10800 Bo-Bo
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
29/06/1950 | To Service | 10800 | NEW | 2B | Bletchley | ||
01/07/1950 | Reallocation | 10800 | 4A | Bletchley | |||
12/1950 | Reallocation | 10800 | 4A | Bletchley | 1A | Willesden | |
06/1951 | Reallocation | 10800 | 1A | Willesden | 4A | Bletchley | |
09/08/1952 | Reallocation | 10800 | 4A | Bletchley | 75C | Norwood Junction | |
18/12/1954 | Reallocation | 10800 | 75C | Norwood Junction | 75C | Plaistow | |
26/02/1955 | Reallocation | 10800 | 75C | Norwood Junction | 2A | Rugby | |
08/08/1959 | Condemned | 10800 | 2A | Rugby | COND |