3178
|
63178
|
90499
|
09/1944 |
|
12/1963 |
|
19.25 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
12/1963 |
19.26 |
|
78717
|
|
|
|
|
90658
|
09/1944 |
|
14/11/1965 |
|
21.17 |
Cut |
W George, Station Steel (Wath) |
02/1966 |
21.43 |
|
78718
|
|
|
3179
|
63179
|
90500
|
09/1944 |
|
12/08/1963 |
|
18.92 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
09/1963 |
19.01 |
|
79177
|
|
|
3180
|
63180
|
90501
|
09/1944 |
|
07/11/1965 |
|
21.17 |
Cut |
T W Ward (Beighton) |
01/1966 |
21.35 |
|
79178
|
|
|
|
|
90659
|
09/1944 |
|
18/05/1963 |
|
18.67 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
07/1963 |
18.84 |
|
79179
|
4456
|
|
|
|
|
09/1944 |
|
05/1956 |
|
11.67 |
|
|
|
|
|
79180
|
|
|
3181
|
63181
|
90502
|
09/1944 |
|
18/05/1963 |
|
18.67 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
10/1963 |
19.09 |
|
79181
|
|
|
|
|
90660
|
09/1944 |
|
18/07/1965 |
|
20.83 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
11/1965 |
21.18 |
|
79182
|
|
|
|
|
90661
|
09/1944 |
|
23/12/1963 |
|
19.25 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
02/1964 |
19.43 |
|
79183
|
4507
|
|
|
|
|
09/1944 |
|
09/1954 |
|
10 |
|
|
|
|
|
79184
|
|
|
|
|
90662
|
09/1944 |
|
29/08/1965 |
|
20.92 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
01/1966 |
21.35 |
|
79185
|
|
|
3182
|
63182
|
90503
|
09/1944 |
|
21/01/1967 |
|
22.33 |
Cut |
T W Ward (Killamarsh) |
04/1967 |
22.59 |
|
79186
|
|
|
|
|
90663
|
09/1944 |
|
13/04/1964 |
|
19.58 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
05/1964 |
19.68 |
|
79187
|
|
|
3183
|
63183
|
90504
|
09/1944 |
|
11/05/1963 |
|
18.67 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
06/1963 |
18.76 |
|
79188
|
4508
|
|
|
|
|
09/1944 |
|
10/1956 |
|
12.08 |
|
|
|
|
|
79189
|
|
|
|
|
|
10/1944 |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
79190
|
|
|
|
|
90664
|
10/1944 |
|
31/10/1966 |
|
22 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
02/1967 |
22.35 |
|
79191
|
|
|
3184
|
63184
|
90505
|
10/1944 |
|
11/06/1962 |
|
17.67 |
Cut |
Campbells (Shieldhall) |
02/1964 |
19.35 |
|
79192
|
|
|
3185
|
63185
|
90506
|
10/1944 |
|
16/01/1966 |
|
21.25 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
05/1966 |
21.59 |
|
79193
|
4510
|
|
|
|
|
10/1944 |
|
07/1957 |
|
12.75 |
|
|
|
|
|
79194
|
|
|
|
|
90665
|
10/1944 |
|
19/12/1965 |
|
21.17 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
04/1966 |
21.51 |
|
79195
|
|
|
|
|
90666
|
10/1944 |
|
12/11/1962 |
|
18.08 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
08/1963 |
18.84 |
|
79196
|
|
|
|
|
90667
|
10/1944 |
|
04/1964 |
|
19.5 |
Cut |
Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) |
01/1965 |
20.27 |
|
79197
|
4512
|
|
|
|
|
10/1944 |
|
01/1954 |
|
9.25 |
|
|
|
|
|
79198
|
|
|
|
|
90668
|
10/1944 |
|
18/04/1965 |
|
20.5 |
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
07/1965 |
20.76 |
|
79199
|
|
|
|
|
90669
|
10/1944 |
|
12/02/1966 |
|
21.33 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
06/1966 |
21.68 |
|
79200
|
|
|
3186
|
63186
|
90507
|
10/1944 |
|
29/06/1963 |
|
18.67 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
09/1963 |
18.93 |
|
79201
|
4457
|
|
|
|
|
10/1944 |
|
11/1949 |
|
5.08 |
|
|
|
|
|
79202
|
|
|
|
|
90670
|
10/1944 |
|
24/06/1967 |
|
22.67 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
01/1968 |
23.27 |
|
79203
|
|
|
|
|
90671
|
10/1944 |
|
07/09/1963 |
|
18.92 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
12/1963 |
19.18 |
|
79204
|
|
|
|
|
90672
|
10/1944 |
|
25/04/1964 |
|
19.5 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
07/1964 |
19.76 |
|
79205
|
|
|
|
|
90673
|
10/1944 |
|
16/03/1964 |
|
19.42 |
Cut |
Albert Looms (Spondon) |
09/1964 |
19.93 |
|
79206
|
|
|
|
|
90674
|
11/1944 |
|
01/08/1965 |
|
20.75 |
Cut |
Arnott Young (Parkgate) |
11/1965 |
21.01 |
|
79207
|
|
|
|
|
90675
|
11/1944 |
|
17/04/1966 |
|
21.42 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
10/1966 |
21.93 |
|
79208
|
|
|
|
|
90676
|
11/1944 |
|
25/01/1964 |
|
19.17 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
03/1964 |
19.34 |
|
79209
|
|
|
|
|
90677
|
11/1944 |
|
09/09/1967 |
|
22.83 |
Cut |
Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) |
09/1967 |
22.85 |
|
79210
|
|
|
|
|
90678
|
11/1944 |
|
24/06/1967 |
|
22.58 |
Cut |
Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) |
09/1967 |
22.85 |
|
79211
|
|
|
3187
|
63187
|
90508
|
11/1944 |
|
29/12/1962 |
|
18.08 |
Cut |
Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) |
01/1964 |
19.18 |
|
79212
|
4513
|
|
|
|
|
11/1944 |
|
12/1953 |
|
9.08 |
|
|
|
|
|
79213
|
|
|
|
|
90679
|
11/1944 |
|
04/09/1966 |
|
21.83 |
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
12/1966 |
22.10 |
|
79214
|
|
|
|
|
90680
|
11/1944 |
|
21/01/1967 |
|
22.17 |
Cut |
T W Ward (Killamarsh) |
05/1967 |
22.51 |
|
79215
|
|
|
|
|
90681
|
11/1944 |
|
03/07/1965 |
|
20.67 |
Cut |
T W Ward (Killamarsh) |
10/1965 |
20.93 |
|
79216
|
|
|
3188
|
63188
|
90509
|
11/1944 |
|
22/08/1965 |
|
20.75 |
Cut |
Garnham, Harris and Elton (Chesterfield) |
10/1965 |
20.93 |
|
79217
|
4458
|
|
|
|
|
11/1944 |
|
03/1956 |
|
11.33 |
|
|
|
|
|
79218
|
4514
|
|
|
|
|
11/1944 |
|
12/1956 |
|
12.08 |
|
|
|
|
|
79219
|
|
|
|
|
90682
|
11/1944 |
|
30/09/1967 |
|
22.83 |
Cut |
Arnott Young (Parkgate) |
01/1968 |
23.18 |
|
79220
|
|
|
|
|
90683
|
11/1944 |
|
27/02/1966 |
|
21.25 |
Cut |
W George, Station Steel (Wath) |
08/1966 |
21.76 |
|
79221
|
|
|
|
|
90684
|
11/1944 |
|
09/01/1967 |
|
22.17 |
Cut |
Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) |
05/1967 |
22.51 |
|
79222
|
4515
|
|
|
|
|
11/1944 |
|
10/1956 |
|
11.92 |
|
|
|
|
|
79223
|
4516
|
|
|
|
|
11/1944 |
|
03/1954 |
|
9.33 |
|
|
|
|
|
79224
|
|
|
|
|
90685
|
11/1944 |
|
22/11/1964 |
|
20 |
Cut |
W.E.Smiths (Ecclesfield) |
03/1965 |
20.34 |
|
79225
|
|
|
|
|
90686
|
12/1944 |
|
03/04/1965 |
|
20.33 |
Cut |
T W Ward (Beighton) |
07/1965 |
20.59 |
|
79226
|
|
|
|
|
90687
|
12/1944 |
|
02/01/1966 |
|
21.08 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
04/1966 |
21.35 |
|
79227
|
|
|
|
|
90688
|
12/1944 |
|
24/06/1967 |
|
22.5 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
01/1968 |
23.10 |
|
79228
|
|
|
|
|
90689
|
12/1944 |
|
12/02/1966 |
|
21.17 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
06/1966 |
21.51 |
|
79229
|
|
|
|
|
90690
|
12/1944 |
|
10/09/1962 |
|
17.75 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
10/1963 |
18.84 |
|
79230
|
4459
|
|
|
|
|
12/1944 |
|
12/1955 |
|
11 |
|
|
|
|
|
79231
|
4460
|
|
|
|
|
12/1944 |
|
04/1955 |
|
10.33 |
|
|
|
|
|
79232
|
|
|
|
|
90691
|
12/1944 |
|
24/05/1962 |
|
17.42 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
07/1962 |
17.59 |
|
79233
|
|
|
|
|
90692
|
12/1944 |
|
09/12/1963 |
|
19 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
01/1964 |
19.10 |
|
79234
|
|
|
|
|
90693
|
15/12/1944 |
|
12/11/1962 |
|
17.92 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
11/1963 |
18.93 |
|
79235
|
|
|
|
|
90694
|
12/1944 |
|
21/01/1967 |
|
22.08 |
Cut |
T W Ward (Killamarsh) |
05/1967 |
22.43 |
|
79236
|
|
|
3189
|
63189
|
90510
|
12/1944 |
|
04/07/1965 |
|
20.58 |
Cut |
Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) |
04/1966 |
21.35 |
|
79237
|
|
32
|
|
|
|
12/1944 |
|
08/1959 |
|
14.67 |
|
|
|
|
|
79238
|
4498
|
|
|
|
|
12/1944 |
|
05/1956 |
|
11.42 |
|
|
|
|
|
79239
|
|
|
|
|
90695
|
12/1944 |
|
09/09/1967 |
|
22.75 |
Cut |
Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) |
09/1967 |
22.76 |
|
79240
|
|
|
3190
|
63190
|
90511
|
12/1944 |
|
08/06/1964 |
|
19.5 |
Cut |
T W Ward (South Bank, Middlesbrough) |
10/1964 |
19.85 |
|
79241
|
|
|
3191
|
63191
|
90512
|
12/1944 |
|
16/09/1962 |
|
17.75 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Gorton) |
11/1962 |
17.93 |
|
79242
|
|
|
|
|
90696
|
12/1944 |
|
29/07/1963 |
|
18.58 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
08/1963 |
18.68 |
|
79243
|
|
|
|
|
90697
|
01/1945 |
|
14/11/1965 |
|
20.83 |
Cut |
Arnott Young (Parkgate) |
04/1966 |
21.26 |
|
79244
|
|
|
|
|
90698
|
01/1945 |
|
05/07/1967 |
|
22.5 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
10/1967 |
22.76 |
|
79245
|
|
|
3192
|
63192
|
90513
|
01/1945 |
|
16/07/1962 |
|
17.5 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Inverurie) |
09/1962 |
17.68 |
|
79246
|
4499
|
|
|
|
|
01/1945 |
|
11/1949 |
|
4.83 |
|
|
|
|
|
79247
|
|
|
3193
|
63193
|
90514
|
01/1945 |
|
23/01/1966 |
|
21 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
05/1966 |
21.34 |
|
79248
|
4461
|
|
|
|
|
01/1945 |
|
09/1953 |
|
8.67 |
|
|
|
|
|
79249
|
4462
|
|
|
|
|
01/1945 |
|
09/1954 |
|
9.67 |
|
|
|
|
|
79250
|
|
|
|
|
|
01/1945 |
|
1957 |
|
11.92 |
|
|
|
|
|
79251
|
|
|
3194
|
63194
|
90515
|
01/1945 |
|
22/11/1965 |
|
20.83 |
Cut |
Campbells (Shieldhall) |
02/1966 |
21.10 |
|
79252
|
4463
|
|
|
|
|
01/1945 |
|
04/1955 |
|
10.25 |
|
|
|
|
|
79253
|
|
|
3195
|
63195
|
90516
|
01/1945 |
|
21/11/1965 |
|
20.83 |
Cut |
Garnham, Harris and Elton (Chesterfield) |
06/1966 |
21.43 |
|
79254
|
|
|
|
|
90699
|
01/1945 |
|
09/09/1967 |
|
22.67 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
04/1968 |
23.26 |
|
79255
|
4517
|
|
|
|
|
01/1945 |
|
01/1954 |
|
9 |
|
|
|
|
|
79256
|
4518
|
|
|
|
|
01/1945 |
|
01/1954 |
|
9 |
|
|
|
|
|
79257
|
4464
|
|
|
|
|
01/1945 |
|
01/1973 |
|
28 |
|
|
|
|
|
79258
|
4465
|
|
|
|
|
01/1945 |
|
09/1954 |
|
9.67 |
|
|
|
|
|
79259
|
|
|
|
|
90700
|
01/1945 |
|
14/02/1964 |
|
19.08 |
Cut |
T W Ward (Killamarsh) |
05/1964 |
19.34 |
|
79260
|
4466
|
|
|
|
|
01/1945 |
|
10/1956 |
|
11.75 |
|
|
|
|
|
79261
|
|
|
|
|
90701
|
01/1945 |
|
01/12/1962 |
|
17.92 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
06/1963 |
18.42 |
|
79262
|
|
|
|
|
90702
|
02/1945 |
|
01/08/1965 |
|
20.5 |
Cut |
Arnott Young (Parkgate) |
09/1965 |
20.59 |
|
79263
|
|
|
|
|
90703
|
02/1945 |
|
11/07/1965 |
|
20.42 |
Cut |
Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) |
04/1966 |
21.18 |
|
79264
|
|
|
|
|
90704
|
02/1945 |
|
24/06/1967 |
|
22.33 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
12/1967 |
22.84 |
|
79265
|
|
|
|
|
90705
|
02/1945 |
|
23/07/1964 |
|
19.42 |
Cut |
Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) |
10/1964 |
19.68 |
|
79266
|
|
|
|
|
90706
|
02/1945 |
|
12/02/1966 |
|
21 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
06/1966 |
21.34 |
|
79267
|
4467
|
|
|
|
|
02/1945 |
|
04/1955 |
|
10.17 |
|
|
|
|
|
79268
|
|
|
|
|
90707
|
02/1945 |
|
05/01/1967 |
|
21.92 |
Cut |
Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) |
05/1967 |
22.26 |
|
79269
|
|
|
|
|
90708
|
02/1945 |
|
04/1964 |
|
19.17 |
Cut |
Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) |
01/1965 |
19.93 |
|
79270
|
4468
|
|
|
|
|
02/1945 |
|
12/1954 |
|
9.83 |
|
|
|
|
|
79271
|
|
|
|
|
90709
|
02/1945 |
|
17/04/1966 |
|
21.17 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
10/1966 |
21.68 |
|
79272
|
|
|
|
|
90710
|
02/1945 |
|
05/02/1965 |
|
20 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
03/1965 |
20.09 |
|
79273
|
|
|
|
|
90711
|
02/1945 |
|
06/01/1967 |
|
21.92 |
Cut |
Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) |
07/1967 |
22.42 |
|
79274
|
|
|
|
|
90712
|
02/1945 |
|
07/1964 |
|
19.42 |
Cut |
Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) |
11/1964 |
19.76 |
|
79275
|
|
|
|
|
90713
|
02/1945 |
|
26/10/1963 |
|
18.67 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
02/1964 |
19.01 |
|
79276
|
|
|
|
|
90714
|
02/1945 |
|
13/12/1964 |
|
19.83 |
Cut |
T W Ward (Beighton) |
04/1965 |
20.18 |
|
79277
|
4469
|
|
|
|
|
03/1945 |
|
11/1955 |
|
10.67 |
|
|
|
|
|
79278
|
|
|
|
|
90715
|
03/1945 |
|
09/05/1964 |
|
19.17 |
Cut |
Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) |
01/1965 |
19.85 |
|
79279
|
|
|
|
|
90716
|
03/1945 |
|
12/10/1963 |
|
18.58 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
01/1964 |
18.85 |
|
79280
|
|
|
|
|
90717
|
03/1945 |
|
21/03/1964 |
|
19 |
Cut |
Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) |
01/1965 |
19.85 |
|
79281
|
|
|
|
|
90718
|
03/1945 |
|
27/02/1966 |
|
20.92 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
07/1966 |
21.35 |
|
79282
|
|
|
|
|
90719
|
03/1945 |
|
10/02/1966 |
|
20.92 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
06/1966 |
21.27 |
|
79283
|
|
|
|
|
90720
|
03/1945 |
|
17/07/1965 |
|
20.33 |
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
11/1965 |
20.68 |
|
79284
|
4470
|
|
|
|
|
03/1945 |
|
11/1949 |
|
4.67 |
|
|
|
|
|
79285
|
|
|
3196
|
63196
|
90517
|
03/1945 |
|
15/05/1966 |
|
21.17 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
08/1966 |
21.43 |
|
79286
|
4519
|
|
|
|
|
03/1945 |
|
09/1953 |
|
8.5 |
|
|
|
|
|
79287
|
4471
|
|
|
|
|
03/1945 |
|
05/1956 |
|
11.17 |
|
|
|
|
|
79288
|
|
|
3197
|
63197
|
90518
|
03/1945 |
|
16/02/1966 |
|
20.92 |
Cut |
T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) |
05/1966 |
21.18 |
|
79289
|
4472
|
|
|
|
|
03/1945 |
|
12/1954 |
|
9.75 |
|
|
|
|
|
79290
|
4473
|
|
|
|
|
03/1945 |
|
09/1953 |
|
8.5 |
|
|
|
|
|
79291
|
4474
|
|
|
|
|
03/1945 |
|
08/1956 |
|
11.42 |
|
|
|
|
|
79292
|
4520
|
|
|
|
|
03/1945 |
|
09/1953 |
|
8.5 |
|
|
|
|
|
79293
|
4521
|
|
|
|
|
03/1945 |
|
11/1949 |
|
4.67 |
|
|
|
|
|
79294
|
|
|
|
|
90721
|
03/1945 |
|
09/09/1967 |
|
22.5 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
04/1968 |
23.10 |
|
79295
|
4522
|
|
|
|
|
04/1945 |
|
09/1953 |
|
8.42 |
|
|
|
|
|
79296
|
4523
|
|
|
|
|
04/1945 |
|
11/1949 |
|
4.58 |
|
|
|
|
|
79297
|
4524
|
|
|
|
|
04/1945 |
|
09/1953 |
|
8.42 |
|
|
|
|
|
79298
|
|
|
|
|
90722
|
04/1945 |
|
24/06/1967 |
|
22.17 |
Cut |
Arnott Young (Parkgate) |
11/1967 |
22.60 |
|
79299
|
4525
|
|
|
|
|
04/1945 |
|
08/1951 |
|
6.33 |
|
|
|
|
|
79300
|
4475
|
|
|
|
|
04/1945 |
|
09/1953 |
|
8.42 |
|
|
|
|
|
79301
|
|
|
|
|
90723
|
04/1945 |
|
18/11/1966 |
|
21.58 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
04/1967 |
22.01 |
|
79302
|
|
|
|
|
90724
|
04/1945 |
|
05/06/1965 |
|
20.17 |
Cut |
Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) |
10/1965 |
20.52 |
|
79303
|
|
|
|
|
90725
|
04/1945 |
|
07/08/1965 |
|
20.33 |
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
01/1966 |
20.77 |
|
79304
|
|
|
|
|
90726
|
04/1945 |
|
12/11/1962 |
|
17.58 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
02/1964 |
18.85 |
|
79305
|
|
|
3198
|
63198
|
90519
|
04/1945 |
|
21/09/1964 |
|
19.42 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
05/1965 |
20.10 |
|
79306
|
|
|
|
|
90727
|
04/1945 |
|
08/1965 |
|
20.33 |
Cut |
Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) |
11/1965 |
20.60 |
|
79307
|
|
|
|
|
90728
|
04/1945 |
|
09/12/1963 |
|
18.67 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
01/1964 |
18.76 |
|
79308
|
|
|
3199
|
63199
|
90520
|
05/1945 |
|
06/02/1965 |
|
19.75 |
Cut |
T W Ward (Beighton) |
08/1965 |
20.27 |
|
79309
|
|
|
|
|
90729
|
05/1945 |
|
06/04/1963 |
|
17.92 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Horwich) |
05/1963 |
18.01 |
|
79310
|
|
|
|
|
90730
|
05/1945 |
|
03/10/1965 |
|
20.42 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
01/1966 |
20.68 |
|
79311
|
|
|
|
|
90731
|
05/1945 |
|
13/11/1966 |
|
21.5 |
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
04/1967 |
21.93 |
|
79312
|
|
|
|
|
90732
|
05/1945 |
|
16/09/1962 |
|
17.33 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Gorton) |
12/1962 |
17.60 |