Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 97 Today
» 1006 Yesterday
» 2032 Week
» 17034 Month
» 361213 Year
» 872315 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

D1/1 0-4-0


BR (1955 Num) BR (Pre Tops) Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
11500 D2950 25/12/1954 32B
50D
W
Ipswich (New)
Goole
Withdrawn
25/12/1954
31/12/1966
30/12/1967
30/12/1967
11501 D2951 25/12/1954 32B
91N
50D
W
Ipswich (New)
To North Eastern Region
Goole
Withdrawn
25/12/1954
21/01/1967
28/01/1967
30/12/1967
30/12/1967
11502 D2952 02/01/1955 32B
W
Ipswich (New)
Withdrawn
02/01/1955
25/12/1966
25/12/1966